GREEK v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:98-cv-00425-LMB
District Judge Lawrence M. Baskir, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo RONALD F. GREEK, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of Roger Albright

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael J. Calabro +1 617 482 3366 mjcal@prodigy.net
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Francis Ryan william.ryan2@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 5/7/1998
Jury Demand
Demand $10000
Nature of Suit 352 - Military Pay - Retirement
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 5/19/1999
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (39) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 35 Filed: 9/24/1999, Entered: 10/8/1999 CAFC Mandate Dismissing
MANDATE (certified copy) from CAFC dated September 24, 1999 dismissed [33-1] appeal by RONALD F. GREEK (HW)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 7/29/1999, Entered: 8/3/1999 CAFC Case Number
    CAFC Case Number Re: [33-1] appeal by RONALD F. GREEK. CAFC NUMBER: 99-5134. (HW)
      LREF
      Blank 34 Filed: 7/23/1999, Entered: 8/3/1999 Remark
      This is in regard to the Notice of Appeal filed with the United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit. According to the statute, 28 U.S.C. 2522, a notice of appeal must be filed "within 60 days from the date final judgment entered." (HW)
        LREF
        Blank 33 Filed: 7/20/1999, Entered: 7/20/1999, Terminated: 9/24/1999 Notice of AppealCourt Filing
        NOTICE OF APPEAL by RONALD F. GREEK. Copy to Judge Lawrence M. Baskir, defendant and C.A.F.C. Fee not received. (FE)
          LREF
          Blank 32 Filed: 5/27/1999, Entered: 6/2/1999 Published DecisionCourt Filing
          PUBLISHED DECISION (reissuance of unpublished ordered entered on May 19, 1999). ( signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir ). Copy to parties. (JT)
            LREF
            Blank 31 Filed: 5/24/1999, Entered: 5/26/1999 Terminated:
            MOTION by USA (Service : 5/24/99 ) for publication of the decision issued on May 19, 1999. Response due: 6/10/99 (JT) Modified on 05/26/1999
              LREF
              Blank 30 Filed: 5/19/1999, Entered: 5/19/1999
              JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaint is dismissed. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD)
                LREF
                Blank 29 Filed: 5/19/1999, Entered: 5/19/1999 Court Filing
                UNPUBLISHED DECISION granting [12-1] defendant's motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. ( signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir ). Copy to parties. (See entry of 5/27/99) (LD) Modified on 06/02/1999
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 5/19/1999, Entered: 5/19/1999
                  Case closed (LD)
                    LREF
                    Blank 28 Filed: 4/27/1999, Entered: 4/27/1999
                    TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: Evidentiary Hearing, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of April 5, 1999. Notice to parties. (FE)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 4/5/1999, Entered: 4/6/1999 Evidentiary Hearing
                      Oral Argument held ( Transcript due 5/5/99 ) (DS)
                        LREF
                        Blank 27 Filed: 3/17/1999, Entered: 3/21/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER set oral argument for 2:00 p.m., 4/5/99. Plaintiff's counsel may appear either in person or by telephone at its option, excerised by notice to the Court's Judicial Administrative Assistant no later than 3/26/99. ( signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                          LREF
                          Blank 26 Filed: 2/1/1999, Entered: 2/4/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER re: scheduling oral argument during the month of March. A morning schedule, which shall begin at 10:00 a.m., and an afternoon session, which shall begin at 2:00 p.m. ( signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                            LREF
                            Blank 25 Filed: 1/19/1999, Entered: 1/20/1999 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                            Notice of reassignment to Judge Lawrence M. Baskir . Copy to parties. (CDC) Modified on 01/20/1999
                              LREF
                              Blank 24 Filed: 11/20/1998, Entered: 11/25/1998 Reply to Response to Motion
                              REPLY by USA to response to [12-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, [12-2] motion for Summary Judgment. Service: 11/20/98. (HW)
                                LREF
                                Blank 23 Filed: 11/3/1998, Entered: 11/5/1998 Terminated:
                                MOTION by USA (Service : 11/3/98 ) to Extend Time to reply to opposition to motion to dismiss or for judgment on the administrative record , (until November 23, 1998). Response due: 12/4/98. (FE)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 22 Filed: 10/29/1998, Entered: 11/2/1998 Terminated: Court Filing
                                  RESPONSE by RONALD F. GREEK (Service: 10/22/98 ) to [12-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 11/5/98. (FE)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 21 Filed: 10/21/1998, Entered: 10/29/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                    ORDER granting [20-1] motion to Extend Time to file opposition to motion to dismiss. Plaintiffs' response to [12-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction reset to 10/23/98. ( signed by Sr. Judge Robert J. Yock ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 20 Filed: 10/6/1998, Entered: 10/8/1998, Terminated: 10/21/1998 Terminated: Court Filing
                                      MOTION by RONALD F. GREEK (Service : 9/30/98 ) to Extend Time to file opposition to motion to dismiss , (until October 23, 1998) by leave of the Judge. Response due: 11/2/98. (FE) Modified on 10/08/1998
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 19 Filed: 9/9/1998, Entered: 9/11/1998 Notice of Appearance/
                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by William Francis Ryan. Service : 9/9/98. (FE)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 18 Filed: 9/3/1998, Entered: 9/9/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                          ORDER granting [14-1] motion to Stay proceedings concerning class claims and class certification. ( signed by Sr. Judge Robert J. Yock ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 17 Filed: 9/3/1998, Entered: 9/4/1998 Administrative Record
                                            Administrative record [two volumes] filed by USA. Service: 8/31/98. (HW)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 16 Filed: 9/3/1998, Entered: 9/4/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                              ORDER granting [15-1] motion for Leave to File the Administrative Record, granting [15-2] motion for Waiver of Duplication (signed by Sr. Judge Robert J. Yock). Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 15 Filed: 8/31/1998, Entered: 9/1/1998, Terminated: 9/3/1998 Terminated:
                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 8/31/98 ) for Leave to File the Administrative Record and for Waiver of Duplication. Response due: 9/17/98 (JT)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 14 Filed: 8/31/1998, Entered: 9/1/1998, Terminated: 9/3/1998 Terminated:
                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 8/31/98 ) to Stay proceedings concerning class claims and class certification. Response due: 9/17/98 (JT)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 13 Filed: 8/31/1998, Entered: 9/1/1998 Statement of Facts
                                                    STATEMENT OF FACTS filed by USA. Service: 8/31/98 (JT)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 12 Filed: 8/31/1998, Entered: 9/1/1998 Terminated:
                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 8/31/98 ) to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Summary Judgment. Response due: 10/1/98 (JT)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 11 Filed: 8/24/1998, Entered: 8/25/1998 Amended Complaint
                                                        AMENDED COMPLAINT by RONALD F. GREEK (Answer due 9/4/98 ) amending [1-1] complaint. Service: 8/18/98 (JT) Modified on 08/26/1998
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank -- Filed: 8/24/1998, Entered: 8/26/1998 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                          Deadline updated; reset Answer deadline to 9/4/98. (JT)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 10 Filed: 8/14/1998, Entered: 8/18/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER granting [9-1] motion to Extend Time within which to respond to the complaint Response to [3-1] motion to Certify Class reset to 8/31/98 ( signed by Sr. Judge Robert J. Yock ). Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 9 Filed: 8/6/1998, Entered: 8/10/1998, Terminated: 8/14/1998 Terminated:
                                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 8/6/98 ) to Extend Time within which to respond to the complaint , (until August 31, 1998). (HW)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 8 Filed: 7/16/1998, Entered: 7/22/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER granting [7-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to complaint, granting [7-2] motion to Extend Time to respond to motion for class certification. Reset Answer deadline to 8/10/98 and Defendant's response to [3-1] motion to Certify Class reset to 8/10/98. ( signed by Judge Robert J. Yock ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 7 Filed: 6/26/1998, Entered: 6/29/1998, Terminated: 7/16/1998 Terminated:
                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 6/26/98) to Extend Time to respond to complaint until 8/10/98, and to Extend Time to respond to motion for class certification until 8/10/98. (FE)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 6 Filed: 5/28/1998, Entered: 6/1/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                    ORDER granting [5-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to motion for class certification. Defendant's response to [3-1] motion to Certify Class reset to 7/27/98. ( signed by Judge Robert J. Yock ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 5 Filed: 5/21/1998, Entered: 5/22/1998, Terminated: 5/28/1998 Terminated:
                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 5/21/98 ) to Extend Time to respond to motion for class certification [until July 27, 1998.] Response due: 6/8/98 (CDC)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 4 Filed: 5/20/1998, Entered: 5/22/1998 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Jonathan Scott Lawlor. Service : 5/20/98. (HW)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 3 Filed: 5/7/1998, Entered: 5/7/1998, Terminated: 5/19/1999 Motion to Certify Class
                                                                          MOTION by RONALD F. GREEK (Service: 5/7/98) to Certify Class Response due: 5/26/98. (FE)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 2 Filed: 5/7/1998, Entered: 5/7/1998 Court Filing
                                                                            Notice of assignment to Judge Robert J. Yock. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 5/7/1998, Entered: 5/7/1998
                                                                              COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #045478. Answer due on 7/6/98. (FE)
                                                                                LREF

                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                This case has been viewed 162 times.

                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                Space
                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                 
                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                Need Password Help?