COMMONWEALTH EDISON v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:98-cv-00621-ECH
District Judge Emily C. Hewitt, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Commonwealth Edison Company, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Andrew Handzo +1 202 639 6000 +1 202 639 6066 dhandzo@jenner.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Harold Dewitt Lester, Jr. +1 202 616 0478 +1 202 307 2503 harv.lester@usdoj.gov
No Logo Exelon Generation Company, LLC, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Andrew Handzo +1 202 639 6000 +1 202 639 6066 dhandzo@jenner.com
Office COFC
Filed 7/30/1998
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 536 - Spent Nuclear Fuel
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County None
Terminated 8/9/2004
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
198-cv-00621-ECH None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, ECF, LEAD, SNF
  Entries (381) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 350 Filed: 4/18/2007, Entered: 4/18/2007 Court Filing
ORDER Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (ef2)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 8/25/2004, Entered: 8/25/2004
    Data Quality Correction re: [349] Stipulation of Dismissal. The motion for voluntary dismissal as filed by plaintiff has been deleted and re-entered correctly as a stipulation for dismissal. (dls)
      LREF
      Legal Document 349 Filed: 8/9/2004, Entered: 8/25/2004 Stipulation of Dismissal
      STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice filed by all parties (in this and 04-103C). Complaints dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(ii) this day. (dls) Modified on 8/25/2004 to included consolidated case number. (dls).
        LREF
        Legal Document 348 Filed: 6/29/2004, Entered: 6/29/2004 Court Filing
        ORDER granting [347] Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to [340] Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Plaintiffs' Recovery Of Future or Prospective Damages. Response due by 7/20/2004. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (la1)
          LREF
          Legal Document 347 Filed: 6/28/2004, Entered: 6/28/2004, Terminated: 6/29/2004 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
          MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to [340] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Plaintiff's Recovery Of Future Or Prospective Damages by COMMONWEALTH EDISON COMPANY. Response due by 7/15/2004 (Tompkins, Christopher) Modified on 6/29/2004 for clarity (dw1).
            LREF
            Legal Document 346 Filed: 6/15/2004, Entered: 6/21/2004 Supplemental BriefCourt Filing
            SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF by HOLTEC INTERNATIONAL. Filed by leave of the Judge. (jat, )
              LREF
              Legal Document 345 Filed: 6/15/2004, Entered: 6/15/2004
              RESPONSE to Holtec International's Supplemental Brief, pursuant to the Court's June 1, 2004 order filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) # (2))(Lester, Harold)
                LREF
                Legal Document 344 Filed: 6/15/2004, Entered: 6/15/2004
                RESPONSE to [338] Scheduling Order, regarding supplemental briefing on Defendant's Motion to Compel Production of Documents filed by COMMONWEALTH EDISON COMPANY. (Tompkins, Christopher)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 343 Filed: 6/15/2004, Entered: 6/15/2004 Court Filing
                  ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court fo file Supplemental Brief of Non-Party, Holtec International notwithstanding the defects in Holtec's filing. Holtec shall file a certificate of service with the court on or before Friday, 6/25/2004. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (la1)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 342 Filed: 6/4/2004, Entered: 6/4/2004 Court Filing
                    ORDER granting [320] Defendant's Motion to Lift the Seal on [314] Defendant's Reply to Exelon's Response to Defendant's Motion for Supplemental Fact Discovery (Defendant's Reply). The court's order of May 12, 2004, directing recipients of Defendant's Reply to destroy all electronic and paper copies of the filing and to file a certificate of compliance with the court, is vacated. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (la1)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 341 Filed: 6/2/2004, Entered: 6/2/2004
                      PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact Relating To Defendant's Motion For Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Plaintiff's Recovery Of Future Or Prospective Damages by USA. (Lester, Harold)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 340 Filed: 6/2/2004, Entered: 6/2/2004, Terminated: 8/9/2004 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
                        MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Plaintiff's Recovery Of Future Or Prospective Damages by USA. Response due by 7/6/2004 (Attachments: # (1))(Lester, Harold)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 6/2/2004, Entered: 6/2/2004
                          Set Deadlines/Hearings: Reply due by 6/14/2004. (dw1)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 6/2/2004, Entered: 6/2/2004
                            Set Deadlines/Hearings: Plaintiff and Defendant's Response due by 6/15/2004. (dw1)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 339 Filed: 6/1/2004, Entered: 6/1/2004
                              RESPONSE to [320] MOTION to Unseal Document [314] Reply to Response to Motion, filed by USA filed by COMMONWEALTH EDISON COMPANY. Reply due by 6/15/2004. (Tompkins, Christopher)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 338 Filed: 6/1/2004, Entered: 6/1/2004 Court Filing
                                SCHEDULING ORDER: Holtec International and the parties shall submit supplemental briefing on [288] Defendant's Motion to Compel Production of Documents from Holtec International. Holtec shall file a brief with the court on or before Tuesday, 6/8/2004. Plaintiff and defendant shall respond to Holtec's brief on or before Tuesday, 6/15/2004. See order for details regarding the issues Holtec and the parties shall address in their briefs. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (la1)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 337 Filed: 5/26/2004, Entered: 5/26/2004 Court Filing
                                  ORDER granting [332] Motion to Amend the Court's May 12, 2004 Order. The court hereby amends its [318] order of 5/12/04 by deleting fcano@jenner.com from the list of persons to whom the order is directed. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (la1)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 332 Filed: 5/25/2004, Entered: 5/25/2004, Terminated: 5/26/2004 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                    MOTION to Amend/Correct [318] Order,,,, by COMMONWEALTH EDISON COMPANY. Response due by 6/11/2004 (Tompkins, Christopher)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 336 Filed: 5/24/2004, Entered: 5/25/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                      CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE Pursuant to the Court's Order of 5/12/2004 by TIMOTHY R. MACDONALD. Service: 5/24/2004.(jcp, )
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 335 Filed: 5/24/2004, Entered: 5/25/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                        CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE Pursuant to the Court's Order of 5/12/2004 by JONATHAN FIEDLER. Service: 5/24/2004.(jcp, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/25/2004 (jcp, ).
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 334 Filed: 5/24/2004, Entered: 5/25/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                          CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE Pursuant to the Court's Order of 5/12/2004 by MONICA A. FREAS. (jcp, )
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 333 Filed: 5/24/2004, Entered: 5/25/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                            CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE Pursuant to the Court's 5/12/2004 by DANIEL P. GOLDEN. Service: 5/24/2004.(jcp, )
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 331 Filed: 5/21/2004, Entered: 5/21/2004
                                              NOTICE by DON CARNEY Certificate of Compliance (Carney, Donald)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 330 Filed: 5/20/2004, Entered: 5/21/2004 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings in One Volume held on 5/19/2004 before Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (jcp, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 327 Filed: 5/20/2004, Entered: 5/20/2004 Court Filing
                                                  ORDER granting [323] motion for expedited consideration of defendant's motions. Order finding as moot [323] motion seeking an order requiring plaintiff to complete production of all expert materials by a date certain and to identify expected testimony regarding seventeen identified expert witnesses. At the May 19, 2004 hearing, plaintiff agreed to provide defendant with a revised list of "the data or other information considered by" Mr. Emmert in preparing his expert report, see RCFC 26(a)(2)(B), and with supplemental disclosures regarding the seventeen witnesses, indicating areas of testimony that may fall within Federal Rule of Evidence 702, on or before Friday, 5/28/04. Order granting [323] motion for an enlargement of time to complete expert discovery and amending [291] scheduling order. Expert discovery shall be completed on or before Friday, 8/27/04. Pl.'s expert report(s) shall be submitted on or before Thursday, 4/15/04 and def.'s responsive expert report(s) shall be submitted on or before Thursday, 7/15/04. Pl.'s rebuttal expert report(s) shall be submitted on or before Friday, 8/13/04. Pl. shall file any motions regarding supplemental fact discovery on or before Monday, 7/26/04. Def.'s response shall be filed on or before Monday, 8/2/04 and pl.'s reply shall be filed on or before Monday, 8/9/04. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (la1)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 329 Filed: 5/19/2004, Entered: 5/20/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                    CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE by Daniel Herzfeld, per Order of 5/12/2004. Service: 5/19/2004.(jcp, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank -- Filed: 5/19/2004, Entered: 5/19/2004
                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Emily C. Hewitt : Telephonic hearing held on 5/19/04. (la1, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 5/19/2004, Entered: 5/19/2004
                                                        Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 5/20/2004. (vp1, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank -- Filed: 5/19/2004, Entered: 5/19/2004
                                                          Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 5/17/2004. (vp1, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 328 Filed: 5/18/2004, Entered: 5/20/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                            APPENDIX by COMMONWEALTH EDISON COMPANY in Support of [325] Pltfs' Response to Dft's Motion for Postponement of Expert Disclosure Deadline and Other Relief. [FILED UNDER SEAL] (jcp, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/25/2004 (jcp, ).
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 325 Filed: 5/18/2004, Entered: 5/18/2004
                                                              RESPONSE to [323] MOTION to Expedite MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery,until 8/2/2004, MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery,until 8/2/2004, MOTION Seeking an Order Requiring Pltf to Complete Production of All Expert Materials by a Date Certain and to Identify Expected Testimony Regarding 17 Identified Expert Witnesses MOTION Seeking an Order Requiring Pltf to Complete Production of All Expert Materials by a Date Certain and to Identify Expected Testimony Regarding 17 Identified Expert Witnesses filed by COMMONWEALTH EDISON COMPANY. Reply due by 6/1/2004. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Filed Under Seal)(Tompkins, Christopher)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 324 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: 5/17/2004 Court Filing
                                                                ORDER GRANTING [309] Defendant's Motion for Supplemental Fact Discovery with respect to plaintiff's cost of capital, property tax assessments for each of plaintiff's facilities from 1997 to present and the costs of casks for dry storage and FINDING AS MOOT defendant's motion with respect to audits of Zion Station's actual costs for 2003 and 2004 and Dresden Units 2 and 3 and Quad Cities Units 1 and 2 dry cask storage project costs incurred to date. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (la1)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 322 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: 5/17/2004 Court Filing
                                                                  ORDER The court will conduct a telephonic hearing on the record on Defendant's Motion for an Enlargement of Time to Complete Expert Discovery, Motion Seeking an Order Requiring Plaintiff to Complete Production of All Expert Materials by a Date Certain and to Identify Expected Testimony Regarding 17 Identified Expert Witnesses, and Motion for Expedited Consideration at 3:00 p.m. EDT on Wednesday, 5/19/04. A Sprint operator will initiate the call. If plaintiffs wish to file an opposition to defendant's motions, they shall do so on or before Tuesday, 5/18/04. Plaintiffs shall transmit a facsimile copy of such opposition to chambers at (202) 219-9552 and to defendant at or before 5:00 p.m. EDT on 5/18/04. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (la1)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: 5/17/2004
                                                                    Set Deadlines/Hearings: Telephonic Hearing set for 5/19/2004 03:00 PM before Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (dw1)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 326 Filed: 5/14/2004, Entered: 5/19/2004 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings in One Volume held on 5/14/2004 before Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (jcp, )
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 323 Filed: 5/14/2004, Entered: 5/17/2004, Terminated: 5/20/2004 Terminated:
                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Expert Discovery, until 8/2/2004, MOTION Seeking an Order Requiring Pltf to Complete Production of All Expert Materials by a Date Certain and to Identify Expected Testimony Regarding 17 Identified Expert Witnesses, and MOTION for Expedited Consideration by USA. [FILED UNDER SEAL]Service: 5/14/2004 by hand. Response due by 5/28/2004. Response due by 5/28/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 321 Filed: 5/14/2004, Entered: 5/14/2004 Court Filing
                                                                          ORDER granting [319] Exelon's Motion to Supplement the Record on [309] Defendant's Motion for Supplemental Fact Discovery. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (la1)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 320 Filed: 5/14/2004, Entered: 5/14/2004, Terminated: 6/4/2004 Motion to Unseal Document
                                                                            MOTION to Unseal Document [314] Reply to Response to Motion, filed by USA by USA. Response due by 6/1/2004 (Lester, Harold)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 5/14/2004, Entered: 5/14/2004
                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Emily C. Hewitt : Status conference held on 5/14/04. (la1)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 319 Filed: 5/13/2004, Entered: 5/13/2004, Terminated: 5/14/2004 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                MOTION Supplement The Record On Defendant's Motion For Supplemental Fact Discovery re [309] MOTION for Discovery by COMMONWEALTH EDISON COMPANY. Response due by 6/1/2004 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B)(Tompkins, Christopher)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 318 Filed: 5/12/2004, Entered: 5/12/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                  ORDER OF NOTICE TO: daniel.herzfeld@shawpittman.com, dcarney@perkinscoie.com, dgolden@spriggs.com, jfiedler@spriggs.com, mfreas@spriggs.com,mhenke@velaw.com pbessette@morganlewis.com, pshanz@morganlewis.com, tflynn@velaw.com, timothy_macdonald@aporter.com. [314] Defendant's Reply to Exelon's Response to Defendant's Motion for Supplemental Fact Discovery (Defendant's Reply) was placed under seal because information in Defendant's Reply is subject to a protective order. According to court records, the above-named individuals have received copies of Defendant's Reply. These individuals are ordered to destroy all electronic and paper copies of Defendant's Reply. Defendant's Reply shall not be used or relied upon in any way by any person or entity except parties in the above-captioned matter. Each of the individuals to whom this order is addressed shall file with the court a certificate of compliance with this order on or before Wednesday, 5/26/04. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (la1) Modified on 5/26/2004 to remove fcano@jenner.com from the list, per order of 5/26/2004 (jcp, ).
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 317 Filed: 5/11/2004, Entered: 5/11/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                    ORDER granting [315] Defendant's Motion to Place Under Seal "Defendant's Reply to Exelon's Response to Defendant's Motion for Supplemental Fact Discovery," and Motion for Expedited Consideration. The Clerk of the Court is directed immediately to take the steps necessary to remove [314] Defendant's Reply to Exelon's Response to Defendant's Motion for Supplemental Fact Discovery from the public docket and to place this filing under seal. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (la1)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 316 Filed: 5/11/2004, Entered: 5/11/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                      ORDER granting [313] Defendant's Motion for an Enlargement of Time to file its reply to [311] plaintiff's response to [309] defendant's motion for supplemental fact discovery. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (la1)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 315 Filed: 5/11/2004, Entered: 5/11/2004, Terminated: 5/11/2004 ~Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                        MOTION to Seal Document [314] Reply to Response to Motion by USA. Response due by 5/28/2004 (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 5/11/2004, Entered: 5/11/2004
                                                                                          Set Deadlines/Hearings: Reply to Response to Motion for Supplemental Fact Discovery due by 5/10/2004. (dw1)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 5/10/2004, Entered: 5/10/2004
                                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re [309] MOTION for Discovery filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1))(Lester, Harold) Modified on 5/11/2004 (dw1, ). Document SEALED pursuant to order of 5/11/04. The PDF attached to this docket entry is no longer available to the public.
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 313 Filed: 5/7/2004, Entered: 5/7/2004, Terminated: 5/11/2004 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to [311] Response to Motion,(until 5/10/04), by USA. Response due by 5/24/2004 (Lester, Harold) Modified on 5/10/2004 for clarity (dw1).
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 312 Filed: 5/3/2004, Entered: 5/5/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                APPENDIX by COMMONWEALTH EDISON COMPANY to [311] Pltf's Response to Dft's Motion for Supplemental Fact Discovery. [FILED UNDER SEAL] (jcp, )
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 311 Filed: 5/3/2004, Entered: 5/3/2004
                                                                                                  RESPONSE to [309] MOTION for Discovery filed by COMMONWEALTH EDISON COMPANY. Reply due by 5/17/2004. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Separate Appendix Filed Under Seal)(Tompkins, Christopher)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 310 Filed: 4/29/2004, Entered: 4/29/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                    STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: A telephonic status conference will be held on Friday, 5/14/2004 10:00 AM before Judge Emily C. Hewitt. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (la1, )
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document 309 Filed: 4/26/2004, Entered: 4/28/2004, Terminated: 5/17/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                      MOTION for Supplemental Fact Discovery by USA. [FILED UNDER SEAL]Service: 4/26/2004. Response due by 5/13/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 308 Filed: 4/26/2004, Entered: 4/26/2004
                                                                                                        NOTICE by USA of Filing of Answer to Complaint Originally Filed in Docket No. 04-103C, and Defendant's Answer and Affirmative Defenses (Attachments: # (1))(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 307 Filed: 4/23/2004, Entered: 4/23/2004
                                                                                                          RESPONSE to [298] Order regardng pre-discovery conference to be convened on April 30, 2004 filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3))(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 306 Filed: 4/22/2004, Entered: 4/22/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER granting [305] Defendant's Unopposed Motion for an Enlargement of Time to respond to the complaint in docket no. 04-103C. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (la1)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 4/22/2004, Entered: 4/22/2004
                                                                                                            Set Deadlines/Hearings: Answer Due by 4/26/2004 re: 04-103C. (dw1)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 305 Filed: 4/19/2004, Entered: 4/19/2004, Terminated: 4/22/2004 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                              Consent MOTION For Enlargement Of Time To Respond To Complaint In Docket No. 04-103C by USA. Response due by 5/6/2004 (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 302 Filed: 4/15/2004, Entered: 4/15/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER granting [301] Motion for Leave to File Only a Redacted Reply Brief and Appendix upon Holtec International. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (jb2)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 4/14/2004, Entered: 4/14/2004
                                                                                                                  Set Deadlines/Hearings: Reply due by 4/13/2004. (dw1)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 304 Filed: 4/13/2004, Entered: 4/16/2004 Redacted Document
                                                                                                                    PARTIALLY REDACTED DOCUMENT by USA redacting [303] Reply to Response to Motion. Service: 4/13/04.(dw1)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 303 Filed: 4/13/2004, Entered: 4/16/2004 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re [288] MOTION to Compel Production of Documents From Holtec International filed by USA with a (1) one volume appendix in support. [FILED UNDER SEAL] Service: 4/13/04.(dw1)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 301 Filed: 4/13/2004, Entered: 4/13/2004, Terminated: 4/15/2004 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                        MOTION For Leave To Serve Only A Redacted Reply Brief And Appendix Upon Non-Party Holtec International re [294] Response to Motion, [297] Response to Motion by USA. Response due by 4/30/2004 (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 300 Filed: 4/13/2004, Entered: 4/13/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [299] Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to Response to Motion to Compel. Defendant's reply to [294] now due on or before April 13, 2004. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (jb2) Modified on 4/14/2004 for clarity (dw1).
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 299 Filed: 4/12/2004, Entered: 4/12/2004, Terminated: 4/13/2004 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to [294] Response to [288] Motion, until 4/13/2004, filed by USA. Response due by 4/29/2004 (Lester, Harold) Modified on 4/13/2004 to clean up docket text.(dls).
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 298 Filed: 4/12/2004, Entered: 4/12/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                              Notice of Pre-Discovery Conference. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (jb2)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document 297 Filed: 4/1/2004, Entered: 4/5/2004 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                BRIEF IN OPPOSITION to [288] Dft's MOTION to Compel Production of Documents From Holtec International, filed by HOLTEC INTERNATIONAL. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Reply due by 4/12/2004. Service: 3/29/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 296 Filed: 3/31/2004, Entered: 3/31/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to file the paper copy of Brief of Non-Party, Holtec International, in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel Production of Documents notwithstanding the fact that this is an electronic case and all documents must be filed electronically. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (la1)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 295 Filed: 3/31/2004, Entered: 3/31/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting Defendant's Motion for an Enlargement of Time, filed in case no. 04-103C. Defendant shall respond to Exelon Generation Company's complaint on or before 4/19/2004. The court notes that defendant filed Defendant's Motion for an Enlargement of Time in the docket for case no. 04-103C. Because case no. 04-103C was consolidated into case no. 98-621C, all filings relating to case no. 04-103C shall be docketed in case no. 98-621C. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (la1)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 3/31/2004, Entered: 3/31/2004
                                                                                                                                      Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer Due for Exelon Generation Company's complaint from Case No. 04-103C by 4/19/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 294 Filed: 3/29/2004, Entered: 3/29/2004
                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to [288] MOTION to Compel Production of Documents From Holtec International filed by COMMONWEALTH EDISON COMPANY. Reply due by 4/12/2004. (Tompkins, Christopher)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 3/19/2004, Entered: 3/19/2004
                                                                                                                                          Set Deadlines/Hearings: Plaintiff's Expert Report due by 4/15/2004. Defendant's Responsive Expert Report due by 7/1/2004. Plaintiff's Rebuttal Expert Report due by 7/30/2004. Defendant Motion regarding Supplemental Fact Discovery due by 4/26/2004. Plaintiff's Response re: Motion regarding Supplemental Fact Discovery due by 5/3/2004. Defendant's Reply re: Supplemental Fact Discovery due by 5/7/2004. Plaintiff's Motion regarding Supplemental Fact Discovery due by 7/12/2004. Defendant Response due by 7/19/2004. Plaintiff's Reply due by 7/23/2004. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 292 Filed: 3/18/2004, Entered: 3/18/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [290] Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Take Two Depositions Outside of Fact Discovery Period. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (la1)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 291 Filed: 3/18/2004, Entered: 3/18/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [289] Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Amend July 22, 2003 Scheduling Order to Extend Time to Submit Initial Expert Disclosures and amending [274] scheduling order. Expert discovery shall be completed on or before Friday, 8/13/04. Pl.'s expert report(s) shall be submitted on or before Thursday, 4/15/04 and def.'s responsive expert report(s) shall be submitted on or before Thursday, 7/1/04. Pl.'s rebuttal expert report(s) shall be submitted on or before Friday, 7/30/04. Def. shall file any motions regarding supplemental fact discovery on or before Monday, 4/26/04. Pl.'s response shall be filed on or before Monday, 5/3/04 and def.'s reply shall be filed on or before Friday, 5/7/04. Pl. shall file any motions regarding supplemental fact discovery on or before Monday, 7/12/04. Def.'s response shall be filed on or before Monday, 7/19/04 and pl.'s reply shall be filed on or before Friday, 7/23/04. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (la1)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 293 Filed: 3/17/2004, Entered: 3/18/2004 Order on Motion to Substitute PartyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER: The court has before it [284] Pltf's Motion to Add Exelon Generation Company, LLC as an Additional Pltf. The court treats this motion as a motion to consolidate Exelon Generation Co. v. United States, No. 04-103C, with the present case. The court orders that Exelon Generation Co. v. United States, No. 04-103C, be consolidated into Commonwealth Edison Co. v. United States, No. 98-621C, and that the cases proceed on a consolidated basis. The caption for this case shall be as above. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 290 Filed: 3/17/2004, Entered: 3/17/2004, Terminated: 3/18/2004 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                                                                                                  Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Through Two Fact Witness Depositions by USA. Response due by 4/5/2004 (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 289 Filed: 3/17/2004, Entered: 3/17/2004, Terminated: 3/18/2004 Motion to Amend Schedule
                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Amend Schedule For Plaintiff's Initial Expert Disclosures by COMMONWEALTH EDISON COMPANY. Response due by 4/5/2004 (Tompkins, Christopher)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 288 Filed: 3/12/2004, Entered: 3/12/2004, Terminated: 8/9/2004 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Compel Production of Documents From Holtec International by USA. Response due by 3/29/2004 (Attachments: # (1) Appendix)(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 287 Filed: 3/1/2004, Entered: 3/1/2004
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 286 Filed: 2/9/2004, Entered: 2/13/2004 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [285] Dft's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Paragraph two of the court's scheduling order of 7/22/2003 is AMENDED to read as follows: Fact Discovery: Except as provided in paragraph four below, all fact discovery, including all depositions, shall conclude on or before Friday, 3/12/2004. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 285 Filed: 2/3/2004, Entered: 2/9/2004, Terminated: 2/9/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                          UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Fact Discovery, until 3/12/2004, by USA.Service: 2/3/2004. Response due by 2/20/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 1/30/2004, Entered: 1/30/2004
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER: The Court hereby DENIES [276] Dft's Second Motion to Renew its Motion toConsolidate as well as its previous motions relating to consolidation. The Court further LIFTS THE STAY of the remainder of the cases to which the Order of 4/16/2003, applied. The Clerk of the Court is directed to docket this Order in this case with an entry noting the same on the dockets of the remaining SNFcases captioned in Dft's instant motion, with a courtesy copy to all SNF parties and presiding SNF judges of the Court. [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT LOCATED IN CASE NO. 98-126C] Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 284 Filed: 1/23/2004, Entered: 1/28/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Add EXELON GENERATION COMPANY, LLC as an Additonal Party by COMMONWEALTH EDISON COMPANY.Service: 1/23/2004 by hand. Response due by 2/6/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 283 Filed: 12/1/2003, Entered: 12/4/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Counsel for Dft's Change of Telephone and Facsimile Numbers by USA. Service: 12/1/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 282 Filed: 10/22/2003, Entered: 10/27/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER re: all filings re: issues of consolidation shall be captioned solely in the name of this case and shall show the name of the presiding judge in this case. A courtesy copy of any such filing relating to issues of consolidation shall be provided to the Clerk's Office for transmission to the Chief Judge. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 281 Filed: 9/3/2003, Entered: 9/8/2003 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Pltfs' Responses to [276] Dft's Second MOTION to the Chief Judge to Renew Consideration of Dft's Motion to Consolidate filed by USA. Service: 9/3/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 280 Filed: 8/22/2003, Entered: 8/25/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to [276] Dft's Second MOTION to Renew Its Motion to Consolidate filed by COMMONWEALTH EDISON COMPANY. Reply due by 9/3/2003. Service: 8/22/03 by hand.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 279 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/20/2003 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                        INITIAL DISCLOSURES by USA. Service: 8/15/03 by hand.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 278 Filed: 8/14/2003, Entered: 8/18/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                          UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to [276] Dft's Second MOTION to Renew Its Motion to Consolidate, until 8/22/03, by COMMONWEALTH EDISON COMPANY.Service: 8/14/03 by hand. Response due by 8/28/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 8/8/2003, Entered: 8/8/2003
                                                                                                                                                                            Set/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 8/15/2003 (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 277 Filed: 8/5/2003, Entered: 8/6/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER: Counsel for the parties in this action previously have been informed by the Clerk that on 9/8/03 this case will be converted to electronic case filing. Accordingly, if counsel has not already done so, he or she shall promptly register and be trained in preparation for the 9/8/03 conversion of this case to ECF. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 8/5/2003, Entered: 8/7/2003 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                Dft's Motion to the Chief Judge for Leave to Correct Certificate of Service and to Waive Requirements of RCFC 5.3 Regarding "Dft's Second Motion [to the Chief Judge] to Renew its Motion to Consolidate." (Original Motion located in Case No. 98-126C) (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 276 Filed: 7/30/2003, Entered: 7/31/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                  SECOND MOTION to Renew Its Motion to Consolidate by USA. [COPY] (Original Document in Case No. 98-126C)Service: 7/29/03 by hand. Response due by 8/12/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 275 Filed: 7/25/2003, Entered: 7/28/2003 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on July 21, 2003 before Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 7/24/2003, Entered: 7/24/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                      Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 7/29/2003. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 274 Filed: 7/22/2003, Entered: 7/23/2003 Discovery Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        DISCOVERY SCHEDULING ORDER AND TRIAL MANAGEMENT ORDER:1) Initial Disclosures: Initial disclosures shall be completed on or before Friday, 8/15/2003; 2) Fact Discovery: All Fact Discovery shall conclude on or before Friday, 2/27/2004; 3) Expert Discovery: All expert discovery shall be completed on or before Friday, 8/13/03. Pltf's expert report shall be submitted on or before Friday, 3/26/04 and dft's responsive expert report shall be submitted on or before Friday, 6/11/04. Pltf's rebuttal expert report shall be submitted on or before Friday, 7/30/04; 4) Supplemental Fact Discovery Motions Regarding Expert Reports: (See order for details); 5) Meeting of Counsel: (See order for details); 6) Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law: Pltf shall file its Memorandum on or before Tuesday, 9/28/2004. Dft shall file its responsive Memorandum on or before Tuesday, 10/19/2004; 7) Pretrial Conference: Pretrial Conference set for 11/16/2004 10:00 AM in National Courts Building before Judge Emily C. Hewitt; 8) Trial: Trial will be held on Tuesday, 11/30/2004 through Friday, 12/3/04 and on Tueday, 12/7/04 through Friday, 12/10/04. Trial will begin at 09:00 AM each day. Trial will be held in the National Courts Building before Judge Emily C. Hewitt. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 7/21/2003, Entered: 7/21/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Emily C. Hewitt : Scheduling Conference held on 07/21/2003. (srh)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 273 Filed: 7/18/2003, Entered: 7/21/2003 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Exhibit B to ComEd's Response to Dft's July 3, 2003 Scheduling Sbumission by COMMONWEALTH EDISON COMPANY, Filed by Leave of the Judge.Service: 7/17/03 by hand. Response due by 7/31/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 272 Filed: 7/18/2003, Entered: 7/21/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER: The Clerk of the Court has sent ComEd's motion for leave to file corrected exhibits B to ComEd's response to Dft's 7/3/03 scheduling submission to Chambers unfiled because the filing does not comply with USCFC Rule 83.1(c)(2). Notwithstanding this deficiency, the clerk of the court is directed to file Pltf's motion. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 271 Filed: 7/17/2003, Entered: 7/18/2003 ResponseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to [267] Dft's July 3, 2003 Scheduling Submission filed by COMMONWEALTH EDISON COMPANY, Filed by Leave of the Judge. Service: 7/14/03 by hand.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 270 Filed: 7/17/2003, Entered: 7/18/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER: The Clerk of the Court has sent ComEd's Response to dft's July 3, 2003 Scheduling Submission to chambers unfiled because the filing does not comply with the USCFC Rule 83.1(c)(2). Notwithstanding this deficiency, the clerk of the court is directed to file dft's motion. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 269 Filed: 7/14/2003, Entered: 7/17/2003 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to [266] Pltf's Response to the Court's June 10, 2003 Order (Proposed Pre-Trial Schedule) filed by UNITED STATES. Service: 7/3/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 268 Filed: 7/14/2003, Entered: 7/15/2003 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      SCHEDULING ORDER:The court will hold a Scheduling Conference on Monday, 7/21/2003 02:00 PM in National Courts Building before Judge Emily C. Hewitt. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 267 Filed: 7/3/2003, Entered: 7/8/2003 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Proposal for Further Proceedings Pursuant to the [263] Published Opinion/Order of June 10, 2003 filed by UNITED STATES. Service: 7/3/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 266 Filed: 7/3/2003, Entered: 7/8/2003 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to [263] the Court's June 10, 2003 Order at the Conclusion of the Published Opinion of June 10, 2003 filed by COMMONWEALTH EDISON COMPANY. Service: 7/3/03 by hand.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 265 Filed: 6/26/2003, Entered: 6/30/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [264] Dft's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response and [264] Request for Leave to File Responses. The parties shall file their response to the court's June 10, 2003 Order on or before Thursday, 7/3/2003. The parties may file replies on or before Monday, 7/14/2003. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 264 Filed: 6/25/2003, Entered: 6/26/2003, Terminated: 6/26/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                              UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time for the Parties to File Response, or Responses as to [263] Court's Order of June 10, 2003, until 7/3/03, and MOTION that Parties be Permitted to File Responses by UNITED STATES.Service: 6/25/03. Response due by 7/14/2003 (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 263 Filed: 6/10/2003, Entered: 6/17/2003 Published OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                PUBLISHED OPINION - For the foregoing reasons, defendant's Motion to Dismiss Counts II and III are GRANTED, defendant's Motion to Dismiss Count IV is GRANTED except with respect to GTCC waste, as to which the motion is DENIED as MOOT, defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment regarding plaintiff's Greater than Class C Radioactive Waste Arguments is DENIED, and defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment regarding the Rate of RNF Acceptance is DENIED, and defendant's request that this court remand the question of the SNF acceptance rate to DOE is DENIED. On ore before 6/25/03, the parties shall submit a joint proposal or, ifthey cannot agree, separate proposals, for further proceedings in this matter, including a pretrial schedule as comtemplated by Appendix A to the Rules of the United States Court of Federal Claims, to address the determination of damages on the basis of an acceptance rate to be determined at trial. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 262 Filed: 5/19/2003, Entered: 5/28/2003 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to [257] Scheduling Order, (re: the Relevance of the Defendant's GTCC partial summary judgment motion to plaintiff's claim) filed by COMMONWEALTH EDISON COMPANY. Service: 5/19/03 by hand.(hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 261 Filed: 5/14/2003, Entered: 5/22/2003 Supplemental Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF in support of its motion for partial summary judgment regarding plaintiff's Greater Than Class C Radioactive Waste Arguments. Service: 5/14/03.(hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 260 Filed: 5/13/2003, Entered: 5/15/2003 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to [255] Order on Motion for Clarification, Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File, [249] Scheduling Order filed by COMMONWEALTH EDISON COMPANY and The United States. Service: 5/13/03.(dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 257 Filed: 5/9/2003, Entered: 5/14/2003 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiff's Response due by 5/19/2003. Defendant's Supplemental Brief due by 5/14/2003. Neither brief shall be longer than five (5) pages. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 255 Filed: 5/8/2003, Entered: 5/13/2003 Order on Motion for ClarificationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [254] Motion for Clarification and granting [254] Motion for Extension of Time to file joint list of deposition witnesses. Joint List due by 5/13/2003. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 258 Filed: 5/7/2003, Entered: 5/14/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting re [253] MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to [249] Scheduling Order,until May 8, 2003. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 254 Filed: 5/7/2003, Entered: 5/9/2003, Terminated: 5/8/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Clarification of [249] Scheduling Order and MOTION for Extension of Time (until two days) after the court provides clarification to file joint submission by COMMONWEALTH EDISON COMPANY.Service by hand: 5/7/03. Response due by 5/21/2003. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 253 Filed: 5/6/2003, Entered: 5/8/2003, Terminated: 5/7/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to [249] Scheduling Order, (until May 8, 2003), by COMMONWEALTH EDISON COMPANY.Service by hand: 5/6/03. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 252 Filed: 5/6/2003, Entered: 5/7/2003 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on April 29, 2003 before Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 256 Filed: 5/5/2003, Entered: 5/14/2003 Order on Motion to Supplement Pleadings - Rule 15(Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [237] Motion to Supplement Pleadings - Rule 15(d) Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 249 Filed: 4/29/2003, Entered: 5/1/2003 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SCHEDULING ORDER: Parties joint list of deposition witnesses due by 5/6/2003. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 4/29/2003, Entered: 4/29/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 5/5/2003. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 4/29/2003, Entered: 4/29/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Emily C. Hewitt : Oral Argument held on 04/29/2003. (srh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 259 Filed: 4/28/2003, Entered: 5/14/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE re [250] MOTION for Leave to File copies of defendant's reply brief, etc. filed in No. 98-484C filed by COMMONWEALTH EDISON COMPANY. Reply due by 5/12/2003. Service: 4/28/03.(hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 251 Filed: 4/28/2003, Entered: 5/5/2003 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER denying [250] Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (dls, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 250 Filed: 4/25/2003, Entered: 5/5/2003, Terminated: 4/28/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to File copies of defendant's reply brief and supplemental appendix filed in No. 98-484C filed by The United States.Service: 4/24/03. (dls, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 248 Filed: 4/22/2003, Entered: 4/28/2003 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CORRECTED MEMORANDUM re: opposition to defendant's motion for partial summary judgment regarding the rate of spent nuclear fuel acceptance by COMMONWEALTH EDISON COMPANY. Service by hand: 4/21/03.(dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 247 Filed: 4/22/2003, Entered: 4/28/2003 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [243] Motion to file corrected memorandum in opposition to motion for partial summary judgment and granting [243] Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 246 Filed: 4/22/2003, Entered: 4/28/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to Motion re [237] MOTION to Supplement Pleadings - Rule 15(d) re: [93] Motion for Summary Judgment filed by The United States. Reply due by 5/5/2003. Service: 4/21/03.(dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 245 Filed: 4/22/2003, Entered: 4/28/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [240] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response [237] MOTION to Supplement Pleadings - Rule 15(d) re: [93] Motion for Summary Judgment Response due by 4/21/2003. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 244 Filed: 4/22/2003, Entered: 4/28/2003 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to the Court's Order dated April 15, 2003 filed by The United States. Service: 4/22/03.(hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 243 Filed: 4/21/2003, Entered: 4/25/2003, Terminated: 4/22/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to file instanter corrected memorandum and MOTION to Strike by COMMONWEALTH EDISON COMPANY.Service by hand: 4/21/03. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 240 Filed: 4/18/2003, Entered: 4/24/2003, Terminated: 4/22/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to [237] MOTION to Supplement Pleadings - Rule 15(d) re: [93] Motion for Summary Judgment, (until April 21, 2003), by The United States.Service: 4/18/03. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 241 Filed: 4/17/2003, Entered: 4/25/2003 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [238] Motion to cite additional authority in response to defendant's motion for partial summary judgment regarding the rate of spent nuclear fuel acceptance Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 242 Filed: 4/16/2003, Entered: 4/25/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 239 Filed: 4/15/2003, Entered: 4/23/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, re: further proceedings. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 238 Filed: 4/15/2003, Entered: 4/23/2003, Terminated: 4/17/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to cite additional authority in opposition to Defendant's Motion for partial Summary Judgment regarding the rate of spent nuclear fuel acceptance, by COMMONWEALTH EDISON COMPANY. Service: 4/15/03 by hand. Response due 4/29/2003. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 237 Filed: 4/4/2003, Entered: 4/9/2003, Terminated: 5/5/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Supplement Pleadings - Rule 15(d) re: [93] Motion for Summary Judgment by COMMONWEALTH EDISON COMPANY.Service by hand: 4/4/03. Response due by 4/18/2003. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 236 Filed: 4/2/2003, Entered: 4/8/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER, re: further proceedings. Signed by Judge Diane G. Sypolt. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 235 Filed: 3/26/2003, Entered: 4/3/2003 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER denying [225] Motion to defer and to consolidate with 98-483 C Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 234 Filed: 3/26/2003, Entered: 4/2/2003 Order Setting Oral Argument/Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion Oral Argument set for 4/29/2003 10:00 AM before Judge Emily C. Hewitt. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 233 Filed: 3/25/2003, Entered: 3/28/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re [225] MOTION to defer scheduling argument filed by The United States. Service by hand: 3/25/03.(dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 232 Filed: 3/18/2003, Entered: 3/21/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 231 Filed: 3/18/2003, Entered: 3/20/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to Motion, re [225] MOTION to defer scheduling argument filed by COMMONWEALTH EDISON COMPANY. Reply due 4/1/2003. Service: 3/18/03. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 230 Filed: 3/18/2003, Entered: 3/20/2003 ResponseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to "Plaintiff's Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact re: the rate of spent nuclear fuel acceptance" filed by The United States, by leave of the Judge. Service: 3/17/03.(dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 228 Filed: 3/18/2003, Entered: 3/20/2003 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [226] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 227 Filed: 3/18/2003, Entered: 3/20/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER re: Defendant's "Reply Brief", received in the Clerk's Office on March 17, 2003, shall be filed notwithstanding the document's deficiencies. See Rule 5.2 (a)(1)(G). Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 229 Filed: 3/17/2003, Entered: 3/20/2003 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re [99] Motion for Summary Judgment filed by The United States, by leave of the Judge. [filed with a supplemental appendix] Service: 3/17/03.(dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 226 Filed: 3/17/2003, Entered: 3/19/2003, Terminated: 3/18/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit of reply to the motion for partial summary judgment, re: rate of spent nuclear fuel acceptance by 37 pages by The United States. Service: 3/17/03. Response due by 4/3/2003.(lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 225 Filed: 3/14/2003, Entered: 3/17/2003, Terminated: 3/26/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to defer scheduling argument by The United States. Service: 3/13/03.Response due by 3/31/2003. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 224 Filed: 3/11/2003, Entered: 3/12/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [223-1] motion to Extend Time to file reply to response to motion for partial summary judgment Reply to Response to Motion due 3/17/03 for [99-1] motion for Summary Judgment regarding the rate of spent nuclear fuel acceptance (signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 223 Filed: 3/10/2003, Entered: 3/11/2003, Terminated: 3/11/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 3/10/03) to Extend Time to file reply to response to motion for partial summary judgment , (until March 17, 2003). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 222 Filed: 3/7/2003, Entered: 3/10/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER re: See order [612-1] dated 3/7/03, in case 98-126C (signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 221 Filed: 2/26/2003, Entered: 3/5/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [218-1] motion to Extend Time to file reply to the motion for partial summary judgment Reply to Response to Motion due 3/11/03 for [99-1] motion for Summary Judgment regarding the rate of spent nuclear fuel acceptance (signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt) . Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 220 Filed: 2/25/2003, Entered: 3/4/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 219 Filed: 2/24/2003, Entered: 3/3/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 218 Filed: 2/21/2003, Entered: 2/27/2003, Terminated: 2/26/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 2/21/03) to Extend Time to file reply to the motion for partial summary judgment until 3/11/03. Response due: 3/10/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 217 Filed: 2/13/2003, Entered: 2/24/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY by USA to response to [99-1] motion for Summary Judgment regarding the rate of spent nuclear fuel. Service: 2/11/03. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 216 Filed: 2/13/2003, Entered: 2/24/2003 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fa
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Response by USA to [181-1] response order by COMMONWEALTH EDISON. Service: 2/11/03. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 215 Filed: 2/13/2003, Entered: 2/24/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER re: the Clerk of the Court is directed to file defendant's reply (signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt). Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 214 Filed: 2/13/2003, Entered: 2/24/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [212-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation (signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt). Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 213 Filed: 2/11/2003, Entered: 2/21/2003 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Harold Dewitt Lester Jr. Service: 2/11/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 212 Filed: 2/11/2003, Entered: 2/21/2003, Terminated: 2/13/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service: 2/11/03) For leave to exceed the page limitation for the reply to the motion for partial summary judgment regarding greater than class c radioactive waste arguments. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 211 Filed: 2/5/2003, Entered: 2/13/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 209 Filed: 2/3/2003, Entered: 2/12/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER mooting [208-1] motion for Leave to file response to motion to defer depositions (signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 210 Filed: 1/31/2003, Entered: 2/12/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 208 Filed: 1/30/2003, Entered: 2/10/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by COMMONWEALTH EDISON (Service: 1/30/03) for Leave to file response to motion to defer depositions . Response due: 2/18/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 207 Filed: 1/29/2003, Entered: 2/7/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 206 Filed: 1/23/2003, Entered: 1/31/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER - see 98-126 C for order ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 205 Filed: 1/9/2003, Entered: 1/15/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 204 Filed: 12/23/2002, Entered: 1/2/2003 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: one volume, at Washington, DC, for date of December 19, 2002, exhibits: none. Notice to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 203 Filed: 12/19/2002, Entered: 12/27/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER set deadline of 2/11/03 for Defendant to provide the court with its reply brief re: greater than class c radioactive waste and set deadline of 2/25/03 for Defendant to provide the court with its reply brief re: the rate of spent nuclear fuel acceptance. ( signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 12/19/2002, Entered: 1/2/2003 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Status Conference held (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 202 Filed: 11/26/2002, Entered: 11/27/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [201-1] motion to reschedule status conference Status Conference reset for 10:00 a.m. on 12/19/02 (signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 201 Filed: 11/22/2002, Entered: 11/25/2002, Terminated: 11/26/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 11/22/02) to reschedule status conference . Response due: 12/9/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 200 Filed: 10/28/2002, Entered: 10/30/2002 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY by USA to response to [105-1] motion to Dismiss Count III of Plaintiff's complaint. Service: 10/28/02 (HW) Modified on 11/20/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 199 Filed: 10/28/2002, Entered: 10/29/2002 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of October 24, 2002. Notice to parties. (FE) Modified on 11/20/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 198 Filed: 10/24/2002, Entered: 10/26/2002 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER setting Status conference by 10:00 a.m., 12/12/02 ; ( signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt ) Copy to parties. (HW) Modified on 11/20/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 197 Filed: 10/16/2002, Entered: 10/18/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow for Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD) Modified on 11/20/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 196 Filed: 10/10/2002, Entered: 10/15/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [193-1] motion for Leave to file additional exhibit to supplement its response to defendant's motionto suspend briefing. ( signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 11/20/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 195 Filed: 10/10/2002, Entered: 10/15/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [188-1] motion to suspend the briefing upon Defendant's pending motions for partial summary judgment regarding the rate of spent nuclear fuel acceptance and greater than class c radioactive waste. The parties shall contact the court within three business days after the conclusion of the coordianted discovery proceedings to schedule a status conference and also shall, if that conclusion has not then occured, set Joint Status Report deadline to 11/4/02. ( signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 11/20/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 194 Filed: 10/9/2002, Entered: 10/11/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER see 98-126C for Order. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 11/20/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 193 Filed: 10/4/2002, Entered: 10/9/2002, Terminated: 10/10/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by COMMONWEALTH EDISON (Service by hand: 10/4/02 ) for Leave to file additional exhibit to supplement its response to defendant's motionto suspend briefing . Response due: 10/18/02 (HW) Modified on 11/20/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 192 Filed: 9/30/2002, Entered: 10/2/2002 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY by USA to response to [188-1] motion to suspend the briefing upon Defendant's pending motions for partial summary judgment regarding the rate of spent nuclear fuel acceptance and greater than class c radioactive waste. Service: 9/30/02 (JT) Modified on 11/20/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 191 Filed: 9/19/2002, Entered: 9/23/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by COMMONWEALTH EDISON (Service by hand: 9/19/02) to [188-1] motion to suspend the briefing upon Defendant's pending motions for partial summary judgment regarding the rate of spent nuclear fuel acceptance and greater than class c radioactive waste. Reply due: 9/30/02. (LTD) Modified on 11/20/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 190 Filed: 9/13/2002, Entered: 9/20/2002 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by USA pursuant to [189-2] order. Service: 9/13/02.(LTD) Modified on 11/20/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 189 Filed: 9/13/2002, Entered: 9/19/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [187-1] motion to Extend Time to file reply to the Motion to Dismiss. Defendant's Reply to Response to Motion reset to 10/28/02 for [105-1] motion to Dismiss Count III of Plaintiff's complaint. With respect to Defendant's Motion to Suspend, the court notes the absence from the filing of the attachment referred to in note 3. Defendant shall promptly file and serve a copy of the attachment. The parties shall respond and reply to the Motion to Suspend pursuant to the Rules of the Court. ( signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 11/20/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 188 Filed: 9/12/2002, Entered: 9/19/2002, Terminated: 10/10/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 9/12/02 ) to suspend the briefing upon Defendant's pending motions for partial summary judgment regarding the rate of spent nuclear fuel acceptance and greater than class c radioactive waste. Response due: 9/30/02 (JT) Modified on 11/20/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 187 Filed: 9/12/2002, Entered: 9/17/2002, Terminated: 9/13/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 9/12/02) to Extend Time to file reply to the Motion to Dismiss until 10/28/02. Response due: 9/30/02. (LTD) Modified on 11/20/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 186 Filed: 9/10/2002, Entered: 9/16/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD) Modified on 11/20/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 185 Filed: 9/5/2002, Entered: 9/9/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD) Modified on 11/20/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 184 Filed: 8/30/2002, Entered: 11/20/2002 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by COMMONWEALTH EDISON re: plaintiff's greater than Class C Radioactive Waste Arguments. Service by hand: 8/30/02 (DS) Modified on 11/20/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 183 Filed: 8/30/2002, Entered: 9/4/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by COMMONWEALTH EDISON (Service by hand: 8/30/01 ) to [93-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment (together with a separate appendix). Reply due: 9/13/02 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 182 Filed: 8/30/2002, Entered: 9/4/2002 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fa
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Response by COMMONWEALTH EDISON to [100-1] proposed findings by USA (regarding the rate of spent nuclear fuel acceptance). Service by hand: 8/30/02 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 181 Filed: 8/30/2002, Entered: 9/4/2002 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fa
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Response by COMMONWEALTH EDISON to [94-1] proposed findings by USA re: plaintiff's greater than Class C Radioactive Waste Arguments. Service by hand: 8/30/02 (HW) Modified on 11/20/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 180 Filed: 8/30/2002, Entered: 9/4/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by COMMONWEALTH EDISON (Service by hand: 8/30/02 ) to [105-1] motion to Dismiss Count III of Plaintiff's complaint, and [92-1] motion to Dismiss Count II and IV of the complaint. Reply due: 9/13/02. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 179 Filed: 8/30/2002, Entered: 9/4/2002 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by COMMONWEALTH EDISON (regarding the rate of spent nuclear fuel acceptance). Service by hand: 8/30/02 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 178 Filed: 8/30/2002, Entered: 9/4/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by COMMONWEALTH EDISON (Service by hand: 8/30/02 ) to [99-1] motion for Summary Judgment regarding the rate of spent nuclear fuel acceptance (together with separate appendix). Reply due: 9/13/02 (HW) Modified on 09/04/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 177 Filed: 8/22/2002, Entered: 8/27/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 176 Filed: 8/22/2002, Entered: 8/27/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [174-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the Motion for Summary Judgment and the Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's Response to [105-1] motion to Dismiss Count III of Plaintiff's complaint reset to 8/30/02, [99-1] motion for Summary Judgment regarding the rate of spent nuclear fuel acceptance reset to 8/30/02, [93-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment reset to 8/30/02, [92-1] motion to Dismiss Count II and IV of the complaint reset to 8/30/02. ( by Judge Emily C. Hewitt ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 175 Filed: 8/21/2002, Entered: 8/26/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [171-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation (signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich for Judg Emily C. Hewitt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 174 Filed: 8/20/2002, Entered: 8/23/2002, Terminated: 8/22/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by COMMONWEALTH EDISON (Service: 8/20/02) to Extend Time to respond to the Motion for Summary Judgment and the Motion to Dismiss until 8/30/02. Response due: 9/6/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 173 Filed: 8/20/2002, Entered: 8/22/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 172 Filed: 8/16/2002, Entered: 8/21/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 171 Filed: 8/16/2002, Entered: 8/21/2002, Terminated: 8/21/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by COMMONWEALTH EDISON (Service: 8/16/02) For leave to exceed the page limitation . Response due: 9/3/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 170 Filed: 8/5/2002, Entered: 8/7/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 169 Filed: 7/30/2002, Entered: 8/5/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 168 Filed: 7/29/2002, Entered: 8/1/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER re: see order [467-1] dated 7/29/02, in case No. 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 167 Filed: 7/23/2002, Entered: 7/26/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 166 Filed: 7/23/2002, Entered: 7/26/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 165 Filed: 7/16/2002, Entered: 7/18/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 164 Filed: 7/16/2002, Entered: 7/18/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [162-1] motion to Extend Time to file responses to Defendant's two pending partial summary judgment motions and two motions to dismiss Response to [105-1] motion to Dismiss Count III of Plaintiff's complaint [99-1] motion for Summary Judgment regarding the rate of spent nuclear fuel acceptance, [93-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment, [92-1] motion to Dismiss Count II and IV of the complaint due 8/23/02 (signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 163 Filed: 7/15/2002, Entered: 7/17/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 162 Filed: 7/15/2002, Entered: 7/16/2002, Terminated: 7/16/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by COMMONWEALTH EDISON (Service: 7/15/02) to Extend Time to file responses to Defendant's two pending partial summary judgment motions and two motions to dismiss until 8/23/02. Response due: 8/1/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 161 Filed: 7/10/2002, Entered: 7/12/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 160 Filed: 7/9/2002, Entered: 7/11/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER - see 98-126C for Order. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 159 Filed: 7/3/2002, Entered: 7/3/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 158 Filed: 7/2/2002, Entered: 7/3/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER-see 98-126C for Order ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 157 Filed: 6/28/2002, Entered: 7/1/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by COMMONWEALTH EDISON (Service: 6/28/02) to substitute attorney (consented) Terminated attorney Richard Craig Johnson for COMMONWEALTH EDISON Added David Andrew Handzo. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 156 Filed: 6/28/2002, Entered: 7/1/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER-see 98-126C for Order ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 155 Filed: 6/18/2002, Entered: 6/19/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C.(signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (VO)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 154 Filed: 6/17/2002, Entered: 6/18/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER, Re: see order in 98-126C.(signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt) Copy to parties. (VO)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 153 Filed: 6/10/2002, Entered: 6/12/2002 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: status conference, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of June 4, 2002. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 152 Filed: 6/6/2002, Entered: 6/11/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, re: see order in 98-126, filed 6/6/02. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 151 Filed: 6/4/2002, Entered: 6/5/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Response to [105-1] motion to Dismiss Count III of Plaintiff's complaint, [99-1] motion for Summary Judgment regarding the rate of spent nuclear fuel acceptance, [93-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment and [92-1] motion to Dismiss Count II and IV of the complaint due 7/26/02 signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 6/4/2002, Entered: 6/5/2002 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Status Conference held ( Transcript due 6/10/02 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 150 Filed: 6/3/2002, Entered: 6/4/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER, re: see order in 98-126, filed 6/03/02. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 149 Filed: 5/29/2002, Entered: 5/30/2002 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            JOINT SUBMISSION pursuant to [136-3] order. Service: 5/24/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 148 Filed: 5/29/2002, Entered: 5/30/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [146-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation (signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 147 Filed: 5/28/2002, Entered: 5/29/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 146 Filed: 5/24/2002, Entered: 5/28/2002, Terminated: 5/29/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by COMMONWEALTH EDISON (Service: 5/24/02) For leave to exceed the page limitation . Response due: 6/10/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 145 Filed: 5/9/2002, Entered: 5/10/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER re: See [395-1] order in case No. 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 144 Filed: 5/7/2002, Entered: 5/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 143 Filed: 5/7/2002, Entered: 5/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 142 Filed: 5/6/2002, Entered: 5/7/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 141 Filed: 5/3/2002, Entered: 5/3/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir for Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 140 Filed: 4/26/2002, Entered: 4/29/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER, re: see order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 139 Filed: 4/23/2002, Entered: 4/24/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 138 Filed: 4/18/2002, Entered: 4/18/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 137 Filed: 4/17/2002, Entered: 4/18/2002 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: status conference (one volume), taken at Washington, DC, on April 12, 2002. Notice to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 136 Filed: 4/12/2002, Entered: 4/18/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [135-1] motion for Leave to file response to plaintiff's status report; directing parties to file a joint document, not exceeding 40 pages (20 from each party) by 5/24/02 ; and scheduling a Status Conference at 10:00 a.m. on 6/4/02 . ( signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 4/12/2002, Entered: 4/18/2002 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Status Conference held ( Transcript due 4/17/02 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 135 Filed: 4/11/2002, Entered: 4/12/2002, Terminated: 4/12/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service: 4/11/02) for Leave to file response to plaintiff's status report regarding damages discussions. Response due: 4/29/02. (HW) Modified on 04/18/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 134 Filed: 4/11/2002, Entered: 4/11/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER re: see order [344-2] dated 4/11/02 in Case No. 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 133 Filed: 4/10/2002, Entered: 4/11/2002 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT by COMMONWEALTH EDISON. Service by hand: 4/8/02. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 132 Filed: 4/10/2002, Entered: 4/11/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [131-1] motion for Leave to file status report regarding damages discussions (signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 131 Filed: 4/8/2002, Entered: 4/9/2002, Terminated: 4/10/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by COMMONWEALTH EDISON (Service by hand: 4/8/02) for Leave to file status report regarding damages discussions . Response due: 4/22/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 130 Filed: 3/25/2002, Entered: 3/26/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, re: see order in 98-126 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 129 Filed: 3/19/2002, Entered: 3/20/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER, re: See order in 98-126 (signed by Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir for Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 128 Filed: 3/5/2002, Entered: 3/6/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER denying motion to preclude or, in the alternative, defer, depositions pursuant to Rule 30(b)(6) (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 127 Filed: 3/4/2002, Entered: 3/5/2002 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: status conference, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of February 27, 2002. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 126 Filed: 2/28/2002, Entered: 3/1/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting Plaintiff's motion to Extend Time to respond to interrogatories until 3/8/02. (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD) Modified on 03/01/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 125 Filed: 2/27/2002, Entered: 3/1/2002 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER setting Status conference at 10:00 a.m. on 4/12/02. ( signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 2/27/2002, Entered: 3/1/2002 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Status Conference held ( Transcript due 3/4/02 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 124 Filed: 2/20/2002, Entered: 2/21/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEE NO. 98-126C FOR ORDER. (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD) Modified on 03/01/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 123 Filed: 2/13/2002, Entered: 2/14/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEE NO. 98-126C FOR ORDER. (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD) Modified on 03/01/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 122 Filed: 2/1/2002, Entered: 2/4/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEE NO. 98-126C FOR ORDER denying motion to reconsider filed 1/22/02 and granting the motion to revise dates, etc. (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD) Modified on 03/01/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 121 Filed: 2/1/2002, Entered: 2/4/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SE NO. 98-126C FOR ORDER. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (FE) Modified on 03/01/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 120 Filed: 1/29/2002, Entered: 3/1/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEE NO. 98-126C FOR ORDER scheduling a status conference at 2:00 p.m. on 2/12/02. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 119 Filed: 1/14/2002, Entered: 1/15/2002 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of January 9, 2002. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 118 Filed: 1/11/2002, Entered: 1/14/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEE NO. 98-126C FOR ORDER ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE) Modified on 03/01/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 117 Filed: 1/9/2002, Entered: 1/11/2002 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Adam Levin by COMMONWEALTH EDISON. (LTD) Modified on 01/15/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 116 Filed: 1/9/2002, Entered: 1/11/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [108-1] motion for Leave to file affidavit of Adam Levin (signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt). Copy to parties. (LTD) Modified on 01/15/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 115 Filed: 1/9/2002, Entered: 3/1/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying [97-1] motion to set a pretrial schedule for damages trial, [97-2] motion to defer briefing of defendant's summary judgment motions, granting [97-3] motion to schedule a status conference; and scheduling a Status Conference at 10:00 a.m. on 2/27/02 . ( signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 1/9/2002, Entered: 1/11/2002 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Status Conference held ( Transcript due 1/14/02 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 114 Filed: 1/8/2002, Entered: 3/1/2002 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CORRECTED RESPONSE by USA to plaintiff's motion to defer, etc. Service: 1/8/02 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 113 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: 3/1/2002 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY by COMMONWEALTH EDISON to response to [97-1] motion to set a pretrial schedule for damages trial, [97-2] motion to defer briefing of defendant's summary judgment motions, [97-3] motion to schedule a status conference filed [by leave of the judge]. Service by hand: 1/2/02 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 112 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: 3/1/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by USA (Service: 12/26/01) to [97-1] motion to set a pretrial schedule for damages trial, [97-2] motion to defer briefing of defendant's summary judgment motions, [97-3] motion to schedule a status conference filed [by leave of the judge]. Reply due: 1/11/02 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 111 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: 1/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER directing the Clerk's Office to file Plaintiff's notice notwithstanding the deficiency and Defendant shall file an original signature on its Response to the Plaintiff's Motion to Defer by 1/14/02 (signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: 1/11/2002 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Status Conference set at 10:00 a.m. on 1/9/02 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 110 Filed: 1/3/2002, Entered: 1/7/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER see order in 98-126C filed 01/03/02 ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 109 Filed: 12/21/2001, Entered: 3/1/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying [107-1] motion to Strike [97-1] motion to set a pretrial schedule for damages trial, [97-2] motion to defer briefing of defendant's summary judgment motions and [97-3] motion to schedule a status conference by COMMONWEALTH EDISON; denying [107-2] motion For reconsideration of [102-2] order under Rule 83.2 ; and directing parties to follow the briefing schedule set forth in the order of December 12, 2001. ( signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 108 Filed: 12/21/2001, Entered: 12/27/2001, Terminated: 1/9/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by COMMONWEALTH EDISON (Service by hand: 12/21/01) for Leave to file affidavit of Adam Levin . Response due: 1/4/02. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 107 Filed: 12/18/2001, Entered: 3/1/2002, Terminated: 12/21/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 12/18/01) to Strike [97-1] motion to set a pretrial schedule for damages trial, [97-2] motion to defer briefing of defendant's summary judgment motions and [97-3] motion to schedule a status conference by COMMONWEALTH EDISON ; and For reconsideration of [102-2] order under Rule 83.2 . Response due: 1/4/02 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 12/18/2001, Entered: 3/1/2002 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Deadline updated; Response to [107-1] motion to Strike [97-1] motion to set a pretrial schedule for damages trial, [97-2] motion to defer briefing of defendant's summary judgment motions and [97-3] motion to schedule a status conference by COMMONWEALTH EDISON set to 1/4/02 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 106 Filed: 12/17/2001, Entered: 12/18/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER staying proceedings until further order of the Court (signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 105 Filed: 12/13/2001, Entered: 12/17/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 12/13/01) to Dismiss Count III of Plaintiff's complaint . Response due: 1/14/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 104 Filed: 12/13/2001, Entered: 12/14/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER mooting [103-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to motion to dismiss Counts II and IV of complaint (signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 103 Filed: 12/12/2001, Entered: 12/13/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by COMMONWEALTH EDISON (Service: 12/12/01) to Extend Time to respond to motion to dismiss Counts II and IV of complaint , (until January 9, 2002). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 102 Filed: 12/12/2001, Entered: 12/13/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Defer due: 12/26/01 for USA and Reply due: 1/2/02 for COMMONWEALTH EDISON (signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 101 Filed: 12/12/2001, Entered: 12/13/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [96-1] motion for Leave to file a facsimile affidavit pending submission of original Plaintiff shall submit the Affidavit of Adam Levin with the original signature page by 12/20/01 (signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 100 Filed: 12/12/2001, Entered: 12/12/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact, re: Rate of spent nuclear fuel acceptance, by USA. Service: 11/28/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 99 Filed: 12/12/2001, Entered: 12/12/2001, Terminated: 8/9/2004 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION, with one volume of Appendix, by USA (Service: 11/28/01) for Summary Judgment regarding the rate of spent nuclear fuel acceptance . Response due: 1/2/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 98 Filed: 12/12/2001, Entered: 12/12/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [95-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation (signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 97 Filed: 12/10/2001, Entered: 3/1/2002, Terminated: 1/9/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by COMMONWEALTH EDISON (Service: 12/10/01) to set a pretrial schedule for damages trial , to defer briefing of defendant's summary judgment motions , and to schedule a status conference . Response due: 12/27/01 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 96 Filed: 12/10/2001, Entered: 12/11/2001, Terminated: 12/12/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by COMMONWEALTH EDISON (Service: 12/10/01) for Leave to file a facsimile affidavit pending submission of original . Response due: 12/27/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 95 Filed: 11/29/2001, Entered: 11/30/2001, Terminated: 12/12/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service by hand: 11/28/01) For leave to exceed the page limitation . Response due: 12/12/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 94 Filed: 11/28/2001, Entered: 11/30/2001 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA regarding plaintiff's greater than Class C Radioactive Waste Arguments. Service by hand: 11/27/01. (LTD) Modified on 11/20/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 93 Filed: 11/28/2001, Entered: 11/30/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION, with one volume of Appendix, by USA (Service by hand: 11/27/01) for partial Summary Judgment . Response due: 12/26/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 92 Filed: 11/27/2001, Entered: 11/29/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service by hand: 11/27/01) to Dismiss Count II and IV of the complaint . Response due: 12/11/01 (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 91 Filed: 11/20/2001, Entered: 11/21/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER see order in 98-126C filed 11/20/01 ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 90 Filed: 11/16/2001, Entered: 11/19/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER see order 98-126C file 11/16/01. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 89 Filed: 11/14/2001, Entered: 11/16/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER see order in 98-126C filed 11/14/01. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 88 Filed: 11/14/2001, Entered: 11/16/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER see order in 98-126C filed 11/14/01. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 87 Filed: 11/8/2001, Entered: 11/9/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER. See 98-126C. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 86 Filed: 11/8/2001, Entered: 11/9/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER. See 98-126C. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 85 Filed: 11/7/2001, Entered: 11/8/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER. See 98-126 C ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 84 Filed: 11/6/2001, Entered: 11/7/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting motion to enlarge time to respond to motion to compel production of documents to 11/06/01 ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 83 Filed: 11/6/2001, Entered: 11/7/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER re: Public Service Electric and Gas motion to extend time filed on 11/2/01, within which to respond to the defendant's motion to compel is GRANTED (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein) Copy to parties. (see motion filed in 98-126C) (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 82 Filed: 11/6/2001, Entered: 11/7/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting motion to enlarge time to complete production of documents to 11/19/01 ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 81 Filed: 11/1/2001, Entered: 11/5/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER denying [69-1] motion for Clarification of the Court's 9/26/01 order. Individual Judges retain the right to decide dispositive motions. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 80 Filed: 10/30/2001, Entered: 11/1/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER re: proposed stipulated order, etc. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 79 Filed: 10/29/2001, Entered: 10/31/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [70-1] motion for Leave to file copies of the Motion to Transfer Responsibility, etc. and granting Plaintiff's Motion for leave to file copies of response to transfer motion (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 78 Filed: 10/19/2001, Entered: 10/23/2001 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of supplemental certificate of service by USA. Service: 10/19/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 77 Filed: 10/19/2001, Entered: 10/23/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service: 10/19/01) to Compel . Response due: 11/5/01. (Filed with response to third party objections). (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 76 Filed: 10/19/2001, Entered: 10/23/2001 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by USA to third party objections. Service: 10/19/01. (Filed with Motion to Compel). (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 74 Filed: 10/19/2001, Entered: 10/22/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER re: All filings shall bear the name of the discovery Judge, all matters to be brought to the attention of the Court shall be filed with the discovery Judge only, the Clerk of the Court is directed not to accept for filing any motion by a party in one of the captioned cases for leave to file material with a Judge in an individual case ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 75 Filed: 10/18/2001, Entered: 10/23/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 10/16/01) to Compel . Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 11/2/01. (Filed with response to third party objections). (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 75 Filed: 10/18/2001, Entered: 10/23/2001 ResponseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by USA to third party objections. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 10/16/01. (Filed with Motion to Compel). (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 73 Filed: 10/18/2001, Entered: 10/19/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER directing the Clerk's Office to file Defendant's response and Defendant's corrected certificate of service due 10/25/01 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 72 Filed: 10/17/2001, Entered: 10/18/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER re: Defendant's motion to extend time filed on 10/15/01, within which to file the proposed stipulated order concerning the scheduling and conduct of depositions in the coordinated discovery proceeding, is GRANTED, see motion in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 71 Filed: 10/15/2001, Entered: 10/16/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by COMMONWEALTH EDISON (Service: 10/15/01) for Leave to file Motion for Clarification . Response due: 10/31/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 70 Filed: 10/11/2001, Entered: 10/15/2001, Terminated: 10/29/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service: 10/10/01) for Leave to file copies of the Motion to Transfer Responsibility, etc. Response due: 10/29/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 69 Filed: 10/9/2001, Entered: 10/10/2001, Terminated: 11/1/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by COMMONWEALTH EDISON (Service by hand: 10/9/01) for Clarification of the Court's 9/26/01 order . Response due: 10/23/01 (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 68 Filed: 10/3/2001, Entered: 10/4/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [67-1] motion to Extend Time to submit a plan for production of e-mail messages Plan to be filed by 10/22/01 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 67 Filed: 10/3/2001, Entered: 10/4/2001, Terminated: 10/3/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 10/1/01) to Extend Time to submit a plan for production of e-mail messages until 10/22/01. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 66 Filed: 9/26/2001, Entered: 9/26/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER re: The Joint Motion for an Order for Consolidated Discovery filed on 7/10/01, is granted, with the exception of document production, the parties are granted an enlargement of time until 10/1/01, to submit a plan addressing the production of e-mail messages (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 65 Filed: 9/13/2001, Entered: 9/13/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER setting Status Conference for 4:00 p.m. on 9/20/01 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 64 Filed: 8/22/2001, Entered: 8/22/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting motion for protective order in the form provided by Exhibit A of the parties 08/10/01 motion (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). See case number 98-126 C for motion. Protective order in 98-458 C is also granted, subject to reconsideration by assigned judge. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 63 Filed: 8/15/2001, Entered: 8/16/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER setting Status Conference for 2:00 p.m. on 9/11/01 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein, Discovery Judge). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 62 Filed: 8/1/2001, Entered: 8/8/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER mooting [54-1] motion for entry of Protective Order and stipulated order governing review of the Department of Energy's Electronic "Record Information System" database, granting, (to the limited extent of designating Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein to serve as discovery judge in this case), [54-2] motion for Leave to file a copy of the parties "Joint Motion for an order coordinating discovery" ( signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 61 Filed: 8/1/2001, Entered: 8/2/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [13-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment (signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 60 Filed: 7/31/2001, Entered: 8/1/2001 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY by COMMONWEALTH EDISON to [59-1] response by USA Service by hand: 7/31/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 59 Filed: 7/27/2001, Entered: 7/30/2001 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by USA to [57-1] order. Service: 7/27/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 57 Filed: 7/16/2001, Entered: 7/16/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt). Copy to parties. Show Cause Response due: 7/27/01 for USA. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 56 Filed: 7/13/2001, Entered: 7/13/2001, Terminated: 12/11/2002 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by COMMONWEALTH EDISON (Service by hand: 7/13/01) for Leave to file proposed liability order . Response due: 7/27/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 55 Filed: 7/12/2001, Entered: 7/13/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [54-2] motion for Leave to file a copy of the parties "Joint Motion for an order coordinating discovery" (signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 54 Filed: 7/11/2001, Entered: 7/13/2001, Terminated: 8/1/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 7/11/01) for entry of Protective Order and stipulated order governing review of the Department of Energy's Electronic "Record Information System" database and for Leave to file a copy of the parties "Joint Motion for an order coordinating discovery" . Response due: 7/30/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 58 Filed: 7/10/2001, Entered: 7/17/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [53-1] motion for Leave to file documents relevant to the telephone conference with managing Judge ( signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 53 Filed: 7/5/2001, Entered: 7/17/2001, Terminated: 7/10/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        [YANKEE ATOMIC's] MOTION (Service : 7/5/01 ) for Leave to file documents relevant to the telephone conference with managing Judge . Response due: 7/23/01. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 52 Filed: 5/31/2001, Entered: 6/1/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER resetting Status Conference for 2:30 p.m. on 6/14/01 (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 51 Filed: 5/29/2001, Entered: 5/30/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER scheduling Status Conference for 10:30 a.m., 6/14/01 ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 50 Filed: 5/22/2001, Entered: 5/25/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER: On 1/8/2001, Dft filed a [39-1] Motion for the Chief Judge to reassign to a single judge case involving alleged breaches of the standard contract published at 10 CFR part 961. The Chief Judge hereby designates Judge Wiese as the managing judge in the above cited cases for the purpose of meeting with the parties to consider whether consolidation or other joint handling of discovery or other pre-trial matters is appropriate. Judge Wiese is requested to formulate a management plan, if one is appropriate, and is authorized to make appropriate rulings with respect to this purpose. (signed by Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir). Judge Wiese is designated as managing judge. Copy to parties. (LTD) Modified on 3/17/2004 (jcp, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 49 Filed: 2/21/2001, Entered: 2/23/2001 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY by USA to response to [39-1] motion for the Chief Judge to reassign to a single judge case involving alleged breaches of the standard contract, etc. Service: 2/16/01 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 48 Filed: 2/21/2001, Entered: 2/23/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [47-1] motion for Leave to file in this case a copy of reply to oppostion to the USA's motion to the Chief Judge to reassign to a single Judge cases involving alleged breaches of the standard contract, etc. ( signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 47 Filed: 2/20/2001, Entered: 2/22/2001, Terminated: 2/21/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 2/20/01) for Leave to file in this case a copy of reply to oppostion to the USA's motion to the Chief Judge to reassign to a single Judge cases involving alleged breaches of the standard contract, etc. . Response due: 3/9/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 46 Filed: 2/1/2001, Entered: 2/2/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [45-1] motion for Leave to file a copy of "Plaintiff's memorandum in opposition to the USA's motion to the Chief Judge to reasign to a single Judge the fourteenpending standard contract cases" together with a copy of the similiar response filed by YANKEE ATOMIC ( signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 45 Filed: 1/31/2001, Entered: 2/1/2001, Terminated: 2/1/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by COMMONWEALTH EDISON (Service by hand: 1/31/01) for Leave to file a copy of "Plaintiff's memorandum in opposition to the USA's motion to the Chief Judge to reasign to a single Judge the fourteenpending standard contract cases" together with a copy of the similiar response filed by YANKEE ATOMIC . Response due: 2/14/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 44 Filed: 1/29/2001, Entered: 1/30/2001 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          See 30-1 Response to motion filed January 29, 2001, in 98-483C Florida Power & Light Company. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 43 Filed: 1/22/2001, Entered: 1/23/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by COMMONWEALTH EDISON (Service by hand: 1/22/01) to Extend Time to respond to the USA's motion to the Chief Judge to reassign cases to a single Judge , (until January 29, 2001). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 42 Filed: 1/12/2001, Entered: 1/16/2001 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY by COMMONWEALTH EDISON to response to [32-2] motion to set coordinated discovery schedule. Service by hand: 1/12/01. [2 of 2]. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 42 Filed: 1/12/2001, Entered: 1/16/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by COMMONWEALTH EDISON (Service by hand: 1/12/01 ) to [41-1] motion to Stay. Reply due: 1/24/01. [1 of 2]. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 41 Filed: 1/11/2001, Entered: 1/11/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by USA (Service: 1/9/01 ) to [32-1] motion to lift stay, filed by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 1/22/01. (HW) Modified on 01/11/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 41 Filed: 1/11/2001, Entered: 1/11/2001, Terminated: 12/11/2002 Motion to StayCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 1/9/01 ) to Stay pending resolution of the motions to reassign to a single Judge cases involving alleged breaches of the standard contract, etc., filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 1/26/01. (HW) Modified on 01/11/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 40 Filed: 1/11/2001, Entered: 1/11/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER re: directing the Clerk of the Court to file defendant's Motion to stay and response to plaintiff's motion to set a coordinated discovery schedule by leave of the Judge. Defendant further directed regarding proper use of the night box, etc. ( signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 39 Filed: 1/10/2001, Entered: 1/11/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 1/10/01) for the Chief Judge to reassign to a single judge case involving alleged breaches of the standard contract, etc. . Response due: 1/29/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 38 Filed: 1/10/2001, Entered: 1/11/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [37-1] motion for Leave to file a copy of the USA's motion to the Chief Judge to reassign to a single judge cases involving alleged breaches of the standard contract published at 10 C.F.R. Part 961 (signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 37 Filed: 1/9/2001, Entered: 1/9/2001, Terminated: 1/10/2001 Motion for Leave to FileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service by hand: 1/9/01) for Leave to file a copy of the USA's motion to the Chief Judge to reassign to a single judge cases involving alleged breaches of the standard contract published at 10 C.F.R. Part 961 . Response due: 1/23/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 36 Filed: 12/27/2000, Entered: 1/2/2001 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Corrections to Citations by COMMONWEALTH EDISON re: [32-1] motion to lift stay by COMMONWEALTH EDISON, [32-2] motion to set coordinated discovery schedule. by COMMONWEALTH EDISON Service: 12/22/00 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 35 Filed: 12/27/2000, Entered: 1/2/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to file the Memorandum "Notice of Corrections to Citations in Plaintiff's Motion to Lift Stay, etc." ( signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 34 Filed: 12/20/2000, Entered: 12/21/2000 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM by COMMONWEALTH EDISON re: 10/17/00 Order. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 12/15/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 33 Filed: 12/20/2000, Entered: 12/21/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER filing Plaintiff's memorandum re: issues raised in the Court's 10/17/00 Order. Set Notice of Compliance deadline to 1/12/01 for Defendant to respond to Plaintiff's memorandum. ( signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 32 Filed: 12/15/2000, Entered: 12/19/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by COMMONWEALTH EDISON (Service : 12/15/00 (by hand) ) to lift stay and to set coordinated discovery schedule. Response due: 12/29/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 31 Filed: 11/1/2000, Entered: 11/3/2000 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by COMMONWEALTH EDISON (Service by hand: 11/1/00 ) to [29-1] motion to Stay proceedings. Reply due: 11/13/00 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 30 Filed: 10/31/2000, Entered: 11/2/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [29-1] motion to Stay proceedings until 21 days after the Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit issues its mandates in Northern States Power Co. and Maine Yankee Atomic Power Co. or until further order of this Court. ( signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 29 Filed: 10/30/2000, Entered: 10/31/2000, Terminated: 10/31/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 10/30/00 ) to Stay proceedings [until 21 days after the U.S. Court of Appeals issues its mandates in Northern States and Maine Yankee Atomic Power Co.]. Response due: 11/16/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 28 Filed: 10/19/2000, Entered: 10/24/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER directing the Clerk to return the notice of intent to Plaintiff. ( signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 10/24/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 27 Filed: 10/17/2000, Entered: 10/20/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [26-1] motion to Stay discovery. ( signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 26 Filed: 10/13/2000, Entered: 10/18/2000, Terminated: 10/17/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 10/12/00 ) to Stay discovery , or, in the alternative, to Extend Time to respond to Plaintiff's first request for production of documents [until December 15, 2000]. Response due: 10/30/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 25 Filed: 9/25/2000, Entered: 9/28/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [23-1] motion to Extend Time. Defendant's Response to [13-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment reset to 10/30/00 and Plaintiff's Reply to Response to Motion reset to 11/6/00 [13-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment. ( signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 24 Filed: 9/25/2000, Entered: 9/28/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER re: the parties are not required to file either separate or joint status reports until further order of the court. ( signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 23 Filed: 9/22/2000, Entered: 9/26/2000, Terminated: 9/25/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 9/22/00 ) to Extend Time Response due: 10/10/00 (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 22 Filed: 9/14/2000, Entered: 9/14/2000 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Response to [13-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment reset to 9/29/00 and plainitff may file it's reply to defendant's response by 10/6/00 (signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 21 Filed: 9/12/2000, Entered: 9/13/2000 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF by COMMONWEALTH EDISON pursuant to the Court's 11/5/99 Order. Service: 9/12/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 20 Filed: 11/5/1999, Entered: 11/10/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [17-1] motion to Stay Proceedings. Further proceedings are stayed until the Federal Circuit issues its decision in Federal Circuit No. 99-5096. ( signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 19 Filed: 10/19/1999, Entered: 10/22/1999 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY by USA to response to [17-1] motion to Stay Proceedings. Service: 10/19/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 18 Filed: 10/7/1999, Entered: 10/12/1999 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by COMMONWEALTH EDISON (Service: 10/7/99 (by hand) ) to [17-1] motion to stay proceedings. Reply due: 10/19/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 17 Filed: 9/21/1999, Entered: 9/23/1999, Terminated: 11/5/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SECOND RENEWED MOTION by USA (Service: 9/21/99) to Stay Proceedings . Response due: 10/8/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 16 Filed: 5/28/1999, Entered: 6/3/1999 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by COMMONWEALTH EDISON (Service: 5/28/99) to [15-1] motion to stay all proceedings. Reply due: 6/11/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 15 Filed: 5/13/1999, Entered: 5/17/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RENEWED MOTION by USA (Service : 5/13/99 ) to stay all proceedings. Response due: 6/1/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 14 Filed: 4/26/1999, Entered: 4/29/1999 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by COMMONWEALTH EDISON. Service: 4/26/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 13 Filed: 4/26/1999, Entered: 4/29/1999, Terminated: 8/1/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by COMMONWEALTH EDISON (Service by hand: 4/26/99) for Partial Summary Judgment , (filed with an appendix of exhibits). Response due: 5/27/99. (FE) Modified on 04/29/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 12 Filed: 1/27/1999, Entered: 1/30/1999 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of reassignment to Judge Emily C. Hewitt . Copy to parties. (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 11 Filed: 11/5/1998, Entered: 11/9/1998 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by COMMONWEALTH EDISON to [9-1] order. Service: 11/5/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 10 Filed: 11/5/1998, Entered: 11/9/1998 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by USA to [9-1] order. Service: 11/5/98. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 9 Filed: 10/22/1998, Entered: 10/29/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER re: Counsel will advise the court within ten days whether a ruling in NORTHERN STATES will control this case ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 8 Filed: 10/20/1998, Entered: 10/26/1998 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY by USA to response to [5-1] motion to Stay all proceedings. Service: 10/20/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 7 Filed: 10/9/1998, Entered: 10/14/1998 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by COMMONWEALTH EDISON (Service by hand: 10/9/98) to [5-1] motion to Stay all proceedings. Reply due: 10/21/98. (HW) Modified on 10/14/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 6 Filed: 9/29/1998, Entered: 10/5/1998 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of filing a corrected certificate of service by USA. Service: 9/22/98 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 9/29/1998, Entered: 10/5/1998 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Deadline updated; Response to [5-1] motion to Stay all proceedings, reset to 10/9/98 . (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 5 Filed: 9/22/1998, Entered: 9/24/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 9/22/98 (by hand)) to Stay all proceedings. Response due: 10/6/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 4 Filed: 9/4/1998, Entered: 9/9/1998 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Franklin Elgin White Jr. Service : 9/4/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 8/19/1998, Entered: 8/19/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Joseph Andrew Kijewski. Service : 8/18/98. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 7/30/1998, Entered: 7/31/1998 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of assignment to Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. . Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 7/30/1998, Entered: 7/31/1998 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #045914. Answer due on 9/28/98. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 149 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?