SOUTHERN NUCLEAR, et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:98-cv-00614-JFM
District Judge James F. Merow, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Alabama Power Company, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Balch & Bingham LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Melvin Stanford Blanton +1 205 226 3417 +1 205 488 5879 sblanton@balch.com
No Logo Georgia Power Company, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Balch & Bingham LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Melvin Stanford Blanton +1 205 226 3417 +1 205 488 5879 sblanton@balch.com
No Logo Southern Nuclear Operating Company, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Balch & Bingham LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Melvin Stanford Blanton +1 205 226 3417 +1 205 488 5879 sblanton@balch.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marian Elizabeth Sullivan +1 202 307 0365 +1 202 307 2503 marian.sullivan@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 7/29/1998
Jury Demand None
Demand $1500000000
Nature of Suit 536 - Spent Nuclear Fuel
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Judgment
County None
Terminated 7/10/2007
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case '08-5020'[]
Def Custody Status
Flags APPEAL, CLOSED, CRSAPP, ECF, SNF
  Entries (399) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 372 Filed: 1/10/2008, Entered: 1/10/2008
NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL, filed by SOUTHERN NUCLEAR OPERATING COMPANY, INC., GEORGIA POWER COMPANY, ALABAMA POWER COMPANY. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 067552. (hw1, )
    LREF
    Legal Document 373 Filed: 1/3/2008, Entered: 2/6/2008 CAFC Case Number
    CAFC Case Number 08-5020 for [371] Notice of Appeal filed by USA. (hw1, )
      LREF
      Legal Document 371 Filed: 1/2/2008, Entered: 1/2/2008
      NOTICE OF APPEAL, filed by USA. Copies to judge, opposing party and CAFC. (hw1, )
        LREF
        Legal Document 370 Filed: 12/6/2007, Entered: 12/12/2007 Certified Transcript to Attorney
        CERTIFIED TRANSCRIPT OF JUDGMENT, dated July 11, 2007, forwarded to Melvin Stanford Blanton. See letter in file. (bre,)
          LREF
          Legal Document 369 Filed: 11/1/2007, Entered: 11/1/2007 Court Filing
          ORDER entered denying [364] Motion for Reconsideration and granting [367] Motion To Correct. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae)
            LREF
            Legal Document 368 Filed: 8/21/2007, Entered: 8/21/2007 Court Filing
            ORDER re Mr. William Peterson's submissions of July 23, 2007. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae)
              LREF
              Legal Document 367 Filed: 8/17/2007, Entered: 8/17/2007, Terminated: 11/1/2007 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
              MOTION To Correct re [364] MOTION for Reconsideration - Rule 59(a) re [363] Judgment, [362] Published Opinion/Order And Pursuant To Rule 52(b), filed by USA.Response due by 9/4/2007.(Gardner, Joshua)
                LREF
                Legal Document 366 Filed: 8/10/2007, Entered: 8/10/2007
                RESPONSE to [364] MOTION for Reconsideration - Rule 59(a) re [363] Judgment, [362] Published Opinion/Order And Pursuant To Rule 52(b), filed by SOUTHERN NUCLEAR OPERATING COMPANY, INC..Reply due by 8/24/2007. (Blanton, Melvin)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 365 Filed: 7/24/2007, Entered: 7/24/2007 Court Filing
                  SCHEDULING ORDER: Defendant filed a motion for reconsideration on July 24, 2007. Pursuant to RCFC 59(b), a response to this motion is requested. The response shall be filed on or before August 10, 2007. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 364 Filed: 7/24/2007, Entered: 7/24/2007, Terminated: 11/1/2007 Motion for Reconsideration - Rule 59(a)
                    MOTION for Reconsideration - Rule 59(a) re [363] Judgment, [362] Published Opinion/Order And Pursuant To Rule 52(b), filed by USA.(Gardner, Joshua)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 363 Filed: 7/10/2007, Entered: 7/10/2007
                      JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that damages are awarded in favor of plaintiffs. Plaintiff, Alabama Power Company, shall recover of and from the United States the total amount of $17,278,000.00, and plaintiff, Georgia Power Company, shall recover of and from the United States the amounts of $57,203,080.00 for the Hatch Plant, and $2,716,000.00 for the Vogtle Plant, for a total award to plaintiff, Georgia Powqer Company of $59,919,080.00. (lld)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 362 Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: 7/9/2007 Court Filing
                        This Opinion is PUBLISHED. The Clerk is directed to enter final judgment in favor of plaintiffs as set forth in this Opinion. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 361 Filed: 4/27/2007, Entered: 4/27/2007 Court Filing
                          ORDER RETURNING UNFILED: Motion to Intervene, Memorandum, Complaint and Certificate of Service received April 19, 2007. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 360 Filed: 4/26/2007, Entered: 4/26/2007
                            RESPONSE to Mr. William (Bill) Peterson's Motion To Intervene And Complaint, dated April 7, 2007, filed by USA. (Lester, Harold)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 359 Filed: 3/29/2007, Entered: 3/29/2007
                              NOTICE of Appearance by Marian Elizabeth Sullivan for USA. (Sullivan, Marian)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 358 Filed: 12/18/2006, Entered: 12/18/2006
                                RESPONSE to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Brief, dated December 6, 2006, filed by USA. (Bryan, Patrick)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 357 Filed: 12/18/2006, Entered: 12/18/2006
                                  RESPONSE to [353] Response to Scheduling Order, filed by SOUTHERN NUCLEAR OPERATING COMPANY, INC.. (Blanton, Melvin)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 356 Filed: 12/7/2006, Entered: 12/7/2006 Court Filing
                                    ORDER granting [355] Motion for Leave to File Out of Time. Plaintiffs' supplemental brief, filed on December 6, 2006, is deemed FILED by leave of the court. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 355 Filed: 12/6/2006, Entered: 12/6/2006, Terminated: 12/7/2006 Motion for Leave to File Out of Time
                                      MOTION for Leave to File Attached 354 Out of Time Supplemental Brief, filed by SOUTHERN NUCLEAR OPERATING COMPANY, INC..Response due by 12/26/2006. (Attachments: # (1))(Blanton, Melvin)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 354 Filed: 12/6/2006, Entered: 12/6/2006
                                        RESPONSE to [349] Scheduling Order,, filed by SOUTHERN NUCLEAR OPERATING COMPANY, INC.. (Blanton, Melvin)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 353 Filed: 12/5/2006, Entered: 12/5/2006
                                          RESPONSE to [349] Scheduling Order,, filed by USA. (Bryan, Patrick)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 352 Filed: 11/21/2006, Entered: 11/21/2006 Court Filing
                                            ORDER entered re [350] Motion for Extension of Time: The time for simultaneous supplemental briefs, set by the Order, filed November 1, 2006, shall be ENLARGED to December 5, 2006, with responsive briefs to be filed on or before December 18, 2006. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 351 Filed: 11/20/2006, Entered: 11/20/2006
                                              RESPONSE to [350] Motion for Extension of Time Opposition and Motion for Leave, filed by SOUTHERN NUCLEAR OPERATING COMPANY, INC.. (Blanton, Melvin)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 350 Filed: 11/20/2006, Entered: 11/20/2006, Terminated: 11/21/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                MOTION for Extension of Time until December 11, 2006 to Respond To Court's Order Dated November 1, 2006, filed by USA.Response due by 12/7/2006.(Ekman, John)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 349 Filed: 11/1/2006, Entered: 11/1/2006 Court Filing
                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER: On or before November 20, 2006, the parties are requested to file simultaneous supplemental briefs. Responsive briefs may be filed on or before December 15, 2006. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 348 Filed: 8/2/2006, Entered: 8/2/2006
                                                    Exhibit's (3) CDRoms filed by SOUTHERN NUCLEAR OPERATING COMPANY, INC., GEORGIA POWER COMPANY and ALABAMA POWER COMPANY. Service: 8/2/2006.(dw1)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 347 Filed: 7/24/2006, Entered: 7/24/2006 Court Filing
                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-149) held on July 11, 2006 before Senior Judge James F. Merow. (dw1)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 7/10/2006, Entered: 7/10/2006
                                                        Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 8/11/2006. (vp1, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 345 Filed: 7/7/2006, Entered: 7/7/2006
                                                          Exhibit List Final, filed by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: # (1))(Blanton, Melvin)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 346 Filed: 7/6/2006, Entered: 7/7/2006 Transcript - Cumulative Index
                                                            Cumulative Index for TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-31) held on October 17, 2005 through October 27, 2005. (dw1) Additional attachment(s) added on 10/17/2006 (dw1, ).
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 344 Filed: 6/16/2006, Entered: 6/16/2006
                                                              POST TRIAL BRIEF Reply, filed by all plaintiffs. (Blanton, Melvin)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 343 Filed: 5/24/2006, Entered: 5/24/2006
                                                                POST TRIAL BRIEF, filed by USA. (Ekman, John)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 5/23/2006, Entered: 5/23/2006
                                                                  ORDER terminating [342] Motion for Extension of Time. The Order filed May 22, 2006, Document #341, granted the relief sought by this motion. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 342 Filed: 5/22/2006, Entered: 5/22/2006, Terminated: 5/23/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                    Corrected MOTION for Extension of Time until May 24, 2006 to Defendant's Post-Trial Brief, filed by USA.Response due by 6/8/2006.(Sullivan, Marian)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 341 Filed: 5/22/2006, Entered: 5/22/2006 Court Filing
                                                                      ORDER granting [340] Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's Post Trial Brief due 5/24/2006. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 340 Filed: 5/22/2006, Entered: 5/22/2006, Terminated: 5/22/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time until May 24, 2006 to Defendant's Post Trial Brief, filed by USA.Response due by 6/8/2006.(Sullivan, Marian)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 339 Filed: 5/19/2006, Entered: 5/19/2006 Court Filing
                                                                          ORDER granting [338] Motion for Extension of Time. Post Trial Brief due 5/22/2006. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 338 Filed: 5/19/2006, Entered: 5/19/2006, Terminated: 5/19/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until May 22, 2006 to File Post-Trial Brief, filed by USA.Response due by 6/5/2006.(Ekman, John)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 337 Filed: 5/10/2006, Entered: 5/10/2006 Court Filing
                                                                              ORDER granting [335] Motion for Extension of Time: It is ORDERED that defendant's motion for enlargements of time, filed April 24, 2006, is GRANTED so that the time for defendant's post-trial brief is ENLARGED to and including May 19, 2006 and the time for plaintiffs' reply is ENLARGED to and including June 16, 2006. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 336 Filed: 5/3/2006, Entered: 5/3/2006
                                                                                RESPONSE to [335] MOTION for Extension of Time until May 19, 2006 to File Post-Trial Brief, filed by SOUTHERN NUCLEAR OPERATING COMPANY, INC..Reply due by 5/17/2006. (Blanton, Melvin)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 335 Filed: 4/24/2006, Entered: 4/24/2006, Terminated: 5/10/2006 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time until May 19, 2006 to File Post-Trial Brief, filed by USA. Response due by 5/11/2006.(Ekman, John)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 334 Filed: 4/20/2006, Entered: 4/20/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                    ORDER ENTERED CORRECTING the Order filed April 19, 2006. ORAL ARGUMENT IS SCHEDULED TO BEGIN AT 1:00 P.M. ON JULY 11, 2006. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 333 Filed: 4/19/2006, Entered: 4/19/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                      SCHEDULING ORDER:. Oral Argument set for 7/11/2006 01:00 PM in National Courts Building before Senior Judge James F. Merow. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 332 Filed: 3/27/2006, Entered: 3/27/2006
                                                                                        RESPONSE to [325] Response to Plaintiffs' Designation of Deposition and Trial Testimony, filed by SOUTHERN NUCLEAR OPERATING COMPANY, INC.. (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3))(Blanton, Melvin)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 331 Filed: 3/23/2006, Entered: 3/23/2006
                                                                                          NOTICE, filed by all plaintiffs re [330] Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, by Filing Substitute Pages to Post-Trial Brief (Blanton, Melvin)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 330 Filed: 3/22/2006, Entered: 3/22/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                            ORDER granting [329] Motion for leave to file substitue pages. Plaintiffs shall file substitute pages 76, 117, and 136 of the previously filed Plaintiffs Post-Trial Brief. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 329 Filed: 3/22/2006, Entered: 3/22/2006, Terminated: 3/22/2006 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct [326] Post Trial Brief -- For Leave to File Substitute Pages, filed by SOUTHERN NUCLEAR OPERATING COMPANY, INC..(Blanton, Melvin)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 328 Filed: 3/21/2006, Entered: 3/22/2006 Memorandum
                                                                                                Counter-Designations, filed by USA. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] (mb2, ) Modified on 3/23/2006 to correct filer (mb2, ).
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 327 Filed: 3/21/2006, Entered: 3/21/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER: The defendant's Counter-Designations to the Plaintiffs' Trial and Deposition Testimony Designations, comprised of three volumes, shall be non-electronically FILED by leave of court. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 326 Filed: 3/17/2006, Entered: 3/17/2006
                                                                                                    POST TRIAL BRIEF, filed by all plaintiffs. (Blanton, Melvin)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document 325 Filed: 3/16/2006, Entered: 3/16/2006
                                                                                                      RESPONSE to Plaintiff's Designations of Deposition and Trial Transcripts, filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1))(Sullivan, Marian)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 2/8/2006, Entered: 2/8/2006
                                                                                                        Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 3/2/2006. (vp1, )
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 324 Filed: 2/1/2006, Entered: 2/1/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on January 30-31, 2006 before Senior Judge James F. Merow. (dw1)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 323 Filed: 1/31/2006, Entered: 1/31/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                            POST TRIAL ORDER: Upon agreement of counsel as stated at the conclusion of trial testimony on January 31, 2006, the following schedule is established for the filing of post-trial submissions. The statement of facts in the respective post-trial briefs shall be supported with specific references to record evidence. Any page limitations are waived. (1) Plaintiffs' opening submission shall be filed on or before March 17, 2006; (2) The government's responsive submission shall be filed on or before April 28, 2006; (3) plaintiffs' reply shall be filed on or before May 26, 2006; (4) The government may seek leave to file a sur-reply; (5) Upon completion of briefing, the the parties shall consult and notify the court with respect to their proposal(s) with respect to oral argument. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 322 Filed: 1/12/2006, Entered: 1/12/2006
                                                                                                              Exhibit List of Admitted Exhibits, filed by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Southern's Preliminary List of Admitted Exhibits)(Blanton, Melvin)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 321 Filed: 12/21/2005, Entered: 12/21/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER: Trial is scheduled to reconvene on January 30, 2006 at 1:00 p.m. at the National Courts Building, 717 Madison Place, NW, Washington, DC 20005, with the courtroom number to be posted in the lobby. The final day of trial, January 31, 2006, shall commence at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 320 Filed: 12/6/2005, Entered: 12/6/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER Cancelling Deadline/Trial: It is ORDERED that the scheduling order of November 21, 2005 is vacated and the trial scheduled to reconvene on December 14 and 16, 2005 at 10:00 a.m., is hereby canceled. A revised scheduling order shall be entered at a later date. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 319 Filed: 11/21/2005, Entered: 11/21/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER: Trial is scheduled to reconvene on December 14 and 16, 2005 at 10:00 a.m. at the National Courts Building, 717 Madison Place, NW, Washington, DC 20005, with the courtroom number to be posted in the lobby. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 318 Filed: 11/10/2005, Entered: 11/10/2005
                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to [308] Motion to Amend Pleadings - Rule 15 Defendant's Answer to Plaintiffs' Amended and Supplemental Complaint, filed by USA. (Ekman, John)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 11/4/2005, Entered: 11/4/2005
                                                                                                                        Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 11/28/2005. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 316 Filed: 11/1/2005, Entered: 11/1/2005
                                                                                                                          Exhibit List Of Admitted Exhibits To Which Plaintiffs Did Not Object Prior To Trial, filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1))(Ekman, John)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 317 Filed: 10/31/2005, Entered: 11/2/2005 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on October 24-27, 2005 before Senior Judge James F. Merow. (dw1)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 315 Filed: 10/26/2005, Entered: 10/26/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                              ORDER: (1) GRANTING plaintiffs'[308] motion, filed September 23, 2005; (2) To obviate any impact from the enlargement of time granted for a response to plaintiffs' motion, the Amended and Supplemental Complaint tendered with plaintiffs' motion shall be deemed FILED as of October 11, 2005; (3) The time for a pleading responding to plaintiffs' Amended and Supplemental Complaint, filed October 11, 2005, is enlarged to and including November 18, 2005; (4) To the extent relevant, the legal effect of the filing of the Amended and Supplemental Complaint shall be addressed in the post-trial submissions to be scheduled in this litigation; and (5) Consideration of plaintiffs' motion to allow post-2004 damages to be claimed in a separate complaint shall be deferred for inclusion in the post-trial submissions to be scheduled in this matter. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 10/25/2005, Entered: 10/25/2005
                                                                                                                                Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 11/11/2005. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 314 Filed: 10/24/2005, Entered: 10/25/2005 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on October 17-21, 2005 before Senior Judge James F. Merow. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 313 Filed: 10/18/2005, Entered: 10/18/2005
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by SOUTHERN NUCLEAR OPERATING COMPANY, INC. of Plaintiffs' Designations of Deposition and Trial Transcripts (Attachments: # (1))(Blanton, Melvin)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 312 Filed: 10/17/2005, Entered: 10/17/2005
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by USA Defendant's Testimony Designations (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3))(Sullivan, Marian)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 311 Filed: 10/13/2005, Entered: 10/13/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [310] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re [308] MOTION to file an amended and supplemental complaint. Response due by 11/18/2005. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 310 Filed: 10/13/2005, Entered: 10/13/2005, Terminated: 10/13/2005 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 11/18/2005 to File Response or Reply as to [308] MOTION to Amend Pleadings - Rule 15 and Supplemental Complaint filed by USA. Response due by 10/31/2005. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 309 Filed: 9/28/2005, Entered: 9/28/2005
                                                                                                                                            Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law by USA. (Attachments: # (1))(Sullivan, Marian)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 308 Filed: 9/23/2005, Entered: 9/23/2005, Terminated: 10/26/2005 Motion to Amend Pleadings - Rule 15
                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Amend Pleadings - Rule 15 and Supplemental Complaint filed by SOUTHERN NUCLEAR OPERATING COMPANY, INC.. Response due by 10/11/2005. (Attachments: # (1))(Blanton, Melvin)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 307 Filed: 9/20/2005, Entered: 9/20/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [305] Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's pretrial memorandum of contentions of fact and law due: September 28, 2005. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 306 Filed: 9/20/2005, Entered: 9/20/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on September 15, 2005 before Judge James F. Merow. (vro, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 9/21/2005 (dw1, ).
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 305 Filed: 9/20/2005, Entered: 9/20/2005, Terminated: 9/20/2005 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until September 28, 2005 to File Pretrial Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law filed by USA. Response due by 10/7/2005. (Ekman, John)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 304 Filed: 9/16/2005, Entered: 9/16/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                      ORDER:(1) Demonstrative exhibits shall be provided to the opposing party forty-eight hours prior to their use at trial; (2) The order of witnesses shall be provided to the opposing party seven calendar days in advance of that testimony; (3) Deposition designations shall be provided to the opposing party seven calendar days prior to the commencement of the propounding party's case-in-chief. All counter-designations shall be provided after the conclusion of the trial; (4) Trial transcripts from the consolidated trial in Yankee Atomic Power Company v. United States, No. 98-126C shall be treated as depositions for the purpose of designations with notice(s) given as provided above; (5) The scope of the trial proceedings in this matter will comprise damage evidence up to and including December 31, 2004; (6) Evidence reflecting the results of the government's audit of plaintiffs' damages shall be presented at trial in a manner that will show items not contested for accounting purposes as set forth above; (7) Should counsel agree that the final pretrial conference scheduled for October 11, 2005 at 10:00 a.m., at the National Courts Building, 717 Madison Place, NW, Washington, DC 20005, is not necessary, they shall so inform Judicial Assistant Linda Eddins at (202) 357-6613 and that conference will be cancelled. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 9/15/2005, Entered: 9/15/2005
                                                                                                                                                        Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 10/17/2005. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 303 Filed: 9/12/2005, Entered: 9/12/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER: (1) The first pretrial conference is scheduled to commence at 1:30 p.m. on Thursday, September 15, 2005, at the National Courts Building, 717 Madison Place, NW, Washington, DC 20005, with the courtroom number to be posted in the lobby; (2) The final pretrial conference is rescheduled for October 11, 2005 at 10:00 a.m., at the National Courts Building, with the courtroom number to be posted in the lobby. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 302 Filed: 9/9/2005, Entered: 9/9/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER: At the pre-trial conference(s), the parties should address any impact of the decision in Indiana Michigan Power Co. v. United States, __ F.3d __, No. 04-5122 (Fed. Cir. Sept. 9, 2005) on the trial of this matter. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 301 Filed: 9/8/2005, Entered: 9/8/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER re [298] motion: It is ORDERED that plaintiffs' request to alter the trial location is DENIED, but the parties' requests for an additional and earlier pre-trial conference is GRANTED with the date to be established as set forth in the order. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 300 Filed: 9/6/2005, Entered: 9/6/2005
                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to [298] MOTION Pre-Trial Conference filed by USA. Reply due by 9/19/2005. (Ekman, John) Modified on 9/7/2005 to correct reply deadline (jat, ).
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 9/6/2005, Entered: 9/7/2005 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                  Set/Reset Deadlines: Reply due by 9/19/2005. (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 299 Filed: 9/2/2005, Entered: 9/2/2005
                                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law by SOUTHERN NUCLEAR OPERATING COMPANY, INC.. (Attachments: # (1))(Blanton, Melvin)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 298 Filed: 8/25/2005, Entered: 8/25/2005, Terminated: 9/8/2005 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION Pre-Trial Conference filed by SOUTHERN NUCLEAR OPERATING COMPANY, INC.. Response due by 9/12/2005. (Blanton, Melvin)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 297 Filed: 8/19/2005, Entered: 8/19/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER: (1) The government's [286] Motion to Compel Third Party Production of Documents Pursuant to Subpoena Duces Tecum is granted in part and denied in part;(2) Holtec's Cross-Motion for Protective Order and to Quash/Modify the Subpoena is granted in part and denied in part; (3) The defendant shall promptly furnish Holtec with copies or a descriptive list, of all Holtec documents it has obtained concerning the Hatch, Vogtle, and Farley plants to aid in the document search and to obviate the need for Holtec to produce them to the extent Holtec's file copies comprise the exact same documents; (4) Upon the assumption that documents in the Nuclear Regulatory Commission files are available to defendant, Holtec need not produce its copy of such documents, e.g., license proposals. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 296 Filed: 8/3/2005, Entered: 8/5/2005 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                          Letter from Francis Maneri. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 295 Filed: 7/27/2005, Entered: 7/29/2005 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                            **SEALED**REPLY to Response to Motion re [286] MOTION to Compel, filed by USA. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 7/26/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 294 Filed: 7/26/2005, Entered: 7/26/2005
                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by USA Of Filing Under Seal Of "Defendant's Reply In Support Of Motion To Compel Third-Party Production Of Documents Pursuant To Subpoena Duces Tecum And Response To Cross-Motion For Protective Order And To Quash/Modify The Subpoena" (Herrmann, Heide)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 293 Filed: 7/26/2005, Entered: 7/26/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [292]Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiffs' discovery deadline: Aug 12, 2005. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 292 Filed: 7/26/2005, Entered: 7/26/2005, Terminated: 7/26/2005 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time until August 12, 2005, to due to defendant witness not being available for deposition until after discovery deadline of August 1, 2005, filed by GEORGIA POWER COMPANY, ALABAMA POWER COMPANY. Response due by 8/12/2005. (Blanton, Melvin)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 291 Filed: 7/25/2005, Entered: 7/25/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [290] Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to and including July 26, 2005, within which to file its reply in support of Defendant's Motion to Compel Third Party Production of Documents Pursuant to Subpoena Duces Tecum. (Copy of this order was faxed to Francis P. Maneri, attorney for non-party Holtec) Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 7/25/2005, Entered: 7/26/2005 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                      Set/Reset Deadlines: Reply due by 7/26/2005. (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 290 Filed: 7/22/2005, Entered: 7/22/2005, Terminated: 7/25/2005 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until July 26, 2005 to Reply in support of motion to compel filed by USA. Response due by 8/8/2005. (Herrmann, Heide)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 289 Filed: 7/13/2005, Entered: 7/15/2005 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                          **SEALED**RESPONSE to [286] MOTION to Compel, filed by HOLTEC INTERNATIONAL. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Reply due by 7/22/2005. Service: 7/8/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 288 Filed: 7/13/2005, Entered: 7/13/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER re submission by Holtec Internation. Mr. Francis P. Maneri may participate in this matter, pro hac vice, representing non-party Holtec with respect to discovery issues. The Holtec brief and motions received by the clerk on July 11, 2005, via Mr. Maneri's cover letter, dated July 8, 2005, shall now be FILED under SEAL in paper format by the clerk. A copy of this order shall be mailed to Mr. Maneri on July 14, 2005. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 287 Filed: 6/28/2005, Entered: 6/28/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [285]Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal Electronically. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae,)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 286 Filed: 6/27/2005, Entered: 6/28/2005, Terminated: 8/19/2005 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                **SEALED** MOTION to Compel Third Party Production of Documents Pursuant to Subpoena Decus Tecum, filed by USA. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 6/24/2005. Response due by 7/11/2005. (mb2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 285 Filed: 6/8/2005, Entered: 6/8/2005, Terminated: 6/28/2005 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Protected Documents Under Seal filed by USA. Response due by 6/27/2005. (Herrmann, Heide)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 284 Filed: 6/1/2005, Entered: 6/1/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [283]Motion for Discovery (Defendant's [Corrected] Unopposed Motion for an Order Regarding the Timing of Review of the Government's Responsive Expert Reports by Plaintiffs' Expert Witnesses). Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 283 Filed: 6/1/2005, Entered: 6/1/2005, Terminated: 6/1/2005 Motion for Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Discovery Order Regarding The Timing Of Review Of The Government's Responsive Expert Reports By Plaintiffs' Expert Witnesses (CORRECTED COPY) filed by USA. Response due by 6/20/2005. (Ekman, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 282 Filed: 6/1/2005, Entered: 6/1/2005, Terminated: 7/5/2005 Motion for Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Discovery Order Regarding The Timing Of Review Of The Government's Responsive Expert Reports By Plaintiffs' Expert Witnesses filed by USA. Response due by 6/20/2005. (Ekman, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 281 Filed: 5/26/2005, Entered: 5/26/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [280] Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Expert Discovery. Expert Discovery to be completed and responsive expert reports to be produced by 6/10/2005. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 280 Filed: 5/26/2005, Entered: 5/26/2005, Terminated: 5/26/2005 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and Produce Responsive Expert Reports,until June 10, 2005, filed by USA. Response due by 6/13/2005. (Ekman, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 279 Filed: 5/13/2005, Entered: 5/13/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [278] Motion for Discovery. Upon consideration, it is ORDERED that the Joint Motion for an Order Regarding Discovery of Draft Expert Reports, filed May 12, 2005, which is based upon the joint stipulation of the parties, is GRANTED, so that in this matter no party shall be required to produce any DRAFT (including copies) of any expert report prepared in connection with this case or any spent nuclear fuel case that is or was pending before this court. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae,)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 278 Filed: 5/12/2005, Entered: 5/12/2005, Terminated: 5/13/2005 Motion for Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION for Discovery Order Regarding Discovery of Draft Expert Reports filed by USA. Response due by 5/31/2005. (Ekman, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 277 Filed: 4/8/2005, Entered: 4/8/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER: (1) That the protective order to preclude the individual depositions of Mr. Zabransky and Mr. Kouts shall be GRANTED to the extent that questions shall not be addressed to matters where there exists a reasonably complete response in prior depositions or testimony by the deponent, and where the deposition or testimony is available to plaintiffs, except that prior depositions or testimony may be referenced for foundation, context, or clarification purposes when needed to obtain responses to questions addressed to new subjects; (2) That except to the extent GRANTED in (1) defendant's motion for a protective order addressed to individual depositions of Mr. Zabransky and Mr. Kouts shall, otherwise, be DENIED. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 276 Filed: 4/5/2005, Entered: 4/5/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER: Based upon the telephone hearing with the court on March 23, 2005, plaintiffs and defendant filed a Joint Proposed Scheduling Order on April 1, 2005, which has been adopted. Signed by Judge James F. Merow.(lae, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 4/5/2005, Entered: 4/7/2005 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Set/Reset Deadlines: Discovery deadline for the Government and submission of the Government's expert reports - 6/1/2005; Discovery deadline for Plaintiffs - 8/1/2005; Defendant's Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law - 9/23/2005; Motion(s) in Limine - 9/23/2005. (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 275 Filed: 4/1/2005, Entered: 4/1/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        JOINT STATUS REPORT and Proposed Scheduling Order by USA. (Ekman, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 274 Filed: 3/9/2005, Entered: 3/9/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re [267] MOTION for Protective Order to Preclude Depositions of David Zabransky and Christopher Kouts filed by USA. (Ekman, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 273 Filed: 3/8/2005, Entered: 3/8/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re [268] MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and Submit Expert Reports,until June 29, 2005, filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix)(Ekman, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 272 Filed: 3/1/2005, Entered: 3/1/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to [268] MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and Submit Expert Reports,until June 29, 2005, filed by SOUTHERN NUCLEAR OPERATING COMPANY, INC., GEORGIA POWER COMPANY, ALABAMA POWER COMPANY. Reply due by 3/15/2005. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix)(Blanton, Melvin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 271 Filed: 2/28/2005, Entered: 2/28/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to [268] MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and Submit Expert Reports,until June 29, 2005, filed by SOUTHERN NUCLEAR OPERATING COMPANY, INC., GEORGIA POWER COMPANY, ALABAMA POWER COMPANY. Reply due by 3/14/2005. (Attachments: # (1))(Blanton, Melvin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 270 Filed: 2/28/2005, Entered: 2/28/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to [267] MOTION for Protective Order to Preclude Depositions of David Zabransky and Christopher Kouts filed by SOUTHERN NUCLEAR OPERATING COMPANY, INC., GEORGIA POWER COMPANY, ALABAMA POWER COMPANY. Reply due by 3/14/2005. (Attachments: # (1))(Blanton, Melvin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 269 Filed: 2/14/2005, Entered: 2/14/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER re [260] Motion for Protective Order. It is ORDERED that defendant's Motion for a Protective Order, filed December 3, 2004, is GRANTED to the extent plaintiffs' stated RCFC 30(b)(6) deposition subject matters exceed the limitations or qualifications expressed above and is, otherwise, DENIED.Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 268 Filed: 2/11/2005, Entered: 2/11/2005, Terminated: 4/6/2005 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and Submit Expert Reports,until June 29, 2005, by USA. Response due by 2/28/2005 (Attachments: # (1) Appendix)(Ekman, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 267 Filed: 2/10/2005, Entered: 2/10/2005, Terminated: 4/8/2005 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Protective Order to Preclude Depositions of David Zabransky and Christopher Kouts by USA. Response due by 2/28/2005 (Attachments: # (1) Appendix)(Ekman, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 266 Filed: 1/18/2005, Entered: 1/18/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by John Clifford Ekman for USA. (Ekman, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 1/18/2005, Entered: 1/27/2005 Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            *** Attorney Marian Elizabeth Sullivan terminated. (dls )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 265 Filed: 1/5/2005, Entered: 1/5/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re [260] MOTION for Protective Order To Preclude RCFC 30(b)(6) Deposition And Motion for Expedited Consideration filed by USA. (Sullivan, Marian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 264 Filed: 12/23/2004, Entered: 12/23/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [263] Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Fact Discovery. Fact Discovery to be completed by 3/1/2005. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 263 Filed: 12/23/2004, Entered: 12/23/2004, Terminated: 12/23/2004 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery,until March 1, 2005, by USA. Response due by 1/10/2005 (Ekman, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 262 Filed: 12/20/2004, Entered: 12/20/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER filed. It is ORDERED:(1) Plaintiffs' motion [242], filed September 1, 2004, shall be GRANTED to the extent that: (a)evidence shall be received in this litigation addressed to the monetary damages plaintiffs claim to be appropriately tied to the period of DOE's current performance delay until 2010, including cost or monetary ramifications thereof extending to 2020; and (b) any DOE delay in its obligation to dispose of plaintiffs' HLW or SNF occurring after 2010 shall comprise a separate cause of action accruing then, and not comprising a part of the current litigation; (2) Defendant's cross-motion [247], filed October 1, 2004, shall be DENIED, without prejudice to the appropriate reassertion of the arguments presented in post-trial briefing;(3) Except as so granted above, the parties' cited motions shall be, otherwise, DENIED. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 261 Filed: 12/20/2004, Entered: 12/20/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to [260] MOTION for Protective Order To Preclude RCFC 30(b)(6) Deposition And Motion for Expedited Consideration filed by SOUTHERN NUCLEAR OPERATING COMPANY, INC., GEORGIA POWER COMPANY, ALABAMA POWER COMPANY. Reply due by 1/5/2005. (Attachments: # (1))(Blanton, Melvin) Modified on 1/3/2005 (hw1, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 12/20/2004, Entered: 1/3/2005 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Set Deadlines/Hearings: Reply due by 1/5/2005. (hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 260 Filed: 12/3/2004, Entered: 12/3/2004, Terminated: 2/14/2005 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Protective Order To Preclude RCFC 30(b)(6) Deposition And Motion for Expedited Consideration by USA. Response due by 12/20/2004 (Attachments: # (1))(Sullivan, Marian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 259 Filed: 12/1/2004, Entered: 12/1/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re [242] MOTION For an Order Regarding Subsequent Damages Actions and Request for Expedited Consideration Defendant's Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding Pre-Breach and Future Damages -- Corrected Copy filed by USA. (Sullivan, Marian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 258 Filed: 12/1/2004, Entered: 12/1/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [257] Motion for Leave to File Corrected Copy of Defendant's Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding Pre-Breach and Future Damages. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 257 Filed: 11/30/2004, Entered: 11/30/2004, Terminated: 12/1/2004 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Copy of Defendant's Reply To Plaintiff's Response To Defendant's Cross-Motion For Summary Judgment Regarding Pre-Breach and Future Damages by USA. Response due by 12/17/2004 (Attachments: # (1))(Sullivan, Marian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 256 Filed: 11/24/2004, Entered: 11/24/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re [242] MOTION For an Order Regarding Subsequent Damages Actions and Request for Expedited Consideration Defendant's Reply To Plaintiff's Response To Defendant's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding Pre-Breach and Future Damages filed by USA. (Sullivan, Marian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 255 Filed: 11/19/2004, Entered: 11/19/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to [253] MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [249] Reply to Response to Motion, filed by ALABAMA POWER COMPANY, GEORGIA POWER COMPANY, SOUTHERN NUCLEAR OPERATING COMPANY, INC.. Reply due by 12/6/2004. (Blanton, Melvin) Modified on 11/22/2004 to correct reply due date (dw1).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 254 Filed: 11/19/2004, Entered: 11/19/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [253] Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to the response to the defendant's cross-motion for summary judgment regarding pre-breach and future damages. Reply due by 11/24/2004. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 253 Filed: 11/19/2004, Entered: 11/19/2004, Terminated: 11/19/2004 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [249] Reply to Response to Motion, by USA. Response due by 12/6/2004 (Sullivan, Marian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 11/19/2004, Entered: 11/22/2004 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Set Deadlines/Hearings: Reply due by 12/6/2004. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 252 Filed: 11/3/2004, Entered: 11/3/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [251] Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to plaintiffs'response to the defendant's [247] cross-motion for summary judgment regarding pre-breach and future damages. Reply due by 11/19/2004. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 251 Filed: 11/3/2004, Entered: 11/3/2004, Terminated: 11/3/2004 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to [249] Reply to Response to Motion, Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding Pre-Breach and Future Damages by USA. Response due by 11/22/2004 (Sullivan, Marian) Modified on 11/3/2004 for clarity (dw1).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 250 Filed: 10/18/2004, Entered: 10/18/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by ALABAMA POWER COMPANY, GEORGIA POWER COMPANY, SOUTHERN NUCLEAR OPERATING COMPANY, INC.. (Blanton, Melvin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 249 Filed: 10/18/2004, Entered: 10/18/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re [242] MOTION For an Order Regarding Subsequent Damages Actions and Request for Expedited Consideration and Response to Defendant's Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Pre-Breach and Future Damages filed by ALABAMA POWER COMPANY, GEORGIA POWER COMPANY, SOUTHERN NUCLEAR OPERATING COMPANY, INC.. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix To Damages Reply)(Blanton, Melvin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 248 Filed: 10/1/2004, Entered: 10/1/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact To Accompany Defendant's Cross-Motion For Summary Judgment Regarding Pre-Breach and Future Damages by USA. (Sullivan, Marian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 247 Filed: 10/1/2004, Entered: 10/1/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to [242] MOTION For an Order Regarding Subsequent Damages Actions and Request for Expedited Consideration And Cross-Motion For Summary Judgment Regarding Pre-Breach and Future Damages filed by USA. Reply due by 10/18/2004. (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3))(Sullivan, Marian) Modified on 10/4/2004 to correct reply due date (dw1).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 10/1/2004, Entered: 10/4/2004 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Set Deadlines/Hearings: Reply due by 10/18/2004. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 246 Filed: 9/28/2004, Entered: 9/28/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [245] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re [242] MOTION For an Order Regarding Subsequent Damages Actions and Request for Expedited Consideration. Response due by 10/1/2004. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 245 Filed: 9/28/2004, Entered: 9/28/2004, Terminated: 9/28/2004 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to [242] MOTION For an Order Regarding Subsequent Damages Actions and Request for Expedited Consideration,until October 1, 2004, by USA. Response due by 10/15/2004 (Sullivan, Marian) Modified on 9/29/2004 for clarity (dw1).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 244 Filed: 9/20/2004, Entered: 9/20/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [243] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re [242] MOTION For an Order Regarding Subsequent Damages Actions and Request for Expedited Consideration. Response due by 9/28/2004. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 243 Filed: 9/20/2004, Entered: 9/20/2004, Terminated: 9/20/2004 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to [242] MOTION For an Order Regarding Subsequent Damages Actions and Request for Expedited Consideration, (until 09/28/2004) by USA. Response due by 10/7/2004. (Herrmann, Heide) Modified on 9/21/2004 for clarity (dw1).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 242 Filed: 9/1/2004, Entered: 9/1/2004, Terminated: 12/20/2004 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION For an Order Regarding Subsequent Damages Actions and Request for Expedited Consideration by ALABAMA POWER COMPANY, GEORGIA POWER COMPANY, SOUTHERN NUCLEAR OPERATING COMPANY, INC.. Response due by 9/20/2004 (Blanton, Melvin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 6/22/2004, Entered: 6/22/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Set Deadlines/Hearings: Expert Discovery due by 4/1/2005. Plaintiff's Expert Report due by 1/31/2005. Defendant's Expert Report due 2/29/2005. Fact Discovery due by 12/31/2004. Trial set for 8/29/2005 before Senior Judge James F. Merow. (dw1 )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 6/22/2004, Entered: 6/22/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    *** Attorney Harold Dewitt Lester terminated. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 241 Filed: 6/21/2004, Entered: 6/21/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PRETRIAL ORDER: The following pre-trial schedule, other than for the "audit" process, is established: (1) September 1, 2004 - Fact Discovery shall commence (plaintiff shall also commence the separate "audit" process by submitting its schedule(s) pursuant to the November 8, 2002 Order, on or before September 1, 2004; (2) December 31, 2004 -Fact discovery shall be completed; (3) January 31, 2005 - Plaintiffs' expert reports submitted; (4) February 29, 2005 - Defendant's expert reports submitted; (5) April 1, 2005 - Completion of expert discovery; (6) Remaining schedule in accord with the parties' proposed pre-trial schedule, with trial to commence August 29, 2005; Appendix A Filings due by 5/31/2005;and Opposing Appendix A Filings due by 6/30/2005. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 240 Filed: 5/7/2004, Entered: 5/7/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Proposed Pretrial Order Proposed Pretrial Schedule by USA. (Sullivan, Marian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 239 Filed: 5/7/2004, Entered: 5/7/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to [175] Amended Complaint by USA. JPSR due by 6/28/2004.(Sullivan, Marian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 238 Filed: 5/7/2004, Entered: 5/7/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Marian Elizabeth Sullivan for USA. (Sullivan, Marian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 237 Filed: 5/7/2004, Entered: 5/7/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to [235] Scheduling Order, Proposed Pre-Trial Schedule filed by ALABAMA POWER COMPANY, GEORGIA POWER COMPANY, SOUTHERN NUCLEAR OPERATING COMPANY, INC.. (Blanton, Melvin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 236 Filed: 4/16/2004, Entered: 4/16/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 235 Filed: 4/7/2004, Entered: 4/9/2004 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER: On or before 5/7/2004, counsel shall file their proposed pretrial schedule(s) so that an appropriate scheduling order may thereafter be issued; and Dft's time to file an answer in this matter is enlarged to and including 5/7/2004. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 234 Filed: 4/7/2004, Entered: 4/9/2004 Order on Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER: [109] Dft's Motion to Dismiss Southern Nuclear Operating Company as a Pltf shall be DENIED, wihtout prejudice to its reassertion pursuant to RCFC 52(c) or in pre-judgment briefing; [8] Pltfs' Motion for Summary Judgment on Contract Liability shall be GRANTED; [18] Dft's Motion to Dismiss shall be DENIED; [99] Dft's Motion to Dismiss Count IV of Pltfs' Complaint, as included in the First Amended Complaint, shall be GRANTED; [100] Dft's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Pltfs' Greater Than Class C Radioactive Wast Arguments shall be DENIED; [104] Dft's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding the Rate of Spent Nuclear Fuel Acceptance and [191] Pltfs' Cross Motion shall both be DENIED; [218] Pltfs' Motion to Strike shall be GRANTED; and Dft's Motion to Dismiss Count Three of the Complaint, also included in the First Amended Complaint, shall be DENIED without prejudice to its renewal pursuant to RCFC 52(c) or in final briefing. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 233 Filed: 2/27/2004, Entered: 3/1/2004 Description not available
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re [191] Cross Motion filed by ALABAMA POWER COMPANY, GEORGIA POWER COMPANY, SOUTHERN NUCLEAR OPERATING COMPANY, INC. regaring the rate of spent nuclear fuel acceptance. Service: 02/23/2004 by hand.(lld, ) Modified on 3/1/2004 (lld, ). (by leave of the judge)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 232 Filed: 2/4/2004, Entered: 2/9/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Firm Registration as an LLP and Name Change by all plaintiffs. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 2/2/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 1/30/2004, Entered: 1/30/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER: The Court hereby DENIES [226] Dft's Second Motion to Renew its Motion toConsolidate as well as its previous motions relating to consolidation. The Court further LIFTS THE STAY of the remainder of the cases to which the Order of 4/16/2003, applied. The Clerk of the Court is directed to docket this Order in this case with an entry noting the same on the dockets of the remaining SNFcases captioned in Dft's instant motion, with a courtesy copy to all SNF parties and presiding SNF judges of the Court. [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT LOCATED IN CASE NO. 98-126C] Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 231 Filed: 12/2/2003, Entered: 12/5/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Counsel for Dft's Change of Telephone and Facsimile Numbers by USA. Service: 12/2/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 230 Filed: 9/10/2003, Entered: 9/12/2003 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Pltfs' Responses to [226] Dft's Second MOTION to the Chief Judge to Renew Consideration of Dft's Motion to Consolidate, filed by USA. Service: 9/3/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 229 Filed: 9/10/2003, Entered: 9/12/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER allowing [228] Dft's Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to [226] Dft's Second MOTION to Renew Its Motion to Consolidate, until 9/3/03. Reply due by 9/3/2003. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 228 Filed: 9/3/2003, Entered: 9/9/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to [227] Pltfs' Responses to Dft's Second Motion to Renew Its Motion to Consolidate, until 9/3/03, by USA.Service: 9/3/03. Response due by 9/22/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 8/26/2003, Entered: 8/28/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to the Chief Judge for Extension of Time to File Reply to [227] Pltfs' Responses to Dft's Motion to Renew Its Motion to Consolidate, until 9/3/03, by USA. [Original document located in Case No. 98-126C]Service: 8/26/03. Response due by 9/12/2003.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 227 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/19/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      OPPOSITION to [226] Dft's Second MOTION to Renew Its Motion to Consolidate filed by ALABAMA POWER COMPANY, GEORGIA POWER COMPANY, SOUTHERN NUCLEAR OPERATING COMPANY, INC. Reply due by 8/26/2003. Service: 8/15/03 by hand.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 8/8/2003, Entered: 8/8/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Set/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 8/15/2003 (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 8/5/2003, Entered: 8/7/2003 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Dft's Motion to the Chief Judge for Leave to Correct Certificate of Service and to Waive Requirements of RCFC 5.3 Regarding "Dft's Second Motion [to the Chief Judge] to Renew its Motion to Consolidate." (Original Motion located in Case No. 98-126C) (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 226 Filed: 7/30/2003, Entered: 7/31/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SECOND MOTION to Renew Its Motion to Consolidate by USA. [COPY] (Original Document in Case No. 98-126C)Service: 7/29/03 by hand. Response due by 8/12/2003.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 225 Filed: 7/7/2003, Entered: 7/8/2003 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of decision in Indiana Michigan Power Co. by ALABAMA POWER COMPANY, GEORGIA POWER COMPANY and SOUTHERN NUCLEAR OPERATING COMPANY, INC., by leave of the Judge. Service by hand: 7/2/03.(dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 224 Filed: 6/18/2003, Entered: 6/20/2003 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Decision in Commonwealth Edison v. United States, No. 98-621C by ALABAMA POWER COMPANY, GEORGIA POWER COMPANY, SOUTHERN NUCLEAR OPERATING COMPANY, INC, Filed by Leave of the Judge. Service: 6/16/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 223 Filed: 5/14/2003, Entered: 5/22/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re [221] MOTION to Lift Stay filed by ALABAMA POWER COMPANY, GEORGIA POWER COMPANY, SOUTHERN NUCLEAR OPERATING COMPANY, INC. Service: 5/14/03 by hand.(hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 222 Filed: 5/7/2003, Entered: 5/9/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to Motion re [221] MOTION to Lift Stay filed by The United States. Reply due by 5/19/2003. Service: 5/7/03.(dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 221 Filed: 4/23/2003, Entered: 4/29/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Lift Stay on further proceedings by ALABAMA POWER COMPANY, GEORGIA POWER COMPANY and SOUTHERN NUCLEAR OPERATING COMPANY, INC..Serviceby hand: 4/23/03. Response due by 5/7/2003. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 220 Filed: 4/16/2003, Entered: 4/25/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 219 Filed: 4/15/2003, Entered: 4/21/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [217] Motion for Extension of Time to File Sur-Reply re [104] Motion for Summary Judgment. Surreplies due by 4/30/2003. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 218 Filed: 4/11/2003, Entered: 4/18/2003 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Strike (pages 1584 - 1599 from the plaintiff's appendix submitted in response to motion for partial summary judgment), by ALABAMA POWER COMPANY, GEORGIA POWER COMPANY, SOUTHERN NUCLEAR OPERATING COMPANY, INC., filed by leave of the Judge.Service: 4/10/03. Response due by 4/28/2003 (hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 217 Filed: 4/11/2003, Entered: 4/17/2003, Terminated: 4/15/2003 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to [191] Cross Motion,until 4/30/03, filed by ALABAMA POWER COMPANY, GEORGIA POWER COMPANY, SOUTHERN NUCLEAR OPERATING COMPANY, INC.. by leave of the Judge Service: 4/10/03. Response due by 4/28/2003 (vro, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 216 Filed: 4/2/2003, Entered: 4/8/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER, re: further proceedings. Signed by Judge Diane G. Sypolt. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 215 Filed: 4/2/2003, Entered: 4/11/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE, together with a separate volume of appendix, to [191] Cross Motion filed by The United States. Reply due by 4/16/2003. Service: 3/28/03.(dls, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 214 Filed: 4/2/2003, Entered: 4/7/2003 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to [189] Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact and [186] Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact filed by The United States. Service: 3/28/03.(dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 213 Filed: 4/2/2003, Entered: 4/7/2003 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [212] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 212 Filed: 3/28/2003, Entered: 4/3/2003, Terminated: 4/2/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit of reply to the motion for partial summary judgment and response to cross-motion for partial summary judgment regarding the rate of spent nuclear fuel acceptance by 39 pages by The United States. Service: 3/28/03. Response due 4/14/2003. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 211 Filed: 3/18/2003, Entered: 3/21/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 210 Filed: 3/13/2003, Entered: 3/13/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Response by USA to [186-1] proposed findings by ALABAMA POWER CO, GEORGIA POWER CO, SOUTHERN NUCLEAR. Service: 3/11/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 209 Filed: 3/12/2003, Entered: 3/13/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY by USA to response to [100-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment. Service: 3/11/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 208 Filed: 3/12/2003, Entered: 3/13/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [207-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 207 Filed: 3/11/2003, Entered: 3/12/2003, Terminated: 3/12/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 3/11/03) For leave to exceed the page limitation . Response due: 3/28/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 206 Filed: 3/11/2003, Entered: 3/12/2003 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Harold D. Lester. Service: 3/11/03 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 205 Filed: 3/7/2003, Entered: 3/10/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER re: See order [612-1] dated 3/7/03, in case 98-126C (signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 204 Filed: 2/25/2003, Entered: 3/4/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 203 Filed: 2/24/2003, Entered: 3/3/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 202 Filed: 2/5/2003, Entered: 2/13/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 201 Filed: 2/4/2003, Entered: 2/13/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [192-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to cross-motion for summary judgment, reply to the motion for summary judgment regarding Greater-Than-Class-C radioactive waste and reply to the motion to dismiss its takings claim . (1) Takings (Count IV) by 1/30/03 ; (2) Greater-than-Class-C radioactive waste by 3/11/03 ; and (3) rate of spent nuclear fuel acceptance by 3/28/03 ( signed Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 200 Filed: 1/31/2003, Entered: 2/12/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 199 Filed: 1/30/2003, Entered: 2/10/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY by USA to response to [107-1] motion to Dismiss Count III of the complaint. Service: 1/30/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 198 Filed: 1/29/2003, Entered: 2/7/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 197 Filed: 1/23/2003, Entered: 1/31/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER - see 98-126 C for order ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 196 Filed: 1/21/2003, Entered: 1/28/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY by USA to response to [192-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to cross-motion for summary judgment, reply to the motion for summary judgment regarding Greater-Than-Class-C radioactive waste and reply to the motion to dismiss its takings claim. Service: 1/21/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 195 Filed: 1/14/2003, Entered: 1/21/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by SOUTHERN NUCLEAR (Service: 1/14/03) to [192-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to cross-motion for summary judgment, reply to the motion for summary judgment regarding Greater-Than-Class-C radioactive waste and reply to the motion to dismiss its takings claim. Reply due: 1/29/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 193 Filed: 1/10/2003, Entered: 1/14/2003 Joint Preliminary Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS REPORT. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 194 Filed: 1/9/2003, Entered: 1/15/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 192 Filed: 1/9/2003, Entered: 1/14/2003, Terminated: 2/4/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service: 1/9/03) to Extend Time to respond to cross-motion for summary judgment, reply to the motion for summary judgment regarding Greater-Than-Class-C radioactive waste and reply to the motion to dismiss its takings claim until ? Response due: 1/21/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 191 Filed: 12/18/2002, Entered: 12/19/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CROSS MOTION by SOUTHERN NUCLEAR, GEORGIA POWER CO, ALABAMA POWER CO (Service by hand: 12/16/02) and RESPONSE to [104-1] motion for Summary Judgment by USA (together with separate four volume appendix). Response due: 1/13/03. (HW) Modified on 12/19/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 190 Filed: 12/18/2002, Entered: 12/19/2002 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted FaCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Response by SOUTHERN NUCLEAR, GEORGIA POWER CO, ALABAMA POWER CO to [103-1] proposed findings by USA, filed by leave of the Judge. Service by hand: 12/16/02 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 189 Filed: 12/18/2002, Entered: 12/19/2002 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted FactCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by SOUTHERN NUCLEAR, GEORGIA POWER CO, ALABAMA POWER CO, filed by leave of the Judge. Service by hand: 12/16/02 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 188 Filed: 12/18/2002, Entered: 12/19/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [183-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 12/18/2002, Entered: 12/19/2002 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Deadline updated; Response to [191-1] cross motion reset to 1/13/03 . (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 187 Filed: 12/16/2002, Entered: 12/18/2002 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fa
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Response by SOUTHERN NUCLEAR, GEORGIA POWER CO, ALABAMA POWER CO to [101-1] proposed findings by USA. Service: 12/16/02 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 186 Filed: 12/16/2002, Entered: 12/18/2002 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by SOUTHERN NUCLEAR, GEORGIA POWER CO, ALABAMA POWER CO. Service: 12/16/02 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 185 Filed: 12/16/2002, Entered: 12/18/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE, together with a separate volume of appendix, by SOUTHERN NUCLEAR, GEORGIA POWER CO, ALABAMA POWER CO (Service: 12/16/02 ) to [100-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment. Reply due: 1/10/03 (JT) Modified on 12/18/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 184 Filed: 12/16/2002, Entered: 12/18/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by SOUTHERN NUCLEAR, GEORGIA POWER CO, ALABAMA POWER CO (Service: 12/16/02 ) to [99-1] motion to Dismiss Count IV of the complaint. Reply due: 1/10/03 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 183 Filed: 12/16/2002, Entered: 12/18/2002, Terminated: 12/18/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by SOUTHERN NUCLEAR (Service: 12/16/02) For leave to exceed the page limitation for the response to the motion for partial summary judgment. Response due: 1/2/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 182 Filed: 11/12/2002, Entered: 11/14/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by SOUTHERN NUCLEAR (Service: 11/12/02) to [178-1] motion requesting an order setting November 25, 2002, as the deadline for plaintiffs to respond to motion for summary judgment. Reply due: 11/26/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 181 Filed: 11/8/2002, Entered: 12/6/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting in part, denying in part [179-1] motion for scheduling conference; and directing parties to file a Joint Preliminary Status Report by 1/10/03 . ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 180 Filed: 11/8/2002, Entered: 12/6/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying [178-1] motion requesting an order setting November 25, 2002, as the deadline for plaintiffs to respond to motion for summary judgment; directing plaintiffs to respond to [100-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment and [104-1] motion for Summary Judgment by 12/16/02 ; and defendant to Reply to Response to [100-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment and [104-1] motion for Summary Judgment by 1/10/03 . (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 179 Filed: 10/30/2002, Entered: 11/1/2002, Terminated: 11/8/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by SOUTHERN NUCLEAR (Service: 10/30/02) for scheduling conference . (FILED WITH STATUS REPORT) Response due: 11/18/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 178 Filed: 10/24/2002, Entered: 10/26/2002, Terminated: 11/8/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 10/24/02 ) requesting an order setting November 25, 2002, as the deadline for plaintiffs to respond to motion for summary judgment . Response due: 11/12/02 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 177 Filed: 10/16/2002, Entered: 10/18/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow for Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 176 Filed: 10/9/2002, Entered: 10/11/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER see 98-126C for Order. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 175 Filed: 10/8/2002, Entered: 10/10/2002 Amended ComplaintCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AMENDED COMPLAINT by SOUTHERN NUCLEAR amending [1-1] complaint. Service: 10/4/02. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 174 Filed: 10/8/2002, Entered: 10/10/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER to file first amendment to the complaint (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 173 Filed: 9/10/2002, Entered: 9/16/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 172 Filed: 9/5/2002, Entered: 9/9/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 171 Filed: 8/22/2002, Entered: 8/27/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 170 Filed: 8/20/2002, Entered: 8/22/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 169 Filed: 8/16/2002, Entered: 8/21/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 168 Filed: 8/5/2002, Entered: 8/7/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 167 Filed: 7/30/2002, Entered: 8/5/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 166 Filed: 7/29/2002, Entered: 8/1/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER re: see order [467-1] dated 7/29/02, in case No. 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 165 Filed: 7/23/2002, Entered: 7/26/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 164 Filed: 7/16/2002, Entered: 7/18/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 163 Filed: 7/15/2002, Entered: 7/17/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 162 Filed: 7/10/2002, Entered: 7/12/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 161 Filed: 7/9/2002, Entered: 7/11/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER - see 98-126C for Order. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 160 Filed: 7/3/2002, Entered: 7/3/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 159 Filed: 7/2/2002, Entered: 7/3/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER-see 98-126C for Order ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 158 Filed: 6/28/2002, Entered: 7/1/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER-see 98-126C for Order ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 157 Filed: 6/18/2002, Entered: 6/19/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C.(signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (VO)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 156 Filed: 6/17/2002, Entered: 6/18/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER, Re: see order in 98-126 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt) Copy to parties. (VO)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 155 Filed: 6/6/2002, Entered: 6/11/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER, re: see order in 98-126, filed 6/6/02. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 154 Filed: 6/3/2002, Entered: 6/4/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER, re: see order in 98-126, filed 6/03/02. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 153 Filed: 5/28/2002, Entered: 5/29/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 152 Filed: 5/20/2002, Entered: 5/21/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 151 Filed: 5/20/2002, Entered: 5/21/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 150 Filed: 5/9/2002, Entered: 5/10/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER re: See [395-1] order in case No. 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 149 Filed: 5/7/2002, Entered: 5/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 148 Filed: 5/7/2002, Entered: 5/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 147 Filed: 5/6/2002, Entered: 5/7/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 146 Filed: 5/3/2002, Entered: 5/3/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir for Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 145 Filed: 4/26/2002, Entered: 4/29/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER, re: see order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 144 Filed: 4/23/2002, Entered: 4/24/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 143 Filed: 4/18/2002, Entered: 4/18/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 142 Filed: 4/11/2002, Entered: 4/11/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER re: see order [344-2] dated 4/11/02 in Case No. 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 141 Filed: 3/25/2002, Entered: 3/26/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER, re: see order in 98-126 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 140 Filed: 3/22/2002, Entered: 3/25/2002 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY by USA to response to [109-1] motion to Dismiss Southern Nuclear Operating Company as a plaintiff for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Service: 3/22/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 139 Filed: 3/19/2002, Entered: 3/20/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER, re: See order in 98-126 (signed by Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir for Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 138 Filed: 3/14/2002, Entered: 3/15/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [136-1] motion to Extend Time to file reply to the Motion to Dismiss Reply to Response to Motion due 3/22/02 for [109-1] motion to Dismiss Southern Nuclear Operating Company as a plaintiff for lack of subject matter jurisdiction (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 137 Filed: 3/13/2002, Entered: 3/14/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [135-1] motion to Withdraw [120-1] motion to lift the Stay on plaintiff's response to motion to dismiss Count IV of the complaint by USA (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 136 Filed: 3/13/2002, Entered: 3/14/2002, Terminated: 3/14/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 3/13/02) to Extend Time to file reply to the Motion to Dismiss until 3/22/02. Response due: 4/1/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 135 Filed: 3/8/2002, Entered: 3/11/2002, Terminated: 3/13/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 3/7/02) to Withdraw [120-1] motion to lift the Stay on plaintiff's response to motion to dismiss Count IV of the complaint by USA . (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 134 Filed: 3/5/2002, Entered: 3/6/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying Motion to preclude or, in the alternative, defer, depositions pursuant to Rule 30(b)(6) (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 133 Filed: 3/1/2002, Entered: 3/4/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [131-1] motion to Extend Time to file reply to response to motion to lift the stay on response to motion to dismiss Reply to Response to Motion due 3/7/02 for [120-1] motion to lift the Stay on plaintiff's response to motion to dismiss Count IV of the complaint (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 132 Filed: 2/28/2002, Entered: 3/1/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting Plaintiff's motion to Extend Time to respond to interrogatories until 3/8/02 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 131 Filed: 2/28/2002, Entered: 3/1/2002, Terminated: 3/1/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 2/28/02) to Extend Time to file reply to response to motion to lift the stay on response to motion to dismiss , (until March 7, 2002). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 130 Filed: 2/27/2002, Entered: 2/28/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 2/27/02) to Extend Time to reply to response to motion to dismiss , (until March 13, 2002). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 129 Filed: 2/27/2002, Entered: 2/28/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER Reply to Response to Motion reset to 3/1/02 for [120-1] motion to lift the Stay on plaintiff's response to motion to dismiss Count IV of the complaint (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 128 Filed: 2/26/2002, Entered: 2/27/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 2/26/02) to Extend Time to file reply to response to motion to lift the stay on response to motion to dismiss Count Four of the Complaint , (until March 1, 2002). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 127 Filed: 2/20/2002, Entered: 2/21/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, re: SEE CASE NO. 98-126 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 126 Filed: 2/14/2002, Entered: 2/15/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by SOUTHERN NUCLEAR, GEORGIA POWER CO, ALABAMA POWER CO (Service by hand: 2/14/02) to [120-1] motion to lift the Stay on plaintiff's response to motion to dismiss Count IV of the complaint. Reply due: 2/26/02. (FE) Modified on 02/15/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 125 Filed: 2/13/2002, Entered: 2/14/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER, re: see order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 124 Filed: 2/7/2002, Entered: 2/8/2002 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service: 2/6/02) to Extend Time to reply to response to motion to dismiss , (until February 27, 2002). Response due: 2/25/02. [by leave of the Judge] (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 123 Filed: 2/1/2002, Entered: 2/4/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER denying motion to reconsider filed 1/22/02 and granting the motion to revise dates in 9/26/01 order filed 1/24/02 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 122 Filed: 2/1/2002, Entered: 2/4/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER. See order in 98-126C filed 2/1/02. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 121 Filed: 1/29/2002, Entered: 1/29/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER setting Status Conference for 2:00 p.m. on 2/12/02 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 120 Filed: 1/28/2002, Entered: 1/29/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 1/28/02) to lift the Stay on plaintiff's response to motion to dismiss Count IV of the complaint . Response due: 2/14/02. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 119 Filed: 1/24/2002, Entered: 1/24/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by SOUTHERN NUCLEAR, GEORGIA POWER COMPAN, ALABAMA POWER COMPAN (Service by hand: 1/23/02) to [109-1] motion to Dismiss Southern Nuclear Operating Company as a plaintiff for lack of subject matter jurisdiction, by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 2/1/02. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 118 Filed: 1/24/2002, Entered: 1/24/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [117-1] motion to Withdraw [110-1] motion to stay proceedings on defendant's motion to dismiss by ALABAMA POWER COMPAN, GEORGIA POWER COMPAN, SOUTHERN NUCLEAR ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 117 Filed: 1/23/2002, Entered: 1/24/2002, Terminated: 1/24/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by SOUTHERN NUCLEAR, GEORGIA POWER COMPAN, ALABAMA POWER COMPAN (Service by hand: 1/23/02) to Withdraw [110-1] motion to stay proceedings on defendant's motion to dismiss by ALABAMA POWER COMPAN, GEORGIA POWER COMPAN, SOUTHERN NUCLEAR . Response due: 2/4/02. (FE) Modified on 01/24/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 116 Filed: 1/23/2002, Entered: 1/24/2002 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY by USA to response to [107-1] motion to Dismiss Count III of the complaint. Service: 1/23/02. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 115 Filed: 1/16/2002, Entered: 1/17/2002 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by SOUTHERN NUCLEAR (Service: 1/15/02) to [107-1] motion to Dismiss Count III of the complaint. Reply due: 1/30/02. FIled by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 114 Filed: 1/16/2002, Entered: 1/17/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER lifing stay set by the order filed 12/17/01, directing the Clerk's Office to file Plaintiff's response to the Motion to Dismiss Count III of the complaint and granting leave for Defendant to file a reply to Plaintiff's response if one is considered necessary (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 113 Filed: 1/11/2002, Entered: 1/14/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER see order in 98-126C filed 1/11/02. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 112 Filed: 1/11/2002, Entered: 1/11/2002, Terminated: 1/16/2002 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 1/11/02) to lift stay on Plaintiffs' response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Count III of complaint . Response due: 1/28/02. (FILED WITH RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR A STAY OF PROCEEDINGS ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION). (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 112 Filed: 1/11/2002, Entered: 1/11/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by USA (Service: 1/11/02 ) to [110-1] motion to stay proceedings on defendant's motion to dismiss. Reply due: 1/28/02. (FILED WITH MOTION TO LIFT STAY ON PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTOIN TO DISMISS COUNT THREE OF COMPLAINT). (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 110 Filed: 1/4/2002, Entered: 1/7/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by SOUTHERN NUCLEAR, GEORGIA POWER COMPANY, ALABAMA POWER COMPANY (Service by hand: 1/4/02) to stay proceedings on defendant's motion to dismiss . Response due: 1/18/02 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 111 Filed: 1/3/2002, Entered: 1/7/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER see order in 98-126C filed 01/03/02 ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 109 Filed: 12/21/2001, Entered: 12/27/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service: 12/21/01) to Dismiss Southern Nuclear Operating Company as a plaintiff for lack of subject matter jurisdiction . Response due: 1/21/02. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 108 Filed: 12/17/2001, Entered: 12/18/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER denying [105-1] motion for a status conference ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 107 Filed: 12/14/2001, Entered: 12/17/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 12/13/01) to Dismiss Count III of the complaint for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. Response due: 1/14/02 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 105 Filed: 12/6/2001, Entered: 12/7/2001, Terminated: 12/17/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by SOUTHERN NUCLEAR, GEORGIA POWER COMPAN and ALABAMA POWER COMPAN (Service by hand: 12/6/01) for a status conference . Response due: 12/20/01. (FE) Modified on 12/07/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 106 Filed: 12/3/2001, Entered: 12/11/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [102-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation in the Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding the Rate of Spent Nuclear Fuel Acceptance ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 104 Filed: 12/3/2001, Entered: 12/4/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 11/28/01) for Summary Judgment , regarding the rate of spent nuclear fuel acceptance, (with separate appendix). Response due: 12/31/01. (HW) Modified on 12/07/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 103 Filed: 12/3/2001, Entered: 12/4/2001 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA. Service: 11/28/01. (HW) Modified on 12/07/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 102 Filed: 11/29/2001, Entered: 11/30/2001, Terminated: 12/3/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 11/28/01) For leave to exceed the page limitation . Response due: 12/17/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 101 Filed: 11/28/2001, Entered: 11/30/2001 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA. Service by hand: 11/27/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 100 Filed: 11/28/2001, Entered: 11/30/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION, with one volume of Appendix, by USA (Service by hand: 11/27/01) for partial Summary Judgment . Response due: 12/26/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 99 Filed: 11/27/2001, Entered: 11/29/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 11/27/01) to Dismiss Count IV of the complaint . Response due: 12/28/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 98 Filed: 11/20/2001, Entered: 11/21/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER see order in 98-126C filed 11/20/01 ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 97 Filed: 11/16/2001, Entered: 11/19/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER see order 98-126C filed 11/16/01. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 96 Filed: 11/14/2001, Entered: 11/16/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER see order in 98-126C filed 11/14/01. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 95 Filed: 11/14/2001, Entered: 11/16/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER see order in 98-126C filed 11/14/01. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 94 Filed: 11/8/2001, Entered: 11/9/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER. See 98-126C. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 93 Filed: 11/8/2001, Entered: 11/9/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER. See 98-126C. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 92 Filed: 11/7/2001, Entered: 11/8/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER. See 98-126 C ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 91 Filed: 11/6/2001, Entered: 11/7/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting motion to enlarge time to respond to motion to compel production of documents to 11/06/01 ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 90 Filed: 11/6/2001, Entered: 11/7/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER re: Public Service Electric and Gas motion to extend time filed on 11/2/01, within which to respond to defendant's motion to compel is GRANTED (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein) Copy to parties. (see motion filed in 98-126C) (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 89 Filed: 11/6/2001, Entered: 11/7/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting motion to enlarge time to complete production of documents to 11/19/01 ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 88 Filed: 11/1/2001, Entered: 11/5/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying [78-1] motion for Clarification of the Court's 9/26/01 order. Individual Judges retain the right to decide dispositive motions. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 87 Filed: 10/30/2001, Entered: 11/1/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER re: proposed stipulated order, etc. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 86 Filed: 10/29/2001, Entered: 10/31/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [79-1] motion for Leave to file copies of the Motion to Transfer Responsibility, etc. and granting Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to file copies of response to the transfer motion (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 85 Filed: 10/19/2001, Entered: 10/23/2001 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of supplemental certificate of service by USA. Service: 10/19/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 84 Filed: 10/19/2001, Entered: 10/23/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 10/19/01) to Compel . Response due: 11/5/01. (Filed with response to third party objections). (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 84 Filed: 10/19/2001, Entered: 10/23/2001 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by USA to third party objections. Service: 10/19/01. (Filed with Motion to Compel). (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 82 Filed: 10/19/2001, Entered: 10/22/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER re: All filings shall bear the name of the discovery Judge, all matters to be brought to the attention of the Court shall be filed with the discovery Judge only, the Clerk of the Court is directed not to accept for filing any motion by a party in one of the captioned cases for leave to file material with a Judge in an individual case ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 83 Filed: 10/18/2001, Entered: 10/23/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 10/16/01) to Compel . Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 11/2/01. (Filed with response to third party objections). (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 83 Filed: 10/18/2001, Entered: 10/23/2001 ResponseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by USA to third party objections. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 10/16/01. (Filed with Motion to Compel). (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 81 Filed: 10/18/2001, Entered: 10/19/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER directing the Clerk's Office to file Defendant's response and Defendant's corrected certificate of service due 10/25/01 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 80 Filed: 10/17/2001, Entered: 10/18/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER re: Defendant's motion to extend time filed on 10/15/01, within which to file the proposed stipulated order concerning the scheduling and conduct of depositions in the coordinated discovery proceeding, is GRANTED, see motion in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 79 Filed: 10/11/2001, Entered: 10/15/2001, Terminated: 10/29/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service: 10/10/01) for Leave to file copies of the Motion to Transfer Responsibility, etc. Response due: 10/29/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 78 Filed: 10/9/2001, Entered: 10/10/2001, Terminated: 11/1/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by SOUTHERN NUCLEAR (Service by hand: 10/9/01) for Clarification of the Court's 9/26/01 order . Response due: 10/23/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 77 Filed: 10/9/2001, Entered: 10/10/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by SOUTHERN NUCLEAR, GEORGIA POWER COMPAN, ALABAMA POWER COMPAN (Service: 10/9/01) for Leave to to file papers that the utility plaintiffs have filed with the discovery Judge . Response due: 10/26/01. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 76 Filed: 10/3/2001, Entered: 10/4/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [75-1] motion to Extend Time to submit a plan for production of e-mail messages Plan to be filed by 10/22/01 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 75 Filed: 10/3/2001, Entered: 10/4/2001, Terminated: 10/3/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 10/1/01) to Extend Time to submit a plan for production of e-mail messages until 10/22/01. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 74 Filed: 9/26/2001, Entered: 9/26/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER re: The Joint Motion for an Order for Consolidated Discovery filed on 7/10/01, is granted, with the exception of document production, the parties are granted an enlargement of time until 10/1/01, to submit a plan addressing the production of e-mail messages (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 73 Filed: 9/13/2001, Entered: 9/13/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER setting Status Conference for 4:00 p.m. on 9/20/01 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 72 Filed: 8/22/2001, Entered: 8/22/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting motion for protective order in the form provided by Exhibit A of the parties 08/10/01 motion (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). See case number 98-126 C for motion. Protective order in 98-458 C is also granted, subject to reconsideration by assigned judge. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 71 Filed: 8/17/2001, Entered: 8/20/2001 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE (supplemental brief in support of the entry of summary judgment against defendant liability for partial breach of contract) by SOUTHERN NUCLEAR, GEORGIA POWER COMPAN, ALABAMA POWER COMPAN pursuant to [67-2] order. Service: 8/17/01 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 70 Filed: 8/17/2001, Entered: 8/20/2001 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by USA to [67-2] order. Service: 8/17/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 69 Filed: 8/15/2001, Entered: 8/16/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER setting Status Conference for 2:00 p.m. on 9/11/01 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein, Discovery Judge). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 68 Filed: 7/26/2001, Entered: 7/26/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER denying as moot [44-1] motion to adopt coordinated discovery schedule., and denying as moot [40-1] motion to Stay. (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 67 Filed: 7/24/2001, Entered: 7/24/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER lifting the stay entered on 6/28/99, designating Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein as presiding judge during the discovery phase and Supplemental Briefs, not exceeding 15 pagesl, are due on 8/17/01 (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 66 Filed: 7/11/2001, Entered: 7/13/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 7/11/01) for entry of Protective Order and stipulated order governing review of the Dept. of Energy's electronic "Record Information System" database and for Leave to file a copy of the parties "Joint Motion for an order coordinating discovery" . Response due: 7/30/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 65 Filed: 7/11/2001, Entered: 7/12/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by SOUTHERN NUCLEAR, GEORGIA POWER COMPAN, ALABAMA POWER COMPANY (Service: 7/11/01) for Leave to file Proposed Liablity Order Response due: 7/25/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 64 Filed: 7/5/2001, Entered: 7/6/2001 RemarkCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Copy of Yankee Atomic's Motion for Leave to file documents relevant to the telephone conference with Judge Wiese. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 63 Filed: 5/31/2001, Entered: 6/1/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER resetting Status Conference for 2:30 p.m. on 6/14/01 (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 62 Filed: 5/29/2001, Entered: 5/30/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER scheduling Status Conference for 10:30 a.m., 6/14/01 ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 61 Filed: 5/22/2001, Entered: 5/25/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER: On 1/8/2001, Dft filed a [50-1] Motion to the Chief Judge to reassign to a single judge cases involving alleged breaches of the standard contract published at 10 C.F.R. Part 961. The Chief Judge hereby designates Judge Wiese as the managing judge in the above cited cases for the purpose of meeting with the parties to consider whether consolidation or other joint handling of discovery or other pre-trial matters is appropriate. Judge Wiese is requested to formulate a management plan, if one is appropriate, and is authorized to make appropriate rulings with respect to this purpose. (signed by Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir). Judge Wiese is managing judge. Copy to parties. (LTD) Modified on 3/17/2004 (jcp, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 60 Filed: 2/21/2001, Entered: 2/23/2001 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY by USA to response to [50-1] motion to the Chief Judge to reassign to a single judge cases involving alleged breaches of the standard contract published at 10 C.F.R. Part 961. Service: 2/16/01 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 59 Filed: 2/21/2001, Entered: 2/23/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [58-1] motion for Leave to file a copy of the reply to the opposition to the motion to the Chief Judge to reassign to a single Judge cases involving alleged breaches of the standard contract, etc. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 58 Filed: 2/20/2001, Entered: 2/22/2001, Terminated: 2/21/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 2/20/01) for Leave to file a copy of the reply to the opposition to the motion to the Chief Judge to reassign to a single Judge cases involving alleged breaches of the standard contract, etc. . Response due: 3/9/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 57 Filed: 2/2/2001, Entered: 2/5/2001 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by SOUTHERN NUCLEAR, GEORGIA POWER COMPAN, ALABAMA POWER COMPAN (Service by hand: 1/29/01) to [50-1] motion to the Chief Judge to reassign to a single judge cases involving alleged breaches of the standard contract published at 10 C.F.R. Part 961. Reply due: 2/7/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 56 Filed: 2/2/2001, Entered: 2/5/2001 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        YANKEE UTILITIES OPPOSITION [No. 98-126C] re: [50-1] motion to the Chief Judge to reassign to a single judge cases involving alleged breaches of the standard contract published at 10 C.F.R. Part 961 by USA. Service: 1/29/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 55 Filed: 2/2/2001, Entered: 2/5/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [54-1] motion for Leave to file copies of two memoranda in opposition to the USA's motion to the Chief Judge to reassign to a single fourteen pending standard contract cases (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 54 Filed: 1/31/2001, Entered: 2/1/2001, Terminated: 2/2/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by SOUTHERN NUCLEAR, GEORGIA POWER COMPAN and ALABAMA POWER COMPAN (Service by hand: 1/31/01) for Leave to file copies of two memoranda in opposition to the USA's motion to the Chief Judge to reassign to a single fourteen pending standard contract cases . (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 53 Filed: 1/29/2001, Entered: 1/30/2001 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              See 30-1 Response to motion filed January 29, 2001, in 98-483C Florida Power & Light Company. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 52 Filed: 1/22/2001, Entered: 1/23/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by SOUTHERN NUCLEAR, GEORGIA POWER COMPAN and ALABAMA POWER COMPAN (Service by hand: 1/22/01) to Extend Time to respond to the USA's motion to the Chief Judge to reassign cases to a single Judge , (until January 29, 2001). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 51 Filed: 1/16/2001, Entered: 1/17/2001 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY by SOUTHERN NUCLEAR to response to [44-1] motion to adopt coordinated discovery schedule. Service: 1/2/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 50 Filed: 1/9/2001, Entered: 1/10/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 1/9/01) to the Chief Judge to reassign to a single judge cases involving alleged breaches of the standard contract published at 10 C.F.R. Part 961 . Response due: 1/26/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 49 Filed: 1/9/2001, Entered: 1/10/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [48-1] motion for Leave to file a copy of the motion to reassign to a single judge cases involving alleged breaches of the standard contract, etc. (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 48 Filed: 1/8/2001, Entered: 1/9/2001, Terminated: 1/9/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 1/8/01 ) for Leave to file a copy of the motion to reassign to a single judge cases involving alleged breaches of the standard contract, etc. Response due: 1/25/01. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 47 Filed: 1/5/2001, Entered: 1/8/2001 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY by USA to response to [40-1] motion to Stay. Service: 1/5/01. [2 of 2] (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 47 Filed: 1/5/2001, Entered: 1/8/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by USA (Service: 1/5/01 ) to [45-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to motion to adopt a coordinated discovery schedule. Reply due: 1/17/01. [1 of 2] (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 46 Filed: 1/3/2001, Entered: 1/4/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [45-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to motion to adopt a coordinated discovery schedule Response to [44-1] motion to adopt coordinated discovery schedule. reset to 1/5/01 ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 45 Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: 1/3/2001, Terminated: 1/3/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 1/2/01 ) to Extend Time to respond to motion to adopt a coordinated discovery schedule (to January 5, 2001). Response due: 1/19/01 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 44 Filed: 12/18/2000, Entered: 12/20/2000, Terminated: 7/26/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by SOUTHERN NUCLEAR (Service : 12/18/00 (by hand)) to adopt coordinated discovery schedule. Response due: 1/2/01 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 43 Filed: 11/14/2000, Entered: 11/16/2000 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by SOUTHERN NUCLEAR, et al. (Service by hand: 11/14/00 ) to [40-1] motion to Stay. Reply due: 11/27/00 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 42 Filed: 11/13/2000, Entered: 11/14/2000 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by William Lloyd Olsen Service : 11/13/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 41 Filed: 10/31/2000, Entered: 11/2/2000 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Harold Dewitt Lester Jr. Service : 10/31/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 40 Filed: 10/31/2000, Entered: 11/2/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 10/31/00 ) to Stay. Response due: 11/17/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 39 Filed: 10/2/2000, Entered: 10/5/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [37-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the Court's order by 10/31/00 (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 37 Filed: 9/29/2000, Entered: 10/3/2000, Terminated: 10/2/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 9/29/00) to Extend Time to respond to the Court's order until 10/31/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 38 Filed: 9/28/2000, Entered: 10/3/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by SOUTHERN NUCLEAR, GEORGIA POWER COMPAN, ALABAMA POWER COMPAN (Service : 9/28/00 (by hand)) to notify the Court of the Federal Circuit's decisions in Northern States Power and Maine Yankee Atomic Power. Response due: 10/12/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 36 Filed: 6/28/1999, Entered: 6/29/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER deferring resolution of the parties' dispositive motions and staying proceedings until the C.A.F.C. issues its decision in "Northern States" , and directing parties to file a supplemental brief within 30 days of the Federal Circuit's decision. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 35 Filed: 5/17/1999, Entered: 5/19/1999 ResponseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by SOUTHERN NUCLEAR, GEORGIA POWER COMPAN, ALABAMA POWER COMPAN to [32-1] response by USA. Filed by leave of the Judge. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 34 Filed: 5/17/1999, Entered: 5/19/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [33-1] motion for Leave to file reply to response to notice of recent developement. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 33 Filed: 5/14/1999, Entered: 5/18/1999, Terminated: 5/17/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by SOUTHERN NUCLEAR, GEORGIA POWER COMPAN and ALABAMA POWER COMPAN (Service: 5/14/99) for Leave to file reply to response to notice of recent developement . Response due: 5/28/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 32 Filed: 5/13/1999, Entered: 5/17/1999 ResponseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CORRECTED COPY - RESPONSE by USA to [25-1] notice by ALABAMA POWER COMPAN, GEORGIA POWER COMPAN, SOUTHERN NUCLEAR. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 5/12/99 (JT) Modified on 05/17/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 31 Filed: 5/13/1999, Entered: 5/17/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [30-1] motion for Leave to file corrected copy of response to notice of recent development. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 30 Filed: 5/12/1999, Entered: 5/17/1999, Terminated: 5/13/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 5/12/99) for Leave to file corrected copy of response to notice of recent development . Response due: 6/1/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 29 Filed: 5/7/1999, Entered: 5/11/1999 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by USA to [25-1] notice by ALABAMA POWER COMPAN, GEORGIA POWER COMPAN, SOUTHERN NUCLEAR. Service: 5/7/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 28 Filed: 5/7/1999, Entered: 5/10/1999 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by SOUTHERN NUCLEAR, GEORGIA POWER COMPAN and ALABAMA POWER COMPAN (Service: 5/6/99) to [26-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to Plaintiffs' notice of recent development, by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 5/20/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 27 Filed: 5/3/1999, Entered: 5/5/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [26-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to Plaintiffs' notice of recent development. Reset Notice of Compliance deadline to 5/7/99 for Defendant to respond to Plaintiffs' notice of recent development. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 26 Filed: 4/30/1999, Entered: 5/3/1999, Terminated: 5/3/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 4/30/99 ) to Extend Time to respond to Plaintiffs' notice of recent development [until May 7, 1999]. Response due: 5/17/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 25 Filed: 4/14/1999, Entered: 4/21/1999 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Recent Development by SOUTHERN NUCLEAR, GEORGIA POWER COMPAN, ALABAMA POWER COMPAN. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 4/13/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 24 Filed: 4/14/1999, Entered: 4/21/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER filing by leave of the Court Plaintiffs' notice of recent development. Set Defendant's response to Plaintiffs' notice to 4/30/99. Defendant's response is not to exceed 10 pages. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 04/21/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 23 Filed: 2/16/1999, Entered: 2/18/1999 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY by USA to response to [18-1] motion to Dismiss. Service: 2/16/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 22 Filed: 1/25/1999, Entered: 1/28/1999 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by SOUTHERN NUCLEAR, GEORGIA POWER COMPAN, ALABAMA POWER COMPAN. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 1/22/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 21 Filed: 1/25/1999, Entered: 1/26/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [20-1] motion to Extend Time to reply to Plaintiffs' response to motion to dismiss Reply to Response to Motion reset to 2/16/99 for [18-1] motion to Dismiss. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 20 Filed: 1/22/1999, Entered: 1/25/1999, Terminated: 1/25/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 1/22/99 ) to Extend Time to reply to Plaintiffs' response to motion to dismiss [until February 16, 1999]. Response due: 2/8/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 19 Filed: 1/19/1999, Entered: 1/21/1999 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY by SOUTHERN NUCLEAR, GEORGIA POWER COMPAN, ALABAMA POWER COMPAN to response to [8-1] motion for Summary Judgment. Service: 1/19/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 19 Filed: 1/19/1999, Entered: 1/21/1999 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by SOUTHERN NUCLEAR, GEORGIA POWER COMPAN, ALABAMA POWER COMPAN (Service: 1/19/99) to [18-1] motion to Dismiss. Reply due: 2/2/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 18 Filed: 12/22/1998, Entered: 12/22/1998 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by USA (Service: 12/18/98 ) to [8-1] motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 1/19/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 18 Filed: 12/22/1998, Entered: 12/22/1998, Terminated: 4/7/2004 Description not availableCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 12/18/98 ) to Dismiss. Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 1/19/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 17 Filed: 12/22/1998, Entered: 12/22/1998 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by USA. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 12/18/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 16 Filed: 12/14/1998, Entered: 12/15/1998 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Significant Development by SOUTHERN NUCLEAR, GEORGIA POWER COMPAN, ALABAMA POWER COMPAN. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 12/11/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 15 Filed: 12/8/1998, Entered: 12/10/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [14-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to Motion for Summary Judgment Response to [8-1] motion for Summary Judgment reset to 12/18/98 ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 14 Filed: 12/4/1998, Entered: 12/8/1998, Terminated: 12/8/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 12/4/98) to Extend Time to respond to Motion for Summary Judgment until 12/18/98. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 13 Filed: 11/6/1998, Entered: 11/10/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying as moot [12-1] motion to for an order to show cause or, in the alternative, to lift the stay on the briefing schedule for motion for summary judgment. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 11/10/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 12 Filed: 11/5/1998, Entered: 11/9/1998, Terminated: 11/6/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by SOUTHERN NUCLEAR, GEORGIA POWER COMPAN, ALABAMA POWER COMPAN (Service by hand : 11/5/98 ) to Show Cause why motion for summary judgment on liability should not be granted, or, in the alternative, to lift the stay on the briefing schedule for motion for summary judgment . Response due: 11/23/98. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 11 Filed: 11/4/1998, Entered: 11/6/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER denying [4-1] motion to Stay all proceedings. Defendant's response to [8-1] motion for Summary Judgment reset to 12/4/98. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 10 Filed: 10/9/1998, Entered: 10/14/1998 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY by USA to response to [4-1] motion to Stay all proceedings. Service: 10/9/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 9 Filed: 10/2/1998, Entered: 10/6/1998 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted FactCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by SOUTHERN NUCLEAR, GEORGIA POWER COMPAN, ALABAMA POWER COMPAN, filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 9/30/98. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 8 Filed: 10/2/1998, Entered: 10/6/1998 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by SOUTHERN NUCLEAR, GEORGIA POWER COMPAN, ALABAMA POWER COMPAN (Service by hand: 9/30/98) for Summary Judgment , (on Contract Liability), filed by leave of the Judge. Filed together with separate two volume appendix. Response due: 10/30/98. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 7 Filed: 10/2/1998, Entered: 10/6/1998 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by SOUTHERN NUCLEAR, GEORGIA POWER COMPAN, ALABAMA POWER COMPAN (Service hand: 9/30/98) to [4-1] motion to Stay all proceedings, filed by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 10/9/98. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 6 Filed: 10/2/1998, Entered: 10/6/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER re: (1) Plaintiff's response to motion to stay, etc., and its dispositive motionon contract liability shall be file by leave of the Judge; and (2) Defendant's time to rspond to the dispositive motion shall be stayed pending a ruling on the prior motion to stay proceedings file 9/23/98 ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 9/23/1998, Entered: 9/24/1998, Terminated: 11/4/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 9/23/98 ) to Stay all proceedings , (until decisions have been issued upon the depending dispositive motions). Response due: 10/13/98. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 5 Filed: 9/22/1998, Entered: 9/25/1998 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Terry Mitchell Petrie. Service : 9/22/98. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 3 Filed: 8/10/1998, Entered: 8/11/1998 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Joseph Andrew Kijewski. Service : 8/10/98 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 2 Filed: 7/29/1998, Entered: 7/29/1998 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of assignment to Judge James F. Merow. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 7/29/1998, Entered: 7/29/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT (Filed with Exhibits 1 through 6), FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #045888. Answer due on 9/28/98. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 154 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?