MILLMAN v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:98-cv-00013-JPW
District Judge John P. Wiese, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo RENA MILLMAN, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven Jay Kramer +1 202 659 8598 +1 202 756 1301 kramerlegal@verizon.net
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth MacPhee Kulak
Office COFC
Filed 1/8/1998
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 354 - Military Pay - SBP
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 2/12/1999
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (28) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 27 Filed: 2/12/1999, Entered: 2/17/1999 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by RENA MILLMAN, USA. Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(B). Copy to parties. (JT)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 2/12/1999, Entered: 2/17/1999 Terminated Case
    Case closed. (JT)
      LREF
      Blank 26 Filed: 2/2/1999, Entered: 2/3/1999 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER granting [25-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to complaint Answer deadline to 2/12/99 ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ). Copy to parties. (FE)
        LREF
        Blank 25 Filed: 1/29/1999, Entered: 2/1/1999, Terminated: 2/2/1999 Terminated:
        MOTION by USA (Service : 1/29/99 ) to Extend Time to respond to complaint , (until February 12, 1999). Response due: 2/16/99. (FE)
          LREF
          Blank 24 Filed: 1/5/1999, Entered: 1/8/1999 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER granting [23-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to complaint. Reset Answer deadline to 1/29/99. ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (JT)
            LREF
            Blank 23 Filed: 12/30/1998, Entered: 1/5/1999, Terminated: 1/5/1999 Terminated:
            MOTION by USA (Service: 12/30/98) to Extend Time to respond to complaint until 1/29/99. (FE)
              LREF
              Blank 22 Filed: 12/11/1998, Entered: 12/15/1998 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER granting [21-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to complaint Answer deadline to 12/30/98 ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                LREF
                Blank 21 Filed: 12/9/1998, Entered: 12/15/1998, Terminated: 12/11/1998 Terminated:
                MOTION by USA (Service : 12/9/98 ) to Extend Time to respond to complaint , (until December 30, 1998). Response due: 1/11/99. (FE)
                  LREF
                  Blank 20 Filed: 11/20/1998, Entered: 11/30/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                  ORDER granting [19-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint. Reset Answer deadline to 12/9/98. ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                    LREF
                    Blank 19 Filed: 11/18/1998, Entered: 11/20/1998, Terminated: 11/20/1998 Terminated:
                    MOTION by USA (Service : 11/18/98 ) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint [to December 9, 1998]. Response due: 12/7/98 (JT)
                      LREF
                      Blank 18 Filed: 10/14/1998, Entered: 10/19/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER granting [17-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to complaint reset Answer deadline to 11/18/98 ( Signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                        LREF
                        Blank 17 Filed: 10/9/1998, Entered: 10/14/1998, Terminated: 10/14/1998 Terminated:
                        MOTION by USA (Service : 10/9/98 ) to Extend Time to respond to complaint , (until November 18, 1998). Response due: 11/9/98. (FE)
                          LREF
                          Blank 16 Filed: 8/27/1998, Entered: 8/28/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER granting [15-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint . Answer deadline to 10/9/98 ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ). Copy to parties. (HW)
                            LREF
                            Blank 15 Filed: 8/26/1998, Entered: 8/27/1998, Terminated: 8/27/1998 Terminated:
                            MOTION by USA (Service : 8/26/98 ) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint [until 10/9/98]. (AB)
                              LREF
                              Blank 14 Filed: 7/29/1998, Entered: 8/3/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                              ORDER granting [13-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint. Reset Answer deadline to 8/26/98. ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                LREF
                                Blank 13 Filed: 7/27/1998, Entered: 7/30/1998, Terminated: 7/29/1998 Terminated:
                                MOTION by USA (Service : 7/27/98 ) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint [to August 26, 1998]. Response due: 8/13/98 (JT)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 12 Filed: 6/30/1998, Entered: 7/2/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                  ORDER granting [11-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to complaint to June 27, 1998. ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 11 Filed: 6/26/1998, Entered: 6/29/1998, Terminated: 6/30/1998 Terminated:
                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 6/26/98) to Extend Time to respond to complaint until 6/27/98. (FE)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 10 Filed: 6/1/1998, Entered: 6/3/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                      ORDER granting [9-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint. Reset Answer deadline to 6/26/98. ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 9 Filed: 5/29/1998, Entered: 5/29/1998, Terminated: 6/1/1998 Motion for Extension of Time
                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 5/29/98 ) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint [until 6/26/98]. (AB)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 8 Filed: 3/27/1998, Entered: 3/31/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                          ORDER granting [7-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint. reset Answer deadline to 5/29/98 ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 7 Filed: 3/26/1998, Entered: 3/30/1998, Terminated: 3/27/1998 Terminated:
                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 3/26/98 ) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint. (to May 29, 1998) (DS)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 6 Filed: 3/5/1998, Entered: 3/6/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                              ORDER granting [5-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the Complaint reset Answer deadline to 3/30/98 ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 5 Filed: 3/5/1998, Entered: 3/5/1998, Terminated: 3/5/1998 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 3/5/98 ) to Extend Time to respond to the Complaint [until March 30, 1998.] Response due: 3/23/98 (CDC)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 4 Filed: 1/26/1998, Entered: 1/28/1998 Notice of Appearance/
                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Kenneth MacPhee Kulak. Service : 1/26/98 (DS)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 3 Filed: 1/12/1998, Entered: 1/16/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER directing parties to confer and arrange for preliminary status conference; identifying filing requirements for conference (if defendant intends to proceed by motion in lieu of an answer, defendant is to file a memorandum 10 days before conference); and precluding filing of dispositive motions until after conference has been held. ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 2 Filed: 1/8/1998, Entered: 1/9/1998 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                      Notice of assignment to Judge John P. Wiese. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 1/8/1998, Entered: 1/9/1998 Complaint
                                                        COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #044768. Answer due on 3/9/98. (FE)
                                                          LREF

                                                          Statistics

                                                          This case has been viewed 178 times.

                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                          Space
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                           
                                                          PlainSite
                                                          Sign Up
                                                          Need Password Help?