CRESPO v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:98-cv-00539-RHH
District Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr., presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo PAUL S. CRESPO, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles William Gittins +1 703 683 0660
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jerome Anthony Madden
Office COFC
Filed 6/24/1998
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 346 - Military Pay - Correct/Reinstate
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 11/17/1998
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 14 Filed: 11/20/1998, Entered: 12/11/1998 Record Transferred Out
All original papers comprising the record together with certified copies of docket entries and Order forwarded to the United States District Court for the District of Columbia. See letter in file. (DS)
    LREF
    Blank 13 Filed: 11/17/1998, Entered: 11/19/1998 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER Transferring Case to the United States District Court for the District of Columbia. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (DS)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 11/17/1998, Entered: 11/19/1998 Terminated Case
      Case closed (DS)
        LREF
        Blank 12 Filed: 10/30/1998, Entered: 11/4/1998 Status Report
        STATUS REPORT by USA filed [by leave of the judge]. Service: 10/27/98 (DS)
          LREF
          Blank 11 Filed: 10/19/1998, Entered: 10/20/1998 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER set Status Report deadline to 10/23/98. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (JT)
            LREF
            Blank 10 Filed: 9/29/1998, Entered: 10/2/1998 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER that counsel are to meet no later than October 9 ( Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (CDC)
              LREF
              Blank 9 Filed: 9/25/1998, Entered: 9/28/1998 Terminated:
              RESPONSE by PAUL S. CRESPO (Service: 9/25/98 ) to [6-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Reply due: 10/13/98 (CDC)
                LREF
                Blank 8 Filed: 9/17/1998, Entered: 9/23/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER granting [7-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's response to [6-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdictionreset to 9/25/98. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                  LREF
                  Blank 7 Filed: 9/14/1998, Entered: 9/18/1998, Terminated: 9/17/1998 Terminated:
                  MOTION by PAUL S. CRESPO (Service: 9/8/98) to Extend Time to respond to Motion to Dismiss (until 9/25/98) filed [by leave of the judge]. (FE) Modified on 11/19/1998
                    LREF
                    Blank 6 Filed: 8/28/1998, Entered: 8/28/1998, Terminated: 11/17/1998 Motion to Dismiss
                    MOTION by USA (Service : 8/28/98 ) to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Response due: 9/28/98 (AB)
                      LREF
                      Blank 5 Filed: 8/24/1998, Entered: 8/25/1998 Terminated:
                      MOTION by USA (Service : 8/24/98 ) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint [to August 28, 1998]. Response due: 9/10/98 (JT)
                        LREF
                        Blank 4 Filed: 7/10/1998, Entered: 7/17/1998 Notice of Appearance/
                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Jerome Anthony Madden. Service : 7/10/98 (DS)
                          LREF
                          Blank 3 Filed: 7/7/1998, Entered: 7/14/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER set date Joint Preliminary Status Report due to 10/8/98. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                            LREF
                            Blank 2 Filed: 6/24/1998, Entered: 6/24/1998 Court Filing
                            Notice of assignment to Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. . Copy to parties. (FE)
                              LREF
                              Blank 1 Filed: 6/24/1998, Entered: 6/24/1998
                              COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #045715. Answer due on 8/24/98. (FE)
                                LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 81 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?