NOLAN v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:98-cv-00124-MBH
District Judge Marian Blank Horn, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo GUY R. NOLAN, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by FELDESMAN TUCKER LEIFER FIDELL LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Eugene R. Fidell +1 202 466 8960 +1 202 293 8103 efidell@feldesmantucker.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew David Lee
Office COFC
Filed 2/18/1998
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 346 - Military Pay - Correct/Reinstate
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 7/19/1999
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (31) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 27 Filed: 7/20/1999, Entered: 7/26/1999 Certified Transcript to Attorney
CERTIFIED TRANSCRIPT OF JUDGMENT, dated July 20, 1999, forwarded to attorney of record. See letter in file. (FE)
    LREF
    Blank 26 Filed: 7/19/1999, Entered: 7/19/1999
    JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that: A) Defendant shall correct plaintiff's military records to reflect that plaintiff has served continuously on active duty in the United States Coast Guard from May 25, 1977 through the present. Plaintiff currently serves in the grade of Lieutenant Commander. B) Defendant shall pay plaintiff back pay and allowances for the period from March 1, 1993 through July 2, 1999, less applicable offsets and deductions, in the total amount of $280,756.98 (See Attached Stipulation for Entry of Judgment, (page 2)). C) Defendant shall pay plaintiff active duty pay and allowances commensurate with the grade of Lieutenant Commander beginning July 2, 1999. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD)
      LREF
      Blank 25 Filed: 7/19/1999, Entered: 7/19/1999
      Stipulation by GUY R. NOLAN, USA of Entry of Judgment (LD)
        LREF
        Blank 24 Filed: 7/19/1999, Entered: 7/19/1999 Court Filing
        ORDER granting [23-1] motion for Leave to File stipulation out of time, and directing the clerk to enter judgment pursuant to the stipulation. ( signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn ) Copy to parties. (LD)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 7/19/1999, Entered: 7/19/1999
          Case closed (LD)
            LREF
            Blank 23 Filed: 7/13/1999, Entered: 7/14/1999, Terminated: 7/19/1999 Terminated:
            MOTION by USA (Service : 7/13/99 ) for Leave to File stipulation out of time. Response due: 7/30/99 (JT)
              LREF
              Blank 22 Filed: 7/9/1999, Entered: 7/12/1999 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER granting [21-1] motion to Extend Time to file a proposed stipulation regarding an appropriate remedy and damages. Reset Notice of Compliance deadline to 7/12/99 for the parties to file a proposed stipulation. signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 07/12/1999
                LREF
                Blank 21 Filed: 7/2/1999, Entered: 7/6/1999, Terminated: 7/9/1999 Terminated:
                MOTION by USA (Service : 7/2/99 ) to Extend Time to file a proposed stipulation regarding an appropriate remedy and damages [until July 12, 1999]. Response due: 7/19/99 (JT)
                  LREF
                  Blank 20 Filed: 6/24/1999, Entered: 6/25/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                  ORDER granting [19-1] motion to Extend Time to file proposed stipulation regarding an appropriate remedy and damages. Reset Notice of Compliance deadline to 7/2/99 for the parties to file a proposed stipulation. ( signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                    LREF
                    Blank 19 Filed: 6/14/1999, Entered: 6/17/1999, Terminated: 6/24/1999 Terminated:
                    MOTION by USA (Service: 6/14/99) to Extend Time to file proposed stipulation regarding an apprpriate remedy and damages , (until July 2, 1999). (FE)
                      LREF
                      Blank 18 Filed: 6/9/1999, Entered: 6/10/1999 Transcript
                      TRANSCRIPT of proceedings 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of May 11, 1999. Notice to parties. (FE)
                        LREF
                        Blank 17 Filed: 5/28/1999, Entered: 6/3/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER set Notice of Compliance deadline to 6/18/99 for the parties to file a proposed stipulation that encompasses a remedy consistent with the intent of the court's opinion in favor of the Plaintiff, including joint stipulations as to the appropriate amount of damages. ( signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                          LREF
                          Blank 16 Filed: 5/28/1999, Entered: 6/3/1999 Published DecisionCourt Filing
                          PUBLISHED DECISION granting [7-1] cross motion, denying [6-1] motion to dismiss. ( signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn ). Copy to parties. (JT)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 5/11/1999, Entered: 5/12/1999 Oral Argument
                            Oral Argument re: [6-1] motion to Dismiss by USA ( Transcript due 6/10/99 ), [7-1] cross motion by GUY R. NOLAN ( Transcript due 6/10/99 ) (DS)
                              LREF
                              Blank 15 Filed: 4/29/1999, Entered: 5/3/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                              ORDER oral argument set for 10:00 a.m. 5/11/99 for [7-1] cross motion, set for 10:00 a.m. 5/11/99 for [6-1] motion to Dismiss in the National Courts Building, 717 Madison Pl., N.W., Washington, D.C. 20005 (signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                LREF
                                Blank 14 Filed: 7/22/1998, Entered: 7/24/1998 Reply to Response to Motion
                                REPLY by GUY R. NOLAN to response to [7-1] cross motion. Service: 7/22/98 (JT)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 13 Filed: 7/15/1998, Entered: 7/22/1998 Terminated:
                                  RESPONSE by USA (Service: 7/14/98 ) to [7-1] cross motion. Reply due: 8/11/98 (JT)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 13 Filed: 7/15/1998, Entered: 7/22/1998 Reply to Response to Motion
                                    REPLY by USA to response to [6-1] motion to Dismiss. Service: 7/14/98 (JT)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 12 Filed: 7/15/1998, Entered: 7/21/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                      ORDER granting [11-1] motion for Leave to file a consolidated brief. ( signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 11 Filed: 7/14/1998, Entered: 7/20/1998, Terminated: 7/15/1998 Terminated:
                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 7/14/98) for Leave to file a consolidated brief Response due: 7/1/98. (FE)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 10 Filed: 6/30/1998, Entered: 7/2/1998 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law
                                          JOINT ISSUES OF FACT AND LAW by GUY R. NOLAN, USA. (JT)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 9 Filed: 6/5/1998, Entered: 6/8/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                            ORDER directing parties to file a joint stipulation of facts and a joint statement of issues of law by 6/30/98 , defendant to file its Reply to Response to Motion to dismiss by 7/14/98 , defendant to respond to [7-1] cross motion by 7/28/98 , plaintiff to Reply to Response to cross-motion by 8/11/98. ( signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 8 Filed: 6/1/1998, Entered: 6/2/1998 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                              PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by GUY R. NOLAN. Service: 6/1/98 (JT)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 7 Filed: 6/1/1998, Entered: 6/2/1998 Terminated:
                                                CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment by GUY R. NOLAN ( Service: 6/1/98 ) and RESPONSE to [6-1] motion to Dismiss by USA. Response due: 7/2/98 (JT)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank -- Filed: 6/1/1998, Entered: 6/2/1998 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                  Deadline updated; response to [7-1] cross motion reset to 7/2/98. (JT)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 6 Filed: 5/20/1998, Entered: 5/21/1998 Terminated:
                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 5/20/98) to Dismiss . Response due: 6/22/98. (HW)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 5 Filed: 4/20/1998, Entered: 4/24/1998 Order
                                                      ORDER granting [4-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint. reset Answer deadline to 5/20/98 ( signed by the Clerk ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 4 Filed: 4/20/1998, Entered: 4/24/1998, Terminated: 4/20/1998 Terminated:
                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 4/20/98 ) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint. (to May 20, 1998) (DS)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 3 Filed: 3/5/1998, Entered: 3/6/1998 Notice of Appearance/
                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Matthew David Lee. Service : 3/5/98 (JT)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 2 Filed: 2/18/1998, Entered: 2/19/1998 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                            Notice of assignment to Judge Marian Blank Horn. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 2/18/1998, Entered: 2/19/1998 Complaint
                                                              COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #045018. Answer due on 4/20/98. (FE)
                                                                LREF

                                                                Statistics

                                                                This case has been viewed 210 times.

                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                Space
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                 
                                                                PlainSite
                                                                Sign Up
                                                                Need Password Help?