FLORIDA POWER v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:98-cv-00483-LMB
District Judge Lawrence M. Baskir, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Florida Power & Light Company, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alexander D. Tomaszczuk +1 703 770 7940 +1 703 770 7901 alex.tomaszczuk@pillsburylaw.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marian Elizabeth Sullivan +1 202 307 0365 +1 202 307 2503 marian.sullivan@usdoj.gov
No Logo AEP TEXAS CENTRAL COMPANY, Respondent
No Logo Dairyland Power Cooperative, Respondent
No Logo Kansas City Power & Light Company, Respondent
No Logo KANSAS ELECTRIC POWER COOPERATIVE, INC., Respondent
No Logo Kansas Gas And Electric Company, Respondent
No Logo Luminant Generation Company LLC, Respondent
No Logo TEXAS GENCO, LP, Respondent
No Logo Union Electric Company, Respondent
Office COFC
Filed 6/8/1998
Jury Demand None
Demand $300000000
Nature of Suit 536 - Spent Nuclear Fuel
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County None
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags ECF, SNF, STAYED
  Entries (309) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 292 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: 9/8/2008
RESPONSE to [285] MOTION To Coordinate Discovery and Develop a Litigation Plan For the Spent Nuclear Fuel Cases, filed by FLORIDA POWER AND LIGHT COMPANY.Reply due by 9/22/2008. (Chu, Jack)
    LREF
    Legal Document 291 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: 9/8/2008
    RESPONSE to [285] MOTION To Coordinate Discovery and Develop a Litigation Plan For the Spent Nuclear Fuel Cases, filed by TEXAS GENCO, LP, AEP TEXAS CENTRAL COMPANY.Reply due by 9/22/2008. (Stouck, Jerry)
      LREF
      Legal Document 290 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: 9/8/2008
      RESPONSE to [285] MOTION To Coordinate Discovery and Develop a Litigation Plan For the Spent Nuclear Fuel Cases, filed by LUMINANT GENERATION COMPANY, LLC.Reply due by 9/22/2008. (Stouck, Jerry)
        LREF
        Legal Document 289 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: 9/8/2008
        RESPONSE to [285] MOTION To Coordinate Discovery and Develop a Litigation Plan For the Spent Nuclear Fuel Cases, filed by KANSAS GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY, KANSAS CITY POWER & LIGHT COMPANY, KANSAS ELECTRIC POWER COOPERATIVE, INC..Reply due by 9/22/2008. (Stouck, Jerry)
          LREF
          Legal Document 288 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: 9/8/2008
          RESPONSE to [285] MOTION To Coordinate Discovery and Develop a Litigation Plan For the Spent Nuclear Fuel Cases, filed by UNION ELECTRIC COMPANY.Reply due by 9/22/2008. (Stouck, Jerry)
            LREF
            Legal Document 287 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: 9/8/2008
            RESPONSE to [285] MOTION To Coordinate Discovery and Develop a Litigation Plan For the Spent Nuclear Fuel Cases, filed by DAIRYLAND POWER COOPERATIVE.Reply due by 9/22/2008. (Stouck, Jerry)
              LREF
              Legal Document 286 Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: 8/26/2008 Court Filing
              ORDER granting [284] Motion for Extension of Time to file JSR til 9/18/08. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra for Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (dcl)
                LREF
                Legal Document 285 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: 8/21/2008
                MOTION To Coordinate Discovery and Develop a Litigation Plan For the Spent Nuclear Fuel Cases, filed by USA.Response due by 9/8/2008.(Sullivan, Marian)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 284 Filed: 8/19/2008, Entered: 8/19/2008, Terminated: 8/26/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 09/18/2008 to File Joint Status Report, filed by FLORIDA POWER AND LIGHT COMPANY.Response due by 9/5/2008.(Herzfeld, Daniel)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 283 Filed: 8/18/2008, Entered: 8/18/2008
                    NOTICE of Appearance by Marian Elizabeth Sullivan for USA. (Sullivan, Marian)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 282 Filed: 6/20/2008, Entered: 6/20/2008
                      JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by FLORIDA POWER AND LIGHT COMPANY, USA. (Chu, Jack)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 281 Filed: 4/21/2008, Entered: 4/21/2008
                        JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Herzfeld, Daniel)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 280 Filed: 2/19/2008, Entered: 2/19/2008
                          JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Herzfeld, Daniel)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 279 Filed: 1/18/2008, Entered: 1/18/2008
                            NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa Lefante Donahue for USA. (Donahue, Lisa)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 1/18/2008, Entered: 2/19/2008 Add and Terminate Attorneys
                              *** Attorney Marian Elizabeth Sullivan terminated. (dls)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 278 Filed: 12/19/2007, Entered: 12/19/2007
                                JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 277 Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: 10/29/2007
                                  JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 276 Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: 8/30/2007
                                    JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 275 Filed: 8/8/2007, Entered: 8/8/2007 Court Filing
                                      ORDER returning Mr. Petersens 2nd M/Intervene, with a hard copy of this Order attached. No further filings will be accepted. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (dcl)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 274 Filed: 6/29/2007, Entered: 6/29/2007
                                        JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 273 Filed: 5/3/2007, Entered: 5/3/2007 Court Filing
                                          ORDER returning Mr. Peterson's M/Intervene in this case; thus finding as moot [271] Ds Motion for Leave to File Corrected Response. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (dcl)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 272 Filed: 5/2/2007, Entered: 5/2/2007 Court Filing
                                            ORDER granting [269] Motion to Continue Stay until further notice. JSR every 60 days, beginning 7/2/07. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (dcl)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 271 Filed: 4/27/2007, Entered: 4/27/2007, Terminated: 5/3/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                              MOTION for Leave to File Defendant's Corrected Response To Mr. William (Bill) Peterson's April 7, 2007 Motion To Intervene And Complaint, filed by USA.Response due by 5/14/2007. (Attachments: # (1))(Lester, Harold)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 270 Filed: 4/26/2007, Entered: 4/26/2007
                                                RESPONSE to Mr. William (Bill) Peterson's Motion To Intervene And Complaint, dated April 7, 2007, filed by USA. (Lester, Harold)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 269 Filed: 1/5/2007, Entered: 1/5/2007, Terminated: 5/2/2007 Motion to Continue
                                                  Joint MOTION to Continue Stay, filed by FLORIDA POWER AND LIGHT COMPANY, USA.Response due by 1/22/2007.(Chu, Jack)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 268 Filed: 1/5/2007, Entered: 1/5/2007
                                                    JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by FLORIDA POWER AND LIGHT COMPANY, USA. (Chu, Jack)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 267 Filed: 9/15/2006, Entered: 9/15/2006 Court Filing
                                                      ORDER continuing the Stay of this case until 12/31/06. JSR due by 1/5/07. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (dcl)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 266 Filed: 9/14/2006, Entered: 9/14/2006
                                                        STATUS REPORT, filed by USA. (Herrmann, Heide)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 265 Filed: 3/8/2006, Entered: 3/8/2006 Court Filing
                                                          ORDER staying this case til 9/8/06 since Florida Power no longer a lead case; JSR due 9/15/06 on further proceedings. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (dcl)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 264 Filed: 3/6/2006, Entered: 3/6/2006
                                                            JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Chu, Jack)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 263 Filed: 2/16/2006, Entered: 2/16/2006
                                                              ANSWER to Amended Complaint Second Amended Complaint and Supplemental Complaint, filed by USA. JPSR due by 4/10/2006. (Sullivan, Marian)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 262 Filed: 2/6/2006, Entered: 2/6/2006 Court Filing
                                                                ORDER granting [259] Motion for Leave to File Amended & Supplement Complaint. Joint Status Report due 3/6/06. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (dcl)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 261 Filed: 2/2/2006, Entered: 2/2/2006
                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re [259] MOTION for Leave to File Its Amended And Supplemental Complaint, filed by FLORIDA POWER AND LIGHT COMPANY. (Chu, Jack)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 260 Filed: 1/19/2006, Entered: 1/19/2006
                                                                    RESPONSE to [259] MOTION for Leave to File Its Amended And Supplemental Complaint, filed by USA. Reply due by 2/2/2006. (Sullivan, Marian)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 259 Filed: 1/3/2006, Entered: 1/3/2006, Terminated: 2/6/2006 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File Its Amended And Supplemental Complaint, filed by FLORIDA POWER AND LIGHT COMPANY. Response due by 1/20/2006. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (Second Amended Complaint And Supplemental Complaint)# (2) Exhibit B (DOJ letter in Southern Nuclear)# (3) Exhibit C (DOJ letter in SFI)# (4) Exhibit D (DOJ excerpt in PG&E)# (5) Exhibit E (DOJ excerpt in Yankee))(Chu, Jack)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 258 Filed: 12/16/2005, Entered: 12/16/2005
                                                                      JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by FLORIDA POWER AND LIGHT COMPANY, USA. (Chu, Jack)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 257 Filed: 12/8/2005, Entered: 12/8/2005 Court Filing
                                                                        ORDER granting [256] Motion for Extension of Time. JSR re further proceedings is due 12/16/05. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (dcl)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 12/8/2005, Entered: 12/8/2005
                                                                          Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/16/2005. (jat, )
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 256 Filed: 12/7/2005, Entered: 12/7/2005, Terminated: 12/8/2005 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                            Joint MOTION for Extension of Time until 12/16/05 to Respond To The Court's Order Dated October 7, 2005, filed by FLORIDA POWER AND LIGHT COMPANY. Response due by 12/27/2005. (Chu, Jack)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 255 Filed: 11/2/2005, Entered: 11/2/2005
                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Marian Elizabeth Sullivan for USA. (Sullivan, Marian)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 254 Filed: 10/7/2005, Entered: 10/7/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                ORDER continuing Stay until 11/30/2005. File a JSR w/ suggested sched for further proceedings nlt 12/7/2005. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir.(dcl)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 10/7/2005, Entered: 10/7/2005
                                                                                  Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/7/2005. (jat, )
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 253 Filed: 9/30/2005, Entered: 9/30/2005
                                                                                    JOINT STATUS REPORT AND MOTION TO CONTINUE STAY by all parties. (Chu, Jack)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 252 Filed: 8/1/2005, Entered: 8/1/2005
                                                                                      ORDER STAYING CASE pending CAFC's resolution of Indiana Michigan Power Co., Case No. 04-5122. Parties to file JSR every 60 days of any new developments in Indiana Michigan; and 30 days after CAFC opinion, of further proceedings. THE PREVIOUS ENTRY (251) IS TO BE STRIKEN FROM RECORD. (DCL)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 251 Filed: 8/1/2005, Entered: 8/1/2005, Terminated: 8/1/2005 Order Staying CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                        ORDER STAYING CASE pending CAFC's resolution of Indiana Michigan Power Co., Case No. 04-5122. Parties to file JSR every 60 days of any new developments in Indiana Michigan; and 30 days after CAFC opinion, of further proceedings. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (dcl) Modified on 8/1/2005 (jat, ). (See Order of 8/1/05 striking this document from the record)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 250 Filed: 7/27/2005, Entered: 7/27/2005
                                                                                          RESPONSE to [249] Order By The Parties filed by USA. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 249 Filed: 7/13/2005, Entered: 7/13/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                            ORDER requesting JSR on further proceedings, etc., nlt 7/27/05. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (dcl)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 7/13/2005, Entered: 7/13/2005
                                                                                              Set Deadlines/Hearings: Parties Joint Status Report due by 7/27/2005. (dw1)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 248 Filed: 6/17/2005, Entered: 6/17/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                PUBLISHED OPINION on [234] MOTION for Reconsideration re [232] Published Opinion, filed by FLORIDA POWER AND LIGHT COMPANY, Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (tm)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 247 Filed: 5/26/2005, Entered: 5/26/2005
                                                                                                  NOTICE by FLORIDA POWER AND LIGHT COMPANY of Federal Circuit Order Regarding Plaintiff's Petition for Permission to Appeal (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Tab A - May 17, 2005 Federal Circuit Order)(Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 246 Filed: 4/11/2005, Entered: 4/11/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER granting [242] Joint Motion for Extension of Time until 4/8/05 to response to Court's 3/21/05 Order. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (dcl)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document 245 Filed: 4/8/2005, Entered: 4/8/2005
                                                                                                      RESPONSE to [238] Order, filed by FLORIDA POWER AND LIGHT COMPANY. (Attachments: # (1) Duke Power Order# (2) NPPD Order)(Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 244 Filed: 4/8/2005, Entered: 4/8/2005
                                                                                                        RESPONSE to [238] Order, filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3))(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 243 Filed: 4/7/2005, Entered: 4/7/2005
                                                                                                        NOTICE of Change of Address by Jack Yee-Chieh Chu (Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 242 Filed: 4/6/2005, Entered: 4/6/2005, Terminated: 4/11/2005 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                          Joint MOTION for Extension of Time until 4/8/2005 to Respond To The Court's March 21, 2005 Order filed by USA. Response due by 4/25/2005 (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 241 Filed: 4/6/2005, Entered: 4/6/2005
                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Harold Dewitt Lester, Jr for USA. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 240 Filed: 3/30/2005, Entered: 3/30/2005
                                                                                                              NOTICE by FLORIDA POWER AND LIGHT COMPANY Of Federal Circuit Order Regarding Plaintiff's Petition For Permission To Appeal (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (March 25, 2005 Federal Circuit Order))(Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 239 Filed: 3/29/2005, Entered: 3/29/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT (Pg 1-38) of Proceedings held on 3/16/05 before Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (eph, )
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 238 Filed: 3/21/2005, Entered: 3/21/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER summarizing status conference held on March 16, 2005; directing parties to file simultaneous supplemental briefs by 4/6/05; and staying Transfer Order. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (dcl) Modified on 3/22/2005 to clarify docket text. (dls).
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 3/16/2005, Entered: 3/16/2005
                                                                                                                    Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 4/18/2005. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 237 Filed: 3/2/2005, Entered: 3/2/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                      STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference (on the record) set for 3/16/2005 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom, before Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. Counsel are to appear in person. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (dcl)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 236 Filed: 2/18/2005, Entered: 2/18/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER deferring ruling on [234] Motion for Reconsideration until informal Status Conference (in person) is held during Feb. 28 - Mar. 16, 2005. Contact Ms. Lawson w/ conference dates by Mar. 2, 2005. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (dcl)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 235 Filed: 2/10/2005, Entered: 2/10/2005
                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM by FLORIDA POWER AND LIGHT COMPANY. (Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 234 Filed: 2/10/2005, Entered: 2/10/2005, Terminated: 6/17/2005 Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                                                                            MOTION for Reconsideration re [232] Published Opinion,, by FLORIDA POWER AND LIGHT COMPANY. (Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 233 Filed: 2/2/2005, Entered: 2/3/2005 Notice of ReassignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Reassignment to Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (dls )
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 2/2/2005, Entered: 2/2/2005
                                                                                                                                ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Pursuant to RCFC 40.1(c), for the efficient administration of justice, this case is reassigned to Judge Lawrence M. Baskir for all further proceedings. Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 232 Filed: 1/31/2005, Entered: 1/31/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  PUBLISHED OPINION. Transferring plaintiffs Florida Power and Duke Power's breach of contract claims to the D.C. Circuit, dismissing plaintiffs Nebraska Public Power and PSEG Nuclear's breach of contract claims for lack of jurisdiction, certifying this opinion so that the parties may bring an interlocutory appeal to the Federal Circuit pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1292(c)(1); and staying the plaintiffs' remaining claims pending resolution of the jurisdictional issues raised in this opinion on appeal. Signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt. (wf1, ) Modified on 2/4/2005 to include interlocutory language. (dls ).
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 231 Filed: 1/4/2005, Entered: 1/4/2005
                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE TO [226] ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Brief in opposition to cert petition in Consolidated Edison v. US# (2) Appendix Petition for writ of cert US v. Northern States Power)(Finn, Stephen)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 230 Filed: 12/30/2004, Entered: 12/30/2004
                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Reconsideration re [229] Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by USA. Response due by 1/18/2005 (Herrmann, Heide)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 229 Filed: 12/27/2004, Entered: 12/27/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying [228] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Defendant's response to plaintiffs' responses to the court's October 14, 2004 show cause order due by 1/4/2005. Signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt.(wf1, )
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 228 Filed: 12/15/2004, Entered: 12/15/2004, Terminated: 12/27/2004 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [227] Response to Order to Show Cause,until 1/14/2004, by USA. Response due by 1/3/2005 (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 227 Filed: 11/12/2004, Entered: 11/12/2004
                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE TO [226] ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by FLORIDA POWER AND LIGHT COMPANY. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix To Plaintiffs' Response To The Court's October 14, 2004 Order To Show Cause)(Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 226 Filed: 10/14/2004, Entered: 10/14/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why complaint should not be dismissed or transferred to the D.C. Circuit for lack of jurisdiction. Show Cause Response due by 11/12/2004.Signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt. (wf1, )
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 225 Filed: 4/16/2004, Entered: 4/16/2004
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (jat, )
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 1/30/2004, Entered: 1/30/2004
                                                                                                                                              ORDER: The Court hereby DENIES [218] Dft's Second Motion to Renew its Motion to Consolidate as well as its previous motions relating to consolidation. The Court further LIFTS THE STAY of the remainder of the cases to which the Order of 4/16/2003, applied. The Clerk of the Court is directed to docket this Order in this case with an entry noting the same on the dockets of the remaining SNFcases captioned in Dft's instant motion, with a courtesy copy to all SNF parties and presiding SNF judges of the Court. [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT LOCATED IN CASE NO. 98-126C] Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 224 Filed: 12/2/2003, Entered: 12/5/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Counsel for Dft's Change of Facsimile Number by USA. Service: 12/2/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 223 Filed: 10/27/2003, Entered: 10/28/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER re: all filings in this case relating to issues of consolidation shall be captioned solely in the name of this case and shall show the name of the presiding judge in this case. A courtesy copy of any such filing relating to issues of consolidation shall be provided to the Clerk's Office for transmission to the Chief Judge. Signed by Judge Diane G. Sypolt. (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 222 Filed: 9/23/2003, Entered: 9/25/2003 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Pltfs' Responses to [218] Dft's Second MOTION to the Chief Judge to Renew Consideration of Dft's Motion to Consolidate filed by USA, Filed by Leave of the Judge. Service: 9/3/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 221 Filed: 9/23/2003, Entered: 9/25/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [220] Dft's Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to [219] Pltf's Opposition to Dft's Second Motion to Renew its Motion to Consolidate, until 9/3/03. The reply is filed by leave of the court. Reply due by 9/3/2003. Signed by Judge Diane G. Sypolt. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 220 Filed: 9/3/2003, Entered: 9/9/2003, Terminated: 9/23/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to [219] Pltfs' Responses to Dft's Second Motion to Renew Its Motion to Consolidate, until 9/3/03, by USA.Service: 9/3/03. Response due by 9/22/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 8/26/2003, Entered: 8/29/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to the Chief Judge for Extension of Time to File Reply to [219] Pltfs' Responses to Dft's Second Motion to Renew Its Motion to Consolidate, until 9/3/03, by USA. [Original document located in Case No. 98-126C]Service: 8/26/03. Response due by 9/12/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 219 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/29/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                            OPPOSITION to [218] Dft's Second MOTION to Renew Its Motion to Consolidate filed by FLORIDA POWER AND LIGHT COMPANY. Reply due by 8/29/2003. Service: 8/15/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 8/8/2003, Entered: 8/8/2003
                                                                                                                                                              Set/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 8/15/2003 (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 8/5/2003, Entered: 8/7/2003 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                Dft's Motion to the Chief Judge for Leave to Correct Certificate of Service and to Waive Requirements of RCFC 5.3 Regarding "Dft's Second Motion [to the Chief Judge] to Renew its Motion to Consolidate." (Original Motion located in Case No. 98-126C) (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 218 Filed: 7/30/2003, Entered: 7/31/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                  SECOND MOTION to Renew Its Motion to Consolidate by USA. [COPY] (Original Document in Case No. 98-126C)Service: 7/29/03 by hand. Response due by 8/12/2003.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 217 Filed: 6/18/2003, Entered: 6/20/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                    AMENDED REPLY in Support of [148] Cross Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on the Acceptance Rate filed by FLORIDA POWER AND LIGHT COMPANY. Service: 6/14/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 216 Filed: 6/18/2003, Entered: 6/20/2003 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER, finding no prejudice, and because the Court, in rendering a lead decision, may benefit from awareness of the arguments made by plaintiffs and the Government in other SNF cases, the Court denies Plaintiff's motion for reconsideration and granting [214] Motion for Leave to File Plaintiff's Amended Reply in Support of Its Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on the Acceptance Rate Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 215 Filed: 5/21/2003, Entered: 5/30/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER re: Defendant's Motion to Strike plaintiff's references to DOE's settlement agreement with PECO is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Diane G. Sypolt. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 214 Filed: 5/15/2003, Entered: 5/25/2003, Terminated: 6/18/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File its amended reply in support of its cross-motion for partial summary judgment on the accessable rate by FLORIDA POWER & LIGHT COMPANY.Service: 5/14/03. (hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 213 Filed: 5/2/2003, Entered: 5/5/2003 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fa
                                                                                                                                                                            Amended RESPONSE to PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact (together with a separate appendix) by The United States. Service: 4/25/03 by hand.(hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 212 Filed: 5/2/2003, Entered: 5/5/2003 Description not available
                                                                                                                                                                              Amended REPLY to Response re [20] Motion for Summary Judgment filed by The United States. Service: 4/25/03.(hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 211 Filed: 5/1/2003, Entered: 5/5/2003 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [210] Motion for Leave to File amended reply to motion for partial summary judgment. Plaintiff's motion, if any, for leave of the court to amend its 4/17/03 reply in support of its cross-motion for summary judgment, etc., shall be filed by 5/14/03. Signed by Judge Diane G. Sypolt. (hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 210 Filed: 4/25/2003, Entered: 4/30/2003, Terminated: 5/1/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File amended pleadings in response to plaintiff's response to defendant's motion for partial summary judgment regarding the rate of spent nuclear fuel acceptance and response to cross-motion for partial summary judgment by The United States.Service: 4/25/03. Response due by 5/12/2003 (hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 209 Filed: 4/21/2003, Entered: 4/25/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re [186] MOTION to Strike [154] Cross Motion filed by The United States. Service: 4/21/03.(dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 208 Filed: 4/18/2003, Entered: 4/25/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER cancelling the oral argument scheduled for 5/13/03 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Diane G. Sypolt. (hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 206 Filed: 4/17/2003, Entered: 4/23/2003 Description not available
                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY Motion re [154] Cross Motion (for partial summary judgment filed by FLORIDA POWER & LIGHT COMPANY. Service: 4/11/03.(hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 205 Filed: 4/17/2003, Entered: 4/23/2003 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [202] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Signed by Judge Diane G. Sypolt. (hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 207 Filed: 4/16/2003, Entered: 4/25/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 204 Filed: 4/14/2003, Entered: 4/18/2003 Notice of ReassignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Reassignment to Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt. (dls, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 203 Filed: 4/14/2003, Entered: 4/18/2003 Order Reassigning CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Diane G. Sypolt for all further proceedings. Judge Emily C. Hewitt no longer assigned to case Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (dls, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 202 Filed: 4/11/2003, Entered: 4/17/2003, Terminated: 4/17/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit of Reply Brief by 12 pages by FLORIDA POWER & LIGHT COMPANY.Service: 4/11/03. Response due by 4/28/2003. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 201 Filed: 4/11/2003, Entered: 4/17/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to Motion re [186] MOTION to Strike [154] Cross Motion filed by FLORIDA POWER & LIGHT COMPANY. Reply due by 4/28/2003. Service: 4/11/03.(dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 200 Filed: 4/7/2003, Entered: 4/14/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [199] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to the motion to strike and Reply to Plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment. Response to motion to strike and reply to Plaintiff's cross-motion due 4/11/2003. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 199 Filed: 4/4/2003, Entered: 4/9/2003, Terminated: 4/7/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to [186] MOTION to Strike [154] Cross Motion, (until April 11, 2003), by FLORIDA POWER & LIGHT COMPANY.Service: 4/4/03. Response due by 4/21/2003. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 198 Filed: 3/31/2003, Entered: 4/8/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of filing of amended certificate of service by The United States. Service: 3/19/03. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 197 Filed: 3/26/2003, Entered: 4/3/2003 Order Setting Oral Argument/Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion [80] Motion to Dismiss, [81] Motion for Summary Judgment, [84] Motion for Summary Judgment, [148] Cross Motion, [154] Cross Motion: Oral Argument set for 5/13/2003 10:00 AM in National Courts Building before Judge Emily C. Hewitt. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 196 Filed: 3/26/2003, Entered: 4/3/2003 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER denying [184] Motion to defer and consolidate Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 195 Filed: 3/25/2003, Entered: 3/28/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re [184] MOTION to defer scheduling argument filed by The United States. Service: 3/25/03 by hand.(dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 194 Filed: 3/21/2003, Entered: 3/25/2003 ResponseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to Florida Power & Light Company's "Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact" in support of "Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on the acceptance rate" filed by The United States, by leave of the Judge. Service: 3/19/03.(dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 193 Filed: 3/21/2003, Entered: 3/25/2003 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re [84] Motion for Summary Judgment filed by The United States, filed with a (1) one volume supplemental appendix, by leave of the Judge. Service: 3/19/03.(dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 192 Filed: 3/21/2003, Entered: 3/25/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER re: Pursuant to Rule 5.1(a) of the RCFC, the Defendant shall serve the "Reply Brief" and "Response to Plaintiff's Proposed Findings", by March 25, 2003. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 191 Filed: 3/21/2003, Entered: 3/25/2003 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [187] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 190 Filed: 3/19/2003, Entered: 3/21/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [185] Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to the motion for partial summary judgment. Reply due by 3/19/2003. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 189 Filed: 3/19/2003, Entered: 3/21/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to Motion re [184] MOTION to defer scheduling argument filed by FLORIDA POWER & LIGHT COMPANY. Reply due by 4/2/2003. Service: 3/19/03.(lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 187 Filed: 3/19/2003, Entered: 3/21/2003, Terminated: 3/21/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to Motion re [148] Cross Motion filed by The United States.Reply due by 4/7/2003. Service: 3/19/03.(dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 187 Filed: 3/19/2003, Entered: 3/21/2003, Terminated: 3/21/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit of Reply Brief by 24 pages by The United States. Service: 3/19/03. Response due by 4/7/2003. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 186 Filed: 3/19/2003, Entered: 3/21/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Strike portions of [154] Cross Motion by The United States.Service: 3/19/03. Response due by 4/7/2003. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 188 Filed: 3/18/2003, Entered: 3/21/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 185 Filed: 3/18/2003, Entered: 3/20/2003, Terminated: 3/19/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to the motion for partial summary judgment, re: rate of spent nuclear fuel acceptance by The United States.Service: 3/18/03. Response due by 4/4/2003. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 184 Filed: 3/14/2003, Entered: 3/17/2003, Terminated: 3/26/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to defer scheduling argumenti on pending motions by The United States.Service: 3/13/03. Response due by 3/31/2003. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 183 Filed: 3/11/2003, Entered: 3/12/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [182-1] motion to Extend Time to file reply to response to motion for partial summary judgment Reply to Response to Motion due 3/18/03 for [84-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment (signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 182 Filed: 3/10/2003, Entered: 3/11/2003, Terminated: 3/11/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 3/10/03) to Extend Time to file reply to response to motion for partial summary judgment , (until March 18, 2003). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 181 Filed: 3/7/2003, Entered: 3/10/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER re: See order [612-1] dated 3/7/03, in case 98-126C (signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 180 Filed: 3/3/2003, Entered: 3/6/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [179-1] motion for Leave to remove filings from under seal (signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 179 Filed: 2/27/2003, Entered: 3/5/2003, Terminated: 3/3/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by FLORIDA POWER (Service: 2/27/03) for Leave to remove filings from under seal . Response due: 3/17/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 178 Filed: 2/26/2003, Entered: 3/5/2003 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY, with one volume of appendix, by USA to response to [81-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment. Service: 2/21/03. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 177 Filed: 2/26/2003, Entered: 3/5/2003 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted FaCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Response by USA to [152-1] proposed findings by FLORIDA POWER. Service: 2/21/03. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 176 Filed: 2/26/2003, Entered: 3/5/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER to file Defendant's reply to the motion for partial summary judgment (signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 175 Filed: 2/26/2003, Entered: 3/5/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [171-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation (signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 174 Filed: 2/25/2003, Entered: 3/4/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [170-1] motion to Extend Time to file reply to the motion for partial summary judgment Reply to Response to Motion due 2/21/03 for [81-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment (signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt) Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 173 Filed: 2/25/2003, Entered: 3/4/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 172 Filed: 2/24/2003, Entered: 3/3/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 171 Filed: 2/21/2003, Entered: 2/27/2003, Terminated: 2/26/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 2/21/03) For leave to exceed the page limitation . Response due: 3/10/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 170 Filed: 2/19/2003, Entered: 2/26/2003, Terminated: 2/25/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 2/19/03) to Extend Time to file reply to the motion for partial summary judgment until 2/21/03. Response due: 3/10/03 (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 169 Filed: 2/5/2003, Entered: 2/13/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 167 Filed: 2/3/2003, Entered: 2/12/2003 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY by USA to response to [80-1] motion to Dismiss Count III of First Amended Complaint, by leave of the Judge. Service: 1/30/03. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 166 Filed: 2/3/2003, Entered: 2/12/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER re: Defendant's Reply to Response to Motion to Dismiss Count III shall be filed notwithstanding it's defeciencies (signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 168 Filed: 1/31/2003, Entered: 2/12/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 165 Filed: 1/29/2003, Entered: 2/7/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 164 Filed: 1/23/2003, Entered: 1/31/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER, re: see 98-126 C for order, etc. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 1/21/2003, Entered: 1/21/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Tele-conference held (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 162 Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: 1/21/2003 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of January 14, 2003. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 163 Filed: 1/14/2003, Entered: 1/27/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER mooting [160-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the cross-motion; to reply to the motion for summary judgment; and to reply to the motion to dismiss, mooting [155-1] motion to Extend Time within which to reply to response to motion for summary judgment. Set deadline of 1/30/03 for Defendant's reply brief regarding takings ; set deadline of 2/18/03 for Defendant's reply brief regarding greater than class c radioactive waste ; set deadline of 3/11/03 for Defendant's reply brief regarding the rate of spent nuclear fuel acceptance and response brief to Plaintiff's cross-motion regarding the rate of spent nuclear fuel acceptance; and set deadline of 3/25/03 for Plaintiff's reply brief regarding the rate of spent nuclear fuel acceptance. ( signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 161 Filed: 1/9/2003, Entered: 1/15/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 160 Filed: 1/9/2003, Entered: 1/13/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service: 1/8/03) to Extend Time to respond to the cross-motion; to reply to the motion for summary judgment; and to reply to the motion to dismiss . Response due: 1/27/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 159 Filed: 1/8/2003, Entered: 1/11/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER scheduling Telephone Status Conference for 10:00 a.m., 1/14/03 ( signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 158 Filed: 1/3/2003, Entered: 1/9/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [156-1] motion for Leave to place filings under seal temporarily (signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 157 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/7/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by FLORIDA POWER (Service: 1/2/03 ) to [155-1] motion to Extend Time within which to reply to response to motion for summary judgment. Reply due: 1/16/03 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 156 Filed: 12/30/2002, Entered: 1/3/2003, Terminated: 1/3/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by FLORIDA POWER (Service : 12/30/02 ) for Leave to place filings under seal temporarily . Response due: 1/13/03 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 155 Filed: 12/23/2002, Entered: 12/31/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 12/23/02 ) to Extend Time within which to reply to response to motion for summary judgment , (until January 10, 2003). Response due: 1/10/03 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 154 Filed: 12/13/2002, Entered: 12/16/2002 Cross MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CROSS MOTION, with appendix, by FLORIDA POWER (Service: 12/10/02) and RESPONSE to [81-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment by USA. Response due: 12/26/01. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 153 Filed: 12/13/2002, Entered: 12/16/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER to file Plaintiff's motion and appendix (signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 152 Filed: 12/13/2002, Entered: 12/16/2002 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted FactCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by FLORIDA POWER. Service: 12/10/02. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 151 Filed: 12/13/2002, Entered: 12/16/2002 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted FaCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Response by FLORIDA POWER to [82-1] proposed findings by USA. Service: 12/10/02. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 150 Filed: 12/13/2002, Entered: 12/16/2002 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by FLORIDA POWER. Service: 12/10/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 149 Filed: 12/13/2002, Entered: 12/16/2002 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fa
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Response by FLORIDA POWER to [85-1] proposed findings by USA. Service: 12/10/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 148 Filed: 12/13/2002, Entered: 12/16/2002 Cross Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CROSS MOTION, with one volume of appendix, by FLORIDA POWER (Service: 12/10/02) and RESPONSE to [84-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment by USA. Response due: 1/10/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 147 Filed: 12/13/2002, Entered: 12/16/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [145-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation (signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 12/13/2002, Entered: 12/16/2002 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Deadline updated; Response to [148-1] cross motion due 1/10/03 . (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 144 Filed: 12/11/2002, Entered: 12/12/2002 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of reassignment to Judge Emily C. Hewitt . Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 146 Filed: 12/10/2002, Entered: 12/13/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by FLORIDA POWER (Service: 12/10/02 ) to [80-1] motion to Dismiss Count III of First Amended Complaint. Reply due: 12/27/02. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 145 Filed: 12/10/2002, Entered: 12/13/2002, Terminated: 12/13/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by FLORIDA POWER (Service : 12/10/02 ) For leave to exceed the page limitation (enlarge page limit to 80 pages). (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 143 Filed: 12/3/2002, Entered: 12/4/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [142-1] motion to Extend Time to file response to the motions for summary judgment and the motion to dismiss Florida Power's takings count Response to [81-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment due 12/10/02, [80-1] motion to Dismiss Count III of First Amended Complaint due 12/10/02 (signed by Chief Judge J. Damich). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 142 Filed: 11/21/2002, Entered: 11/25/2002, Terminated: 12/3/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by FLORIDA POWER (Service: 11/21/02) to Extend Time to file response to the motions for summary judgment and the motion to dismiss Florida Power's takings count . until 12/10/02. Response due: 12/9/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 141 Filed: 10/16/2002, Entered: 10/18/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow for Judge Diane Gibert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 140 Filed: 10/9/2002, Entered: 10/11/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER see 98-126C for Order. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 139 Filed: 9/10/2002, Entered: 9/16/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 138 Filed: 9/5/2002, Entered: 9/9/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 137 Filed: 8/22/2002, Entered: 8/27/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 136 Filed: 8/20/2002, Entered: 8/22/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 135 Filed: 8/16/2002, Entered: 8/21/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 134 Filed: 8/5/2002, Entered: 8/7/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 133 Filed: 7/30/2002, Entered: 8/5/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 132 Filed: 7/29/2002, Entered: 8/1/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER re: see order [467-1] dated 7/29/02, in case No. 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 131 Filed: 7/23/2002, Entered: 7/26/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 130 Filed: 7/16/2002, Entered: 7/18/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 129 Filed: 7/15/2002, Entered: 7/17/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 128 Filed: 7/10/2002, Entered: 7/12/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 127 Filed: 7/9/2002, Entered: 7/11/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER - see 98-126C for Order. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 126 Filed: 7/3/2002, Entered: 7/3/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 125 Filed: 7/2/2002, Entered: 7/3/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER-see Order in 98-126C ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 124 Filed: 6/28/2002, Entered: 7/1/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER-see Order in 98-126C ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 123 Filed: 6/18/2002, Entered: 6/19/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C.(signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (VO)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 122 Filed: 6/17/2002, Entered: 6/18/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER, Re: see order in 98-126C. (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt) Copy to parties. (VO)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 121 Filed: 6/6/2002, Entered: 6/11/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER, re order in 98-126, filed 6/6/02. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 120 Filed: 6/4/2002, Entered: 6/4/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER, re: see order in 98-126, filed 6/03/02. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (FE) Modified on 06/04/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 119 Filed: 5/28/2002, Entered: 5/29/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 118 Filed: 5/20/2002, Entered: 5/21/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 117 Filed: 5/9/2002, Entered: 5/10/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER re: See [395-1] order in case No. 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 116 Filed: 5/7/2002, Entered: 5/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 115 Filed: 5/7/2002, Entered: 5/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 114 Filed: 5/6/2002, Entered: 5/7/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 113 Filed: 5/3/2002, Entered: 5/3/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 112 Filed: 4/26/2002, Entered: 4/29/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER, re: see order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 111 Filed: 4/23/2002, Entered: 4/24/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 110 Filed: 4/18/2002, Entered: 4/18/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER, Re: see order in 98-126 ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (VO) Modified on 04/18/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 109 Filed: 4/11/2002, Entered: 4/11/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER re: see order [344-2] dated 4/11/02 in Case No. 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 108 Filed: 3/25/2002, Entered: 3/26/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, re: see order in 98-126 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 107 Filed: 3/19/2002, Entered: 3/20/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER, re: Defendant's response to the motion for reconsideration and clarification of the 3/5/02 order due 3/22/02 (signed by Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 106 Filed: 3/18/2002, Entered: 3/19/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [105-1] motion to Withdraw [96-1] motion to lift stay on Plaintiff's response to the Motion to Dismiss Count III of Plaintiff's first amended complaint by USA (signed by Judge Sarah L. Wilson). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 105 Filed: 3/8/2002, Entered: 3/11/2002, Terminated: 3/18/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service: 3/7/02) to Withdraw [96-1] motion to lift stay on Plaintiff's response to the Motion to Dismiss Count III of Plaintiff's first amended complaint by USA . (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 104 Filed: 3/5/2002, Entered: 3/6/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER denying Motion to preclude or, in the alternative, defer, depositions pursuant to Rule 30(b)(6) (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 103 Filed: 2/28/2002, Entered: 3/1/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting Motion to Extend Time to respond to interrogatories until 3/8/02 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 102 Filed: 2/28/2002, Entered: 3/1/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service: 2/28/02) to Extend Time to file reply the the Motion to Lift Stay on Briefing of the Motion to Dismiss Count Three of the complaint until 3/7/02. Response due: 3/18/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 101 Filed: 2/20/2002, Entered: 2/21/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, re: SEE CASE NO. 98-126 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 100 Filed: 2/15/2002, Entered: 2/19/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by FLORIDA POWER (Service: 2/15/02 ) to [96-1] motion to lift stay on Plaintiff's response to the Motion to Dismiss Count III of Plaintiff's first amended complaint. Reply due: 3/4/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 99 Filed: 2/13/2002, Entered: 2/14/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER, re: see order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 98 Filed: 2/1/2002, Entered: 2/4/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER. See order in 98-126C filed 2/1/02. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 97 Filed: 2/1/2002, Entered: 2/4/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying motion to reconsider filed 1/22/02 and granting the motion to revise dates in 9/26/01 order filed 1/24/02 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 96 Filed: 1/29/2002, Entered: 1/30/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 1/29/02) to lift stay on Plaintiff's response to the Motion to Dismiss Count III of Plaintiff's first amended complaint . Response due: 2/15/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 95 Filed: 1/29/2002, Entered: 1/29/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER setting Status Conference for 2:00 p.m. on 2/12/02 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 94 Filed: 1/15/2002, Entered: 1/16/2002 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: status conference, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of January 11, 2002. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 93 Filed: 1/11/2002, Entered: 1/14/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [20-1] motion for Summary Judgment (signed by Judge Sarah L. Wilson). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 92 Filed: 1/11/2002, Entered: 1/14/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER see order in 98-126C filed 1/11/02. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 1/11/2002, Entered: 1/14/2002 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Status Conference held ( Transcript due 1/16/02 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 91 Filed: 1/10/2002, Entered: 1/11/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [87-1] motion for a status conference Status Conference for 10:00 a.m. 1/11/02 (signed by Judge Sarah L. Wilson). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 1/10/2002, Entered: 1/11/2002 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Status Conference set at 10:00 a.m. on 1/11/02 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 89 Filed: 1/4/2002, Entered: 1/5/2002 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by USA (Service: 1/2/02 ) to [87-1] motion for a status conference filed by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 1/16/02. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 90 Filed: 1/3/2002, Entered: 1/7/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER see order in 98-126C filed 01/03/02 ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 88 Filed: 12/21/2001, Entered: 12/27/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by FLORIDA POWER (Service: 12/21/01) to Extend Time to file a response to the Motion for partial Summary Judgment until 1/25/02. Response due: 1/7/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 87 Filed: 12/14/2001, Entered: 12/17/2001, Terminated: 1/10/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by FLORIDA POWER (Service: 12/14/01) for a status conference . Response due: 1/2/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 86 Filed: 11/30/2001, Entered: 12/16/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [83-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation. ( signed by Judge Sarah L. Wilson ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 85 Filed: 11/30/2001, Entered: 12/3/2001 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact regarding the rate of spent nuclear fuel acceptance filed by USA. Service: 11/28/01. (LTD) Modified on 12/13/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 84 Filed: 11/30/2001, Entered: 12/3/2001 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION, with one volume of Appendix, by USA (Service: 11/28/01) for partial Summary Judgment regarding the rate of spent nuclear fuel acceptance. Response due: 12/31/01. (LTD) Modified on 12/13/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 83 Filed: 11/29/2001, Entered: 11/30/2001, Terminated: 11/30/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service by hand: 11/28/01) For leave to exceed the page limitation . Response due: 12/12/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 82 Filed: 11/28/2001, Entered: 11/30/2001 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact regarding plaintiff's greater than Class C radioactive waste arguments filed by USA. Service: 11/27/01. (LTD) Modified on 12/13/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 81 Filed: 11/28/2001, Entered: 11/30/2001 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION, with one volume of Appendix, by USA (Service by hand: 11/27/01) for partial Summary Judgment regarding plaintiff's greater than Class C radioactive waste arguments. Response due: 12/26/01. (LTD) Modified on 12/13/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 80 Filed: 11/27/2001, Entered: 11/29/2001 Description not available
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service by hand: 11/27/01) to Dismiss Count III of First Amended Complaint . Response due: 12/26/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 79 Filed: 11/20/2001, Entered: 11/21/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER see order in 98-126C filed 11/20/01 ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 78 Filed: 11/16/2001, Entered: 11/19/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER see order in 98-126C filed 11/16/01. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 77 Filed: 11/14/2001, Entered: 11/16/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER see order in 98-126C filed 11/14/01. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 76 Filed: 11/14/2001, Entered: 11/16/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER see order in 98-126C filed 11/14/01. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 75 Filed: 11/8/2001, Entered: 11/9/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER. See 98-126C. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 74 Filed: 11/8/2001, Entered: 11/9/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER. See 98-126C. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 73 Filed: 11/7/2001, Entered: 11/8/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting the Motion for Enlargement of Time to respond to the Motion to Compel (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 72 Filed: 11/6/2001, Entered: 11/7/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting motion to enlarge time to respond to motion to compel production of documents to 11/06/01 ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 71 Filed: 11/6/2001, Entered: 11/7/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER re: Public Service Electric and Gas motion to extend time filed on 11/2/01, within which to respond to the defendant's motion to compel is GRANTED (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (see motion filed in 98-126C) (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 70 Filed: 11/6/2001, Entered: 11/7/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting the motion to enlarge time to complete production of documents to 11/19/01 ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 69 Filed: 11/1/2001, Entered: 11/5/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying motion for clarification (refer to lead case 98-126C). Individual Judges retain the right to decide dispositive motions. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 68 Filed: 10/30/2001, Entered: 11/1/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER re: proposed stipulated order ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 67 Filed: 10/29/2001, Entered: 10/31/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting Defendant's Motion for leave to file Transfer responsiblity, etc. and granting Plaintiff's Motion for leave to file copies of Pliantiff's response to transfer motion (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 66 Filed: 10/19/2001, Entered: 10/22/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER re: All filings shall bear the name of the discovery Judge, all matters to be brought to the attention of the Court shall be filed with the discovery Judge only, the Clerk of the Court is directed not to accept for filing any motion by a party in one of the captioned cases for leave to file material with a Judge in an individual case ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE) Modified on 10/30/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 65 Filed: 10/18/2001, Entered: 10/19/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER directing the Clerk's Office to file Defendant's response and the Defendant's corrected certificate of service is due 10/25/01 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (LTD) Modified on 10/30/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 64 Filed: 10/17/2001, Entered: 10/18/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER re: Defendant's motion to extend time filed on 10/15/01, within which to file the proposed stipulated order concerning the scheduling and conduct of depositions in the coordinated discovery proceeding, is GRANTED, see motion in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ). Copy to parties. (FE) Modified on 10/30/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 63 Filed: 10/12/2001, Entered: 10/30/2001 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Copy of utility plaintiffs' motion [filed in 98-126C] for clarification of September 26, 2001, order filed by FLORIDA POWER [by leave of the judge]. Service: 10/9/01 (DS) Modified on 10/30/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 62 Filed: 10/12/2001, Entered: 10/16/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by FLORIDA POWER (Service: 10/10/01) for Leave to file motion that the utility plaintiffs have filed with the discovery Judge , by leave of the Judge. Response due: 10/29/01. (FE) Modified on 10/30/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 61 Filed: 10/3/2001, Entered: 10/4/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [60-1] motion to Extend Time to submit a plan for the production of e-mail messages Plan is to be filed by 10/22/01 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 60 Filed: 10/3/2001, Entered: 10/4/2001, Terminated: 10/3/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 10/1/01) to Extend Time to submit a plan for the production of e-mail messages until 10/22/01. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 59 Filed: 9/26/2001, Entered: 9/26/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER re: The Joint Motion for an Order for Consoidated Discovery filed on 7/10/01, is granted, with the exception of document production, the parties are granted an enlargement of time until 10/1/01, to submit a plan addressing the production of e-mail messages (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 9/20/2001, Entered: 10/30/2001 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Status Conference held (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 58 Filed: 9/13/2001, Entered: 9/13/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER setting Status Conference for 4:00 p.m. on 9/20/01 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 57 Filed: 9/5/2001, Entered: 9/6/2001 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of reassignment to Judge Sarah L. Wilson . Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 56 Filed: 9/5/2001, Entered: 9/6/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER transferring case to Judge Sarah Wilson. ( signed by Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 55 Filed: 8/31/2001, Entered: 9/4/2001 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by FLORIDA POWER to [49-3] order. Reply 9/14/01. Service: 8/31/01 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 54 Filed: 8/22/2001, Entered: 8/22/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting motion for protective order in the form provided by Exhibit A of the parties 08/10/01 motion (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). See case number 98-126 C for motion. Protective order in 98-458 C is also granted, subject to reconsideration by assigned judge. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 53 Filed: 8/15/2001, Entered: 8/16/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER setting Status Conference for 2:00 p.m. on 9/11/01 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein, Discovery Judge). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 52 Filed: 8/15/2001, Entered: 8/15/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by USA to [49-3] order. Service: 8/15/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 51 Filed: 8/9/2001, Entered: 8/10/2001 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of reassignment to Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir . Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 50 Filed: 8/9/2001, Entered: 8/10/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER reassigning case to Chief Judge Baskir (signed by Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 49 Filed: 8/3/2001, Entered: 8/6/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [47-1] joint motion for an order for coordinated discovery, granting in part, denying in part [46-1] motion for Leave to file in this case a copy of filings made before Judge Wiese as managing Judge Defendant shall show cause by 8/17/01 and Reply due: 9/14/01 for USA, Response due: 8/31/01 for FLORIDA POWER ( signed by Judge Roger B. Andewelt). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 48 Filed: 8/3/2001, Entered: 8/6/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by FLORIDA POWER (Service: 7/9/01) for Leave to file proposed order concerning liability in Spent Nuclear Fuel cases . (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 47 Filed: 8/3/2001, Entered: 8/6/2001, Terminated: 8/3/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    JOINT MOTION by FLORIDA POWER and USA for an order for coordinated discovery . (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 46 Filed: 7/13/2001, Entered: 7/16/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service: 7/13/01) for Leave to file in this case a copy of filings made before Judge Wiese as managing Judge . (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 45 Filed: 7/5/2001, Entered: 7/6/2001 RemarkCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Copy of Yankee Atomic's Motion for Leave to file documents relevant to the telephone conference with Judge Wiese. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 44 Filed: 5/31/2001, Entered: 6/1/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER resetting Status Conference for 2:30 p.m. on 6/14/01 (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 43 Filed: 5/29/2001, Entered: 5/31/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER setting Status Conference for 10:30 a.m. on 6/14/01 (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 42 Filed: 5/22/2001, Entered: 5/25/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER: On 1/8/2001, Dft filed a [25-1] Motion to the Chief Judge to reassign to a single Judge cases involving alleged breaches of the standard contract published at 10 C.F.R. part 961. The Chief Judge hereby designates Judge Wiese as the managing judge in the above cited cases for the purpose of meeting with the parties to consider whether consolidation or other joint handling of discovery or other pre-trial matters is appropriate. Judge Wiese is requested to formulate a management plan, if one is appropriate, and is authorized to make appropriate rulings with respect to this purpose. (signed by Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir). Judge Wiese is designated as managing judge. Copy to parties. (LTD) Modified on 3/17/2004 (jcp, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 41 Filed: 5/11/2001, Entered: 5/14/2001 RemarkCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                *** Copies of Plaintiffs' memorandum in opposition to the United States' motion to the Chief Judge to reassign to a single Judge the fourteen pending standard contract cases filed in 98-483 C. *** (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 40 Filed: 2/22/2001, Entered: 2/23/2001 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by YANKEE UTILITIES (Service: 1/29/01 ) to [25-1] motion to the Chief Judge to reassign to a single Judge cases involving alleged breaches of the standard contract published at 10 C.F.R. part 961, (together with a separate appendix). Reply due: 2/12/01. (HW) Modified on 02/23/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 39 Filed: 2/22/2001, Entered: 2/23/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [35-1] motion for Leave to file in this case a copy of "Yankee Utilities" opposition to motion to reassign cases ( signed by Judge Roger B. Andewelt ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 38 Filed: 2/22/2001, Entered: 2/23/2001 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY by USA to response to [25-1] motion to the Chief Judge to reassign to a single Judge cases involving alleged breaches of the standard contract published at 10 C.F.R. part 961. Service: 2/16/01 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 37 Filed: 2/20/2001, Entered: 2/23/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [36-1] motion for Leave to file a copy of the reply to the opposition to the motion to the Chief Judge to reassign to a single Judge cases involving alleged breaches of the standard contract, etc. (signed by Judge Roger B. Andewelt). Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 36 Filed: 2/20/2001, Entered: 2/22/2001, Terminated: 2/20/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service: 2/20/01) for Leave to file a copy of the reply to the opposition to the motion to the Chief Judge to reassign to a single Judge cases involving alleged breaches of the standard contract, etc. . Response due: 3/9/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 35 Filed: 2/20/2001, Entered: 2/22/2001, Terminated: 2/22/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by FLORIDA POWER (Service: 2/20/01) for Leave to file in this case a copy of "Yankee Utilities" opposition to motion to reassign cases . Response due: 2/20/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 34 Filed: 2/5/2001, Entered: 2/6/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by FLORIDA POWER (Service: 2/5/01) to [26-1] motion to Stay proceedings. Reply due: 2/20/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 33 Filed: 2/2/2001, Entered: 2/5/2001 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by FLORIDA POWER (Service by hand: 1/29/01) to [25-1] motion to the Chief Judge to reassign to a single Judge cases involving alleged breaches of the standard contract published at 10 C.F.R. part 961. Reply due: 2/7/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 32 Filed: 2/2/2001, Entered: 2/5/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [31-1] motion for Leave to file a copy of "Plaintiff's memorandum in opposition to the USA's motion to the Chief Judge to reassign to a single Judge the Fourteen pending standard contract cases" (signed by Judge Roger B. Andewelt). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 31 Filed: 1/30/2001, Entered: 1/30/2001, Terminated: 2/2/2001 Motion for Leave to FileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by FLORIDA POWER (Service: 1/30/01) for Leave to file a copy of "Plaintiff's memorandum in opposition to the USA's motion to the Chief Judge to reassign to a single Judge the Fourteen pending standard contract cases" . (FE) Modified on 01/30/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 30 Filed: 1/29/2001, Entered: 1/30/2001 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by FLORIDA POWER (Service y hand: 1/29/01) to [25-1] motion to the Chief Judge to reassign to a single Judge cases involving alleged breaches of the standard contract published at 10 C.F.R. part 961. Reply due: 2/12/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 29 Filed: 1/25/2001, Entered: 1/25/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY by FLORIDA POWER to response to [19-1] motion to set coordinated discovery schedule. Service: 1/25/01. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 28 Filed: 1/24/2001, Entered: 1/24/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [23-1] motion to Extend Time within which to file reply to response to motion to set coordinated discovery schedule . Reply to Response to Motion reset to 1/25/01 for [19-1] motion to set coordinated discovery schedule ( signed by Judge Roger B. Andewelt ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 27 Filed: 1/22/2001, Entered: 1/23/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by FLORIDA POWER (Service by hand: 1/22/01) to Extend Time to respond to the USA's motion to reassign cases to a single Judge , (until January 29, 2001). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 26 Filed: 1/19/2001, Entered: 1/22/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 1/19/01) to Stay proceedings , pending Chief Judge's resolution of the motion to reassign to a single Judge cases involving alleged breaches of teh standard contract published at 10 C.F.R. part 961. Response due: 2/5/01 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 25 Filed: 1/18/2001, Entered: 1/19/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service: 1/8/01) to the Chief Judge to reassign to a single Judge cases involving alleged breaches of the standard contract published at 10 C.F.R. part 961 , filed by leave of the Judge, pursuant to 1/18/01 Order. Response due: 1/25/01 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 24 Filed: 1/18/2001, Entered: 1/19/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [21-1] motion for Leave to file a copy of the motion to reassign to a single Judge cases involving alleged breaches of the standard contract, etc. ( signed by Judge Roger B. Andewelt ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 23 Filed: 1/18/2001, Entered: 1/19/2001, Terminated: 1/24/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by FLORIDA POWER (Service : 1/18/01 ) to Extend Time within which to file reply to response to motion to set coordinated discovery schedule , (until January 25, 2001). (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 22 Filed: 1/8/2001, Entered: 1/9/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by USA (Service: 1/8/01 ) to [19-1] motion to set coordinated discovery schedule. Reply due: 1/22/01. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 21 Filed: 1/8/2001, Entered: 1/9/2001, Terminated: 1/18/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 1/8/01 ) for Leave to file a copy of the motion to reassign to a single Judge cases involving alleged breaches of the standard contract, etc. Response due: 1/25/01 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 20 Filed: 1/5/2001, Entered: 1/8/2001, Terminated: 1/11/2002 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by FLORIDA POWER (Service: 12/20/00) for Summary Judgment , by leave of the Judge. Response due: 1/22/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 19 Filed: 12/20/2000, Entered: 12/27/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by FLORIDA POWER (Service: 12/20/00) to set coordinated discovery schedule . Response due: 1/8/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 18 Filed: 12/15/2000, Entered: 12/18/2000 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of change of address by Alexander D. Tomaszczuk. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 17 Filed: 11/8/2000, Entered: 11/11/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting in part [15-1] motion to Stay. Proceedings are stayed pending the Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit's issuance of mandates in Northern States Power and Maine Yankee Atomic Power. ( signed by Judge Roger B. Andewelt ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 11/11/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 16 Filed: 11/6/2000, Entered: 11/8/2000 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by FLORIDA POWER (Service: 11/6/00 ) to [15-1] motion to Stay. Reply due: 11/20/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 15 Filed: 10/30/2000, Entered: 10/31/2000, Terminated: 11/8/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 10/30/00 ) to Stay. Response due: 11/16/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 14 Filed: 10/6/2000, Entered: 10/10/2000 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by FLORIDA POWER (Answer due 10/19/00) amending [1-1] complaint. Service: 10/6/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 13 Filed: 10/4/2000, Entered: 10/6/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [12-1] motion to Extend Time to file status report. Reset Defendant's Status Report deadline to 10/30/00. ( signed by Judge Roger B. Andewelt ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 12 Filed: 10/2/2000, Entered: 10/5/2000, Terminated: 10/4/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service: 10/2/00) to Extend Time to file status report until 10/30/00. Response due: 10/19/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 11 Filed: 9/29/2000, Entered: 10/3/2000 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT by FLORIDA POWER Service: 9/29/00 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 10 Filed: 1/21/2000, Entered: 1/24/2000 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of filing "Joint Proposed Scheduling Order" by FLORIDA POWER and USA, by leave of the Judge. Service: 1/21/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 9 Filed: 7/30/1999, Entered: 7/30/1999 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [8-1] motion to continue stay. On or before the date 30 days after the Federal Circuit renders its final decision in Northern States, the parties shall file a status report. ( signed by Judge Roger B. Andewelt ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 8 Filed: 7/20/1999, Entered: 7/20/1999, Terminated: 7/30/1999 Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 7/20/99 (by hand)) to continue stay. Response due: 8/3/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 7 Filed: 5/20/1999, Entered: 6/1/1999 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of change of address by Alexander D. Tomaszczuk. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 6 Filed: 9/23/1998, Entered: 9/25/1998 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Marian Elizabeth Sullivan. Service: 9/23/98. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 5 Filed: 6/17/1998, Entered: 6/18/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by FLORIDA POWER (Service : 6/17/98 ) to Consolidate Cases 98-483C, 98-484C, 98-485C and 98-486C. (AB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 4 Filed: 6/17/1998, Entered: 6/18/1998 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Joseph Andrew Kijewski Service : 6/17/98 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 3 Filed: 6/8/1998, Entered: 6/9/1998 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of assignment to Judge Roger B. Andewelt. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 2 Filed: 6/8/1998, Entered: 6/9/1998 Notice of Related Cases
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by FLORIDA POWER of related case; (98-126 C, 98-154 C and 98-474 C). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 6/8/1998, Entered: 6/9/1998 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #045627. Answer due on 8/7/98. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 6/8/1998, Entered: 6/9/1998 Set/Clear Flags
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 158 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?