GRAVEE, et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:98-cv-00061-JPW
District Judge John P. Wiese, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo JEROME A. MAHER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Camillo Francis Volini +1 773 275 9100
No Logo JOHN R. GRAVEE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Camillo Francis Volini +1 773 275 9100
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William George Kanellis +1 202 353 0526 +1 202 514 8640 william.kanellis@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 1/27/1998
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 511 - Taking - FIRREA
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 1/24/2001
Origin 5
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case 94-4589[N. District of Illinois]
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (43) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 37 Filed: 2/10/2003, Entered: 1/2/2008 CAFC Mandate Affirming
MANDATE of CAFC Affirming the [35] Published Opinion that directed the Clerk to enter judgment in this case. (hw1, )
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 3/26/2001, Entered: 3/27/2001 Terminated:
    CAFC Case Number Re: [36-1] appeal by JEROME A. MAHER, JOHN R. GRAVEE. CAFC NUMBER: 01-5076. (HW)
      LREF
      Blank 36 Filed: 3/22/2001, Entered: 3/22/2001, Terminated: 2/10/2003 Notice of AppealCourt Filing
      NOTICE OF APPEAL by JOHN R. GRAVEE, JEROME A. MAHER. Copy to Defendant, Judge John P. Wiese and to CAFC. FILING FEE $105.00; RECEIPT # 051441. (HW)
        LREF
        Blank 35 Filed: 2/7/2001, Entered: 2/8/2001 Published DecisionCourt Filing
        PUBLISHED DECISION granting [11-1] motion to Dismiss ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (FE)
          LREF
          Blank 34 Filed: 2/7/2001, Entered: 2/7/2001 Court Filing
          ORDER granting [33-1] motion for Publication (signed by Judge John P. Wiese) Copy to parties. (FE)
            LREF
            Blank 33 Filed: 2/6/2001, Entered: 2/7/2001, Terminated: 2/7/2001 Terminated:
            MOTION by USA (Service: 2/6/01) for Publication . Response due: 2/23/01. (FE)
              LREF
              Blank 32 Filed: 2/2/2001, Entered: 2/2/2001
              TRANSCRIPT of proceedings, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of January 18, 2001. Notice to parties. (FE)
                LREF
                Blank 31 Filed: 1/24/2001, Entered: 1/24/2001
                JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaint is dismissed. Costs shall not be assessed. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD)
                  LREF
                  Blank 30 Filed: 1/24/2001, Entered: 1/24/2001 Court Filing
                  ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND DIRECTING DISMISSAL OF COMPLAINT granting [11-1] motion to Dismiss and directing the clerk to dismiss the complaint. Costs shall not be assessed.( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (LD)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 1/24/2001, Entered: 1/24/2001
                    Case closed (LD)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 1/18/2001, Entered: 1/19/2001 Oral Argument
                      Oral Argument re: [11-1] motion to Dismiss by USA ( Transcript due 2/20/01 ) (DS)
                        LREF
                        Blank 29 Filed: 12/11/2000, Entered: 12/12/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER oral argument set for 10:30 a.m. 1/18/01 for [11-1] motion to Dismiss , in the National Courts Building, 717 Madison Pl., N.W., Washington, D.C. (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (FE)
                          LREF
                          Blank 28 Filed: 10/20/2000, Entered: 10/26/2000 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                          Notice of reassignment to Judge John P. Wiese . Copy to parties. (DS)
                            LREF
                            Blank 27 Filed: 10/20/2000, Entered: 10/26/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                            ORDER extending the appointment of Judge Wiese as the Issue Judge to resolve the statute of limitations question, with the case to be reassigned to Judge Wiese. ( signed by Senior Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                              LREF
                              Blank 26 Filed: 4/19/1999, Entered: 4/21/1999 Reply to Response to Motion
                              REPLY by USA to response to [11-1] motion to Dismiss. Service: 4/19/99. (FE)
                                LREF
                                Blank 25 Filed: 4/15/1999, Entered: 4/16/1999 Terminated:
                                MOTION by USA (Service : 4/15/99) to Extend Time to reply to response to motion to dismiss , (until April 19, 1999). (FE)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 24 Filed: 4/13/1999, Entered: 4/16/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                  ORDER granting [23-1] motion to Extend Time to reply to response to motion to dismiss. Defendant's reply to response to motion reset to 4/15/99 for [11-1] motion to dismiss. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 23 Filed: 4/1/1999, Entered: 4/5/1999, Terminated: 4/13/1999 Terminated:
                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 4/1/99 ) to Extend Time to reply to response to motion to dismiss [until April 15, 1999]. Response due: 4/19/99 (JT)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 22 Filed: 3/23/1999, Entered: 3/25/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                      ORDER granting [21-1] motion to Extend Time to reply to response to motion to dismiss Reply to Response to Motion reset to 4/1/99 for [11-1] motion to Dismiss (signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 21 Filed: 3/11/1999, Entered: 3/14/1999, Terminated: 3/23/1999 Terminated:
                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 3/11/99 ) to Extend Time to reply to response to motion to dismiss [until April 1, 1999]. Response due: 3/29/99 (JT)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 20 Filed: 2/25/1999, Entered: 3/1/1999 Terminated: Court Filing
                                          RESPONSE by JOHN R. GRAVEE, JEROME A. MAHER (Service: 2/22/99 ) to [11-1] motion to Dismiss, by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 3/8/99. (FE)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 19 Filed: 2/16/1999, Entered: 2/18/1999 Terminated:
                                            MOTION by JOHN R. GRAVEE, JEROME A. MAHER (Service : 2/15/99 ) to Extend Time to respond to Defendant's motion to dismiss [until February 23, 1999]. Response due: 3/4/99 (JT)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 18 Filed: 1/19/1999, Entered: 1/28/1999 Terminated:
                                              MOTION by JOHN R. GRAVEE, JEROME A. MAHER (Service : 1/18/99 ) to Extend Time to respond to Defendant's motion to dismiss [until February 15, 1999]. Response due: 2/4/99 (JT)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 17 Filed: 12/4/1998, Entered: 12/9/1998 Terminated:
                                                MOTION by JOHN R. GRAVEE, JEROME A. MAHER (Service : 11/3/98 ) to Extend Time to respond to motion to dismiss , (until January 15, 1999). Response due: 12/4/98. (FE)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 16 Filed: 11/3/1998, Entered: 11/5/1998 Terminated:
                                                  MOTION by JOHN R. GRAVEE, JEROME A. MAHER (Service : 9/15/98 ) to Extend Time within which to respond to motion to dismiss , (until December 4, 1998). (HW)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 15 Filed: 10/1/1998, Entered: 10/6/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER granting [14-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs' response to [11-1] motion to dismiss reset to 11/4/98. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 14 Filed: 9/16/1998, Entered: 9/18/1998, Terminated: 10/1/1998 Terminated:
                                                      MOTION by JOHN R. GRAVEE, JEROME A. MAHER (Service: 9/15/98) to Extend Time to respond to Motion to Dismiss until 11/4/98. (FE)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 13 Filed: 8/27/1998, Entered: 8/28/1998 Notice of Appearance/
                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by William George Kanellis. Service : 8/27/98. (HW)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 12 Filed: 7/2/1998, Entered: 7/8/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER granting [10-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to amended complaint. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 11 Filed: 6/26/1998, Entered: 6/29/1998, Terminated: 1/24/2001 Terminated:
                                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 6/26/98) to Dismiss Response due: 7/27/98. (FE)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 10 Filed: 6/16/1998, Entered: 6/22/1998, Terminated: 7/2/1998 Terminated:
                                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 6/16/98 ) to Extend Time to respond to amended complaint [to June 26, 1998]. Response due: 7/6/98 (JT)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 9 Filed: 6/1/1998, Entered: 6/2/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER granting [8-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to plaintiff's amended complaint reset Answer deadline to 6/16/98 ( Signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith. ) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 8 Filed: 5/27/1998, Entered: 5/28/1998, Terminated: 6/1/1998 Terminated:
                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 5/27/98 ) to Extend Time to respond to plaintiff's amended complaint [until 6/16/98]. (AB)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 7 Filed: 4/27/1998, Entered: 4/29/1998 Order
                                                                    ORDER granting [6-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to amended complaint reset Answer deadline to 5/27/98 ( signed by the Clerk ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 6 Filed: 4/24/1998, Entered: 4/29/1998, Terminated: 4/27/1998 Terminated:
                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 4/24/98 ) to Extend Time to respond to amended complaint [to May 27, 1998]. Response due: 5/11/98 (JT)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 5 Filed: 3/11/1998, Entered: 3/12/1998 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Shalom Brilliant Service : 3/11/98 (CDC)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 4 Filed: 3/3/1998, Entered: 3/6/1998 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                          Notice of reassignment to Chief Judge Loren A. Smith . Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 3 Filed: 2/26/1998, Entered: 2/27/1998 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                            Notice of assignment to Judge Marian Blank Horn . Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 2 Filed: 2/26/1998, Entered: 2/27/1998 Amended Complaint
                                                                              AMENDED COMPLAINT by JOHN R. GRAVEE, JEROME A. MAHER (Answer due 4/27/98 ) Copies (5) to defendant. (DS)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 2/26/1998, Entered: 2/27/1998 Set/Clear Flags
                                                                                **Not member of bar flag removed. (HW)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 1/27/1998, Entered: 1/27/1998
                                                                                  Record transferred from the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Illinois (Chicago), case number 94-cv-4589, consisting of 14 bound volumes. Notice to parties. (Amended complaint due by 2/24/98). (FE)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 1/27/1998, Entered: 1/27/1998
                                                                                    **Not member of bar flag set (FE)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 1/27/1998, Entered: 1/27/1998
                                                                                      CASE assigned to Judge Unassigned. (FE)
                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                        This case has been viewed 154 times.

                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                        Space
                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                         
                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                        Need Password Help?