CUNG, et al v. HHS
Federal Court Proceeding United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:97-vv-00420-UNJ

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo DIANE CUNG, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donald Alan Carstens +1 714 851 9611
No Logo THACH BAO CUNG, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donald Alan Carstens +1 714 851 9611
No Logo THUY BUI KIM, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donald Alan Carstens +1 714 851 9611
v.
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Respondent
Officially listed as "SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gerard William Fischer +1 202 616 4122
Office COFC
Filed 6/12/1997
Jury Demand
Demand $250000
Nature of Suit 483 - Death - Other
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 300 Vaccine Injury Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 2/8/1999
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 22 Filed: 8/5/1999, Entered: 8/6/1999 Order
ORDER reassigning this case to Chief Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz. Copy to parties. (DS)
    LREF
    Blank 21 Filed: 2/8/1999, Entered: 2/8/1999
    JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Vaccine Rule 11(a), that the petition is dismissed. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 2/8/1999, Entered: 2/8/1999
      Case closed (LD)
        LREF
        Blank 20 Filed: 1/6/1999, Entered: 1/12/1999 DECISION of Special Master
        Decision of Special Master Elizabeth E. Wright. Copy to parties. (JT)
          LREF
          Blank 19 Filed: 11/24/1998, Entered: 12/2/1998 Order
          ORDER set Status Conference for 1:00 p.m., 1/5/99. ( signed by Special Master Elizabeth E. Wright ) Copy to parties. (JT)
            LREF
            Blank 18 Filed: 10/21/1998, Entered: 10/26/1998 Order
            ORDER re: Status Conference for 12:00 Noon, 11/23/98 ( signed by Special Master Elizabeth E. Wright ) Copy to parties. (HW)
              LREF
              Blank 17 Filed: 10/14/1998, Entered: 10/16/1998 Order
              ORDER set Status Conference for 12:30 p.m., 10/20/98. ( signed by Special Master Elizabeth E. Wright ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                LREF
                Blank 16 Filed: 8/12/1998, Entered: 8/14/1998 Order
                ORDER granting [14-1] motion to Extend Time to August 29, 1998, to comply with the Court's Order of May 29, 1998. Reset Additional Documents (re: whether Diane received a DPT or DT vaccination, supplemental expert report and curriculum vitae of their expert) due: 8/31/98 for DIANE CUNG, for THUY BUI KIM, for THACH BAO CUNG and reset Expert Report due: 10/13/98 for HHS. ( signed by Special Master Elizabeth E. Wright ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                  LREF
                  Blank 15 Filed: 8/4/1998, Entered: 8/7/1998 Order
                  ORDER set Notice of Compliance deadline to 9/8/98 for petitioners to file a notice of intent indicating whether they elect to remain in the program ( Signed by Special Master Elizabeth E. Wright. ) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                    LREF
                    Blank 14 Filed: 8/4/1998, Entered: 8/7/1998, Terminated: 8/12/1998 Terminated:
                    MOTION by THACH BAO CUNG, THUY BUI KIM, DIANE CUNG (Service : 7/30/98 ) to Extend Time to August 29, 1998, to comply with the Court's Order of May 29, 1998 Response due: 8/17/98 (CDC)
                      LREF
                      Blank 13 Filed: 5/29/1998, Entered: 6/3/1998 Scheduling Order
                      SCHEDULING ORDER setting Additional Documents due: 7/27/98 for DIANE CUNG, for THUY BUI KIM, for THACH BAO CUNG. Expert Report due: 9/10/98 for HHS ( signed by Special Master Elizabeth E. Wright ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                        LREF
                        Blank 12 Filed: 4/29/1998, Entered: 5/4/1998 Order
                        ORDER set telephonic Rule 5 Status Conference for 3:00 p.m., 5/28/98. ( signed by Special Master Elizabeth E. Wright ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                          LREF
                          Blank 11 Filed: 4/8/1998, Entered: 4/9/1998 Respondent's Report
                          SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONDENT'S REPORT Service: 4/8/98 (JT)
                            LREF
                            Blank 10 Filed: 3/10/1998, Entered: 3/11/1998 notice of filing
                            Revised Notice of filing Documents by THACH BAO CUNG, THUY BUI KIM, DIANE CUNG. Filed by leave of the Special Master. (JT)
                              LREF
                              Blank 9 Filed: 3/10/1998, Entered: 3/11/1998 Order
                              ORDER instructing the Clerk's Office to file the attached documents as revised notice of filing documents and setting Notice of Compliance deadline to 4/8/98 for Respondent to file a supplemental Rule 4 report. ( signed by Special Master Elizabeth E. Wright ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                LREF
                                Blank 8 Filed: 2/5/1998, Entered: 2/9/1998 Order
                                ORDER pursuant to Vaccine Rule 9 suspending the proceedings for a period of 180 days. ( signed by Special Master Elizabeth E. Wright ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 7 Filed: 12/1/1997, Entered: 12/16/1997 Order
                                  ORDER Additional Documents [petitioner shall refile any document currently on file, etc.] by 12/30/97 ( signed by Special Master Elizabeth E. Wright ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 6 Filed: 11/24/1997, Entered: 12/10/1997 Additional Documentation
                                    Notice of Filing legible copies of medical records, additional medical records and declaration of Thuy Bui Kim filed by THACH BAO CUNG, THUY BUI KIM, DIANE CUNG. Service: 11/3/97 (DS)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 5 Filed: 9/15/1997, Entered: 9/19/1997 Scheduling Order
                                      SCHEDULING ORDER directing petitioners to file a legible copy of pediatric records and all outstanding records by 11/14/97; and directing respondent to file a supplemental report (if necessary) 30 days after additional documents are filed. ( signed by Special Master Elizabeth E. Wright ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 4 Filed: 9/10/1997, Entered: 9/12/1997 Respondent's Report
                                        RESPONDENT'S REPORT Service: 9/10/97 (CDC)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 3 Filed: 6/26/1997, Entered: 7/10/1997 Notice of Appearance/
                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for HHS by Gerard William Fischer. Service : 6/26/97 (AB)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 2 Filed: 6/12/1997, Entered: 6/13/1997 Case Assigned/Reassigned to Special Master
                                            NOTICE OF assignment to Special Master Elizabeth E. Wright. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 1 Filed: 6/12/1997, Entered: 6/13/1997 Petition
                                              PETITION (Filed with Exhibit List containing Exhibits 1 through 11), by THACH BAO CUNG and THUY BUI KIM as parents and legal representatives of the deceased, DIANE CUNG. FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #043711, Vac. Date: 5/30/96 (Respondent's report due 9/10/97). (FE)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 6/12/1997, Entered: 6/13/1997 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                CASE assigned to Judge Unassigned. (FE)
                                                  LREF

                                                  Statistics

                                                  This case has been viewed 154 times.

                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                  Space
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                   
                                                  PlainSite
                                                  Sign Up
                                                  Need Password Help?