DUKE POWER, et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:98-cv-00485-JPW
District Judge John P. Wiese, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Duke Energy Corporation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alexander D. Tomaszczuk +1 703 770 7940 +1 703 770 7901 alex.tomaszczuk@pillsburylaw.com
No Logo DUKE POWER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alexander D. Tomaszczuk +1 703 770 7940 +1 703 770 7901 alex.tomaszczuk@pillsburylaw.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Russell Alan Shultis +1 202 305 7571 +1 202 305 7643 russell.shultis@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 6/8/1998
Jury Demand None
Demand $2000000000
Nature of Suit 536 - Spent Nuclear Fuel
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Vaccine - Dismissed - Voluntarily
County None
Terminated 3/13/2007
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, ECF, SNF
  Entries (244) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 231 Filed: 7/25/2007, Entered: 7/25/2007 Court Filing
ORDER returning unfiled Mr. Peterson's motion to intervene, received by the court on July 23, 2007. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (jwg)
    LREF
    Legal Document 230 Filed: 5/8/2007, Entered: 5/8/2007 Court Filing
    ORDER returning submissions of Mr. William D. Peterson. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (jwg)
      LREF
      Legal Document 229 Filed: 3/13/2007, Entered: 3/13/2007
      STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice, filed by all parties.. (Herzfeld, Daniel)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 3/13/2007, Entered: 3/19/2007 Terminated Case - Public
        Complaint dismissed, with prejudice, pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(ii) this day. (dls)
          LREF
          Legal Document 228 Filed: 2/27/2007, Entered: 2/27/2007 Court Filing
          ORDER canceling status conference. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (jwg)
            LREF
            Legal Document 227 Filed: 2/20/2007, Entered: 2/20/2007 Court Filing
            STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 2/27/2007 02:30 PM before Senior Judge John P. Wiese. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (jwg)
              LREF
              Legal Document 226 Filed: 1/8/2007, Entered: 1/8/2007 Court Filing
              ORDER: on or before 2/2/07, the parties shall contact the court to schedule a follow-up status conference. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (jwg)
                LREF
                Legal Document 225 Filed: 11/6/2006, Entered: 11/6/2006 Court Filing
                ORDER : on or before 12/1/06, the parties shall contact the court to schedule a follow-up status conference. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (jwg)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 224 Filed: 5/1/2006, Entered: 5/1/2006 Court Filing
                  ORDER: on or before 7/3/06, the parties shall contact the court to schedule a follow-up status conference. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (jwg)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 223 Filed: 2/3/2006, Entered: 2/3/2006 Court Filing
                    ORDER: On or before 5/1/2006, the parties shall contact the court to schedule a follow-up status conference. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (jwg)
                      LREF
                      Sealed Legal Document 222 Filed: 12/22/2005, Entered: 12/27/2005 ~Notice (other)
                      **SEALED**NOTICE of Filing Expert Reports, filed by DUKE POWER, DUKE ENERGY CORPORATION. Service: 12/20/2005.(mb2, )
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 221 Filed: 11/17/2005, Entered: 11/17/2005 Court Filing
                        ORDER: on or before 2/1/2006, the parties shall contact the court to schedule a follow-up status conference. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (jwg) Modified on 11/18/2005 to correct clerical error.(dls ).
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 220 Filed: 10/27/2005, Entered: 10/27/2005 Court Filing
                          ORDER rescheduling telephone conference currently scheduled for 10/27/05 to 2:30 p.m. on 11/17/05. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (jwg)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 219 Filed: 10/25/2005, Entered: 10/25/2005 Court Filing
                            ORDER granting [217] Motion for Leave to File Expert Reports Under Seal. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (jwg)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 218 Filed: 10/24/2005, Entered: 10/24/2005, Terminated: 3/13/2007 Motion for Extension of Time
                              First MOTION for Extension of Time until Week of November 14, 2005 to Telephonic Status Conference, filed by USA. Response due by 11/10/2005. (Shultis, Russell)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 217 Filed: 10/13/2005, Entered: 10/13/2005, Terminated: 10/25/2005 Motion for Leave to File
                                MOTION for Leave to File Expert Reports Under Seal filed by DUKE POWER, DUKE ENERGY CORPORATION. Response due by 10/31/2005. (Chu, Jack)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 216 Filed: 6/2/2005, Entered: 6/2/2005 Court Filing
                                  ORDER granting [215] Motion for Extension of Time. The time within which plaintiff shall provide defendant with its claim letter is extended to 10/13/05; the telephone conference currently scheduled for 7/21/05 is rescheduled for 10/27/05. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (jwg)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 6/2/2005, Entered: 6/6/2005 Set/Reset Hearings
                                    Set/Reset Hearings: Telephonic Status Conference set for 10/27/2005 02:30 PM before Senior Judge John P. Wiese. (jat, )
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 215 Filed: 5/27/2005, Entered: 5/27/2005, Terminated: 6/2/2005 Motion for Extension of Time
                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 10/11/2005 to Submit Expert Reports with Auditable Past & Future Damages and Motion for Clarification filed by DUKE POWER, DUKE ENERGY CORPORATION. Response due by 6/13/2005. (Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 214 Filed: 4/7/2005, Entered: 4/7/2005
                                        NOTICE of Change of Address by Jack Yee-Chieh Chu (Chu, Jack)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 213 Filed: 3/29/2005, Entered: 3/29/2005
                                          NOTICE by DUKE POWER, DUKE ENERGY CORPORATION Of Federal Circuit Order Regarding Plaintiff's Petition For Permission To Appeal (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (March 25, 2005 Federal Circuit Order))(Chu, Jack)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 212 Filed: 3/7/2005, Entered: 3/7/2005 Court Filing
                                            ORDER REGARDING INITIAL PRETRIAL PROCEDURES: on or before 7/1/05, plaintiff shall provide defendant with a claim letter identifying all costs plaintiff is seeking to recover in this action; a telephone conference is scheduled for 2:30 p.m. on 7/21/05. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (jwg)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 211 Filed: 3/7/2005, Entered: 3/7/2005 Court Filing
                                              ORDER FORMALIZING DEFENDANT'S ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF LIABILITY FOR PARTIAL BREACH. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (jwg)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 210 Filed: 3/3/2005, Entered: 3/3/2005 Court Filing
                                                ORDER deferring ruling on [70] Motion for Summary Judgment, deferring ruling on [93] Motion for Summary Judgment, deferring ruling on [141] Cross Motion, deferring ruling on [186] Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(6). Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (jwg)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 209 Filed: 3/3/2005, Entered: 3/3/2005 Court Filing
                                                  ORDER granting [202] Motion for Reconsideration and Vacating [200] Published Opinion and Order. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (jwg )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 208 Filed: 3/1/2005, Entered: 3/1/2005
                                                    RESPONSE to [202] MOTION for Reconsideration re [200] Published Opinion,, Pursuant to the Court's February 23, 2005 Order filed by USA. (Lester, Harold)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 207 Filed: 2/23/2005, Entered: 2/23/2005 Court Filing
                                                      (CORRECTED ENTRY) ORDER ESTABLISHING FILING DEADLINE AND SCHEDULING TELEPHONE CONFERENCE: On or before 3/1/05, defendant shall file its response to plaintiff's motion for reconsideration; a follow-up telephone conference is set for 3/3/2005 04:00 PM before Senior Judge John P. Wiese. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (jwg)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 206 Filed: 2/23/2005, Entered: 2/23/2005 Court Filing
                                                        TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 3/3/2005 04:00 PM. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (jwg)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank -- Filed: 2/23/2005, Entered: 2/24/2005 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                          Set/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 3/1/2005 (jat, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 205 Filed: 2/15/2005, Entered: 2/16/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER (CORRECTED COPY): A telephone Conference is scheduled for 2:00 p.m. on February 23, 2005. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (jwg)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 204 Filed: 2/15/2005, Entered: 2/15/2005 Court Filing
                                                              ORDER: A telephone conference is scheduled for 2:00 p.m. on February 23, 2005. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (jwg)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank -- Filed: 2/15/2005, Entered: 2/16/2005 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                                                Set Deadlines/Hearings: Telephonic Status Conference set for 2/23/2005 02:00 PM before Senior Judge John P. Wiese. (jat, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 203 Filed: 2/10/2005, Entered: 2/10/2005
                                                                  MEMORANDUM by DUKE POWER, DUKE ENERGY CORPORATION. (Chu, Jack)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 202 Filed: 2/10/2005, Entered: 2/10/2005, Terminated: 3/3/2005 Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                    MOTION for Reconsideration re [200] Published Opinion,, by DUKE POWER, DUKE ENERGY CORPORATION. (Chu, Jack)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 201 Filed: 2/2/2005, Entered: 2/3/2005 Notice of ReassignmentCourt Filing
                                                                      NOTICE of Reassignment to Senior Judge John P. Wiese. (dls )
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 2/2/2005, Entered: 2/2/2005
                                                                        ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Pursuant to RCFC 40.1(c), for the efficient administration of justice, this case is reassigned to Judge John P. Wiese for all further proceedings. Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (jsb)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 200 Filed: 1/31/2005, Entered: 1/31/2005 Court Filing
                                                                          PUBLISHED OPINION. Transferring plaintiffs Florida Power and Duke Power's breach of contract claims to the D.C. Circuit, dismissing plaintiffs Nebraska Public Power and PSEG Nuclear's breach of contract claims for lack of jurisdiction, certifying this opinion so that the parties may bring an interlocutory appeal to the Federal Circuit pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1292(c)(1); and staying the plaintiffs' remaining claims pending resolution of the jurisdictional issues raised in this opinion on appeal. Signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt. (wf1, ) Modified on 2/4/2005 to include interlocutory language. (dls ). Modified on 3/7/2005 (jat, ). (VACATED PURSUANT TO ORDER OF 3/3/05)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 199 Filed: 1/4/2005, Entered: 1/4/2005
                                                                            RESPONSE TO [194] ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Brief in opposition to petition for writ of cert in Consolidated Edison v. US# (2) Appendix Petition for writ of cert in US v. Northern States Power)(Finn, Stephen)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 198 Filed: 12/30/2004, Entered: 12/30/2004, Terminated: 3/13/2007 Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                            MOTION for Reconsideration re [197] Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by USA. Response due by 1/18/2005 (Herrmann, Heide)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 197 Filed: 12/27/2004, Entered: 12/27/2004 Court Filing
                                                                              ORDER denying [196] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Defendant's response to plaintiffs' responses to the court's October 14, 2004 show cause order due by 1/4/2005. Signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt.(wf1, )
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 196 Filed: 12/15/2004, Entered: 12/15/2004, Terminated: 12/27/2004 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to [195] Response to Order to Show Cause,until 1/14/2005, by USA. Response due by 1/3/2005 (Lester, Harold) Modified on 12/17/2004 for clarity (dw1).
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 195 Filed: 11/12/2004, Entered: 11/12/2004
                                                                                  RESPONSE TO [194] ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by DUKE ENERGY CORPORATION, DUKE POWER. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix To Plaintiffs' Response To The Court's October 14, 2004 Order To Show Cause)(Chu, Jack)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 194 Filed: 10/14/2004, Entered: 10/14/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                  ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why complaint should not be dismissed or transferred to the D.C. Circuit for lack of jurisdiction. Show Cause Response due by 11/12/2004. Signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt. (wf1, )
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 193 Filed: 4/16/2004, Entered: 4/16/2004
                                                                                    NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (jat, )
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 192 Filed: 4/12/2004, Entered: 4/14/2004 Description not available
                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re [186] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by USA. Service: 4/12/04.(jat, )
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 191 Filed: 3/26/2004, Entered: 3/29/2004 Response to Motion
                                                                                        MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION to [186] Dft's MOTION to Dismiss Count III of Pltf's Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6), filed by DUKE ENERGY CORPORATION, DUKE POWER. Reply due by 4/12/2004. Service: 3/26/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 190 Filed: 3/23/2004, Entered: 3/25/2004 Order on Motion to StayCourt Filing
                                                                                          ORDER granting [185] Dft's Unopposed Motion to Stay its Response to the Remainder of the Complaint Pending Resolution of its Motion to Dismiss Count III of the Complaint for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted. Dft shall file its response to the remainder of the complaint 10 days after disposition of its motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone for Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt. (jcp, ) Modified on 3/25/2004 (jcp, ).
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 189 Filed: 3/16/2004, Entered: 3/18/2004 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                            REPLY to Pltf's Opposition to [185] Dft's MOTION to Stay Response to the Remainder of the Complaint Pending Resolution of Motion to Dismiss filed by USA. Service: 3/16/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 188 Filed: 3/9/2004, Entered: 3/11/2004 Response to Motion
                                                                                              RESPONSE OPPOSING [185] Dft's MOTION to Stay Response to the Remainder of the Complaint Pending Resolution of Motion to Dismiss filed by DUKE POWER. Reply due by 3/23/2004. Service: 3/9/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 187 Filed: 2/26/2004, Entered: 3/1/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                ORDER: On 2/18/2004, the dft filed a request to correct a typographical error in the motion for enlargement, filed on 2/17/2004. The motion for enlargement having been granted, dft's request is denied as moot. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (jcp, )
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 186 Filed: 2/24/2004, Entered: 2/29/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss Count III of the Complaint pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) by USA.Service: 2/24/2004. Response due by 3/26/2004 (lg1, )
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 185 Filed: 2/24/2004, Entered: 2/29/2004, Terminated: 3/23/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                    MOTION to Stay response to the remainder of the complaint pending resolution of motion to dismiss by USA.Service: 2/24/04. Response due by 3/12/2004 (jat, )
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 184 Filed: 2/19/2004, Entered: 2/27/2004 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER granting [183] Motion for Extension of Time to respond to plaintiff's amended complaint until 2/24/2004. Signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt. (lld, )
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 183 Filed: 2/17/2004, Entered: 2/24/2004, Terminated: 2/19/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re [181] Amended Complaint until 2/24/2004 by USA.Service: 2/17/04. Response due by 3/5/2004 (jat, )
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 182 Filed: 2/12/2004, Entered: 2/19/2004 Order on Motion Lifting StayCourt Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER: On 1/30/2004, pltf submitted for filing a motion for leave to lift the stay to file a first amended complaint. Leave is not required for either action. Therefore, the [180] Motion is moot. Because the clerk's office erroneously failed to file the 1/30/2004 motion on the date of receipt, it shall be filed as of that date. Therefore, the clerk shall file the first amended complaint as of the same date. Signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt. (jcp, )
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 181 Filed: 2/12/2004, Entered: 2/19/2004 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                            FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, Nunc Pro Tunc 1/30/2004. Service: 1/30/2004.(jcp, ) Modified on 2/26/2004 to correct filing date (jcp, ).
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 180 Filed: 1/30/2004, Entered: 2/19/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to Lift Stay to File First Amended Complaint by DUKE ENERGY CORPORATION, DUKE POWER.Service: 1/30/2004. Response due by 2/17/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 1/30/2004, Entered: 1/30/2004
                                                                                                                ORDER: The Court hereby DENIES [174] Dft's Second Motion to Renew its Motion toConsolidate as well as its previous motions relating to consolidation. The Court further LIFTS THE STAY of the remainder of the cases to which the Order of 4/16/2003, applied. The Clerk of the Court is directed to docket this Order in this case with an entry noting the same on the dockets of the remaining SNFcases captioned in Dft's instant motion, with a courtesy copy to all SNF parties and presiding SNF judges of the Court. [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT LOCATED IN CASE NO. 98-126C] Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 179 Filed: 12/2/2003, Entered: 12/5/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Counsel for Dft's Change of Facsimile Number by USA. Service: 12/1/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 178 Filed: 10/27/2003, Entered: 10/28/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER re: all filings in this case relating to issues of consolidation shall be captioned solely in the name of this case and shall show the name of the presiding judge in this case. A courtesy copy of any such filing relating to issues of consolidation shall be provided to the Clerk's Office for transmission to the Chief Judge. Signed by Judge Diane G. Sypolt. (jat, )
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 177 Filed: 9/23/2003, Entered: 9/25/2003 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      REPLY to Pltfs' Responses to [174] Dft's Second MOTION to the Chief Judge to Renew Consideration of Dft's Motion to Consolidate filed by USA, Filed by Leave of the Judge. Service: 9/3/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 176 Filed: 9/23/2003, Entered: 9/25/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [175] Dft's Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to [174] Dft's Second MOTION to Renew its Motion to Consolidate. The reply is filed by leave of the court. Reply due by 9/3/2003. Signed by Judge Diane G. Sypolt. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 175 Filed: 9/3/2003, Entered: 9/8/2003, Terminated: 9/23/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to Pltfs' Response to Dft's Second Motion to Renew Its Motion to Consolidate, until 9/3/03, by USA.Service: 9/3/03. Response due by 9/22/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 8/26/2003, Entered: 8/29/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                            MOTION to the Chief Judge for Extension of Time to File Reply to Pltfs' Responses to Dft's Second Motion to Renew Its Motion to Consolidate, until 9/3/03, by USA. [Original document located in Case No. 98-126C]Service: 8/26/03. Response due by 9/12/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/29/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                              OPPOSITION to [174] Dft's Second MOTION to Renew Its Motion to Consolidate filed by DUKE POWER. [Original document located in Case No. 98-483C] Reply due by 8/29/2003. Service: 8/15/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 8/8/2003, Entered: 8/8/2003
                                                                                                                                Set/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 8/15/2003 (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 8/5/2003, Entered: 8/7/2003 Remark
                                                                                                                                  Dft's Motion to the Chief Judge for Leave to Correct Certificate of Service and to Waive Requirements of RCFC 5.3 Regarding "Dft's Second Motion [to the Chief Judge] to Renew its Motion to Consolidate." (Original Motion located in Case No. 98-126C) (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 174 Filed: 7/30/2003, Entered: 7/31/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                    SECOND MOTION to Renew Its Motion to Consolidate by USA. [COPY] (Original Document in Case No. 98-126C)Service: 7/29/03 by hand. Response due by 8/12/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 172 Filed: 4/17/2003, Entered: 4/22/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE re [141] Cross Motion for partial summary judgment regarding the rate of spent nuclear fuel acceptance (together with separate appendix) filed by The United States. Reply due by 4/25/2003. Service: 4/11/03 by hand.(hw1, )
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 171 Filed: 4/17/2003, Entered: 4/22/2003 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [168] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Signed by Judge Diane G. Sypolt. (hw1, )
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 169 Filed: 4/17/2003, Entered: 4/17/2003
                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by The United States. Service: 4/11/03 by hand.(hw1, )
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 173 Filed: 4/16/2003, Entered: 4/25/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 170 Filed: 4/11/2003, Entered: 4/18/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Strike portions of plaintiff's filings concerning the rate of acceptance of spent Nuclear fuel by The United States.Service: 4/11/03 by hand. Response due by 4/25/2003 (hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 168 Filed: 4/11/2003, Entered: 4/17/2003, Terminated: 4/17/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit of Reply Brief by 30 pages by The United States.Service by hand: 4/11/03. Response due by 4/25/2003. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 167 Filed: 4/2/2003, Entered: 4/8/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, re: further proceedings. Signed by Judge Diane G. Sypolt. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 166 Filed: 3/18/2003, Entered: 3/21/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 165 Filed: 3/13/2003, Entered: 3/14/2003 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fa
                                                                                                                                                      Response by USA to [142-1] proposed findings by DUKE ENERGY CORPORATION, DUKE POWER. Service: 3/10/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 164 Filed: 3/13/2003, Entered: 3/14/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                        REPLY by USA to response to [70-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment. Service: 3/10/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 163 Filed: 3/13/2003, Entered: 3/14/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [162-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 162 Filed: 3/10/2003, Entered: 3/11/2003, Terminated: 3/13/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 3/10/03) For leave to exceed the page limitation . Response due: 3/27/03. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 161 Filed: 3/7/2003, Entered: 3/10/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER re: See order [612-1] dated 3/7/03, in case 98-126C (signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 160 Filed: 3/6/2003, Entered: 3/7/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [159-1] motion for Leave to remove filings from under seal (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 159 Filed: 2/27/2003, Entered: 3/5/2003, Terminated: 3/6/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by DUKE POWER (Service: 2/27/03) for Leave to remove filings from under seal . Response due: 3/17/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 158 Filed: 2/25/2003, Entered: 3/4/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt) . Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 157 Filed: 2/24/2003, Entered: 3/3/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 156 Filed: 2/5/2003, Entered: 2/13/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [146-1] motion to Extend Time to file response to Plaintiff's cross-motion and reply to the motion for summary judgment Response to [141-1] cross motion due 4/11/03 , and Reply to Response to Motion due 3/11/03 for [70-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 155 Filed: 2/5/2003, Entered: 2/13/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 154 Filed: 1/31/2003, Entered: 2/12/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 153 Filed: 1/29/2003, Entered: 2/7/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 151 Filed: 1/27/2003, Entered: 1/27/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY by USA to response to [146-1] motion to Extend Time to file response to Plaintiff's cross-motion and reply to the motion for summary judgment. Service: 1/21/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 152 Filed: 1/23/2003, Entered: 1/31/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, re: see 98-126 C for order ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 150 Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: 1/24/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [148-1] motion for Leave to place filings under seal temporarily (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 149 Filed: 1/15/2003, Entered: 1/23/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by DUKE POWER (Service: 1/15/03) to [146-1] motion to Extend Time to file response to Plaintiff's cross-motion and reply to the motion for summary judgment. Reply due: 1/30/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 148 Filed: 1/13/2003, Entered: 1/21/2003, Terminated: 1/16/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by DUKE POWER (Service: 1/30/02) for Leave to place filings under seal temporarily . Response due: 1/30/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 147 Filed: 1/9/2003, Entered: 1/15/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 146 Filed: 1/9/2003, Entered: 1/13/2003, Terminated: 2/5/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 1/9/03) to Extend Time to file response to Plaintiff's cross-motion and reply to the motion for summary judgment until ? Response due: 1/27/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 145 Filed: 1/7/2003, Entered: 1/11/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER returning Plaintiff's motion received 12/30/02 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 144 Filed: 1/6/2003, Entered: 1/10/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY by DUKE POWER to response to [132-1] motion for Summary Judgment on liability. Service: 1/6/03 . (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 143 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/6/2003 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fa
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Response by DUKE POWER, DUKE ENERGY CORPORAT to [94-1] proposed findings by USA. Service: 12/16/02 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 142 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/6/2003 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                    PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by DUKE POWER, DUKE ENERGY CORPORAT. Service: 12/16/02 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 141 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/6/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                      CROSS MOTION by DUKE POWER, DUKE ENERGY CORPORAT ( Service: 12/16/02 ) and RESPONSE to [93-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment regarding the rate of spent nuclear fuel acceptance by USA, (together with a separate appendix). Response due: 1/16/03. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 140 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/6/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [133-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 139 Filed: 12/19/2002, Entered: 12/27/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by USA (Service: 12/19/02 ) to [132-1] motion for Summary Judgment on liability. Reply due: 1/6/03. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 138 Filed: 12/19/2002, Entered: 12/27/2002 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fa
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Response by USA to [136-1] proposed findings by DUKE ENERGY CORPORAT, DUKE POWER. Service: 12/19/02 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 137 Filed: 12/18/2002, Entered: 12/20/2002 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted FaCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Response by DUKE POWER, DUKE ENERGY CORPORAT to [71-1] proposed findings by USA (regardings greater than class c radioactive waste arguments), by leave of Judge. Service: 12/16/02. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 136 Filed: 12/18/2002, Entered: 12/20/2002 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted FactCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by DUKE POWER, DUKE ENERGY CORPORAT (re: greater than class c radioactive waste arguments), filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 12/16/02. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 135 Filed: 12/18/2002, Entered: 12/20/2002 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by DUKE POWER, DUKE ENERGY CORPORAT (Service: 12/16/02 ) to [70-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment (together with separate appendix), by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 1/2/03 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 134 Filed: 12/16/2002, Entered: 12/18/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by DUKE POWER, DUKE ENERGY CORPORAT (Service : 12/16/02 ) for Oral Argument re: Motions for Summary Judgment. Response due: 1/2/03 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 133 Filed: 12/16/2002, Entered: 12/18/2002, Terminated: 1/2/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by DUKE POWER (Service: 12/16/02) For leave to exceed the page limitation for response to the motion for partial summary judgment. Response due: 1/2/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 132 Filed: 11/26/2002, Entered: 12/1/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by DUKE POWER (Service : 11/26/02 ) for Summary Judgment on liability . Response due: 12/27/02 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 131 Filed: 11/14/2002, Entered: 11/18/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Response to [93-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment regarding the rate of spent nuclear fuel acceptance due 12/16/02, [70-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment due 12/16/02 , and Reply to Response to Motion due 1/10/03 for [93-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment regarding the rate of spent nuclear fuel acceptance, due 1/10/03 for [70-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 130 Filed: 10/16/2002, Entered: 10/18/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow for Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 129 Filed: 10/9/2002, Entered: 10/11/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER see 98-126C for Order. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 128 Filed: 9/10/2002, Entered: 9/16/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 127 Filed: 9/5/2002, Entered: 9/9/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, re: See order in98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 126 Filed: 8/22/2002, Entered: 8/27/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 125 Filed: 8/20/2002, Entered: 8/22/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 124 Filed: 8/16/2002, Entered: 8/21/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 123 Filed: 8/5/2002, Entered: 8/7/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER, re: See order in 98-485C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 122 Filed: 7/30/2002, Entered: 8/5/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 121 Filed: 7/29/2002, Entered: 8/1/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER re: see order [467-1] dated 7/29/02, in case No. 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 120 Filed: 7/23/2002, Entered: 7/26/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 119 Filed: 7/16/2002, Entered: 7/18/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 118 Filed: 7/15/2002, Entered: 7/17/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 117 Filed: 7/10/2002, Entered: 7/12/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 116 Filed: 7/9/2002, Entered: 7/11/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER - see 98-126C for Order. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 115 Filed: 7/3/2002, Entered: 7/3/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 114 Filed: 7/2/2002, Entered: 7/3/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER-see Order in 98-126C ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 113 Filed: 6/28/2002, Entered: 7/1/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER-see 98-126C for Order ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 112 Filed: 6/18/2002, Entered: 6/19/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C.(signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (VO)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 111 Filed: 6/17/2002, Entered: 6/18/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, Re: see order in 98-126 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt) Copy to parties. (VO)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 110 Filed: 6/6/2002, Entered: 6/11/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, re order in 98-126, filed 6/6/02. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 109 Filed: 6/4/2002, Entered: 6/4/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER, re: see order in 98-126, filed 6/03/02. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (FE) Modified on 06/04/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 108 Filed: 5/28/2002, Entered: 5/29/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 107 Filed: 5/20/2002, Entered: 5/21/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 106 Filed: 5/9/2002, Entered: 5/10/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER re: See [395-1] order in case No. 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 104 Filed: 5/8/2002, Entered: 5/8/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 105 Filed: 5/7/2002, Entered: 5/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 103 Filed: 5/6/2002, Entered: 5/7/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 102 Filed: 5/3/2002, Entered: 5/3/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, re: See order in 98-126 (signed by Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 101 Filed: 4/26/2002, Entered: 4/29/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER, re: see order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 100 Filed: 4/23/2002, Entered: 4/24/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 99 Filed: 4/18/2002, Entered: 4/18/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER, Re: see order in 98-126 ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (VO)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 98 Filed: 4/11/2002, Entered: 4/11/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER re: see order [344-2] dated 4/11/02 in Case No. 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 97 Filed: 3/25/2002, Entered: 3/26/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER, re: see order in 98-126 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 96 Filed: 3/19/2002, Entered: 3/20/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER, re: See order in 98-126 (signed by Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir for Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 95 Filed: 3/5/2002, Entered: 3/6/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying Motion to preclude or, in the alternative, defer, depositions pursuant to Rule 30(b)(6) (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 94 Filed: 3/5/2002, Entered: 3/6/2002 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA. Service by hand: 11/28/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 93 Filed: 3/5/2002, Entered: 3/6/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service by hand: 11/28/01) for Partial Summary Judgment regarding the rate of spent nuclear fuel acceptance , filed with a (1) one volume appendix in support. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 92 Filed: 3/5/2002, Entered: 3/6/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [72-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 91 Filed: 2/28/2002, Entered: 3/1/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting Motion to Extend Time to respond to interrogatories until 3/8/02 ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 90 Filed: 2/20/2002, Entered: 2/21/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER, re: SEE CASE NO. 98-126 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 88 Filed: 2/14/2002, Entered: 2/14/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of reassignment to Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt . Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 89 Filed: 2/13/2002, Entered: 2/14/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER, re: see order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 87 Filed: 2/1/2002, Entered: 2/4/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying motion to reconsider filed 1/22/02 and granting the motion to revise dates in 9/26/01 order filed 1/24/02 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 86 Filed: 2/1/2002, Entered: 2/4/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER. See order in 98-126C filed 2/1/02. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 85 Filed: 2/1/2002, Entered: 2/4/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying motion to reconsider filed 1/22/02 and granting the motion to revise dates in 9/26/01 order filed 1/24/02 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 84 Filed: 1/29/2002, Entered: 1/29/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER setting Status Conference for 2:00 p.m. on 2/12/02 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 83 Filed: 1/22/2002, Entered: 1/22/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [82-1] motion to defer briefing on Government motions. Proceedings are STAYED pending completion of discovery on the Schedule Issues (signed by Sr. Judge Moody R. Tidwell, III). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 82 Filed: 1/17/2002, Entered: 1/17/2002, Terminated: 1/22/2002 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by DUKE POWER (Service: 1/17/02) to defer briefing on Government motions . Response due: 2/4/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 81 Filed: 1/11/2002, Entered: 1/14/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER see order in 98-126C filed 1/11/02. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 80 Filed: 1/10/2002, Entered: 1/11/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by USA (Service: 1/8/02) to [73-1] motion for a status conference. Reply due: 1/23/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 79 Filed: 1/10/2002, Entered: 1/11/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [78-1] motion for Leave to file response to the Motion for a Status Conference (signed by Sr. Judge Moody R. Tidwell, III). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 78 Filed: 1/8/2002, Entered: 1/9/2002, Terminated: 1/10/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 1/8/02) for Leave to file response to the Motion for a Status Conference . Response due: 1/24/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 77 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: 1/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [74-1] motion to Extend Time to file a response to the Motion for partial Summary Judgment Response to [70-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment reset to 1/25/02 (signed by Sr. Judge Moody R. Tidwell, III). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 75 Filed: 1/4/2002, Entered: 1/7/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER re: The Clerk of the Court shall return the Defendant's "Response in Opposition to Motion for a Status Conference", received by the Court on 1/2/02, for not complying with Rule 81(d)(2) of the RCFC (signed by Sr. Judge Moody R. Tidwell, III). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 76 Filed: 1/3/2002, Entered: 1/7/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER see order in 98-126C filed 01/03/02 ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 74 Filed: 12/21/2001, Entered: 12/27/2001, Terminated: 1/7/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by DUKE POWER (Service: 12/21/01) to Extend Time to file a response to the Motion for partial Summary Judgment until 1/25/02. Response due: 1/7/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 73 Filed: 12/14/2001, Entered: 12/17/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by DUKE POWER (Service: 12/14/01) for a status conference . Response due: 1/2/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 72 Filed: 11/29/2001, Entered: 11/30/2001, Terminated: 3/5/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service by hand: 11/28/01) For leave to exceed the page limitation . Response due: 12/12/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 71 Filed: 11/28/2001, Entered: 11/30/2001 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA. Service by hand: 11/27/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 70 Filed: 11/28/2001, Entered: 11/30/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION, with one volume of Appendix, by USA (Service by hand: 11/27/01) for partial Summary Judgment . Response due: 12/26/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 69 Filed: 11/20/2001, Entered: 11/21/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER see order in 98-126C filed 11/20/01 ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 68 Filed: 11/16/2001, Entered: 11/19/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER see order in 98-126C filed 11/16/01. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 67 Filed: 11/14/2001, Entered: 11/16/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER see order in 98-126C filed 11/14/01. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 66 Filed: 11/14/2001, Entered: 11/16/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER see order in 98-126C filed 11/14/01. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 65 Filed: 11/8/2001, Entered: 11/9/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER. See 98-126C. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 64 Filed: 11/8/2001, Entered: 11/9/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER. See 98-126C. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 63 Filed: 11/6/2001, Entered: 11/7/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting motion to enlarge time to respond to motion to compel production of documents to 11/06/01 ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 62 Filed: 11/6/2001, Entered: 11/7/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER re: Public Service Electric and Gas motion to extend time filed on 11/2/01, within which to respond to the defendant's motion to compel is GRANTED (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (see motion filed in 98-126C) (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 61 Filed: 11/6/2001, Entered: 11/7/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting motion to complete production of documents to 11/19/01 ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 59 Filed: 11/1/2001, Entered: 11/5/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER denying [48-1] motion for Clarification of the Court's 9/26/01 order. Individual Judges retains the right to decide dispositive motions. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 58 Filed: 10/29/2001, Entered: 10/31/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [49-1] motion for Leave to file copies of the Motion to Transfer Responsibility, etc. and granting Plaintiff's Motion for leave copies of response to transfer motion (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 60 Filed: 10/26/2001, Entered: 11/6/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER denying motion for leave to file the Motion for Clarification (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 57 Filed: 10/19/2001, Entered: 10/23/2001 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of supplemental certificate of service by USA. Service: 10/19/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 56 Filed: 10/19/2001, Entered: 10/23/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service: 10/19/01) to Compel . Response due: 11/5/01. (Filed with response to third party objections). (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 56 Filed: 10/19/2001, Entered: 10/23/2001 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by USA to third party objections. Service: 10/19/01. (Filed with Motion to Compel). (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 54 Filed: 10/19/2001, Entered: 10/22/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER re: All filing s shall bear the name of the discovery Judge, all matters to be brought to the attention of the Court shall be filed with the discovery Judge only, the Clerk of the Court is directed not to accept for filing any motion by a party in one of the captioned cases for leave to file material with a Judge in an individual case ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 55 Filed: 10/18/2001, Entered: 10/23/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service: 10/16/01) to Compel . Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 11/2/01. (Filed with response to third party objections). (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 55 Filed: 10/18/2001, Entered: 10/23/2001 ResponseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by USA to third party objections. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 10/16/01. (Filed with Motion to Compel). (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 53 Filed: 10/18/2001, Entered: 10/19/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER directing the Clerk's Office to file Defendant's response and Defendant's corrected certificate of service due 10/25/01 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 52 Filed: 10/17/2001, Entered: 10/18/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER re: Defendant's motion to extend time filed on 10/15/01, within which to file the proposed stipulated order concerning the scheduling and conduct of depositions in the coordinated discovery proceeding, is GRANTED, see motion in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 51 Filed: 10/17/2001, Entered: 10/18/2001 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE to the Court regarding liability by USA. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 10/12/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 50 Filed: 10/17/2001, Entered: 10/18/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER directing the Clerk's Office to file Defendant's notice regarding liability and Plaintiff's response to notice due by 10/29/01 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 49 Filed: 10/11/2001, Entered: 10/15/2001, Terminated: 10/29/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 10/10/01) for Leave to file copies of the Motion to Transfer Responsibility, etc. . Response due: 10/29/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 48 Filed: 10/9/2001, Entered: 10/10/2001, Terminated: 11/1/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by DUKE POWER (Service by hand: 10/9/01) for Clarification of the Court's 9/26/01 order . Response due: 10/23/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 47 Filed: 10/3/2001, Entered: 10/4/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [46-1] motion to Extend Time to submit a plan for production of e-mail messages Plan is to be filed by 10/22/01 signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 46 Filed: 10/3/2001, Entered: 10/4/2001, Terminated: 10/3/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 10/1/01) to Extend Time to submit a plan for production of e-mail messages until 10/22/01. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 45 Filed: 9/26/2001, Entered: 9/27/2001 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Russell Alan Shultis. Service: 9/25/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 44 Filed: 9/26/2001, Entered: 9/26/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER re: The Joint Motion for an Order for Consolidated Discovery filed on 7/10/01, is granted, with the exception of document production, the parties are granted an enlargement of time until 10/1/01, to submit a plan addressing the production of e-mail messages (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 43 Filed: 9/13/2001, Entered: 9/13/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER setting Status Conference for 4:00 p.m. on 9/20/01 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 42 Filed: 9/10/2001, Entered: 9/10/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [39-1] motion for Leave to file in this case a copy of filings made before Judge Wiese as managing Judge (signed by Sr. Judge Moody R. Tidwell, III). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 41 Filed: 8/22/2001, Entered: 8/22/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting motion for protective order in the form provided by Exhibit A of the parties 08/10/01 motion (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). See case number 98-126 C for motion. Protective order in 98-458 C is also granted, subject to reconsideration by assigned judge. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 40 Filed: 8/15/2001, Entered: 8/16/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER setting Status Conference for 2:00 p.m. on 9/11/01 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein, Discovery Judge) Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 39 Filed: 7/13/2001, Entered: 7/16/2001, Terminated: 9/10/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by DUKE POWER, DUKE ENERGY CORPORAT (Service: 7/13/01) for Leave to file in this case a copy of filings made before Judge Wiese as managing Judge . (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 38 Filed: 7/5/2001, Entered: 7/6/2001 RemarkCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Copy of Yankee Atomic's Motion for Leave to file documents relevant to the telephone conference with Judge Wiese. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 37 Filed: 5/31/2001, Entered: 6/1/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER resetting Status Conference for 2:30 p.m. on 6/14/01 (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 36 Filed: 5/29/2001, Entered: 5/31/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER setting Status Conference for 10:30 a.m. on 6/14/01 (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 35 Filed: 5/22/2001, Entered: 5/25/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER: On 1/8/2001, Dft filed a [21-1] Motion to the Chief Judge to reassign to a single Judge cases involving alleged breaches of the standard contract published at 10 CFR Part 961. The Chief Judge hereby designates Judge Wiese as the managing judge in the above cited cases for the purpose of meeting with the parties to consider whether consolidation or other joint handling of discovery or other pre-trial matters is appropriate. Judge Wiese is requested to formulate a management plan, if one is appropriate, and is authorized to make appropriate rulings with respect to this purpose. (signed by Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir). Judge Wiese is designated as managing judge. Copy to parties. (LTD) Modified on 3/17/2004 (jcp, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 34 Filed: 2/21/2001, Entered: 2/23/2001 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE (Service by hand: 1/29/01 ) to [21-1] motion to the Chief Judge to reassign to a single Judge cases involving alleged breaches of the standard contract, etc.,(together with separate appendix), filed by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 2/8/01 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 33 Filed: 2/21/2001, Entered: 2/23/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [30-1] motion for Leave to file in this case a copy of "Yankee Utilities" opposition to motion to reassign cases ( signed by Sr. Judge Moody R. Tidwell, III ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 32 Filed: 2/21/2001, Entered: 2/23/2001 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY by USA to response to [21-1] motion to the Chief Judge to reassign to a single Judge cases involving alleged breaches of the standard contract, etc. Service: 2/16/01 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 31 Filed: 2/21/2001, Entered: 2/23/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [29-1] motion for Leave to file in this case copy of reply to motion to reassign to a single Judge cases involving alleged breaches of contract, etc. ( signed by Sr. Judge Moody R. Tidwell, III ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 30 Filed: 2/20/2001, Entered: 2/22/2001, Terminated: 2/21/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by DUKE POWER and DUKE ENERGY CORPORAT (Service: 2/20/01) for Leave to file in this case a copy of "Yankee Utilities" opposition to motion to reassign cases . Response due: 2/20/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 29 Filed: 2/20/2001, Entered: 2/21/2001, Terminated: 2/21/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 2/20/01 ) for Leave to file inthis case a copy of reply to motion to reassign to a single Judge cases involving alleged breaches of contract, etc. Response due: 3/9/01 (HW) Modified on 02/21/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 28 Filed: 1/31/2001, Entered: 1/31/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by DUKE POWER, DUKE ENERGY CORPORAT (Service: 1/29/01 ) to [21-1] motion to the Chief Judge to reassign to a single Judge cases involving alleged breaches of the standard contract, etc. Reply due: 2/12/01 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 27 Filed: 1/31/2001, Entered: 1/31/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [21-1] motion to the Chief Judge to reassign to a single Judge cases involving alleged breaches of the standard contract, etc. (signed by Sr. Judge Moody R. Tidwell, III). Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 26 Filed: 1/30/2001, Entered: 1/30/2001, Terminated: 12/16/2002 Motion for Leave to FileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by DUKE POWER and DUKE ENERGY CORPORAT (Service: 1/30/01) for Leave to file a copy of "Plaintiff's memorandum in opposition to the USA's motion to the Chief Judge to reassign to a single Judge the fourteen pending standard contract cases" . (FE) Modified on 01/30/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 25 Filed: 1/29/2001, Entered: 1/30/2001 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  JOINT STATUS REPORT filed. Service: 1/29/01 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 24 Filed: 1/29/2001, Entered: 1/30/2001 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    See 30-1 Response to motion filed January 29, 2001, in 98-483C Florida Power & Light Company. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 23 Filed: 1/23/2001, Entered: 1/24/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [22-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the USA's motion to the Chief Judge to reassign cases to a single Judge Response to [21-1] motion to the Chief Judge to reassign to a single Judge cases involving alleged breaches of the standard contract, etc. reset to 1/29/01 ( signed by Sr. Judge Moody R. Tidwell, III). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 22 Filed: 1/22/2001, Entered: 1/23/2001, Terminated: 1/23/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by DUKE POWER and DUKE ENERGY CORPORAT (Service by hand: 1/22/01) to Extend Time to respond to the USA's motion to the Chief Judge to reassign cases to a single Judge , (until January 29, 2001). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 21 Filed: 1/11/2001, Entered: 1/12/2001, Terminated: 1/31/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service: 1/11/01) to the Chief Judge to reassign to a single Judge cases involving alleged breaches of the standard contract, etc. . Response due: 1/29/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 20 Filed: 1/11/2001, Entered: 1/12/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [19-1] motion for Leave to file a copy of the USA's motion to the Chief Judge to reassign to a single judge cases involving alleged breaches of the standard contract published at 10 C.F.R. Part 961 (signed by Sr. Judge Moody R. Tidwell, III). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 19 Filed: 1/9/2001, Entered: 1/9/2001, Terminated: 1/11/2001 Motion for Leave to FileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 1/9/01) for Leave to file a copy of the USA's motion to the Chief Judge to reassign to a single judge cases involving alleged breaches of the standard contract published at 10 C.F.R. Part 961 . Response due: 1/23/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 18 Filed: 12/15/2000, Entered: 12/18/2000 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of change of address by Alexander D. Tomaszczuk. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 17 Filed: 11/17/2000, Entered: 11/21/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER re: the proceedings shall continue in suspension until 21 days after the U.S. Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit issues its mandates in Northern States Power Co. and Maine Yankee Atomic Power Co. The parties, thereafter, shall file a joint status report within 39 days of the Federal Circuit's issuance of the aforementioned mandates. ( signed by Sr. Judge Moody R. Tidwell, III ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 16 Filed: 11/15/2000, Entered: 11/17/2000 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    JOINT STATUS REPORT by DUKE POWER, DUKE ENERGY CORPORAT, USA. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 15 Filed: 10/4/2000, Entered: 10/6/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [13-1] motion to Extend Time to file the joint status report. Reset joint Status Report deadline to 11/15/00. ( signed by Sr. Judge Moody R. Tidwell, III ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 14 Filed: 10/2/2000, Entered: 10/5/2000 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT by DUKE POWER, DUKE ENERGY CORPORAT Service: 10/2/00 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 13 Filed: 10/2/2000, Entered: 10/4/2000, Terminated: 10/4/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service: 10/2/00) to Extend Time to file the joint status report , (until November 1, 2000). Response due: 10/19/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 12 Filed: 7/29/1999, Entered: 7/30/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [10-1] motion to continue stay of proceedings (signed by Sr. Judge Moody R. Tidwell, III). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 11 Filed: 7/29/1999, Entered: 7/30/1999 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by DUKE POWER, DUKE ENERGY CORPORAT (Service: 7/29/99 (by hand)) to [10-1] motion to continue stay of proceedings. Reply due: 8/9/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 10 Filed: 7/21/1999, Entered: 7/22/1999, Terminated: 7/29/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 7/21/99 (by hand)) to continue stay of proceedings. Response due: 8/4/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 9 Filed: 5/20/1999, Entered: 6/1/1999 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of change of address by Alexander D. Tomaszczuk. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 8 Filed: 1/12/1999, Entered: 1/15/1999 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Harold Dewitt Lester Jr.. Service : 1/12/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 7 Filed: 6/30/1998, Entered: 7/6/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying [5-1] motion to Consolidate Cases 98-483C, 98-484C, 98-485C and 98-486C. Pursuant to the "Order Establishing Procedure to Serve in Lieu of Consolidation," filed on 6/24/98 in Northern States Power Co. v. United States (98-484), the case is hereby stayed pending the court's decision following resolution of the jurisdictional issues in Northern Power. ( signed by Judge Moody R. Tidwell, III ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 6 Filed: 6/23/1998, Entered: 6/25/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER informing the parties of two rules that will apply to the litigation of this suit in addition to the Rules of the United States Court of Federal Claims. ( signed by Judge Moody R. Tidwell, III ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 5 Filed: 6/17/1998, Entered: 6/18/1998, Terminated: 6/30/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by DUKE POWER (Service : 6/17/98 ) to Consolidate Cases 98-483C, 98-484C, 98-485C and 98-486C. (AB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 4 Filed: 6/17/1998, Entered: 6/18/1998 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Joseph Andrew Kijewski Service : 6/17/98 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 3 Filed: 6/8/1998, Entered: 6/9/1998 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of assignment to Judge Moody R. Tidwell, III. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 2 Filed: 6/8/1998, Entered: 6/9/1998 Notice of Related Cases
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by DUKE POWER, a Division of DUKE ENERGY CORPORATION of related cases; (98-126 C, 98-154 C and 98-474 C). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 6/8/1998, Entered: 6/9/1998 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #045625. Answer due on 8/7/98. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 6/8/1998, Entered: 6/9/1998 Set/Clear Flags
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 180 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?