NORTHERN STATES v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:98-cv-00484-JPW
District Judge John P. Wiese, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Northern States Power Company, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alexander D. Tomaszczuk +1 703 770 7940 +1 703 770 7901 alex.tomaszczuk@pillsburylaw.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew P. Averbach +1 202 353 0527 +1 202 305 2118 andrew.averbach@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 6/8/1998
Jury Demand None
Demand $1000000000
Nature of Suit 536 - Spent Nuclear Fuel
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Judgment
County None
Terminated 9/26/2007
Origin 4
Reopened 12/19/2000
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Cases '08-5037'[], '2008-5041'[]
Def Custody Status
Flags APPEAL, CLOSED, CRSAPP, ECF
  Entries (348) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 326 Filed: 2/21/2008, Entered: 2/21/2008
CAFC Case Number 08-5041 for [325] Notice of Cross Appeal filed by NORTHERN STATES POWER COMPANY. (hw1, )
    LREF
    Legal Document 325 Filed: 2/13/2008, Entered: 2/14/2008 Notice of cross-appeal
    NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL, filed by NORTHERN STATES POWER COMPANY. Filing fee $ 455.00, receipt number 067666. (hw1, )
      LREF
      Legal Document 324 Filed: 2/13/2008, Entered: 2/13/2008
      CAFC Case Number 08-5037 for [323] Notice of Appeal filed by USA. (hw1, )
        LREF
        Legal Document 323 Filed: 2/8/2008, Entered: 2/8/2008
        NOTICE OF APPEAL, filed by USA. Copies to judge, opposing party and CAFC. (hw1, )
          LREF
          Legal Document 321 Filed: 12/12/2007, Entered: 12/12/2007 Court Filing
          ORDER denying [318] Motion for Reconsideration - Rule 59(a). Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (jwg)
            LREF
            Legal Document 322 Filed: 12/11/2007, Entered: 12/27/2007 Certified Transcript to Attorney
            CERTIFIED TRANSCRIPT OF JUDGMENT, forwarded to Alexander D. Tomaszczuk. See letter in file. (bre,)
              LREF
              Legal Document 320 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: 11/13/2007
              RESPONSE to [318] MOTION for Reconsideration - Rule 59(a), filed by NORTHERN STATES POWER COMPANY.Reply due by 11/26/2007. (Herzfeld, Daniel)
                LREF
                Legal Document 319 Filed: 10/16/2007, Entered: 10/16/2007 Court Filing
                ORDER requesting response to [318] Motion for Reconsideration - Rule 59(a) on or before 11/13/2007. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (jwg)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 318 Filed: 10/11/2007, Entered: 10/11/2007, Terminated: 12/12/2007 Motion for Reconsideration - Rule 59(a)
                  MOTION for Reconsideration - Rule 59(a), filed by USA.(Averbach, Andrew)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 317 Filed: 9/27/2007, Entered: 9/27/2007 Court Filing
                    ORDER REGARDING DEFERRED RULINGS: Defendant's 11/30/01 motion for partial summary judgment, plaintiff's 12/13/02 cross-motion, defendnat's 11/28/01 motion for partial summary judgment, and defendant's 11/27/01 motion to dismiss are denied without prejudice to their reassertion at a later date based on a different set of facts. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (jwg)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 316 Filed: 9/26/2007, Entered: 9/26/2007
                      JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the plaintiff recover of and from the United States, as damages for Department of Energy's partial breach of contract, measured through December 31, 2004, the sum of $116,485,000.00. (lld)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 315 Filed: 9/26/2007, Entered: 9/26/2007 Court Filing
                        OPINION: Plaintiff is entitled to recover as damages for DOE's partial breach of contract, measured through December 31, 2004, the sum of $116,485,000. The Clerk shall enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (jwg)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 314 Filed: 8/8/2007, Entered: 8/8/2007
                          RESPONSE to [313] Notice of Additional Authority, filed by NORTHERN STATES POWER COMPANY. (Herzfeld, Daniel)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 313 Filed: 8/2/2007, Entered: 8/2/2007
                            NOTICE of Additional Authority (Averbach, Andrew)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 312 Filed: 7/12/2007, Entered: 7/12/2007 Court Filing
                              ORDER granting [311] Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (jwg)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 311 Filed: 7/11/2007, Entered: 7/11/2007, Terminated: 7/12/2007 Motion to Seal
                                MOTION to Seal Trial Transcript Pages and Exhibits, filed by NORTHERN STATES POWER COMPANY.Response due by 7/30/2007.(Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 6/14/2007, Entered: 6/14/2007 Court Filing
                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 5392-5628) 2007 before Senior Judge John P. Wiese. (dw1)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 6/4/2007, Entered: 6/4/2007
                                    Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 6/5/2007. (vp1, )
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 309 Filed: 5/16/2007, Entered: 5/16/2007
                                      POST TRIAL BRIEF (reply brief), filed by USA. (Averbach, Andrew)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 308 Filed: 5/11/2007, Entered: 5/11/2007, Terminated: 9/26/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                        Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Attachment 1, filed by NORTHERN STATES POWER COMPANY.Response due by 5/29/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Attachment 1)(Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 307 Filed: 5/8/2007, Entered: 5/8/2007 Court Filing
                                          ORDER returning submissions of Mr. William D. Peterson. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (jwg)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 306 Filed: 4/27/2007, Entered: 4/27/2007
                                            POST TRIAL BRIEF Reply, filed by NORTHERN STATES POWER COMPANY. (Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 305 Filed: 4/26/2007, Entered: 4/26/2007
                                              RESPONSE to Mr. William (Bill) Peterson's Motion To Intervene And Complaint, dated April 7, 2007, filed by USA. (Lester, Harold)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 304 Filed: 4/23/2007, Entered: 4/23/2007 Court Filing
                                                ORDER granting [303] Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until April 27, 2007 to File Post-Trial Reply Brief. Reply due by 4/27/2007; Sur-reply due by 5/16/2007. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (jwg)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 303 Filed: 4/18/2007, Entered: 4/18/2007, Terminated: 4/23/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until April 27, 2007 to File Response or Reply Post-Trial Brief, filed by NORTHERN STATES POWER COMPANY.Response due by 5/7/2007.(Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 302 Filed: 4/11/2007, Entered: 4/13/2007 Transcript - Cumulative Index
                                                    Cumulative Index for TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-23) held on October 24, 2006 through December 11, 2006 filed with plaintiff and defendant exhibits. Plaintiff exhibits [85,220(dvd),435,440,1057] filed under seal and defendants exhibits [191 and 210] filed under seal. (dw1)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 301 Filed: 4/10/2007, Entered: 4/10/2007
                                                      NOTICE, filed by USA re [296] Post Trial Brief of reference to materials in administrative record not referenced at trial (Averbach, Andrew)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 300 Filed: 4/5/2007, Entered: 4/5/2007 Court Filing
                                                        ORDER Admitting Deposition Designations and Counter-Designations into Evidence. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (jwg)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 299 Filed: 3/29/2007, Entered: 3/29/2007 Court Filing
                                                          ORDER granting [297] Motion Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (jwg)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 298 Filed: 3/27/2007, Entered: 3/27/2007
                                                            NOTICE, filed by USA re [291] Notice (Other) of filing of counter-designations of deposition testimony (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit table of counter-designations# (2) Exhibit counter-designations -- part 1# (3) Exhibit counter-designations -- part 2# (4) Exhibit counter-designations -- part 3# (5) Exhibit counter-designations -- part 4)(Averbach, Andrew)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 297 Filed: 3/27/2007, Entered: 3/27/2007, Terminated: 3/29/2007 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                              MOTION to admit defendant's exhibit 191 into evidence, filed by USA.Response due by 4/13/2007.(Averbach, Andrew) Modified on 3/29/2007 to edit docket text. (Samler, Debbie).
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 296 Filed: 3/27/2007, Entered: 3/27/2007
                                                                POST TRIAL BRIEF, filed by USA. (Averbach, Andrew)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 295 Filed: 3/26/2007, Entered: 3/26/2007, Terminated: 9/26/2007 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 04/27/07 to post-trial brief, filed by USA.Response due by 4/12/2007.(Averbach, Andrew)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 294 Filed: 3/23/2007, Entered: 3/23/2007, Terminated: 9/26/2007 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 03/26/2007 to Defendant's Post-Trial Brief, filed by USA.Response due by 4/9/2007.(Averbach, Andrew)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 293 Filed: 3/8/2007, Entered: 3/8/2007
                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew P. Averbach for USA. (Averbach, Andrew)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 292 Filed: 2/9/2007, Entered: 2/9/2007
                                                                        POST TRIAL BRIEF, filed by NORTHERN STATES POWER COMPANY. (Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 291 Filed: 2/9/2007, Entered: 2/9/2007
                                                                          NOTICE, filed by NORTHERN STATES POWER COMPANY Regarding Deposition Designations and Status of Admitted Trial Exhibits (Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 290 Filed: 2/5/2007, Entered: 2/5/2007 Court Filing
                                                                            ORDER granting [289] Motion for Extension of Time Post Trial Brief due 2/9/2007.Post Trial Response Brief due 3/23/2007. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (jwg)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 289 Filed: 2/1/2007, Entered: 2/1/2007, Terminated: 2/5/2007 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 02/09/2007 to File Post-Trial Brief, filed by NORTHERN STATES POWER COMPANY.Response due by 2/20/2007.(Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 288 Filed: 12/12/2006, Entered: 12/14/2006 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 5240-5391) held on December 11, 2006 before Judge John P. Wiese. (dw1)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 287 Filed: 12/4/2006, Entered: 12/4/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                  ORDER: Trial will recommence at 10:30 a.m. on 12/11/06; plaintiff's post-trial brief due 2/2/07; defendant's responsive brief due 3/16/07; plaintiff's reply brief due 4/18/07; D's sur-reply due 4/30/07; closing arguments will be held at 10:30 a.m. on 5/31/07. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (jwg)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 286 Filed: 12/4/2006, Entered: 12/4/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 4872-5239) held on November 30, 2006 and December 1, 2006 before Senior Judge John P. Wiese. (dw1)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 285 Filed: 11/27/2006, Entered: 11/28/2006 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 4385-4891) held on November 20-21, 2006 before Senior Judge John P. Wiese. (dw1)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 284 Filed: 11/20/2006, Entered: 11/20/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 2942-4384) held on November 13-17, 2006 before Senior Judge John P. Wiese. (dw1)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 283 Filed: 11/13/2006, Entered: 11/14/2006 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1932-2941) held on November 7-9, 2006 before Senior Judge John P. Wiese. (dw1)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 282 Filed: 11/8/2006, Entered: 11/8/2006
                                                                                            SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF Regarding Causation, Pursant To The Court's Order From The Bench On November 7, 2006, filed by USA. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 11/3/2006, Entered: 11/3/2006
                                                                                              Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 12/4/2006. (vp1, )
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 281 Filed: 11/2/2006, Entered: 11/8/2006 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1109-1931) held on October 30, 2006 through November 2, 2006 before Senior Judge John P. Wiese. (dw1)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 280 Filed: 10/30/2006, Entered: 10/30/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-737) held on October 24-27, 2006 before Judge John P. Wiese. (dw1)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 279 Filed: 10/23/2006, Entered: 10/23/2006
                                                                                                    NOTICE, filed by USA re [255] Notice (Other) Of Filing Of Defendant's Objections To Plaintiff's Designations Of Deposition and Trial Testimony and Defendant's Counter-Designations of Deposition and Trial Testimony (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3) # (4) # (5) # (6) # (7) # (8) # (9) # (10) # (11) # (12) # (13) # (14) # (15) # (16) # (17) # (18) # (19) # (20) # (21) # (22) # (23) # (24) # (25) # (26) # (27) # (28) # (29))(Sullivan, Marian)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 278 Filed: 10/23/2006, Entered: 10/23/2006
                                                                                                    RESPONSE to [266] MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony Regarding Minnesota State Legislation, filed by NORTHERN STATES POWER COMPANY.Reply due by 11/6/2006. (Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document 277 Filed: 10/19/2006, Entered: 10/23/2006 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on October 18, 2006 before Senior Judge John P. Wiese. (dw1)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 276 Filed: 10/19/2006, Entered: 10/19/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER denying [265] Motion in Limine, deferring ruling on [266] Motion in Limine, deferring ruling on [268] Motion to Strike . Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (jwg)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 275 Filed: 10/18/2006, Entered: 10/18/2006
                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re [268] MOTION to Strike [255] Notice (Other) and, in the alternative, motion in limine to preclude reliance upon plaintiff's deposition designations, filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1))(Sullivan, Marian)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 10/18/2006, Entered: 10/18/2006
                                                                                                            Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 10/23/2006. (vp1, )
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 274 Filed: 10/12/2006, Entered: 10/12/2006
                                                                                                              NOTICE, filed by NORTHERN STATES POWER COMPANY of Proposed Agenda for Pre-Trial Conference (Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 273 Filed: 10/12/2006, Entered: 10/12/2006
                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT Proposed Agenda For Pretrial Conference, filed by USA. (Herrmann, Heide)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 272 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: 10/10/2006
                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to [268] MOTION to Strike [255] Notice (Other) and, in the alternative, motion in limine to preclude reliance upon plaintiff's deposition designations, filed by NORTHERN STATES POWER COMPANY.Reply due by 10/24/2006. (Attachments: # (1) Attachment A# (2) Attachment B# (3) Attachment C# (4) Attachment D)(Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 271 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: 10/10/2006
                                                                                                                    Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law, filed by USA. (Herrmann, Heide)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 270 Filed: 10/6/2006, Entered: 10/6/2006, Terminated: 9/26/2007 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                      Second MOTION for Extension of Time until 10/10/06 to to file memorandum of contentions of fact and law, filed by USA.Response due by 10/23/2006.(Herrmann, Heide)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 269 Filed: 10/6/2006, Entered: 10/6/2006
                                                                                                                        Exhibit List, filed by USA. (Herrmann, Heide)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 268 Filed: 10/6/2006, Entered: 10/6/2006, Terminated: 9/26/2007 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                          MOTION to Strike [255] Notice (Other) and, in the alternative, motion in limine to preclude reliance upon plaintiff's deposition designations, filed by USA.Response due by 10/23/2006. (Attachments: # (1) objections and counterdesignations# (2) Appendix)(Averbach, Andrew)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 267 Filed: 10/6/2006, Entered: 10/6/2006
                                                                                                                            Witness List, filed by USA. (Finn, Stephen)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 266 Filed: 10/4/2006, Entered: 10/4/2006, Terminated: 9/26/2007 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                              MOTION in Limine to exclude testimony regarding Minnesota state legislation, filed by USA.Response due by 10/23/2006.(Herrmann, Heide) Modified on 10/5/2006 to add descriptive text. (dls ).
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document 265 Filed: 10/4/2006, Entered: 10/4/2006, Terminated: 10/19/2006 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                MOTION in Limine to exclude the testimony of Plaintiff's expert witness, Ms. Eileen M. Supko, filed by USA.Response due by 10/23/2006. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix # (2) Appendix # (3) Appendix # (4) Appendix # (5) Appendix)(Finn, Stephen)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 264 Filed: 9/28/2006, Entered: 9/28/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [262] Motion for Extension of Time. Evidentiary motions due by 10/4/06; Pretrial Brief due by 10/6/2006. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (jwg) Modified on 9/29/2006 to add due date for motions. (dls).
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 263 Filed: 9/28/2006, Entered: 9/28/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying [261] Motion in Limine Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (jwg)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 262 Filed: 9/26/2006, Entered: 9/26/2006, Terminated: 9/28/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 10/4/06 to file any remaining evidentiary motions, and until 10/6/06 to file memorandum of contentions of fact and law, witness and exhibit list, filed by USA.Response due by 10/13/2006.(Herrmann, Heide) Modified on 9/28/2006 to clarify docket entry. (dls ).
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 261 Filed: 9/20/2006, Entered: 9/20/2006, Terminated: 9/28/2006 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                        **SEALED** MOTION in Limine To Exclude Evidence of the Kenrich Fuel Management Model, filed by USA.Response due by 10/10/2006. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix # (2) Appendix # (3) Appendix # (4) Appendix # (5) Appendix # (6) Appendix # (7) Appendix)(Herrmann, Heide)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 260 Filed: 9/20/2006, Entered: 9/20/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [258] Motion for Leave to File documents under seal electronically. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (jwg) Modified on 9/21/2006 to add docket text. (dls ).
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 259 Filed: 9/18/2006, Entered: 9/18/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER: Trial set to commence at 9:30 am on 10/24/06 through 11/3/06 in Minneapolis, MN, and to resume at 9:30 am on 11/7/06 through 11/17/06 in Washington, DC, before Senior Judge John P. Wiese. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (jwg) Modified on 9/21/2006 to add additional trial dates. (dls ).
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 258 Filed: 9/18/2006, Entered: 9/18/2006, Terminated: 9/20/2006 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal, filed by USA.Response due by 10/5/2006.(Herrmann, Heide)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 257 Filed: 9/1/2006, Entered: 9/1/2006
                                                                                                                                                Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law, filed by NORTHERN STATES POWER COMPANY. (Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 256 Filed: 9/1/2006, Entered: 9/1/2006
                                                                                                                                                  Exhibit List, filed by NORTHERN STATES POWER COMPANY. (Attachments: # (1) List of Exhibits)(Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 255 Filed: 9/1/2006, Entered: 9/1/2006
                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE, filed by NORTHERN STATES POWER COMPANY of Deposition & Trial Testimony Designations (Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 254 Filed: 9/1/2006, Entered: 9/1/2006
                                                                                                                                                      Witness List, filed by NORTHERN STATES POWER COMPANY. (Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 253 Filed: 8/15/2006, Entered: 8/15/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        ORDER deferring further briefing with respect to re [251] MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Prejudgment Interest pending the conclusion of trial. Plaintiff's opposition and defendant's reply brief are to be filed along with the parties' post-trial submissions. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (jwg) Modified on 8/16/2006 to add direction to file briefs with post-trial submissions.(dls ).
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 252 Filed: 7/28/2006, Entered: 7/28/2006
                                                                                                                                                          PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact RE: [251] MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Prejudgment Interest, filed by USA. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 251 Filed: 7/28/2006, Entered: 7/28/2006, Terminated: 9/26/2007 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Prejudgment Interest, filed by USA.Response due by 8/28/2006.(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 250 Filed: 4/19/2006, Entered: 4/24/2006 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on April 4, 2006 before Senior Judge John P. Wiese. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 249 Filed: 4/4/2006, Entered: 4/4/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER modifying pretrial schedule. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (jwg)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 4/3/2006, Entered: 4/3/2006
                                                                                                                                                                  Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 5/4/2006. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 248 Filed: 3/22/2006, Entered: 3/22/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: A status conference is scheduled for 2:30 p.m. on Tuesday, 4/4/06. The proceedings will be transcribed. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (jwg)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 247 Filed: 3/22/2006, Entered: 3/22/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting the parties' [246] motion for entry of an order based on a joint stipulation regarding proprietary information and trade secrets, and adopting the language set forth in the proposed order accompanying that motion. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (jwg)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 246 Filed: 2/24/2006, Entered: 2/24/2006, Terminated: 3/22/2006
                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION - Motion for Entry of Order Based on Joint Stipulation Regarding Proprietary Information and Trade Secrets, filed by all parties. (Attachments: # (1) Attachment 1 - Protective Order)(Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 245 Filed: 2/22/2006, Entered: 2/22/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [244] motion regarding discovery of draft expert reports. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (jwg)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 244 Filed: 2/15/2006, Entered: 2/15/2006, Terminated: 2/22/2006 Motion for Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION for an Order Regarding Discovery Of Draft Expert Reports filed by USA, NORTHERN STATES POWER COMPANY. Response due by 3/6/2006. (Cochran, Todd) Modified on 2/24/2006 to clarify text and add plaintiff as a filer. (dls).
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 243 Filed: 2/14/2006, Entered: 2/14/2006
                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to Amended Complaint (Second Amended Complaint), filed by USA. JPSR due by 4/7/2006. (Herrmann, Heide)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 242 Filed: 1/30/2006, Entered: 1/30/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting the [241] Motion for Leave. The Second Amended Complaint and Supplemental Complaint (attached to the motion for leave) is deemed to be filed this day. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 241 Filed: 1/27/2006, Entered: 1/27/2006, Terminated: 1/30/2006 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended And Supplemental Complaint, filed by NORTHERN STATES POWER COMPANY. Response due by 2/13/2006. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (Second Amended Complaint And Supplemental Complaint)# (2) Exhibit B (DOJ letter in Southern Nuclear)# (3) Exhibit C (DOJ letter in SFI)# (4) D (DOJ excerpt in PG&E)# (5) Exhibit E (DOJ excerpt in Yankee))(Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 240 Filed: 10/26/2005, Entered: 10/28/2005 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                  **SEALED**NOTICE of Filing Expert Reports, filed by NORTHERN STATES POWER COMPANY. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 10/18/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 239 Filed: 9/14/2005, Entered: 9/14/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Establishing Pretrial Schedule: Pretrial Conference scheduled for 10/18/2006 at 02:30 PM; trial scheduled to commence on 10/23/2006 and will be held in Minneapolis, MN, for the first two weeks and in Washington, DC, for the following two weeks. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (jwg)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 238 Filed: 9/13/2005, Entered: 9/13/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [232] Motion for Leave to File Expert Reports Under Seal and deferring ruling on [235] Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding Pre-Breach and Future Damages. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (jwg)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 237 Filed: 9/9/2005, Entered: 9/9/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                        JOINT STATUS REPORT by all parties. (Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 236 Filed: 8/24/2005, Entered: 8/24/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                          PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact RE: [232] MOTION for Leave to File Expert Reports Under Seal and Request for Order Regarding Certain Future Damages And Cross-Motion For Summary Judgment Regarding Pre-Breach And Future Damages by USA. (Herrmann, Heide)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 235 Filed: 8/24/2005, Entered: 8/24/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to [232] MOTION for Leave to File Expert Reports Under Seal and Request for Order Regarding Certain Future Damages And Cross-Motion For Summary Judgment Regarding Pre-Breach And Future Damages filed by USA. Response/Reply due by 9/26/2005. (Attachments: # (1) # (2) Appendix)(Herrmann, Heide) Modified on 9/6/2005 to correct response/reply deadline (jat, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 8/24/2005, Entered: 9/6/2005 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                            Set/Reset Deadlines: Response/Reply due by 9/26/2005. (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 8/24/2005, Entered: 8/25/2005 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                                                                                                                                                                              Set Deadlines/Hearings: Reply due by 9/6/2005. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 234 Filed: 8/22/2005, Entered: 8/22/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [233] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to [232] MOTION for Leave to File Expert Reports Under Seal and Request for Order Regarding Certain Future Damages. Response due by 8/24/2005. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (jwg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 233 Filed: 8/18/2005, Entered: 8/18/2005, Terminated: 8/22/2005 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [232] MOTION for Leave to File Expert Reports Under Seal and Request for Order Regarding Certain Future Damages filed by USA. Response due by 9/6/2005. (Herrmann, Heide)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 232 Filed: 8/1/2005, Entered: 8/1/2005, Terminated: 9/13/2005 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Expert Reports Under Seal and Request for Order Regarding Certain Future Damages filed by NORTHERN STATES POWER COMPANY. Response due by 8/24/2005. (Attachments: # (1) Attachment 1 - Southern Nuclear Order)(Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 231 Filed: 7/22/2005, Entered: 7/22/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Heide Lynn Herrmann for USA. (Herrmann, Heide)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 230 Filed: 4/7/2005, Entered: 4/7/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Change of Address by Jack Yee-Chieh Chu (Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 229 Filed: 3/30/2005, Entered: 3/30/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [226] Motion for Extension of Time, clarifying the court's 3/3/05 order, and rescheduling the telephone conference currently scheduled for 4/14/05 to 8/16/05. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (jwg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 3/30/2005, Entered: 3/30/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Set Deadlines/Hearings: Telephonic Status Conference set for 8/16/2005 02:30 PM before Senior Judge John P. Wiese. (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 228 Filed: 3/23/2005, Entered: 3/23/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re [226] Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until June 1, 2005 to Submit Claim Letter and Motion for Clarification and Motion for Status Conference filed by NORTHERN STATES POWER COMPANY. (Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 227 Filed: 3/21/2005, Entered: 3/21/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to [226] Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until June 1, 2005 to Submit Claim Letter and Motion for Clarification filed by USA. Reply due by 4/4/2005. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 226 Filed: 3/18/2005, Entered: 3/18/2005, Terminated: 3/30/2005 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until June 1, 2005 to Submit Claim Letter and Motion for Clarification filed by NORTHERN STATES POWER COMPANY. Response due by 4/4/2005 (Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 225 Filed: 3/3/2005, Entered: 3/3/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Regarding Initial Pretrial Procedures: establishing a 4/1/05 deadline and scheduling a telephone conference for 4/14/05. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (jwg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 3/3/2005, Entered: 3/7/2005 Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Set/Reset Hearings: Telephonic Status Conference set for 4/14/2005 02:30 PM before Senior Judge John P. Wiese. (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 224 Filed: 12/7/2004, Entered: 12/7/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        JOINT STATUS REPORT by NORTHERN STATES POWER COMPANY, USA. (Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 223 Filed: 10/28/2004, Entered: 10/28/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT AND PROPOSED PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE by NORTHERN STATES POWER COMPANY. (Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 222 Filed: 10/28/2004, Entered: 10/28/2004, Terminated: 9/26/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File An Individual Status Report In Response To This Court's Order Dated September 28, 2004; Defendant's Status Report; And Defendant's Motion For Leave To File Supplemental Status Report On November 11, 2004 by USA. Response due by 11/15/2004 (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 221 Filed: 10/20/2004, Entered: 10/20/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [220] Motion for leave to file supplemental authority. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (jwg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 220 Filed: 10/8/2004, Entered: 10/8/2004, Terminated: 10/20/2004 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION Leave to File Supplemental Authority by USA. Response due by 10/25/2004 (Attachments: # (1))(Miller, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 219 Filed: 10/5/2004, Entered: 10/5/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER deferring ruling on defendant's motion to strike portions of plaintiff's filings concerning the rate of acceptance. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (jwg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 218 Filed: 9/28/2004, Entered: 9/28/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER deferring ruling on dispositive motions pending completion of the trial on plaintiff's damages claim; on or before 10/28/04, the parties shall file a proposed pretrial schedule. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (jwg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 217 Filed: 4/7/2004, Entered: 4/7/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER: the court's order issued on 4/6/04 shall be stricken from the docket, as it was not signed by the court, and substituted with this order granting plaintiff's motion for leave to exceed the page limitation. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (jwg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 216 Filed: 4/6/2004, Entered: 4/6/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [215] plaintiff's motion for leave to exceed page limitation. signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (jwg) Modified on 4/7/2004 for punctuation (dw1).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 215 Filed: 3/31/2004, Entered: 3/31/2004, Terminated: 4/6/2004 Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit of Northern States Power Company's Reply in Support of its Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on the Acceptance Rate and Response to Defendant's Supplemental Brief by 20 pages by NORTHERN STATES POWER COMPANY. Response due by 4/19/2004 (Attachments: # (1) Northern States Power Company's Reply in Support of its Cross-Motion For Partial Summary Judgment on the Acceptance Rate and Response to Defendant's Supplemental Brief)(Lepre, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 214 Filed: 3/11/2004, Entered: 3/11/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER ESTABLISHING FILING DEADLINE: Plaintiff shall file its final brief on the rate of acceptance issue on or before 3/31/2004. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (jwg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 212 Filed: 3/1/2004, Entered: 3/1/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 213 Filed: 2/27/2004, Entered: 3/2/2004 Supplemental Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF in Response to the Court's [211] 2/4/2004 Scheduling Order, filed by USA. Service: 2/27/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 211 Filed: 2/4/2004, Entered: 2/10/2004 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER: Dft may file a Supplemental Brief on or before 2/27/2004, in support of its motion for partial summary judgment regarding the rate of spent nuclear fuel acceptance. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 2/4/2004, Entered: 2/4/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John P. Wiese : Telephone Conference held on 2/3/04. (jwg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 1/30/2004, Entered: 1/30/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER: The Court hereby DENIES [205] Dft's Second Motion to Renew its Motion to Consolidate as well as its previous motions relating to consolidation. The Court further LIFTS THE STAY of the remainder of the cases to which the Order of 4/16/2003, applied. The Clerk of the Court is directed to docket this Order in this case with an entry noting the same on the dockets of the remaining SNFcases captioned in Dft's instant motion, with a courtesy copy to all SNF parties and presiding SNF judges of the Court. [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT LOCATED IN CASE NO. 98-126C] Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 210 Filed: 12/1/2003, Entered: 12/4/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Change of Counsel for Dft's Facsimile Number by USA. Service: 12/1/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 209 Filed: 10/22/2003, Entered: 10/27/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER: All filings in this case relating to the issue of consolidation shall be captioned solely in the name of this case and shall show on the first page the name of the presiding judge in this case. In addition, a courtesy copy of any such filings relating to the issue consolidation shall be provided to the Clerk's Office for transmission to the Chief Judge. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 208 Filed: 9/10/2003, Entered: 9/12/2003 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Pltfs' Responses to [205] Dft's Second MOTION to the Chief Judge to Renew Consideration of Dft's Motion to Consolidate, filed by USA. Service: 9/3/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 207 Filed: 9/10/2003, Entered: 9/12/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER allowing [206] Dft's Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to [205] Dft's Second MOTION to Renew Its Motion to Consolidate, until 9/3/03. Dft's reply shall be FILED THIS DAY. Reply due by 9/3/2003. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 206 Filed: 9/3/2003, Entered: 9/9/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to Pltfs' Responses to Dft's Second Motion to Renew Its Motion to Consolidate, until 9/3/03, by USA.Service: 9/3/03. Response due by 9/22/2003.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 8/26/2003, Entered: 8/29/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to the Chief Judge for Extension of Time to File Reply to Pltfs' Responses to Dft's Second Motion to Renew Its Motion to Consolidate, until 9/3/03, by USA. [Original document located in Case No. 98-126C]Service: 8/26/03. Response due by 9/12/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/29/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  OPPOSITION to [205] Dft's Second MOTION to Renew Its Motion to Consolidate filed by NORTHERN STATES POWER COMPANY. [Original document located in Case No. 98-483C] Reply due by 8/29/2003. Service: 8/15/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 8/8/2003, Entered: 8/8/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Set/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 8/15/2003 (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 8/5/2003, Entered: 8/7/2003 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Dft's Motion to the Chief Judge for Leave to Correct Certificate of Service and to Waive Requirements of RCFC 5.3 Regarding "Dft's Second Motion [to the Chief Judge] to Renew its Motion to Consolidate." (Original Motion located in Case No. 98-126C) (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 205 Filed: 7/30/2003, Entered: 7/31/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SECOND MOTION to Renew Its Motion to Consolidate by USA. [COPY] (Original Document in Case No. 98-126C)Service: 7/29/03 by hand. Response due by 8/12/2003 (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 204 Filed: 4/16/2003, Entered: 4/25/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 203 Filed: 4/15/2003, Entered: 4/22/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE re [168] Cross Motion for partial summary judgment regarding the rate of spent nuclear fuel acceptance (together with a separate appendix) filed by The United States. Reply due by 4/25/2003. Service: 4/11/03 by hand.(hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 202 Filed: 4/15/2003, Entered: 4/22/2003 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [199] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 200 Filed: 4/15/2003, Entered: 4/17/2003 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fa
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by The United States. Service: 4/11/03 by hand.(hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 201 Filed: 4/11/2003, Entered: 4/18/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Strike portions of plaintiff's filings concerning the rate of acceptance of spent Nuclear fuel by The United States.Service: 4/11/03 by hand. Response due by 4/25/2003 (hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 199 Filed: 4/11/2003, Entered: 4/17/2003, Terminated: 4/15/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit of Reply Brief by 30 pages by The United States.Service by hand: 4/11/03. Response due by 4/25/2003. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 198 Filed: 4/2/2003, Entered: 4/8/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER, re: further proceedings. Signed by Judge Diane G. Sypolt. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 197 Filed: 3/18/2003, Entered: 3/21/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 196 Filed: 3/11/2003, Entered: 3/12/2003 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fa
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Response by USA to [174-1] proposed findings by NORTHERN STATES. Service: 3/7/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 195 Filed: 3/11/2003, Entered: 3/12/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY, with appendix, by USA to response to [102-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment. Service: 3/7/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 194 Filed: 3/11/2003, Entered: 3/12/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [192-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 193 Filed: 3/7/2003, Entered: 3/10/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER re: See order [612-1] dated 3/7/03, in case 98-126C (signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 192 Filed: 3/7/2003, Entered: 3/10/2003, Terminated: 3/11/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 3/7/03) For leave to exceed the page limitation . Response due: 3/24/03. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 191 Filed: 3/3/2003, Entered: 3/6/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [190-1] motion for Leave to remove filings from under seal (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 190 Filed: 2/27/2003, Entered: 3/5/2003, Terminated: 3/3/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by NORTHERN STATES (Service: 2/27/03) for Leave to remove filings from under seal . Response due: 3/17/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 189 Filed: 2/25/2003, Entered: 3/4/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 188 Filed: 2/24/2003, Entered: 3/3/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 187 Filed: 2/5/2003, Entered: 2/13/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 186 Filed: 1/31/2003, Entered: 2/12/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 185 Filed: 1/30/2003, Entered: 2/10/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY by USA to response to [101-1] motion to Dismiss Count III of First Amended Complaint. Service: 1/30/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 184 Filed: 1/29/2003, Entered: 2/7/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 183 Filed: 1/23/2003, Entered: 1/31/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, re: see 98-126 C for order, etc. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 182 Filed: 1/22/2003, Entered: 1/30/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [178-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the cross-motion for summary judgment, reply to the motion for summary judgment regarding Greater-Than-Class-C radioactive waste and reply to the motino to dismiss its takings claim Reply to Response to Motion due 1/30/03 for [101-1] motion to Dismiss Count III of First Amended Complaint , Reply to Response to Motion reset to 3/11/03 for [102-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment , and Response to [168-1] cross motion due 4/11/03 (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 181 Filed: 1/21/2003, Entered: 1/28/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY by USA to response to [178-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the cross-motion for summary judgment, reply to the motion for summary judgment regarding Greater-Than-Class-C radioactive waste and reply to the motion to dismiss its takings claim. Service: 1/21/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 180 Filed: 1/15/2003, Entered: 1/21/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by NORTHERN STATES (Service: 1/15/03 ) to [178-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the cross-motion for summary judgment, reply to the motion for summary judgment regarding Greater-Than-Class-C radioactive waste and reply to the motino to dismiss its takings claim. Reply due: 1/31/03 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 179 Filed: 1/9/2003, Entered: 1/15/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 178 Filed: 1/9/2003, Entered: 1/14/2003, Terminated: 1/22/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 1/9/03) to Extend Time to respond to the cross-motion for summary judgment, reply to the motion for summary judgment regarding Greater-Than-Class-C radioactive waste and reply to the motino to dismiss its takings claim until ? Response due: 1/21/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 177 Filed: 1/3/2003, Entered: 1/9/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [175-1] motion to Extend Time within which to reply to respond to motion for summary judgment Reply to Response to [107-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment, [102-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment, due 1/10/03 for [101-1] motion to Dismiss Count III of First Amended Complaint (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 176 Filed: 12/30/2002, Entered: 1/3/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by NORTHERN STATES (Service : 12/30/02 ) for Leave to place filings under seal temporarily . Response due: 1/13/03 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 175 Filed: 12/23/2002, Entered: 12/31/2002, Terminated: 1/3/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 12/23/02 ) to Extend Time within which to reply to respond to motion for summary judgment , (until January 10, 2003). Response due: 1/10/03 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 174 Filed: 12/13/2002, Entered: 12/17/2002 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted FactCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by NORTHERN STATES (regarding plaintiff's greater than class c radioactive waste arguments), filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 12/10/02 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 173 Filed: 12/13/2002, Entered: 12/17/2002 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted FaCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Response by NORTHERN STATES to [103-1] proposed findings by USA (filed by leave of the Judge). Service: 12/10/02. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 172 Filed: 12/13/2002, Entered: 12/17/2002 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by NORTHERN STATES (Service: 12/10/02 ) to [102-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment (together with separate volume appendix), filed by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 12/27/02. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 171 Filed: 12/13/2002, Entered: 12/17/2002 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fa
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Response by NORTHERN STATES to [106-1] proposed findings by USA. Service: 12/10/02 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 170 Filed: 12/13/2002, Entered: 12/17/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [166-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 169 Filed: 12/13/2002, Entered: 12/17/2002 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted FactCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by NORTHERN STATES (in support of the of its cross-motion for partial summary judgment on the acceptance rate), filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 12/10/02. (HW) Modified on 12/17/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 168 Filed: 12/13/2002, Entered: 12/17/2002 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CROSS MOTION by NORTHERN STATES ( Service: 12/10/02 ) and RESPONSE to [107-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment regarding the rate of spent nuclear fuel acceptance by USA (together with separate one volume appendix), filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 1/10/03. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 12/13/2002, Entered: 12/17/2002 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Deadline updated; Response to [168-1] cross motion reset to 1/10/03 . (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 167 Filed: 12/10/2002, Entered: 12/13/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by NORTHERN STATES (Service: 12/10/02 ) to [101-1] motion to Dismiss Count III of First Amended Complaint Reply due: 12/27/02 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 166 Filed: 12/10/2002, Entered: 12/13/2002, Terminated: 12/13/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by NORTHERN STATES (Service : 12/10/02 ) For leave to exceed the page limitation (elarge page limit to 80 pages). (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 165 Filed: 11/26/2002, Entered: 11/27/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Response to [107-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment due 12/10/02, [102-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment due 12/10/02, [101-1] motion to Dismiss Count III of First Amended Complaint due 12/10/02 (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 164 Filed: 11/21/2002, Entered: 11/25/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by NORTHERN STATES (Service: 11/21/02) to Extend Time to respond to the motions for summary judgment and the motion to dismiss Northern States' takings count until 12/10/02. Response due: 12/9/02. (LTD) Modified on 11/25/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 163 Filed: 10/16/2002, Entered: 10/18/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow for Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 162 Filed: 10/9/2002, Entered: 10/11/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER see 98-126C for Order. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 161 Filed: 9/10/2002, Entered: 9/16/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 160 Filed: 9/5/2002, Entered: 9/9/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 159 Filed: 8/22/2002, Entered: 8/27/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 158 Filed: 8/20/2002, Entered: 8/22/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 157 Filed: 8/16/2002, Entered: 8/21/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 156 Filed: 8/5/2002, Entered: 8/7/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER, re: See order in 98-484C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 155 Filed: 7/30/2002, Entered: 8/5/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 154 Filed: 7/29/2002, Entered: 8/1/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER re: see order [467-1] dated 7/29/02, in case No. 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 153 Filed: 7/23/2002, Entered: 7/26/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 152 Filed: 7/16/2002, Entered: 7/18/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 151 Filed: 7/15/2002, Entered: 7/17/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 150 Filed: 7/10/2002, Entered: 7/12/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 149 Filed: 7/9/2002, Entered: 7/11/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER - see 98-484C for Order. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 148 Filed: 7/3/2002, Entered: 7/3/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 147 Filed: 7/2/2002, Entered: 7/3/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER-see Order in 98-126C ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 146 Filed: 6/28/2002, Entered: 7/1/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER-see 98-126C for Order ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 145 Filed: 6/18/2002, Entered: 6/19/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C.(signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (VO)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 144 Filed: 6/17/2002, Entered: 6/18/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, Re: see order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt) Copy to parties. (VO)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 143 Filed: 6/17/2002, Entered: 6/18/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER, Re: see order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (VO)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 142 Filed: 6/6/2002, Entered: 6/11/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER, re order in 98-126, filed 6/6/02. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 141 Filed: 6/4/2002, Entered: 6/4/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER, re: see order in 98-126, filed 6/03/02. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (FE) Modified on 06/04/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 140 Filed: 5/28/2002, Entered: 5/29/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 139 Filed: 5/20/2002, Entered: 5/21/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 138 Filed: 5/9/2002, Entered: 5/10/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER re: See [395-1] order in case No. 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 137 Filed: 5/7/2002, Entered: 5/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 136 Filed: 5/7/2002, Entered: 5/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 135 Filed: 5/6/2002, Entered: 5/7/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 134 Filed: 5/3/2002, Entered: 5/3/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 133 Filed: 4/26/2002, Entered: 4/29/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER, re: see order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 132 Filed: 4/23/2002, Entered: 4/24/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 131 Filed: 4/18/2002, Entered: 4/18/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER, Re: see order in 98-126 ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (VO)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 130 Filed: 4/11/2002, Entered: 4/11/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER re: see order [344-2] dated 4/11/02 in Case No. 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 129 Filed: 3/25/2002, Entered: 3/26/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, re: see order in 98-126 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 128 Filed: 3/19/2002, Entered: 3/20/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, re: see order in 98-126 (signed by Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir for Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 127 Filed: 3/5/2002, Entered: 3/6/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying Motion to preclude or, in the alternative, defer, depositions pursuant to Rule 30(b)(6) (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 126 Filed: 2/28/2002, Entered: 3/1/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting Motion to Extend Time to respond to interrogatories until 3/8/02 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 125 Filed: 2/28/2002, Entered: 3/1/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service: 2/28/02) to Extend Timeto file the reply to the Motion to Lift Stay on Briefing of the Motion to Dismiss Count Three of the Complaint until 3/7/02. Response due: 3/18/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 124 Filed: 2/27/2002, Entered: 2/28/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER denying [117-1] motion to list the stay on the response to the Motion to Dismiss Count III of Plaintiff's amended complaint (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 122 Filed: 2/20/2002, Entered: 2/21/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER, re: SEE CASE NO. 98-126 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 121 Filed: 2/15/2002, Entered: 2/19/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by NORTHERN STATES (Service: 2/15/02 ) to [117-1] motion to list the stay on the response to the Motion to Dismiss Count III of Plaintiff's amended complaint. Reply due: 3/5/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 120 Filed: 2/13/2002, Entered: 2/14/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, re: see order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 119 Filed: 2/1/2002, Entered: 2/4/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying motion to reconsider filed 1/22/02 and granting the motion to revise dates in 9/26/01 order filed 1/24/02 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 118 Filed: 2/1/2002, Entered: 2/4/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER. See order in 98-126C filed 2/1/02. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 117 Filed: 1/29/2002, Entered: 1/30/2002, Terminated: 2/27/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 1/29/02) to list the stay on the response to the Motion to Dismiss Count III of Plaintiff's amended complaint . Response due: 2/15/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 116 Filed: 1/29/2002, Entered: 1/29/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER setting Status Conference for 2:00 p.m. on 2/12/02 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 115 Filed: 1/11/2002, Entered: 1/14/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER see order in 98-126C filed 1/11/02. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 114 Filed: 1/3/2002, Entered: 1/7/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER see order in 98-126C filed 01/03/02 ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 113 Filed: 12/26/2001, Entered: 1/2/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER mooting [112-1] motion to Extend Time to file response to the Motion for partial Summary Judgment ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 112 Filed: 12/21/2001, Entered: 12/27/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by NORTHERN STATES (Service: 12/21/01) to Extend Time to file response to the Motion for partial Summary Judgment until 1/25/02. Response due: 1/7/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 111 Filed: 12/18/2001, Entered: 12/19/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER staying Plaintiff's responses to Summary Judgment motions pending ruling by Discovery Judge (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 110 Filed: 12/18/2001, Entered: 12/19/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying [109-1] motion for a status conference (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 109 Filed: 12/14/2001, Entered: 12/17/2001, Terminated: 12/18/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by NORTHERN STATES (Service: 12/14/01) for a status conference . Response due: 1/2/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 108 Filed: 12/6/2001, Entered: 12/7/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER setting Status Conference for 2:30 p.m. on 12/11/01 (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 107 Filed: 11/30/2001, Entered: 12/4/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION, together with a separate volume of appendix, by USA (Service by hand: 11/28/01) for Partial Summary Judgment regarding the rate of spent nuclear fuel acceptance. Response due: 12/28/01 (DS) Modified on 12/13/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 106 Filed: 11/30/2001, Entered: 12/4/2001 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact regarding the rate of spent nuclear fuel acceptance filed by USA. Service by hand: 11/28/01 (DS) Modified on 12/13/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 105 Filed: 11/30/2001, Entered: 12/4/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [104-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation. ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 104 Filed: 11/29/2001, Entered: 11/30/2001, Terminated: 11/30/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service by hand: 11/28/01) For leave to exceed the page limitation . Response due: 12/12/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 103 Filed: 11/28/2001, Entered: 11/30/2001 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact regarding plaintiff's greater than Class C radioactive waste arguments filed by USA. Service by hand: 11/27/01. (LTD) Modified on 12/13/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 102 Filed: 11/28/2001, Entered: 11/30/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION, with one volume of Appendix, by USA (Service by hand: 11/27/01) for partial Summary Judgment regarding plaintiff's greater than Class C radioactive waste arguments. Response due: 12/26/01. (LTD) Modified on 12/13/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 101 Filed: 11/27/2001, Entered: 11/29/2001 Description not available
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service by hand: 11/27/01) to Dismiss Count III of First Amended Complaint . Response due: 12/26/01. (FE) Modified on 11/29/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 100 Filed: 11/20/2001, Entered: 11/21/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER see order in 98-126C filed 11/20/01 ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 99 Filed: 11/16/2001, Entered: 11/19/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER see order in 98-126C filed 11/16/01. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 98 Filed: 11/14/2001, Entered: 11/16/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER see order in 98-126C filed 11/14/01. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 97 Filed: 11/14/2001, Entered: 11/16/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER see order in 98-126C filed 11/14/01. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 96 Filed: 11/8/2001, Entered: 11/9/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER. See 98-126C. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 95 Filed: 11/8/2001, Entered: 11/9/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER. See 98-126C. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 94 Filed: 11/7/2001, Entered: 11/8/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting Motion to Extend time to respond to the Motion to Compel production of documents (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 93 Filed: 11/6/2001, Entered: 11/7/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting motion to enlarge time to respond to motion to compel production of documents to 11/06/01 ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 92 Filed: 11/6/2001, Entered: 11/7/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER re: Public Service Electric and Gas motion to extend time filed on 11/2/01, within which to respond to the defendant's motion to compel is GRANTED (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (see motion filed in 98-126C) (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 91 Filed: 11/6/2001, Entered: 11/7/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting motion to enlarge time to complete production of documents to 11/19/01 ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 90 Filed: 11/1/2001, Entered: 11/5/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER denying [78-1] motion for Clarification of the Court's 9/26/01 order. Individual Judges retains the right to decide dispositive motions. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 89 Filed: 10/30/2001, Entered: 11/1/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER re: proposed stipulated order, etc., ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 88 Filed: 10/29/2001, Entered: 10/31/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [79-1] motion for Leave to file copies of the Motion to Transfer Responsibility, etc. and granting Plaintiff's Motion for leave to file copies of response to transfer motion (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 87 Filed: 10/19/2001, Entered: 10/23/2001 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of supplemental certificate of service by USA. Service: 10/19/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 86 Filed: 10/19/2001, Entered: 10/23/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service: 10/19/01) to Compel . Response due: 11/5/01. (Filed with response to third party objections). (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 86 Filed: 10/19/2001, Entered: 10/23/2001 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by USA to third party objections. Service: 10/19/01. (Filed with Motion to Compel). (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 84 Filed: 10/19/2001, Entered: 10/22/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER re: All filings shall bear the name of the discovery Judge, all matter's to be brought to the attention of the Court shall be filed with the discovery Judge only, the Clerk of the Court is directed not to accept for filing any motion by a party in one of the captioned cases for leave to file material with a Judge in an individual case ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 85 Filed: 10/18/2001, Entered: 10/23/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 10/16/01) to Compel . Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 11/2/01. (Filed with response to third party objections). (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 85 Filed: 10/18/2001, Entered: 10/23/2001 ResponseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by USA to third party objections. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 10/16/01. (Filed with Motion to Compel). (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 83 Filed: 10/18/2001, Entered: 10/19/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER directing the Clerk's Office to file Defendant's response and Defendant's corrected certificate of service is due 10/25/01 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 82 Filed: 10/17/2001, Entered: 10/18/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER re: Defendant's motion to extend time filed on 10/15/01, within which to file the proposed stipulated order concerning the scheduling and conduct of depositions in the coordinated discovery proceeding, is GRANTED, see motion in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 81 Filed: 10/12/2001, Entered: 10/15/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [80-1] motion for Leave to file the Motion for Clarification, etc. (signed by Judge John P. Wiese) Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 80 Filed: 10/11/2001, Entered: 10/15/2001, Terminated: 10/12/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by NORTHERN STATES (Service: 10/10/01) for Leave to file the Motion for Clarification, etc. . Response due: 10/29/01. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 79 Filed: 10/11/2001, Entered: 10/15/2001, Terminated: 10/29/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 10/10/01) for Leave to file copies of the Motion to Transfer Responsibility, etc. . Response due: 10/29/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 78 Filed: 10/9/2001, Entered: 10/10/2001, Terminated: 11/1/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by NORTHERN STATES (Service by hand: 10/9/01) for Clarification of the Court's 9/26/01 order . Response due: 10/23/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 77 Filed: 10/3/2001, Entered: 10/4/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [76-1] motion to Extend Time to submit a plan for production of e-mail messages Plan is due by 10/22/01 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 76 Filed: 10/3/2001, Entered: 10/4/2001, Terminated: 10/3/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 10/1/01) to Extend Time to submit a plan for production of e-mail messages until 10/22/01. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 75 Filed: 9/26/2001, Entered: 9/27/2001 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Richard Alan Miller. Service: 9/26/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 74 Filed: 9/26/2001, Entered: 9/26/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER re: The Joint Motion for an order for Consolidated Discovery filed on 7/10/01, is granted, with the exception of document production, the parties are granted an enlargement of time until 10/1/01, to submit a plan addressing the production of e-mail messages (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 73 Filed: 9/13/2001, Entered: 9/13/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER setting Status Conference for 4:00 p.m. on 9/20/01 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 72 Filed: 8/22/2001, Entered: 8/22/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting motion for protective order in the form provided by Exhibit A of the parties 08/10/01 motion (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). See case number 98-126 C for motion. Protective order in 98-458 C is also granted, subject to reconsideration by assigned judge. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 71 Filed: 8/15/2001, Entered: 8/16/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER setting Status Conference for 2:00 p.m. on 9/11/01 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein, Discovery Judge). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 70 Filed: 7/31/2001, Entered: 8/7/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [50-1] motion for Summary Judgment (signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 69 Filed: 7/27/2001, Entered: 7/30/2001 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by USA to [68-2] order. Service: 7/27/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 68 Filed: 7/19/2001, Entered: 7/23/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER re: Defendant directed to Show Cause by 7/27/01. If defendant shows such cause, plaintiff may respond by 8/10/01, and defendant may reply to response by 8/17/01 ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 67 Filed: 7/19/2001, Entered: 7/20/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [33-1] motion to set coordinated discovery schedule (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 66 Filed: 7/17/2001, Entered: 7/17/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [65-1] motion for Leave to file in this case a copy of filings made before Judge Wiese as managing judge (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 65 Filed: 7/13/2001, Entered: 7/16/2001, Terminated: 7/17/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by NORTHERN STATES (Service: 7/13/01) for Leave to file in this case a copy of filings made before Judge Wiese as managing judge . (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 64 Filed: 7/5/2001, Entered: 7/6/2001 RemarkCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Copy of Yankee Atomic's Motion for Leave to file documents relevant to the telephone conference with Judge Wiese. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 63 Filed: 5/31/2001, Entered: 6/1/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER resetting Status Conference for 2:30 p.m. on 6/14/01 (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 62 Filed: 5/29/2001, Entered: 5/31/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER setting Status Conference for 10:30 a.m. on 6/14/01 (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 61 Filed: 2/21/2001, Entered: 2/23/2001 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY by USA to response to [57-1] motion for Leave to file a copy of "Defendant's reply to plaintiffs' response to motion to reassign" Service: 2/16/01 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 60 Filed: 2/21/2001, Entered: 2/23/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [57-1] motion for Leave to file a copy of "Defendant's reply to plaintiffs' response to motion to reassign" (signed by Judge John P. Wiese) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 59 Filed: 2/21/2001, Entered: 2/23/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE (Filed with separate Appendix containing attachments 1 through 15)) by NORTHERN STATES (Service: 1/30/01) to [38-1] motion to reassign to a single judge cases involving breaches of the standard contract published at 10 C.F.R. Part 961 Reply due: 2/16/01 (FE) Modified on 02/23/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 58 Filed: 2/21/2001, Entered: 2/23/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [56-1] motion for Leave to file a copy of "Yankee Utilities" opposition to motion to reassign cases (signed by Judge John P. Wiese) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 57 Filed: 2/20/2001, Entered: 2/21/2001, Terminated: 2/21/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 2/20/01) for Leave to file a copy of "Defendant's reply to plaintiffs' response to motion to reassign" Response due: 3/9/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 56 Filed: 2/20/2001, Entered: 2/20/2001, Terminated: 2/21/2001 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by NORTHERN STATES (Service: 2/20/01) for Leave to file a copy of "Yankee Utilities" opposition to motion to reassign cases (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 55 Filed: 2/7/2001, Entered: 2/8/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER re: Plaintiff filed a renewed motion for summary judgment on 12/27/00, pursuant to the telephonic conference, a ruling on the plaintiff's motion shall be deferred to await the outcome of the defendant's motion now pending before Chief Judge Baskir re: requesting reassignment to a single Judge (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 53 Filed: 2/7/2001, Entered: 2/7/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [46-1] motion to Stay Proceedings (signed by Judge John P. Wiese) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 54 Filed: 2/2/2001, Entered: 2/7/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER re: Ruling deferred pending disposition of defendant's motion for reassignment of case (filed January 10, 2001) now pending before Chief Judge Baskir ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 52 Filed: 2/2/2001, Entered: 2/6/2001 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by NORTHERN STATES (Answer due 2/15/01) amending [1-1] complaint. Service: 12/26/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 51 Filed: 2/2/2001, Entered: 2/6/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [32-1] motion for Leave to File first amended complaint. (signed by Judge John P. Wiese) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 49 Filed: 1/31/2001, Entered: 1/31/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COPY OF RESPONSE in No. 98-483C filed by NORTHERN STATES (Service by hand: 1/29/01 ) to [38-1] motion to reassign to a single judge cases involving breaches of the standard contract published at 10 C.F.R. Part 961. Reply due: 2/9/01 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 48 Filed: 1/31/2001, Entered: 1/31/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [47-1] motion for Leave to file a copy of "Plaintiff's memorandum in opposition to the USA's motion to the Chief Judge to reassign to a single Judge the fourteen pending standard contract cases" ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 47 Filed: 1/30/2001, Entered: 1/31/2001, Terminated: 1/31/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by NORTHERN STATES (Service: 1/30/01) for Leave to file a copy of "Plaintiff's memorandum in opposition to the USA's motion to the Chief Judge to reassign to a single Judge the fourteen pending standard contract cases" . (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 46 Filed: 1/29/2001, Entered: 1/30/2001, Terminated: 2/7/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 1/29/01 ) to Stay Proceedings pending resolution of motion for reassignment of cases. Response due: 2/15/01 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 45 Filed: 1/29/2001, Entered: 1/30/2001 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          See 30-1 Response to motion filed January 29, 2001, in 98-483C Florida Power & Light Company. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 44 Filed: 1/29/2001, Entered: 1/30/2001 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY by NORTHERN STATES to response to [32-1] motion for Leave to File first amended complaint. Service: 1/29/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 43 Filed: 1/23/2001, Entered: 1/23/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [42-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the USA's motion to the Chief Judge to reassign cases to a single Judge Response to [38-1] motion to reassign to a single judge cases involving alleged breaches of the standard contract published at 10 C.F.R. Part 961 reset to 1/29/01 (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 42 Filed: 1/22/2001, Entered: 1/23/2001, Terminated: 1/23/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by NORTHERN STATES (Service by hand: 1/22/01) to Extend Time to respond to the USA's motion to the Chief Judge to reassign cases to a single Judge , (until January 29, 2001). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 41 Filed: 1/17/2001, Entered: 1/18/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by USA (Service: 1/17/01) to [32-1] motion for Leave to File first amended complaint. Reply due: 1/29/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 40 Filed: 1/12/2001, Entered: 1/16/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [39-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to motion for leave to amend complaint Response to [32-1] motion for Leave to File first amended complaint. reset to 1/17/01 (signed by Judge John P. Wiese) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 39 Filed: 1/11/2001, Entered: 1/12/2001, Terminated: 1/12/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service: 1/11/01) to Extend Time to respond to motion for leave to amend complaint until 01/17/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 38 Filed: 1/9/2001, Entered: 1/10/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Copy of MOTION to the Chief Judge filed in No. 98-126C by USA (Service : 1/8/01 ) to reassign to a single judge cases involving alleged breaches of the standard contract published at 10 C.F.R. Part 961 . Response due: 1/25/01 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 37 Filed: 1/9/2001, Entered: 1/10/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [36-1] motion. ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 36 Filed: 1/9/2001, Entered: 1/10/2001, Terminated: 1/9/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 1/9/01) for Leave to file a copy of motion to the Chief Judge to reassign cases involving breaches of the standard contract. Response due: 1/23/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 35 Filed: 1/9/2001, Entered: 1/9/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Harold Dewitt Lester Jr. Service : 1/9/01 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 50 Filed: 12/27/2000, Entered: 2/2/2001, Terminated: 7/31/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RENEWED MOTION by NORTHERN STATES (Service : 12/26/00 ) for Summary Judgment Response due: 1/26/01 (AB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 33 Filed: 12/27/2000, Entered: 12/28/2000, Terminated: 7/19/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by NORTHERN STATES (Service : 12/26/00 ) to set coordinated discovery schedule. Response due: 1/12/01 Filed by leave of the Judge. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 32 Filed: 12/27/2000, Entered: 12/28/2000, Terminated: 2/2/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by NORTHERN STATES (Service : 12/26/00 ) for Leave to File first amended complaint. Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 1/12/01 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 31 Filed: 12/26/2000, Entered: 12/27/2000 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of change of address by Alexander D. Tomaszczuk. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 34 Filed: 12/19/2000, Entered: 12/28/2000 CAFC Mandate Reversing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MANDATE (certified copy) from CAFC dated December 19, 2000 reversing the [28-1] judgment order (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 5/21/1999, Entered: 5/24/1999 CAFC Case Number
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CAFC Case Number Re: [29-1] appeal by NORTHERN STATES CAFC NUMBER: 99-5096 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 30 Filed: 5/20/1999, Entered: 6/1/1999 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of change of address by Alexander D. Tomaszczuk. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 29 Filed: 5/20/1999, Entered: 5/20/1999, Terminated: 12/19/2000 Notice of AppealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEAL by NORTHERN STATES. Copy to Defendant, Judge John P. Weise and to CAFC. FILING FEE $ 105 RECEIPT # 047541. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 28 Filed: 4/6/1999, Entered: 4/6/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaint is dismissed. No costs. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 27 Filed: 4/6/1999, Entered: 4/6/1999 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PUBLISHED DECISION denying [12-1] plaintiff's motion for summary judgment, granting [11-1] defendant's motion to Dismiss, and directing the clerk to enter judgment. No costs. ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ). Copy to parties. (LD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 4/6/1999, Entered: 4/6/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Case closed (LD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 26 Filed: 3/26/1999, Entered: 3/29/1999 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of proceedings 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of March 25, 1999. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 3/25/1999, Entered: 3/26/1999 Oral Argument
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Oral Argument re: [12-1] cross motion by NORTHERN STATES ( Transcript due 3/26/99 ), [11-1] motion to Dismiss by USA ( Transcript due 3/26/99 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 25 Filed: 3/18/1999, Entered: 3/21/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER oral argument set for 10:30 a.m., 3/25/99 for [12-1] cross motion and [11-1] motion to dismiss. ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 24 Filed: 3/18/1999, Entered: 3/21/1999 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF by USA re: the contention that Plaintiff is barred by the doctrine of collateral estoppel from arguing that it does not have to exhaust its administrative remedy. (1 Separate volume of appendix) Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 3/17/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 23 Filed: 2/8/1999, Entered: 2/9/1999 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF by NORTHERN STATES re: the statements of the D.C. Circit on the issue of Plaintiff's contract remedies. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 2/5/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 22 Filed: 1/12/1999, Entered: 1/15/1999 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Doris Susan Finnerman. Service : 1/12/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 21 Filed: 12/16/1998, Entered: 12/18/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [20-1] motion for Leave to File Letter re: Supreme Court's Denial of Petition for a writ of certiorari. ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 20 Filed: 12/9/1998, Entered: 12/18/1998, Terminated: 12/16/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by NORTHERN STATES (Service : 12/9/98 ) for Leave to File Letter re: Supreme Court's Denial of Petition for a writ of certiorari. (Letter included) Response due: 12/28/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 19 Filed: 10/22/1998, Entered: 10/28/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [17-1] motion for Leave to Amend their Reply to Response to Motion to Dismiss and their Response to Plaintiff's Cross-Motion. ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 18 Filed: 10/20/1998, Entered: 10/22/1998 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY by NORTHERN STATES to response to [12-1] cross motion. Service: 10/20/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 17 Filed: 10/19/1998, Entered: 10/22/1998, Terminated: 10/22/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 10/19/98 ) for Leave to Amend their Reply to Response to Motion to Dismiss and their Response to Plaintiff's Cross-Motion. Response due: 11/5/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 15 Filed: 10/8/1998, Entered: 10/14/1998 Statement of Genuine IssuesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by USA. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 10/6/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 14 Filed: 10/8/1998, Entered: 10/13/1998 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by USA (Service: 10/6/98 ) to [12-1] cross motion. Filed by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 10/23/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 13 Filed: 8/31/1998, Entered: 8/31/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by NORTHERN STATES Service: 8/31/98 (AB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 12 Filed: 8/31/1998, Entered: 8/31/1998, Terminated: 4/6/1999 Cross Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CROSS MOTION by NORTHERN STATES ( Service by hand: 8/31/98 ) and RESPONSE to [11-1] motion to Dismiss by USA Response due: 9/28/98 (AB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 8/31/1998, Entered: 8/31/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Deadline updated; Response to [12-1] cross motion reset to 9/28/98 (AB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 11 Filed: 7/31/1998, Entered: 8/4/1998 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service: 7/31/98) to Dismiss , by leave of the Judge. Response due: 8/21/98. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 10 Filed: 7/30/1998, Entered: 8/3/1998 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT by NORTHERN STATES of Dr. John Whelan Service 7/27/98 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 8 Filed: 7/21/1998, Entered: 7/22/1998 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: Status Conference, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of July 14, 1998. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 9 Filed: 7/17/1998, Entered: 7/22/1998 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Stipulation by NORTHERN STATES re: briefing schedule pursuant to instructions provided by the Court at the July 14, 1998 Prehearing Conference. Briefing schedule as follows: (1) Defendant's motion to dismiss by July 31, 1998; (2) Plaintiff's response, etc. by August 31, 1998; (3) Defendant's reply, etc. by October 6, 1998; and (4) Plaintiff's reply etc., by October 20, 1998. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 7/14/1998, Entered: 7/16/1998 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Status Conference held ( Transcript due 8/13/98 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 6/25/1998, Entered: 6/26/1998 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Status Conference set at 10:30 a.m. on 7/14/98 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 7 Filed: 6/24/1998, Entered: 6/26/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER re: in lieu of consolidating 98-484, 98-483, 98-485 and 98-486, it has been decided that briefing on the jurisdictional issues shall go forward in the instant action, while further proceedings in the remaining suits will be stayed. Set Status Conference for 10:30 a.m., 7/14/98. ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties.(JT) Modified on 06/26/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 6 Filed: 6/17/1998, Entered: 6/18/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by NORTHERN STATES (Service : 6/17/98 ) to Consolidate Cases 98-483C, 98-484C, 98-485C and 98-486C. Response due: 7/6/98 (AB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 5 Filed: 6/17/1998, Entered: 6/18/1998 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Joseph Andrew Kijewski Service : 6/17/98 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 4 Filed: 6/11/1998, Entered: 6/12/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER (i) directing parties to confer and arrange for preliminary status conference; (ii) identifying filing requirements for conference; and (iii) precluding filing of dispositive motions until after conference has been held. ( Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. ) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 3 Filed: 6/8/1998, Entered: 6/9/1998 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of assignment to Judge John P. Wiese. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 2 Filed: 6/8/1998, Entered: 6/9/1998 Notice of Related Cases
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by NORTHERN STATES of related cases; (98-126 C, 98-154 C and 98-474 C). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 6/8/1998, Entered: 6/9/1998 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #045626. Answer due on 8/7/98. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 6/8/1998, Entered: 6/9/1998 Set/Clear Flags
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 224 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?