ANDREWS v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:98-cv-00023-MBH
District Judge Marian Blank Horn, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ROBERT L. ANDREWS, JR., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Terrence James Benshoof +1 312 368 1400
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ho Sik Shin
Office COFC
Filed 1/9/1998
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 352 - Military Pay - Retirement
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 4/26/1999
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 11 Filed: 4/26/1999, Entered: 4/26/1999
JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaint is dismissed, with prejudice. Costs shall be awarded to the defendant. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 4/26/1999, Entered: 4/26/1999
    Case closed (LD)
      LREF
      Blank 10 Filed: 4/22/1999, Entered: 4/22/1999 Court Filing
      PUBLISHED DECISION granting [6-1] defendant's motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, and directing the clerk to dismiss the complaint with prejudice. Costs shall be awarded to the defendant. ( signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn ). Copy to parties. (LD)
        LREF
        Blank 9 Filed: 5/27/1998, Entered: 5/29/1998 Reply to Response to Motion
        REPLY by USA to response to [6-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Service: 5/27/98 (JT)
          LREF
          Blank 8 Filed: 5/14/1998, Entered: 5/19/1998 Terminated:
          RESPONSE by ROBERT L. ANDREWS JR.(Service: 5/13/98 ) to [6-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Reply due: 6/1/98 (JT)
            LREF
            Blank 7 Filed: 4/24/1998, Entered: 4/28/1998 Terminated:
            MOTION by USA (Service : 4/24/98 ) for Leave to File Administrative Record and for Waiver of Copying Requirements. Response due: 5/11/98 (JT)
              LREF
              Blank 6 Filed: 4/24/1998, Entered: 4/28/1998 Terminated:
              MOTION by USA (Service : 4/24/98 ) to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Response due: 5/26/98 (JT)
                LREF
                Blank 5 Filed: 3/16/1998, Entered: 3/17/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER granting [4-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to complaint. Reset Answer deadline to 4/24/98. ( signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                  LREF
                  Blank 4 Filed: 3/9/1998, Entered: 3/10/1998, Terminated: 3/16/1998 Terminated:
                  MOTION by USA (Service : 3/9/98 ) to Extend Time to respond to complaint [to April 24, 1998]. Response due: 3/26/98 (JT)
                    LREF
                    Blank 3 Filed: 3/2/1998, Entered: 3/3/1998 Notice of Appearance/
                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Ho Sik Shin. Service : 3/2/98 (JT)
                      LREF
                      Blank 2 Filed: 1/9/1998, Entered: 1/15/1998 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                      Notice of assignment to Judge Marian Blank Horn. Copy to parties. (FE)
                        LREF
                        Blank 1 Filed: 1/9/1998, Entered: 1/15/1998 Complaint
                        COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #044815. Answer due on 3/10/98. (FE)
                          LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 144 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?