FAULKNER v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:98-cv-00019-ECH
District Judge Emily C. Hewitt, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo GARY D. FAULKNER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by HUNT HASSLER & LORENZ, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert F Hunt +1 812 232 9691 +1 812 234 2881 hunt@huntlawfirm.net
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Owen, Wickersham & Erickson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Luke Paul Levasseur +1 212 463 2000 llevasseur@mayerbrown.com
Office COFC
Filed 1/9/1998
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 346 - Military Pay - Correct/Reinstate
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 2/25/1999
Origin 5
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case 96-201[S. District of Indiana]
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 11 Filed: 2/25/1999, Entered: 2/25/1999
JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaint is dismissed. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD)
    LREF
    Blank 10 Filed: 2/25/1999, Entered: 2/25/1999 Court Filing
    PUBLISHED DECISION granting [5-1] defendant's motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. ( signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt ). Copy to parties. (LD)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 2/25/1999, Entered: 2/25/1999
      Case closed (LD)
        LREF
        Blank 9 Filed: 1/27/1999, Entered: 1/29/1999 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
        Notice of reassignment to Judge Emily C. Hewitt . Copy to parties. (CDC)
          LREF
          Blank 8 Filed: 5/14/1998, Entered: 5/19/1998 Reply to Response to Motion
          REPLY by USA to response to [5-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Service: 5/14/98 (JT)
            LREF
            Blank 8 Filed: 5/14/1998, Entered: 5/19/1998 Terminated:
            RESPONSE by USA (Service: 5/14/98 ) to [6-1] motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Reply due: 5/28/98 (JT)
              LREF
              Blank 7 Filed: 5/4/1998, Entered: 5/6/1998 Terminated:
              RESPONSE by GARY D. FAULKNER (Service: 5/2/98 ) to [5-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Reply due: 5/19/98 (JT)
                LREF
                Blank 6 Filed: 5/4/1998, Entered: 5/6/1998 Terminated:
                MOTION by GARY D. FAULKNER (Service : 5/2/98 ) for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Response due: 5/19/98 (JT)
                  LREF
                  Blank 5 Filed: 4/9/1998, Entered: 4/9/1998, Terminated: 2/25/1999 Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                  MOTION by USA (Service : 4/6/98 ) to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 5/7/98 (JT)
                    LREF
                    Blank 4 Filed: 3/3/1998, Entered: 3/4/1998 Notice of Appearance/
                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Luke Paul Levasseur. Service : 3/3/98 (JT)
                      LREF
                      Blank 3 Filed: 2/5/1998, Entered: 2/5/1998 Court Filing
                      Notice of assignment to Judge James T. Turner . Copy to parties. (DS)
                        LREF
                        Blank 2 Filed: 2/5/1998, Entered: 2/5/1998
                        COMPLAINT filed. Copies (5) to defendant. Answer due on 4/6/98 (DS)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 2/5/1998, Entered: 2/5/1998
                          **Not member of bar flag removed. (HW)
                            LREF
                            Blank 1 Filed: 1/9/1998, Entered: 1/14/1998 Case Transferred In - District Transfer
                            Record transferred from the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana, case number 96-201, consisting of one bound volume. Notice to parties. (Amended complaint due by 2/6/98). (FE)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 1/9/1998, Entered: 1/14/1998 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                              CASE assigned to Judge Unassigned. (FE)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 1/9/1997, Entered: 1/14/1998 Set/Clear Flags
                                **Not member of bar flag set (FE)
                                  LREF

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 177 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?