MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:98-cv-00474-JFM
District Judge James F. Merow, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Maine Yankee Atomic Power Company, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenberg Traurig, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jerry Stouck +1 202 331 3173 +1 202 331 3101 stouckj@gtlaw.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Harold Dewitt Lester, Jr. +1 202 616 0478 +1 202 307 2503 harv.lester@usdoj.gov
No Logo Holtec International, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fulbright & Jaworski, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Laurence Storch +1 202 662 4561 +1 202 662 4643 lstorch@fulbright.com
No Logo MAINE PUBLIC UTILITIES COMMISION, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kaye Scholer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Randall L. Speck +1 202 682 3510 RSpeck@kayescholer.com
Office COFC
Filed 6/2/1998
Jury Demand None
Demand $384000000
Nature of Suit 536 - Spent Nuclear Fuel
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Judgment
County None
Terminated 10/4/2006
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Cases '07-5026'[], '07-5032'[]
Def Custody Status
Flags APPEAL, CLOSED, CRSAPP, ECF, SNF
  Entries (438) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 372 Filed: 8/21/2007, Entered: 8/21/2007 Court Filing
ORDER re Mr. William Petersons submissions of July 23, 2007. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae)
    LREF
    Legal Document 371 Filed: 4/25/2007, Entered: 4/25/2007 Court Filing
    ORDER RETURNING UNFILED: Motion to Intervene, Memorandum, Complaint and Certificate of Service received April 18, 2007. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae)
      LREF
      Legal Document 370 Filed: 12/22/2006, Entered: 12/22/2006
      CAFC Case Number 07-5032 for [368] Notice of Cross Appeal filed by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC POWER COMPANY. (hw1, )
        LREF
        Legal Document 369 Filed: 12/15/2006, Entered: 12/15/2006
        CAFC Case Number 07-5026 for [367] Notice of Appeal filed by USA. (hw1, ) .
          LREF
          Legal Document 368 Filed: 12/14/2006, Entered: 12/18/2006 Notice of cross-appeal
          NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL, filed by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC POWER COMPANY. Filing fee $ 455.00, receipt number 065835. (hw1, ) .
            LREF
            Legal Document 367 Filed: 12/4/2006, Entered: 12/5/2006 Notice of AppealCourt Filing
            NOTICE OF APPEAL to [365] Judgment filed by USA. Copies to Senior Judge James F. Merow, opposing party and CAFC. (dw1)
              LREF
              Legal Document 366 Filed: 10/5/2006, Entered: 10/5/2006
              AMENDED ANSWER to Plaintiff's Complaint, And Defendant's Affirmative Defenses And Counterclaims, Filed Pursuant To This Court's September 30, 2006 Order, filed by USA. (Lester, Harold)
                LREF
                Legal Document 365 Filed: 10/4/2006, Entered: 10/4/2006
                JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that plaintiffs recover of and from the United States, the following total amounts: (1) Yankee Atomic - $32,866.087.55; (2) Connecticut Yankee - $34,154,879.00; and (3) Maine Yankee - $75,774,554.00. (dls )
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 364 Filed: 10/4/2006, Entered: 10/4/2006 Court Filing
                  REISSUED PUBLISHED OPINION and ORDER. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment as set forth in the REISSUED OPINION and ORDER filed this day in this and 98-126 C, and 98-154 C. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 363 Filed: 10/4/2006, Entered: 10/4/2006 Court Filing
                    ORDER (filed in this and 98-126C and 98-154C): The Opinion originally filed under seal on September 30, 2006, with minor non-substantive edits, including an addition correction in the amount awarded to Yankee Atomic for deposition expenses, shall now be issued without the "sealed" restriction. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 362 Filed: 9/30/2006, Entered: 9/30/2006 Court Filing
                      ORDER: (1) The Opinion issued this date shall be temporarily filed under seal with access restricted to persons covered by the applicable protective order(s); (2) Counsel shall promptly review the sealed Opinion and notify the court if any portion of the Opinion is discovered to comprise sealed material and, if so, the exact portion concerned; (3) Absent any notice pursuant to (2) filed on or before October 10, 2006, the Opinion will be unsealed by an appropriate Order. (Filed in this and 98-126 C and 98-154 C)Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                        LREF
                        Sealed Legal Document 361 Filed: 9/30/2006, Entered: 9/30/2006 Court Filing
                        **SEALED** SEALED OPINION and ORDER: The Clerk is directed to enter judgment as set forth in the SEALED OPINION and ORDER filed this day in this and 98-126 C and 98-154 C. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 360 Filed: 8/16/2006, Entered: 8/16/2006, Terminated: 9/30/2006 Motion for Leave to File
                          MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority, filed by USA.Response due by 9/5/2006.(Sullivan, Marian)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 359 Filed: 7/6/2005, Entered: 7/6/2005
                            NOTICE of Change of Address by Jerry Stouck (Stouck, Jerry)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 358 Filed: 2/22/2005, Entered: 2/22/2005
                              POST TRIAL BRIEF In Reply To Plaintiff's Post-Trial Response Brief by USA. (Attachments: # (1) # (2))(Lester, Harold)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 2/22/2005, Entered: 2/22/2005
                                SCHEDULING ORDER: Pursuant to the Order filed in 98-126 and deemed applicable in this case, defendant's Post Trial is Brief due 2/22/2005. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 357 Filed: 2/18/2005, Entered: 2/18/2005
                                  POST TRIAL BRIEF - Maine Yankee's Reply on its Post-Trial Proposed Findings of Fact by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC POWER COMPANY. (Attachments: # (1))(Stouck, Jerry)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 356 Filed: 2/3/2005, Entered: 2/3/2005 Court Filing
                                    SCHEDULING ORDER:in re Unopposed Motion for an Enlargement of Time to File Replies on Post Trial Briefs and Proposed Findings of Fact filed in 98-126. Replies on post trial briefs and proposed findings of fact due 2/18/2005. (applicable in this and 98-154). Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 355 Filed: 1/25/2005, Entered: 1/25/2005 Court Filing
                                      SCHEDULING ORDER: Final post-trial reply briefs due by 2/4/2005 (filed in 98-126). Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 1/14/2005, Entered: 1/14/2005
                                        ORDER granting [354]Motion for Leave to File Defendant's Responses to Plaintiffs' Proposed Post-Trial Findings of Fact. Defendant's Responses to Plaintiffs' Proposed Post-Trial Findings of Fact is deemed filed January 13, 2005.Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 1/14/2005, Entered: 1/14/2005
                                          ORDER granting [353]Motion for Leave to File Defendant's Responses to Plaintiffs' Initial Post-Trial Brief. Defendant's Responses to Plaintiffs' Initial Post-Trial Brief is deemed filed January 13, 2005. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                            LREF
                                            Sealed Legal Document 354 Filed: 1/13/2005, Entered: 1/13/2005, Terminated: 1/14/2005 Motion for Leave to File
                                            **SEALED** MOTION for Leave to File Defendant's Responses To Plaintiff's Proposed Post-Trial Findings Of Fact by USA. Response due by 1/31/2005 (Attachments: # (1) # (2))(Lester, Harold)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 353 Filed: 1/13/2005, Entered: 1/13/2005, Terminated: 1/14/2005 Motion for Leave to File
                                              MOTION for Leave to File Defendant's Response To Plaintiff's Initial Post-Trial Brief by USA. Response due by 1/31/2005 (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3))(Lester, Harold)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 352 Filed: 1/13/2005, Entered: 1/13/2005 Court Filing
                                                ORDER (filed in 98-126) deferring ruling on [319] Motion to Amend Pleadings - Rule 15(b): Action on the Motion for Leave to File Amended Answer and Counterclaims and Defendant's Alternative Motion for Leave to File Amended Answer and Counterclaims Pursuant to RCFC 13(f) and 15(b) and responses thereto shall be DEFERRED for consideration and resolution as a part of the case-in-chief in this matter, and can be addressed in oral argument scheduled for January 24, 2004. As a part of the scheduled oral argument the parties may also address, to the extent relevant, the jurisdictional issues raised in the Order to Show Cause and for Additional Briefing filed in Florida Power & Light Company, et al., Case Nos. 98-483C, 98-485C, 01-116C, 01-551C on October 15, 2004. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 351 Filed: 1/12/2005, Entered: 1/12/2005 Court Filing
                                                  ORDER granting [350] Motion for Extension of Time. On January 12, 2005, Defendant's Unopposed Motion for a One-Day Enlargement of Time was filed. Defendant requests an enlargement of time allowing the parties to file their responses to the opposing parties' proposed post-trial findings of fact and post-trial response briefs by 5:00 p.m. on January 13, 2005. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that defendant's unopposed motion, filed January 12, 2005, is GRANTED. (filed in 98-126)Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 350 Filed: 1/12/2005, Entered: 1/12/2005, Terminated: 1/12/2005 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                    Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [336] Post Trial Brief, [337] Post Trial Brief, [338] Statement of Facts, [339] Post Trial Brief Of One Additional Day by USA. Response due by 1/31/2005 (Lester, Harold)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 349 Filed: 1/7/2005, Entered: 1/7/2005 Court Filing
                                                      ORDER granting [348] Motion for Extension of Time to and including January 12, 2005, within which to respond to the opposing parties' proposed post-trial findings of fact and post-trial response briefs (filed in 98-126). Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 348 Filed: 1/7/2005, Entered: 1/7/2005, Terminated: 1/7/2005 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                        Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [342] Statement of Facts, [336] Post Trial Brief, [337] Post Trial Brief, [339] Post Trial Brief,until 1/12/2005, by USA. Response due by 1/24/2005 (Lester, Harold)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 347 Filed: 12/20/2004, Entered: 12/20/2004 Court Filing
                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER: Closing Argument set for 1/24/2005 10:00 AM in National Courts Building before Senior Judge James F. Merow. (filed in 98-126 C) Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 346 Filed: 12/17/2004, Entered: 12/17/2004 Court Filing
                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER:Post Trial Response Brief due 1/10/2005. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 345 Filed: 12/1/2004, Entered: 12/1/2004
                                                              NOTICE by USA Of Compliance With Paragraph 8 And Footnote 3 Of The Court's Order Dated September 21, 2004 (Attachments: # (1))(Lester, Harold)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 344 Filed: 11/25/2004, Entered: 11/25/2004 Court Filing
                                                                ORDER (filed in 98-126) granting [343] Motion for Extension of Time. Post-trial response briefs and responses to proposed findings of fact shall be filed by December 22, 2004, and post-trial reply briefs shall be filed by January 28, 2005. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 11/25/2004, Entered: 11/29/2004 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                  Set/Reset Deadlines: Post trial Response briefs and responses to proposed findings of fact due by 12/22/2004. Post trial Reply briefs due by 1/28/2005. (jcp, )
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 343 Filed: 11/24/2004, Entered: 11/24/2004, Terminated: 11/25/2004 Motion to Amend Schedule
                                                                    Consent MOTION to Amend Schedule re: [324] Scheduling Order,, by USA. Response due by 12/13/2004 (Lester, Harold)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 342 Filed: 11/23/2004, Entered: 11/23/2004
                                                                      STATEMENT OF FACTS Corrected Copy - Defendant's Proposed Post-Trial Findings of Fact by USA. (Miller, Richard)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 341 Filed: 11/23/2004, Entered: 11/23/2004 Court Filing
                                                                        ORDER granting [340] Motion for Leave to File Corrected Post-Trial Proposed Findings of Fact. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 340 Filed: 11/22/2004, Entered: 11/22/2004, Terminated: 11/23/2004 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Copy Of Defendant's Post-Trial Proposed Findings Of Fact by USA. Response due by 12/9/2004 (Lester, Harold)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 339 Filed: 11/18/2004, Entered: 11/18/2004
                                                                            POST TRIAL BRIEF by USA. (Attachments: # (1) # (2))(Lester, Harold)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 338 Filed: 11/18/2004, Entered: 11/18/2004
                                                                              STATEMENT OF FACTS (Defendant's Post-Trial Proposed Findings Of Fact) by USA. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 337 Filed: 11/17/2004, Entered: 11/17/2004
                                                                                POST TRIAL BRIEF - Proposed Findings of Fact - by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC POWER COMPANY. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 336 Filed: 11/17/2004, Entered: 11/17/2004
                                                                                  POST TRIAL BRIEF - Initial Post-Trial Legal Brief by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC POWER COMPANY. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 335 Filed: 11/17/2004, Entered: 11/17/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                    ORDER granting [334] Motion for Extension of Time (filed in 98-128). Post Trial Brief due 5:00 p.m.,11/18/2004. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 334 Filed: 11/17/2004, Entered: 11/17/2004, Terminated: 11/17/2004 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time until 5 p.m., 11/18/2004 to file The Parties's Initial Post-Trial Briefs And Proposed Findings Of Fact by USA. Response due by 12/6/2004 (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 333 Filed: 11/12/2004, Entered: 11/12/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                        ORDER granting [332] Motion for Extension of Time. (filed in 98-126) Post Trial Brief due 11/17/2004. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 332 Filed: 11/11/2004, Entered: 11/11/2004, Terminated: 11/12/2004 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time until 11/17/04 to file The Parties' Post-Trial Briefs And Proposed Findings Of Fact by USA. Response due by 11/29/2004 (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 331 Filed: 11/8/2004, Entered: 11/8/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                            ORDER granting [330] Motion for Extension of Time.Post Trial Brief due 11/12/2004. (Filed in 98-126) Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 330 Filed: 11/5/2004, Entered: 11/5/2004, Terminated: 11/8/2004 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                              Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until 11/12/04 to file The Parties' Initial Post-Trial Briefs And Proposed Findings Of Fact by USA. Response due by 11/22/2004 (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 329 Filed: 11/2/2004, Entered: 11/2/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                ORDER granting [328] Motion for Extension of Time. Post-trial briefs and proposed findings of fact due by 11/8/2004. (Order filed in 98-126 C deemed filed in 98-154 C and 98-474 C.) Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, ) Modified on 11/2/2004 to correct docket text. (dls).
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 328 Filed: 11/1/2004, Entered: 11/1/2004, Terminated: 11/2/2004 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                  Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until 11/8/2004 to file The Parties' Post-Trial Briefs And Proposed Findings Of Fact by USA. Response due by 11/18/2004 (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 327 Filed: 10/15/2004, Entered: 10/15/2004
                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re [319] MOTION to Amend Pleadings - Rule 15 [35] Answer filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) # (2))(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document 326 Filed: 10/14/2004, Entered: 10/14/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER granting [325] Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply re [319] MOTION to Amend Pleadings - Rule 15 [35] Answer. Reply due by 10/15/2004. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 325 Filed: 10/13/2004, Entered: 10/13/2004, Terminated: 10/14/2004 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                        Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [319] MOTION to Amend Pleadings - Rule 15 [35] Answer,until 10/15/2004, by USA. Response due by 11/1/2004 (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 324 Filed: 10/12/2004, Entered: 10/12/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER:(1) That the dates set forth in the September 21, 2004 Order shall be deemed amended as follows: October 15, 2004 to November 4, 2004; ?November 16, 2004 to December 2, 2004; ?December 7, 2004 to December 22, 2004; ?December 16, 2004 to January 14, 2004; (2) The courtroom location for the oral argument commencing at 10:00 a.m. on January 14, 2005, will be posted in the lobby of the National Courts Building; (3) Except as so amended, the September 21, 2004 Order shall, otherwise, remain in effect.Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 323 Filed: 10/8/2004, Entered: 10/8/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER granting [322] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re [319] MOTION to Amend Pleadings - Rule 15 [35] Answer Reply due by 10/13/2004. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 322 Filed: 10/8/2004, Entered: 10/8/2004, Terminated: 10/8/2004 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                              Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [319] MOTION to Amend Pleadings - Rule 15 [35] Answer,until 10/13/2004, by USA. Response due by 10/25/2004 (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 321 Filed: 10/5/2004, Entered: 10/5/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER:Telephone Status Conference set for 10/6/2004 02:00 PM in Chambers before Senior Judge James F. Merow. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 320 Filed: 9/17/2004, Entered: 9/17/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER re Bench Memorandum Addressing the Admissibility of Certain Exhibits Prepared by Contractors (filed in case# 98-126). Plaintiffs shall promptly electronically file the Bench Memorandum Addressing the Admissibility of Certain Exhibits dated July 12, 2004, and tendered to the court during trial proceedings, which Memorandum shall upon receipt be deemed filed nunc pro tunc (July 12, 2004);(2) Proposed findings and objections to proposed findings, filed by the parties, shall clearly indicate, in the supporting record citations, any reliance on the contractor generated documents discussed herein. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 319 Filed: 8/5/2004, Entered: 8/5/2004, Terminated: 9/30/2006 Motion to Amend Pleadings - Rule 15
                                                                                                                    MOTION to Amend Pleadings - Rule 15 [35] Answer by USA. Response due by 8/23/2004 (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3))(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 318 Filed: 6/28/2004, Entered: 6/28/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER denying [302] Motion in Limine to Exclude Testimony and Evidence Regarding Plaintiff's Request for Pre-breach Damages and Alternative Restitution Claim and Defendant's Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 317 Filed: 6/23/2004, Entered: 6/23/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER: The court deems oral argument on pending motions unnecessary. Accordingly, oral argument on pending motions scheduled for June 29, 2004 at 10:00 a.m. is cancelled. Orders will be issued on pending motions on or before June 30, 2004. The Final Pre-trial Conference will be held on June 29, 2004 at 2:00 p.m. The courtroom number will be posted in the lobby of the National Courts Building on June 29th. Counsel are requested to confer prior to the Final Pre-trial Conference to reach agreement to the admission of as many of the proposed exhibits as feasible and submit list(s) of exhibits to be admitted at that conference. The opening session of the trial will also be devoted to the admission of proposed exhibits prior to testimony to the extent possible. Trial time will not be devoted to the admission of exhibits, except where testimony is required in this regard. Counsel are further requested to contact Ms. Linda Eddins, at (202) 219-9787 to arrange for courtroom set-up for trial. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 316 Filed: 6/8/2004, Entered: 6/8/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER:President Bush has declared Friday, June 11, 2004, to be a day of national mourning to honor the memory of former President Ronald Reagan. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that the responses to the motions referenced in the Order of May 19, 2004, previously due on June 11, 2004, shall be filed by 12:00 noon EDT on June 14, 2004 and the replies shall be filed by 12:00 noon EDT on June 21, 2004. The court will hear oral argument on these motions on June 29, 2004 at 10:00 a.m., in lieu of the date previously set in the Order of May 19, 2004. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 315 Filed: 5/24/2004, Entered: 5/24/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                            CORRECTED SCHEDULING ORDER:The date for oral argument set forth in the Order, filed May 19, 2004, is hereby corrected. The court will hear oral argument on Tuesday, June 22, 2004 at 2:00 p.m., at 717 Madison Pl., NW, Washington, DC, in a courtroom to be assigned.Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 5/20/2004, Entered: 5/20/2004
                                                                                                                              Set Deadlines/Hearings: Motion(s) due by 6/1/2004. Reply due by 6/18/2004. Response due by 6/11/2004. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/29/2004 02:00 PM before Senior Judge James F. Merow. Oral Argument set for 6/21/2004 02:00 PM before Senior Judge James F. Merow. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document 314 Filed: 5/19/2004, Entered: 5/19/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                ORDER granting in part and denying in part [299] Motion in Limine Regarding Takings Damages; and granting in part and denying in part Motion, filed April 23, 2004 (in 98-126 C) for Leave to Substitute Ivan F. Stuart as an expert Witness in Place of Charles W. Pennington and to subpoena Dan M. Collier. The court will hear oral argument on pending motions on Tuesday, June 21, 2004 at 2:00 p.m. (National Courts Building, 717 Madison Pl. NW., Washington, DC). Additional motions in limine mentioned by plaintiffs' counsel at the pre-trial conference and motions concerning future damages referenced by defendant's counsel shall be filed on or before June 1, 2004. Responses shall be filed on or before June 11, 2004. Replies shall be filed on or before June 18, 2004. The court will hear oral argument on these motions on June 21, 2004 at 2:00 p.m. (National Courts Building)and The Final Pre-Trial Conference will be held on Tuesday, June 29, 2004 at 2:00 p.m (National Courts Building). Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 313 Filed: 5/13/2004, Entered: 5/17/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                  APPENDIX by USA to [312] Dft's Reply to Pltf's Opposition to Dft's Motion in Limine Regarding Takings Damages. [FILED UNDER SEAL][FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 5/13/2004, Entered: 5/13/2004
                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James F. Merow : Pretrial Conference held on May 13, 2004. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 312 Filed: 5/12/2004, Entered: 5/12/2004
                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re [299] MOTION in Limine Regarding Takings Damages; Appendix (Filed Separately) Under Seal, filed by USA. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 311 Filed: 5/5/2004, Entered: 5/5/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        ORDER re: telephone conference concerning production of documents by Holtec International, held on May 5, 2004. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (Attachments: # (1) Certification submitted by Holtec)(lae, )
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 5/5/2004, Entered: 5/5/2004
                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James F. Merow : Telephone Conference held on May 5, 2004. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 310 Filed: 4/16/2004, Entered: 4/16/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [308] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re [302] MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony and Evidence Regarding Plaintiff's Request for Pre-Breach Damages and Alternative Restitution Claim, and Defendant's Motion to Strike. Response due by 4/23/2004 Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 309 Filed: 4/16/2004, Entered: 4/16/2004
                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to [299] MOTION in Limine regarding Takings Damages filed by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC POWER COMPANY. Reply due by 4/30/2004. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Cover and Table of Contents# (2) Appendix Volume 1 of 7# (3) Appendix Volume 2 of 7# (4) Appendix Volume 3 of 7# (5) Appendix Volume 4 of 7# (6) Appendix Volume 5 of 7# (7) Appendix Volume 6 of 7# (8) Appendix Volume 7 of 7)(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 308 Filed: 4/16/2004, Entered: 4/16/2004, Terminated: 4/16/2004 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                              Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to [302] MOTION in Limine,until April 23, 2004, regarding pre-breach damages and alternative restitution claim by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC POWER COMPANY. Response due by 5/3/2004 (Stouck, Jerry) Modified on 4/19/2004 for clarity (dw1).
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 307 Filed: 3/30/2004, Entered: 3/30/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting in part and denying in part [-] Motion to require plaintiff to identify those documents within plaintiff's exhibit list upon which it will rely at trial. (Original motion and order filed in Yankee Atomic 98-126) Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 3/30/2004, Entered: 3/31/2004 Response
                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to Pltf's Motion to Compel Production of Documents Pursuant to the Court's 8/25/2003 Order, filed by USA. Reply due by 4/13/2004. [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT LOCATED IN CASE NO. 98-126C] Service: 3/30/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 306 Filed: 3/3/2004, Entered: 3/3/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [305] Motion for Extension of Time to File Responses re [302] MOTION in Limine, [299] MOTION in Limine Responses due by 4/16/2004. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 305 Filed: 3/2/2004, Entered: 3/2/2004, Terminated: 3/3/2004 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                      Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply,until 04/16/2004, by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC POWER COMPANY. Response due by 3/19/2004 (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 304 Filed: 3/1/2004, Entered: 3/1/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER:It is ORDERED that this case shall be CONSOLIDATED with Yankee Atomic Electric Co. v. United States, 98-126 C, for the purpose of trial proceedings. Pretrial Conference set for 5/13/2004, 02:00 PM in the National Courts Building before Senior Judge James F. Merow. Trial set for 7/12/2004, 10:30 AM (concluding on August 27, 2004) in the National Courts Building before Senior Judge James F. Merow. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 303 Filed: 3/1/2004, Entered: 3/1/2004
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 2/26/2004, Entered: 2/26/2004
                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James F. Merow : Telephone Scheduling Conference held on February 26, 2004. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 2/25/2004, Entered: 3/1/2004 Order
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER re: counsel shall promptly confer and contact Ms. Linda Eddins to arrange for a brief telephone conference this week limited to the matter of a trial date. A formal pretrial conference shall be subsequently scheduled, prior to the trial, to address outstanding pretrial matters. (See 98-126 for Order) Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 302 Filed: 2/20/2004, Entered: 2/27/2004, Terminated: 6/28/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony and Evidence Regarding Plaintiff's Request for Pre-Breach Damages and Alternative Restitution Claim, and Defendant's Motion to Strike. FILED UNDER SEAL by USA.Service: 02/19/2004. Response due by 3/8/2004 (lld, )
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 301 Filed: 2/20/2004, Entered: 2/27/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Status Conference and Status Report (See 98-126C) by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC POWER COMPANY.Service: 02/20/2004. Response due by 3/8/2004 (lld, )
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 300 Filed: 2/20/2004, Entered: 2/27/2004 Order on Motion to CompelCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER: Counsel shall confer to reach agreement on the documents to be produced, in response to Requests Nos. 27 and 28. [294] Dft's Motion to Compel, shall be GRANTED to the extent provided above with respect to Requests Nos. 27 and 28 and is otherwise DENIED. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 2/19/2004, Entered: 2/27/2004 Response
                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to Dft's Motion for an Enlargement of Time in Which to Serve its Pretrial Submissions filed by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC POWER COMPANY. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT LOCATED IN CASE NO. 98-126C] Service: 2/13/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 299 Filed: 2/18/2004, Entered: 2/26/2004, Terminated: 5/19/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION IN LIMINE REGARDING TAKINGS DAMAGES by USA. APPENDIX (UNDER SEAL) FILED SEPARATELYService: 02/17/2004 by hand. Response due by 3/2/2004 (lld, )
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 2/9/2004, Entered: 2/12/2004 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                          OPPOSITION to Dft's MOTION to Require Pltf to Identify Those Documents Within Pltf's Exhibit List Upon Which It Will Rely At Trial, filed by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC POWER COMPANY. [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT LOCATED IN CASE NO. 98-126C] Reply due by 2/19/2004. Service: 2/9/2004 by hand.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 2/4/2004, Entered: 2/9/2004 Response
                                                                                                                                                                            OPPOSITION to Dft's Motion to Compel Production of Documents From Framatome ANP filed by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC POWER COMPANY. [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT LOCATED IN CASE NO. 98-126C] Service: 2/4/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 1/30/2004, Entered: 1/30/2004
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER: The Court hereby DENIES [291] Dft's Second Motion to Renew its Motion to Consolidate as well as its previous motions relating to consolidation. The Court further LIFTS THE STAY of the remainder of the cases to which the Order of 4/16/2003, applied. The Clerk of the Court is directed to docket this Order in this case with an entry noting the same on the dockets of the remaining SNFcases captioned in Dft's instant motion, with a courtesy copy to all SNF parties and presiding SNF judges of the Court. [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT LOCATED IN CASE NO. 98-126C] Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 298 Filed: 1/28/2004, Entered: 2/2/2004 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Holtec International's Response to [294] Dft's MOTION to Enforce Request for Production of Documents filed by USA. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 1/21/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 1/28/2004, Entered: 2/2/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Require Plaintiff to Identify Those Documents Within Plaintiff's Exhibit List Upon Which It Will Rely At Trial by USA. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT LOCATED IN CASE NO. 98-126C]Service: 1/22/2004. Response due by 2/9/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 297 Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: 1/26/2004 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Pltf's Opposition to [294] Dft's MOTION to Enforce Holtec Subpoena filed by USA. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 1/16/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 296 Filed: 1/12/2004, Entered: 1/14/2004 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to [294] Dft's MOTION to Enforce Subpoena by HOLTEC INTERNATIONAL. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Reply due by 1/20/2004. Service: 1/8/2004 by hand.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 295 Filed: 1/8/2004, Entered: 1/13/2004 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                        OPPOSITION to [294] Dft's MOTION to Enforce Request for Production of Documents filed by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC POWER COMPANY. Reply due by 1/23/2004. Service: 1/8/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 12/24/2003, Entered: 12/30/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Resp
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER: That with the exception of amended document request No. 25, which is GRANTED, Dft's Motion to Compel, filed 9/24/2003, shall be, otherwise, DENIED. Pltf's Motion for Protective Orders, filed 11/3/2003, shall be DENIED. Dft's Motion, filed 9/24/2003, for Extension of Time, to and including 2/12/2004, for its final pretrial submissions is GRANTED. This Order also serves to note that dft's pending motions for time enlargements, filed 11/17/2003 and 11/21/2003, are also ALLOWED. [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT LOCATED IN CASE NO. 98-126C] Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 294 Filed: 12/23/2003, Entered: 12/30/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Enforce Request for Production of Documents by USA.Service: 12/22/03. Response due by 1/8/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 12/17/2003, Entered: 12/22/2003 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC POWER COMPANY. [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT LOCATED IN CASE NO. 98-126C] Service: 12/17/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 12/5/2003, Entered: 12/11/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY on Pltf's MOTION for a Protective Order filed by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC POWER COMPANY. [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT LOCATED IN CASE NO. 98-126C] Service: 12/5/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 293 Filed: 12/1/2003, Entered: 12/4/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Counsel for Dft's Change of Telephone and Facsimile Numbers by USA. Service: 11/28/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 11/24/2003, Entered: 12/2/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Pltf's Response to Dft's MOTION for an Additional Enlargement of Five Months, REPLY to Pltf's Response to Dft's 9/24/2003 RENEWED MOTION to Compel, and RESPONSE to Pltf's MOTION for a Protective Order That Depositions Noticed on 9/26/2003 Not Be Had, filed by USA. [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT LOCATED IN CASE NO. 98-126C] Service: 11/24/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 11/21/2003, Entered: 11/26/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Pltf's 1) Response to Dft's Request for an Additional Enlargement of Five Months, 2) Response to DFt's 9/24/2003 "Renewed" Motion to Compel and Motion for a Protective Order and 3) Motion for a Protective Order That Depositions First Noticed 9/26/2003 Not Be Had, until 11/24/2003, by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC POWER COMPANY. [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT LOCATED IN CASE NO. 98-126C]Service: 11/21/03. Response due by 12/8/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 11/18/2003, Entered: 11/24/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                        OPPOSITION to [744] Dft's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responses on its Motions to enlarge the time for its pretrial submissions and to compel the production of documents by four days, filed by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC POWER COMPANY. [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT LOCATED IN CASE NO. 98-126C] Reply due by 12/2/2003. Service: 11/18/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 11/17/2003, Entered: 11/21/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Pltf's 1) Response to the Dft's Request for an Additional Enlargement of Five Months, 2) Response to the Dft's 9/24/2003 "Renewed" Motion to Compel and Motion for a Protective Order, and 3) Motion for a Protective Order That Depositions First Noticed 9/26/2003 Not Be Had, until 11/21/03, by USA. [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT LOCATED IN CASE NO. 98-126C]Service: 11/17/03. Response due by 12/4/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 11/3/2003, Entered: 11/6/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Resp
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER: Leave is GRANTED for the filing of pltf's corrected combined response to dft's September 24, 2003 motions, received with the motion filed October 23, 2003; As pltf's October 21, 2003 original combined response was not filed by the clerk, because a copy of volume 2 of the appendix was missing and an original declaration was missing in volume 1, this unfiled submission shall now be RETURNED to pltf in view of the filing of the corrected version as provided; Pltf's motions, filed October 8, 16, 21, 23 shall be GRANTED to the extent reflected by the filing in (1) and, otherwise, DENIED; Dft's reply to the pltf's combined response as filed pursuant to (1) shall be filed on or before 11/15/2003. [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT LOCATED IN CASE NO. 98-126C] Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 11/3/2003, Entered: 11/6/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                              CORRECTED COMBINED RESPONSE to Dft's MOTION for an Enlargement of Five Months, Dft's Renewed MOTION to Compel and MOTION for a Protective Order, and MOTION for a Protective Order That Depositions First Noticed September 26, 2003 Not Be Had, Together with Two (2) Separately Bound Appendix Volumes filed by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC POWER COMPANY. [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT LOCATED IN CASE NO. 98-126C] Reply due by 11/15/2003. Service: 10/23/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 10/23/2003, Entered: 10/27/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to File a Corrected Copy of Its October 21, 2003 1) Response to the Government's Request for an Additional Enlargement of Five Months, 2) Response to the Government's September 24 "Renewed" Motion to Compel and Motion for Protective Order, and 3) Motion for a Protective Order That Deposition First Noticed September 26, 2003 Not Be Had by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC POWER COMPANY. [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT LOCATED IN CASE NO. 98-126C]Service: 10/23/03 by hand. Response due by 11/6/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 10/22/2003, Entered: 10/24/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Dft's Opposition to Pltf's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Combined Opposition to Dft's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response, and MOTION to renew motion to compel the production of documents filed by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC POWER COMPANY. [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT LOCATED IN CASE NO. 98-126C] Service: 10/22/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 10/21/2003, Entered: 10/23/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File 1) Response to the Dft's Request for an Additional Enlargement of File Months, 2) Response to the Dft's September 24 "Renewed" Motion to Compel and Motion for Protective Order, and 3) Motion for a Protective Order That Depositions First Noticed September 26 Not Be Had by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC POWER COMPANY. [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT LOCATED IN CASE NO. 98-126C]Service: 10/21/03 by hand. Response due by 11/4/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 10/16/2003, Entered: 10/21/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to Oppose Dft's MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Its Pretrial Submissions, and Dft's MOTION to Compel the Production of Docments, by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC POWER COMPANY. [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT LOCATED IN CASE NO. 98-126C]Service: 10/16/03. Response due by 11/3/2003.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 10/8/2003, Entered: 10/16/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to File Combined Opposition to Dft's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response and Dft's MOTION to renew Dft's motion to compel the production of documents, by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC POWER COMPANY. [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT LOCATED IN CASE NO. 98-126C]Service: 10/8/03. Response due by 10/27/2003.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 9/24/2003, Entered: 9/25/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Pltfs' Recent Pretrial Filings, until 2/12/2004, by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC POWER COMPANY. [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT LOCATED IN CASE NO. 98-126C]Service: 9/24/03. Response due by 10/14/2003.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 9/16/2003, Entered: 9/22/2003 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC POWER COMPANY. [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT LOCATED IN CASE NO. 98-126C] Service: 9/16/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 292 Filed: 9/10/2003, Entered: 9/12/2003 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Pltfs' Responses to [291] Dft's Second MOTION to the Chief Judge to Renew Consideration of Dft's Motion to Consolidate, filed by USA. Service: 9/3/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 9/10/2003, Entered: 9/12/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Resp
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER allowing Dft's Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to [291] Dft's Second MOTION to Renew Its Motion to Consolidate, until 9/3/03. [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT LOCATED IN CASE NO. 98-126C] Reply due by 9/3/2003. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 9/4/2003, Entered: 9/9/2003 Order on Motion to Publish
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER: It is ORDERED that Pltf's Motion to Publish the Order of June 26, 2003, and Pltf's Motion to Publish the Order of August 25, 2003 are DENIED. [Original document located in Case No. 98-126C] Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 9/3/2003, Entered: 9/8/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to Pltfs' Response to Dft's Second Motion to Renew Its Motion to Consolidate, until 9/3/03, by USA.Service: 9/3/03. Response due by 9/22/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 8/29/2003, Entered: 9/4/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Publish August 25, 2003 Decision on Privilege Issues, by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC POWER COMPANY. [Original document located in Case No. 98-126C]Service: 8/29/03. Response due by 9/15/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 8/29/2003, Entered: 9/4/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Publish the [286] Court's June 26, 2003 Decision Addressing the Government's Summary Judgment Motions, by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC POWER COMPANY. [Original document located in Case No. 98-126C]Service: 8/29/03. Response due by 9/15/2003.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 8/29/2003, Entered: 9/2/2003 Order on Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER: Accordingly, it is ORDERED that Pltf's Motions for Protective Order, filed August 4 and 18, 2003 and Dft's Motion to Compel, filed August 15, 2003, shall be GRANTED to the extent provided in this Order and shall, otherwise, be DENIED. [Original document located in Case No. 98-126C] Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 8/28/2003, Entered: 9/3/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to Pltf's MOTION for a Protective Order and CROSS-MOTION to Compel a Response to the Government's Interrogatories Regarding the Production of E-Mail Pursuant to the Court's July 25, 2003 Order filed by USA. [Original document located in Case No. 98-126C] Reply due by 9/9/2003. Service: 8/28/03 by hand.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 8/26/2003, Entered: 8/28/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to the Chief Judge for Extension of Time to File Reply to Pltfs' Responses to Dft's Second Motion to Renew Its Motion to Consolidate, until 9/3/03, by USA. [Original document located in Case No. 98-126C]Service: 8/26/03. Response due by 9/12/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 8/25/2003, Entered: 8/26/2003 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER (Original document located in Case No. 98-126C): The following documents, using the numbers assigned in pltf's March 6, 2003 motion, must be produced: 58,61,74,76,77,88,89,90,92,93,94,95,96,97,98,99,102,103,104,111,112,120,136,138,139,146,149,154,155,156,157,203,206,209,211,212,214,216,219,220,E14,E15,E39,E40,E41,E42,E43,E44, and E95. The following documents do not, in their entirety, meet the necessary requirements for the privilege claimed and must be modified and produced as noted: 3,9,61,66,67,70,100,106,113,115,135,137,142,145,202,204,205,208,E44, and E46. With the exception of the above-listed production, it is concluded that the assertions of privilege by dft are otherwise, sustained. Accordingly, it is ORDERED: 1) That pltf's motion, filed March 6, 2003, shall be GRANTED to the extent of the production called for above and, otherwise, DENIED; 2) That to the extent testimony was withheld on the subject matter of the production ordered herein, that testimony shall now be taken. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 8/21/2003, Entered: 8/25/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  OPPOSITION to [291] Dft's Second MOTION to Renew Its Motion to Consolidate, Together with Separately Bound Appendix Volume [Large] filed by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC POWER COMPANY. [Original document located in Case No. 98-126C] Reply due by 8/29/2003. Service: 8/15/03.(jcp, ) Modified on 8/25/2003 (jcp, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 8/21/2003, Entered: 8/25/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Dft's Second MOTION to Renew Its Motion to Consolidate, filed by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC POWER COMPANY per Order of 8/21/03. [Original document located in Case No. 98-126C] (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 8/21/2003, Entered: 8/25/2003 Order on Motion For Leave to File.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER: That Pltf's Motion, filed August 15, 2003, for Leave to File in this case Dft's Second Motion to Renew Its Motion to Consolidate and pltf's opposition thereto, shall be ALLOWED and the tendered dft's second motion, served July 29, 2003, and pltf's opposition thereto, served August 15, 2003, set out as Exhibits A and B to pltf's August 15, 2003 motion shall be deemed so FILED. [Original document located in Case No. 98-126C] Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 8/21/2003, Entered: 8/25/2003 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER: Accordingly, without in any way ruling on whether the documents concerned are correctly categorized as privileged, it is ORDERED: 1) Dft's motion, filed June 20, 2003, is GRANTED; 2) That, pursuant to the "claw-back" provisions of the May 20, 1999 orders and Judge Sypolt's September 26, 2001 order, pltf shall return documents Nos. 1339, 1723, and 1724 to dft's counsel pending any further order of the court in this regard; 3) Attachment No. 2 to pltf's status report, filed February 6, 2003, shall be considered stricken pending any further order of the court in this regard. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. [Original document located in Case No. 98-126C] (jcp, ) Modified on 8/25/2003 (jcp, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 8/18/2003, Entered: 8/20/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Protective Order by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC POWER COMPANY. (Original document located in Case No. 98-126C)Service: 8/18/03 by hand. Response due by 9/2/2003.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/19/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File Dft's Second Motion to Renew Its Motion to Consolidate and Yankee Utilities' Opposition Thereto In This Case filed by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY. (Original document located in Case No. 98-126C)Service: 8/15/03. Response due by 9/2/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/19/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit by 7 pages in Opposing Dft's Renewed Motion to Consolidate to Facilitate Reliance on Previous Briefing by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC POWER COMPANY. (Original document located in Case No. 98-126C)Service: 8/15/03. Response due by 9/2/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 8/8/2003, Entered: 8/8/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Set/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 8/15/2003 (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 8/5/2003, Entered: 8/7/2003 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Dft's Motion to the Chief Judge for Leave to Correct Certificate of Service and to Waive Requirements of RCFC 5.3 Regarding "Dft's Second Motion [to the Chief Judge] to Renew its Motion to Consolidate." (Original Motion located in Case No. 98-126C) (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 291 Filed: 7/30/2003, Entered: 7/31/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SECOND MOTION to Renew Its Motion to Consolidate by USA. [COPY] (Original Document in Case No. 98-126C)Service: 7/29/03 by hand. Response due by 8/12/2003.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 290 Filed: 7/2/2003, Entered: 7/7/2003 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER finding as moot [288] Pltf's Motion for Leave to File New Authority in Support of Opposition to Government's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on the Rate of Spent Fuel Accpetance. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 289 Filed: 7/1/2003, Entered: 7/3/2003 Order Returning Document UnfiledCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER RETURNING: It is ORDERED that Pltf's Notice of New Authority in Support of Opposition to Dft's Motion for Summary Judgment Upon Count III of Pltf's Complaint (Re Takings) is MOOT and shall be returned UNFILED to pltf's counsel. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 288 Filed: 6/30/2003, Entered: 7/2/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File New Authority in Support of Opposition to Government's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on the Rate of Spent Fuel Acceptance by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC POWER COMPANY.Service: 6/30/03. Response due by 7/17/2003 (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 287 Filed: 6/27/2003, Entered: 7/1/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER: That Pltf's motion, filed 5/8/03, for Leave to File Notice of Additional Evidence and Volume 3 of its Appendix in Support of its Opposition to the Government's GTCC Waste Summary Judgment Motion shall be DENIED as MOOT. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 286 Filed: 6/26/2003, Entered: 6/30/2003 Order on Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER: For reasons expressed in the Order filed this date in Yankee Atomic Electric Co. v. US, No. 98-126C, it is ORDERED that dft's motions: [163] Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Pltf's Greater Than Class C Radioactive Waste Arguments, [172] Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding the Rate of Spent Nuclear Fuel Acceptance, and [174] Motion for Summary Judgment Upon Count III of Pltf's Complaint, each shall be DENIED. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 285 Filed: 6/26/2003, Entered: 6/30/2003 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [284] Pltf's Motion for Leave to File New Authority in Support of Opposition to Government's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on the Rate of Spent Fuel Acceptance. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 284 Filed: 6/11/2003, Entered: 6/17/2003, Terminated: 6/26/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File New Authority in Support of Opposition to Government's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on the Rate of Spent Fuel Acceptance by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC POWER COMPANY.Service: 06/11/03. Response due by 6/30/2003 (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 283 Filed: 5/22/2003, Entered: 6/3/2003 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to Maine Yankee's Motion for Leave to File Notice of Additional Evidence and Volume 36 of its Appendix in Support of its Opposition to the Government's GTCC Waste Summary Judgment Motion filed by UNITED STATES. [see motion filed on 5/8/03 in case No. 98-126C] Service: 5/22/03.(dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 282 Filed: 5/12/2003, Entered: 5/15/2003 Order on Motion to StrikeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying [275] Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 281 Filed: 4/28/2003, Entered: 4/30/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re [275] MOTION to Strike filed by The United States. Service: 4/28/03.(dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 280 Filed: 4/16/2003, Entered: 4/25/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER, re: See orde rin 98-126C. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 279 Filed: 4/2/2003, Entered: 4/8/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER, re: further proceedings. Signed by Judge Diane G. Sypolt. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 278 Filed: 4/2/2003, Entered: 4/7/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re [172] Motion for Summary Judgment regarding spent nuclear fuel acceptance (together with separate appendix) filed by The United States. Service: 03/28/03.(hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 277 Filed: 4/2/2003, Entered: 4/7/2003 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [274] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 276 Filed: 3/28/2003, Entered: 4/2/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Strike pages 1 through 36 of Plaintiff's appendix to its response to the motion for partial summary judgment regarding the rate of spent nuclear fuel acceptance, by The United States. Service: 3/28/03. Response due 4/14/2003. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 275 Filed: 3/28/2003, Entered: 4/2/2003, Terminated: 5/12/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Strike portions of Plaintiff's filings concerning the rate of acceptance of spent nuclear fuel containing information about settlement activities, by The United States. Service: 3/28/03. Response due 4/14/2003.(lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 274 Filed: 3/28/2003, Entered: 4/2/2003, Terminated: 4/2/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit of reply to the motion for partial summary judgment by 59 pages by The United States. Service: 3/28/03. Response due 4/14/2003. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 273 Filed: 3/20/2003, Entered: 3/25/2003 Description not available
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion, re [163] Motion for Summary Judgment filed by The United States. Service: 3/18/03. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 272 Filed: 3/20/2003, Entered: 3/25/2003 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [270] Motion for Leave to Exceed the Page limtiation. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 271 Filed: 3/18/2003, Entered: 3/21/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 270 Filed: 3/18/2003, Entered: 3/20/2003, Terminated: 3/20/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit of reply to the Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, re: Plaintiff's Greater than Class C Radioactive Waste Arguments by 16 pages by The United States. Service: 3/18/03. Response due by 4/4/2003. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 269 Filed: 3/11/2003, Entered: 3/12/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service: 3/11/03) to Extend Time to file reply to the motion for partial summary judgment until 3/18/03. Response due: 3/28/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 268 Filed: 3/7/2003, Entered: 3/10/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER re: See order [612-1] dated 3/7/03, in case 98-126C (signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 267 Filed: 2/25/2003, Entered: 3/4/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 266 Filed: 2/24/2003, Entered: 3/3/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 265 Filed: 2/5/2003, Entered: 2/13/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 264 Filed: 1/31/2003, Entered: 2/13/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY by USA to response to [174-1] motion for Summary Judgment upon Count III. Service: 1/31/03 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 263 Filed: 1/31/2003, Entered: 2/12/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 258 Filed: 1/30/2003, Entered: 2/5/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 1/30/03) to Extend Time within which to reply to respond to motion for summary judgment , (until 1/31/03). (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 262 Filed: 1/29/2003, Entered: 2/7/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of filing of appendix to response to motion for partial summary judgment regarding Plaintiff's greater than class c radioactive waste arguments by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC. Volume 2 of 2 (Cost Study and Expert Report of R. Larry Johnson) Service: 1/29/03. FILED UNDER SEAL. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 261 Filed: 1/29/2003, Entered: 2/7/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of filing of appendix to response to motion for partial summary judgment regarding Plaintiff's greater than class c radioactive waste arguments by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC. Service: 1/29/03. Volume 1 of 2 and direct testimony of Russel Mellor (3/17/95) (FILED UNDERR SEAL). (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 260 Filed: 1/29/2003, Entered: 2/7/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 259 Filed: 1/29/2003, Entered: 2/5/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC (Service : 1/29/03 ) for Leave to file substitute appendix . Response due: 2/18/03 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 257 Filed: 1/23/2003, Entered: 1/31/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER, re: see 98-126 C for order, etc. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 256 Filed: 1/9/2003, Entered: 1/15/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 255 Filed: 1/3/2003, Entered: 1/9/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [254-1] motion to Extend Time to file reply to response to motion for summary judgment by 1/10/03 (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 254 Filed: 1/3/2003, Entered: 1/9/2003, Terminated: 1/3/2003 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service by hand: 12/30/02) to Extend Time to file reply to response to motion for summary judgment , (until January 10, 2003). Response due: 1/13/03. [by leave of the Judge] (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 253 Filed: 12/16/2002, Entered: 12/18/2002 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fa
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Response by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC to [173-1] proposed findings by USA. Service: 12/16/02 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 252 Filed: 12/16/2002, Entered: 12/18/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC (Service: 12/16/02 ) to [174-1] motion for Summary Judgment upon Count III. Reply due: 1/10/03 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 251 Filed: 11/15/2002, Entered: 11/19/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting in part, denying in part [250-1] motion to defer briefing on the pending motions for partial summary judgment Reply to Response to Motion due 1/10/03 for [174-1] motion for Summary Judgment upon Count III, [172-1] motion for partial summary judgment regarding the rate of spent nuclear fuel acceptance, and [163-1] motion for Summary Judgment Plaintiff's greater than class Class C Radioactive waste arguments (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 250 Filed: 11/12/2002, Entered: 11/14/2002, Terminated: 11/15/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service: 11/12/02) to defer briefing on the pending motions for partial summary judgment . Response due: 11/26/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 249 Filed: 10/31/2002, Entered: 11/1/2002 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fa
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Response by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC to [171-1] proposed findings by USA. Service by hand: 10/28/02 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 248 Filed: 10/31/2002, Entered: 11/1/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE, together with seven volumes of appendix, by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC (Service by hand: 10/28/02) to [172-1] motion for partial summary judgment regarding the rate of spent nuclear fuel acceptance. Reply due: 11/14/02 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 247 Filed: 10/31/2002, Entered: 11/1/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [244-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 246 Filed: 10/29/2002, Entered: 10/30/2002 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fa
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Response by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC to [162-1] proposed findings by USA. Service by hand: 10/29/02. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 245 Filed: 10/29/2002, Entered: 10/30/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC (Service by hand: 10/29/02 ) to [163-1] motion for Summary Judgment regarding Plaintiff's greater than class Class C Radioactive waste arguments (together with two volume appendix). Reply due: 11/12/02. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 244 Filed: 10/28/2002, Entered: 10/30/2002, Terminated: 10/31/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC (Service: 10/28/02) For leave to exceed the page limitation re: opposition to motion for summary judgment. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 243 Filed: 10/16/2002, Entered: 10/18/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow for Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD) Modified on 10/18/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 242 Filed: 10/9/2002, Entered: 10/11/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER see 98-126C for Order. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 241 Filed: 9/10/2002, Entered: 9/16/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 240 Filed: 9/5/2002, Entered: 9/9/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 239 Filed: 8/22/2002, Entered: 8/27/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 238 Filed: 8/20/2002, Entered: 8/22/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 237 Filed: 8/16/2002, Entered: 8/21/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 236 Filed: 8/5/2002, Entered: 8/7/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 235 Filed: 8/1/2002, Entered: 8/5/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 234 Filed: 7/30/2002, Entered: 8/5/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 233 Filed: 7/29/2002, Entered: 8/1/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER re: see order [467-1] dated 7/29/02, in case No. 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 232 Filed: 7/23/2002, Entered: 7/26/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 231 Filed: 7/16/2002, Entered: 7/18/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 230 Filed: 7/15/2002, Entered: 7/17/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 229 Filed: 7/10/2002, Entered: 7/12/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 228 Filed: 7/9/2002, Entered: 7/11/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER - see 98-126C for Order. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 227 Filed: 7/3/2002, Entered: 7/3/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 226 Filed: 7/2/2002, Entered: 7/3/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER-see Order in 98-126C ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 225 Filed: 7/2/2002, Entered: 7/3/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [224-1] motion to Extend Time for paragraph 3 submissions Pretrial Submissions due: 8/23/02 for MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 224 Filed: 6/28/2002, Entered: 7/1/2002, Terminated: 7/2/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC (Service : 6/28/02 ) to Extend Time for paragraph 3 submissions [until August 23, 2002]. Response due: 7/15/02 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 223 Filed: 6/28/2002, Entered: 7/1/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER-see Order in 98-126C ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 222 Filed: 6/18/2002, Entered: 6/19/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C.(signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (VO)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 221 Filed: 6/17/2002, Entered: 6/18/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 220 Filed: 6/6/2002, Entered: 6/11/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, re order in 98-126, filed 6/6/02. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 219 Filed: 6/4/2002, Entered: 6/4/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, re: see order in 98-126, filed 6/03/02. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (FE) Modified on 06/04/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 218 Filed: 5/28/2002, Entered: 5/29/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 217 Filed: 5/20/2002, Entered: 5/21/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 216 Filed: 5/9/2002, Entered: 5/10/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER re: See [395-1] order in case No. 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 215 Filed: 5/7/2002, Entered: 5/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 214 Filed: 5/7/2002, Entered: 5/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 213 Filed: 5/6/2002, Entered: 5/7/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 212 Filed: 5/3/2002, Entered: 5/3/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir for Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 211 Filed: 4/26/2002, Entered: 4/29/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, re: see order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 210 Filed: 4/23/2002, Entered: 4/24/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 209 Filed: 4/18/2002, Entered: 4/18/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER, Re: see order in 98-126 ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (VO)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 208 Filed: 4/11/2002, Entered: 4/12/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          (Supplemental) MOTION by USA (Service by hand: 4/11/02) to Strike the fact and expert testimony of Dr. John Bartlett . Response due: 4/25/02 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 207 Filed: 4/11/2002, Entered: 4/11/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER re: see order [344-2] dated 4/11/02 in Case No. 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 206 Filed: 4/2/2002, Entered: 4/2/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [205-1] motion to Extend Time to serve pretrial submissions Plaintiff to serve pretrial submissions by 7/1/02 (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 205 Filed: 4/1/2002, Entered: 4/2/2002, Terminated: 4/2/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC (Service: 4/1/02) to Extend Time to serve pretrial submissions (to July 1, 2002). (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 204 Filed: 3/25/2002, Entered: 3/26/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, re: see order in 98-126 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 203 Filed: 3/19/2002, Entered: 3/20/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, re: Defendant's response to the Motion for Reconsideration and Clarification of the 3/5/02 order due 3/22/02 (signed by Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir for Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD) Modified on 03/20/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 202 Filed: 3/6/2002, Entered: 3/7/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [199-1] motion for Leave to submit a corrected response to plaintiff's proposed stipulations of facts (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 201 Filed: 3/5/2002, Entered: 3/6/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER denying Motion to preclude or, in the alternative, defer, depositions pursuant to Rule 30(b)(6) (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 200 Filed: 3/5/2002, Entered: 3/6/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [195-1] motion to Extend Time to file pretrial submissions pursuant to the 11/4/98 Pretrial Order, granting [190-1] motion to Extend Time to submit the pretrial submissions Defendant's Pre-trial submissions due 3/1/02 (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 199 Filed: 3/5/2002, Entered: 3/6/2002, Terminated: 3/6/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service by hand: 3/5/02) for Leave to submit a corrected response to plaintiff's proposed stipulations of facts . Response due: 3/19/02 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 198 Filed: 3/5/2002, Entered: 3/6/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [197-1] motion to submit expert report with facsimile of expert's signature and to submit original signature upon receipt (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 197 Filed: 3/1/2002, Entered: 3/5/2002, Terminated: 3/5/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service: 3/1/02) to submit expert report with facsimile of expert's signature and to submit original signature upon receipt . Response due: 3/18/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 196 Filed: 2/28/2002, Entered: 3/1/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting Motion to Extend Time to respond to interrogatories until 3/8/02 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 195 Filed: 2/21/2002, Entered: 2/22/2002, Terminated: 3/5/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 2/21/02) to Extend Time to file pretrial submissions pursuant to the 11/4/98 Pretrial Order , (until March 1, 2002). Response due: 3/11/02. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 194 Filed: 2/20/2002, Entered: 2/21/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER, SEE CASE NO. 98-126 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 193 Filed: 2/13/2002, Entered: 2/14/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER, re: see order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 192 Filed: 2/8/2002, Entered: 2/11/2002 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY by USA to response to [190-1] motion to Extend Time to submit the pretrial submissions. Service: 2/8/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 191 Filed: 2/6/2002, Entered: 2/6/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC (Service by hand: 2/6/02) to [190-1] motion to Extend Time to submit the pretrial submissions. Reply due: 2/20/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 190 Filed: 2/6/2002, Entered: 2/6/2002, Terminated: 3/5/2002 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service by hand: 2/5/02) to Extend Time to submit the pretrial submissions , (until February 22, 2002). Response due: 2/19/02. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 189 Filed: 2/5/2002, Entered: 2/5/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [186-1] motion to Withdraw [184-1] motion for Protective Order (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 188 Filed: 2/1/2002, Entered: 2/4/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying motion to reconsider filed 1/22/02 and granting the motion to revise dates in 9/26/01 order filed 1/24/02 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 187 Filed: 2/1/2002, Entered: 2/4/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER see order filed in 98-126C dated 2/1/02. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 186 Filed: 2/1/2002, Entered: 2/4/2002, Terminated: 2/5/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC (Service: 2/1/02) to Withdraw [184-1] motion for Protective Order . (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 185 Filed: 1/29/2002, Entered: 1/29/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER setting Status Conference for 2:00 p.m. on 2/12/02 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 184 Filed: 1/22/2002, Entered: 1/22/2002, Terminated: 2/5/2002 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC (Service by hand: 1/22/02) for Protective Order . Response due: 2/5/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 183 Filed: 1/11/2002, Entered: 1/14/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER see order in 98-126C filed 1/11/02. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 182 Filed: 1/3/2002, Entered: 1/7/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER see order in 98-126C filed 01/03/02 ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 181 Filed: 12/26/2001, Entered: 12/28/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 12/21/01 ) to Compel production of information considered by experts . Response due: 1/7/02 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 180 Filed: 12/5/2001, Entered: 12/7/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service by hand: 12/5/01) for Reconsideration of [179-1] order . Response due: 12/19/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 12/5/2001, Entered: 12/7/2001 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Deadline updated; Response to [180-1] motion for Reconsideration of [179-1] order due 12/19/01 . (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 179 Filed: 11/20/2001, Entered: 11/21/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER see order in 98-126C filed 11/20/01 ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 178 Filed: 11/16/2001, Entered: 11/19/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER see order in 98-126C filed 11/16/01. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 177 Filed: 11/14/2001, Entered: 11/16/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER see order in 98-126C filed 11/14/01. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 176 Filed: 11/14/2001, Entered: 11/16/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER see order in 98-126C filed 11/14/01. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 175 Filed: 11/14/2001, Entered: 11/16/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service by hand: 11/14/01) to stay further compliance with pretrial proceedings (pending disposition of dispositive motions), and for expedited consideration . Response due: 11/28/01 (DS) Modified on 11/16/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 174 Filed: 11/14/2001, Entered: 11/16/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service by hand: 11/14/01) for Summary Judgment upon Count III of plaintiff's complaint. Response due: 12/12/01 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 173 Filed: 11/14/2001, Entered: 11/16/2001 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact regarding Count III filed by USA. Service by hand: 11/14/01 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 172 Filed: 11/9/2001, Entered: 11/16/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION, together with a separate volume of appendix, by USA (Service by hand: 11/8/01) for partial summary judgment regarding the rate of spent nuclear fuel acceptance . Response due: 12/7/01 (DS) Modified on 11/16/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 171 Filed: 11/9/2001, Entered: 11/16/2001 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact regarding the rate of spent nuclear fuel acceptance filed by USA. Service by hand: 11/8/01 (DS) Modified on 11/16/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 170 Filed: 11/9/2001, Entered: 11/16/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [169-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 169 Filed: 11/9/2001, Entered: 11/16/2001, Terminated: 11/9/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service by hand: 11/8/01) For leave to exceed the page limitation re: dispositive motion filed [by leave of the judge]. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 168 Filed: 11/8/2001, Entered: 11/16/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER stating that the June 8, 1999, order is no longer in effect; authorizing Judge Weinstein to issue any order concerning the general preservation of e-mail deemed necessary; directing parties to participate in coordinated discovery proceeding concerning e-mail production fully subject to Judge Weinstein's direction; and informing parties that any additional e-mail production, beyond that obtained in the coordinated discovery proceeding, shall be obtained only by leave of Court. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 167 Filed: 11/8/2001, Entered: 11/16/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [134-1] motion to permit expert Discovery pursuant to Rule 26(b)(3)(A)(ii), to the extent outlined in this order. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 166 Filed: 11/8/2001, Entered: 11/9/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER. See 98-126C. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 165 Filed: 11/8/2001, Entered: 11/9/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER. See 98-126C. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 164 Filed: 11/7/2001, Entered: 11/8/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting the Motion for Enlargement of time to respond to the Motion to Compel production of documents (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 163 Filed: 11/7/2001, Entered: 11/8/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service by hand: 11/7/01) for Summary Judgment regarding Plaintiff's greater than class Class C Radioactive waste arguments . Response due: 12/5/01. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 162 Filed: 11/7/2001, Entered: 11/8/2001 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA. Service by hand: 11/7/01. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 161 Filed: 11/6/2001, Entered: 11/7/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER igranting motion to enlarge time to respond to motion to compel production of documents to 11/06/01 ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 160 Filed: 11/6/2001, Entered: 11/7/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER re: Public Service Electric and Gas motion to extend time filed on 11/2/01, within which to respond to the defendant's motion to compel is GRANTED (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (see motion filed in 98-126C) (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 159 Filed: 11/6/2001, Entered: 11/7/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER re: granting motion to enlarge time to complete production of documents by 11/19/01 ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 158 Filed: 11/1/2001, Entered: 11/6/2001 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY by USA to response to [142-1] motion to transfer responsibility for e-mail preservation and production issues to the coordinated discovery proceedings. Service: 11/1/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 157 Filed: 11/1/2001, Entered: 11/5/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying [143-1] motion for Clarification of the Court's 9/26/01 order. Individual Judges retain the right to decide dispositive motions. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 156 Filed: 10/30/2001, Entered: 11/1/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [153-1] motion to Extend Time within which to reply to response to motion to transfer, etc., granting [144-1] motion for Leave to file papers that utility Plaintiffs have filed with Discovery Judge Reply to Response to Motion reset to 11/1/01 for [142-1] motion to transfer responsibility for e-mail preservation and production issues to the coordinated discovery proceedings (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 155 Filed: 10/29/2001, Entered: 10/31/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service: 10/5/01) to transfer responsibility for e-mail preservation and production issues to the coordinated discovery proceedings . Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 154 Filed: 10/29/2001, Entered: 10/31/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [145-1] motion for Leave to file a copy of the Motion to Transfer Responsibility, etc. and granting motion for leave to file copies of Plaintiff's response to transfer motion (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 153 Filed: 10/29/2001, Entered: 10/31/2001, Terminated: 10/30/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service: 10/29/01 ) to Extend Time within which to reply to response to motion to transfer, etc. , (until November 1, 2001). (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 152 Filed: 10/19/2001, Entered: 10/23/2001 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of supplemental certificate of service by USA. Service: 10/19/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 151 Filed: 10/19/2001, Entered: 10/23/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 10/19/01) to Compel . Response due: 11/5/01. (Filed with response to third party objections). (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 151 Filed: 10/19/2001, Entered: 10/23/2001 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by USA to third party objections. Service: 10/19/01. (Filed with Motion to Compel). (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 150 Filed: 10/18/2001, Entered: 10/23/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 10/16/01) to Compel . Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 11/2/01. (Filed with response to third party objections). (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 150 Filed: 10/18/2001, Entered: 10/23/2001 ResponseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by USA to third party objections. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 10/16/01. (Filed with Motion to Compel). (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 149 Filed: 10/18/2001, Entered: 10/19/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER directing the Clerk's Office to file Defendant's response and Defendant's corrected Certificate of service is due by 10/25/01 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 148 Filed: 10/17/2001, Entered: 10/18/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER re: Defendant's motion to extend time within which to file the proposed stipulated order concerning the scheduling and conduct of depositions in the coordinated discovery proceeding, is GRANTED, see motion in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 147 Filed: 10/16/2001, Entered: 10/17/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC (Service: 10/16/01) to [142-1] motion to transfer responsibility for e-mail preservation and production issues to the coordinated discovery proceedings. Reply due: 10/30/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 146 Filed: 10/15/2001, Entered: 10/16/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service by hand: 10/11/01) to Strike the expert report of Dr. John W. Bartlett and exclude Dr. Bartlett from testifying as an expert or lay opinoin witness . Response due: 10/25/01 (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 145 Filed: 10/11/2001, Entered: 10/15/2001, Terminated: 10/29/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 10/10/01) for Leave to file a copy of the Motion to Transfer Responsibility, etc. . Response due: 10/29/01 (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 144 Filed: 10/10/2001, Entered: 10/11/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC (Service: 10/10/01) for Leave to file papers that utility Plaintiffs have filed with Discovery Judge . Response due: 10/29/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 143 Filed: 10/9/2001, Entered: 10/10/2001, Terminated: 11/1/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC (Service by hand: 10/9/01) for Clarification of the Court's 9/26/01 order . Response due: 10/23/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 142 Filed: 10/5/2001, Entered: 10/9/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 10/5/01) to transfer responsibility for e-mail preservation and production issues to the coordinated discovery proceedings . Response due: 10/22/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 141 Filed: 10/3/2001, Entered: 10/4/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [140-1] motion to Extend Time to submit a plan for production of e-mail messages Plan is to be filed by 10/22/01 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 140 Filed: 10/3/2001, Entered: 10/4/2001, Terminated: 10/3/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 10/1/01) to Extend Time to submit a plan for production of e-mail messages until 10/22/01. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 139 Filed: 9/26/2001, Entered: 9/27/2001 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY by USA to response to [134-1] motion to permit expert Discovery pursuant to Rule 26(b)(3)(A)(ii). Service: 9/26/01 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 138 Filed: 9/26/2001, Entered: 9/26/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER re: The Joint Motion for an Order for Consolidated Discovery filed on 7/10/01, is granted, with exception of document production, the parties are granted an enlargement of time until 10/1/01, to submit a plan addressing the production of e-mail messages (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 137 Filed: 9/17/2001, Entered: 9/18/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC (Service by hand: 9/17/01) to [134-1] motion to permit expert Discovery pursuant to Rule 26(b)(3)(A)(ii). Reply due: 9/26/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 136 Filed: 9/13/2001, Entered: 9/13/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER setting Status Conference for 4:00 p.m. on 9/20/01 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 135 Filed: 9/4/2001, Entered: 9/4/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [112-1] motion for Leave to Substitute Charles W. Pennington as an expert witness in place of James P. Malone (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 134 Filed: 8/31/2001, Entered: 9/4/2001, Terminated: 11/8/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 8/31/01) to permit expert Discovery pursuant to Rule 26(b)(3)(A)(ii) and for Expedited Consideration . Response due: 9/14/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 133 Filed: 8/22/2001, Entered: 8/22/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting motion for protective order in the form provided by Exhibit A of the parties 08/10/01 motion (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). See case number 98-126 C for motion. Protective order is also entered in 98-485 C, subject to reconsideration by the assigned judge. Copy to parties. (FE) Modified on 08/22/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 132 Filed: 8/15/2001, Entered: 8/16/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER setting Status Conference for 2:00 p.m. on 9/11/01 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein, Discovery Judge). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 131 Filed: 8/13/2001, Entered: 8/13/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of proceedings (See: 98-126 C for Transcript) 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of August 6, 2001. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 130 Filed: 8/9/2001, Entered: 8/10/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER re: (1) Defendant's complete pretrial submissions shall be forwarded on or before 12/3/01; (2) If prior to 12/3/01, defendant can demonstrate that ongoing discovery will alter pretrial submissions, a motion shall be promptly filed; and (3) Defendant shall commence the audit activity by 12/3/01 (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 129 Filed: 7/30/2001, Entered: 7/31/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER re: Pursuant to the order filed on July 25, 2001, the order filed on October 6, 1999, staying proceedings, is LIFTED (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 128 Filed: 7/25/2001, Entered: 7/26/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER regarding procedure for pretrial submissions, etc. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 127 Filed: 7/18/2001, Entered: 7/20/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC (Service by hand: 7/18/01) for Leave to file joint motion for leave to file a proposed order on liability that was filed before Judge Wiese as managing Judge. Response due: 8/1/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 126 Filed: 7/11/2001, Entered: 7/13/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 7/11/01 ) for Leave to file a copy of the parties' "joint motion for an order coordinating discovery ." Response due: 7/30/01. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 125 Filed: 7/5/2001, Entered: 7/6/2001 RemarkCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Copy of Yankee Atomic's Motin for Leave to file documents relevant to the telephone conference with Judge Wiese. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 124 Filed: 7/5/2001, Entered: 7/5/2001, Terminated: 1/8/2003 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service by hand: 7/3/01) for an order directing plaintiff to participate in consolidated discovery effort limited to schedule issues . Response due: 7/17/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 123 Filed: 5/31/2001, Entered: 6/1/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER resetting Status Conference for 2:30 p.m. on 6/14/01 (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 122 Filed: 5/29/2001, Entered: 5/31/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER setting Status Conference for 10:30 a.m. on 6/14/01 (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 121 Filed: 5/22/2001, Entered: 5/25/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER: On 1/8/2001, Dft filed a [116-1] Motion to the Chief Judge to reassign to a single Judge cases involving alleged breaches of the standard contract published at 10 C.F.R. part 961. The Chief Judge hereby designates Judge Wiese as the managing judge in the above cited cases for the purpose of meeting with the parties to consider whether consolidation or other joint handling of discovery or other pre-trial matters is appropriate. Judge Wiese is requested to formulate a management plan, if one is appropriate, and is authorized to make appropriate rulings with respect to this purpose. (signed by Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir). Judge Wiese is designated as managing judge. Copy to parties. (LTD) Modified on 3/17/2004 (jcp, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 120 Filed: 2/21/2001, Entered: 2/23/2001 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY by USA to response to [116-1] motion to the Chief Judge to reassign to a single Judge cases involving alleged breaches of the standard contract published at 10 C.F.R. part 961. Service: 2/16/01 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 119 Filed: 2/21/2001, Entered: 2/23/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [118-1] motion for Leave to file a copy of the reply to the opposition to the motion to the Chief Judge to reassign to a single Judge cases involving alleged breachs of the standard contract, etc. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 118 Filed: 2/20/2001, Entered: 2/22/2001, Terminated: 2/21/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 2/20/01) for Leave to file a copy of the reply to the opposition to the motion to the Chief Judge to reassign to a single Judge cases involving alleged breachs of the standard contract, etc. . Response due: 3/9/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 117 Filed: 1/22/2001, Entered: 1/23/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC (Service by hand: 1/22/01) to Extend Time to respond to the USA's motion to the Chief Judge to reassign cases to a single Judge , (until January 29, 2001). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 116 Filed: 1/10/2001, Entered: 1/10/2001, Terminated: 5/22/2001 Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 1/8/01 ) to the Chief Judge to reassign to a single Judge cases involving alleged breaches of the standard contract published at 10 C.F.R. part 961 . Response due: 1/25/01. (HW) Modified on 01/10/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 115 Filed: 1/10/2001, Entered: 1/10/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [114-1] motion for Leave to file a copy of the USA's motion to the Chief Judge to reassign to a single judge cases involving alleged breaches of the standard contract, etc. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 114 Filed: 1/9/2001, Entered: 1/10/2001, Terminated: 1/10/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service by hand: 1/9/01) for Leave to file a copy of the USA's motion to the Chief Judge to reassign to a single judge cases involving alleged breaches of the standard contract, etc. . Response due: 1/23/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 113 Filed: 12/19/2000, Entered: 12/28/2000 CAFC Mandate Affirming
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MANDATE (certified copy) from CAFC dated December 19, 2000 affirmed [24-1] order. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 112 Filed: 8/23/2000, Entered: 8/24/2000, Terminated: 9/4/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC (Service : 8/23/00 (by hand)) for Leave to Substitute Charles W. Pennington as an expert witness in place of James P. Malone. Response due: 9/6/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 111 Filed: 10/6/1999, Entered: 10/12/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [86-1] motion to stay proceedings. Proceedings shall be stayed pending further Order of the Court. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 110 Filed: 8/31/1999, Entered: 10/7/1999 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    *** Official Caption - Maine Yankee Atomic Power Company, Connecticut Yankee Atomic Electric Company *** (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 8/31/1999, Entered: 9/2/1999 CAFC Case Number
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CAFC Case Number Re: [109-1] appeal by USA CAFC NUMBER: 99-5138. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 107 Filed: 8/13/1999, Entered: 8/16/1999 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by USA re: Maine Public Utilities Commission's amicus curiae brief opposing the United States' motion for a stay. Service: 8/13/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 109 Filed: 8/4/1999, Entered: 9/2/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL of [24-1] order by USA. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 108 Filed: 8/4/1999, Entered: 9/2/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [86-1] motion for Certification for Interlocutory Appeal - See 98-126 for motion) (signed by Pauline Newman, Circuit Judge). Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 106 Filed: 8/3/1999, Entered: 8/4/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [101-1] motion for Leave to File an Amicus Curiae brief opposing the United States' motion for a stay. Set the parties responses to the amicus curiae brief deadline to 8/13/99. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 105 Filed: 7/30/1999, Entered: 8/2/1999 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY by USA to response to [86-1] motion to Stay Proceedings pending the conclusion of proceedings relating to interlocutory appeal in Yankee Atomic 98-126 C. Service: 7/30/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 104 Filed: 7/30/1999, Entered: 8/2/1999 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by USA (Service: 7/30/99) to [101-1] motion for Leave to File an Amicus Curiae brief opposing the United States' motion for a stay. Reply due: 8/13/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 103 Filed: 7/26/1999, Entered: 7/27/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [102-1] motion to Extend Time within which to respond to motion to stay. Defendant's reply to response to motion reset to 7/30/99 for [86-1] motion to Stay Proceedings pending the conclusion of proceedings relating to interlocutory appeal in Yankee Atomic 98-126 C and Defendant's response to [101-1] motion for Leave to File an Amicus Curiae brief opposing the United States' motion for a stay reset to 7/30/99. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 102 Filed: 7/23/1999, Entered: 7/26/1999, Terminated: 7/26/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 7/23/99 ) to Extend Time within which to respond to motion to stay , (until July 30, 1999). Response due: 8/10/99 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 101 Filed: 7/15/1999, Entered: 7/16/1999, Terminated: 8/3/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by MAINE PUBLIC UTILITI (Service : 7/15/99 (by hand) ) for Leave to File an Amicus Curiae brief opposing the United States' motion for a stay. (brief included) Response due: 7/29/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 100 Filed: 7/15/1999, Entered: 7/16/1999 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC (Service: 7/15/99 (by hand) ) to [86-1] motion to Stay Proceedings pending the conclusion of proceedings relating to interlocutory appeal in Yankee Atomic 98-126 C. Reply due: 7/26/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 99 Filed: 7/2/1999, Entered: 9/2/1999 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            *** Request for permission to file Interlocutory Appeal filed in CAFC, Misc. No. 591. *** (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 98 Filed: 6/30/1999, Entered: 7/1/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER amending the 6/22/99 Order to substitute the correct date for the Order certified pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1292(d)(2), which is November 3, 1998, and the correct citation to this Order, as subsequently published, which is 42 Fed. Cl. 582 (1998). ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 97 Filed: 6/30/1999, Entered: 7/1/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [94-1] motion for entry of agreement and protective order. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 96 Filed: 6/30/1999, Entered: 7/1/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [95-1] motion for Leave to File status report. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 95 Filed: 6/29/1999, Entered: 6/30/1999, Terminated: 6/30/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 6/28/99 (by hand)) for Leave to File status report. (status report included) Response due: 7/12/99 (JT) Modified on 06/30/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 94 Filed: 6/29/1999, Entered: 6/30/1999, Terminated: 6/30/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      JOINT MOTION by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC, USA for entry of agreement and protective order. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 93 Filed: 6/29/1999, Entered: 6/30/1999 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by USA (Service: 6/28/99 (by hand)) to [87-1] motion for entry of an order protecting proprietary material disclosed in the course of litigation. Reply due: 7/8/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 92 Filed: 6/25/1999, Entered: 6/25/1999 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER mooting [91-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to motion for a stay (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 91 Filed: 6/24/1999, Entered: 6/25/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC (Service: 6/24/99) to Extend Time to respond to motion for a stay , (until July 15, 1999). Response due: 7/12/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 90 Filed: 6/22/1999, Entered: 6/24/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER amending the 10/29/98 Order and granting [88-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to Defendant's motion to stay. Plaintiff's response to [86-1] motion to stay proceedings pending the conclusion of proceedings relating to interlocutory appeal in Yankee Atomic 98-126 C reset to 7/15/99. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 89 Filed: 6/18/1999, Entered: 6/22/1999 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by USA (Service: 6/18/99 (by hand)) to [88-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to Defendant's motion to stay, [88-2] motion for expedited briefing and consideration. Reply due: 6/29/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 87 Filed: 6/14/1999, Entered: 6/17/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC (Service: 6/14/99) for entry of an order protecting proprietary material disclosed in the course of litigation . Response due: 7/1/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 88 Filed: 6/11/1999, Entered: 6/17/1999, Terminated: 6/22/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC (Service : 6/11/99 ) to Extend Time to respond to Defendant's motion to stay [until July 15, 1999] and for expedited briefing and consideration. Response due: 6/28/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 86 Filed: 6/11/1999, Entered: 9/2/1999, Terminated: 10/6/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 6/11/99 ) for Certification for Interlocutory Appeal , filed in 98-126. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 86 Filed: 6/11/1999, Entered: 6/16/1999, Terminated: 8/4/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 6/11/99) to Stay Proceedings pending the conclusion of proceedings relating to interlocutory appeal in Yankee Atomic 98-126 C Response due: 6/25/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 85 Filed: 6/8/1999, Entered: 6/14/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying [48-1] motion to compel the government to preserve and recover its e-mail documents and to adequately safeguard the preservaton of other documentary evidence and denying defendant's March 29, 1999 Motion for a Protective Order contained in defendant's March 29, 1999 Response to Motion to Compel (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 84 Filed: 6/3/1999, Entered: 6/8/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting in part, denying in part [43-1] motion to Compel. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 83 Filed: 6/2/1999, Entered: 6/7/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting in part, denying in part [50-1] motion to compel the production of responsive documents and information, granting in part, denying in part [52-1] motion for Protective Order, granting in part, denying in part [79-1] motion to Extend Time to file pretrial submissions, granting in part, denying in part [79-2] motion to Amend [25-1] order. Reset pretrial submissions due: 6/30/99 for MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 82 Filed: 5/21/1999, Entered: 5/27/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER denying as moot Plaintiff's 12/18/98 motion to compel deposition. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 81 Filed: 5/20/1999, Entered: 5/24/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER re: Governing review of priviledged or otherwise protected information (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 80 Filed: 5/20/1999, Entered: 5/24/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying [54-1] motion for Protective Order (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 78 Filed: 5/18/1999, Entered: 5/19/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [77-1] motion to compel the deposition of Christopher Kouts., denying [74-1] motion to Stay additional depositions pending decisions upon interlocutory appeal ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 79 Filed: 5/17/1999, Entered: 5/20/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC (Service : 5/17/99 ) to Extend Time to file their pretrial submissions [until June 30, 1999] and to Amend [25-1] order. Response due: 6/3/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 5/17/1999, Entered: 5/20/1999 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Deadline updated; Defendant's response to [79-2] motion to Amend [25-1] order reset to 6/3/99. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 77 Filed: 5/14/1999, Entered: 5/18/1999, Terminated: 5/18/1999 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC (Service: 5/14/99 (by hand) ) to [74-1] motion to stay additional depositions pending decisions upon interlocutory appeal. Reply due: 5/28/99 (motion to compel included) (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 77 Filed: 5/14/1999, Entered: 5/18/1999, Terminated: 5/18/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC (Service : 5/14/99 (by hand)) to compel the deposition of Christopher Kouts. Response due: 5/28/99 (response to motion to stay included) (JT) Modified on 05/18/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 76 Filed: 5/12/1999, Entered: 5/17/1999 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 5/12/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 75 Filed: 5/12/1999, Entered: 5/17/1999 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC. Service: 5/12/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 74 Filed: 5/10/1999, Entered: 5/12/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service by hand: 5/10/99) to Stay additional depositions pending decisions upon interlocutory appeal . Response due: 5/24/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 73 Filed: 5/6/1999, Entered: 5/7/1999 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SCHEDULING ORDER setting Status Report due on 5/12/99 ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 72 Filed: 5/5/1999, Entered: 5/6/1999 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of proceedings (For Transcript see: 98-126 C) 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of May 4, 1999. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 5/4/1999, Entered: 5/5/1999 Oral Argument
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Oral Argument re: [54-1] motion for Protective Order by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC, [52-1] motion for Protective Order by USA, [50-1] motion to compel the production of responsive documents and information by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC , [48-1] motion to compel the government to preserve and recover its e-mail documents and to adequately safeguard the preservaton of other evidence by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC, [43-1] motion to Compel by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC ( Transcript due 6/3/99 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 71 Filed: 4/22/1999, Entered: 4/28/1999 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY by USA to response to [52-1] motion for Protective Order. Service: 4/20/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 70 Filed: 4/22/1999, Entered: 4/28/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [68-1] motion for Leave to file a telecopied signature (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 69 Filed: 4/21/1999, Entered: 4/27/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [66-1] motion to Extend Time to April 21, 1999, to file reply to "Maine Yankee's Reply to Defendant's Response to the Motion to Compel Discovery and Response to Defendant's Motion for a Protective Order. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 68 Filed: 4/21/1999, Entered: 4/26/1999, Terminated: 4/22/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 4/20/99 ) for Leave to file a telecopied signature. Response due: 5/7/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 67 Filed: 4/21/1999, Entered: 4/26/1999 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY by USA to response to [52-1] motion for Protective Order. Service: 4/21/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 66 Filed: 4/16/1999, Entered: 4/20/1999, Terminated: 4/21/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service: 4/16/99) to Extend Time to file its reply to "Maine Yankee's Reply to Defendant's Response to the Motion to Compel Discovery and Response to Defendant's Motion for a Protective Order until 4/21/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 65 Filed: 4/13/1999, Entered: 4/16/1999 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC to response to [54-1] motion for Protective Order. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 4/9/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 64 Filed: 4/9/1999, Entered: 4/15/1999 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC to response to [48-1] motion to compel the government to preserve and recover its e-mail documents and to adequately safeguard the preservaton of other documentary evidence. Service: 4/9/99. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 62 Filed: 4/8/1999, Entered: 4/14/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER oral argument set for 2:00 p.m., 5/4/99 for [43-1] motion to compel, [48-1] motion to compel, [52-1] motion for Protective Order, [50-1] motion to compel and [54-1] motion for Protective Order. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 63 Filed: 4/7/1999, Entered: 4/14/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [60-1] motion to Extend Time for reply on it's motion to compel and opposition to defendant's motion for a protective order. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 61 Filed: 4/6/1999, Entered: 4/12/1999 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC (Service: 4/6/99 ) to [52-1] motion for Protective Order. Reply due: 4/19/99 (reply to response to motion included) (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 61 Filed: 4/6/1999, Entered: 4/12/1999 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC to response to [50-1] motion to compel the production of responsive documents and information. Service: 4/6/99 (response to motion included) (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 60 Filed: 4/5/1999, Entered: 4/9/1999, Terminated: 4/7/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC (Service : 4/5/99) to Extend Time for reply on it's motion to compel and opposition to defendant's motion for a protective order , (until April 6, 1999). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 59 Filed: 4/1/1999, Entered: 4/6/1999 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC (Service: 3/31/99 (by hand) ) to [55-1] motion to Extend Time out of time Defendant's response to Plaintiff's emergency motion to compel, [55-2] motion to Strike [48-1] motion to compel the government to preserve and recover its e-mail documents and to adequately safeguard the preservaton of other documentary evidence by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC. Filed by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 4/9/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 58 Filed: 3/29/1999, Entered: 3/31/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [55-1] motion to Extend Time out of time Defendant's response to Plaintiff's emergency motion to compel, denying [55-2] motion to Strike [48-1] motion to compel the government to preserve and recover its e-mail documents and to adequately safeguard the preservaton of other documentary evidence by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC. Defendant's response to [48-1] motion to compel the government to preserve and recover its e-mail documents and to adequately safeguard the preservaton of other documentary evidence reset to 3/29/99. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 57 Filed: 3/29/1999, Entered: 3/31/1999 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by USA (Service: 3/29/99 ) to [48-1] motion to compel the government to preserve and recover its e-mail documents and to adequately safeguard the preservaton of other documentary evidence. Reply due: 4/12/99. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 56 Filed: 3/29/1999, Entered: 3/30/1999 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by USA (Service: 3/29/99 (by hand)) to [54-1] motion for Protective Order. Reply due: 4/7/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 55 Filed: 3/23/1999, Entered: 3/25/1999, Terminated: 3/29/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 3/23/99 (by hand)) to Extend Time out of time Defendant's response to Plaintiff's emergency motion to compel or to Strike [48-1] motion to compel the government to preserve and recover its e-mail documents and to adequately safeguard the preservaton of other documentary evidence by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC. Response due: 4/6/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 3/23/1999, Entered: 3/25/1999 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Deadline updated; Plaintiff's response to [55-2] motion to Strike [48-1] motion to compel the government to preserve and recover its e-mail documents and to adequately safeguard the preservaton of other documentary evidence by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC reset to 4/6/99. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 54 Filed: 3/19/1999, Entered: 3/23/1999, Terminated: 5/20/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC (Service by hand: 3/19/99) for Protective Order . Response due: 4/2/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 53 Filed: 3/17/1999, Entered: 3/21/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [51-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to motion to compel to March 17, 1999. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 52 Filed: 3/17/1999, Entered: 3/19/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 3/17/99 ) for Protective Order . Response due: 4/5/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 52 Filed: 3/17/1999, Entered: 3/19/1999 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by USA (Service: 3/17/99 ) to [50-1] motion to compel the production of responsive documents and information. Reply due: 3/29/99. (FE) Modified on 03/19/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 51 Filed: 3/15/1999, Entered: 3/17/1999, Terminated: 3/17/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 3/15/99 ) to Extend Time to respond to motion to compel , (until March 17, 1999). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 50 Filed: 3/3/1999, Entered: 3/5/1999, Terminated: 6/2/1999 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC (Service : 3/1/99 (by hand)) to compel the production of responsive documents and information. (1 Separate Volume of Exhibits) Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 3/15/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 49 Filed: 2/25/1999, Entered: 3/1/1999 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC to response to [43-1] motion to Compel. Service: 2/25/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 48 Filed: 2/18/1999, Entered: 2/19/1999, Terminated: 6/8/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC (Service : 2/18/99 ) to compel the government to preserve and recover its e-mail documents and to adequately safeguard the preservaton of other documentary evidence. Response due: 3/4/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 47 Filed: 2/16/1999, Entered: 2/17/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [46-1] motion to Extend Time for submissions under pretrial order. Set pretrial submissions due: 5/17/99 for MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 46 Filed: 2/11/1999, Entered: 2/12/1999, Terminated: 2/16/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC (Service : 2/11/99 ) to Extend Time for submissions under pretrial order , (until May 17, 1999). Response due: 3/1/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 45 Filed: 2/10/1999, Entered: 2/11/1999 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by USA (Service: 2/10/99) to [43-1] motion to Compel. Reply due: 2/22/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 43 Filed: 1/28/1999, Entered: 1/30/1999, Terminated: 6/3/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC (Service by hand: 1/27/99 ) to Compel document production. Response due: 2/10/99 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 44 Filed: 1/27/1999, Entered: 2/1/1999 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 1/27/99. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 42 Filed: 1/25/1999, Entered: 1/25/1999 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER denying [29-1] motion for Protective Order, denying [28-1] motion to Compel Discovery Status Report deadline to 1/27/99 ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 1/13/1999, Entered: 1/13/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Oral Argument re: [28-1] motion to Compel Discovery by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC ( Transcript due 2/12/99 ), [29-1] motion for Protective Order. by USA ( Transcript due 2/12/99 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 41 Filed: 1/12/1999, Entered: 1/15/1999 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Harold Dewitt Lester Jr.. Service by hand: 1/12/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 40 Filed: 12/18/1998, Entered: 12/18/1998 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER oral argument set for 2:30 p.m., 1/13/99 for [29-1] motion for Protective Order and [28-1] motion to Compel Discovery. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 39 Filed: 12/16/1998, Entered: 12/17/1998 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY by USA to response to [29-1] motion for Protective Order. Service: 12/16/98. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 38 Filed: 12/15/1998, Entered: 12/17/1998 Published DecisionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PUBLISHED DECISION (reissuance of unpublished order entered on November 3, 1998). ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ). Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 37 Filed: 12/15/1998, Entered: 12/17/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [36-1] motion for publication of the Order of 11/3/98. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 36 Filed: 12/14/1998, Entered: 12/15/1998, Terminated: 12/15/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC (Service : 12/14/98 (by hand) ) for publication of the Order of 11/3/98. Response due: 12/28/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 35 Filed: 12/14/1998, Entered: 12/15/1998 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to Complaint by USA. Service: 12/14/98 ( JPSR due 2/1/99 ) (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 34 Filed: 12/7/1998, Entered: 12/9/1998 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC (Service: 12/4/98 ) to [29-1] motion for Protective Order. Reply due: 12/18/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 34 Filed: 12/7/1998, Entered: 12/9/1998 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC to response to [28-1] motion to Compel Discovery. Service: 12/4/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 32 Filed: 12/2/1998, Entered: 12/8/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying [30-1] motion to Amend [25-1] order with the exception that briefs submitted pursuant to the 11/4/98 Pretrial Order may comprise up to 30 pages. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 31 Filed: 12/2/1998, Entered: 12/8/1998 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Significant Development by USA. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 12/1/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 33 Filed: 12/1/1998, Entered: 12/9/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [26-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint . Answer deadline to 12/14/98 ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 30 Filed: 11/25/1998, Entered: 12/3/1998, Terminated: 12/2/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC (Service : 11/25/98 (by hand) ) to Amend [25-1] order. Response due: 12/9/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 11/25/1998, Entered: 12/3/1998 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Deadline updated; Defendant's response to [30-1] motion to Amend [25-1] order reset to 12/9/98. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 29 Filed: 11/24/1998, Entered: 12/3/1998, Terminated: 1/25/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 11/24/98 (by hand)) for Protective Order. Response due: 12/8/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 29 Filed: 11/24/1998, Entered: 12/3/1998, Terminated: 1/25/1999 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by USA (Service: 11/24/98 (by hand)) to [28-1] motion to Compel Discovery. Reply due: 12/8/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 29 Filed: 11/24/1998, Entered: 12/3/1998, Terminated: 1/25/1999 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY by USA to response to [26-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint. Service: 11/24/98 (by hand) (JT) Modified on 12/03/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 28 Filed: 11/17/1998, Entered: 11/19/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC (Service by hand : 11/17/98 ) to Compel Discovery . Response due: 12/1/98. (FE) Modified on 11/19/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 27 Filed: 11/13/1998, Entered: 11/17/1998 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC (Service by hand: 11/13/98 ) to [26-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint. Reply due: 11/24/98. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 26 Filed: 11/9/1998, Entered: 11/12/1998, Terminated: 12/1/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 11/9/98 ) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint [until 10 days after the U.S. Supreme Court has resolved Defendant's Petition for a writ of certiorari]. Response due: 11/27/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 25 Filed: 11/4/1998, Entered: 11/6/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PRETRIAL ORDER (RULE 16) ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 24 Filed: 11/3/1998, Entered: 11/4/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting in part (to the extent it seeks dismissal of Count IV of the complaint), denying in part [14-1] motion to Dismiss, granting [9-1] motion for Summary Judgment. (See entry of 12/15/98) ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 12/17/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 22 Filed: 9/28/1998, Entered: 10/1/1998 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC re: Dispositive Motions. Service: 9/28/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 23 Filed: 9/18/1998, Entered: 10/15/1998 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEE NO. 98-126C FOR TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: oral argument (one volume), taken at Washington, DC on September 16, 1998. Notice to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 9/16/1998, Entered: 9/16/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Oral Argument re: [9-1] motion for Summary Judgment. by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC ( Transcript due 10/16/98 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 21 Filed: 9/14/1998, Entered: 9/18/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [20-1] motion for Leave to file faxed signature page of second declaration of Michael E. Thomas and notice of filing of original signature page. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 20 Filed: 9/10/1998, Entered: 9/15/1998, Terminated: 9/14/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC (Service : 9/10/98 ) for Leave to faxed signature page of second declaration of Michael E. Thomas and notice of filing of original signature page Response due: 9/29/98 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 19 Filed: 9/9/1998, Entered: 9/11/1998 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC (Service: 9/9/98 ) to [14-1] supplemental motion to dismiss. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 18 Filed: 9/9/1998, Entered: 9/11/1998 Statement of Genuine Issues
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC. Service: 9/9/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 17 Filed: 8/27/1998, Entered: 8/27/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of filing original declaration of Michael E. Thomas in support of motion for summary judgment by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC. Service by hand: 8/27/98 (AB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 16 Filed: 8/19/1998, Entered: 8/20/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER oral argument set for 2:00 p.m., 9/16/98 for [9-1] motion for Summary Judgment. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 15 Filed: 8/19/1998, Entered: 8/19/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA. Service: 8/19/98 (AB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 14 Filed: 8/19/1998, Entered: 8/19/1998, Terminated: 11/3/1998 Description not available
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION by USA (Service : 8/19/98 ) to Dismiss Response due: 9/21/98 (AB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 13 Filed: 8/17/1998, Entered: 8/19/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATED ORDER setting filing deadline for August 19, 1998 for Defendant to make argument re: dismissal and opposing Plaintiff's summary judgment motion and set Plaintiff's response deadline to 9/9/98. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 12 Filed: 8/14/1998, Entered: 8/17/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    JOINT MOTION by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC, USA for entry of a stipulated order. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 11 Filed: 8/11/1998, Entered: 8/13/1998 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY by USA to response to [5-1] motion to Stay all proceedings. Service: 8/11/98. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 10 Filed: 8/10/1998, Entered: 8/12/1998 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC. Service: 8/3/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 9 Filed: 8/10/1998, Entered: 8/12/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC (Service : 8/3/98 (by hand)) for Summary Judgment. 1 Separate Volume of Appendix. Response due: 8/31/98 (JT) Modified on 08/12/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 8 Filed: 8/10/1998, Entered: 8/12/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [7-1] motion for Leave to File Faxed Signature Page of Declaration Supporting Motion for Summary Judgment on Contract Liability. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 7 Filed: 8/3/1998, Entered: 8/6/1998, Terminated: 8/10/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC (Service : 8/3/98 (by hand)) for Leave to File Faxed Signature Page of Declaration Supporting Motion for Summary Judgment on Contract Liability. Response due: 8/17/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 6 Filed: 8/3/1998, Entered: 8/5/1998 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC (Service by hand: 8/3/98 ) to [5-1] motion to Stay all proceedings. Reply due: 8/12/98 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 5 Filed: 7/31/1998, Entered: 8/5/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service by hand: 7/31/98 ) to Stay all proceedings . Response due: 8/14/98 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 6/9/1998, Entered: 6/9/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Joseph Andrew Kijewski. Service : 6/9/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 6/2/1998, Entered: 6/2/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC of related cases; (98-126 C and 98-154 C). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 6/2/1998, Entered: 6/2/1998 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of assignment to Judge James F. Merow. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 6/2/1998, Entered: 6/2/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT (Filed with 1 Exhibit), FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #045595. Answer due on 8/3/98. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 223 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?