SACRAMENTO MUNICIPAL v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:98-cv-00488-SGB
District Judge Susan G. Braden, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Sacramento Municipal Utility District, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Howard Neil Cayne +1 202 942 5566 +1 202 942 5999 howard_cayne@aporter.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Russell Alan Shultis +1 202 305 7571 +1 202 305 7643 russell.shultis@usdoj.gov
No Logo 24 PLAINTIFF UTILITIES, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Balch & Bingham LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Melvin Stanford Blanton +1 205 226 3417 +1 205 488 5879 sblanton@balch.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard William Oehler +1 206 359 8419 +1 206 359 9419 roehler@perkinscoie.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alexander D. Tomaszczuk +1 703 770 7940 +1 703 770 7901 alex.tomaszczuk@pillsburylaw.com
No Logo CERTAIN UTILITY PLAINTIFFS, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenberg Traurig, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jerry Stouck +1 202 331 3173 +1 202 331 3101 stouckj@gtlaw.com
No Logo Consumers Energy Company, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Williams Mullen, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas Owen Mason +1 703 760 5200 +1 703 748 0244 tmason@williamsmullen.com
No Logo NARUC, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by naruc.org Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Grace D. Soderberg +1 202 898 1350 +1 202 898 2213 gsoderberg@naruc.org
No Logo Nevada, State of, Amicus Curiae
Office COFC
Filed 6/9/1998
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 536 - Spent Nuclear Fuel
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Judgment
County None
Terminated 12/4/2006
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case '07-5052'[]
Def Custody Status
Flags APPEAL, CLOSED, ECF, SNF
  Entries (439) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 396 Filed: 7/25/2007, Entered: 7/25/2007 Court Filing
ORDER Directing the Clerk to Return Mr. Peterson's Motion to Intervene. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (gbb)
    LREF
    Legal Document 395 Filed: 4/20/2007, Entered: 4/20/2007 Court Filing
    ORDER RETURNING MOTION TO INTERVENE Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (gbb)
      LREF
      Legal Document 393 Filed: 2/12/2007, Entered: 2/13/2007 Notice of Appeal
      NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL, filed by SACRAMENTO MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 066154. Copies to judge, opposing party and CAFC. (hw1, )
        LREF
        Legal Document 394 Filed: 2/6/2007, Entered: 2/23/2007 CAFC Case Number
        CAFC Case Number 07-5052 for [392] Notice of Appeal filed by USA. (hw1, )
          LREF
          Legal Document 392 Filed: 2/2/2007, Entered: 2/2/2007
          NOTICE OF APPEAL, filed by USA. Copies to judge, opposing party and CAFC. (hw1, )
            LREF
            Legal Document 391 Filed: 12/29/2006, Entered: 12/29/2006 Court Filing
            ORDER Clarifying the Court's December 1, 2006 Opinion and Order Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (gbb, )
              LREF
              Legal Document 390 Filed: 12/20/2006, Entered: 12/21/2006 Certified Transcript to Attorney
              CERTIFIED TRANSCRIPT OF JUDGMENT, dated December 4, 2006, forwarded to Howard Neil Cayne. See letter in file. (bre,)
                LREF
                Legal Document 389 Filed: 12/18/2006, Entered: 12/18/2006
                Unopposed MOTION for Clarification of the Court's December 1, 2006 Opinion and Order, filed by SACRAMENTO MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT.Response due by 1/4/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A: Proposed Order Clarifying the Court's December 1, 2006 Opinion and Order)(Macdonald, Timothy)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 388 Filed: 12/4/2006, Entered: 12/4/2006
                  JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the plaintiff recover of and from the United States the sum of $39,796,234.00. (lld, )
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 387 Filed: 12/1/2006, Entered: 12/1/2006 Court Filing
                    PUBLISHED OPINION and ORDER. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (gbb, )
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 386 Filed: 11/30/2006, Entered: 11/30/2006 Court Filing
                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-39) held on November 28, 2006 before Judge Susan G. Braden. (dw1)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 385 Filed: 11/30/2006, Entered: 11/30/2006
                        JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING COSTS ATTRIBUTABLE TO NONFUEL COMPONENTS, filed by all parties. (Macdonald, Timothy) Modified on 12/5/2006 to edit text. (dls ).
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 384 Filed: 11/7/2006, Entered: 11/7/2006 Court Filing
                          ORDER granting [381] Plaintiff's Motion To Readmit Two Exhibits Into The Record Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (gbb, )
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 383 Filed: 10/17/2006, Entered: 10/17/2006
                            RESPONSE to [381] MOTION To Readmit two exhibits into the Record, filed by USA.Reply due by 10/30/2006. (Gardner, Joshua) Modified on 10/18/2006 to correct reply due date. (dls ).
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 382 Filed: 10/16/2006, Entered: 10/16/2006
                              Five Volumes of Exhibits Admitted at August 23 & 24, 2006 Hearing, and Exhibits Referenced in [380] Post Trial Brief, filed by SACRAMENTO MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT. (mb2, ) Modified on to edit text. 10/17/2006 (dls ).
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 381 Filed: 10/13/2006, Entered: 10/13/2006, Terminated: 11/7/2006 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                MOTION To Readmit Two Exhibits into the Record, filed by SACRAMENTO MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 10/12/2006.Response due by 10/30/2006.(mb2, )
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 380 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: 10/10/2006
                                  POST TRIAL BRIEF Sacramento Municipal Utility District's Post-Hearing Legal Brief, filed by SACRAMENTO MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT. (Attachments: # (1) Attachment 1# (2) Attachment 2)(Macdonald, Timothy)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 379 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: 10/10/2006
                                    POST TRIAL BRIEF Concerning Evidentiary Hearing, filed by USA. (Gardner, Joshua)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 421
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 378 Filed: 9/13/2006, Entered: 9/13/2006 Court Filing
                                        ORDER granting Government's Motion for Extension of Time. Post Trial Briefs due 10/10/2006. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden.
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 377 Filed: 9/12/2006, Entered: 9/12/2006, Terminated: 9/13/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                                          Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until September 29, 2006 to post-trial briefing, filed by USA.Response due by 9/29/2006.(Lo Re, Alan)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 8/28/2006, Entered: 8/28/2006
                                            Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 9/25/2006. (vp1, )
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 376 Filed: 8/25/2006, Entered: 8/25/2006 Court Filing
                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (page 276-458) held on August 24, 2006 before Judge Susan G. Braden. (dw1)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 375 Filed: 8/25/2006, Entered: 8/25/2006
                                                Cumulative Index for TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on March 21, 2005 through April 1, 2005. (dw1)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 374 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: 8/24/2006 Court Filing
                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-275) held on August 23, 2006 before Judge Susan G. Braden. (dw1)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 373 Filed: 8/22/2006, Entered: 8/22/2006
                                                    NOTICE, filed by SACRAMENTO MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT re [360] Scheduling Order, SMUD's Filing of Summary Table of Adjusted Damages, Revised Table A, Exhibit 1 to Supplemental Written Direct Testimony of James Field, and Summary of Total Costs by Category and Date (Attachments: # (1) Summary Table of Adjusted Damages# (2) Complete Revised Table A# (3) Exhibit 1 to Supplemental Written Direct of Fields# (4) Summary of Total Costs by Category and Date)(Macdonald, Timothy)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 372 Filed: 8/18/2006, Entered: 8/18/2006
                                                      NOTICE, filed by SACRAMENTO MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT re [364] Response, SMUD'S Filing of Revised Proposed Modification to Labor Costs in Table A (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Modification Table# (2) Written Testimony# (3) Exhibit 1)(Macdonald, Timothy)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 371 Filed: 8/18/2006, Entered: 8/18/2006
                                                        NOTICE, filed by SACRAMENTO MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT re [365] Response, SMUD's Filing of Revised Table B (Attachments: # (1) Revised Table B# (2) Written Testimony)(Macdonald, Timothy)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 370 Filed: 8/18/2006, Entered: 8/18/2006
                                                          NOTICE, filed by USA re [362] Response (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Gardner, Joshua)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 369 Filed: 8/16/2006, Entered: 8/16/2006 Court Filing
                                                            ORDER: Although designated as an electronic case in the court's case management/electronic case filing (CM/ECF) system, any filing in excess of 100 pages (inclusive of appendices/exhibits) will be filed in traditional, hard-copy form, and not in electronic form. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (sf2, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 368 Filed: 7/28/2006, Entered: 7/28/2006, Terminated: 12/1/2006 Motion for Leave to File
                                                              MOTION for Leave to File RESPONSIVE DIRECT TESTIMONY, filed by USA.Response due by 8/14/2006. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Gardner, Joshua)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 367 Filed: 7/24/2006, Entered: 7/24/2006 Court Filing
                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-25) held on June 27, 2006 before Judge Susan G. Braden. (dw1)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 366 Filed: 7/21/2006, Entered: 7/21/2006
                                                                  RESPONSE to [360] Scheduling Order, SMUD's Filing of Table C, filed by SACRAMENTO MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT. (Attachments: # (1) Written Testimony# (2) Exhibit 1# (3) Exhibit 2# (4) Exhibit 3# (5) Exhibit 4# (6) Exhibit 5# (7) Exhibit 6# (8) Exhibit 7# (9) Exhibit 8# (10) Exhibit 9# (11) Exhibit 10# (12) Exhibit 11# (13) Exhibit 12# (14) Exhibit 13)(Macdonald, Timothy)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 365 Filed: 7/21/2006, Entered: 7/21/2006
                                                                  RESPONSE to [360] Scheduling Order, SMUD's Filing of Table B, filed by SACRAMENTO MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT. (Attachments: # (1) Table B# (2) Written Testimony# (3) Exhibit 1# (4) Exhibit 2# (5) Exhibit 3# (6) Exhibit 4# (7) Exhibit 5# (8) Exhibit 6)(Macdonald, Timothy)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 364 Filed: 7/21/2006, Entered: 7/21/2006
                                                                    RESPONSE to [360] Scheduling Order, SMUD's Filing of Proposed Modification to Labor Costs in Table A, filed by SACRAMENTO MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Modification Table# (2) Written Testimony# (3) Exhibit 1)(Macdonald, Timothy)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 363 Filed: 7/21/2006, Entered: 7/21/2006
                                                                      RESPONSE to [360] Scheduling Order, Joint Filing of Stipulated Adjustments to Table A, filed by SACRAMENTO MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT. (Attachments: # (1) Stipulated Adjustments Table)(Macdonald, Timothy)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 362 Filed: 7/21/2006, Entered: 7/21/2006
                                                                        RESPONSE to [360] Scheduling Order,, filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Gardner, Joshua)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 361 Filed: 7/7/2006, Entered: 7/7/2006
                                                                          RESPONSE to [360] Scheduling Order, Joint Filing of Tables A, D, and E, filed by SACRAMENTO MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT. (Attachments: # (1) Table A# (2) Table D# (3) Table E)(Macdonald, Timothy)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 360 Filed: 6/28/2006, Entered: 6/28/2006 Court Filing
                                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER:Tables A, D, & E, as referenced in the March 31, 2006 Order Requesting Supplemental Expert Testimony, due by 7/7/2006. Tables B & C, as referenced in the March 31, 2006 Order Requesting Supplemental Expert Testimony, due by 7/21/2006. Evidentiary Hearing set for 8/23-24/2006 in National Courts Building before Judge Susan G. Braden. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (sf2, )
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 6/27/2006, Entered: 6/27/2006
                                                                              Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 7/27/2006. (vp1, )
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 359 Filed: 6/19/2006, Entered: 6/20/2006 Transcript - Cumulative Index
                                                                                Cumulative Index (pages 1-65) for TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (filed with exhibits) held on March 21, 2005 through April 1, 2005. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit List) (dw1)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 358 Filed: 6/8/2006, Entered: 6/13/2006 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on May 16, 2006 before Judge Susan G. Braden. (dw1)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 5/19/2006, Entered: 5/19/2006
                                                                                    Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 6/16/2006. (vp1, )
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 357 Filed: 5/16/2006, Entered: 5/16/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                      STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 6/27/2006 at 2:00 PM before Judge Susan G. Braden. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (sf2, )
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 356 Filed: 4/18/2006, Entered: 4/24/2006 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on April 10, 2006 before Judge Susan G. Braden. (dw1)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 4/12/2006, Entered: 4/12/2006
                                                                                          Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 5/10/2006. (vp1, )
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 355 Filed: 4/10/2006, Entered: 4/10/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                            STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 5/16/2006 02:00 PM before Judge Susan G. Braden. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (sf2, )
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 354 Filed: 3/31/2006, Entered: 3/31/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                              PUBLISHED OPINION: Requesting Supplemental Expert Testimony. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (sf2, )
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 353 Filed: 3/31/2006, Entered: 3/31/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                ORDER Regarding Final Evidentiary Exhibits. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (sf2, )
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 352 Filed: 3/31/2006, Entered: 3/31/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                  PUBLISHED OPINION re: entitlement to damages. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (sf2, )
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 3/31/2006, Entered: 3/31/2006
                                                                                                    Set Deadline: Status Conference set for 4/10/2006 at 2:00 PM before Judge Susan G. Braden. (dls )
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document 351 Filed: 1/23/2006, Entered: 1/23/2006, Terminated: 12/1/2006 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Proposed Order Regarding Final Exhibits, filed by SACRAMENTO MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT. Response due by 2/9/2006. (Attachments: # (1) Attachment 1)(Macdonald, Timothy)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 350 Filed: 1/18/2006, Entered: 1/18/2006, Terminated: 12/1/2006 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                        Joint MOTION for Leave to File Proposed Order Regarding Exhibits, filed by USA. Response due by 2/6/2006. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Gardner, Joshua)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 349 Filed: 12/5/2005, Entered: 12/5/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                          STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 12/7/2005 3:00 PM before Judge Susan G. Braden. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (sf2, )
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 348 Filed: 11/29/2005, Entered: 11/29/2005, Terminated: 12/1/2006 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Conditional Motion To Exclude Certain Documents Relied Upon By Defendant, filed by SACRAMENTO MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT. Response due by 12/16/2005. (Macdonald, Timothy)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 347 Filed: 11/28/2005, Entered: 11/28/2005, Terminated: 12/1/2006 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                              MOTION to Exclude Certain Documents Not Used With A Witness By Plaintiff At Trial filed by USA. Response due by 12/15/2005. (Damelin, Scott) Modified on 11/29/2005 to edit docket text for clarity. (dls ).
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 346 Filed: 11/23/2005, Entered: 11/23/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER granting [345] Motion for Leave to File Thid Supplemental Exhibit List. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (sf2, )
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 345 Filed: 11/10/2005, Entered: 11/10/2005, Terminated: 11/23/2005 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Third Supplemental Exhibit List, filed by SACRAMENTO MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT. Response due by 11/28/2005. (Attachments: # (1))(Macdonald, Timothy)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 344 Filed: 11/10/2005, Entered: 11/10/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [343] Motion for Extension of Time. The parties shall file their respective Motions to Exclude additional documents not used by a witness at trial on or before November 28, 2005. Responses to such motions shall be filed on or before December 19, 2005. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (sf2, )
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 343 Filed: 11/8/2005, Entered: 11/8/2005, Terminated: 11/10/2005 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time until November 28, 2005 to File Motion To Exclude Additional Documents Not Used By Plaintiff At Trial, filed by USA. Response due by 11/25/2005. (Gardner, Joshua)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 342 Filed: 11/1/2005, Entered: 11/1/2005
                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact, filed by SACRAMENTO MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT, filed by SACRAMENTO MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT. (Macdonald, Timothy)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 341 Filed: 10/18/2005, Entered: 10/18/2005
                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to [338] Post Trial Brief filed by SACRAMENTO MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT. (Macdonald, Timothy)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 340 Filed: 10/4/2005, Entered: 10/4/2005
                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA filed by USA. (Gardner, Joshua)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 339 Filed: 9/21/2005, Entered: 9/21/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [336] Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Response to Proposed Findings of Fact. Defendant shall file its response to Plaintiff's Proposed Findings of Fact by October 4, 2005. Plaintiff shall file a response to Defendant's Proposed Findings of Fact by November 1, 2005. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (sf2, )
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 9/21/2005, Entered: 9/21/2005
                                                                                                                                Set Deadlines/Hearings: Plaintiffs Response to defendants Proposed Findings of Fact due by 11/1/2005. Defendant's Response to Plaintiffs Proposed Finding of Fact due by 10/4/2005. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 338 Filed: 9/20/2005, Entered: 9/20/2005
                                                                                                                                  POST TRIAL BRIEF by USA. (Attachments: # (1))(Gardner, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 337 Filed: 9/20/2005, Entered: 9/20/2005
                                                                                                                                    Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by USA. (Attachments: # (1))(Gardner, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 336 Filed: 9/16/2005, Entered: 9/16/2005, Terminated: 9/21/2005 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File responses to proposed findings filed by USA. Response due by 10/3/2005. (Lo Re, Alan)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 335 Filed: 9/8/2005, Entered: 9/13/2005 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                        Counter Designations re: [334] Notice, filed by USA. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 334 Filed: 9/8/2005, Entered: 9/8/2005
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by USA of Filing of Counter-Designations to Plaintiff's Trial and Deposition Testimony Designations (Attachments: # (1))(Cochran, Todd)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 333 Filed: 9/6/2005, Entered: 9/6/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting Defendant's Motion to File Cross-Designations in paper form. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (cw2, )
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 332 Filed: 8/22/2005, Entered: 8/22/2005
                                                                                                                                              Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by SACRAMENTO MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT. (Attachments: # (1))(Macdonald, Timothy)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 331 Filed: 8/22/2005, Entered: 8/22/2005
                                                                                                                                                POST TRIAL BRIEF by SACRAMENTO MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT. (Macdonald, Timothy)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 330 Filed: 7/27/2005, Entered: 7/27/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiff will file a post-trial brief on or before August 22, 2005. Defendant will file a response brief on or before September 20, 2005. Plaintiff will file a reply brief on or before October 18, 2005. The parties will submit an agreed list of exhibits entered into evidence on or before December 5, 2005. Motion to exclude any exhibits will be filed on or before November 14, 2005. Response to any such motions will be filed on or before December 5, 2005. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden.(ec1,)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 7/27/2005, Entered: 7/28/2005 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                    Set/Reset Deadlines: Exhibit List due by 12/5/2005; Motion(s) to Exclude due by 11/14/2005; Responses to Motion(s) to Exclude due by 12/5/2005; Plaintiff's Post Trial Brief due 8/22/2005; Defendant's Response Brief due 9/20/2005; Plaintiff's Reply Brief due by 10/18/2005. (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 328 Filed: 7/11/2005, Entered: 7/11/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                      SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiff's Post-Trial Brief due on or before August 12, 2005. Defendant's response brief due on or before September 13, 2005. Plaintiff's reply brief due on or before October 11, 2005. See order for other deadlines. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (ec1,)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 327 Filed: 7/11/2005, Entered: 7/11/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [325] Motion for Leave to File Appendix to Sacramento Municipal Utility District's Response to Memorandum Opinion and Order to Show Cause Dated April 21, 2005 in Paper Form. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (ec1,)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 7/11/2005, Entered: 7/11/2005
                                                                                                                                                          Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Exhibit List due by 8/15/2005; Motion(s) to exclude due by 8/1/2005; Responses to motions to exclude due by 8/15/2005; Post Trial Brief due 8/12/2005; Post Trial Response Brief due 9/13/2005; and Reply due by 10/11/2005. (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 329 Filed: 7/8/2005, Entered: 7/11/2005 Appendix
                                                                                                                                                            APPENDIX to [326] Response. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 326 Filed: 7/7/2005, Entered: 7/7/2005
                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to [315] Published Opinion, and Order to Show Cause Dated April 21, 2005 filed by SACRAMENTO MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT. (Macdonald, Timothy)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 325 Filed: 7/7/2005, Entered: 7/7/2005, Terminated: 7/11/2005 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Appendix to Sacramento Municipal Utility District's Response to Memorandum Opinion and Order to Show Cause Dated April 21, 2005 In Paper Form filed by SACRAMENTO MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT. Response due by 7/25/2005. (Macdonald, Timothy)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 324 Filed: 7/7/2005, Entered: 7/7/2005
                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE TO [318] ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by USA. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 323 Filed: 7/7/2005, Entered: 7/7/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    AMICUS BRIEF by NARUC, filed by leave of the Judge. (Soderberg, Grace)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 322 Filed: 7/7/2005, Entered: 7/7/2005
                                                                                                                                                                      AMICUS BRIEF In Response To The Court's April 21, 2005 Show Cause Order by 24 Plaintiff Utilities. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix)(Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 321 Filed: 7/7/2005, Entered: 7/7/2005
                                                                                                                                                                        AMICUS BRIEF in Support of SMUD's Response to Order to Show Cause Dated April 21, 2005 by Certain Utility Plaintiffs. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 320 Filed: 7/7/2005, Entered: 7/7/2005
                                                                                                                                                                          AMICUS BRIEF on The Court's Order to Show Cause by State of Nevada. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1# (2) Exhibit 2# (3) Exhibit 3# (4) Exhibit 4# (5) Exhibit 5# (6) Exhibit 6# (7) Exhibit 7# (8) Exhibit 8# (9) Exhibit 9)(Cynkar, Robert) Modified on 7/7/2005 (jat, ). Filed by leave.
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 319 Filed: 6/20/2005, Entered: 6/20/2005
                                                                                                                                                                          AMICUS BRIEF Submitted Pursuant to Order Dated April 21, 2005 by CONSUMERS ENERGY COMPANY. (Mason, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 318 Filed: 6/16/2005, Entered: 6/16/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [317] Motion for Extension of Time. Briefs from the parties and any interested amicus in response to the April 21, 2005 Order to Show Cause Why the Standard Contract Should Not Be Held Void and Restitution Awarded from the Nuclear Waste Fund are now due on or before July 7, 2005. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (ec1,)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 6/16/2005, Entered: 6/16/2005
                                                                                                                                                                              Set/Reset Deadlines: Briefs due by 7/7/2005. (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 317 Filed: 6/15/2005, Entered: 6/15/2005, Terminated: 6/16/2005 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time until July 7, 2005 to To File Response To The Court's Show Cause Order filed by USA. Response due by 7/5/2005. (Gardner, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 316 Filed: 5/20/2005, Entered: 5/20/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by USA of Filing Objections and Counter-Designations to Plaintiff's Designations and Motion for Leave to File Appendix (Attachments: # (1))(Cochran, Todd)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 315 Filed: 4/21/2005, Entered: 4/21/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    PUBLISHED OPINION Memorandum Opinion and Order to Show Cause Why The Standard Contract Should Not Be Held Void and Restitution Awarded From the Nuclear Waste Fund. The parties are ordered to file briefs to address these issues no later than 60 days hereafter, i.e., June 20, 2005. Any interested entity also may file an amicus on that date, not to exceed 25 pages. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (ec1,)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 4/21/2005, Entered: 4/22/2005 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                      Set/Reset Deadlines: Brief due by 6/20/2005. (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 314 Filed: 4/14/2005, Entered: 4/14/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER:Telephone Status Conference set for 4/14/2005 04:00 PM EST before Judge Susan G. Braden. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (ec1,)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 313 Filed: 4/6/2005, Entered: 4/6/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT (Pg's 1-303, 304-583, 584-880, 881-1158, 1159-1463, 1464-1825, 1826-2214, 2215-2534, 2535-2805, 2806-3003) of Proceedings held on 3/21,22,23,24,25,28,29,30,31, 4-1-05 before Judge Susan G. Braden. (eph, )
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 312 Filed: 4/5/2005, Entered: 4/5/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER:Telephone Status Conference set for 4/13/2005 03:00 PM EST before Judge Susan G. Braden. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (ec1,)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 311 Filed: 3/31/2005, Entered: 3/31/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [289] Motion for Leave to File Designated Deposition Testimony of David Langstaff as Substantive Evidence Pursuant to FRE 801(d). Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (ec1,)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 309 Filed: 3/22/2005, Entered: 3/28/2005 Order on Motion for Authorization of Service 100+Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [308] Motion for Authorization of Service 100+. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 308 Filed: 3/21/2005, Entered: 3/21/2005, Terminated: 3/22/2005 Motion for Authorization of Service 100+ Miles
                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Authorization of Service 100+ Miles for attendance at trial of Messrs. Robert Jones and Daniel Keuter, filed by USA. Response due by 4/7/2005 (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 307 Filed: 3/18/2005, Entered: 3/18/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to [299] MOTION in Limine To Expert Witness filed by SACRAMENTO MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT. Reply due by 4/1/2005. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix# (2) # (3) # (4) # (5) # (6))(Macdonald, Timothy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 310 Filed: 3/16/2005, Entered: 3/29/2005 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    CORRECTED APPENDIX (7 volumes) TO ACCOMPANY SACRAMENTO MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT'S motion for leave to file designated deposition and trial testimony as substantive evidence pursuant to RCFC 32(a) and FRE 801(d) re [306] Order. Service: 3/16/2005.(hw1, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/29/2005 (dw1, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 306 Filed: 3/16/2005, Entered: 3/16/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER regarding pre-trial conference; granting in part and denying in part plaintiff's motion for leave to file designated deposition and trial testimony as substantive evidence pursuant to RCFC 32(a) and FRE 801(d); granting plaintiff's motion for leave to file designated deposition testimony of Salomon Levy and Roger Powers as substantive evidence pursuant to Rule 32(a). Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (ec1,)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 3/16/2005, Entered: 3/16/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 4/11/2005. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 305 Filed: 3/15/2005, Entered: 3/15/2005, Terminated: 12/1/2006 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File Second Supplemental Exhibit List filed by SACRAMENTO MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT. Response due by 4/1/2005 (Attachments: # (1) Attachment 1)(Macdonald, Timothy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 304 Filed: 3/14/2005, Entered: 3/15/2005 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT (Pages 1-103) of Proceedings held on 3/11/05 before Judge Susan G. Braden. (eph, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 303 Filed: 3/14/2005, Entered: 3/14/2005, Terminated: 12/1/2006 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Exhibit List filed by USA. Response due by 3/31/2005 (Attachments: # (1))(Cochran, Todd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 302 Filed: 3/9/2005, Entered: 3/9/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to [297] MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony and Evidence Regarding Plaintiff's Request for Pre-Breach Damages filed by SACRAMENTO MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT. Reply due by 3/21/2005. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Macdonald, Timothy) Modified on 3/10/2005 (reply date) (jat, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 301 Filed: 3/9/2005, Entered: 3/9/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re [288] MOTION Leave to File Designated Deposition and Trial Testimony as Substantive Evidence Pursuant to RCFC 32(a) and FRE 801(d) filed by SACRAMENTO MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT. (Macdonald, Timothy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 3/9/2005, Entered: 3/10/2005 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Set/Reset Deadlines: Reply due by 3/21/2005. (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 300 Filed: 3/7/2005, Entered: 3/7/2005, Terminated: 3/16/2005 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION Leave to File Designated Deposition Testimony of Salomon Levy and Roger Powers as Substantive Evidence Pursuant to RCFC 32(a) filed by SACRAMENTO MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT. Response due by 3/24/2005 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1a# (2) Exhibit 1b# (3) Exhibit 2a# (4) Exhibit 2b# (5) Exhibit 2c)(Macdonald, Timothy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 299 Filed: 3/4/2005, Entered: 3/4/2005, Terminated: 12/1/2006 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        **SEALED** MOTION in Limine To Expert Witness filed by USA. Response due by 3/21/2005 (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Supko 1a# (2) Appendix Supko 1b# (3) Appendix Supko 2a# (4) Appendix Supko 2b# (5) Appendix Supko 3a# (6) Affidavit Supko 3b# (7) Appendix Supko 4)(Shultis, Russell)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 298 Filed: 3/4/2005, Entered: 3/4/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Exhibit List (Supplemental) by SACRAMENTO MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT. (Attachments: # (1) Attachment 1)(Macdonald, Timothy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 297 Filed: 3/2/2005, Entered: 3/2/2005, Terminated: 12/1/2006 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            **SEALED** MOTION in Limine filed by USA. Response due by 3/21/2005 (Attachments: # (1) brief# (2) Appendix)(Shultis, Russell)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 296 Filed: 3/2/2005, Entered: 3/2/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [294] Motion for Leave to File Defendant's Motion In Limine To Exclude Testimony and Evidence Regarding Plaintiff's Request for Pre-Breach Damages under seal. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (ec1,)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 295 Filed: 3/2/2005, Entered: 3/2/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER:Telephone Status Conference set for 3/2/2005 02:30 PM before Judge Susan G. Braden. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (ec1,)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 294 Filed: 2/28/2005, Entered: 2/28/2005, Terminated: 3/2/2005 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Defendant's Motion In Limine To Exclude Testimony And Evidence Regarding Plaintiff's Request For Pre-Breach Damages by USA. Response due by 3/17/2005 (Gardner, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 293 Filed: 2/28/2005, Entered: 2/28/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Witness List by USA. (Damelin, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 292 Filed: 2/28/2005, Entered: 2/28/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Contentions)(Gardner, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 291 Filed: 2/28/2005, Entered: 2/28/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Exhibit List by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Attachment 1# (2) Affidavit Attachment 2)(Damelin, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 290 Filed: 2/28/2005, Entered: 2/28/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to [288] MOTION Leave to File Designated Deposition and Trial Testimony as Substantive Evidence Pursuant to RCFC 32(a) and FRE 801(d), [289] MOTION for Leave to File Designated Deposition Testimony of David Langstaff as Substantive Evidence Pursuant to FRE 801(d) filed by USA. Reply due by 3/14/2005. (Cochran, Todd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 289 Filed: 2/25/2005, Entered: 2/25/2005, Terminated: 3/31/2005 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File Designated Deposition Testimony of David Langstaff as Substantive Evidence Pursuant to FRE 801(d) by SACRAMENTO MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT. Response due by 3/14/2005 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 (Part 1)# (2) Exhibit 1 (Part 2))(Macdonald, Timothy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 288 Filed: 2/18/2005, Entered: 2/19/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION Leave to File Designated Deposition and Trial Testimony as Substantive Evidence Pursuant to RCFC 32(a) and FRE 801(d) by SACRAMENTO MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT. Response due by 3/7/2005 (Attachments: # (1) Attachment 1# (2) Appendix (Filed Separately))(Macdonald, Timothy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 287 Filed: 2/18/2005, Entered: 2/18/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Exhibit List by SACRAMENTO MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT. (Attachments: # (1) Attachment 2)(Macdonald, Timothy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 286 Filed: 2/17/2005, Entered: 2/17/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law by SACRAMENTO MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT. (Macdonald, Timothy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 285 Filed: 2/17/2005, Entered: 2/17/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Witness List by SACRAMENTO MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT. (Macdonald, Timothy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 284 Filed: 2/17/2005, Entered: 2/17/2005, Terminated: 12/1/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until February 18, 2005 to file exhibit list and additional motions, and for leave to submit appendix in paper form filed by SACRAMENTO MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT. Response due by 3/7/2005 (Macdonald, Timothy) Modified on 2/23/2005 to include request to file appendix in paper form. (dls).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 283 Filed: 2/15/2005, Entered: 2/15/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [282] Motion to Amend the Second Amended Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (ec1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 2/15/2005, Entered: 2/16/2005 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Appendix A filings due by 2/17/2005; Defendant's Appendix A filings due by 2/28/2005; Both parties will file their objections to a witness or exhibit by 3/4/2005; Defendant's responses to any motions filed by Plaintiff will be due by 2/28/2005; and Plaintiff's responses to any motions filed by Defendant will be due by 3/9/2005. (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 282 Filed: 2/10/2005, Entered: 2/10/2005, Terminated: 2/15/2005 Motion to Amend Schedule
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION to Amend Schedule by USA. Response due by 2/28/2005 (Cochran, Todd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 281 Filed: 1/19/2005, Entered: 1/19/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PUBLISHED OPINION. SMUD's July 18, 2001 Motion for Entry of an Order holding that the Government is liable fora breach of SMUD's June 14, 1983 DOE Standard Contract is granted. Whether damages, if any, were caused by the January 31, 1998 breach has not been adjudicated. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (ec1,)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 280 Filed: 1/7/2005, Entered: 1/7/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER Pursuant to the parties' request, the court hereby amends the expert discovery deadline contained in the October 8, 2004 Second Amended Scheduling Order. Accordingly, all expert discovery will now conclude on or before February 4, 2005. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden.(ec1,)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 1/7/2005, Entered: 1/10/2005 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Set Deadlines/Hearings: Expert Discovery due by 2/4/2005. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 279 Filed: 12/14/2004, Entered: 12/22/2004 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings in One Volume held in Washington D.C. on 12/7/04 before Judge Susan G. Braden. (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 278 Filed: 12/14/2004, Entered: 12/14/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by USA (Attachments: # (1))(Cochran, Todd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 277 Filed: 12/8/2004, Entered: 12/8/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT of Alan R. Denko by USA. (Cochran, Todd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 276 Filed: 12/7/2004, Entered: 12/7/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER:Telephone Status Conference set for 1/7/2005 02:00 PM before Judge Susan G. Braden. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (ec1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 275 Filed: 12/1/2004, Entered: 12/7/2004 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings in One Volume held in Washington, DC on 11/19/2004 before Judge Susan G. Braden. [Provided by the Dept. of Justice per Order of 10/22/2004] (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 274 Filed: 12/1/2004, Entered: 12/7/2004 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings in One Volume held at Washington, DC on 11/4/2004 before Judge Suan G. Braden. [Provided by the Dept. of Justice per Order of 10/22/2004] (jcp, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 12/7/2004 (jcp, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 273 Filed: 12/1/2004, Entered: 12/1/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by USA (Attachments: # (1))(Cochran, Todd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 272 Filed: 11/30/2004, Entered: 11/30/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [271] Motion to Amend the Second Amended Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (ec1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 271 Filed: 11/24/2004, Entered: 11/24/2004, Terminated: 11/30/2004 Motion to Amend Schedule
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION to Amend Schedule by USA. Response due by 12/13/2004 (Cochran, Todd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 270 Filed: 11/16/2004, Entered: 11/17/2004 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings in One Volume held at Washington, DC Before Judge Susan G. Braden on 10/5/2004. [Provided by the Dept. of Justice per Order of 10/22/2004] (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 269 Filed: 11/16/2004, Entered: 11/17/2004 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings in One Volume held at Washington, DC Before Judge Susan G. Braden on 10/1/2004. [Provided by the Dept. of Justice per Order of 10/22/2004] (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 268 Filed: 11/16/2004, Entered: 11/17/2004 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings in One Volume held at Washington, DC Before Judge Susan G. Braden on 9/17/2004. [Provided by the Dept. of Justice per Order of 10/22/2004] (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 267 Filed: 11/16/2004, Entered: 11/17/2004 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings in One Volume held at the Office of the US Attorney for the Eastern District of California on 9/10/2004. [Provided by the Dept. of Justice per Order of 10/22/2004] (jcp, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/17/2004 (jcp, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 266 Filed: 11/15/2004, Entered: 11/15/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by USA (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Cochran, Todd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 265 Filed: 10/29/2004, Entered: 10/29/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUPPLEMENTAL Reply BRIEF to defendant's [264] Supplemental Response to Plaintiff's Motion For Leave to File Proposed Liability Order by SACRAMENTO MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Part 1# (2) Appendix Part 2# (3) Appendix Part 3# (4) Appendix Part 4# (5) Appendix Part 5)(Macdonald, Timothy) Modified on 11/2/2004 to clarify docket text. (dls).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 263 Filed: 10/25/2004, Entered: 10/25/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [261] Motion for Leave to File Transcripts of Status Conferences and standing order to file transcripts for future status conferences. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (ec1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 264 Filed: 10/15/2004, Entered: 10/29/2004 Supplemental Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE filed by USA to [56] Motion for Leave to File proposed liability order. Service: 10/15/04.(dls) FILED UNDER SEAL.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 262 Filed: 10/15/2004, Entered: 10/15/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to [246] Amended Complaint by USA. JPSR due by 12/6/2004.(Cochran, Todd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 261 Filed: 10/15/2004, Entered: 10/15/2004, Terminated: 10/25/2004 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File Official Transcripts by USA. Response due by 11/1/2004 (Cochran, Todd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 260 Filed: 10/8/2004, Entered: 10/14/2004 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SECOND AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: The Government will file an Answer to the Amended Complaint on or before 10/15/2004. The Government will file a supplemental brief on or before 10/15/2004. Pltf will file any response on or before 10/29/2004. All Fact Discovery shall conclude on or before 11/10/2004. Any other motion for summary judgment or any supplemental briefing on the pending motions for summary judgment on or before 11/30/2004. A Status Conference will be held on 12/7/2004 at 04:00 PM before Judge Susan G. Braden. All expert Discovery will conclude on or before 1/18/2005. Pltf will file its Memorandum of Contentions of Law and Fact on or before 2/15/2005. Dft will file its responsive Memorandum on or before 2/25/2005. Each Memorandum will be accompanied by witness lists, exhibit lists, and any motions contemplated in Appendix A. Dft will file its response to any motions filed by pltf on or before 2/25/2005. Pltf will file its responses to any motions filed by dft on or before 3/7/2005. The Pretrial Conference will be held on 3/11/2005 at 10:00 AM in National Courts Building before Judge Susan G. Braden. Trial will be held beginning 3/21/2005 through 4/1/2005 at 10:00 AM in National Courts Building before Judge Susan G. Braden. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 259 Filed: 10/5/2004, Entered: 10/5/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 11/4/2004 03:00 PM EST before Judge Susan G. Braden. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (ec1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 258 Filed: 10/1/2004, Entered: 10/1/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER on parties' joint stipulation regarding the treatment of depositions from other spent nuclear fuel cases. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (ec1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 257 Filed: 10/1/2004, Entered: 10/1/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER on parties' joint stipulation regarding damages. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (ec1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 256 Filed: 10/1/2004, Entered: 10/1/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Telephone status conferences set for 10/5/2004 03:15 PM EST and 12/7/04 at 4:00 PM EST before Judge Susan G. Braden. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (ec1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 10/1/2004, Entered: 10/5/2004 Set/Reset Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Status Conference set for 12/7/2004 04:00 PM before Judge Susan G. Braden. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 255 Filed: 9/27/2004, Entered: 9/27/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION re [231] Reply to Response to Motion, [229] MOTION for Discovery Motion Regarding The Treatment Of Depositions From Other Spent Nuclear Fuel Cases, [230] Response to Motion and Proposed Order by all parties. (Shultis, Russell)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 254 Filed: 9/27/2004, Entered: 9/27/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION re [233] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Plaintiff's Recovery of Future Or Prospective Damages, [234] Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact, [250] Reply to Response to Motion,, [235] Notice (Other), [242] Response to Motion,, [239] MOTION for an Order Regarding Subsequent Actions for Future Damages, Plaintiff's Request to Stay Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Plaintiff's Recovery of Future Damages, and Plaintiff's Request for Expedite, [243] Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact, and Proposed Order by all parties. (Shultis, Russell)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 252 Filed: 9/23/2004, Entered: 9/23/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUPPLEMENTAL SCHEDULING ORDER ?Pursuant to the status conference held on 9/17/04, the court hereby modifies and supplements the Amended Scheduling Order entered on 7/28/04, as follows: (1) The trial scheduled to begin 3/21/05 through 4/1/05 will concern solely the contract claims asserted by the Plaintiff in Counts I and II of the Amended Complaint; (2) the deadline for fact discovery is extended until 10/1/04, with an additional extension likely after the parties' 10/1/04 telephone status conference; (3) the Government will file an Answer to the Amended Complaint by 10/15/04, however, no answer is required regarding the allegations in the takings claim set forth in Counts IV and V of the Amended Complaint; (4) the Government will file a supplemental brief, as requested, regarding the issue of contract liability by 10/15/04. Plaintiff will file any response to the Government's brief by 10/29/04; (5) all dispositive motions regarding the contract claims will be filed by 11/23/04; (6) the Court will issue a scheduling order for resolving the takings claims asserted by the Plaintiff in Counts IV and V of the Amended Complaint after the trial of the contract claims, if necessary. A telephone status conference will be held on 10/1/04 at 1:30 p.m. EST. All other deadlines in the Amended Scheduling Order entered 7/28/04 remain unchanged at this time. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (ec1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 9/23/2004, Entered: 9/24/2004 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Set Deadlines/Hearings: Defendant's Answer to Amended Complaint Due by 10/15/2004. Defendant's Supplemental Brief due by 10/15/2004. Dispositive Motion(s) due by 11/23/2004. Fact Discovery due by 10/1/2004. Plaintiffs' response to Defendant's Supplemental Brief due by 10/29/2004. Telephonic Status Conference set for 10/1/2004 01:30 PM before Judge Susan G. Braden. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 253 Filed: 9/21/2004, Entered: 9/24/2004 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings in One Volume held on 9/2/2004 before Judge Susan G. Braden. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 251 Filed: 9/2/2004, Entered: 9/7/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Documents [Example of the April 16 Supporting Material That Was Not Provided to the Court], by SACRAMENTO MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT. [FILED UNDER SEAL] Service: 9/2/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 250 Filed: 9/1/2004, Entered: 9/1/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Pltf's Response to [233] Dft's MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Pltfs Recovery of Future or Prospective Damages, filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Cover page, table of contents & table of authorities)(Gardner, Joshua) Modified on 9/15/2004 to correct the motion being referred to, from [239] to [233] (jcp, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 249 Filed: 9/1/2004, Entered: 9/1/2004, Terminated: 12/1/2006 ~Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Emergency MOTION to Seal Document [248] Notice (Other) by USA. Response due by 9/20/2004 (Cochran, Todd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 9/1/2004, Entered: 9/1/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by USA (Attachments: # (1))(Cochran, Todd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 247 Filed: 8/31/2004, Entered: 8/31/2004, Terminated: 12/1/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to [242] Response to Motion, for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Plaintiff's Recovery of Future Or Prospective Damages by USA. Response due by 9/17/2004. (Lo Re, Alan) Modified on 9/1/2004 for clarity (dw1).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 246 Filed: 8/30/2004, Entered: 8/30/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED COMPLAINT. (Macdonald, Timothy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 245 Filed: 8/30/2004, Entered: 8/30/2004, Terminated: 12/1/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to [242] Response to Motion, For Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Plaintiff's Recovery Of Future Or Prospective Damages by USA. Response due by 9/16/2004 (Gardner, Joshua) Modified on 8/31/2004 for clarity (dw1).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 244 Filed: 8/16/2004, Entered: 8/17/2004 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on July 15, 2004 before Judge Susna G. Braden. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 243 Filed: 8/16/2004, Entered: 8/16/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to [234] PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact in Support of Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment regarding Plaintiff's Recovery of Future or Prospective Damages by SACRAMENTO MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT filed by SACRAMENTO MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix)(Macdonald, Timothy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 242 Filed: 8/16/2004, Entered: 8/16/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to [233] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Plaintiff's Recovery of Future Or Prospective Damages filed by SACRAMENTO MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT. Reply due by 8/30/2004. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Macdonald, Timothy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 8/3/2004, Entered: 8/3/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying [236] Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (cd1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 8/3/2004, Entered: 8/3/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying [155] Motion for Status Conference, denying [212] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (cd1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 8/3/2004, Entered: 8/3/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER denying [23] Motion for Leave to File, denying [70] Motion for Clarification, denying [75] Motion to Compel, denying [76] Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (cd1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 8/3/2004, Entered: 8/3/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying [22] Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (cd1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 8/3/2004, Entered: 8/3/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER denying [13] Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (cd1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 241 Filed: 7/30/2004, Entered: 8/3/2004 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PUBLISHED MEMORANDUM and ORDER denying [91] Motion to Dismiss, granting [98] Motion to Dismiss; and granting plaintiff 30 days to amend the June 19, 1998 complaint. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (cd1) Modified on 8/4/2004 to correct filed date, enter language re: amending complaint; and to indicate that this is a published order. (dls).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 7/30/2004, Entered: 8/4/2004 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's amended complaint due by 8/30/2004. (dls)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 240 Filed: 7/28/2004, Entered: 7/30/2004 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER: Except as provided in paragraph 4 below, all Fact Discovery shall conclude on or before 9/27/2004. All Expert Discovery will be completed on or before 12/20/2004. Any Motion(s) regarding supplemental fact or expert discovery will be filed on or before 8/9/2004. Responses, if any, will be filed on or before 8/16/2004 and Replies, if any, will be filed on or before 8/23/2004. Pltf will file its Memorandum of Contentions of Law and Fact on or before 1/24/2005. Dft will file its responsive Memorandum on or before 2/17/2005. Each Memorandum will be accompanied by witness lists, exhibit lists, and any motions contemplated by Appendix A. Dft will file its responses to any motions filed by pltf with its Memorandum on or before 2/17/2005. Pltf will file its responses to any motions filed by dft on or before 3/7/2005. The Pretrial Conference will be held on 3/11/2005 10:00 AM in National Courts Building before Judge Susan G. Braden. Trial will be held beginning 3/21/2005 through 4/1/2005 from 10:00 AM in National Courts Building before Judge Susan G. Braden. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 7/20/2004, Entered: 7/20/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 8/16/2004. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 7/15/2004, Entered: 7/15/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan G. Braden: Status Conference held on 7/15/04. (cd1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 239 Filed: 7/8/2004, Entered: 7/8/2004, Terminated: 12/1/2006 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for an Order Regarding Subsequent Actions for Future Damages, Plaintiff's Request to Stay Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Plaintiff's Recovery of Future Damages, and Plaintiff's Request for Expedited Consideration by SACRAMENTO MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT. Response due by 7/26/2004 (Attachments: # (1))(Macdonald, Timothy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 238 Filed: 7/7/2004, Entered: 7/7/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re [236] First MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and For Clarification or Modification or March 23, 2004 Scheduling Order,until 90, filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Cochran, Todd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 237 Filed: 7/1/2004, Entered: 7/1/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to [236] First MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and For Clarification or Modification or March 23, 2004 Scheduling Order,until 90, filed by SACRAMENTO MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT. Reply due by 7/15/2004. (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3) # (4) # (5))(Macdonald, Timothy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 236 Filed: 6/14/2004, Entered: 6/14/2004, Terminated: 8/3/2004 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            First MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and For Clarification or Modification or March 23, 2004 Scheduling Order,until 90, by USA. Response due by 7/1/2004 (Shultis, Russell)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 235 Filed: 6/7/2004, Entered: 6/14/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              APPENDIX to [234] Dft's Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact in Support of its Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Pltf's Recovery of Future or Prospective Damages, by USA. [FILED UNDER SEAL] Service: 6/7/2004 by hand.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 234 Filed: 6/7/2004, Entered: 6/7/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact In Support Of Its Motion For Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Plaintiff's Recovery of Future Or Prospective Damages by USA. (Gardner, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 233 Filed: 6/7/2004, Entered: 6/7/2004, Terminated: 12/1/2006 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Plaintiff's Recovery of Future Or Prospective Damages by USA. Response due by 7/8/2004 (Gardner, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 6/7/2004, Entered: 6/7/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ********** This is a TEST entry. This entry will be removed from the docket sheet as soon as the test is complete. Please disregard this entry. ********** (ajkb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 232 Filed: 6/3/2004, Entered: 6/3/2004, Terminated: 6/3/2004 Motion to Substitute Attorney (Consented)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Consented MOTION to Substitute Attorney Howard N. Cayne in place of Melvin Garbow by SACRAMENTO MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT. (Cayne, Howard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 6/3/2004, Entered: 6/3/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ***Attorney Howard Neil Cayne for SACRAMENTO MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT added. Attorney Melvin Carl Garbow terminated. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 231 Filed: 5/28/2004, Entered: 5/28/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re [229] MOTION for Discovery Motion Regarding The Treatment Of Depositions From Other Spent Nuclear Fuel Cases filed by SACRAMENTO MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT. (Macdonald, Timothy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 5/20/2004, Entered: 5/20/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Set Deadlines/Hearings: Reply due by 6/1/2004. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 230 Filed: 5/19/2004, Entered: 5/19/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to [229] MOTION for Discovery Motion Regarding The Treatment Of Depositions From Other Spent Nuclear Fuel Cases filed by USA. Reply due by 6/2/2004. (Gardner, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 229 Filed: 5/6/2004, Entered: 5/6/2004, Terminated: 12/1/2006 Motion for Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Discovery Motion Regarding The Treatment Of Depositions From Other Spent Nuclear Fuel Cases by SACRAMENTO MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT. Response due by 5/24/2004 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 4/26/2004 Order from J. Lettow# (2) Exhibit 4/23/04 Letter)(Macdonald, Timothy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 228 Filed: 5/4/2004, Entered: 5/4/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by SACRAMENTO MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT Plaintiff's Withdrawal of Counsel of Record and Notice of Change of Counsel of Record (Macdonald, Timothy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 5/4/2004, Entered: 5/4/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt: Status Conference held on 4/30/04. (cd1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 227 Filed: 4/23/2004, Entered: 4/23/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to Notice of Pre-Discovery Conference to be Convened on April 30, 2004 filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix # (2) Appendix # (3))(Shultis, Russell)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 226 Filed: 4/16/2004, Entered: 4/16/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 225 Filed: 4/14/2004, Entered: 4/19/2004 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER: The new SNF pltfs should submit, on or before 4/23/2004, a report or reports specifying their discovery plans and objectives. On or before 4/23/2004, the Government should submit a report presenting its views on the same matters. The pre-discovery conference will be held on Firday, 4/30/2004 02:00 PM in Courtroom 4 on the National Courts Building before Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 224 Filed: 3/23/2004, Entered: 3/25/2004 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER: All Fact Discovery, including all depositions, shall conclude on or before 8/2/2004. All Expert Discovery, including the exchange of expert reports and the completion of expert depositions, will be completed on or before 10/25/2004. Any Motion(s) regarding supplemental fact or expert discovery will be filed on or before 6/14/2004. Responses, if any, will be filed on or before 6/21/2004 and Replies, if any, will be filed on or before 6/28/2004. Pltf will file its Memorandum of Contentions of Law and Fact on or before 11/29/2004. Dft will file its responsive Memorandum on or before 12/23/2004. Each Memorandum will be accompanied by witness lists, exhibit lists, and any motions contemplated by Appendix A. Dft will file its response to any motions filed by Pltf with its Memorandum on or before 11/29/2004. Pltf will file its response to any motions filed by dft on or before 12/30/2004. The Pretrial Conference will be held on 1/14/2005 10:00 AM in National Courts Building before Judge Susan G. Braden. Trial will be held beginning 1/24/2005 through 2/4/2005 10:00 AM in National Courts Building before Judge Susan G. Braden. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 223 Filed: 3/15/2004, Entered: 3/16/2004 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to [222] Dft's Response to Pltf's Status Report and Proposed Discovery Schedule, filed by SACRAMENTO MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 3/10/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 222 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/10/2004 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to [220] Status Report and Proposed Discovery Schedule filed by USA. Service: 3/8/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 221 Filed: 2/27/2004, Entered: 3/2/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Firm Registration as an LLP and Name Change by SACRAMENTO MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT. Service: 2/26/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 2/25/2004, Entered: 2/25/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan G. Braden: Status Conference held on 2/25/04. (cd1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 220 Filed: 2/20/2004, Entered: 2/27/2004 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT and Proposed Discovery Schedule by SACRAMENTO MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT. Service: 2/19/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 2/17/2004, Entered: 2/17/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan G. Braden: Telephone hearing held on 12/15/03. (cd1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 1/30/2004, Entered: 1/30/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER: The Court hereby DENIES [209] Dft's Second Motion to Renew its Motion toConsolidate as well as its previous motions relating to consolidation. The Court further LIFTS THE STAY of the remainder of the cases to which the Order of 4/16/2003, applied. The Clerk of the Court is directed to docket this Order in this case with an entry noting the same on the dockets of the remaining SNFcases captioned in Dft's instant motion, with a courtesy copy to all SNF parties and presiding SNF judges of the Court. [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT LOCATED IN CASE NO. 98-126C] Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 219 Filed: 12/4/2003, Entered: 12/10/2003 Order on Motion for HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [216] Pltf's Motion for a Status Conference. Accordingly, the court will conduct a Telephonic Status Conference in this matter on 12/15/2003 02:00 PM before Judge Susan G. Braden. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 218 Filed: 12/2/2003, Entered: 12/5/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Counsel for Dft's Change of Facsimile Number by USA. Service: 12/1/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 217 Filed: 12/1/2003, Entered: 12/4/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to [216] Pltf's RENEWED MOTION for Status Conference filed by USA. Reply due by 12/15/2003. Service: 12/1/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 216 Filed: 11/17/2003, Entered: 11/19/2003, Terminated: 12/4/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RENEWED MOTION for a Status Conference by SACRAMENTO MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT.Service: 11/13/03. Response due by 12/1/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 215 Filed: 9/3/2003, Entered: 9/8/2003 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Pltfs' Responses to [209] Dft's Second MOTION to the Chief Judge to Renew Consideration of Dft's Motion to Consolidate filed by USA. Service: 9/3/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 214 Filed: 8/26/2003, Entered: 8/27/2003 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Dft's Response to [204] Pltf's MOTION to Lift the Stay, and MOTION for a Status Conference filed by SACRAMENTO MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT, Filed by Leave of the Judge. Service: 8/13/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 213 Filed: 8/21/2003, Entered: 8/22/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      OPPOSITOIN to [209] Dft's Second MOTION to Renew Its Motion to Consolidate filed by SACRAMENTO MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT. Reply due by 9/5/2003. Service: 8/21/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 212 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/19/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to [209] Dft's Second MOTION to Renew Its Motion to Consolidate, until 8/22/03, by SACRAMENTO MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT.Service: 8/15/03. Response due by 9/2/2003.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 211 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/15/2003 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Reassignment to Judge Susan Braden. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 210 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/15/2003 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Pursuant to Rule 40.1(c) of the RCFC, which permits the Chief Judge to reassign any case if necessary for the efficient administration of justice, the Clerk of the Court is directed to reassign the above captioned case to Judge Susan Braden. Judge Emily C. Hewitt no longer assigned to case. The Clerk is also directed to notify the parties that the case will not be included in the September 8, 2003 expansion of ECF. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 8/8/2003, Entered: 8/8/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Set/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 8/15/2003 (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 8/5/2003, Entered: 8/7/2003 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Dft's Motion to the Chief Judge for Leave to Correct Certificate of Service and to Waive Requirements of RCFC 5.3 Regarding "Dft's Second Motion [to the Chief Judge] to Renew its Motion to Consolidate." (Original Motion located in Case No. 98-126C) (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 209 Filed: 7/30/2003, Entered: 7/31/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SECOND MOTION to Renew Its Motion to Consolidate by USA. [COPY] (Original Document in Case No. 98-126C)Service: 7/29/03 by hand. Response due by 8/12/2003.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 208 Filed: 7/30/2003, Entered: 7/31/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to [204] Pltf's MOTION to Lift Stay and MOTION for Status Conference filed by USA. Reply due by 8/13/2003. Service: 7/30/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 207 Filed: 7/29/2003, Entered: 7/30/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [206] Dft's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response as to [204] Pltf's MOTION to Lift Stay and MOTION for Status Conference, until 7/30/03. Response due by 7/30/2003. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 206 Filed: 7/28/2003, Entered: 7/29/2003, Terminated: 7/29/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to [204] Pltf's MOTION to Lift Stay and MOTION for Status Conference, until 7/30/03, by UNITED STATES.Service: 7/28/03. Response due by 8/14/2003.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 204 Filed: 7/11/2003, Entered: 7/14/2003 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Lift the Stay Set by Chief Judge's April 16, 2003 Order, and MOTION for Schedule of a Status Conference by SACRAMENTO MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT.Service: 7/11/03. Response due by 7/28/2003. Response due by 7/28/2003.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 205 Filed: 4/18/2003, Entered: 7/21/2003 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fa
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to [167] PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact filed by UNITED STATES. Service: 4/11/03 by hand.(dls, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 202 Filed: 4/18/2003, Entered: 4/21/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to Motion re [165] Cross Motion filed by The United States together with separate appendix. Reply due by 5/2/2003. Service: 4/11/03 by hand.(hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 201 Filed: 4/18/2003, Entered: 4/21/2003 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [198] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 200 Filed: 4/17/2003, Entered: 4/18/2003 Notice of ReassignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Reassignment to Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (dls, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 199 Filed: 4/17/2003, Entered: 4/18/2003 Order Reassigning CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Emily C. Hewitt for all further proceedings. Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt no longer assigned to case Signed by Judge Diane G. Sypolt. (dls, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 203 Filed: 4/16/2003, Entered: 4/25/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 198 Filed: 4/11/2003, Entered: 4/17/2003, Terminated: 4/18/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit of Reply Brief by 30 pages by The United States.Service by hand: 4/11/03. Response due by 4/25/2003. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 197 Filed: 4/11/2003, Entered: 4/17/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Strike portions of [162] Response to Motion by The United States.Service by hand: 4/11/03. Response due by 4/25/2003. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 196 Filed: 4/2/2003, Entered: 4/8/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER, re: further proceedings. Signed by Judge Diane G. Sypolt. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 195 Filed: 3/20/2003, Entered: 3/25/2003 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fa
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by The United States.Service: 3/18/03. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 194 Filed: 3/20/2003, Entered: 3/25/2003 Description not available
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion, re [92] Motion for Summary Judgment filed by The United States. Service: 3/18/03. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 193 Filed: 3/20/2003, Entered: 3/25/2003 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [191] Motion for Leave to exceed the page limitation by six pages. Signed by Judge Diane G. Sypolt. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 192 Filed: 3/18/2003, Entered: 3/21/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 191 Filed: 3/18/2003, Entered: 3/20/2003, Terminated: 3/20/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit of reply to the Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, re: Plaintiff's Greater Than Class C Radioactive Waste Arguments, by 16 pages, by The United States. Service: 3/18/03. Response due 4/4/2003. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 190 Filed: 3/13/2003, Entered: 3/14/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [189-1] motion to Extend Time to file reply to the motion for partial summary judgment Reply to Response to Motion due 3/18/03 for [92-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 189 Filed: 3/11/2003, Entered: 3/12/2003, Terminated: 3/13/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service: 3/11/03) to Extend Time to file reply to the motion for partial summary judgment until 3/18/03. Response due: 3/28/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 188 Filed: 3/7/2003, Entered: 3/10/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER re: See order [612-1] dated 3/7/03, in case 98-126C (signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 187 Filed: 2/25/2003, Entered: 3/4/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 186 Filed: 2/24/2003, Entered: 3/3/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 185 Filed: 2/5/2003, Entered: 2/13/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 184 Filed: 2/5/2003, Entered: 2/13/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [180-1] motion to Extend Time to file reply to the motion for summary judgment by 1/31/03 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 183 Filed: 1/31/2003, Entered: 2/13/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY by USA to response to [91-1] motion to Dismiss Counts IV and V of the complaint. Service: 1/31/03 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 182 Filed: 1/31/2003, Entered: 2/12/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 181 Filed: 1/31/2003, Entered: 2/12/2003 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE (NOTICE OF FILING) by SACRAMENTO MUNICIPAL pursuant to [176-2] order. Service: 1/30/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 180 Filed: 1/30/2003, Entered: 2/10/2003, Terminated: 2/5/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 1/30/03) to Extend Time to file reply to the motion for summary judgment until 1/31/03. Response due: 2/18/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 179 Filed: 1/29/2003, Entered: 2/7/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 178 Filed: 1/28/2003, Entered: 2/4/2003 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                [REVISED] NOTICE of filing "Appendix to plaintiff's cross motion for partial summary judgment on the acceptance rate (in two volumes)" by SACRAMENTO MUNICIPAL, filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 1/28/03 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 177 Filed: 1/28/2003, Entered: 2/4/2003 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  [REVISED] NOTICE of filing "Appendix to plaintiff's opposition to defendant's motion for partial summary judgment regarding plaintiff's greater than class c radioactive waste arguments" by SACRAMENTO MUNICIPAL, filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 1/28/03. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 176 Filed: 1/28/2003, Entered: 2/4/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER directing the plaintiff's attorney to file a notice of filing by deadline of 2/5/03 and that the appendices are to be filed by leave of the court ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 175 Filed: 1/23/2003, Entered: 1/31/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER - see 98-126 C for order ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 174 Filed: 1/21/2003, Entered: 1/27/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY by USA to response to [169-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to cross-motion and reply to the motion for summary judgment. Service: 1/21/03 (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 173 Filed: 1/21/2003, Entered: 1/27/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [171-1] motion for Clarification Plaintiff's revised appendices due 1/23/03 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 172 Filed: 1/15/2003, Entered: 1/24/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by SACRAMENTO MUNICIPAL (Service: 1/15/03) to [169-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to cross-motion and reply to the motion for summary judgment. Reply due: 1/30/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 171 Filed: 1/14/2003, Entered: 1/21/2003, Terminated: 1/21/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by SACRAMENTO MUNICIPAL (Service: 1/14/03) for Clarification regarding revised appendices. Response due: 1/31/03 (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 170 Filed: 1/9/2003, Entered: 1/15/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 169 Filed: 1/9/2003, Entered: 1/13/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 1/9/03) to Extend Time to respond to cross-motion and reply to the motion for summary judgment until ? Response due: 1/27/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 167 Filed: 1/7/2003, Entered: 1/9/2003 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by SACRAMENTO MUNICIPAL. Service by hand: 12/16/02 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 166 Filed: 1/7/2003, Entered: 1/9/2003 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fa
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Response by SACRAMENTO MUNICIPAL to [96-1] proposed findings by USA. Service by hand: 12/16/02 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 165 Filed: 1/7/2003, Entered: 1/9/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CROSS MOTION by SACRAMENTO MUNICIPAL (Service by hand: 12/16/02) and RESPONSE to [97-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment regarding the rate of spent nuclear fuel acceptance by USA Response due: 1/13/03. (HW) Modified on 01/09/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 164 Filed: 1/7/2003, Entered: 1/9/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER directing the clerk of the court to return appendices to plaintiff, who shall re-file them to include only pertinent portions, etc., ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 1/7/2003, Entered: 1/9/2003 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Deadline updated; Response to [165-1] cross motion reset to 1/13/03 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 168 Filed: 1/6/2003, Entered: 1/10/2003 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [163-1] motion to Extend Time to file reply to the motion for summary judgment Reply to Response to Motion due 1/10/03 for [92-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment and [91-1] motion to Dismiss Counts IV and V of the complaint (signed by Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 163 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/8/2003, Terminated: 1/6/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service: 12/31/02) to Extend Time to file reply to the motion for summary judgment until 1/10/03. Response due: 1/21/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 162 Filed: 12/16/2002, Entered: 12/18/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE, with one volume of appendix, by SACRAMENTO MUNICIPAL (Service by hand: 12/16/02) to [92-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment. Reply due: 12/30/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 161 Filed: 12/16/2002, Entered: 12/18/2002 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fa
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Response by SACRAMENTO MUNICIPAL to [93-1] proposed findings by USA. Service: 12/16/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 160 Filed: 12/16/2002, Entered: 12/18/2002 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by SACRAMENTO MUNICIPAL. Service: 12/16/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 159 Filed: 12/16/2002, Entered: 12/18/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by SACRAMENTO MUNICIPAL (Service: 12/16/02) to [98-1] motion to Dismiss Count III of Plaintiff's complaint, [91-1] motion to Dismiss Counts IV and V of the complaint. Reply due: 1/10/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 158 Filed: 12/16/2002, Entered: 12/18/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by SACRAMENTO MUNICIPAL (Service: 12/16/02) For leave to exceed the page limitation for cross-motion. Response due: 1/2/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 157 Filed: 11/14/2002, Entered: 11/15/2002 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of reassignment to Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt . Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 156 Filed: 11/14/2002, Entered: 11/15/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER directing the Clerk, pursuant to RCFC 40.1(b) for the efficient administration of justice or to promote docket efficiency, to transfer this case to Judge Sypolt. ( signed by Sr. Judge Robert J. Yock ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 155 Filed: 11/12/2002, Entered: 11/14/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by SACRAMENTO MUNICIPAL (Service: 11/12/02) to [153-1] motion requesting the court to enter a deadline no later than 11/25/02 for Plaintiff to file responses to Defendant's motions for summary judgment. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 155 Filed: 11/12/2002, Entered: 11/14/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by SACRAMENTO MUNICIPAL (Service: 11/12/02) for a status conference . Response due: 11/29/02. (FILED WITH RESPONSE TO THE MOTION REQUESTING AN ORDER SETTING 11/25/02, AT THE DEADLINE FOR PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSES). (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 154 Filed: 11/8/2002, Entered: 11/14/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting in part, denying in part [153-1] motion requesting the court to enter a deadline no later than 11/25/02 for Plaintiff to file responses to Defendant's motions for summary judgment. Response to [98-1] motion to Dismiss Count III of Plaintiff's complaint [97-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment regarding the rate of spent nuclear fuel acceptance, [92-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment and [91-1] motion to Dismiss Counts IV and V of complaint due 12/16/02 , and Reply to Response to Motion due 1/10/03 for [98-1] motion to Dismiss Count III of Plaintiff's complaint, [97-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment regarding the rate of spent nuclear fuel acceptance, [92-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment, [91-1] motion to Dismiss Counts IV and V of the complaint (signed by Sr. Judge Robert J. Yock). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 153 Filed: 10/25/2002, Entered: 10/29/2002, Terminated: 11/8/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 10/25/02 ) requesting the court to enter a deadline no later than 11/25/02 for Plaintiff to file responses to Defendant's motions for summary judgment. Response due: 11/12/02 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 152 Filed: 10/16/2002, Entered: 10/18/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow for Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 151 Filed: 10/9/2002, Entered: 10/11/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER see 98-126C for Order. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 150 Filed: 9/10/2002, Entered: 9/16/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER, re: Order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 149 Filed: 9/5/2002, Entered: 9/9/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 148 Filed: 8/22/2002, Entered: 8/27/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 147 Filed: 8/20/2002, Entered: 8/22/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 146 Filed: 8/16/2002, Entered: 8/21/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 145 Filed: 8/5/2002, Entered: 8/7/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 144 Filed: 7/30/2002, Entered: 8/5/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 143 Filed: 7/29/2002, Entered: 8/1/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER re: see order [467-1] dated 7/29/02, in case No. 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 142 Filed: 7/23/2002, Entered: 7/26/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER, re: See order in 98-26 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 141 Filed: 7/16/2002, Entered: 7/18/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 140 Filed: 7/15/2002, Entered: 7/17/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 139 Filed: 7/10/2002, Entered: 7/12/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 138 Filed: 7/9/2002, Entered: 7/11/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER - see 98-126C for Order. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 137 Filed: 7/3/2002, Entered: 7/3/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 136 Filed: 7/2/2002, Entered: 7/3/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER-see 98-126C for Order ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 135 Filed: 6/28/2002, Entered: 7/1/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER-see 98-126C for Order ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 134 Filed: 6/18/2002, Entered: 6/19/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C.(signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (VO)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 133 Filed: 6/17/2002, Entered: 6/18/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER, Re: see order in 98-126 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt) Copy to parties. (VO)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 132 Filed: 6/6/2002, Entered: 6/11/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER, re order in 98-126, filed 6/6/02. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 131 Filed: 6/3/2002, Entered: 6/4/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, re: see order in 98-126, filed 6/03/02. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 130 Filed: 5/28/2002, Entered: 5/29/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 129 Filed: 5/20/2002, Entered: 5/21/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 128 Filed: 5/9/2002, Entered: 5/10/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER re: See [395-1] order in case No. 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 127 Filed: 5/7/2002, Entered: 5/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 126 Filed: 5/7/2002, Entered: 5/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 125 Filed: 5/6/2002, Entered: 5/7/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 124 Filed: 5/3/2002, Entered: 5/3/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir for Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 123 Filed: 4/26/2002, Entered: 4/29/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, re: see order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 122 Filed: 4/23/2002, Entered: 4/24/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 121 Filed: 4/18/2002, Entered: 4/18/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 120 Filed: 4/11/2002, Entered: 4/11/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER re: see order [344-2] dated 4/11/02 in Case No. 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 119 Filed: 3/25/2002, Entered: 3/26/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER, re: see order in 98-126 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 118 Filed: 3/19/2002, Entered: 3/20/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER, re: See order filed in 98-126 (signed by Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir for Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt) Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 117 Filed: 3/5/2002, Entered: 3/6/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER denying Motion to preclude or, in the alternative, defer depositions pursuant to Rule 30(b)(6) (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 116 Filed: 2/28/2002, Entered: 3/1/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting Motion to Extend Time to respond to interrogatories until 3/8/02 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 115 Filed: 2/20/2002, Entered: 2/21/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, re: SEE CASE NO. 98-126 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 114 Filed: 2/13/2002, Entered: 2/14/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, re: see order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 113 Filed: 2/1/2002, Entered: 2/4/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying motion to reconsder filed 1/2/202 and granting the motion to revise dates in 9/26/01 order filed 1/24/02 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 112 Filed: 2/1/2002, Entered: 2/4/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER. See order in 98-126C filed 2/1/02. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 111 Filed: 1/29/2002, Entered: 1/29/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [107-1] motion to defer briefing on the Government Motions (signed by Sr. Judge Robert J. Yock). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 110 Filed: 1/29/2002, Entered: 1/29/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER setting Status Conference for 2:00 p.m. on 2/12/02 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 109 Filed: 1/25/2002, Entered: 1/28/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by USA (Service: 1/24/02) to [107-1] motion to defer briefing on the Government Motions. Reply due: 2/7/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 108 Filed: 1/11/2002, Entered: 1/14/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER see order in 98-126C filed 1/11/02. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 107 Filed: 1/11/2002, Entered: 1/14/2002, Terminated: 1/29/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by SACRAMENTO MUNICIPAL (Service: 1/11/02) to defer briefing on the Government Motions . Response due: 1/28/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 106 Filed: 1/9/2002, Entered: 1/10/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [104-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to motion to dismiss Count III of the complaint Response to [98-1] motion to Dismiss Count III of Plaintiff's complaint reset to 2/13/02 (signed by Sr. Judge Robert J. Yock). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 104 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: 1/8/2002, Terminated: 1/9/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by SACRAMENTO MUNICIPAL (Service: 1/7/02) to Extend Time to respond to motion to dismiss Count III of the complaint (to February 13, 2002). (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 105 Filed: 1/3/2002, Entered: 1/10/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [99-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to Defendant's motions Response to [97-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment regarding the rate of spent nuclear fuel acceptance, [92-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment, and [91-1] motion to Dismiss Counts IV and V of the complaint reset to 1/28/02 ( by Sr. Judge Robert J. Yock ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 103 Filed: 1/3/2002, Entered: 1/7/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER see order in 98-126C filed 01/03/02 ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 102 Filed: 1/3/2002, Entered: 1/7/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [100-1] motion for Leave to file amended certificate of service (signed by Sr. Judge Robert J. Yock). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 101 Filed: 1/2/2002, Entered: 1/3/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by USA (Service: 1/2/02) to [99-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to Defendant's motions. Reply due: 1/11/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 100 Filed: 1/2/2002, Entered: 1/3/2002, Terminated: 1/3/2002 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by SACRAMENTO MUNICIPAL (Service: 12/21/01) for Leave to file amended certificate of service . Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 1/7/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 99 Filed: 12/14/2001, Entered: 12/17/2001, Terminated: 1/3/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by SACRAMENTO MUNICIPAL (Service: 12/14/01) to Extend Time to respond to Defendant's motions until 1/28/02. Response due: 1/2/02. (LTD) Modified on 01/10/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 98 Filed: 12/13/2001, Entered: 12/17/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 12/13/01) to Dismiss Count III of Plaintiff's complaint . Response due: 1/14/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 97 Filed: 12/10/2001, Entered: 12/11/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service by hand: 11/28/01) for Partial Summary Judgment regarding the rate of spent nuclear fuel acceptance , filed with a (1) one volume appendix in support. Response due: 12/26/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 96 Filed: 12/10/2001, Entered: 12/11/2001 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA. Service by hand: 11/28/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 95 Filed: 12/10/2001, Entered: 12/11/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [94-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation (signed by Sr. Judge Robert J. Yock). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 94 Filed: 11/29/2001, Entered: 11/30/2001, Terminated: 12/10/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service by hand: 11/28/01) For leave to exceed the page limitation . Response due: 12/12/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 93 Filed: 11/28/2001, Entered: 11/30/2001 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA. Service by hand: 11/27/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 92 Filed: 11/28/2001, Entered: 11/30/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION, with one volume of Appendix, by USA (Service by hand: 11/27/01) for partial Summary Judgment . Response due: 12/26/01. (LTD) Modified on 11/30/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 91 Filed: 11/27/2001, Entered: 11/29/2001, Terminated: 7/30/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service by hand: 11/27/01) to Dismiss Counts IV and V of the complaint . Response due: 12/11/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 90 Filed: 11/20/2001, Entered: 11/21/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER see order in 98-126C filed 11/20/01 ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 89 Filed: 11/16/2001, Entered: 11/19/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER see order in 98-126C filed 11/16/01. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 88 Filed: 11/14/2001, Entered: 11/16/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER see order in 98-126C filed 11/14/01. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 87 Filed: 11/14/2001, Entered: 11/16/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER see order in 98-126C filed 11/14/01. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 86 Filed: 11/8/2001, Entered: 11/9/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER. See 98-126C. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 85 Filed: 11/8/2001, Entered: 11/9/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER. See 98-126C. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 84 Filed: 11/7/2001, Entered: 11/8/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER. See 98-126 C ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 83 Filed: 11/6/2001, Entered: 11/7/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting motion to enlarge time to respond to motion to compel production of documents to 11/06/01 ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 82 Filed: 11/6/2001, Entered: 11/7/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER re: Public Service Electric and Gas motion to extend filed on 11/2/01, within which to respond to the defendant's motion to compel is GRANTED (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein) Copy to parties. (see motion filed in 98-126C) (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 81 Filed: 11/6/2001, Entered: 11/7/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting motion to enlarge time to complete production of documents to 11/19/01 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 80 Filed: 11/1/2001, Entered: 11/5/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER denying [67-1] motion for Clarification of the Court's 9/26/01 order. Individual Judges retain the right to decide dispositive motions. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 79 Filed: 10/30/2001, Entered: 11/1/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER re: proposed stipulated order, etc. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 78 Filed: 10/29/2001, Entered: 10/31/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [69-1] motion for Leave to file copies of the Motion to Transfer Responsibility, etc. and granting Plaintiff's Motion for leave to file copies of response to the transfer motion (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 77 Filed: 10/19/2001, Entered: 10/23/2001 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of supplemental certificate of service by USA. Service: 10/19/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 76 Filed: 10/19/2001, Entered: 10/23/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service: 10/19/01) to Compel . Response due: 11/5/01. (Filed with response to third party objections). (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 76 Filed: 10/19/2001, Entered: 10/23/2001 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by USA to third party objections. Service: 10/19/01. (Filed with Motion to Compel). (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 74 Filed: 10/19/2001, Entered: 10/22/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER re: All filings shall bear the name of the discovery Judge, all matters to be brought to the attention of the Court shall be filed with the discovery Judge only, the Clerk of the Court is directed not to accept for filing any motion by a party in one of the captioned cases for leave to file material with a Judge in an individual case ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 75 Filed: 10/18/2001, Entered: 10/23/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service: 10/16/01) to Compel . Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 11/2/01. (Filed with response to third party objections). (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 75 Filed: 10/18/2001, Entered: 10/23/2001 ResponseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by USA to third party objections. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 10/16/01. (Filed with Motion to Compel). (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 73 Filed: 10/18/2001, Entered: 10/19/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER directing the Clerk's Office to file Defendant's response and Defendant's corrected certificate of service due 10/25/01 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 72 Filed: 10/17/2001, Entered: 10/18/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER re: Defendant's motion to extend time filed on 10/15/01, within which to file the proposed stipulated order concerning the scheduling and conduct of depositions in the coordinated discovery proceeding, is GRANTED, see motion in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 71 Filed: 10/12/2001, Entered: 10/16/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [68-1] motion for Leave to file papers that the utility Plaintiffs have filed with the Discovery Judge (signed by Sr. Judge Robert J. Yock). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 70 Filed: 10/12/2001, Entered: 10/16/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by SACRAMENTO MUNICIPAL (Service: 10/9/01) for clarification of the Court's 9/26/01 order . Response due: 10/26/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 69 Filed: 10/11/2001, Entered: 10/15/2001, Terminated: 10/29/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 10/10/01) for Leave to file copies of the Motion to Transfer Responsibility, etc. . Response due: 10/29/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 68 Filed: 10/10/2001, Entered: 10/11/2001, Terminated: 10/12/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by SACRAMENTO MUNICIPAL (Service by hand: 10/9/01) for Leave to file papers that the utility Plaintiffs have filed with the Discovery Judge . Response due: 10/23/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 67 Filed: 10/9/2001, Entered: 10/10/2001, Terminated: 11/1/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by SACRAMENTO MUNICIPAL (Service by hand: 10/9/01) for Clarification of the Court's 9/26/01 order . Response due: 10/23/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 66 Filed: 10/3/2001, Entered: 10/4/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [65-1] motion to Extend Time to submit a plan for production of e-mail messages Plan is to be filed by 10/22/01 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 65 Filed: 10/3/2001, Entered: 10/4/2001, Terminated: 10/3/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service: 10/1/01) to Extend Time to submit a plan for production of e-mail messages until 10/22/01. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 64 Filed: 9/26/2001, Entered: 9/26/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER re: The Joint Motion for an Order for Consolidated Discovery filed on 7/10/01, is granted, with the exception of document production, the parties are granted an enlargement of time until 10/1/01, to submit a plan addressing the production of e-mail messages (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 63 Filed: 9/13/2001, Entered: 9/13/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER setting Status Conference for 4:00 p.m. on 9/20/01 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 62 Filed: 8/24/2001, Entered: 8/27/2001 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                (REPLY) RESPONSE by SACRAMENTO MUNICIPAL to [60-1] response by USA. Service: 8/24/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 61 Filed: 8/22/2001, Entered: 8/22/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting motion for protective order in the form provided by Exhibit A of the parties 08/10/01 motion (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). See case number 98-126 C for motion. Protective order in 98-458 C is also granted, subject to reconsideration by assigned judge. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 60 Filed: 8/17/2001, Entered: 8/20/2001 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by USA to [58-3] order. Service: 8/17/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 8/17/2001, Entered: 8/20/2001 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Deadline updated; Plaintiff's response to defendant's response to the Court's order dated 8/1/01 due by 8/31/01 . (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 59 Filed: 8/15/2001, Entered: 8/16/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER setting Status Conference for 2:00 p.m. on 9/11/01 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein, Discovery Judge) Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 58 Filed: 8/1/2001, Entered: 8/2/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PROTECTIVE ORDER (signed by Sr. Judge Robert J. Yock). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 58 Filed: 8/1/2001, Entered: 8/2/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [56-1] motion for Leave to file proposed liability order Show cause as to why a liability order should not be filed by 8/17/01 for USA, and if Defendant shall show cause, the Plaintiff shall file any response by 8/31/01 , and Defendant's reply Brief to Plaintiff's response is due by 9/7/01 (signed by Sr. Judge Robert J. Yock). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 57 Filed: 8/1/2001, Entered: 8/2/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATED ORDER governing review of the Department of Energy's Electronic "Record Information System" database (signed by Sr. Judge Robert J. Yock). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 57 Filed: 8/1/2001, Entered: 8/2/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER lifting any stays entered in this case and designating Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein to preside over the discovery phase of this proceeding (signed by Sr. Judge Robert J. Yock). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 56 Filed: 8/1/2001, Entered: 8/2/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [55-1] motion for Protective Order, granting [55-1] motion for Leave to file a copy of the parties "Joint Motion for an order coordinating discovery" (signed by Sr. Judge Robert J. Yock). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 56 Filed: 7/18/2001, Entered: 7/18/2001, Terminated: 8/1/2001 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by SACRAMENTO MUNICIPAL (Service: 7/18/01) for Leave to file proposed liability order . Response due: 8/6/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 55 Filed: 7/11/2001, Entered: 8/2/2001, Terminated: 8/1/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA for Leave to file a copy of the parties "Joint Motion for an order coordinating discovery" . (LTD) Modified on 08/02/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 55 Filed: 7/11/2001, Entered: 7/12/2001, Terminated: 8/1/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 7/11/01) for Protective Order and stipulated order governing review of the Department of Energy's electronic "record information system" database . Response due: 7/30/01. (LTD) Modified on 08/02/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 54 Filed: 7/5/2001, Entered: 7/6/2001 RemarkCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Copy of Yankee Atomic's Motion for Leave to file documents relevant to the telephone conference with Judge Wiese. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 53 Filed: 5/31/2001, Entered: 6/1/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER resetting Status Conference for 2:30 p.m. on 6/14/01 (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 52 Filed: 5/29/2001, Entered: 5/30/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER scheduling Status Conference for 10:30 a.m., 6/14/01 ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 51 Filed: 5/22/2001, Entered: 5/25/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER: On 1/8/2001, Dft filed a [39-1] Motion to the Chief Judge to reassign to a single Judge cases involving alleged breaches of contract published at 10 CFR part 961. The Chief Judge hereby designates Judge Wiese as the managing judge in the above cited cases for the purpose of meeting with the parties to consider whether consolidation or other joint handling of discovery or other pre-trial matters is appropriate. Judge Wiese is requested to formulate a management plan, if one is appropriate, and is authorized to make appropriate rulings with respect to this purpose. (signed by Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir). Judge Wiese is managing judge. Copy to parties. (LTD) Modified on 3/17/2004 (jcp, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 50 Filed: 5/1/2001, Entered: 5/8/2001 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of change of address by Melvin Carl Garbow. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 49 Filed: 2/22/2001, Entered: 2/23/2001 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY by USA to response to [47-1] motion for Leave to file a copy of "Defendant's reply to plaintiffs' response to motion to reassign" Service: 2/16/01 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 48 Filed: 2/22/2001, Entered: 2/23/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [47-1] motion for Leave to file a copy of "Defendant's reply to plaintiffs' response to motion to reassign" (signed by Sr. Judge Robert J. Yock) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 47 Filed: 2/20/2001, Entered: 2/21/2001, Terminated: 2/22/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 2/20/01) for Leave to file a copy of "Defendant's reply to plaintiffs' response to motion to reassign" Response due: 3/9/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 46 Filed: 2/9/2001, Entered: 2/13/2001 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Appendix to Yankee Utilities opposition to the USA's motion to reassign cases. Service: 1/29/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 45 Filed: 2/9/2001, Entered: 2/13/2001 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in opposition to the USA's motion to the Chief Judge to reassign to a single Judge the fourteen pending standard contract cases by SACRAMENTO MUNICIPAL re: see opposition in 98-126C. Service: 2/9/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 44 Filed: 2/9/2001, Entered: 2/13/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [43-1] motion for Leave to file copy of oppposition to motion for reassignment filed in No. 98-126C (signed by Sr. Judge Robert J. Yock). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 43 Filed: 1/31/2001, Entered: 2/1/2001, Terminated: 2/9/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by SACRAMENTO MUNICIPAL (Service : 1/30/01 ) for Leave to file copy of oppposition to motion for reassignment filed in No. 98-126C . Response due: 2/16/01 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 42 Filed: 1/29/2001, Entered: 1/30/2001 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  See 30-1 Response to motion filed January 29, 2001, in 98-483C Florida Power & Light Company. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 41 Filed: 1/23/2001, Entered: 1/24/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [40-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the USA's motion to the Chief Judge to reassign cases to a single Judge, granting [38-1] motion for Leave to file a copy of the motion to the Chief Judge to reassign to a single judge cases involving alleged breaches of the standard contract Response to [39-1] motion to the Chief Judge to reassign to a single Judge cases involving alleged breaches of contract, etc. reset to 1/29/01 (signed by Sr. Judge Robert J. Yock). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 40 Filed: 1/23/2001, Entered: 1/24/2001, Terminated: 1/23/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by SACRAMENTO MUNICIPAL (Service: 1/22/01) to Extend Time to respond to the USA's motion to the Chief Judge to reassign cases to a single Judge , (until January 29, 2001) . Response due: 2/9/01. (FE) Modified on 01/24/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 39 Filed: 1/23/2001, Entered: 1/24/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 1/23/01) to the Chief Judge to reassign to a single Judge cases involving alleged breaches of contract, etc. . Response due: 2/9/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 38 Filed: 1/9/2001, Entered: 1/10/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service: 1/9/01) for Leave to file a copy of the motion to the Chief Judge to reassign to a single judge cases involving alleged breaches of the standard contract Response due: 1/23/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 37 Filed: 1/4/2001, Entered: 1/4/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [33-1] motion to Stay set Notice of Compliance deadline to 1/9/01 for defendant to respond to Court's September 22, 2000 order . ( signed by Sr. Judge Robert J. Yock ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 36 Filed: 12/26/2000, Entered: 12/27/2000 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY by USA to response to [33-1] motion to Stay. Service: 12/26/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 35 Filed: 12/18/2000, Entered: 12/19/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER Reply to Response to Motion reset to 12/28/00 for [33-1] motion to Stay (signed by Sr. Judge Robert J. Yock ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 34 Filed: 11/27/2000, Entered: 11/29/2000 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by SACRAMENTO MUNICIPAL (Service: 11/27/00) to [33-1] motion to Stay. Reply due: 12/11/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 33 Filed: 11/20/2000, Entered: 11/21/2000, Terminated: 1/4/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 11/20/00) to Stay . Response due: 12/7/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 32 Filed: 11/1/2000, Entered: 11/3/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [29-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the Court's 9/22/00 Order reset Notice of Compliance deadline to 11/20/00 ( signed by Sr. Judge Robert J. Yock ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 31 Filed: 10/26/2000, Entered: 10/27/2000 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by SACRAMENTO MUNICIPAL (Service: 10/26/00 ) to [29-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the Court's 9/22/00 Order. Reply due: 11/9/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 30 Filed: 10/20/2000, Entered: 10/25/2000 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT by SACRAMENTO MUNICIPAL. Service: 10/20/00 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 29 Filed: 10/18/2000, Entered: 10/23/2000, Terminated: 11/1/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 10/18/00 ) to Extend Time to respond to the Court's 9/22/00 Order [until November 20, 2000]. Response due: 11/6/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 28 Filed: 9/22/2000, Entered: 9/25/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER re: The parties shall confer and advise the Court as to theie intentions as to how they intend to proceed in resolving this matter by 10/20/00 (signed by Sr. Judge Robert J. Yock). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 27 Filed: 9/13/2000, Entered: 9/14/2000 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Two Federal Circuit Decisions by SACRAMENTO MUNICIPAL. Service: 9/12/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 26 Filed: 7/20/1999, Entered: 7/22/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER continuing the suspension of proceedings and setting individual status reports deadline to 1/21/00 or 10 days after the Federal Circuit issues a decision re: the Defendant's interlocutory appeal in the Yankee cases. ( signed by Sr. Judge Robert J. Yock ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 25 Filed: 7/15/1999, Entered: 7/15/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by SACRAMENTO MUNICIPAL to [21-1] response by USA. Service: 7/15/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 24 Filed: 7/2/1999, Entered: 7/7/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER set Plaintiff's reply to Defendant's response to Plaintiff's notice of decision in Northern States deadline to 7/15/99. ( signed by Sr. Judge Robert J. Yock ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 23 Filed: 6/21/1999, Entered: 6/22/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 6/21/99) for Leave to file notice of subsequent activity . Response due: 7/8/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 22 Filed: 6/2/1999, Entered: 6/7/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service: 6/2/99) for Leave to file notice of subsequent activity . Response due: 6/21/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 21 Filed: 5/19/1999, Entered: 5/21/1999 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by USA to [16-1] notice by SACRAMENTO MUNICIPAL. Service: 5/19/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 20 Filed: 5/17/1999, Entered: 5/20/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [19-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to Plaintiff's motion to lift the stay. Reset Defendant's response to Plaintiff's motion to lift stay (Notice of Decision) deadline to 5/19/99. ( signed by Sr. Judge Robert J. Yock ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 19 Filed: 5/13/1999, Entered: 5/17/1999, Terminated: 5/17/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 5/12/99 ) to Extend Time to respond to Plaintiff's motion to lift the stay [until May 19, 1999]. Response due: 6/1/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 18 Filed: 5/13/1999, Entered: 5/17/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER allowing the filing of Defendant's motion for enlargement of time to resond to Plaintiff's motion to lift stay. ( signed by Sr. Judge Robert J. Yock ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 17 Filed: 4/26/1999, Entered: 4/29/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER set Defendant's response deadline to Plaintiff's motion to lift stay contained in the Plaintiff's notice of decision to 5/12/99. ( signed by Sr. Judge Robert J. Yock ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 16 Filed: 4/16/1999, Entered: 4/21/1999 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Decision in Northern States Power Co., No. 98-484 by SACRAMENTO MUNICIPAL. Service: 4/16/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 15 Filed: 12/22/1998, Entered: 12/23/1998 Status ReportCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT (Plaintiff's notice of significant development) by SACRAMENTO MUNICIPAL. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 12/18/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 14 Filed: 12/22/1998, Entered: 12/23/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER filing by leave of the Judge Plaintiff's notice of significant development as Plaintiff's status report. ( signed by Sr. Judge Robert J. Yock ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 13 Filed: 12/18/1998, Entered: 12/21/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 12/18/98 ) for Leave to respond to notice of decisions in Yankee Atomic, Connecticut, and maine Yankee , (response included). Response due: 1/5/99. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 12 Filed: 12/7/1998, Entered: 12/9/1998 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Decisions in Yankee Atomic (98-126), Connecticut Yankee (98-154) and Maine Yanke (98-474) by SACRAMENTO MUNICIPAL. Service: 12/7/98 (re-served by hand on 1/8/99 per amended certificate of service received on 1/8/99) (JT) Modified on 01/14/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 11 Filed: 9/24/1998, Entered: 9/28/1998 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Russell Alan Shultis. Service : 9/24/98. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 10 Filed: 8/31/1998, Entered: 9/2/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [7-1] motion to Stay all proceedings, until decisions have been issued on the pending dispositive motions ( signed by Sr. Judge Robert J. Yock ). Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 9 Filed: 8/26/1998, Entered: 8/27/1998 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY by USA to response to [7-1] motion to Stay all proceedings, until decisions have been issued on the pending dispositive motions. Service: 8/26/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 8 Filed: 8/14/1998, Entered: 8/17/1998 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by SACRAMENTO MUNICIPAL (Service: 8/14/98 ) to [7-1] motion to Stay all proceedings, until decisions have been issued on the pending dispositive motions. Reply due: 8/24/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 7 Filed: 8/10/1998, Entered: 8/12/1998, Terminated: 8/31/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 8/10/98) to Stay all proceedings, until decisions have been issued on the pending dispositive motions (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 6 Filed: 8/4/1998, Entered: 8/7/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER returning, UNFILED for correction of defect (index to appendix/exhibits is missing), defendant's motion to stay all proceedings, and allowing the filing of the motion after defect has been corrected. ( signed by Sr. Judge Robert J. Yock ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 5 Filed: 6/24/1998, Entered: 6/26/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER re: Plaintiff's Notice of Filing of Contract in Suit is allowed to be filed as an attachment to the Complaint. ( signed by Judge Robert J. Yock ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 4 Filed: 6/24/1998, Entered: 6/26/1998 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Filing of the standard contract in suit by SACRAMENTO MUNICIPAL. Service: 6/10/98. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 3 Filed: 6/18/1998, Entered: 6/18/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Joseph Andrew Kijewski Service : 6/17/98 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 6/9/1998, Entered: 6/10/1998 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of assignment to Judge Robert J. Yock. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 6/9/1998, Entered: 6/10/1998 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #045628. Answer due on 8/10/98. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 285 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?