BROWN v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:98-cv-00102-CCM
District Judge Christine O.C. Miller, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo CHARLES W. BROWN, JR., Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William George Kanellis +1 202 353 0526 +1 202 514 8640 william.kanellis@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 2/9/1998
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 346 - Military Pay - Correct/Reinstate
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 12/10/1998
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (38) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 33 Filed: 9/30/1999, Entered: 10/8/1999 CAFC Mandate Affirming
MANDATE (certified copy) from CAFC dated September 30, 1999 affirmed [31-1] judgment order. (HW)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 1/25/1999, Entered: 1/27/1999 CAFC Case Number
    CAFC Case Number Re: [32-1] appeal by CHARLES W. BROWN JR. CAFC NUMBER: 99-5042 (HW)
      LREF
      Blank 32 Filed: 1/22/1999, Entered: 1/22/1999, Terminated: 9/30/1999 Notice of AppealCourt Filing
      NOTICE OF APPEAL by CHARLES W. BROWN JR. Copy to Defendant, Judge Miller and to CAFC. FILING FEE $105.00; RECEIPT # 046890. (HW)
        LREF
        Blank 31 Filed: 12/10/1998, Entered: 12/10/1998
        JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that defendant recover of and from plaintiff the sum of $33,045.00. No costs. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD)
          LREF
          Blank 30 Filed: 12/10/1998, Entered: 12/10/1998 Court Filing
          ORDER granting [26-1] defendant's motion for Summary Judgment, and directing the Clerk to enter judgment in favor of defendant in the amount of $33,045.00. No costs. ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (LD)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 12/10/1998, Entered: 12/10/1998
            Case closed (LD)
              LREF
              Blank 29 Filed: 11/30/1998, Entered: 12/7/1998 Reply to Response to Motion
              REPLY by USA to response to [26-1] motion for Summary Judgment. Service: 11/30/98 (JT)
                LREF
                Blank 28 Filed: 11/19/1998, Entered: 11/30/1998 Terminated: Court Filing
                RESPONSE by CHARLES W. BROWN JR. to [26-1] motion for Summary Judgment. Filed by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 12/7/98 (JT)
                  LREF
                  Blank 27 Filed: 10/30/1998, Entered: 11/5/1998 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                  PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by CHARLES W. BROWN JR. Service: 10/30/98 (DS)
                    LREF
                    Blank 26 Filed: 10/30/1998, Entered: 11/3/1998, Terminated: 12/10/1998 Terminated:
                    MOTION by USA (Service : 10/30/98 ) for Summary Judgment . Response due: 11/30/98. (FE)
                      LREF
                      Blank 25 Filed: 10/26/1998, Entered: 10/29/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER returing to Plaintiff as unfiled the complaint and check. Plaintiff may obtain counsel if he so desires. This court does not have the authority to appoint counsel. ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                        LREF
                        Blank 24 Filed: 10/5/1998, Entered: 10/9/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER set Defendant's motion for summary judgment filing deadline to 10/30/98. ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                          LREF
                          Blank 23 Filed: 9/30/1998, Entered: 10/1/1998 Status Report
                          STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 9/30/98. (FE)
                            LREF
                            Blank 22 Filed: 9/15/1998, Entered: 9/21/1998 Published DecisionCourt Filing
                            PUBLISHED DECISION granting [13-1] motion to Dismiss, denying [20-1] motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Set Notice of Compliance deadline to 9/30/98 for Defendant to advise the court whether it intends to proceed on the counterclaim. ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ). Copy to parties. (JT)
                              LREF
                              Blank 21 Filed: 9/3/1998, Entered: 9/8/1998 Terminated:
                              RESPONSE by USA (Service: 9/3/98 ) to [20-1] motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and correction of Plaintiff's response. Reply due: 9/21/98 (JT)
                                LREF
                                Blank 20 Filed: 8/26/1998, Entered: 8/26/1998
                                NOTICE of correction of plaintiff's response to the respondant's dismiss and counterclaim by CHARLES W. BROWN JR. FIled by leave of the judge. Copy to defendant. Service: 8/26/98 (AB)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 20 Filed: 8/26/1998, Entered: 8/26/1998, Terminated: 9/15/1998 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings
                                  MOTION by CHARLES W. BROWN JR. (Service : 8/26/98 ) for Judgment on the Pleadings Filed by leave of the judge. Copy to defendant. Response due: 9/28/98 (AB)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 19 Filed: 7/31/1998, Entered: 8/5/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                    ORDER granting [16-1] motion to Extend Time to reply to Plaintiff's response to motion to dismiss Reply to Response to Motion reset to 7/30/98 for [13-1] motion to Dismiss ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 18 Filed: 7/31/1998, Entered: 8/5/1998 Notice of Appearance/
                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by William George Kanellis. Service : 7/31/98 (DS)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 17 Filed: 7/30/1998, Entered: 8/3/1998 Reply to Response to Motion
                                        REPLY by USA to response to [13-1] motion to Dismiss. Service: 7/30/98. (HW)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 16 Filed: 7/27/1998, Entered: 7/31/1998, Terminated: 7/31/1998 Terminated:
                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 7/27/98 ) to Extend Time to reply to Plaintiff's response to motion to dismiss [to July 30, 1998]. Response due: 8/13/98 (JT)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 15 Filed: 7/10/1998, Entered: 7/16/1998 Answer to Counterclaim
                                            ANSWER by CHARLES W. BROWN JR. to [12-2] counter claim by USA. Service: 7/8/98 JPSR due 8/25/98 (JT)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 15 Filed: 7/10/1998, Entered: 7/16/1998 Terminated:
                                              RESPONSE by CHARLES W. BROWN JR.(Service: 7/8/98 ) to [13-1] motion to Dismiss. Reply due: 7/27/98 (JT)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 14 Filed: 7/2/1998, Entered: 7/10/1998 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                MOTION by CHARLES W. BROWN JR. (Service : 6/24/98 ) for Entry of Default as to USA Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 7/20/98 (CDC)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 13 Filed: 6/24/1998, Entered: 6/26/1998 Terminated:
                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 6/24/98) to Dismiss Response due: 7/27/98. (FE)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 12 Filed: 6/24/1998, Entered: 6/26/1998 Description not available
                                                    ANSWER to Complaint and COUNTERCLAIM by USA against CHARLES W. BROWN JR. Service: 6/24/98 (Answer to counterclaim due 7/17/98). (FE)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 11 Filed: 6/11/1998, Entered: 6/12/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER granting [9-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint. Defendant shall respond to the complaint by 6/24/98. No further extensions. (signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 9 Filed: 6/10/1998, Entered: 6/10/1998, Terminated: 6/11/1998 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 6/10/98 ) to Extend Time to respond to the comlaint [until 6/24/98 ] Response due: 6/29/98 (AB)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 10 Filed: 6/9/1998, Entered: 6/10/1998 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                          MOTION by CHARLES W. BROWN JR. for Default Judgment. Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 4/8/98 (JT)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 8 Filed: 6/1/1998, Entered: 6/3/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER granting [7-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to complaint. Reset Answer deadline to 6/10/98. ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 7 Filed: 5/8/1998, Entered: 5/11/1998, Terminated: 6/1/1998 Terminated:
                                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 5/8/98) to Extend Time to respond to complaint until 6/10/98. Response due: 5/26/98. (FE)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 6 Filed: 4/28/1998, Entered: 4/30/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER granting [4-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint. Reset Answer deadline to 5/11/98. ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 5 Filed: 4/21/1998, Entered: 4/27/1998 RemarkCourt Filing
                                                                  Letter dated April 13, 1998 from Charles W. Brown, Jr. to Clerk of Court. Filed by leave of the Judge. (JT)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 4/10/1998, Entered: 4/13/1998, Terminated: 4/28/1998 Terminated:
                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 4/9/98 ) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint. (to May 11, 1998) Response due: 4/27/98 (DS)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 2/24/1998, Entered: 2/25/1998 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by John Peebles Sholar Jr. Service : 2/24/98. (HW)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 2/11/1998, Entered: 2/11/1998 Court Filing
                                                                        Notice of assignment to Judge Christine O.C. Miller. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 2/9/1998, Entered: 2/10/1998 Complaint
                                                                          COMPLAINT (Filed with Exhibits A through F), FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #044968. Answer due on 4/10/98. (FE)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 2/9/1998, Entered: 2/10/1998 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                            CASE assigned to Judge Unassigned. (FE)
                                                                              LREF

                                                                              Statistics

                                                                              This case has been viewed 168 times.

                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                              Space
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                               
                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                              Need Password Help?