INDIANA MICHIGAN v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:98-cv-00486-RHH
District Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr., presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Indiana Michigan Power Company, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alexander D. Tomaszczuk +1 703 770 7940 +1 703 770 7901 alex.tomaszczuk@pillsburylaw.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Harold Dewitt Lester, Jr. +1 202 616 0478 +1 202 307 2503 harv.lester@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 6/8/1998
Jury Demand None
Demand $150000000
Nature of Suit 536 - Spent Nuclear Fuel
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed
County None
Terminated 5/25/2004
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Cases '04-5122'[], '04-5122'[], '04-5139'[]
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, ECF, SNF
  Entries (321) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 293 Filed: 12/2/2005, Entered: 1/13/2006 CAFC Mandate Affirming
MANDATE of CAFC affirming [285] Published Order/Opinion. (hw1, )
    LREF
    Legal Document 292 Filed: 8/23/2004, Entered: 9/27/2004 CAFC Case Number
    CAFC Case Number 04-5139 for [288] Notice of Cross Appeal filed by USA. (hw1, )
      LREF
      Legal Document 291 Filed: 8/10/2004, Entered: 8/12/2004 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fa
      RESPONSE to [149] Pltf's PROPOSED FINDINGS of Fact in Support of Pltf's Post-Trial Brief and Opposition to Dft's Rule 52(C) Motion, filed by USA. [FILED UNDER SEAL] Service: 4/26/2004 by hand.(jcp, )
        LREF
        Legal Document 290 Filed: 8/10/2004, Entered: 8/10/2004 Court Filing
        ORDER - We ask the Clerk of Court to accept the attached briefs from the Government notwithstanding the rules of this court that do not permit the filing of such material. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (swf, )
          LREF
          Legal Document 289 Filed: 7/26/2004, Entered: 8/20/2004 Terminated:
          CAFC Case Number 04-5122 for [287] Notice of Appeal filed by INDIANA MICHIGAN POWER COMPANY. (hw1, )
            LREF
            Legal Document 288 Filed: 7/26/2004, Entered: 8/20/2004 Notice of cross-appeal
            NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL by USA. Copy to judge, opposing party, and CAFC. Fee not required. (hw1, )
              LREF
              Legal Document 287 Filed: 7/23/2004, Entered: 7/23/2004
              NOTICE OF APPEAL by INDIANA MICHIGAN POWER COMPANY. Filing fee $ 255, receipt number 061059. Copies to judge, opposing party and CAFC. (hw1, )
                LREF
                Legal Document 286 Filed: 5/25/2004, Entered: 5/25/2004
                JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that Count I of the complaint (the only remaining count) is dismissed. No costs. (lld, )
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 285 Filed: 5/21/2004, Entered: 5/21/2004 Court Filing
                  PUBLISHED OPINION. The Clerk is directed to dismiss Count I of plaintiff's Complaint and enter judgment. This is a final judgment. No costs. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (swf, )
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 284 Filed: 4/30/2004, Entered: 4/30/2004
                    NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (jcp, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 283 Filed: 4/26/2004, Entered: 4/28/2004 Terminated:
                      MOTION for Leave to Respond to Pltf's Proposed Findings of Fact, by USA.Service: 4/26/2004. Response due by 5/13/2004. (jcp, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 282 Filed: 4/20/2004, Entered: 4/22/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER: The parties should not be concerned about proposed findings post-trial. The court will issue an Opinion promptly so that participants in trials scheduled behind this one will have an opportunity to evaluate their cases. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (jcp, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 281 Filed: 4/16/2004, Entered: 4/20/2004 Response to Motion
                          RESPONSE to [277] MOTION for Leave to File Proposed Findings of Fact MOTION to Strike [274] Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law filed by INDIANA MICHIGAN POWER COMPANY. Reply due by 4/30/2004. Service: 04/16/2004.(lld, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 280 Filed: 4/15/2004, Entered: 4/20/2004 Description not available
                            REPLY to Pltf's Response to [266] Dft's MOTION for Judgment on Partial Findings, and to [275] Pltf's Post Trial Brief, filed by USA. Service: 4/12/2004.(jcp, )
                              LREF
                              Blank 279 Filed: 4/15/2004, Entered: 4/20/2004 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                              ORDER granting [278] Dft's Motion for Leave to Exceed the Page Limit Established by the Rules for its Post Trial Reply Brief. We ask that the Clerk of Court accept the Government's brief for filing. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (jcp, )
                                LREF
                                Blank 278 Filed: 4/12/2004, Entered: 4/14/2004, Terminated: 4/15/2004 Terminated:
                                MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit of reply to response to motion for judgment and Plaintiff's post-trial brief by 5 pages by USA.Service: 4/12/04. Response due by 4/29/2004 (jat, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 277 Filed: 4/8/2004, Entered: 4/12/2004 Terminated:
                                  MOTION to Strike [274] Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law or, in the alternative, for Leave to File Proposed Findings of Fact by USA.Service: 4/8/04 by hand. Response due by 4/22/2004 Response due by 4/22/2004 (jat, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 276 Filed: 4/7/2004, Entered: 4/9/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                    FINAL BRIEF Concerning (1) The Admissibility of the Expert Testimony of Eileen Supko, (2) The Power of the Court to Retain Jurisdiction Over Indiana Michigan's Future Claims, and (3) Its Response to Certain Discrete Issues Raised in the Government's Post-Hearing Brief, by INDIANA MICHIGAN POWER COMPANY. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 4/2/2004.(jcp, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 275 Filed: 4/1/2004, Entered: 4/5/2004 Response to Motion
                                      OPPOSITION to [266] Dft's Rule 52(C) MOTION for Judgment on Partial Findings filed by INDIANA MICHIGAN POWER COMPANY. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Reply due by 4/15/2004. Service: 3/29/2004.(jcp, )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 275 Filed: 4/1/2004, Entered: 4/5/2004 Post-Trial Brief
                                        POST TRIAL BRIEF, Together with Opposition to Dft's Rule 52(C) Motion, by INDIANA MICHIGAN POWER COMPANY. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE](jcp, )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 274 Filed: 4/1/2004, Entered: 4/9/2004 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law
                                          Proposed Findings of Fact in support of plaintiff's post-trial brief and opposition to defendant's Rule 52(c) motion by INDIANA MICHIGAN POWER COMPANY filed [by leave of the judge]. (dls)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 273 Filed: 4/1/2004, Entered: 4/5/2004 Post-Trial Brief
                                            POST TRIAL BRIEF by USA. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE](jcp, )
                                              LREF
                                              Blank -- Filed: 3/23/2004, Entered: 3/23/2004
                                              Minute Entryfor proceedings held before Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr: Status Conference on telephone held on March 23, 2004. (swf, )
                                                LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 3/18/2004, Entered: 3/18/2004
                                                Minute Entry:Trial proceedings held before Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr: on March 1, 2004 - March 16, 2004. (swf, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 272 Filed: 3/17/2004, Entered: 3/18/2004 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings in One Volume held on 3/16/2004 before Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. (jcp, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 271 Filed: 3/15/2004, Entered: 3/16/2004 Response to Motion
                                                    OPPOSITION to [258] Dft's MOTION in Limine Regarding Pltf's Claim for Future Damages, filed by INDIANA MICHIGAN POWER COMPANY. Reply due by 3/29/2004. Service: 3/15/2004.(jcp, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 270 Filed: 3/15/2004, Entered: 3/16/2004 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings in Two (2) Volumes held on 3/11/2004 - 3/12/2004 before Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. (jcp, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 269 Filed: 3/11/2004, Entered: 3/15/2004 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings in One Volume held on 3/10/2004 before Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. (jcp, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank -- Filed: 3/11/2004, Entered: 3/11/2004
                                                          Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 3/15/2004. (vp1, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 268 Filed: 3/10/2004, Entered: 3/11/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                            BENCH MEMORANDUM by USA Regarding Pltf's Request to Admit its Expert Witness Workpapers Into Evidence. Service: 3/8/2004.(jcp, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 267 Filed: 3/10/2004, Entered: 3/11/2004 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                              ORDER: [265] Dft's Motion for Leave to File its Bench Memorandum Regarding Admissibility of Pltf's Expert Workpapers is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (jcp, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 266 Filed: 3/9/2004, Entered: 3/11/2004 Terminated:
                                                                MOTION for Judgment Based Upon Partial Findings by USA.Service: 3/9/2004 by hand. Response due by 4/6/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 265 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/10/2004, Terminated: 3/10/2004 Terminated:
                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File "Dft's Bench Memorandum Regarding Pltf's Request to Admit its Expert Workpapers Into Evidence" by USA.Service: 3/8/2004 by hand. Response due by 3/22/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 3/4/2004, Entered: 3/4/2004
                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr: Pretrial Conference held on February 27, 2004. (swf, )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 3/4/2004, Entered: 3/4/2004
                                                                      Minute Entryfor proceedings held before Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr: Pretrial Conference held on February 25, 2004. (swf, )
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 264 Filed: 3/2/2004, Entered: 3/4/2004 Exhibit
                                                                        Revised Joint Exhibit List by all parties. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE](jcp, )
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 263 Filed: 3/2/2004, Entered: 3/4/2004 Exhibit
                                                                          Revised Exhibit List by USA. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE](jcp, )
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 262 Filed: 3/2/2004, Entered: 3/4/2004 Stipulation
                                                                            JOINT STIPULATIONS Regarding Testimony on Spent Fuel Discharges and Cask Loading Costs by all parties. Service: 3/1/2004 by hand.(jcp, )
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 261 Filed: 3/1/2004, Entered: 3/2/2004 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings in One Volume held on 2/25/2004 before Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. (jcp, )
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 260 Filed: 2/27/2004, Entered: 3/2/2004 Response to Motion
                                                                                OPPOSITION to [241] Dft's MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Mitigation and Cost of Capital Damages filed by INDIANA MICHIGAN POWER COMPANY. [FILED UNDER SEAL] [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Reply due by 3/5/2004. Service: 2/20/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 259 Filed: 2/27/2004, Entered: 3/1/2004 Order on Motion to InterveneCourt Filing
                                                                                  ORDER denying [256] Motion to Intervene for the limited purpose of "asserting their right under common law to secure access to pleadings filed under seal and to ensure access to trial proceedings." Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (lld, )
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 258 Filed: 2/27/2004, Entered: 3/16/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to notify court of argument to be raised at trial or, in the alternative, MOTION in Limine to exclude evidence of future damages in this case filed by USA.Service: 2/27/04. Response due by 3/15/2004 (dls)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 257 Filed: 2/27/2004, Entered: 3/1/2004 Response to Motion
                                                                                      OPPOSITION to defendant's[240] MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Expert Report and Testimony of Eileen M. Supko concerning the Repository Initial Operation Date. filed by INDIANA MICHIGAN POWER COMPANY. Reply due by 3/12/2004. Service: 02/20/2004.(lld, )
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 2/27/2004, Entered: 2/27/2004
                                                                                        Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 3/29/2004. (vp1, )
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 2/27/2004, Entered: 2/27/2004
                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr: Pretrial Conference held on February 25, 2004. (swf, )
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 254 Filed: 2/26/2004, Entered: 3/1/2004 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                            ORDER denying [251] Motion Exclude Exhibits or to Delay Trial. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (lld, )
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 249 Filed: 2/26/2004, Entered: 2/29/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File New Authority Relating to Defendant's January 7, 2004 Motion to Compel Compliance with Subpoena by USA.Service: 02/26/2004. Response due by 3/15/2004 (lld, )
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 247 Filed: 2/26/2004, Entered: 2/29/2004 Exhibit
                                                                                                Joint Exhibit List by INDIANA MICHIGAN POWER COMPANY, USA. (lld, )
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 255 Filed: 2/25/2004, Entered: 3/1/2004 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings in One Volume held on 1/27/2004 before Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. (jcp, )
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 253 Filed: 2/25/2004, Entered: 3/1/2004 Exhibit
                                                                                                    Proposed Exhibit List by INDIANA MICHIGAN POWER COMPANY. (jat, )
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 252 Filed: 2/25/2004, Entered: 3/1/2004 Response to Motion
                                                                                                      RESPONSE to [251] Dft's MOTION In Limine to Exclude Certain Exhibits Indentified by Plaintiff on February 18, 2004 Or, In the Alternative, for Leave to Take Additional Discovery and Postpone the Scheduled Trial Date, and Motion for Expedited Consideration filed by INDIANA MICHIGAN POWER COMPANY. [FILED UNDER SEAL] Reply due by 3/10/2004. Service: 2/25/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 256 Filed: 2/24/2004, Entered: 3/1/2004, Terminated: 2/27/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                        MOTION to Intervene-To secure access to Filings and Trail Proceedings. by CONNECTICUT YANKEE ATOMIC POWER COMPANY, MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC POWER COMPANY, YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY.Service: 2/24/2004. Response due by 3/12/2004 (lg1, )
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 251 Filed: 2/24/2004, Entered: 2/29/2004, Terminated: 2/26/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                          MOTION In Limine to Exclude certain exhibits indentified by plaintiff on February 18, 2004 Or, In the Alternative, for Leave to take additional Discovery and postpone the scheduled Trial date, and Motion for Expedited Consideration by USA.Service: 2/24/2004. Response due by 3/12/20049 (UNDER SEAL)(lg1, ).
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 2/24/2004, Entered: 2/24/2004
                                                                                                            Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 3/25/2004. (vp1, )
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 250 Filed: 2/23/2004, Entered: 2/29/2004 Response
                                                                                                              OBJECTIONS to [244] Dft's Proposed Exhibits filed by INDIANA MICHIGAN POWER COMPANY. Service: 2/23/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 248 Filed: 2/23/2004, Entered: 2/29/2004 Response
                                                                                                                OBJECTIONS to Pltf's Proposed Exhibits filed by USA. Service: 2/23/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 246 Filed: 2/20/2004, Entered: 2/27/2004 Order on Motion to Amend/CorrectCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER: [243] Dft's Motion for Leave to File a Corrected Copy of the certificate of service attached to its motion in limine is GRANTED. We ask that the Clerk of Court repolace the previous certificate with the corrected version, which is attached to this Order. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 245 Filed: 2/20/2004, Entered: 2/27/2004 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to [242] Pltf's MOTION in Limine to Exclude Certain Testimony of Dft's Expert, Jonathan A. Neuberger, filed by USA. [FILED UNDER SEAL] Reply due by 3/5/2004. Service: 2/20/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 2/19/2004, Entered: 2/19/2004
                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for Pretrial Conference held before Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr: on February 4, 2004. (swf, )
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 244 Filed: 2/18/2004, Entered: 2/25/2004 Exhibit
                                                                                                                        Defendant's Exhibit List by INDIANA MICHIGAN POWER COMPANY. (lg1, )
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 2/18/2004, Entered: 2/18/2004
                                                                                                                          Minute Entryfor proceedings held before Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr: Motion Hearing held on January 27, 2004 re [220] MOTION to Compel filed by INDIANA MICHIGAN POWER COMPANY. (swf, )
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 243 Filed: 2/17/2004, Entered: 2/23/2004, Terminated: 2/20/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                            MOTION for leave to correct certificate of service accompanying "Defendant's Motion in Limine to Exclude Testimony and Evidence Regarding Plaintiff's Request for Pre-Breach Damages and For Interest on Previously Incurred Damages," filed 2/13/04 by USA.Service: 2/17/04. Response due by 3/5/2004 (jat, )
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 242 Filed: 2/13/2004, Entered: 2/19/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                              MOTION in Limine to Exclude Certain Testimony of Dft's Expert, Jonathan A. Neuberger by INDIANA MICHIGAN POWER COMPANY.Service: 2/13/2004. Response due by 3/1/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 241 Filed: 2/13/2004, Entered: 2/19/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony and Evidence Regarding Pltf's Request for Pre-Breach Damages and for Interest on Previously Incurred Damages by USA. [FILED UNDER SEAL]Service: 2/13/2004 by hand. Response due by 2/20/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 240 Filed: 2/13/2004, Entered: 2/19/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                  MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Expert Report and Testimony of Eileen M. Supko Concerning the Repository Initial Operation Date by USA. [FILED UNDER SEAL]Service: 2/13/2004. Response due by 2/20/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 239 Filed: 2/9/2004, Entered: 2/12/2004 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings in One Volume held on 2/4/2004 before Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 238 Filed: 2/4/2004, Entered: 2/9/2004 Witness List
                                                                                                                                      Witness List by USA. (hw1, )
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 237 Filed: 2/4/2004, Entered: 2/9/2004 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER: Concurrent Motions in Limine - 2/13/2004. Responses to Motions in Limine - 2/20/2004 (replies are optional). Objections to Exhbibits - 2/23/2004. Stipulaitons - 2/26/2004. Exhibits to Judge - 2/27/2004 (two sets of hard copies). Counsel for pltf should provide the Holtec documents discussed at today's hearing as soon as possible for in camera review. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 236 Filed: 2/4/2004, Entered: 2/9/2004 Witness List
                                                                                                                                          Witness List by INDIANA MICHIGAN POWER COMPANY. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 235 Filed: 2/4/2004, Entered: 2/9/2004 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                            REPLY in Support of [222] Dft's MOTION to Compel Third Party Production of Documents Pursuant to Subpoena Duces Tecum filed by USA. Service: 2/3/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 2/3/2004, Entered: 2/3/2004
                                                                                                                                              Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 3/4/2004. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 234 Filed: 2/2/2004, Entered: 2/5/2004 Status Conference OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                CONFERENCE ORDER: We have rescheduled the Pretrial Conference for 2/4/2004 10:00 AM before Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. The conference will be on the record. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese for Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. (jcp, ) Modified on 2/5/2004 (jcp, ).
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 1/30/2004, Entered: 1/30/2004
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER: The Court hereby DENIES [188] Dft's Second Motion to Renew its Motion toConsolidate as well as its previous motions relating to consolidation. The Court further LIFTS THE STAY of the remainder of the cases to which the Order of 4/16/2003, applied. The Clerk of the Court is directed to docket this Order in this case with an entry noting the same on the dockets of the remaining SNFcases captioned in Dft's instant motion, with a courtesy copy to all SNF parties and presiding SNF judges of the Court. [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT LOCATED IN CASE NO. 98-126C] Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 1/28/2004, Entered: 1/28/2004
                                                                                                                                                    Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 2/27/2004. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 233 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/30/2004 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to [222] Dft's MOTION to Compel Third Party Production of Documents Pursuant to Subpoena Duces Tecum filed by HOLTEC INTERNATIONAL. [FILED UNDER SEAL] Reply due by 2/9/2004. Service: 1/26/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 232 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/29/2004 Status Conference OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        CONFERENCE ORDER: The parties have requested a telephone Conference for 1/27/2004 at 10:00 am, in response to the court's Order dated 1/23/2004. An alternative time for the hearing is 1/28/2004 10:00 AM before Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. The conference will be on the record. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 231 Filed: 1/23/2004, Entered: 1/28/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER: We do not approve of counsel directing witnesses not to testify during depositions. We hope to avoid having to reschedule depositions, which tends to inconvenience the witness and to add to the costs of litigation. Counsel may contact the court for a hearing on this matter, or any other issue related to pretrial discovery. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 230 Filed: 1/21/2004, Entered: 1/27/2004 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Dft's Opposition to [220] Pltf's MOTION to Compel the Testimony of Tom Pollog filed by INDIANA MICHIGAN POWER COMPANY. Service: 1/21/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 229 Filed: 1/21/2004, Entered: 1/26/2004 Pretrial OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              PRETRIAL ORDER: We have scheduled a Pretrial Conference for 2/2/2004 02:00 PM before Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 228 Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: 1/26/2004 Expert Report - Rule 26
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF FILINGS and EXPERT WITNESS REPORT of Jonathon A. Neuberger, PhD. filed by USA. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] [FILED UNDER SEAL] Service: 1/14/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 227 Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: 1/26/2004 Expert Report - Rule 26
                                                                                                                                                                  NOCTICE OF FILING and EXPERT REPORTS of 1) Dr. K.P. Singh Dated 12/23/2003; 2) Tucker Alan Dated 11/25/2003; 3) Revised - Eileen M. Supko Dated 11/17/2003 regarding spent fuel acceptance rates 11/17/2003; and 4) Revised - Eileen Supko regarding basis for 2015 repository initial operation date filed by INDIANA MICHIGAN POWER COMPANY. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] [EXPERT REPORTS #1,2, and 3 - FILED UNDER SEAL] Service: 1/14/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 226 Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: 1/23/2004 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                    OPPOSITION to [220] Pltf's MOTION to Compel the Testimony of Tom Pollog filed by USA. Reply due by 2/3/2004. Service: 1/20/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 225 Filed: 1/15/2004, Entered: 1/21/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER: Trial of this case begins March 1. Counsel should agree on a date that is convenient to meet with the court to discuss pretrial matters and to resolve pending motions. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 224 Filed: 1/12/2004, Entered: 1/14/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                        UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time until 1/14/2004 to Submit the Report of One Expert, Mr. Jonathon Neuberger, Economists Inc. by USA.Service: 1/12/2004. Response due by 1/29/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 223 Filed: 1/12/2004, Entered: 1/14/2004 Expert Report - Rule 26
                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING AND EXPERT REPORT of Edward C. Abbott filed by USA. [FILED UNDER SEAL] Service: 1/12/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 222 Filed: 1/9/2004, Entered: 1/13/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Compel Third Party Production of Documents Pursuant to Subpoena Duces Tecum of Non-Party Holtec International, by USA.Service: 1/9/2004. Response due by 1/26/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 221 Filed: 1/6/2004, Entered: 1/9/2004 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [218] Dft's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. The Government will submit expert reports according to the schedule established by the parties. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 220 Filed: 12/31/2003, Entered: 1/8/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Compel the Testimony of Tom Pollog by INDIANA MICHIGAN POWER COMPANY.Service: 12/31/2003. Response due by 1/20/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 219 Filed: 12/23/2003, Entered: 12/29/2003 Expert Report - Rule 26
                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF FILING AND EXPERT REPORT of Expert Witness Rafael Emmanuel A. Macatangay filed by USA. [FILED UNDER SEAL] Service: 12/23/03 by hand.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 218 Filed: 12/23/2003, Entered: 12/29/2003, Terminated: 1/6/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time for Production of the Government's Expert Reports for: 1) the expert report of Rafael A. Macatangay on 12/23/2003; 2) the expert report of Stephen J. Kiraly on or before 1/5/2004; and 3) the expert reports of Jonathan A. Neuberger and Edward C. Abbott on or before 1/12/2004, by USA.Service: 12/23/03. Response due by 1/9/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 217 Filed: 12/22/2003, Entered: 12/29/2003 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      SCHEDULING ORDER: Pltf may withdraw Dr. Singh's report, or dft may produce its responsive reports on December 23 as scheduled. Any reports that turn out to have been affected by Dr. Singh's report may be amended or supplemented no later than 1/12/2004. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 216 Filed: 12/22/2003, Entered: 12/29/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY in Support of [214] Dft's MOTION for Extension of Time until 1/26/2004 for Submission of Dft's Responsive Expert Reports filed by USA. [FILED UNDER SEAL] Service: 12/22/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 215 Filed: 12/18/2003, Entered: 12/23/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                          OPPOSITION to [214] Dft's MOTION for Extension of Time until 1/26/2004 for Submission of Dft's Responsive Expert Reports filed by INDIANA MICHIGAN POWER COMPANY. [FILED UNDER SEAL] Reply due by 12/31/2003. Service: 12/18/03 by hand.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 214 Filed: 12/15/2003, Entered: 12/19/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time until 1/26/2004 for Submission of Dft's Responsive Expert Reports by USA. [FILED UNDER SEAL]Service: 12/15/03 by hand. Response due by 12/29/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 213 Filed: 12/1/2003, Entered: 12/4/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Counsel for Dft's Change of Telephone and Facsimile Numbers by USA. Service: 12/1/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 212 Filed: 11/17/2003, Entered: 11/24/2003 Order on Motion to VacateCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [210] Dft's Motion to Vacate the [205] October 29, 2003 Order certifying the court's ruling for interlocatory appeal. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 211 Filed: 11/12/2003, Entered: 11/17/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to [210] Dft's MOTION to Vacate the [205] Court's Order Dated October 29, 2003, filed by INDIANA MICHIGAN POWER COMPANY. Reply due by 11/26/2003. Service: 11/12/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 210 Filed: 11/7/2003, Entered: 11/13/2003, Terminated: 11/17/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Vacate the [205] Court's Order Dated October 29, 2003 Certifying its June 27, 2003 Opinion for Interlocutory Appeal, by USA.Service: 11/7/03. Response due by 11/24/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 11/6/2003, Entered: 11/6/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 12/4/2003. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 208 Filed: 11/5/2003, Entered: 11/6/2003 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 11/4/03 before Judge Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. (hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 209 Filed: 11/4/2003, Entered: 11/7/2003 Order on Motion to SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER: The status report to be filed on 11/7/2003 is no longer necessary in view of today's status conference. [203] Dft's Motion to Place Under Seal Its October 24th Filing Responding to Pltf's Request for Dft's Expert Reports is GRANTED. We ask the Clerk of Court to take note. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 207 Filed: 10/31/2003, Entered: 11/5/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY in Support of [200] Pltfs' Expedited MOTION to set a 12/1/03 deadline for Defendant to submit its expert reports on damages, or in the Alternative MOTION for a Status Conference on Discovery, filed by INDIANA MICHIGAN POWER COMPANY. Service: 10/31/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 206 Filed: 10/30/2003, Entered: 11/3/2003 Status Conference OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER:The parties have requested a Status Conference on 11/4/2003 11:00 AM in Courtroom before Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 205 Filed: 10/29/2003, Entered: 10/31/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER re: judicial economy will be served by awaiting appellate review of this court's liability ruling before we address damages. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 204 Filed: 10/29/2003, Entered: 10/31/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER re: pending motion and response from the government. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. [VACATED PER ORDER OF 11/17/2003] (jat, ) Modified on 11/24/2003 (jcp, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 203 Filed: 10/29/2003, Entered: 10/30/2003, Terminated: 11/4/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to Place "Dft's Response to Pltf's Expedited Motion to Set a December 1, 2003 Deadline for Dft to Submit its Expert Report on Damages" Under Seal by USA.Service: 10/28/03. Response due by 11/14/2003.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 202 Filed: 10/24/2003, Entered: 10/28/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to [200] Pltf's Expedited MOTION to Set a 12/1/2003 Deadline for Defendant to Submit Its Expert Reports on Damages filed by USA. Reply due by 11/7/2003. Service: 10/24/03. [FILED UNDER SEAL](jcp, ) Modified on 11/7/2003 (jcp, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 201 Filed: 10/22/2003, Entered: 10/27/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER: All filings in this case relating to issues of consolidation will be captioned in this case name and show this presiding judge on the caption. The parties will provide a courtesy copy of each filings to the Clerk's Office for transmission to the Chief Judge. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 200 Filed: 10/21/2003, Entered: 10/23/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to set a 12/1/03 deadline for Defendant to submit its expert reports on damages or in the alternative for Status Conference by INDIANA MICHIGAN POWER COMPANY.Service: 10/21/03. Response due by 11/7/2003 (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 199 Filed: 10/8/2003, Entered: 10/16/2003 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER:Counsel will file a Status Report by 11/7/2003. Trial will commence in this case on March 1, 2004. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (jat, ) Modified on 10/28/2003 (jcp, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 10/8/2003, Entered: 10/28/2003 Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Set/Reset Hearings: Trial set for 3/1/2004 before Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 198 Filed: 10/1/2003, Entered: 10/7/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to submit and submission of a response to defendant's proposed pre-trial schedule by INDIANA MICHIGAN POWER COMPANY.Service: 10/1/03. Response due by 10/20/2003. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 197 Filed: 9/22/2003, Entered: 9/25/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PROPOSED PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE by USA Pursuant to the [196] Court's Scheduling Order Dated September 8, 2003. Service: 9/22/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 196 Filed: 9/8/2003, Entered: 9/10/2003 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER:Dft's proposed pretrial schedule is due on 9/19/2003. As we discussed, this is a lead case that we have committed to decide promptly so that the Federal Circuit may provide the court guidance if necessary. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 195 Filed: 9/3/2003, Entered: 9/8/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to Pltfs' Response to Dft's Second Motion to Renew Its Motion to Consolidate, until 9/3/03, by USA.Service: 9/3/03. Response due by 9/22/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 194 Filed: 8/27/2003, Entered: 8/28/2003 Order on Motion for Reconsideration - Rule 59(a)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER: That [168] Dft's Motion for Reconsideration is DENIED. If the parties will not stipulate a means of resolving this case short of trial, we expect to proceed on an expedited basis. We will contact counsel Tuesday, September 2, 2003 at 10:00 am to discuss trial. Counsel should be prepared to try this case on a very short schedule. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 8/27/2003, Entered: 8/28/2003 Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Set/Reset Hearings: Conference set for 9/2/2003 10:00 AM before Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 8/26/2003, Entered: 8/29/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to the Chief Judge for Extension of Time to File Reply to Pltfs' Responses to Dft's Second Motion to Renew Its Motion to Consolidate, until 9/3/03, by USA. [Original document located in Case No. 98-126C]Service: 8/26/03. Response due by 9/12/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 193 Filed: 8/22/2003, Entered: 8/25/2003 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              OPPOSITION to [168] Dft's Motion for Reconsideration on Liability, and Response [186] to the Court's July 23, 2003 Order, filed by INDIANA MICHIGAN POWER COMPANY. Reply due by 9/8/2003. Service: 8/22/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/29/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                OPPOSITION to [188] Dft's Second MOTION to Renew Its Motion to Consolidate filed by INDIANA MICHIGAN POWER COMPANY. [Original document located in Case No. 98-483C] Reply due by 8/29/2003. Service: 8/15/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 192 Filed: 8/14/2003, Entered: 8/18/2003 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ATTACHMENTS to Joint Status Report of 8/12/03 by INDIANA MICHIGAN POWER COMPANY. [UNDER SEAL] Service: 8/12/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 191 Filed: 8/14/2003, Entered: 8/18/2003 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [189] Dft's Motion for Leave to File Attachments to the Joint Status Report Under Seal. The Clerk will file pltf's attachments to the Joint Status Report Under Seal. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 190 Filed: 8/12/2003, Entered: 8/13/2003 Joint Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      JOINT STATUS REPORT by INDIANA MICHIGAN POWER COMPANY, USA. Service: 8/12/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 189 Filed: 8/12/2003, Entered: 8/13/2003, Terminated: 8/14/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Plaintiff's Attachments to Joint Status Report by USA.Service: 8/12/03. Response due by 8/29/2003.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 8/8/2003, Entered: 8/8/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Set/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 8/15/2003 (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 8/5/2003, Entered: 8/7/2003 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Dft's Motion to the Chief Judge for Leave to Correct Certificate of Service and to Waive Requirements of RCFC 5.3 Regarding "Dft's Second Motion [to the Chief Judge] to Renew its Motion to Consolidate." (Original Motion located in Case No. 98-126C) (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 188 Filed: 7/30/2003, Entered: 7/31/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SECOND MOTION to Renew Its Motion to Consolidate by USA. [COPY] (Original Document in Case No. 98-126C)Service: 7/29/03 by hand. Response due by 8/12/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 187 Filed: 7/25/2003, Entered: 7/25/2003 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER:Pltf's Response to dft's request that we vacate the January 17 ruling on liability is due on 8/22/2003. Dft's Reply will be filed no later than 9/8/2003. We will schedule an oral argument soon thereafter. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 186 Filed: 7/23/2003, Entered: 7/24/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER: We ask that pltf respond to dft's 7/16 arguments. Also, we seek comment on pltf's reason for withholding payments under the contract from the beginning, how much it has paid into escrow, and the nature of the escrow agreement. Pltf should comment on whether it is possible for the US to waive such an argument in this circumstance, or whether laches or another form of estoppel may apply against the US. The parties may request a hearing to discuss these matters if they prefer. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 185 Filed: 7/16/2003, Entered: 7/18/2003 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to [183] Court's Order of July 7, 2003, and [184] Court's Order of July 8, 2003 filed by UNITED STATES. Service: 7/16/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 7/9/2003, Entered: 7/9/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 8/7/2003. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 184 Filed: 7/8/2003, Entered: 7/10/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER: The [133] January 17 Order referred to yesterday does not enter final money judgment, and without certification or entry of partial judgment, does not operate as a final judgment for purposes of Rule 59. Therefore, dft need not address this point further. The matter what we wish to address further, however, is pltf's obligation to contribute fees in light of the breach, other than into escrow. Specifically, did dft declare pltf's non-payment a default or otherwise protest. If not, may dft declare retrospectively this a failure of condition precedent or an incident of default. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 182 Filed: 7/8/2003, Entered: 7/9/2003 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on July 7, 2003 before Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr.. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 183 Filed: 7/7/2003, Entered: 7/9/2003 Order on Motion to StrikeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER: Pltf will make an effort to provide dft with information that it needs to consider a stipulation of damages, no later than 8/12. The parties will file a joint status report on that day. Counsel should be prepared for a trial at the earliest possible date should it become necessary. [176] Dft's Motion to Strike Portions of Pltf's Filings Concerning the Rate of Accpetance of Spent Nuclear Fuel is GRANTED. Dft states in its 5/30 Motion for Reconsideration that the motion is timely because the court's ruling was a "non-final" order. Rule 59(b). We ask that dft explain why this is not a final judgment as to liability, for the purposes of this Rule. Dft's counsel will respond no later than 7/16; we will notify pltf whether additional proceedings are needed promptly thereafter. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 7/7/2003, Entered: 7/9/2003 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Set/Reset Deadlines: Dft's counsel will Respond to Order of 7/7/03 no later than 7/16/2003. Joint Status Report due by 8/12/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 181 Filed: 6/27/2003, Entered: 7/1/2003 Published OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PUBLISHED OPINION AND ORDER: [67] Dft's Motion for Summary Judgment on Rate and Order of Acceptance is DENIED. [157] Pltf's CROSS MOTION to [67] Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED, consistent with the terms of this Opinion. [64] Dft's Motion for Summary Judgment on Greater than Class C Materials is Moot, and therefore DENIED.Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 6/27/2003, Entered: 7/1/2003 Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Set/Reset Hearings: Counsel may argue pending motions or other issues at a Hearing on 7/7/2003 01:00 PM before Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr, per Opinion and Order of 6/27/03. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 180 Filed: 6/24/2003, Entered: 6/25/2003 Order Returning Document UnfiledCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER RETURNING: Plaintiff has called to our attention a recent ruling in Commonwealth Edison v. US, No. 98-621C. We are aware of Judge Hewitt's ruling in this case, and will give it due consideration. We appreciate the parties' interest in any litigation that may bear on the issues of this case, but it does not seem necessary to consider related summaries or commentaires at this time. Therefore, we ask that the Clerk return Plaintiff's Notice received 6/19/03 unfiled. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 178 Filed: 6/13/2003, Entered: 6/18/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response/Opposition to Motion re [176] Defendant's MOTION to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Filings Concerning the Rate of Acceptance of Spent Nuclear Fuel filed by UNITED STATES. Service: 06/13/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 179 Filed: 6/12/2003, Entered: 6/18/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to [176] MOTION for Leave to File and MOTION to Strike filed by INDIANA MICHIGAN POWER COMPANY. Reply due by 6/26/2003. Service: 6/12/03.(dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 177 Filed: 6/9/2003, Entered: 6/18/2003 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on June 4, 2003 before Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr.. (hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 6/4/2003, Entered: 6/4/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 7/7/2003. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 176 Filed: 6/2/2003, Entered: 6/11/2003, Terminated: 7/7/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File out of time, and MOTION to Strike portions of Plaintiff's filings concerning the rate of acceptance of spent nuclear fuel by UNITED STATES.Service: 6/2/03. Response due by 6/19/2003 Response due by 6/19/2003 (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 175 Filed: 6/2/2003, Entered: 6/9/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re [157] CROSS MOTION to [67] Motion for Summary Judgment filed by The United States filed by INDIANA MICHIGAN POWER COMPANY. Service: 5/29/03.(jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 174 Filed: 6/2/2003, Entered: 6/9/2003 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [173] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 168 Filed: 5/30/2003, Entered: 6/5/2003, Terminated: 8/27/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Reconsideration - Rule 59(a) re [133] Order, by UNITED STATES.Service: 5/30/03. (hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 173 Filed: 5/29/2003, Entered: 6/5/2003, Terminated: 6/2/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit of Reply in support of its Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by 20 pages pages by INDIANA MICHIGAN POWER COMPANY.Service: 5/29/03. Response due by 6/16/2003 (vro, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 172 Filed: 5/29/2003, Entered: 6/5/2003 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER: Hearing set for 6/4/2003 10:00 AM before Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 171 Filed: 5/28/2003, Entered: 6/5/2003 Description not available
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response (together with a separate appendix) re [157] CROSS MOTION to [67] Motion for Summary Judgment filed by The United States filed by UNITED STATES. Service: 5/21/03 by hand.(hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 170 Filed: 5/28/2003, Entered: 6/5/2003 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [166] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 169 Filed: 5/28/2003, Entered: 6/5/2003 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fa
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by UNITED STATES. Service: 5/21/03 by hand.(hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 167 Filed: 5/27/2003, Entered: 6/4/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Reconsideration re [161] Order by UNITED STATES.Service: 5/23/03. Response due by 6/13/2003 (hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 166 Filed: 5/22/2003, Entered: 6/3/2003, Terminated: 5/28/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit by UNITED STATES.Service: 5/21/03. Response due by 6/9/2003. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 165 Filed: 5/14/2003, Entered: 5/30/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to [157] CROSS MOTION filed by UNITED STATES. Reply due by 5/29/2003. Service: 5/12/03.(dls, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 164 Filed: 5/14/2003, Entered: 5/21/2003 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fa
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by UNITED STATES. Service: 5/12/03.(hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 162 Filed: 5/14/2003, Entered: 5/19/2003 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [160] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (vro, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 161 Filed: 5/13/2003, Entered: 5/16/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER re: Defedant's Motion on Summary Judgment on Greater-than-Class-C Waste is MOOT. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr..(dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 160 Filed: 5/12/2003, Entered: 5/15/2003, Terminated: 5/14/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit of Reply to Response to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment regarding greater than Class C Radioactive Waste Arguments by 8 pages by The United States.Service: 5/12/03. Response due by 5/29/2003. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 159 Filed: 5/9/2003, Entered: 5/14/2003 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to [158] Order filed by INDIANA MICHIGAN POWER COMPANY. Service: 5/9/03.(dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 158 Filed: 5/6/2003, Entered: 5/9/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER re: The court is prepared to rule on the Greater Than Class C Isssue, the court ask's that the plaintiff respond as soon as possible, but no later than May 9, 2003. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 157 Filed: 4/29/2003, Entered: 4/30/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CROSS MOTION to [67] Motion for Summary Judgment (together with separate appendix) filed by The United States by INDIANA MICHIGAN POWER COMPANY.Service: 4/24/03. Response due by 5/30/2003 (hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 156 Filed: 4/29/2003, Entered: 4/30/2003 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on April 24, 2003 before Judge Robert H. Hodges. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 155 Filed: 4/29/2003, Entered: 4/30/2003 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [148] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 154 Filed: 4/29/2003, Entered: 4/30/2003 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fa
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by INDIANA MICHIGAN POWER COMPANY. Service: 4/24/03.(hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 4/25/2003, Entered: 4/25/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 5/27/2003. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 153 Filed: 4/24/2003, Entered: 4/30/2003 Order Setting Oral Argument/Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion [64] Motion for Summary Judgment, [67] Motion for Summary Judgment: Oral Argument set for 6/5/2003 10:00 AM in National Courts Building before Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 152 Filed: 4/24/2003, Entered: 4/30/2003 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER: Defendant's response to the Cross Motion due by 5/22/2003; Plaintiff's reply by 5/29/03. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 151 Filed: 4/24/2003, Entered: 4/29/2003 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fa
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by INDIANA MICHIGAN POWER COMPANY. Service: 4/24/03.(hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 150 Filed: 4/24/2003, Entered: 4/29/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE (together with separate appendix) re [67] Motion for Summary Judgment filed by INDIANA MICHIGAN POWER COMPANY. Reply due by 5/12/2003. Service: 4/24/03.(hw1, ) Modified on 5/13/2003 (dls, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 149 Filed: 4/24/2003, Entered: 4/29/2003 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by INDIANA MICHIGAN POWER COMPANY. Service: 4/24/03.(hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 148 Filed: 4/24/2003, Entered: 4/29/2003, Terminated: 4/29/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit of Response to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by 29 pages by INDIANA MICHIGAN POWER COMPANY.Service: 4/24/03. (vro, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 147 Filed: 4/21/2003, Entered: 4/28/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER; re: further proceedings. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 146 Filed: 4/16/2003, Entered: 4/25/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 145 Filed: 4/16/2003, Entered: 4/23/2003 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER: Hearing set for 4/22/2003 at 10:00 AM before Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 144 Filed: 4/14/2003, Entered: 4/21/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to [142] MOTION for Leave to File response to partially dispositive motions MOTION for Status Conference, filed by The United States. Reply due 4/28/2003. Service: 4/14/03. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 143 Filed: 4/2/2003, Entered: 4/8/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER, re: further proceedings. Signed by Judge Diane G. Sypolt. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 142 Filed: 3/27/2003, Entered: 4/2/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File response to partially dispositive motions and MOTION for Status Conference by INDIANA MICHIGAN POWER COMPANY. Service: 3/27/03.Response due 4/14/2003. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 141 Filed: 3/18/2003, Entered: 3/21/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 140 Filed: 3/7/2003, Entered: 3/10/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER re: See order [612-1] dated 3/7/03, in case 98-126C (signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 139 Filed: 2/25/2003, Entered: 3/4/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 138 Filed: 2/24/2003, Entered: 3/3/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 137 Filed: 2/5/2003, Entered: 2/13/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 136 Filed: 2/4/2003, Entered: 2/13/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER re: The hearing scheduled for February 5, 2003 shall be rescheduled so that the coordinating judge can meet with the judge's of Spent Nuclear Fuel cases pending in the court, counsel shall be contacted after the meeting of February 12 to schedule a new hearing (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 135 Filed: 1/31/2003, Entered: 2/12/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 134 Filed: 1/29/2003, Entered: 2/7/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 132 Filed: 1/23/2003, Entered: 1/31/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, re: see 98-126 C for order ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 133 Filed: 1/17/2003, Entered: 2/5/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER noting that decisions by the Federal Circuit have established liability against the United States; directing the Clerk to enter judgment for plaintiff on the issue of liability; and directing parties to advise the court within the next two weeks regarding the issuance of a scheduling order. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (HW) Modified on 4/25/2003 (dls, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 131 Filed: 1/9/2003, Entered: 1/15/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 130 Filed: 12/26/2002, Entered: 1/2/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY by INDIANA MICHIGAN to response to [122-1] motion to defer briefing until the court has ruled on Defendant's liability for partial breach of contract . Service: 12/26/02 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 129 Filed: 12/26/2002, Entered: 1/2/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY by INDIANA MICHIGAN to response to [121-1] motion for the Government to acknowledge its liability on the issue of partial breach of contract. Service: 12/26/02 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 128 Filed: 12/13/2002, Entered: 12/17/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER re: defendant's motion for enlargement of time filed on 12/9/02.(signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (LTD) Modified on 4/25/2003 (dls, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 127 Filed: 12/12/2002, Entered: 12/16/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by USA (Service: 12/12/02) to [121-1] motion for the Government to acknowledge its liability on the issue of partial breach of contract. Reply due: 12/27/02. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 126 Filed: 12/12/2002, Entered: 12/16/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by USA (Service: 12/12/02) to [122-1] motion to defer briefing until the court has ruled on Defendant's liability for partial breach of contract. Reply due: 12/27/02. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 125 Filed: 12/11/2002, Entered: 12/13/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 12/11/02 ) to Extend Time within which to motion to defer briefing, etc. , (until December 12, 2002). Response due: 12/30/02 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 124 Filed: 12/9/2002, Entered: 12/12/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service: 12/9/02) to Extend Time to respond to the motio to defer briefing, etc. until 12/11/02. Response due: 12/26/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 123 Filed: 12/9/2002, Entered: 12/12/2002 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Harold Dewitt Lester Jr. Service: 12/9/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 122 Filed: 11/21/2002, Entered: 11/25/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by INDIANA MICHIGAN (Service: 11/21/02) to defer briefing until the court has ruled on Defendant's liability for partial breach of contract . Response due: 12/9/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 121 Filed: 11/21/2002, Entered: 11/25/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RENEWED MOTION by INDIANA MICHIGAN (Service: 11/21/02) for the Government to acknowledge its liability on the issue of partial breach of contract . Response due: 12/9/02 (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 120 Filed: 10/16/2002, Entered: 10/18/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow for Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 119 Filed: 10/9/2002, Entered: 10/11/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER see 98-126C for Order. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 118 Filed: 9/10/2002, Entered: 9/16/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 117 Filed: 9/5/2002, Entered: 9/9/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 116 Filed: 8/22/2002, Entered: 8/27/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 115 Filed: 8/20/2002, Entered: 8/22/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 114 Filed: 8/16/2002, Entered: 8/21/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 113 Filed: 8/5/2002, Entered: 8/7/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 112 Filed: 7/30/2002, Entered: 8/5/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 111 Filed: 7/29/2002, Entered: 8/1/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER re: see order [467-1] dated 7/29/02, in case No. 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 110 Filed: 7/23/2002, Entered: 7/26/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 109 Filed: 7/16/2002, Entered: 7/18/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 108 Filed: 7/15/2002, Entered: 7/17/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 107 Filed: 7/10/2002, Entered: 7/12/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 106 Filed: 7/9/2002, Entered: 7/11/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER - see 98-126C for Order. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 105 Filed: 7/3/2002, Entered: 7/3/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 104 Filed: 7/2/2002, Entered: 7/3/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER-see 98-126C for Order ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 103 Filed: 6/28/2002, Entered: 7/1/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER-see 98-126C for Order ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 102 Filed: 6/18/2002, Entered: 6/19/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C.(signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (VO)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 101 Filed: 6/17/2002, Entered: 6/18/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, Re: see order in 98-126 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt) Copy to parties. (VO)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 100 Filed: 6/6/2002, Entered: 6/11/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER, re order in 98-126, filed 6/6/02. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 99 Filed: 6/4/2002, Entered: 6/4/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER, re: see order in 98-126, filed 6/03/02. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (FE) Modified on 06/04/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 98 Filed: 5/28/2002, Entered: 5/29/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 97 Filed: 5/20/2002, Entered: 5/21/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 96 Filed: 5/9/2002, Entered: 5/10/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER re: See [395-1] order in case No. 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 95 Filed: 5/7/2002, Entered: 5/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 94 Filed: 5/7/2002, Entered: 5/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, re: See order in 98-126 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 93 Filed: 5/6/2002, Entered: 5/7/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 92 Filed: 5/3/2002, Entered: 5/3/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 91 Filed: 4/26/2002, Entered: 4/29/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER, re: see order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 90 Filed: 4/23/2002, Entered: 4/24/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 89 Filed: 4/18/2002, Entered: 4/18/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER, Re: see order in 98-126 ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (VO)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 88 Filed: 4/11/2002, Entered: 4/11/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER re: see order [344-2] dated 4/11/02 in Case No. 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 87 Filed: 3/25/2002, Entered: 3/26/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER, re: see order in 98-126 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 86 Filed: 3/19/2002, Entered: 3/20/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, re: See order in 98-126 (signed by Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir for Judge Diana Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 85 Filed: 3/5/2002, Entered: 3/6/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying Motion to preclude or, in the alternative, defer, depositions pursuant to Rule 30(b)(6) (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 84 Filed: 2/28/2002, Entered: 3/1/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting Motion to Extend Time to respond to interrogatories until 3/8/02 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 83 Filed: 2/20/2002, Entered: 2/21/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER, re: SEE CASE NO. 98-486 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 81 Filed: 2/13/2002, Entered: 2/14/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER, re: see order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 80 Filed: 2/1/2002, Entered: 2/4/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER denying motion to reconsider filed 1/22/02 and granting the motion to revise dates in 9/26/01 order filed 1/24/02 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 79 Filed: 2/1/2002, Entered: 2/4/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER. See order in 98-126C filed 2/1/02. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 78 Filed: 1/29/2002, Entered: 1/29/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER setting Status Conference for 2:00 p.m. on 2/12/02 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 77 Filed: 1/22/2002, Entered: 1/23/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [76-1] motion to defer briefing on Government motions (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 76 Filed: 1/17/2002, Entered: 1/17/2002, Terminated: 1/22/2002 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by INDIANA MICHIGAN (Service: 1/17/02) to defer briefing on Government motions . Response due: 2/4/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 75 Filed: 1/11/2002, Entered: 1/14/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER see order in 98-126C filed 1/11/02. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 74 Filed: 1/10/2002, Entered: 1/11/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER denying [69-1] motion for a status conference (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 73 Filed: 1/9/2002, Entered: 1/10/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [70-1] motion to Extend Time to file a response to the Motion for partial Summary Judgment Response to [64-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment reset to 1/25/02 (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 72 Filed: 1/8/2002, Entered: 1/8/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by USA (Service: 1/2/02) to [69-1] motion for a status conference filed [by leave of the judge]. Reply due: 1/14/02 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 71 Filed: 1/3/2002, Entered: 1/7/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER see order in 98-126C filed 01/03/02 ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 70 Filed: 12/21/2001, Entered: 12/27/2001, Terminated: 1/9/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by INDIANA MICHIGAN (Service: 12/21/01) to Extend Time to file a response to the Motion for partial Summary Judgment until 1/25/02. Response due: 1/7/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 69 Filed: 12/14/2001, Entered: 12/17/2001, Terminated: 1/10/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by INDIANA MICHIGAN (Service: 12/14/01) for a status conference . Response due: 1/2/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 68 Filed: 12/3/2001, Entered: 12/4/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [66-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 67 Filed: 12/3/2001, Entered: 12/4/2001, Terminated: 6/27/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service: 11/28/01) for Summary Judgment , regarding the rate of spent nuclear fuel acceptance, (with separate appendix). Response due: 12/31/01 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 66 Filed: 11/29/2001, Entered: 11/30/2001, Terminated: 12/3/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service by hand: 11/28/01) For leave to exceed the page limitation . Response due: 12/12/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 65 Filed: 11/28/2001, Entered: 11/30/2001 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA. Service by hand: 11/27/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 64 Filed: 11/28/2001, Entered: 11/30/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION, with one volume of Appendix, by USA (Service by hand: 11/27/01) for partial Summary Judgment . Response due: 12/26/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 63 Filed: 11/20/2001, Entered: 11/21/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER see order in 98-126C filed 11/20/01 ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 62 Filed: 11/16/2001, Entered: 11/19/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER see order in 98-126C filed 11/16/01. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 61 Filed: 11/14/2001, Entered: 11/16/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER see order in 98-126C filed 11/14/01. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 60 Filed: 11/14/2001, Entered: 11/16/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER see order in 98-126C filed 11/14/01. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 59 Filed: 11/8/2001, Entered: 11/9/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER. See 98-126C. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 58 Filed: 11/8/2001, Entered: 11/9/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER. See 98-126C. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 57 Filed: 11/7/2001, Entered: 11/8/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER. See 98-126 C ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 56 Filed: 11/7/2001, Entered: 11/8/2001 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 55 Filed: 11/6/2001, Entered: 11/7/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting motion to enlarge time to respond to motion to compel production of documents to 11/06/01 ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 54 Filed: 11/6/2001, Entered: 11/7/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER re: Public Service Electric and Gas motion to extend time filed on 11/2/01, within which to respond to the defendant;s motion to compel is GRANTED (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein) Copy to parties. (see motion filed in 98-126C) (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 53 Filed: 11/6/2001, Entered: 11/7/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting motion to enlarge time to complete production of documents to 11/19/01 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 52 Filed: 11/1/2001, Entered: 11/5/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying [40-1] motion for Clarification of the Court's 9/26/01 order. Individual Judges retain the right to decide dispositive motions. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 51 Filed: 10/30/2001, Entered: 11/1/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER re: proposed stipulated order (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 50 Filed: 10/29/2001, Entered: 10/31/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [41-1] motion for Leave to file copies of the Motion to Transfer Responsibility, etc. and granting Plaintiff's Motion for leave to file copies of response to the transfer motion (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 49 Filed: 10/19/2001, Entered: 10/23/2001 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of supplemental certificate of service by USA. Service: 10/19/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 48 Filed: 10/19/2001, Entered: 10/23/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 10/19/01) to Compel . Response due: 11/5/01. (Filed with response to third party objections). (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 48 Filed: 10/19/2001, Entered: 10/23/2001 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by USA to third party objections. Service: 10/19/01. (Filed with Motion to Compel). (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 46 Filed: 10/19/2001, Entered: 10/22/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER re: All filings shall bear the name of the discovery Judge, all matters to be brought to the attention of the Court shall be filed with the discovery Judge only, the Clerk of the Court is directed not to accept for filing any motion by a party in one of the captioned cases for leave to file material with a Judge in an individual case ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 47 Filed: 10/18/2001, Entered: 10/23/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 10/16/01) to Compel . Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 11/2/01. (Filed with response to third party objections). (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 47 Filed: 10/18/2001, Entered: 10/23/2001 ResponseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by USA to third party objections. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 10/16/01. (Filed with Motion to Compel). (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 45 Filed: 10/18/2001, Entered: 10/19/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER directing the Clerk's Office to file Defendant's response and Defendant's corrected certificate of service is due 10/25/01 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 44 Filed: 10/17/2001, Entered: 10/18/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER re: Defendant's motion to extend time filed on 10/15/01, within which to file the proposed stipulated order concerning the scheduling and conduct of depositions in the coordinated discovery proceedings, is GRANTED, see motion in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 43 Filed: 10/11/2001, Entered: 10/15/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [42-1] motion for Leave to file the Motion for Clarification (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 42 Filed: 10/11/2001, Entered: 10/15/2001, Terminated: 10/11/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by INDIANA MICHIGAN (Service: 10/10/01) for Leave to file the Motion for Clarification . Response due: 10/29/01. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 41 Filed: 10/11/2001, Entered: 10/15/2001, Terminated: 10/29/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 10/10/01) for Leave to file copies of the Motion to Transfer Responsibility, etc. . Response due: 10/29/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 40 Filed: 10/9/2001, Entered: 10/10/2001, Terminated: 11/1/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by INDIANA MICHIGAN (Service by hand: 10/9/01) for Clarification of the Court's 9/26/01 order . Response due: 10/23/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 39 Filed: 10/3/2001, Entered: 10/4/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [38-1] motion to Extend Time to submit a plan for production of e-mail messages Plan is to be filed by 10/22/01 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 38 Filed: 10/3/2001, Entered: 10/4/2001, Terminated: 10/3/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 10/1/01) to Extend Time to submit a plan for production of e-mail messages until 10/22/01. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 37 Filed: 9/26/2001, Entered: 9/26/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER re: The Joint Motion for an Order for Consolidated Discovery filed on 7/10/01, is granted, with the exception of document production, the parties are granted an enlargement of time until 10/1/01, to submit a plan addressing the production of e-mail messages (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 36 Filed: 9/13/2001, Entered: 9/13/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER setting Status Conference for 4:00 p.m. on 9/20/01 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 35 Filed: 8/22/2001, Entered: 8/22/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting motion for protective order in the form provided by Exhibit A of the parties 08/10/01 motion (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). See case number 98-126 C for motion. Protective order in 98-458 C is also granted, subject to reconsideration by assigned judge. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 34 Filed: 8/15/2001, Entered: 8/16/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER setting Status Conference for 2:00 p.m. on 9/11/01 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein, Discovery Judge). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 33 Filed: 7/27/2001, Entered: 7/30/2001 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by USA to [31-1] order. Service: 7/27/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 32 Filed: 7/20/2001, Entered: 7/26/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER. The Joint Motion for an Order for Coordinated Discovery is granted to the limited extent of designating Judge Diane Weinstein to serve as discovery judge in this case. Further action on the parties' proposed discovery schedule (as set forth in the Joint Motion) will be determined by Judge Weinstein ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ). Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 31 Filed: 7/20/2001, Entered: 7/23/2001 Order on Motion for Order to Show CauseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. Show Cause Response due: 7/27/01 for USA (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 7/20/2001, Entered: 7/23/2001 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Deadline updated; Plaintiff's response to show cause is due on 8/10/01 . (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 30 Filed: 7/13/2001, Entered: 7/16/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by INDIANA MICHIGAN (Service: 7/13/01) for Leave to file in this case a copy of filings made before Judge Wiese as managing Judge . (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 29 Filed: 7/5/2001, Entered: 7/6/2001 RemarkCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Copy of Yankee Atomic's Motion for Leave to file documents relevant to the telephone conference with Judge Wiese. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 28 Filed: 5/31/2001, Entered: 6/1/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER resetting Status Conference for 2:30 p.m. on 6/14/01 (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 27 Filed: 5/29/2001, Entered: 5/31/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER setting Status Conference for 10:30 a.m. on 6/14/01 (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 26 Filed: 5/22/2001, Entered: 5/25/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER: On 1/8/2001, Dft filed a [15-1] Motion for the Chief Judge to reassign to a single judge cases involving alleged breaches of the standard contract published at 10 C.F.R. Part 961. The Chief Judge hereby designates Judge Wiese as the managing judge in the above cited cases for the purpose of meeting with the parties to consider whether consolidation or other joint handling of discovery or other pre-trial matters is appropriate. Judge Wiese is requested to formulate a management plan, if one is appropriate, and is authorized to make appropriate rulings with respect to this purpose. (signed by Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir). Judge Wiese is designated as managing judge. Copy to parties. (LTD) Modified on 3/17/2004 (jcp, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 25 Filed: 2/27/2001, Entered: 2/27/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by "YANKEE UTILITIES" (Service: 1/29/01) to [15-1] motion for the Chief Judge to reassign to a single judge cases involving alleged breaches of the standard contract published at 10 C.F.R. Part 961, filed with a (1) one volume appendix. Reply due: 2/12/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 24 Filed: 2/27/2001, Entered: 2/27/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [21-1] motion for Leave to file in this case a copy of "Yankee Utilities" opposition to motion to reassign cases (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 23 Filed: 2/27/2001, Entered: 2/27/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY by USA to response to [15-1] motion for the Chief Judge to reassign to a single judge cases involving alleged breaches of the standard contract published at 10 C.F.R. Part 961. Service by hand: 2/16/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 22 Filed: 2/27/2001, Entered: 2/27/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [20-1] motion for Leave to file in this case a copy of reply to motion to reassign to a single Judge cases involving alleged breaches of contract, etc. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 21 Filed: 2/20/2001, Entered: 2/22/2001, Terminated: 2/27/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by INDIANA MICHIGAN (Service: 2/20/01) for Leave to file in this case a copy of "Yankee Utilities" opposition to motion to reassign cases . Response due: 2/20/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 20 Filed: 2/20/2001, Entered: 2/21/2001, Terminated: 2/27/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 2/20/01 ) for Leave to file in this case a copy of reply to motion to reassign to a single Judge cases involving alleged breaches of contract, etc. Response due: 3/9/01 (HW) Modified on 02/21/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 19 Filed: 2/5/2001, Entered: 2/6/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [18-1] motion for Leave to file a copy of "Plaintiff's memorandum in opposition to the USA's motion to the Chief Judge to reassign to a single Judge the fourteenpending standard contract cases" (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 18 Filed: 1/30/2001, Entered: 1/30/2001, Terminated: 2/5/2001 Motion for Leave to FileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by INDIANA MICHIGAN (Service: 1/30/01) for Leave to file a copy of "Plaintiff's memorandum in opposition to the USA's motion to the Chief Judge to reassign to a single Judge the fourteen pending standard contract cases" . (FE) Modified on 02/21/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 17 Filed: 1/29/2001, Entered: 1/30/2001 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                See 30-1 Response to motion filed January 29, 2001, in 98-483C Florida Power & Light Company. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 16 Filed: 1/22/2001, Entered: 1/23/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by INDIANA MICHIGAN (Service by hand: 1/22/01) to Extend Time to respond to the USA's motion to the Chief Judge to reassign cases to a single Judge , (until January 29, 2001). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 15 Filed: 1/9/2001, Entered: 1/10/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 1/9/01) for the Chief Judge to reassign to a single judge cases involving alleged breaches of the standard contract published at 10 C.F.R. Part 961 . Response due: 1/26/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 14 Filed: 1/9/2001, Entered: 1/10/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [13-1] motion for Leave to file a copy of the USA's motion to the Chief Judge to reassign to a single judge cases involved alleged breaches of the standard contract published at 10 C.F.R. Part 961 (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 13 Filed: 1/9/2001, Entered: 1/9/2001, Terminated: 1/9/2001 Motion for Leave to FileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service by hand: 1/9/01) for Leave to file a copy of the USA's motion to the Chief Judge to reassign to a single judge cases involved alleged breaches of the standard contract published at 10 C.F.R. Part 961 . Response due: 1/23/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 12 Filed: 12/15/2000, Entered: 12/18/2000 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of change of address by Alexander D. Tomaszczuk. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 11 Filed: 8/2/1999, Entered: 8/3/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [10-1] motion to continue Stay of all proceedings. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 10 Filed: 7/30/1999, Entered: 7/30/1999, Terminated: 8/2/1999 Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 7/30/99) to continue Stay of all proceedings . (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 9 Filed: 7/12/1999, Entered: 7/13/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER re: This case was stayed pending Northern States Power Company v. United States, which is now on appeal, the parties will advise the court how they wish to proceed ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 8 Filed: 5/20/1999, Entered: 6/1/1999 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of change of address by Alexander D. Tomaszczuk. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 7 Filed: 9/22/1998, Entered: 9/25/1998 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Bryant Steven Banes. Service : 9/22/98. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 6 Filed: 6/25/1998, Entered: 6/26/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER suspending this case until further notice. ( Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. ) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 5 Filed: 6/17/1998, Entered: 6/18/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by INDIANA MICHIGAN (Service : 6/17/98 ) to Consolidate Cases 98-483C, 98-484C, 98-485C and 98-486C. (AB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 4 Filed: 6/17/1998, Entered: 6/18/1998 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Joseph Andrew Kijewski Service : 6/17/98 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 3 Filed: 6/8/1998, Entered: 6/9/1998 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of assignment to Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. . Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 2 Filed: 6/8/1998, Entered: 6/9/1998 Notice of Related Cases
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by INDIANA MICHIGAN POWER COMPANY of related cases; (98-126 C, 98-154 C and 98-474 C). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 6/8/1998, Entered: 6/9/1998 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #045624. Answer due on 8/7/98. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 6/8/1998, Entered: 6/9/1998 Set/Clear Flags
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 233 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?