RIGSBEE v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:98-cv-00623-JTT
District Judge James T. Turner, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo THOMAS E. RIGSBEE, Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel D. McClain
Office COFC
Filed 7/31/1998
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 346 - Military Pay - Correct/Reinstate
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 10/1/2002
Origin 4
Reopened 11/20/2000
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case 97-1957[District of Columbia]
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (55) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 49 Filed: 6/2/2003, Entered: 6/3/2003 CAFC Mandate Affirming
MANDATE of CAFC affirming [46] Unpublished Decision directing clerk of the court to enter [47] Judgment. (hw1, )
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 11/1/2002, Entered: 11/18/2002 Terminated:
    CAFC Case Number Re: [48-1] appeal by THOMAS E. RIGSBEE CAFC NUMBER: 03-5008 (HW)
      LREF
      Blank 48 Filed: 10/10/2002, Entered: 10/10/2002, Terminated: 6/2/2003 Notice of AppealCourt Filing
      NOTICE OF APPEAL by THOMAS E. RIGSBEE. Copy to Defendant, Judge James Turner and to C.A.F.C. FILING FEE $ 105.00; RECEIPT # 055096 (HW)
        LREF
        Blank 47 Filed: 10/1/2002, Entered: 10/1/2002
        JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, in favor of defendant and the complaint is dismissed. Pursuant to RCFC 54(d), costs are allowed to defendant ("the prevailing party"). (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD)
          LREF
          Blank 46 Filed: 10/1/2002, Entered: 10/1/2002 Court Filing
          UNPUBLISHED DECISION denying [32-1] motion to revise relief sought., denying [38-1] motion to Compel discovery., granting [39-1] motion for judgment upon the administrative record and directing the clerk to enter judgment in favor of defendant. Pursuant to RCFC 54(d), costs shall be allowed to defendant ("the prevailing party").. ( signed by Judge James T. Turner ). Copy to parties. (LD)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 10/1/2002, Entered: 10/1/2002
            Case closed (LD)
              LREF
              Blank 45 Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: 1/3/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
              RESPONSE by THOMAS E. RIGSBEE to [43-1] motion reply by USA, filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 12/21/00 (HW)
                LREF
                Blank 44 Filed: 12/26/2000, Entered: 12/27/2000 Reply to Response to Motion
                REPLY by THOMAS E. RIGSBEE to response to [38-1] motion to Compel discovery. Service: 12/21/00. (FE)
                  LREF
                  Blank 43 Filed: 12/18/2000, Entered: 12/20/2000 Reply to Response to Motion
                  REPLY by USA to response to [39-1] motion for judgment upon the administrative record. Service: 12/18/00 (JT)
                    LREF
                    Blank 42 Filed: 12/15/2000, Entered: 12/19/2000 Terminated:
                    RESPONSE by USA (Service: 12/15/00 ) to [38-1] motion to Compel discovery. Reply due: 12/29/00 (JT)
                      LREF
                      Blank 41 Filed: 12/11/2000, Entered: 12/12/2000 Terminated:
                      RESPONSE by THOMAS E. RIGSBEE (Service: 12/8/00) to [39-1] motion for judgment upon the administrative record. Reply due: 12/22/00. (FE)
                        LREF
                        Blank 40 Filed: 11/29/2000, Entered: 12/1/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER Response to [39-1] motion for judgment upon the administrative record reset to 12/29/00, and response to [38-1] motion to Compel discovery reset to 12/15/00. ( signed by Judge James T. Turner ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                          LREF
                          Blank 39 Filed: 11/28/2000, Entered: 11/30/2000 Terminated: Court Filing
                          RENEWED MOTION by USA (Service : 10/17/00 ) for judgment upon the administrative record. Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 11/17/00 (JT)
                            LREF
                            Blank 38 Filed: 11/28/2000, Entered: 11/30/2000 Terminated: Court Filing
                            MOTION by THOMAS E. RIGSBEE (Service : 10/20/00 ) to Compel discovery. Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 11/6/00 (JT)
                              LREF
                              Blank 37 Filed: 11/28/2000, Entered: 11/30/2000 MemorandumCourt Filing
                              BRIEF ON REMAND by THOMAS E. RIGSBEE. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 10/18/00 (JT)
                                LREF
                                Blank 36 Filed: 11/20/2000, Entered: 11/27/2000 Terminated:
                                MANDATE (certified copy) from CAFC dated November 20, 2000 reversing the [30-1] judgment order (HW)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 35 Filed: 11/2/2000, Entered: 11/6/2000 Reply to Response to Motion
                                  REPLY by THOMAS E. RIGSBEE to response to [32-1] motion to revise relief sought. Service: 10/31/00 (JT)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 34 Filed: 10/24/2000, Entered: 10/26/2000 Terminated:
                                    RESPONSE by USA (Service: 10/24/00 ) to [32-1] motion to revise relief sought. Reply due: 11/6/00 (JT)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 33 Filed: 10/18/2000, Entered: 10/23/2000 Notice of Appearance/
                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Daniel D. McClain Service : 10/18/00 (JT)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 32 Filed: 10/18/2000, Entered: 10/23/2000 Terminated: Court Filing
                                        MOTION by THOMAS E. RIGSBEE (Service : 10/10/00 ) to revise relief sought. Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 10/27/00 (JT)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 4/4/2000, Entered: 4/5/2000 Filing Fee Received
                                          Appeal Filing Fee Paid; FILING FEE $ 105.00. RECEIPT # 049391. (HW)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 4/3/2000, Entered: 4/10/2000 Terminated:
                                            CAFC Case Number Re: [31-1] appeal by THOMAS E. RIGSBEE. CAFC NUMBER: 00-5061. (HW)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 31 Filed: 3/30/2000, Entered: 3/30/2000, Terminated: 11/20/2000 Notice of AppealCourt Filing
                                              NOTICE OF APPEAL by THOMAS E. RIGSBEE. Copy to Defendant, Judge James T. Turner and to CAFC. Fee not paid. (HW)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 30 Filed: 2/29/2000, Entered: 2/29/2000
                                                JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that judgment is entered in favor of defendant and the complaint is dismissed. Each party shall bear its own costs. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD) Modified on 03/09/2000
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 29 Filed: 2/29/2000, Entered: 3/9/2000 Published DecisionCourt Filing
                                                  PUBLISHED DECISION granting [6-1] motion to Dismiss to the extent that it seeks dismissal for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. ( signed by Judge James T. Turner ). Copy to parties. (DS) Modified on 03/09/2000
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 2/29/2000, Entered: 2/29/2000
                                                    Case closed (LD)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 28 Filed: 3/23/1999, Entered: 3/25/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER denying [25-1] motion for Leave to File additional evidence in support of case against Defendant. ( signed by Judge James T. Turner ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 27 Filed: 3/17/1999, Entered: 3/19/1999 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                        REPLY by THOMAS E. RIGSBEE to response to [25-1] motion for Leave to File additional evidence in support of case against Defendant. Service: 3/13/99 (JT)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 26 Filed: 3/11/1999, Entered: 3/14/1999 Terminated:
                                                          RESPONSE by USA (Service: 3/11/99 ) to [25-1] motion for Leave to File additional evidence in support of case against Defendant. Reply due: 3/25/99 (JT)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 25 Filed: 2/24/1999, Entered: 2/26/1999, Terminated: 3/23/1999 Terminated:
                                                            MOTION by THOMAS E. RIGSBEE (Service : 2/22/99 ) for Leave to File additional evidence in support of case against Defendant. Response due: 3/11/99 (JT) Modified on 02/26/1999
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 24 Filed: 2/18/1999, Entered: 2/23/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER denying [23-1] motion for authorization of service of subpoenas more than 100 miles from place of trial (signed by Judge James T. Turner ). Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 23 Filed: 2/16/1999, Entered: 2/18/1999, Terminated: 2/18/1999 Terminated:
                                                                MOTION by THOMAS E. RIGSBEE (Service : 2/11/99 ) for authorization of service of subpoenas more than 100 miles from place of trial. Response due: 3/1/99 (JT)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 22 Filed: 2/16/1999, Entered: 2/18/1999 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                  RESPONSE by THOMAS E. RIGSBEE re: [21-1] Surreply by USA. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 2/11/99 (JT)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 21 Filed: 2/9/1999, Entered: 2/11/1999 Memorandum
                                                                    SURREPLY by USA re: [6-1] motion to Dismiss by USA, [6-2] motion for Judgment upon the Administrative Record by USA. Service: 2/9/99 (JT)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 20 Filed: 1/26/1999, Entered: 1/29/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                      ORDER mooting Plaintiff's motion filed 1/19/99 to deny Defendant's motion for leave to file a sur-sur-reply. ( signed by Judge James T. Turner ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 19 Filed: 1/19/1999, Entered: 1/23/1999 Terminated:
                                                                        COUNTER MOTION and RESPONSE by THOMAS E. RIGSBEE (Service: 1/15/99 ) to [16-1] motion for Leave to file a surreply in support of motion to dismiss, or, in the alternative, for judgment upon the administrative record. Reply due: 2/1/99.(HW) Modified on 01/29/1999
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 18 Filed: 1/19/1999, Entered: 1/22/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                          ORDER granting [16-1] motion for Leave to file a surreply in support of motion to dismiss, or, in the alternative, for judgment upon the administrative record . Sur-reply by 2/9/99 ( signed by Judge James T. Turner ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 16 Filed: 1/8/1999, Entered: 1/11/1999, Terminated: 1/19/1999 Terminated:
                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 1/8/99 ) for Leave to file a surreply in support of motion to dismiss, or, in the alternative, for judgment upon the administrative record . Response due: 1/25/99. (FE)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 17 Filed: 1/6/1999, Entered: 1/12/1999 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                              NOTICE of response to defendant's reply in support of its motion to dismiss, or, in the alternative, for judgment upon the administrative record by THOMAS E. RIGSBEE, filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 12/31/98. (HW)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 15 Filed: 11/20/1998, Entered: 12/1/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                ORDER granting [14-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to reply to motion to dismiss, or, in the alternative, for judgment upon the administrative record. Defendant's reply to response to motion reset to 12/9/98 for [6-1] motion to Dismiss, reset to 12/9/98 for [6-2] motion for Judgment upon the Administrative Record. ( signed by Judge James T. Turner ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 14 Filed: 11/17/1998, Entered: 11/19/1998, Terminated: 11/20/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 11/17/98 ) to Extend Time to respond to reply to motion to dismiss, or, in the alternative, for judgment upon the administrative record , (until December 9, 1998). Response due: 12/18/98. (FE)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 13 Filed: 11/6/1998, Entered: 11/10/1998 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                                    AMENDMENT by THOMAS E. RIGSBEE re: [11-1] motion response by THOMAS E. RIGSBEE. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 11/3/98 (JT)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 12 Filed: 11/4/1998, Entered: 11/6/1998 Statement of FactsCourt Filing
                                                                                      STATEMENT OF FACTS filed by THOMAS E. RIGSBEE. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 10/31/98 (JT)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 11 Filed: 11/4/1998, Entered: 11/6/1998 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                        RESPONSE by THOMAS E. RIGSBEE (Service: 10/31/98 ) to [6-1] motion to Dismiss, [6-2] motion for Judgment upon the Administrative Record. Filed by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 11/17/98 (JT)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 9 Filed: 10/15/1998, Entered: 10/15/1998
                                                                                          Administrative record, consisting of one bound volume, filed by USA. (DS)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 8 Filed: 10/15/1998, Entered: 10/15/1998 Court Filing
                                                                                            ORDER granting [7-1] motion for Leave to file the administrative record ( signed by Judge James T. Turner ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 10 Filed: 10/13/1998, Entered: 10/16/1998 Statement of Facts
                                                                                              STATEMENT OF FACTS filed by USA. Service: 10/13/98 (JT)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 7 Filed: 10/13/1998, Entered: 10/15/1998, Terminated: 10/15/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 10/13/98 ) for Leave to file the administrative record . Response due: 10/30/98. (FE)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 6 Filed: 10/13/1998, Entered: 10/14/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 10/13/98 ) to Dismiss , or, in the alternative, for Judgment upon the Administrative Record. Response due: 11/13/98 (JT)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 5 Filed: 8/31/1998, Entered: 9/2/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER re: Special procedures ( signed by Judge James T. Turner ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 4 Filed: 8/27/1998, Entered: 8/28/1998 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Katherine Mary Kelly. Service: 8/27/98. (FE)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 3 Filed: 8/18/1998, Entered: 8/18/1998 Court Filing
                                                                                                        Notice of assignment to Judge James T. Turner . Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 2 Filed: 8/13/1998, Entered: 8/14/1998 Complaint
                                                                                                          COMPLAINT filed. Copies (5) to defendant. Answer due on 10/13/98 (DS)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 7/31/1998, Entered: 8/4/1998 Case Transferred In - District Transfer
                                                                                                            Record transferred from the U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia, case number 97-cv-1957, consisting of 2 bound volumes. Notice to parties. (Amended complaint due by 8/28/98). (FE)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 7/31/1998, Entered: 8/4/1998 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                                                              CASE assigned to Judge Unassigned. (FE)
                                                                                                                LREF

                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 141 times.

                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                Need Password Help?