YANKEE ATOMIC v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:98-cv-00126-JFM
District Judge James F. Merow, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenberg Traurig, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jerry Stouck +1 202 331 3173 +1 202 331 3101 stouckj@gtlaw.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Harold Dewitt Lester, Jr. +1 202 616 0478 +1 202 307 2503 harv.lester@usdoj.gov
No Logo American Electric Power Company, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alexander D. Tomaszczuk +1 703 770 7940 +1 703 770 7901 alex.tomaszczuk@pillsburylaw.com
No Logo Carolina Power And Light Company, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alexander D. Tomaszczuk +1 703 770 7940 +1 703 770 7901 alex.tomaszczuk@pillsburylaw.com
No Logo Detroit Edison Company, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alexander D. Tomaszczuk +1 703 770 7940 +1 703 770 7901 alex.tomaszczuk@pillsburylaw.com
No Logo Ohio Edison Company, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alexander D. Tomaszczuk +1 703 770 7940 +1 703 770 7901 alex.tomaszczuk@pillsburylaw.com
No Logo PENNSYLVANIA POWER COMPANY, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alexander D. Tomaszczuk +1 703 770 7940 +1 703 770 7901 alex.tomaszczuk@pillsburylaw.com
No Logo Public Service Electric And Gas Company, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alexander D. Tomaszczuk +1 703 770 7940 +1 703 770 7901 alex.tomaszczuk@pillsburylaw.com
No Logo Rochester Gas & Electric Corporation, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alexander D. Tomaszczuk +1 703 770 7940 +1 703 770 7901 alex.tomaszczuk@pillsburylaw.com
No Logo South Carolina Electric & Gas Company, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alexander D. Tomaszczuk +1 703 770 7940 +1 703 770 7901 alex.tomaszczuk@pillsburylaw.com
No Logo UNION ELECTRIC COMPANY D/B/A/ AMERENUE, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alexander D. Tomaszczuk +1 703 770 7940 +1 703 770 7901 alex.tomaszczuk@pillsburylaw.com
No Logo Virginia Electric And Power Company, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alexander D. Tomaszczuk +1 703 770 7940 +1 703 770 7901 alex.tomaszczuk@pillsburylaw.com
No Logo WOLF CREEK NUCLEAR OPERATING CORPORATION, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alexander D. Tomaszczuk +1 703 770 7940 +1 703 770 7901 alex.tomaszczuk@pillsburylaw.com
No Logo CONNECTICUT DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC UTILITY CONTROL, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Kaye Scholer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Randall L. Speck +1 202 682 3510 RSpeck@kayescholer.com
No Logo MAINE PUBLIC UTILITIES COMMISION, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Kaye Scholer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Randall L. Speck +1 202 682 3510 RSpeck@kayescholer.com
Office COFC
Filed 2/18/1998
Jury Demand None
Demand $210000000
Nature of Suit 536 - Spent Nuclear Fuel
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Judgment
County None
Terminated 10/4/2006
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Cases '07-5025'[], '07-5031'[]
Def Custody Status
Flags APPEAL, CLOSED, CRSAPP, ECF, SNF
  Entries (1070) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Latest 500DividerNext 500DividerPrevious 500DividerEarliest 500

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 956 Filed: 8/21/2007, Entered: 8/21/2007 Court Filing
ORDER re Mr. William Peterson's submissions of July 23, 2007. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae)
    LREF
    Legal Document 955 Filed: 4/25/2007, Entered: 4/25/2007 Court Filing
    ORDER RETURNING UNFILED: Motion to Intervene, Memorandum, Complaint and Certificate of Service received April 17 and 18, 2007. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae)
      LREF
      Legal Document 954 Filed: 12/22/2006, Entered: 12/22/2006
      CAFC Case Number 07-5031 for [953] Notice of Cross Appeal filed by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY. (hw1, )
        LREF
        Legal Document 952 Filed: 12/15/2006, Entered: 12/15/2006
        CAFC Case Number 07-5025 for [951] Notice of Appeal filed by USA. (hw1, )
          LREF
          Legal Document 953 Filed: 12/14/2006, Entered: 12/18/2006 Notice of cross-appeal
          NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL, filed by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY. Filing fee $ 455.00, receipt number 065833. (hw1, ) .
            LREF
            Legal Document 951 Filed: 12/4/2006, Entered: 12/5/2006 Notice of AppealCourt Filing
            NOTICE OF APPEAL to [947] Judgment filed by USA. Copies to Senior Judge James F. Merow, opposing party and CAFC. (dw1)
              LREF
              Legal Document 950 Filed: 11/22/2006, Entered: 11/22/2006 Court Filing
              ORDER granting [949] Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                LREF
                Legal Document 949 Filed: 11/21/2006, Entered: 11/21/2006, Terminated: 11/22/2006 Motion to Amend/Correct
                Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Court's October 17, 2006 Docket Order Sealing Certain Trial Exhibits, filed by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY.Response due by 12/8/2006.(Stouck, Jerry)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 948 Filed: 10/5/2006, Entered: 10/5/2006
                  Certified transcript of judgment forwarded to Jerry Stouck. (dls )
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 947 Filed: 10/4/2006, Entered: 10/4/2006
                    JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that plaintiffs recover of and from the United States, the following total amounts: (1) Yankee Atomic - $32,866.087.55; (2) Connecticut Yankee - $34,154,879.00; and (3) Maine Yankee - $75,774,554.00. (dls)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 946 Filed: 10/4/2006, Entered: 10/4/2006 Court Filing
                      REISSUED PUBLISHED OPINION and ORDER. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment as set forth in the REISSUED OPINION and ORDER filed this day in this and 98-154 C, and 98-474 C. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 945 Filed: 10/4/2006, Entered: 10/4/2006 Court Filing
                        ORDER granting [944] Motion to Unseal Document (filed in this and 98-154C and 98-474C. The Opinion originally filed under seal on September 30, 2006, with minor non-substantive edits, including an addition correction in the amount awarded to Yankee Atomic for deposition expenses, shall now be issued without the "sealed" restriction. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 944 Filed: 10/3/2006, Entered: 10/3/2006, Terminated: 10/4/2006 Motion to Unseal Document
                          MOTION to Unseal Document [941] Sealed Opinion/Order, filed by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY.Response due by 10/20/2006.(Stouck, Jerry)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 943 Filed: 9/30/2006, Entered: 9/30/2006 Court Filing
                            ERRATA ORDER: The court's sealed Order and Opinion of this date, Conclusion, Paragraph 5 is amended to correct a case number. (Filed only in 98-126 C) Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 942 Filed: 9/30/2006, Entered: 9/30/2006 Court Filing
                              ORDER: (1) The Opinion issued this date shall be temporarily filed under seal with access restricted to persons covered by the applicable protective order(s); (2) Counsel shall promptly review the sealed Opinion and notify the court if any portion of the Opinion is discovered to comprise sealed material and, if so, the exact portion concerned; (3)Absent any notice pursuant to (2) filed on or before October 10, 2006, the Opinion will be unsealed by an appropriate Order. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                LREF
                                Sealed Legal Document 941 Filed: 9/30/2006, Entered: 9/30/2006 Court Filing
                                **SEALED**SEALED OPINION and ORDER: The Clerk is directed to enter judgment as set forth in the SEALED OPINION and ORDER filed this day in this and 98-154 C, and 98-474 C. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 940 Filed: 5/5/2006, Entered: 5/5/2006 Court Filing
                                  ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint shall be GRANTED to the extent that the Complaint shall be deemed amended and supplemented to encompass sustained damages, based on record evidence, through 2001 for Yankee Atomic and Connecticut Yankee and through 2002 for Maine Yankee, and shall be otherwise DENIED. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 939 Filed: 4/17/2006, Entered: 4/17/2006
                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re [931] MOTION to Amend Pleadings - Rule 15 [1] Complaint, filed by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 938 Filed: 4/4/2006, Entered: 4/4/2006
                                      RESPONSE to [931] MOTION to Amend Pleadings - Rule 15 [1] Complaint, filed by USA. Reply due by 4/18/2006. (Lester, Harold)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 937 Filed: 3/31/2006, Entered: 3/31/2006 Court Filing
                                        ORDER Striking [936] Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply and Granting [935] Second MOTION for Extension of Time until 4/4/2006 to File Response or Reply as to [931] MOTION to Amend Pleadings - Rule 15 [1] Complaint, Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (teq)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 936 Filed: 3/30/2006, Entered: 3/30/2006, Terminated: 3/31/2006 Court Filing
                                          (STRIKING ORDER PURSUANT TO ORDER DOC #937) ORDER granting [935] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's motion for leave to file an amended complaint. Response due by 4/4/2006. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, ) Modified on 4/4/2006 (lg1, ).
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 935 Filed: 3/30/2006, Entered: 3/30/2006, Terminated: 3/30/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                            Second MOTION for Extension of Time until 4/4/2006 to File Response or Reply as to [931] MOTION to Amend Pleadings - Rule 15 [1] Complaint, filed by USA. Response due by 4/17/2006.(Lester, Harold)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 934 Filed: 3/21/2006, Entered: 3/21/2006 Court Filing
                                              ORDER granting in part [932] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re [931] MOTION to Amend Pleadings - Rule 15 [1] Complaint. Response due by 3/30/2006. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 933 Filed: 3/20/2006, Entered: 3/20/2006
                                                RESPONSE to [932] MOTION for Extension of Time until 3/30/2006 to File Response or Reply as to [931] MOTION to Amend Pleadings - Rule 15 [1] Complaint (Filed One Day Out of Time), filed by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY. Reply due by 4/3/2006. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 1045 Filed: 7/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  ORDER re 1039 Defendant's motion for the return of plaintiff's bill of costs or its dismissal: GRANTED to the extent provided in this order and is, otherwise, DENIED. This shall also be deemed applicable in Connecticut Yankee v. United States, No. 98-154 C and Maine Yankee v. United States, No. 98-474 C. Signed by Senior Judge James F. Merow. (lae) Copy to parties.
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 932 Filed: 3/17/2006, Entered: 3/17/2006, Terminated: 3/21/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time until 3/30/2006 to File Response or Reply as to [931] MOTION to Amend Pleadings - Rule 15 [1] Complaint (Filed One Day Out of Time), filed by USA. Response due by 4/3/2006. (Lester, Harold)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 931 Filed: 2/27/2006, Entered: 2/27/2006, Terminated: 5/5/2006 Motion to Amend Pleadings - Rule 15
                                                      MOTION to Amend Pleadings - Rule 15 [1] Complaint, filed by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY. Response due by 3/16/2006. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 929 Filed: 1/12/2006, Entered: 1/12/2006 Court Filing
                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on January 10, 2006 before Judge James F. Merow. (dw1)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank -- Filed: 1/12/2006, Entered: 1/12/2006
                                                          Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 2/10/2006. (vp1, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 928 Filed: 1/5/2006, Entered: 1/5/2006
                                                            RESPONSE to [923] Supplemental Brief,, filed by USA. (Lester, Harold)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 927 Filed: 1/5/2006, Entered: 1/5/2006
                                                              RESPONSE to [922] Response filed by Government Addressing Indiana Michigan, filed by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY, CONNECTICUT YANKEE ATOMIC POWER COMPANY, MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC POWER COMPANY. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Part 1# (2) Appendix Part 2)(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 926 Filed: 12/22/2005, Entered: 12/22/2005 Court Filing
                                                                ORDER granting [924] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Supplemental Post Trial Brief. Response due by 1/5/2006. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 925 Filed: 12/22/2005, Entered: 12/22/2005
                                                                  RESPONSE to [924] MOTION for Extension of Time until 1/5/2006 to File Response or Reply as to [923] Supplemental Brief,, filed by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY. Reply due by 1/5/2006. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 924 Filed: 12/22/2005, Entered: 12/22/2005, Terminated: 12/22/2005 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time until 1/5/2006 to File Response or Reply as to [923] Supplemental Brief,, filed by USA. Response due by 1/9/2006. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 923 Filed: 12/6/2005, Entered: 12/6/2005
                                                                      SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re: [919] Scheduling Order,,, filed by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY, CONNECTICUT YANKEE ATOMIC POWER COMPANY, MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC POWER COMPANY. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Part 1# (2) Appendix Part 2# (3) Appendix Part 3# (4) Appendix Part 4# (5) Appendix Part 5# (6) Appendix Part 6# (7) Appendix Part 7)(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 922 Filed: 12/6/2005, Entered: 12/6/2005
                                                                        RESPONSE to [915] Scheduling Order,,, filed by USA. (Herrmann, Heide)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 921 Filed: 12/5/2005, Entered: 12/5/2005 Court Filing
                                                                          ORDER granting [920] Motion for Extension of Time. Post Trial Brief due 12/6/2005. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 920 Filed: 12/2/2005, Entered: 12/2/2005, Terminated: 12/5/2005 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 12/06/05 to File Post-Trial Briefs Addressing Impact of Indiana Michigan, filed by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY. Response due by 12/19/2005. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 919 Filed: 11/8/2005, Entered: 11/8/2005 Court Filing
                                                                              RE-SCHEDULING ORDER: By conference call on November 7, 2005, parties requested a modification of the supplemental briefing and oral argument schedule. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that: (1) Initial submissions by each party addressing the effect of the decision rendered in Indiana Michigan Power Co. v. United States, 422 F.3d 1369 (Fed. Cir. 2005) shall be filed on December 2, 2005; (2) Parties' responsive submissions shall be filed on December 23, 2005;(3) Oral Argument shall be scheduled for January 10, 2006 at 10:30 a.m., at the National Courts Building in Washington, DC. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 918 Filed: 10/11/2005, Entered: 10/11/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER: Oral Argument set for 12/19/2005 10:30 AM in the National Courts Building before Senior Judge James F. Merow. Courtroom assignment will be posted in the lobby. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 10/11/2005, Entered: 10/12/2005 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                  Set/Reset Deadlines: Initial submissions by each party due by 11/17/2005 and parties' responsive submissions due by 12/8/2005. (jat, )
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 917 Filed: 10/7/2005, Entered: 10/7/2005
                                                                                    MEMORANDUM re: [915] Scheduling Order,, by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY, USA. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 916 Filed: 10/3/2005, Entered: 10/3/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                      RE-SCHEDULING ORDER: Memorandum due by 10/7/2005. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 915 Filed: 9/12/2005, Entered: 9/12/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER:The decision rendered in Indiana Michigan Power Co. v. United States, __ F.3d __, 2005 WL 2173563 (Fed. Cir. Sept. 9, 2005) impacts on the damages which may be considered for an award in this litigation. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that the parties shall confer and, on or before October 5, 2005, file a memorandum(s) setting forth a proposed schedule(s) for supplemental submissions detailing, with specificity, the damage items which may be addressed in this litigation in accord with the Federal Circuit's ruling.Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 914 Filed: 7/6/2005, Entered: 7/6/2005
                                                                                          NOTICE of Change of Address by Jerry Stouck (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 910 Filed: 4/11/2005, Entered: 4/11/2005, Terminated: 9/30/2006 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION Yankee Atomic's Unopposed Motion for an Order Designating Certain Exhibits as Confidential filed by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY. Response due by 4/28/2005 (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 2/24/2005, Entered: 2/24/2005
                                                                                              Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 2/24/2005. (vp1, )
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 909 Filed: 2/22/2005, Entered: 2/22/2005
                                                                                                POST TRIAL BRIEF In Reply To Plaintiff's Post-Trial Response Brief by USA. (Attachments: # (1) # (2))(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 908 Filed: 2/22/2005, Entered: 2/22/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER: On August 2, 2004, Defendant's Motion for Judgment Based Upon Partial Findings was filed. During trial, on August 20, 2004, ruling on the motion for summary judgment was deferred until after post-trial briefing. (Tr. at 6318-19.) Accordingly, this order is to confirm that a ruling on [851] Defendant's Motion for Judgment Based Upon Partial Findings has been DEFERRED for consideration and ruling in conjunction with the opinion to be issued after all post trial briefing. (This shall also be deemed applicable in 98-154 and 98-474) Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 2/22/2005, Entered: 2/22/2005
                                                                                                    ORDER granting [907] Motion for Extension of Time (deemed applicable in 98-154 and 98-474). Defendant requests an enlargement to and including February 22, 2005, within which to file its post-trial reply brief. Reply due by 2/22/2005. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document 907 Filed: 2/18/2005, Entered: 2/18/2005, Terminated: 2/22/2005 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [896] Response,until 2/22/05, by USA. Response due by 3/7/2005 (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 906 Filed: 2/18/2005, Entered: 2/18/2005
                                                                                                        POST TRIAL BRIEF - Yankee Atomic's Reply on its Post-Trial Proposed Findings of Fact by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY. (Attachments: # (1))(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 905 Filed: 2/18/2005, Entered: 2/18/2005
                                                                                                          POST TRIAL BRIEF - Reply to defendant's Response to Plaintiffs' Initial Post-Trial Brief by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY. (Attachments: # (1))(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 904 Filed: 2/3/2005, Entered: 2/3/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER granting [903]Yankee Atomic's Unopposed Motion for an Enlargement of Time to File Replies on Post Trial Briefs and Proposed Findings of Fact. Replies on post trial briefs and proposed findings of fact due 2/18/2005. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (applicable in this and 98-154 and 98-474) (lae, )
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 903 Filed: 2/3/2005, Entered: 2/3/2005, Terminated: 2/3/2005 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 2/18/2005 to Reply to Post Trial Briefs and Proposed Findings of Fact by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY. Response due by 2/22/2005 (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 902 Filed: 1/25/2005, Entered: 1/25/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER:Final post-trial reply briefs are due: by 2/4/2005.Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 901 Filed: 1/25/2005, Entered: 1/25/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 1/24/05 before Judge James F. Merow. (eph, )
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 1/14/2005, Entered: 1/14/2005
                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [900]Motion for Leave to File Defendant's Responses to Plaintiffs' Proposed Post-Trial Findings of Fact. Defendant's Responses to Plaintiffs' Proposed Post-Trial Findings of Fact is deemed filed January 13, 2005. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 1/14/2005, Entered: 1/14/2005
                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [899] Motion for Leave to File Defendant's Responses to Plaintiffs' Initial Post-Trial Brief. Defendant's Responses to Plaintiffs' Initial Post-Trial Brief is deemed filed January 13, 2005. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 900 Filed: 1/13/2005, Entered: 1/13/2005, Terminated: 1/14/2005 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                        **SEALED** MOTION for Leave to File Defendant's Response To Plaintiff's Proposed Post-Trial Findings Of Fact by USA. Response due by 1/31/2005 (Attachments: # (1) # (2))(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 899 Filed: 1/13/2005, Entered: 1/13/2005, Terminated: 1/14/2005 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File Defendant's Response To Plaintiff's Initial Post-Trial Brief by USA. Response due by 1/31/2005 (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3))(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 898 Filed: 1/13/2005, Entered: 1/13/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER re Motion for Leave to File Amended Answer and Counterclaims, filed August 5, 2004 in cases 98-154 and 98-474 and Defendant's Alternative Motion for Leave to File Amended Answer and Counterclaims Pursuant to RCFC 13(f) and 15(b), filed October 15, 2004 in cases 98-154 and 98-474. Action DEFERRED for consideration and resolution as a part of the case-in-chief in this matter, and can be addressed in oral argument scheduled for January 24, 2004. As a part of the scheduled oral argument the parties may also address, to the extent relevant, the jurisdictional issues raised in the Order to Show Cause and for Additional Briefing filed in Florida Power & Light Company, et al., Case Nos. 98-483C, 98-485C, 01-116C, 01-551C on October 15, 2004. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 897 Filed: 1/13/2005, Entered: 1/13/2005
                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to [882] Statement of Facts filed by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document 896 Filed: 1/13/2005, Entered: 1/13/2005
                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to [883] Post Trial Brief filed by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 895 Filed: 1/12/2005, Entered: 1/12/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [894] Motion for Extension of Time. On January 12, 2005, Defendant's Unopposed Motion for a One-Day Enlargement of Time was filed. Defendant requests an enlargement of time allowing the parties to file their responses to the opposing parties' proposed post-trial findings of fact and post-trial response briefs by 5:00 p.m. on January 13, 2005. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that defendant's unopposed motion, filed January 12, 2005, is GRANTED. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 894 Filed: 1/12/2005, Entered: 1/12/2005, Terminated: 1/12/2005 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                    Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [880] Post Trial Brief, [881] Post Trial Brief, [882] Statement of Facts, [883] Post Trial Brief Of One Additional Day by USA. Response due by 1/31/2005 (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 893 Filed: 1/7/2005, Entered: 1/7/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [892]Motion for Extension of Time to and including January 12, 2005, within which to respond to the opposing parties' proposed post-trial findings of fact and post-trial response briefs. Response due by 1/12/2005Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 892 Filed: 1/7/2005, Entered: 1/7/2005, Terminated: 1/7/2005 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                        Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [880] Post Trial Brief, [881] Post Trial Brief, [883] Post Trial Brief, [886] Statement of Facts,until 1/12/2005, by USA. Response due by 1/24/2005 (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 891 Filed: 12/20/2004, Entered: 12/20/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER:Closing Argument reset for 1/24/2005 10:00 AM in National Courts Building before Senior Judge James F. Merow. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 930 Filed: 12/17/2004, Entered: 1/18/2006 Transcript - Cumulative Index
                                                                                                                                            Cumulative Index for TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on July 12 through August 31, 2004. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 912 Filed: 12/17/2004, Entered: 6/13/2005 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on July 12-August 31, 2004 before Judge James F. Merow. (eph, )
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 911 Filed: 12/17/2004, Entered: 6/13/2005 ERRATA
                                                                                                                                                List of plaintiff's/defendant's exhibits filed this date. (eph, )
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 890 Filed: 12/17/2004, Entered: 12/17/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER:Post Trial Response Brief due 1/10/2005.Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 889 Filed: 12/1/2004, Entered: 12/1/2004
                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by USA Of Compliance With Paragraph 8 And Footnote 3 Of The Court's Order Dated September 21, 2004 (Attachments: # (1))(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 888 Filed: 11/25/2004, Entered: 11/25/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [887] Motion for Extension of Time. Post-trial response briefs and responses to proposed findings of fact shall be filed by December 22, 2004, and post-trial reply briefs shall be filed by January 28, 2005. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 11/25/2004, Entered: 11/29/2004 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                        Set/Reset Deadlines: Post trial Response briefs and responses to proposed findgins of fact to be filed by 12/22/2004. Post trial Reply briefs to be filed by 1/28/2005. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 887 Filed: 11/24/2004, Entered: 11/24/2004, Terminated: 11/25/2004 Motion to Amend Schedule
                                                                                                                                                          Consent MOTION to Amend Schedule re: [864] Scheduling Order,, by USA. Response due by 12/13/2004 (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 886 Filed: 11/23/2004, Entered: 11/23/2004
                                                                                                                                                            STATEMENT OF FACTS Corrected Copy - Defendant's Proposed Post-Trial Findings of Fact by USA. (Miller, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 885 Filed: 11/23/2004, Entered: 11/23/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [884] Motion for Leave to File Post-Trial Proposed Findings of Fact. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 884 Filed: 11/22/2004, Entered: 11/22/2004, Terminated: 11/23/2004 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Copy Of Defendant's Post-Trial Proposed Findings of Fact by USA. Response due by 12/9/2004 (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 883 Filed: 11/18/2004, Entered: 11/18/2004
                                                                                                                                                                  POST TRIAL BRIEF by USA. (Attachments: # (1) # (2))(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 882 Filed: 11/18/2004, Entered: 11/18/2004
                                                                                                                                                                    STATEMENT OF FACTS (Defendant's Proposed Post-Trial Findings Of Fact) by USA. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 881 Filed: 11/17/2004, Entered: 11/17/2004
                                                                                                                                                                      POST TRIAL BRIEF -Proposed Findings of Fact - by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 880 Filed: 11/17/2004, Entered: 11/17/2004
                                                                                                                                                                        POST TRIAL BRIEF - Initial Post-Trial Legal Brief by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 879 Filed: 11/17/2004, Entered: 11/17/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [877] Motion for Leave to File post-trial documents under seal.Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 878 Filed: 11/17/2004, Entered: 11/17/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [876] Motion for Extension of Time. Post Trial Brief due by 5:00 p.m., 11/18/2004. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 877 Filed: 11/17/2004, Entered: 11/17/2004, Terminated: 11/17/2004 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File to file documents under seal by USA. Response due by 12/6/2004 (Miller, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 876 Filed: 11/17/2004, Entered: 11/17/2004, Terminated: 11/17/2004 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time until 5 p.m., 11/18/2004 to file The Parties' Initial Post-Trial Briefs and Proposed Findings Of Fact by USA. Response due by 12/6/2004 (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 875 Filed: 11/12/2004, Entered: 11/12/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [874] Motion for Extension of Time. Post Trial Brief due 11/17/2004. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 874 Filed: 11/11/2004, Entered: 11/11/2004, Terminated: 11/12/2004 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time until 11/17/04 to file The Parties' Post-Trial Briefs And Proposed Findings Of Fact by USA. Response due by 11/29/2004 (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 873 Filed: 11/8/2004, Entered: 11/8/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [872] Motion for Extension of Time. Post Trial Brief due 11/12/2004. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 872 Filed: 11/5/2004, Entered: 11/5/2004, Terminated: 11/8/2004 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                        Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until 11/12/04 to file The Parties' Initial Post-Trial Briefs And Proposed Findings Of Fact by USA. Response due by 11/22/2004 (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 871 Filed: 11/2/2004, Entered: 11/2/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [870] Motion for Extension of Time .Post Trial Brief due 11/8/2004 (deemed applicable in 98-154 C and 98-474 C) Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 870 Filed: 11/1/2004, Entered: 11/1/2004, Terminated: 11/2/2004 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                            Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until 11/8/2004 to file The Parties' Post-Trial Briefs And Proposed Findings Of Fact by USA. Response due by 11/18/2004 (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 869 Filed: 10/12/2004, Entered: 10/14/2004 Redacted DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              REDACTED DOCUMENT of Under Seal Transcript of Trial/Proceedings Held on August 18, 2004 [Pages 5730 - 6002] Before Judge James F. Merow by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 868 Filed: 10/12/2004, Entered: 10/14/2004 Redacted DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                REDACTED DOCUMENT of Under Seal Transcript of Trial/Proceedings Held on August 17, 2004 [Pages 5484 - 5729] Before Judge James F. Merow by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY. (jcp, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 10/14/2004 (jcp, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 867 Filed: 10/12/2004, Entered: 10/14/2004 Redacted DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  REDACTED DOCUMENT of Under Seal Transcript of Trial/Proceedings Held on August 12, 2004 [Pages 4866 - 5139] Before Judge James F. Merow by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 866 Filed: 10/12/2004, Entered: 10/14/2004 Redacted DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    REDACTED DOCUMENT of Under Seal Transcript of Trial/Proceedings Held on July 20, 2004 [Pages 1595 - 1830] Before Judge James F. Merow by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY. (jcp, ) Modified on 10/14/2004 (jcp, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 865 Filed: 10/12/2004, Entered: 10/14/2004 Redacted DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      REDACTED DOCUMENT of Under Seal Transcript of Trial/Proceedings Held on July 16, 2004 [Pages 1066 - 1322] Before Judge James F. Merow by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 864 Filed: 10/12/2004, Entered: 10/12/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER:(1) That the dates set forth in the September 21, 2004 Order shall be deemed amended as follows:October 15, 2004 to November 4, 2004;November 16, 2004 to December 2, 2004;December 7, 2004 to December 22, 2004;December 16, 2004 to January 14, 2004;(2) The courtroom location for the oral argument commencing at 10:00 a.m. on January 14, 2005, will be posted in the lobby of the National Courts Building;(3) Except as so amended, the September 21, 2004 Order shall, otherwise, remain in effect. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 863 Filed: 10/8/2004, Entered: 10/8/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [862] Motion for Leave to File redacted transcripts Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 862 Filed: 10/8/2004, Entered: 10/8/2004, Terminated: 10/8/2004 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File Publicly Available Redacted Versions of Five Days of Trial Testimony by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY. Response due by 10/25/2004 (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 861 Filed: 10/5/2004, Entered: 10/5/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER:Telephone Status Conference set for 10/6/2004 02:00 PM in Chambers before Senior Judge James F. Merow. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 860 Filed: 9/21/2004, Entered: 9/21/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER entered: (1) Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Designated Deposition Testimony as Substantive Evidence Pursuant to RCFC 32(a)(2), filed June 28, 2004, is GRANTED, to the extent discussed in the Order;(2) Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File a Corrected Copy of its July 7, 2004 Motion for Leave to File Designated Deposition Testimony as Substantive Evidence, is GRANTED, and the corrected Motion is deemed filed;(3) Plaintiffs' Corrected Motion for Leave to File Designated Deposition Testimony as Substantive Evidence, filed July 14, 2004, is GRANTED, to the extent discussed in the Order; and (4) Defendant's Counter-Designations contained within defendant's Response to Plaintiffs' Motions to Introduce Deposition Testimony, filed on July 29, 2004, are GRANTED, to the extent discussed Order. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 859 Filed: 9/21/2004, Entered: 9/21/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER: Confirming the post-trial matters considered at the conclusion of trial proceedings on August 31, 2004. Response to defendant's Motion to file Amended Answer and Counterclaims and Motion for Judgment based Upon Partial Findings due by 10/15/2004. Post-Trial Replies due by 12/7/2004. Post Trial Brief due 10/15/2004.Post Trial Response Brief due 11/16/2004. Oral Argument set for 12/16/2004 10:00 AM in Courtroom # 4 before Senior Judge James F. Merow. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 858 Filed: 9/20/2004, Entered: 9/20/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1# (2) Exhibit 2# (3) Exhibit 3 (1 of 2)# (4) Exhibit 3(2 of 2)# (5) Exhibit 4# (6) Exhibit 5# (7) Exhibit 6# (8) Exhibit 7# (9) Exhibit 8)(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 857 Filed: 9/17/2004, Entered: 9/17/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER re plaintiffs' Bench Memorandum Addressing the Admissibility of Certain Exhibits Prepared by Contractors. Plaintiffs shall promptly electronically file the Bench Memorandum Addressing the Admissibility of Certain Exhibits dated July 12, 2004, and tendered to the court during trial proceedings, which Memorandum shall upon receipt be deemed filed nunc pro tunc (July 12, 2004);(2) Proposed findings and objections to proposed findings, filed by the parties, shall clearly indicate, in the supporting record citations, any reliance on the contractor generated documents discussed herein. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 856 Filed: 9/3/2004, Entered: 9/3/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re [840] MOTION for Leave to File Designated Deposition Testimony as Substantive Evidence and Rebuttal Evidence pursuant to RCFC 32 and FRE 801(d)(2)(D), [833] MOTION for Leave to File Designated Deposition Testimony as Substantive Evidence Pursuant to RCFC 32(a)(2) filed by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1# (2) Exhibit 2# (3) Exhibit 3# (4) Exhibit 4# (5) Exhibit 5# (6) Exhibit 6# (7) Exhibit 7# (8) Exhibit 8# (9) Exhibit 9# (10) Exhibit 10 (1 of 2)# (11) Exhibit 10 (2 of 2)# (12) Exhibit 11# (13) Exhibit 12# (14) Exhibit 13 (1 of 4)# (15) Exhibit 13 (2 of 4)# (16) Exhibit 13 (3 of 4)# (17) Exhibit 13 (4 of 4))(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 9/3/2004, Entered: 9/3/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 10/1/2004. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 913 Filed: 8/19/2004, Entered: 6/13/2005 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (5 Volumes FILED UNDER SEAL) held on July 16, 20, August 12, 17, 18, 2004 before Judge James F. Merow. (eph, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 855 Filed: 8/16/2004, Entered: 8/16/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to [854] MOTION to Amend/Correct Russell A. Mellor's Subpoena filed by USA. Reply due by 8/30/2004. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 854 Filed: 8/15/2004, Entered: 8/15/2004, Terminated: 2/11/2005 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Modify Russell A. Mellor's Subpoena by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY. Response due by 9/1/2004 (Stouck, Jerry) Modified on 8/16/2004 to correct the filer (jcp, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 853 Filed: 8/9/2004, Entered: 8/9/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 of 1)(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 852 Filed: 8/9/2004, Entered: 8/9/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying without prejudice, as the issue has become essentially MOOT, the [842] Motion to Publish. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 851 Filed: 8/2/2004, Entered: 8/2/2004, Terminated: 2/11/2005 Motion for Judgment on Partial Findings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Judgment on Partial Findings by USA. Response due by 9/2/2004 (Attachments: # (1) # (2))(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 850 Filed: 7/30/2004, Entered: 7/30/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Exhibit List for Both Parties by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 of 4# (2) Exhibit 2 of 4# (3) Exhibit 3 of 4# (4) Exhibit 4 of 4)(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 849 Filed: 7/29/2004, Entered: 7/29/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to [840] MOTION for Leave to File Designated Deposition Testimony as Substantive Evidence and Rebuttal Evidence pursuant to RCFC 32 and FRE 801(d)(2)(D), [833] MOTION for Leave to File Designated Deposition Testimony as Substantive Evidence Pursuant to RCFC 32(a)(2) and, to the Extent that Plaintiff's Motion is Granted, Submission of Defendant's Counter-Designations and Objections filed by USA. Reply due by 8/12/2004. (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3) # (4) # (5) # (6) # (7) # (8) # (9) # (10) # (11) # (12) # (13) # (14) # (15) # (16) # (17) # (18) # (19) # (20) # (21) # (22) # (23) # (24))(Finn, Stephen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 848 Filed: 7/27/2004, Entered: 7/27/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM by USA. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 847 Filed: 7/26/2004, Entered: 7/26/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to [842] MOTION to Publish June 28, 2004 Decision on Future Damages, Pre-Breach Damages, and Election of Remedies filed by USA. Reply due by 8/9/2004. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 846 Filed: 7/14/2004, Entered: 7/14/2004, Terminated: 9/21/2004 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Version of Yankee Atomic's Motion for Leave to File Designated Deposition Testimony as Substantive Evidence and Rebuttal Evidence pursuant to RCFC 32 and Federal Rule of Evidence 801(d)(2)(D) by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY. Response due by 8/2/2004 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit 1 and 2# (3) Exhibit 3 (1 of 3)# (4) Exhibit 3 (2 of 3)# (5) Exhibit 3 (3 of 3)# (6) Exhibit 4 (1 of 3)# (7) Exhibit 4 (2 of 3)# (8) Exhibit 4 (3 of 3)# (9) Exhibit 5# (10) Exhibit 6 (1 of 2)# (11) Exhibit 6 (2 of 2)# (12) Exhibit 7# (13) Exhibit 8 and 9# (14) Exhibit 10 (1 of 2)# (15) Exhibit 10 (2 of 2)# (16) Exhibit 11# (17) Exhibit 12 and 13)(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 844 Filed: 7/9/2004, Entered: 7/9/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting in part and denying in part [837] Motion for Authorization of Service of a Subpoena and Motion for Expedited Consideration. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 843 Filed: 7/9/2004, Entered: 7/9/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying without prejudice to any objections as to admissibility of the evidence to be raised at trial, the [813] Motion in Limine to Preclude Evidence Concerning Four Government Damages Scenarios. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 845 Filed: 7/8/2004, Entered: 7/12/2004 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings in One Volume held on 6/29/2004 before Judge James F. Merow. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 842 Filed: 7/8/2004, Entered: 7/8/2004, Terminated: 8/9/2004 Motion to Publish
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Publish June 28, 2004 Decision on Future Damages, Pre-Breach Damages, and Election of Remedies by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY. Response due by 7/26/2004 (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 841 Filed: 7/8/2004, Entered: 7/8/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER denying [838] Plaintiffs' Motion to Set a Hearing on the Admissibility of Exhibits for July 9, 2004, was filed. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 7/8/2004, Entered: 7/8/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 7/29/2004. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 840 Filed: 7/7/2004, Entered: 7/7/2004, Terminated: 9/21/2004 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File Designated Deposition Testimony as Substantive Evidence and Rebuttal Evidence pursuant to RCFC 32 and FRE 801(d)(2)(D) by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY. Response due by 7/26/2004 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 of 15# (2) Exhibit 2 of 15# (3) Exhibit 3 of 15# (4) Exhibit 4 of 15# (5) Exhibit 5 of 15# (6) Exhibit 6 of 15# (7) Exhibit 7 of 15# (8) Exhibit 8 of 15# (9) Exhibit 9 of 15# (10) Exhibit 10 of 15# (11) Exhibit 11 of 15# (12) Exhibit 12 of 15# (13) Exhibit 13 of 15# (14) Exhibit 14 of 15# (15) Exhibit 15 of 15)(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 839 Filed: 7/7/2004, Entered: 7/7/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to [838] MOTION for Hearing on the Admissibility of Exhibits on July 9, 2004 filed by USA. Reply due by 7/19/2004. (Lester, Harold) Modified on 7/7/2004 tgo correct reply due date (dw1).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 7/7/2004, Entered: 7/7/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Set Deadlines/Hearings: Reply due by 7/19/2004. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 838 Filed: 7/2/2004, Entered: 7/2/2004, Terminated: 7/8/2004 Motion for Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Hearing on the Admissibility of Exhibits on July 9, 2004 by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY. Response due by 7/19/2004 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 (1 of 13)# (2) Exhibit 1 (2 of 13)# (3) Exhibit 1 (3 of 13)# (4) Exhibit 1 (4 of 13)# (5) Exhibit 1 (5 of 13)# (6) Exhibit 1 (6 of 13)# (7) Exhibit 1 (7 of 13)# (8) Exhibit 1 (8 of 13)# (9) Exhibit 1 (9 of 13)# (10) Exhibit 1 (10 of 13)# (11) Exhibit 1 (11 of 13)# (12) Exhibit 1 (12 of 13)# (13) Exhibit 1 (13 of 13)# (14) Exhibit 2)(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 837 Filed: 6/29/2004, Entered: 6/29/2004, Terminated: 7/9/2004 Motion for Authorization of Service 100+ Miles
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Authorization of Service 100+ Miles And For Expedited Consideration by USA. Response due by 7/16/2004 (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 836 Filed: 6/28/2004, Entered: 6/28/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying [768] Motion in Limine to Exclude Testimony and Evidence Regarding Plaintiff's Request for Pre-Breach Damages; denying [814] Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Future Damages.Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 835 Filed: 6/28/2004, Entered: 6/28/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER: (1) Defendant's motions to preclude the testimony of Frank Graves and John W. Bartlett shall be DENIED; (2) Plaintiffs' motions to preclude the testimony of Kenneth W. Blair and Daniel Fischel shall be DENIED.Signed by Judge James F. Merow.(lae, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 834 Filed: 6/28/2004, Entered: 6/28/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying [761] Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Priority for Shutdown Reactors, in that need for ventilation of factual issues precludes resolution of this priority issue on summary judgment. Signed by Judge James F. Merow.(lae, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 833 Filed: 6/28/2004, Entered: 6/28/2004, Terminated: 9/21/2004 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File Designated Deposition Testimony as Substantive Evidence Pursuant to RCFC 32(a)(2) by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY. Response due by 7/15/2004 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1# (2) Exhibit 2 (1 of 3)# (3) Exhibit 2 (2 of 3)# (4) Exhibit 2 (3 of 3)# (5) Exhibit 3 (1 of 6)# (6) Exhibit 3 (2 of 6)# (7) Exhibit 3 (3 of 6)# (8) Exhibit 3 (4 of 6)# (9) Exhibit 3 (5 of 6)# (10) Exhibit 3 (6 of 6)# (11) Exhibit 4 (1 of 3)# (12) Exhibit 4 (2 of 3)# (13) Exhibit 4 (3 of 3)# (14) Exhibit 5# (15) Exhibit 6)(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 832 Filed: 6/28/2004, Entered: 6/28/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting in part and denying in part [775] Motion to Compel. It is ORDERED that plaintiffs' motion to compel, filed March 12, 2004, shall be GRANTED, to the extent that the deleted entries on HQR 236-0030 for the "Greater than Class C" activity shall be produced, and the motion shall, otherwise, be DENIED.Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 831 Filed: 6/28/2004, Entered: 6/28/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to [828] MOTION for Order Governing Trial Procedures and Stipulation of Facts, and Agenda Items for the June 29, 2004 Pre-Trial Conference filed by USA. Reply due by 7/12/2004. (Attachments: # (1))(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 830 Filed: 6/23/2004, Entered: 6/23/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER: The court deems oral argument on pending motions unnecessary. Accordingly, oral argument on pending motions scheduled for June 29, 2004 at 10:00 a.m. is cancelled. Orders will be issued on pending motions on or before June 30, 2004. The Final Pre-trial Conference will be held on June 29, 2004 at 2:00 p.m. The courtroom number will be posted in the lobby of the National Courts Building on June 29th.Counsel are requested to confer prior to the Final Pre-trial Conference to reach agreement to the admission of as many of the proposed exhibits as feasible and submit list(s) of exhibits to be admitted at that conference. The opening session of the trial will also be devoted to the admission of proposed exhibits prior to testimony to the extent possible. Trial time will not be devoted to the admission of exhibits, except where testimony is required in this regard. Counsel are further requested to contact Ms. Linda Eddins, at (202) 219-9787 to arrange for courtroom set-up for trial. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 829 Filed: 6/23/2004, Entered: 6/23/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re [816] MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony from Daniel Fischel filed by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 828 Filed: 6/22/2004, Entered: 6/22/2004, Terminated: 7/12/2004 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Order Governing Trial Procedures and Stipulation of Facts, and Agenda Items for the June 29, 2004 Pre-Trial Conference by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY. Response due by 7/9/2004 (Attachments: # (1) Appendix A - E)(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 827 Filed: 6/21/2004, Entered: 6/21/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re [814] MOTION in Limine To Exclude Evidence Of Future Damages filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) # (2))(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 826 Filed: 6/21/2004, Entered: 6/21/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re [813] MOTION in Limine To Preclude Evidence Concerning Four Government Damages "Scenarios" filed by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 and 2 of 2)(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 825 Filed: 6/21/2004, Entered: 6/21/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re [815] MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony from Kenneth W. Blair filed by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 6/17/2004, Entered: 6/17/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Set Deadlines/Hearings: Reply due by 6/28/2004. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 824 Filed: 6/16/2004, Entered: 6/16/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to [816] MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony from Daniel Fischel filed by USA. Reply due by 6/28/2004. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix # (2) Appendix # (3) Appendix)(Sullivan, Marian) Modified on 6/17/2004 to correct reply due date (dw1).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 823 Filed: 6/14/2004, Entered: 6/14/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [822] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response.Defendant requests an enlargement to and including June 16, 2004, within which to file its response to plaintiffs' motion in limine to exclude the testimony of Daniel Fischel.Accordingly, it is ORDERED that:(1)That defendant's motion filed June 14, 2004 is GRANTED;(2) Defendant shall file its response to plaintiffs' motion in limine to exclude the testimony of Daniel Fischel on or before midnight on June 16, 2004; (3) Plaintiffs' shall file their reply to plaintiffs' response on or before midnight, June 23, 2004. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 822 Filed: 6/14/2004, Entered: 6/14/2004, Terminated: 6/14/2004 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to [816] MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony from Daniel Fischel,until 6/19/2004, by USA. Response due by 7/1/2004 (Lester, Harold) Modified on 6/15/2004 to clarify (dw1).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 821 Filed: 6/14/2004, Entered: 6/14/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to [815] MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony from Kenneth W. Blair filed by USA. Reply due by 6/28/2004. (Attachments: # (1))(Miller, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 820 Filed: 6/14/2004, Entered: 6/14/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to [813] MOTION in Limine To Preclude Evidence Concerning Four Government Damages "Scenarios" filed by USA. Reply due by 6/28/2004. (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3) # (4))(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 819 Filed: 6/14/2004, Entered: 6/14/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to [814] MOTION in Limine To Exclude Evidence Of Future Damages filed by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY. Reply due by 6/28/2004. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 818 Filed: 6/8/2004, Entered: 6/8/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER:President Bush has declared Friday, June 11, 2004, to be a day of national mourning to honor the memory of former President Ronald Reagan. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that the responses to the motions referenced in the Order of May 19, 2004, previously due on June 11, 2004, shall be filed by 12:00 noon EDT on June 14, 2004 and the replies shall be filed by 12:00 noon EDT on June 21, 2004. The court will hear oral argument on these motions on June 29, 2004 at 10:00 a.m., in lieu of the date previously set in the Order of May 19, 2004. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 817 Filed: 6/3/2004, Entered: 6/3/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Additional Authority by USA Relating to "Defendant's Motion In Limine To Exclude Testimony And Evidence Of Plaintiff's Request For Pre-Breach Damages" (Attachments: # (1))(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 816 Filed: 6/1/2004, Entered: 6/1/2004, Terminated: 6/28/2004 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony from Daniel Fischel by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY. Response due by 6/18/2004 (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Volume 1 of 15# (2) Appendix Volume 2 of 15# (3) Appendix Volume 3 of 15# (4) Appendix Volume 4 of 15# (5) Appendix Volume 5 of 15# (6) Appendix Volume 6 of 15# (7) Appendix Volume 7 of 15# (8) Appendix Volume 8 of 15# (9) Appendix Volume 9 of 15# (10) Appendix Volume 10 of 15# (11) Appendix Volume 11 of 15# (12) Appendix Volume 12 of 15# (13) Appendix Volume 13 of 15# (14) Appendix Volume 14 of 15# (15) Appendix Volume 15 of 15)(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 815 Filed: 6/1/2004, Entered: 6/1/2004, Terminated: 6/28/2004 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony from Kenneth W. Blair by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY. Response due by 6/18/2004 (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Volume 1 of 7# (2) Appendix Volume 2 of 7# (3) Appendix Volume 3 of 7# (4) Appendix Volume 4 of 7# (5) Appendix Volume 5 of 7# (6) Appendix Volume 6 of 7# (7) Appendix Volume 7 of 7)(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 814 Filed: 6/1/2004, Entered: 6/1/2004, Terminated: 6/28/2004 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION in Limine To Exclude Evidence Of Future Damages by USA. Response due by 6/18/2004 (Attachments: # (1))(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 813 Filed: 5/28/2004, Entered: 5/28/2004, Terminated: 7/9/2004 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION in Limine To Preclude Evidence Concerning Four Government Damages "Scenarios" by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY. Response due by 6/14/2004 (Attachments: # (1) Appendix (Exhibits 1 - 3)(Freas, Monica)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 812 Filed: 5/24/2004, Entered: 5/24/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CORRECTED SCHEDULING ORDER: The date for oral argument set forth in the Order, filed May 19, 2004, is hereby corrected. The court will hear oral argument on Tuesday, June 22, 2004 at 2:00 p.m., at 717 Madison Pl., NW, Washington, DC, in a courtroom to be assigned. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. T(lae, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 811 Filed: 5/21/2004, Entered: 5/21/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re [768] MOTION in Limine Regarding Pre-Breach Damages And Restitution filed by USA. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 810 Filed: 5/19/2004, Entered: 5/19/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting in part and denying in part [763] Motion in Limine Regarding Takings Damages, filed February 19, 2004; granting in part and denying in part [793] Motion, filed April 23, 2004, for Authorization of Service of subpoena on Dan M. Collier (100+ miles)and granting in part and denying in part [793] Motion, filed April 23, 2004, for Leave to Substitute Ivan F. Stuart as an expert Witness in Place of Charles W. Pennington. The court will hear oral argument on pending motions on Tuesday, June 21, 2004 at 2:00 p.m. (National Courts Building, 717 Madison Pl. NW., Washington, DC). Additional motions in limine mentioned by plaintiffs' counsel at the pre-trial conference and motions concerning future damages referenced by defendant's counsel shall be filed on or before June 1, 2004. Responses shall be filed on or before June 11, 2004. Replies shall be filed on or before June 18, 2004. The court will hear oral argument on these motions on June 21, 2004 at 2:00 p.m. (National Courts Building)and The Final Pre-Trial Conference will be held on Tuesday, June 29, 2004 at 2:00 p.m (National Courts Building). Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 5/19/2004, Entered: 5/19/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Set Deadlines/Hearings: Motion(s) due by 6/1/2004. Oral Arguments by 6/21/2004. Reply due by 6/18/2004. Response due by 6/11/2004. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/29/2004 02:00 PM before Senior Judge James F. Merow. Oral Argument set for 6/21/2004 02:00 PM before Senior Judge James F. Merow. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 5/19/2004, Entered: 5/19/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 6/14/2004. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 809 Filed: 5/14/2004, Entered: 5/18/2004 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on May 13, 2004 before Senior Judge James F. Merow. (Attachments: # (1) Transcript) (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 807 Filed: 5/14/2004, Entered: 5/14/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re [769] MOTION in Limine filed by USA. (Sullivan, Marian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 806 Filed: 5/14/2004, Entered: 5/14/2004, Terminated: 2/11/2005 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to [768] MOTION in Limine Regarding Pre-Breach Damages And Restitution Claims by USA. Response due by 6/1/2004 (Lester, Harold) Modified on 5/17/2004 for clarity (dw1).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 805 Filed: 5/14/2004, Entered: 5/14/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re [764] MOTION in Limine To Exclude Testimony Of Dr. John Bartlett filed by USA. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 808 Filed: 5/13/2004, Entered: 5/17/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPENDIX by USA to [803] Dft's Reply to Pltf's Opposition to Dft's Motion in Limine Regarding Takings Damages. [FILED UNDER SEAL][FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] (jcp, ) Modified on 5/17/2004 (jcp, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 5/13/2004, Entered: 5/13/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James F. Merow : Pretrial Conference held on May 13, 2004. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 804 Filed: 5/12/2004, Entered: 5/12/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to [793] MOTION for Authorization of Service 100+ Miles MOTION Leave to Substitute Ivan F. Stuart As An Expert Witness In Place of Charles W. Pennington And To Subpoena Dan M. Collier MOTION Leave to Substitute Ivan F. Stuart As An Expert Witness In Place of Charles W. Pennington And To Subpoena Dan M. Collier filed by USA. Reply due by 5/26/2004. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 803 Filed: 5/12/2004, Entered: 5/12/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re [763] MOTION in Limine Regarding Takings Damages, Appendix (Under Seal) Filed Separately, filed by USA. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 802 Filed: 5/11/2004, Entered: 5/11/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [801] Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply re [768] MOTION in Limine, [769] MOTION in Limine, [763] MOTION in Limine, [764] MOTION in Limine Reply due by 5/14/2004. Defendant's reply re motion to substitute a new expert witness, Mr. Stuart, for its current expert witness, Mr. Pennington is due by 5/12/04. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 801 Filed: 5/10/2004, Entered: 5/10/2004, Terminated: 5/11/2004 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to [789] Response to Motion,, [791] Response to Motion,,, [792] Response to Motion,,, [793] MOTION for Authorization of Service 100+ Miles MOTION Leave to Substitute Ivan F. Stuart As An Expert Witness In Place of Charles W. Pennington And To Subpoena Dan M. Collier MOTION Leave to Substitute Ivan F. Stuart As An Expert Witness In Place of Charles W. Pennington And To Subpoena Dan M. Collier, [794] Response to Motion by USA. Response due by 5/27/2004 (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 800 Filed: 5/5/2004, Entered: 5/5/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [799] Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply re [768] MOTION in Limine. Reply due by 5/10/2004. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 5/5/2004, Entered: 5/5/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Set Deadlines/Hearings: Reply due by 5/10/2004. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 799 Filed: 5/4/2004, Entered: 5/4/2004, Terminated: 5/5/2004 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to [794] Response to Motion, (until 5/10/04), regarding pre-breach damages by USA. Response due by 5/21/2004 (Lester, Harold) Modified on 5/5/2004 for clarity (dw1).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 5/4/2004, Entered: 5/4/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Set Deadlines/Hearings: Reply due by 5/10/2004. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 798 Filed: 5/3/2004, Entered: 5/3/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [797] Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply re [769] MOTION in Limine, [763] MOTION in Limine, [764] MOTION in Limine. Reply due by 5/10/2004. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 5/3/2004, Entered: 5/3/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James F. Merow : Telephone Conference held on May 3, 2004. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 797 Filed: 4/30/2004, Entered: 4/30/2004, Terminated: 5/3/2004 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to [789] Response to Motion, [791] Response to Motion and [792] Response to Motion (until 5/10/2004) In Limine Regarding Dr. Bartlett's Testimony, Mr. Graves' Testimony and Takings Claim by USA. Response due by 5/17/2004 (Lester, Harold) Modified on 5/3/2004 for clarity (dw1).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 4/30/2004, Entered: 4/30/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James F. Merow : Telephone Conference held on April 30, 2004. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 796 Filed: 4/27/2004, Entered: 4/27/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER: On April 26, 2004, defendant electronically filed document #795. The docket entry for document #795, "REPLY to Response to Motion re [781] MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Brief in Response to Partial Summary Judgment Motion Regarding Shutdown Priority and Missing Page of Appendix" and the document caption, "DEFENDANT'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION [F]OR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT" are inconsistent because the docket entry was incorrectly linked to document #781. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that the Clerk's Office shall correct the mistake in filing by now linking document #795 to document #761, Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Priority for Shutdown Reactors, filed on February 19, 2004. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 795 Filed: 4/26/2004, Entered: 4/26/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re [761] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Shutdown Priority and Missing Page of Appendix filed by USA. (Ekman, John) Modified on 4/28/2004 (dw1).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 794 Filed: 4/23/2004, Entered: 4/23/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to [768] MOTION in Limine Regarding Pre-Breach and Restitution Damages filed by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY. Reply due by 5/7/2004. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 793 Filed: 4/23/2004, Entered: 4/23/2004, Terminated: 5/19/2004 Motion for Authorization of Service 100+ Miles
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Authorization of Service 100+ Miles, MOTION Leave to Substitute Ivan F. Stuart As An Expert Witness In Place of Charles W. Pennington And To Subpoena Dan M. Collier by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY. Response due by 5/10/2004 Response due by 5/10/2004 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 of 3# (2) Exhibit 2a of 3# (3) Exhibit 2b of 3# (4) Exhibit 3 of 3)(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 792 Filed: 4/16/2004, Entered: 4/16/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to [764] MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Expert Report and Testimony of Dr. John Bartlett filed by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY. Reply due by 4/30/2004. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Volume 1 of 17# (2) Appendix Volume 2 of 17# (3) Appendix Volume 3 of 17# (4) Appendix Volume 4 of 17# (5) Appendix Volume 5 of 17# (6) Appendix Volume 6 of 17# (7) Appendix Volume 7 of 17# (8) Appendix Volume 8 of 17# (9) Appendix Volume 9 of 17# (10) Appendix Volume 10 of 17# (11) Appendix Volume 11 of 17# (12) Appendix Volume 12 of 17# (13) Appendix Volume 13 of 17# (14) Appendix Volume 14 of 17# (15) Appendix Volume 15 of 17# (16) Appendix Volume 16 of 17# (17) Appendix Volume 17 of 17)(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 791 Filed: 4/16/2004, Entered: 4/16/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to [769] MOTION in Limine to Preclude Frank C. Graves' Expert Testimony Regarding Exchanges filed by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY. Reply due by 4/30/2004. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Volume 1 of 12# (2) Appendix Volume 2 of 12# (3) Appendix Volume 3 of 12# (4) Appendix Volume 4 of 12# (5) Appendix Volume 5 of 12# (6) Appendix Volume 6 of 12# (7) Appendix Volume 7 of 12# (8) Appendix Volume 8 of 12# (9) Appendix Volume 9 of 12# (10) Appendix Volume 10 of 12# (11) Appendix Volume 11 of 12# (12) Appendix Volume 12 of 12)(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 790 Filed: 4/16/2004, Entered: 4/16/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [788] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re [768] MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony and Evidence Regarding Plaintiff's Request for Pre-Breach Damages and Alternative Restitution Claim, and Defendant's Motion to Strike. Response due by 4/23/2004 Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 789 Filed: 4/16/2004, Entered: 4/16/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to [763] MOTION in Limine regarding Takings Damages filed by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY. Reply due by 4/30/2004. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Cover Sheet and Table of Contents# (2) Appendix Volume 1 of 7# (3) Appendix Volume 2 of 7# (4) Appendix Volume 3 of 7# (5) Appendix Volume 4 of 7# (6) Appendix Volume 5 of 7# (7) Appendix Volume 6 of 7# (8) Appendix Volume 7 of 7)(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 788 Filed: 4/16/2004, Entered: 4/16/2004, Terminated: 4/16/2004 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to [768] MOTION in Limine,until April 23, 2004, regarding pre-breach damages by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY. Response due by 5/3/2004 (Stouck, Jerry) Modified on for clarity 4/19/2004 (dw1).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 787 Filed: 4/13/2004, Entered: 4/13/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting in part and denying in part [784] Motion to Strike (filed April 7, 2004), granting in part and denying in part [785] Motion to Compel (filed April 9, 2004) Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 4/12/2004, Entered: 4/12/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James F. Merow : Telephone Conference held on April 12, 2004. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 786 Filed: 4/9/2004, Entered: 4/9/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re [775] MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Pursuant to the Court's August, 25 2003 Order filed by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 785 Filed: 4/9/2004, Entered: 4/9/2004, Terminated: 4/13/2004 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Compel Depositions of Government Witnesses by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY. Response due by 4/26/2004 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibits 1 through 4)(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 4/8/2004, Entered: 4/8/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Set Deadlines/Hearings: Reply due by 4/26/2004. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 784 Filed: 4/7/2004, Entered: 4/7/2004, Terminated: 4/13/2004 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Strike Defendant's Unnamed Fact Witness From the Office of Nuclear Security and Incident Response and Fact Witnesses Boyea, Davis, Helin, Lepisto, and Shyloski by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY. Response due by 4/26/2004 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - March 23, 2004 letter# (2) Exhibit 2 - March 1, 2004 letter# (3) Exhibit 3 - March 22, 2004 letter# (4) Exhibit 4 - March 26, 2004 letter# (5) Exhibit 5 - April 6, 2004 letter# (6) Exhibit 6 - April 7, 2004 letter)(Freas, Monica)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 783 Filed: 4/7/2004, Entered: 4/7/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to [761] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Priority for Shutdown Reactors - CORRECTED COPY filed by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY. Reply due by 4/26/2004. (Attachments: # (1) Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Facts# (2) Revised Appendix 1 of 6# (3) Revised Appendix 2 of 6# (4) Revised Appendix 3 of 6# (5) Revised Appendix 4 of 6# (6) Revised Appendix 5 of 6# (7) Revised Appendix 6 of 6)(Stouck, Jerry) Modified on 4/8/2004 to correct reply date (dw1).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 782 Filed: 4/7/2004, Entered: 4/7/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [781]Motion for Leave to File Corrected Brief in Response to Partial Summary Judgment Motion Regarding Shutdown Priority and Missing Page of Appendix. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 781 Filed: 4/7/2004, Entered: 4/7/2004, Terminated: 4/7/2004 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Brief in Response to Partial Summary Judgment Motion Regarding Shutdown Priority and Missing Page of Appendix by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY. Response due by 4/26/2004 (Attachments: # (1) Corrected Brief# (2) Page to Appendix)(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 4/7/2004, Entered: 4/7/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Set Deadlines/Hearings: Reply due by 4/23/2004. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 780 Filed: 4/6/2004, Entered: 4/6/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to [761] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Priority for Shutdown Reactors filed by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY. Reply due by 4/23/2004. (Attachments: # (1) Supplement Response to Defendant's Proposed Statement of Facts# (2) Appendix 1 of 6# (3) Appendix 2 of 6# (4) Appendix 3 of 6# (5) Appendix 4 of 6# (6) Appendix 5 of 6# (7) Appendix 6 of 6)(Stouck, Jerry) Modified on 4/7/2004 (dw1, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 779 Filed: 3/30/2004, Entered: 3/30/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to [775] MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Pursuant to the Court's August, 25 2003 Order filed by USA. Reply due by 4/13/2004. (Attachments: # (1))(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 778 Filed: 3/30/2004, Entered: 3/30/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting in part and denying in part [756] Motion to require plaintiff to identify those documents within plaintiff's exhibit list upon which it will rely at trial. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 777 Filed: 3/30/2004, Entered: 3/30/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [776] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to[775] MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Pursuant to the Court's August, 25 2003 Order. Response due by 3/30/2004. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae) Modified on 3/30/2004 (dw1).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 3/30/2004, Entered: 3/30/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Set Deadlines/Hearings: Response to [775] Motion to Compel due by 3/30/2004. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 776 Filed: 3/29/2004, Entered: 3/29/2004, Terminated: 3/30/2004 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to [775] MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Pursuant to the Court's August, 25 2003 Order, (until 3/30/04), by USA. Response due by 4/15/2004 (Lester, Harold) Modified on 3/30/2004 (dw1).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 775 Filed: 3/12/2004, Entered: 3/12/2004, Terminated: 6/28/2004 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Pursuant to the Court's August, 25 2003 Order by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY. Response due by 3/29/2004 (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 774 Filed: 3/3/2004, Entered: 3/3/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [773] Motion for Extension of Time to File Responses re [761] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, [763] MOTION in Limine, [764] MOTION in Limine, [768]MOTION in Limine,[769]MOTION in Limine. Responses due by 4/16/2004. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 773 Filed: 3/2/2004, Entered: 3/2/2004, Terminated: 3/3/2004 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply,until 04/16/2004, by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY. Response due by 3/19/2004 (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 772 Filed: 3/1/2004, Entered: 3/1/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER:Pretrial Conference set for 5/13/2004, 02:00 PM in the National Courts Building before Senior Judge James F. Merow. Trial set for 7/12/2004 10:30 AM (concluding by August 27, 2004) in the National Courts Building before Senior Judge James F. Merow. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 771 Filed: 3/1/2004, Entered: 3/1/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 2/26/2004, Entered: 2/26/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James F. Merow : Telephone Scheduling Conference held on February 26, 2004. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 770 Filed: 2/25/2004, Entered: 3/1/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER re: counsel shall promptly confer and contact Ms. Linda Eddins to arrange for a brief telephone conference this week limited to the matter of a trial date. A formal pretrial conference shall be subsequently scheduled, prior to the trial, to address outstanding pretrial matters. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 769 Filed: 2/20/2004, Entered: 2/27/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION in Limine to Preclude the Presentation of Dr. Graves' Speculative Theory of 'Exchanges' at Trial in Support of Yankee Atomic's Claim for Damages FILED UNDER SEAL by USA.Service: 02/19/2004. Response due by 3/8/2004 (lld, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 768 Filed: 2/20/2004, Entered: 2/27/2004, Terminated: 6/28/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony and Evidence Regarding Plaintiff's Request for Pre-Breach Damages FILED UNDER SEAL by USA .Service: 02/13/2004. Response due by 3/1/2004 (lld, ) Modified on 2/27/2004 (lld, ). Modified on 2/27/2004 (lld, ). Modified on 3/1/2004 to correct response date from 3/8/2004 to 3/1/2004 (jcp, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 767 Filed: 2/20/2004, Entered: 2/27/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Status Conference and Status Report by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY.Service: 02/20/2004. Response due by 3/8/2004 (lld, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 2/20/2004, Entered: 2/27/2004 Order on Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER: Counsel shall confer to reach agreement on the documents to be produced, in response to Requests Nos. 27 and 28. Dft's Motion to Compel, shall be GRANTED to the extent provided above with respect to Requests Nos. 27 and 28 and is otherwise DENIED. [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT LOCATED IN CASE NO. 98-474C] Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 766 Filed: 2/19/2004, Entered: 2/27/2004 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to [759] Dft's MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Its Pretrial Submissions, until 2/19/04, filed by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Reply due by 3/1/2004. Service: 2/13/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 765 Filed: 2/19/2004, Entered: 2/26/2004 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THE GOVERNMENT'S [756] MOTION TO REQUIRE PLAINTIFF TO IDENTIFY THOSE DOCUMENTS WITHIN PLAINTIFF'S EXHIBIT LIST UPON WHICH IT WILL RELY AT TRIAL filed by USA. Service: 02/19/2004.(lld, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 764 Filed: 2/19/2004, Entered: 2/26/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE THE EXPERT REPORT AND TESTIMONY OF JOHN BARTLETT by USA. (FILED UNDER SEAL)Service: 02/19/2004 by hand. Response due by 3/4/2004 (lld, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 763 Filed: 2/19/2004, Entered: 2/26/2004, Terminated: 5/19/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION IN LIMINE REGARDING TAKINGS DAMAGES by USA. Together with separate APPENDIX (UNDER SEAL)Service: 02/19/2004 by hand. Response due by 3/4/2004 (lld, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 762 Filed: 2/19/2004, Entered: 2/26/2004 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PROPOSED FINDINGS OF UNCONTROVERTED FACT by USA. Service: 02/19/2004 by hand.(lld, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 761 Filed: 2/19/2004, Entered: 2/26/2004, Terminated: 6/28/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT REGARDING PRIORITY FOR SHUTDOWN REACTORS by USA.Service: 02/19/2004 by hand. Response due by 3/18/2004 (lld, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 760 Filed: 2/18/2004, Entered: 2/25/2004 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [759] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply,with the understanding that no further enlargement of time for pretrail submissions will be sought. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lg1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 759 Filed: 2/17/2004, Entered: 2/24/2004, Terminated: 2/18/2004 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to plaintiffs' pretrial submissions,until 2/19/04, by USA. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 2/12/04. Response due by 3/1/2004 (jat, ) Modified on 2/24/2004 (jat, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 758 Filed: 2/9/2004, Entered: 2/12/2004 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    OPPOSITION to [756] Dft's MOTION to Require Pltf to Identify Those Documents Within Pltf's Exhibit List Upno Which It Will Rely At Trial, filed by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY. Reply due by 2/19/2004. Service: 2/9/2004 by hand.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 757 Filed: 2/4/2004, Entered: 2/9/2004 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      OPPOSITION to Dft's Motion to Compel Production of Documents From Framatome ANP filed by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY. Service: 2/4/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 755 Filed: 1/30/2004, Entered: 1/30/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER: The Court hereby DENIES [717] Dft's Second Motion to Renew its Motion to Consolidate as well as its previous motions relating to consolidation. The Court further LIFTS THE STAY of the remainder of the cases to which the Order of 4/16/2003, applied. The Clerk of the Court is directed to docket this Order in this case with an entry noting the same on the dockets of the remaining SNF cases captioned in Dft's instant motion, with a courtesy copy to all SNF parties and presiding SNF judges of the Court. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 756 Filed: 1/28/2004, Entered: 2/2/2004, Terminated: 3/30/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Require Plaintiff to Identify Those Documents Within Plaintiff's Exhibit List Upon Which It Will Rely At Trial by USA. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE]Service: 1/22/2004. Response due by 2/9/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 1/8/2004, Entered: 1/13/2004 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            OPPOSITION to Dft's MOTION to Enforce Request for Production of Documents filed by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY. [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT LOCATED IN CASE NO. 98-474C] Reply due by 1/23/2004. Service: 1/8/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 751 Filed: 12/24/2003, Entered: 12/30/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER: With the exception of amended document requests No. 25, which is GRANTED, [731] Dft's Motion to Compel, filed 9/24/2003, shall be otherwise, DENIED. Pltf's Motion for Protective Orders, filed 11/3/2003, shall be DENIED. [730] Dft's Motion, filed 9/24/2003, for Extension of Time, to and including 2/12/2004, for its final pretrial submissions is GRANTED. This Order also serves to note that Dft's pending motions for time enlargement [744] and [746], filed on 11/17/2003 and 11/21/2003, are also ALLOWED. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 12/23/2003, Entered: 1/13/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Enforce Request for Production of Documents by USA. [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT LOCATED IN CASE NO. 98-474C]Service: 12/22/2003. Response due by 1/8/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 750 Filed: 12/17/2003, Entered: 12/22/2003 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY. Service: 12/17/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 749 Filed: 12/5/2003, Entered: 12/11/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY on [713] Pltf's MOTION for a Protective Order filed by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY. Service: 12/5/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 748 Filed: 12/1/2003, Entered: 12/4/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Counsel for Dft's Change of Telephone and Facsimile Numbers by USA. Service: 11/28/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 747 Filed: 11/24/2003, Entered: 12/2/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Pltf's Response to [730] Dft's MOTION for an Additional Enlargement of Five Months, REPLY to Pltf's Response to [731] Dft's 9/24/2003 RENEWED MOTION to Compel and RESPONSE to Pltf's MOTION for a Protective Order That Depositions Noticed on 9/26/2003 Not Be Had, filed by USA. Service: 11/24/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 746 Filed: 11/21/2003, Entered: 11/26/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to [741] Pltf's 1) Response to Dft's Request for an Additional Enlargement of Five Months, 2) Response to the Dft's 9/24/2003 "Renewed" Motion to Compel and Motion for a Protective Order, and 3) Motion for a Protective Order That Depositions First Noticed 9/26/2003 Not Be Had, until 11/24/2003, by USA.Service: 11/21/03. Response due by 12/8/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 745 Filed: 11/18/2003, Entered: 11/24/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            OPPOSITION to [744] Dft's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responses on its Motions to enlarge the time for its pretrial submissions and to compel the production of documents by four days, filed by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY. Reply due by 12/2/2003. Service: 11/18/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 744 Filed: 11/17/2003, Entered: 11/21/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to [741] Pltf's Response to 1) Response to the Dft's Request for an Additional Enlargement of Five Months, 2) Response to the Dft's 9/24/2003 "Renewed" Motion to Compel and Motion for a Protective Order, and 3) Motion for a Protective Order That Depositions Fist Noticed 9/26/2003 Not Be Had, until 11/21/03, by USA.Service: 11/17/03. Response due by 12/4/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 743 Filed: 11/5/2003, Entered: 11/10/2003 Notice of Indirectly Related Case(s)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Indirectly Related Case(s) [03-2625, 03-2624, 03-2623, 03-2622, 03-2621, 03-2505, 02-1894, 02-926, 02-898, 01-551, 01-249, 01-116, 01-115, 00-703, 00-697, 00-440, 99-447, 98-621, 98-614, 98-488, 98-486, 98-485, 98-484, 98-483, 98-474, 98-154] by all plaintiffs. Service: 11/5/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 742 Filed: 11/3/2003, Entered: 11/6/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER: Leave is GRANTED for the filing of pltf's corrected combined response to dft's September 24, 2003 motions, received with the motion filed October 23, 2003; As pltf's October 21, 2003 original response was not filed by the clerk, because a copy of volume 2 of the appendix was missing and an original declaration was missing in volume 1, this unfiled submission shall now be RETURNED to pltf in view of the filing of the corrected version; [735] Pltf's Motion, filed October 8, 2003, [738] Pltf's MOTION, filed on October 16, 2003, [740] Pltf's MOTION, filed October 21, 2003, [736] Pltf's Motion, filed October 23, 2003 shall be GRANTED to the extent reflected by the filing in (1) and, otherwise, DENIED; Dft's reply to the pltf's combined response as filed pursuant to (1) shall be filed on or before 11/15/2003. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 741 Filed: 11/3/2003, Entered: 11/6/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CORRECTED COMBINED RESPONSE to [730] Dft's MOTION for an Additional Enlargement of Five Months, [731] Dft's Renewed MOTION to Compel and MOTION for a Protective Order, and MOTION for a Protective Order That Depositions First Noticed September 26, 2003 Not Be Had, Together with Two (2) Separately Bound Appendix Volumes, filed by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY. Reply due by 11/15/2003. Service: 10/23/03 by hand.(jcp, ) Modified on 11/6/2003 (jcp, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 740 Filed: 10/23/2003, Entered: 10/27/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File a Corrected Copy of Its October 21, 2003 1) Response to the Government's Request for an Additional Enlargement of Five Months, 2) Response to the Government's September 24 "Renewed" Motion to Compel and Motion for Protective Order, and 3) Motion for a Protective Order That Deposition First Noticed September 26, 2003 Not Be Had by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY.Service: 10/23/03 by hand. Response due by 11/6/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 739 Filed: 10/22/2003, Entered: 10/24/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Dft's Opposition to [735] Pltf's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Combined Opposition to [730] Dft's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response, [731] MOTION to renew motion to compel the production of documents filed by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY. Service: 10/22/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 738 Filed: 10/21/2003, Entered: 10/23/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File 1) Response to the Dft's Request for an Additional Enlargement of File Months, 2) Response to the Dft's September 24 "Renewed" Motion to Compel and Motion for Protective Order, and 3) Motion for a Protective Order That Depositions First Noticed September 26 Not Be Had by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY.Service: 10/21/03 by hand. Response due by 11/4/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 737 Filed: 10/21/2003, Entered: 10/23/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to [735] MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [730] MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply,until 2/12/2004,, [731] MOTION to renew motion to compel the production of documents,until 10/16/03,, [736] MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [730] MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply,until 2/12/2004,, [731] MOTION to renew motion to compel the production of documents,until 10/21/03, filed by USA. Reply due by 11/3/2003. Service: 10/21/03.(jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 736 Filed: 10/16/2003, Entered: 10/21/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to Oppose the [730] Dft's MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Its Pretrial Submissions, and [731] Dft's MOTION to Compel the production of documents, until 10/21/03, by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY.Service: 10/16/03. Response due by 11/3/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 735 Filed: 10/8/2003, Entered: 10/16/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time to File Combined Opposition to [730] Dft's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response, and [731] Dft's MOTION to renew motion to compel the production of documents, by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY.Service: 10/8/03. Response due by 10/27/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 734 Filed: 9/30/2003, Entered: 10/7/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re [730] MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to Response to motion for enlargement, (until 2/12/2004). filed by USA. Service by hand: 9/30/03.(dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 733 Filed: 9/26/2003, Entered: 10/3/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to [730] MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply,until 2/12/2004, filed by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY. Reply due by 10/10/2003. Service: 9/26/03.(jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 732 Filed: 9/26/2003, Entered: 10/2/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File Attached Scheduling Material from the Yankee Utility Cases by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY.Service: 9/26/03. Response due by 10/14/2003 (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 731 Filed: 9/24/2003, Entered: 9/29/2003, Terminated: 12/24/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to renew motion to compel the production of documents by USA.Service by hand: 9/24/03. Response due by 10/8/2003. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 730 Filed: 9/24/2003, Entered: 9/25/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Pltfs' Most Recent Pretrial Filings, until 2/12/2004, by USA.Service: 9/24/03. Response due by 10/14/2003.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 729 Filed: 9/16/2003, Entered: 9/22/2003 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY. Service: 9/16/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 728 Filed: 9/10/2003, Entered: 9/12/2003 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Pltfs' Responses to [703] Dft's Second MOTION to the Chief Judge to Renew Consideration of Dft's Motion to Consolidate, filed by USA. Service: 9/3/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 727 Filed: 9/10/2003, Entered: 9/12/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER allowing [725] Dft's Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to [717] Dft's Second MOTION to Renew Its Motion to Consolidate, until 9/3/03. Reply due by 9/3/2003. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 726 Filed: 9/4/2003, Entered: 9/9/2003 Order on Motion to PublishCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER: It is ORDERED that [723] Pltf's Motion to Publish the Order of June 26, 2003, and [724] Pltf's Motion to Publish the Order of August 25, 2003 are DENIED. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 725 Filed: 9/3/2003, Entered: 9/8/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to [718] Pltfs' Response to Dft's Second Motion to Renew its Motion to Consolidate, until 9/3/03, by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY.Service: 9/3/03. Response due by 9/22/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 724 Filed: 8/29/2003, Entered: 9/4/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Publish [719] August 25, 2003 Decision on Privilege Issues, by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY.Service: 8/29/03. Response due by 9/15/2003.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 723 Filed: 8/29/2003, Entered: 9/4/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Publish the [690] Court's June 26, 2003 Decision Addressing the Government's Summary Judgment Motions, by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY.Service: 8/29/03. Response due by 9/15/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 721 Filed: 8/29/2003, Entered: 9/2/2003 Order on Motion for Protective OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER: Accordingly, it is ORDERED that [704] Pltf's Motion for Protective Order, and [713] Pltf's Motion for Protective Order, filed August 4 and 18, 2003 and [710] Dft's Motion to Compel, filed August 15, 2003, shall be GRANTED to the extent provided in this Order and shall, otherwise, be DENIED. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 722 Filed: 8/28/2003, Entered: 9/3/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to [713] Pltf's MOTION for a Protective Order and CROSS-MOTION to Compel a Response to the Government's Interrogatories Regarding the Production of E-Mail Pursuant to the Court's July 25, 2003 Order filed by USA. Reply due by 9/9/2003. Service: 8/28/03 by hand.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 720 Filed: 8/26/2003, Entered: 8/28/2003 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to the Chief Judge for Extension of Time to File Reply to [719] Pltfs' Responses to Dft's Second Motion to Renew Its Motion to Consolidate, until 9/3/03, by USA.Service: 8/26/03. Response due by 9/12/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 719 Filed: 8/25/2003, Entered: 8/26/2003 Order on Motion to CompelCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER: The following documents, using the numbers assigned in pltf's March 6, 2003 motion, must be produced: 58,61,74,76,77,88,89,90,92,93,94,95,96,97,98,99,102,103,104,111, 112,120,136,138,139,146,149,154,155,156,157,203,206,209,211,212 ,214,216,219,220,E14,E15,E39,E40,E41,E42,E43,E44, and E95. The following documents do not, in their entirety, meet the necessary requirements for the privilege claimed and must be modified and produced as noted: 3,9,61,66,67,70,100,106,113,115,135,137,142,145,202,204,205,208,E44, and E46. With the exception of the above-listed production, it is concluded that the assertions of privilege by dft are otherwise, sustained. Accordingly, it is ORDERED: 1) That [610] Pltf's Motion to Compel, filed March 6, 2003, shall be GRANTED to the extent of the production called for above and, otherwise DENIED; 2) that to the extent testimony was withheld on the subject matter of the production ordered herein, that testimony shall now be taken. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (jcp, ) Modified on 4/21/2004 (dfh, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 718 Filed: 8/21/2003, Entered: 8/25/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  OPPOSITION to [703] Dft's Second MOTION to Renew Its Motion to Consolidate, Together with Separately Bound Appendix Volume [Large] filed by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY. Reply due by 8/29/2003. Service: 8/15/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 717 Filed: 8/21/2003, Entered: 8/25/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Dft's Second MOTION to Renew Its Motion to Consolidate [COPY], filed by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY per Order of 8/21/03. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 716 Filed: 8/21/2003, Entered: 8/25/2003 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER: That [713] Pltf's Motion for Leave to File in This Case Dft's Second Motion to Renew Its Motion to Consolidate and Pltf's Opposition Thereto, shall be ALLOWED and the tendered dft's second motion, served on July 29, 2003, and pltf's opposition thereto, served August 15, 2003, set out as Exhibit A and B to pltf's August 15, 2003 motion shall be deemed so FILED. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 715 Filed: 8/21/2003, Entered: 8/25/2003 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER: Accordingly, without any way ruling on whether the documents concerned are correctly categorized as privileged, it is ORDERED: 1) [683] Dft's Motion, filed June 20, 2003, is GRANTED; 2) That, pursuant to the "claw-back" provisions of the May 20, 1999 orders and Judge Sypolt's September 26, 2001 order, pltf shall return documents Nos. 1339, 1723, and 1724 to dft's counsel pending any further order of the court in this regard; 3) Attachment No. 2 to pltf's status report, filed February 6, 2003, shall be considered stricken pending any further order of the court in this regard. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 714 Filed: 8/19/2003, Entered: 8/20/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Pltf's Response to [702] Dft's MOTION to Renew Dft's 12/23/02, [538] Motion to Compel the Production of Documents Improperly Withheld on the Basis of Privilege filed by USA. Service: 8/19/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 713 Filed: 8/18/2003, Entered: 8/20/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Protective Order by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY.Service: 8/18/03 by hand. Response due by 9/2/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 712 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/19/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File Dft's Second Motion to Renew Its Motion to Consolidate and Yankee Utilities' Opposition Thereto In This Case by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY.Service: 8/15/03. Response due by 9/2/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 711 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/19/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit by 7 pages in Opposing Dft's Renewed Motion to Consolidate to Facilitate Reliance on Previous Briefing by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY.Service: 8/15/03. Response due by 9/2/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 710 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/19/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CROSS-MOTION to Compel Discovery or, in the Alternative MOTION to Strike Pltf's 2003 Pre-Trial Filings and MOTION for Expedited Considertaion, by USA. (Together with Dft's Opposition to Pltf's Motion for a Protective Order)Service: 8/15/03 by hand. Response due by 8/29/2003. Response due by 8/29/2003. Response due by 8/29/2003.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 710 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/19/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    OPPOSITION to [704] Pltf's MOTION for a Protective Order filed by USA. (Together with Cross-Motion to Compel Discovery or, in the Alternative, Motion to Strike Pltf's 2003 Pre-Trial Filings and Motion for Expedited Consideration) Reply due by 8/26/2003. Service: 8/15/03 by hand.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 709 Filed: 8/11/2003, Entered: 8/13/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to [702] Dft's MOTION to Renew Dft's 12/23/02 Motion to Compel the Production of Documents Improperly Withheld on the Basis of Privilege re: [538] Motion to Compel filed by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY. Reply due by 8/20/2003. Service: 8/11/03 by hand.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 708 Filed: 8/11/2003, Entered: 8/13/2003 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY. Service: 8/11/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 8/8/2003, Entered: 8/8/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Set/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 8/15/2003 (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 707 Filed: 8/5/2003, Entered: 8/7/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY in Support of [610] Pltf's Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Testimony Withheld as Privileged in 2003 filed by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY. Service: 7/11/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 706 Filed: 8/5/2003, Entered: 8/7/2003 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [700] Pltf's Motion for Leave to Exceed the Page Limitation for its Reply on its Motion to Compel Production of Documents Withheld as Privileged in 2003 and the reply shall now be FILED. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 705 Filed: 8/5/2003, Entered: 8/7/2003 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to the Chief Judge for Leave to Correct Certificate of Service, and MOTION to Waive Requirements of RCFC 5.3 Regarding "Dft's Second Motion [to the Chief Judge] to Renew its Motion to Consolidate" by USA, Filed by Leave of the Judge. Service: 7/31/03. Response due by 8/18/2003. Response due by 8/18/2003. (jcp, ) Modified on 8/7/2003 (jcp, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 704 Filed: 8/4/2003, Entered: 8/6/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Protective Order, Together with Two (2) Separately Bound Appendix Volumes by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY.Service: 8/4/03 by hand. Response due by 8/18/2003.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 703 Filed: 7/30/2003, Entered: 7/31/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SECOND MOTION to Renew Its Motion to Consolidate by USA.Service: 7/29/03 by hand. Response due by 8/12/2003.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 702 Filed: 7/23/2003, Entered: 7/24/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Renew Dft's 12/23/02 [538] Motion to Compel the Production of Documents Improperly Withheld on the Basis of Privilege by UNITED STATES.Service: 7/23/03. Response due by 8/11/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 701 Filed: 7/17/2003, Entered: 7/21/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Opposition to Motion re: [683] Dft's MOTION enforce the terms of the September 26, 2001 Protective Order and MOTION to Strike Exhibits from Yankee Atomic's Pre-Trial Exhibit List filed by UNITED STATES. Service: 7/16/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 700 Filed: 7/11/2003, Entered: 7/15/2003, Terminated: 8/5/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit of Reply on Its Motion to Compel Production of Documents Withheld as Privileged in 2003 by 8 pages by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY.Service: 7/11/03. Response due by 7/28/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 699 Filed: 7/7/2003, Entered: 7/9/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [696] Pltf's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [610] Pltf's Motion to Compel the Production of Documents and Testimony Wihtheld as Privileged, until 7/11/03. Reply due by 7/11/2003. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 698 Filed: 7/7/2003, Entered: 7/8/2003 ResponseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to government's motion to apply order from coordinated discovery protecting confidential information in lieu of this court's order protecting priviledged information filed by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY, by leave of the Judge. Service: 7/2/03.(dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 697 Filed: 7/2/2003, Entered: 7/7/2003 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER finding as moot [694] Pltf's Motion for Leave to File New Authority in Support of Opposition to Government's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on the Rate of Spent Fuel Acceptance. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 696 Filed: 7/2/2003, Entered: 7/3/2003, Terminated: 7/7/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Its Reply as to [610] Motion to Compel the Production of Documents and Testimony Withheld as Privileged, until 7/11/03, by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY.Service: 7/2/03. Response due by 7/21/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 695 Filed: 7/1/2003, Entered: 7/3/2003 Order Returning Document UnfiledCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER RETURNING: It is ORDERED that Pltf's Notice of New Authority in Support of Opposition to Dft's Motion for Summary Judgment Upon Count III of Pltf's Complaint (Re Takings) is MOOT and shall be returned UNFILED to pltf's counsel. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 694 Filed: 6/30/2003, Entered: 7/2/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File New Authority in Support of Opposition to Government's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on the Rate of Spent Fuel Accpetance by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY.Service: 6/30/03. Response due by 7/17/2003 (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 693 Filed: 6/27/2003, Entered: 7/1/2003 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER denying as moot [658] Pltf's Motion for Leave to File Notice of Additional Evidence and Volume 3 of its Appendix in Support of its Opposition to the Government's GTCC Waste Summary Judgment Motion. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 692 Filed: 6/26/2003, Entered: 6/30/2003 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [674] Pltf's Motion for Leave to File New Authority in Support of Opposition to Government's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on the Rate of Spent Fuel Acceptance. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 691 Filed: 6/26/2003, Entered: 6/30/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [689] Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply as to [685] Dft's Opposition to Pltf's Motion to Compel Production of Documents, until 7/2/03. Reply due by 7/2/2003. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 690 Filed: 6/26/2003, Entered: 6/30/2003 Order on Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER: Based on the discussion, it is ORDERED that dft's motions: [251] Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding the Rate of Spent Nuclear Fuel Acceptance, [260] Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Pltf's Greater Than Class C Radioactive Waste Arguments, and [263] Motion for Summary Judgment Upon Count III of Pltf's Complaint [Taking Claim] shall be DENIED. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 689 Filed: 6/25/2003, Entered: 6/26/2003, Terminated: 6/26/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to [685] Opposition to Yankee Atomic's Motion to Compel Production of Documents Withheld as Privileged in 2003,until 7/2/03, by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY.Service: 6/25/03. Response due by 7/14/2003 (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 688 Filed: 6/25/2003, Entered: 6/26/2003 Order on Motion for ClarificationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER: granting [595] Defendant's Motion for Clarification to the extent provided herein, and denying [609] Plaintiff's Motion to Compel with the exception that defendant shall search Mr. Zabransky's two disks and produce any material therefrom covered by the discovery order. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 687 Filed: 6/25/2003, Entered: 6/26/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER: 1) That defendant's [651] Motion for Enlargment of Time and Motion for Suspension, filed April 28, 2003, shall be DENIED with regard to suspension of pretrial proceedings and shall be GRANTED with regard to an enlargement of time for its final pretrial submissions. 2) That defendant's final pretrial submissions shall be submitted on or before September 25, 2003. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 686 Filed: 6/25/2003, Entered: 6/26/2003 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER: As stated throughout the conduct of this litigation, a trial date will be set promptly upon completion of the pretrial submissions, in consultation with counsel. Accordingly in this circumstance, it is ORDERED that [648] Motion to Have Case Set for Trial in September 2003, filed on April 23, 2003, and [677] Motion to Have Case Set for Trial in September 2003, filed on June 13, 2003 shall be DENIED without prejudice to renewal upon completion of the pretrial proceedings. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (jcp, ) Modified on 9/5/2003 (dfh, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 6/25/2003, Entered: 6/26/2003 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Final Pretrial Submissions due on or before 9/25/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 685 Filed: 6/20/2003, Entered: 6/23/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE/BRIEF IN OPPOSITION to [610] Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of Documents Withheld as Privileged in 2003 filed by UNITED STATES. CORRECTED COPY Reply due by 6/30/2003. Service: 6/19/03 by hand.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 684 Filed: 6/20/2003, Entered: 6/23/2003 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER that [682] Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Corrected Version of "Defendant's Brief in Opposition to Yankee Atomic's Motion to Compel Production of Documents Withheld as Privileged in 2003" is ALLOWED. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 683 Filed: 6/20/2003, Entered: 6/23/2003, Terminated: 8/21/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION enforce the terms of the September 26, 2001 Protective Order and MOTION to Strike exhibit's from Yankee Atomic's 2003 Pre-Trial Exhibit List by UNITED STATES.Service by hand: 6/20/03. Response due by 7/7/2003. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 682 Filed: 6/19/2003, Entered: 6/20/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Version of "Defendant's Brief in Opposition to Yankee Atomic's Motion to Compel Production of Documents Withheld as Privileged in 2003" by UNITED STATES.Service: 6/19/03 by hand. Response due by 7/7/2003 (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 680 Filed: 6/19/2003, Entered: 6/20/2003 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to [610] Motion to Compel filed by UNITED STATES, by leave of the Judge. Reply due by 6/30/2003. Service by hand: 6/16/03.(dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 681 Filed: 6/17/2003, Entered: 6/20/2003 ResponseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to Connecticut Department of Public Utility Control's and Maine Public Utilities Commission's Amicus Brief oppoding the United States Motion to Suspend further compliance with pretrial proceedings etc., filed by UNITED STATES, by leave of the Judge. Service: 6/12/03.(dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 678 Filed: 6/16/2003, Entered: 6/19/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [676] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to [610] Motion to Compel. Response due by 6/16/2003. Signed by Senior Judge James F. Merow. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 679 Filed: 6/13/2003, Entered: 6/19/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [673] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion to Compel and granting [675] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Amicus Curiae Brief. Signed by Senior Judge James F. Merow. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 677 Filed: 6/13/2003, Entered: 6/18/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RENEWED MOTION to Set a Trial Date, and for an Immediate Status Conference by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY.Service: 06/13/03. Response due by 6/30/2003 (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 676 Filed: 6/13/2003, Entered: 6/18/2003, Terminated: 6/16/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Testimony Withheld as Privileged in 2003, until 6/16/03, by UNITED STATES.Service: 06/13/03. Response due by 6/30/2003 (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 6/13/2003, Entered: 6/19/2003 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Motion to Compel due by 6/13/2003. Response to Amicus Curiae Brief due by 6/12/2003. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 675 Filed: 6/11/2003, Entered: 6/18/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to Connecticut Department of Public Utility Control's and Maine Public Utilities "Amicus Curiae Brief" opposing the "Motion to Suspend Further Compliance, etc., (until June 12, 2003), by UNITED STATES.Service: 6/11/03. Response due by 6/30/2003. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 674 Filed: 6/11/2003, Entered: 6/17/2003, Terminated: 6/26/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File New Authority in Support of Opposition to Government's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on the Rate of Spent Fuel Acceptance by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY.Service: 06/11/03. Response due by 6/30/2003 (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 673 Filed: 6/10/2003, Entered: 6/17/2003, Terminated: 6/13/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Testimony Withheld as Privileged in 2003,until 06/13/03, by UNITED STATES.Service: 06/10/03. Response due by 6/27/2003 (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 754 Filed: 6/3/2003, Entered: 1/4/2004 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [753] Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (dls)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 672 Filed: 6/3/2003, Entered: 6/12/2003 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [666] Motion for Leave to File previously filed objections. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 671 Filed: 6/3/2003, Entered: 6/12/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re [658] MOTION for Leave to File file Notice of Additional Evidence and Volume 3 of its Appendix in support of its Opposition to the GTCC waste Summary Judgment Motion filed by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY. Service: 6/3/03.(jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 752 Filed: 6/2/2003, Entered: 1/4/2004 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [668] Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (dls)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 670 Filed: 5/28/2003, Entered: 6/5/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re [666] MOTION for Leave to File file its previously filed objections as its supplemental reply upon the acceptance rate motion filed by UNITED STATES. Service: 5/28/03.(dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 669 Filed: 5/27/2003, Entered: 6/4/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to [666] MOTION for Leave to File file its previously filed objections as its supplemental reply upon the acceptance rate motion filed by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY. Reply due by 6/9/2003. Service: 5/27/03.(hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 668 Filed: 5/23/2003, Entered: 6/4/2003, Terminated: 6/2/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by CONNECTICUT DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC UTILITY CONTROL and the MAINE PUBLIC UTILITIES COMMISSION.Service by hand: 5/23/03. Response due by 6/6/2003. (dw1, ) Modified on 1/4/2004 to correct filers. (dls).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 667 Filed: 5/22/2003, Entered: 6/3/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to [658] MOTION for Leave to File file Notice of Additional Evidence and Volume 3 of its Appendix in support of its Opposition to the GTCC waste Summary Judgment Motion filed by UNITED STATES. Reply due by 6/6/2003. Service: 5/22/03.(dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 666 Filed: 5/21/2003, Entered: 5/30/2003, Terminated: 6/3/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File its previously filed objections as its supplemental reply upon the acceptance rate motion by UNITED STATES.Service by hand: 5/21/03. Response due by 6/2/2003. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 665 Filed: 5/16/2003, Entered: 5/28/2003 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [664] Motion for Leave to File two pages of the appendix to plaintiff's motion to compel. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 753 Filed: 5/13/2003, Entered: 1/4/2004, Terminated: 6/3/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File file two pages of the appendix to plaintiff's motion to compel documents and testimony withheld as privileged that were inadvertently omitted because of copying error filed by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY.Service: 5/13/03. (dls)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 664 Filed: 5/13/2003, Entered: 5/15/2003, Terminated: 5/16/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File two pages of the appendix, etc. re: motion to compel documents and testimony by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY.Service: 5/13/03. (hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 663 Filed: 5/12/2003, Entered: 5/15/2003 Order on Motion to StrikeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER denying [627] Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 662 Filed: 5/12/2003, Entered: 5/15/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to Motion re [652] MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Recent Authority filed by The United States. Reply due by 5/21/2003. Service by hand: 5/12/03.(dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 661 Filed: 5/9/2003, Entered: 5/14/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting in part [640] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to motion to compel and denying in part motion to deem March 6, 2003 motion moot. Defendant's Response due by 6/10/2003. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 660 Filed: 5/9/2003, Entered: 5/14/2003 Order on Motion to StrikeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying [628] Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 659 Filed: 5/9/2003, Entered: 5/14/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re [648] MOTION to have case set for trial filed by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY. Service: 5/9/03 by hand.(dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 5/9/2003, Entered: 5/14/2003 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Supplement to Reply Brief due by 5/27/2003. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 658 Filed: 5/8/2003, Entered: 5/13/2003, Terminated: 6/27/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Additional Evidence and Volume 3 of its Appendix in support of its Opposition to the GTCC waste Summary Judgment Motion by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY.Service by hand: 5/8/03. Response due by 5/22/2003. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 656 Filed: 5/8/2003, Entered: 5/8/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to [640] MOTION to deem plaintiff's motion to compel moot or, in the alternative, for Extension of Time to File Response as to [610] Motion to Compel filed by The United States. Service: 5/7/03.(dls, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 657 Filed: 5/7/2003, Entered: 5/9/2003 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re [628] MOTION to Strike filed by The United States, by leave of the Judge. Service: 5/5/03.(dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 655 Filed: 5/2/2003, Entered: 5/7/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [650] Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply as to [641] Response to Motion,until May 5, 2003, Reply due by 5/5/2003. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 654 Filed: 5/1/2003, Entered: 5/2/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE re [651] MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response,until October 25, 2003, MOTION to Stay further compliance with pretrial proceedings, etc. MOTION to Stay further compliance with pretrial proceedings, etc. filed by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY. Reply due by 5/15/2003. Service: 5/1/03 by hand.(hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 653 Filed: 4/28/2003, Entered: 4/30/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re [627] MOTION to Strike filed by The United States. Service: 4/28/03.(dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 652 Filed: 4/28/2003, Entered: 4/30/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Recent Authority by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY.Service: 4/28/03. Response due by 5/15/2003. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 651 Filed: 4/28/2003, Entered: 4/30/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Yankees most recent filings, (until October 25, 2003), or, in the alternative, MOTION to Stay further compliance with pretrial proceedings, etc. by The United States.Service: 4/28/03. Response due by 5/15/2003. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 650 Filed: 4/28/2003, Entered: 4/30/2003, Terminated: 5/2/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to [641] Response to Motion, (until May 5, 2003), by The United States.Service: 4/28/03. Response due by 5/15/2003. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 649 Filed: 4/24/2003, Entered: 5/8/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to [640] MOTION to deem motion to compel moot or, in the alternative, for Extension of Time to File Response to [610] Motion to Compel filed by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY. Reply due by 5/8/2003. Service: 4/24/03.(dls, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 648 Filed: 4/23/2003, Entered: 4/28/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to have case set for trial by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY.Service: 4/23/03 by hand. Response due by 5/9/2003 (hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 647 Filed: 4/18/2003, Entered: 4/25/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re [609] Motion to Compel filed by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY. Service: 4/18/03.(dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 646 Filed: 4/17/2003, Entered: 4/25/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [644] Motion for Extension of Time re [644] MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply,until 4/18/03, Response due by 4/16/2003 Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 645 Filed: 4/16/2003, Entered: 4/23/2003 Order on Motion for ReconsiderationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying [633] Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (jat)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 644 Filed: 4/16/2003, Entered: 4/23/2003, Terminated: 4/17/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to the Motion for Enforcement of Discovery Order and to the Motion to Compel a Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition, etc., until 4/18/03, by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY. Service: 4/16/03.Response due 5/5/2003. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 643 Filed: 4/15/2003, Entered: 4/23/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [621] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to the Motion to Compel. Response to Motion to Compel due 4/15/2003. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 640 Filed: 4/15/2003, Entered: 5/8/2003, Terminated: 5/9/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to deem plaintiff's motion to compel moot or, in the alternative, for Extension of Time (to June 10, 2003) to respond to [610] Motion to Compel filed by The United States.Service: 4/15/03. Response due by 5/2/2003 (dls, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 642 Filed: 4/14/2003, Entered: 4/21/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to [628] MOTION to Strike, filed by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY.Reply due 4/28/2003. Service: 4/14/03. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 641 Filed: 4/14/2003, Entered: 4/21/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to [627] MOTION to Strike, filed by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY.Reply due 4/28/2003. Service: 4/14/03. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 639 Filed: 4/9/2003, Entered: 4/15/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [637] Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to the Motion for Enforcement of Discovery and Motion to Compel. Reply to motions due 4/7/2003. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 4/9/2003, Entered: 4/15/2003 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Set/Reset Deadlines: Reply to Motion for Enforcement of Discovery and Motion Compel a Rule 30(b)(6) deposition, etc., due 4/16/2003. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 638 Filed: 4/8/2003, Entered: 4/14/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to [624] MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to [609] Motion to Compel, filed by The United States. Service: 4/7/03. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 637 Filed: 4/7/2003, Entered: 4/11/2003, Terminated: 4/9/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to the Motion for Enforcement of Discovery Order, Motion to Compel A Rule 30(b)(6) deposition, etc., until 4/16/03, by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY. Service: 4/7/03. Response due 4/24/2003. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 634 Filed: 4/4/2003, Entered: 4/7/2003 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT in response to Orders of March 7 and 18, 2003, filed by BOSTON EDISON COMPANY, COMMONWEALTH EDISON COMPANY, CONNECTICUT YANKEE ATOMIC POWER COMPANY, CONSUMERS ENERGY COMPANY, DETROIT EDISON COMPANY, DUKE POWER COMPANY, FLORIDA POWER & LIGHT COMPANY, GPU NUCLEAR, INC., INDIANA MICHIGAN POWER COMPANY, MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC POWER COMPANY, NEBRASKA PUBLIC POWER DISTRICT, NORTHERN STATES POWER COMPANY, OMAHA PUBLIC POWER DISTRICT, POWER AUTHORITY, PUBLIC SERVICE ELECTRIC AND GAS COMPANY, SACRAMENTO MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT, SOUTHERN NUCLEAR OPERATING COMPANY, INC., TENNESSEE VALLEY AUTHORITY, The United States, VERMONT YANKEE NUCLEAR POWER CORPORATION, WISCONSIN ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY, YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY. (dls, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 633 Filed: 4/4/2003, Entered: 4/7/2003, Terminated: 4/16/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Reconsideration re [612]Order, filed by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY (for the YANKEE UTILITIES).Service: 4/4/03. Response due by 4/21/2003 (dls, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 636 Filed: 4/2/2003, Entered: 4/10/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to [609] Motion to Compel, filed by The United States. Reply due 4/16/2003. Service: 4/2/03. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 635 Filed: 4/2/2003, Entered: 4/8/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER, re: further proceedings. Signed by Judge Diane G. Sypolt. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 632 Filed: 4/2/2003, Entered: 4/7/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re [260] Motion for Summary Judgment filed by The United States. Service: 3/28/03.(dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 631 Filed: 4/2/2003, Entered: 4/7/2003 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [629] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 630 Filed: 3/31/2003, Entered: 4/4/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to Motion, re [624] MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to [609] Motion to Compel filed by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY. Reply due 4/14/2003. Service: 3/31/03. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 629 Filed: 3/28/2003, Entered: 4/3/2003, Terminated: 4/2/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit of reply to the motion for partial summary judgment regarding the rate of spent nuclear fuel acceptance by 59 pages by The United States. Service: 3/28/03. Response due 4/14/2003. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 628 Filed: 3/28/2003, Entered: 4/2/2003, Terminated: 5/9/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Strike pages 1 through 36 of the appendix to the response to the motion for partial summary judgment regarding the reate of spent nuclear fuel acceptance, by The United States. Service: 3/28/03. Response due 4/14/2003. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 627 Filed: 3/28/2003, Entered: 4/2/2003, Terminated: 5/12/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Strike portions of Plaintiff's filings concerning the rate of acceptance of spent nuclear fuel containing information about settlement activities, by The United States. Service: 3/28/03. Response due 4/14/2003.(lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 626 Filed: 3/25/2003, Entered: 3/27/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to Motion re [621] MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response,until 4/25/03 filed by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY. Reply due by 4/7/2003. Service: 3/25/03.(dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 625 Filed: 3/25/2003, Entered: 4/8/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to Motion re [598]MOTION for enforcement of discovery order filed by The United States. Reply due by 4/7/2003. Service: 3/25/03. (included in reply to opposition to motion for clarification)(dls, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 625 Filed: 3/25/2003, Entered: 3/27/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re [595] Motion for Clarification filed by The United States. Service: 3/25/03.(dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 624 Filed: 3/25/2003, Entered: 3/27/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to [609] Motion to Compel by The United States, until April 2, 2003. Service: 3/25/03. Response due by 4/11/2003. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 623 Filed: 3/20/2003, Entered: 3/25/2003 Description not available
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion, re [251] Motion for Summary Judgment filed by The United States. Service: 3/18/03. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 622 Filed: 3/20/2003, Entered: 3/25/2003 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [618] Motion for Leave to Exceed the Page limitation. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 621 Filed: 3/20/2003, Entered: 3/24/2003, Terminated: 4/15/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to the Motion to Compel, until 4/15/03, by The United States. Service: 3/20/03. Response due by 4/7/2003. (lrd) Modified on 4/16/2003 (dls, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 620 Filed: 3/18/2003, Entered: 3/21/2003 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER: Response to the Court's order of 3/7/03 due 4/4/2003.Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 619 Filed: 3/18/2003, Entered: 3/20/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to Motion re [617] MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply, until 3/25/03, filed by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY. Reply due by 4/4/2003. Service: 3/18/03. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 618 Filed: 3/18/2003, Entered: 3/20/2003, Terminated: 3/20/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit of reply to the motion for partial summary judgment, re: Plaintiff's greater than class C radioactive waste arguments by 16 pages by The United States. Service: 3/18/03. Response due by 4/4/2003. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 617 Filed: 3/14/2003, Entered: 3/17/2003 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to the Motion to Clarify, until 3/25/03 by The United States. Service: 3/13/03. Response due by 3/31/2003. Filed by leave of the Judge.(lrd, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 616 Filed: 3/12/2003, Entered: 3/13/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by YANKEE ATOMIC (Service: 3/12/03) to [615-1] motion to Extend Time to file reply to the motion for partial summary judgment. Reply due: 3/26/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 615 Filed: 3/11/2003, Entered: 3/12/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 3/11/03) to Extend Time to file reply to the motion for partial summary judgment until 3/18/03. Response due: 3/28/03. (LTD) Modified on 03/13/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 614 Filed: 3/10/2003, Entered: 3/11/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by YANKEE ATOMIC (Service: 3/10/03) to Extend Time to file opposition to the motion of the USA to renew consideration, etc. , (until March 24, 2003). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 613 Filed: 3/10/2003, Entered: 3/11/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by YANKEE ATOMIC (Service: 3/10/03) to Extend Time to file opposition to the government's motion for renewed consideration of it's January 2001 motion, etc. , (until March 31, 2003). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 612 Filed: 3/7/2003, Entered: 3/10/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER re: The parties in the SNF cases shall confer, and, on or before March 21, 2003, shall collectively file with the Court a single list of suitable cases for deciding the pending motions listed in footnote 1 (signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 610 Filed: 3/6/2003, Entered: 3/7/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by YANKEE ATOMIC (Service by hand: 3/6/03 ) to Compel production of documents and testimony withheld as privileged in 2003 . Response due: 3/20/03. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 609 Filed: 3/4/2003, Entered: 3/6/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by YANKEE ATOMIC (Service by hand: 3/4/03) to Compel a Rule 30(b)(6) deposition and for further discovery regarding the Government's compliance with the Court's 7/25/02 order and to reconsider, if necessary, the Court's 2/10/03 order. Response due: 3/18/03 (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 608 Filed: 3/3/2003, Entered: 3/6/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [607-1] motion to Extend Time within which to serve pretrial submissions Plaintiff's Pre-trial submissions due 3/28/03 (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 607 Filed: 2/28/2003, Entered: 3/5/2003, Terminated: 3/3/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by YANKEE ATOMIC (Service : 2/28/03 ) to Extend Time within which to serve pretrial submissions , (until 3/28/03). (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 606 Filed: 2/27/2003, Entered: 3/5/2003 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by YANKEE ATOMIC (Service: 2/27/03) to [597-1] motion for Leave to file motion for renew consideration of defendant's pending motion to the Chief Judge. Reply due: 3/13/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 605 Filed: 2/27/2003, Entered: 3/5/2003 ResponseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by USA to [591-1] status report by YANKEE ATOMIC. Service: 2/21/03. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 604 Filed: 2/25/2003, Entered: 3/4/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER denying as moot [587-1] motion for Leave to file a single reply to the various utility plaintiffs' responses to the government's motion for permission to defer depositions (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 602 Filed: 2/25/2003, Entered: 3/4/2003 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by YANKEE ATOMIC (Service: 2/25/03) to [597-1] motion for Leave to file motion for renewed consideration of defendant's pending motion to the Chief Judge. Reply due: 3/3/03 (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 603 Filed: 2/24/2003, Entered: 3/4/2003 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 2/14/03) to renew consideration of the "Motion to the Chief Judge to reassign to a single Judge cases involving alleged breaches of the standard contract published at 10 C.F.R. Part 961" . Response due: 3/3/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 601 Filed: 2/24/2003, Entered: 3/3/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [597-1] motion for Leave to file motion for renew consideration of defendant's pending motion to the Chief Judge (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 598 Filed: 2/24/2003, Entered: 4/8/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for enforcement of discovery order filed by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY.Service: 2/24/03. Response due by 3/13/2003 (included in opposition to defendant's motion for clarification)(dls, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 598 Filed: 2/24/2003, Entered: 2/28/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by YANKEE ATOMIC (Service: 2/24/03) to [595-1] motion for Clarification of the Court's 7/25/02 order. Reply due: 3/10/03. (LTD) Modified on 4/8/2003 (dls, ). (also includes motion for enforcement of discovery order)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 600 Filed: 2/19/2003, Entered: 3/3/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [599-1] motion for Leave to file sur-reply to the motion to compel (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 597 Filed: 2/14/2003, Entered: 2/24/2003, Terminated: 2/24/2003 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service: 2/14/03) for Leave to file motion for renew consideration of defendant's pending motion to the Chief Judge . Response due: 3/3/03 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 599 Filed: 2/10/2003, Entered: 3/3/2003, Terminated: 2/19/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by YANKEE ATOMIC (Service: 2/10/03) for Leave to file sur-reply to the motion to compel . Response due: 2/27/03. (FILED WITH SUR-REPLY) (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 596 Filed: 2/10/2003, Entered: 2/21/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying [560-1] cross motion, granting [548-1] motion for Protective Order (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 595 Filed: 2/7/2003, Entered: 2/21/2003, Terminated: 6/25/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 2/6/03 ) for Clarification of the Court's 7/25/02, order . Response due: 2/24/03. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 591 Filed: 2/6/2003, Entered: 2/13/2003 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT by YANKEE ATOMIC. Service: 2/6/03 (VO)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 593 Filed: 2/5/2003, Entered: 2/13/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY by USA to response to [538-1] motion to Compel the production of documents improperly withheld on the basis of privilege. Service: 1/30/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 592 Filed: 2/5/2003, Entered: 2/13/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [585-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 587 Filed: 2/4/2003, Entered: 2/13/2003, Terminated: 2/25/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 2/4/03) for Leave to file a single reply to the various utility plaintiffs' responses to the government's motion for permission to defer depositions . Response due: 2/21/03. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 594 Filed: 2/3/2003, Entered: 2/13/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by USA (Service: 2/3/03) to [560-1] cross motion. Reply due: 2/20/03. (FILED WITH REPLY TO THE MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER) (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 594 Filed: 2/3/2003, Entered: 2/13/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY by USA to response to [548-1] motion for Protective Order. Service: 2/3/03. (FILED WITH RESPONSE TO CROSS-MOTION). (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 590 Filed: 2/3/2003, Entered: 2/13/2003 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SURREPLY by YANKEE ATOMIC to [579-1] motion for Leave to file surreply by YANKEE ATOMIC Service: 1/28/03 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 589 Filed: 2/3/2003, Entered: 2/13/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [579-1] motion for Leave to file surreply, granting [549-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the cross-motion, reply to the motion for summary judgment and reply to the motion to dismiss ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 588 Filed: 1/31/2003, Entered: 2/13/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY by USA to response to [263-1] motion for Summary Judgment upon Count III. Service: 1/31/03 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 586 Filed: 1/31/2003, Entered: 2/12/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [547-1] motion to defer depositions (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 585 Filed: 1/31/2003, Entered: 2/12/2003, Terminated: 2/5/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 1/30/03) For leave to exceed the page limitation for reply to the motion to compel. Response due: 2/18/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 580 Filed: 1/30/2003, Entered: 2/10/2003 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REVISED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by SACRAMENTO MUNICIPAL. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 573 Filed: 1/30/2003, Entered: 2/5/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service: 1/30/03) to Extend Time within which to file its reply to response to motion for summary judgment , (until 1/31/03). (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 578 Filed: 1/29/2003, Entered: 2/7/2003 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by SACRAMENTO MUNICIPAL (Service: 1/23/03) to [547-1] motion to defer depositions. Reply due: 2/6/03. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 577 Filed: 1/29/2003, Entered: 2/7/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Plaintiff to file proof of service on all parties by 2/5/03 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 576 Filed: 1/29/2003, Entered: 2/6/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of filing appendix to response to defendant's motion for partial summary judgment regarding plaintiff's greater than class c radioactive waste argumants filed in two volumes) by YANKEE ATOMIC. Three segments of the appendix are filed UNDER SEAL. Service: 1/29/03 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 575 Filed: 1/29/2003, Entered: 2/5/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by YANKEE ATOMIC (Service : 1/16/03 ) for Leave to file substitute appendix . Response due: 2/18/03 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 574 Filed: 1/29/2003, Entered: 2/5/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 1/29/03 ) to Extend Time within which to reply to response to motion for protective order , (until 2/3/03). (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 579 Filed: 1/28/2003, Entered: 2/7/2003, Terminated: 2/3/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by YANKEE ATOMIC (Service: 1/28/03) for Leave to file surreply to Defendant's motion for extension of time to address erroneous statement. Response due: 2/14/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 572 Filed: 1/27/2003, Entered: 2/4/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY by USA to response to [549-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the cross-motion, reply to the motion for summary judgment and reply to the motion to dismiss. Service: 1/27/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 571 Filed: 1/27/2003, Entered: 2/4/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by YANKEE ATOMIC (Service: 1/27/03) to [547-1] motion to defer depositions. Reply due: 2/10/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 570 Filed: 1/27/2003, Entered: 2/3/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by YANKEE ATOMIC (Service: 1/27/03) to [547-1] motion to defer depositions. Reply due: 2/10/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 569 Filed: 1/27/2003, Entered: 2/3/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [567-1] motion to Extend Timei to file pretrial submissions Plaintiff's Pre-trial submissions due 2/28/03 (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 568 Filed: 1/24/2003, Entered: 1/31/2003 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 1/24/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 567 Filed: 1/24/2003, Entered: 1/31/2003, Terminated: 1/27/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by YANKEE ATOMIC (Service: 1/24/03) to Extend Timei to file pretrial submissions until 2/28/03. Response due: 2/10/03. (FILED WITH STATUS REPORT). (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 566 Filed: 1/23/2003, Entered: 1/31/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [565-1] motion for Leave to file ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 611 Filed: 1/21/2003, Entered: 3/10/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying, except to the extent that the text of this order provides clarification, [583-1] motion For reconsideration of [582-1] order. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 581 Filed: 1/21/2003, Entered: 2/11/2003 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE (Service: 1/16/03) to motion for reconsideration. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 564 Filed: 1/21/2003, Entered: 1/28/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by SOUTHERN NUCLEAR (Service: 1/21/03) to [547-1] motion to defer depositions. Reply due: 2/4/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 563 Filed: 1/21/2003, Entered: 1/28/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by WISCONSIN ELECTRIC (Service: 1/21/03) to [547-1] motion to defer depositions. Reply due: 2/3/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 562 Filed: 1/21/2003, Entered: 1/28/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by TENNESSEE VALLEY (Service: 1/16/03) to [547-1] motion to defer depositions. Reply due: 1/31/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 565 Filed: 1/17/2003, Entered: 1/28/2003, Terminated: 1/23/2003 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by COMMONWEALTH EDISON (Service: 1/17/03) for Leave to file before Judge Hewitt Comed's response to Defendant's motion to defer depositions upon Defendant's pending motions for partial summary judgment. Response due: 2/3/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 584 Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: 2/12/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER re: (1) Leave is GRANTED for plaintiff to substitute a replacement redacted appendix for appendix, filed 10/29/02. etc.; (2) Leave is also GRANTED for the separate filing under seal of complete copies of any document or page removed or redatced from the original appendix, filed 10/29/02; and (3) The appendix for plaintiff's opposition, filed 10/31/02, to defendant's summary judgment motion concerning the rate of acceptance, etc. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 559 Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: 1/24/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER denying as moot [556-1] motion to Withdraw [550-1] motion to Extend Time to serve Paragraph 3 pretrial submissions by YANKEE ATOMIC (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 558 Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: 1/24/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by YANKEE ATOMIC (Service: 1/16/03) to [538-1] motion to Compel the production of documents improperly withheld on the basis of privilege. Reply due: 1/31/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 557 Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: 1/23/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by COMMONWEALTH EDISON (Service: 1/16/03) to [547-1] motion to defer depositions. Reply due: 1/31/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 583 Filed: 1/15/2003, Entered: 2/12/2003, Terminated: 1/21/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 1/15/03 ) For reconsideration of [582-1] order under Rule 83.2 . (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 560 Filed: 1/15/2003, Entered: 1/24/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CROSS MOTION by YANKEE ATOMIC (Service by hand: 1/15/03 ) and RESPONSE to 12/23/02 notice of deposition, cross-motion to compel a privilege log for withheld e-mail by 1/22/03, and for expedited consideration. Third and fourth of four items in the same document. Response due 1/29/03 (HW) Modified on 01/24/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 560 Filed: 1/15/2003, Entered: 1/24/2003, Terminated: 2/10/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CROSS MOTION by YANKEE ATOMIC (Service by hand: 1/15/03 ) and RESPONSE to [538-1] motion to Compel the production of documents improperly withheld on the basis of privilege by USA. Response due: 1/29/03. Second of four items in the same document. (HW) Modified on 01/24/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 560 Filed: 1/15/2003, Entered: 1/24/2003, Terminated: 2/10/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by YANKEE ATOMIC (Service by hand: 1/15/03 ) to [548-1] motion for Protective Order. Reply due: 1/28/03. First of four items in the same document. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 556 Filed: 1/15/2003, Entered: 1/23/2003, Terminated: 1/16/2003 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by YANKEE ATOMIC (Service: 1/13/03) to Withdraw [550-1] motion to Extend Time to serve Paragraph 3 pretrial submissions by YANKEE ATOMIC . Response due: 8/7/02. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD) Modified on 01/23/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 1/15/2003, Entered: 1/24/2003 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Deadline updated; Response to [560-1] cross motion reset to 1/29/03 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 555 Filed: 1/14/2003, Entered: 1/22/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying as moot [550-1] motion to Extend Time to serve Paragraph 3 pretrial submissions Plaintiff's Pre-trial submissins due 1/24/03 (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 554 Filed: 1/13/2003, Entered: 1/21/2003 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT by YANKEE ATOMIC. Service: 1/13/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 553 Filed: 1/13/2003, Entered: 1/21/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by USA (Service: 1/13/03) to [549-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the cross-motion, reply to the motion for summary judgment and reply to the motion to dismiss. Reply due: 1/28/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 551 Filed: 1/10/2003, Entered: 1/15/2003 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by YANKEE ATOMIC (Service: 1/7/03) to [549-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the cross-motion, reply to the motion for summary judgment and reply to the motion to dismiss. Reply due: 1/22/03. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 550 Filed: 1/10/2003, Entered: 1/15/2003, Terminated: 1/14/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by YANKEE ATOMIC (Service: 1/10/03) to Extend Time to serve Paragraph 3 pretrial submissions until? Response due: 1/27/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 552 Filed: 1/9/2003, Entered: 1/15/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [544-1] motion to Extend Time within which to respond to the motion to compel Response to [538-1] motion to Compel the production of documents improperly withheld on the basis of privilege due 1/16/03 (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 549 Filed: 1/9/2003, Entered: 1/14/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 1/9/03) to Extend Time to respond to the cross-motion, reply to the motion for summary judgment and reply to the motion to dismiss until ? Response due: 1/21/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 548 Filed: 1/9/2003, Entered: 1/13/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service: 1/9/03) for Protective Order . Response due: 1/23/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 547 Filed: 1/9/2003, Entered: 1/13/2003, Terminated: 1/31/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 1/9/03) to defer depositions until after the Court rules on the Defendant's pending motions for partial summary judgment. Response due: 1/27/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 546 Filed: 1/8/2003, Entered: 1/13/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Status report or Motion to extend time due 1/24/03 (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 545 Filed: 1/8/2003, Entered: 1/11/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting in part, denying in part [497-1] motion to Compel ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 544 Filed: 1/7/2003, Entered: 1/10/2003, Terminated: 1/9/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by YANKEE ATOMIC (Service : 1/7/03 ) to Extend Time within which to respond to the motion to compel , (until January 16, 2003). (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 561 Filed: 1/6/2003, Entered: 1/24/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying [489-1] motion for Protective Order ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 543 Filed: 1/3/2003, Entered: 1/9/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting in part, denying in part [487-1] motion to Compel (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 542 Filed: 1/3/2003, Entered: 1/9/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER denying [531-1] motion partial brief from the Court's 7/25/02 Order and denying motion for sanctions filed on 11/27/02 (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. [motion for sanctions included in plaintiffs opposition filed 11/27/02] (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 541 Filed: 1/3/2003, Entered: 1/9/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [540-1] motion to Extend Time to file reply to response to motion for summary judgment by 1/10/03 (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 540 Filed: 1/3/2003, Entered: 1/9/2003, Terminated: 1/3/2003 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 12/30/02) to Extend Time to file reply to response to motion for summary judgment , (until January 10, 2003). Response due: 1/13/03. [by leave of the Judge] (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 582 Filed: 12/30/2002, Entered: 2/12/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER re: Except to the extent granted by this Order, the above listed motions shall be otherwise, be DENIED ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 539 Filed: 12/30/2002, Entered: 1/6/2003 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Reply to response to motion by YANKEE ATOMIC re: motion to permit submissions pending government compliance with discovery obligations, filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 12/20/02 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 538 Filed: 12/26/2002, Entered: 1/2/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 12/23/02) to Compel the production of documents improperly withheld on the basis of privilege , (together with separate appendix). Response due: 1/10/03. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 537 Filed: 12/20/2002, Entered: 12/30/2002 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT ORDER. Plaintiff's Status report due 1/13/03 (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 536 Filed: 12/19/2002, Entered: 12/27/2002 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT by YANKEE ATOMIC Service: 12/19/02 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 535 Filed: 12/16/2002, Entered: 12/18/2002 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY by USA to response to [531-1] motion partial brief from the Court's 7/25/02 Order. Service: 12/16/02. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 534 Filed: 12/16/2002, Entered: 12/18/2002 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fa
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Response by YANKEE ATOMIC to [262-1] proposed findings by USA. Service: 12/16/02 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 533 Filed: 12/16/2002, Entered: 12/18/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by YANKEE ATOMIC (Service: 12/16/02 ) to [263-1] motion for Summary Judgment upon Count III. Reply due: 1/10/03 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 532 Filed: 11/27/2002, Entered: 12/3/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by YANKEE ATOMIC (Service: 11/27/02 ) to [531-1] motion partial relief from the Court's 7/25/02 Order. Reply due: 12/16/02 (HW) Modified on 12/03/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 531 Filed: 11/20/2002, Entered: 11/23/2002, Terminated: 1/3/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 11/20/02 ) partial brief from the Court's 7/25/02 Order , and for Protective Order Response due: 12/9/02 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 530 Filed: 11/18/2002, Entered: 11/21/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER denying as moot [487-1] motion to Compel (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 529 Filed: 11/15/2002, Entered: 11/19/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting in part, denying in part [528-1] motion to defer briefing on the motions for partial summary judgment Reply to Response to Motion due 1/10/03 for [263-1] motion for Summary Judgment upon Count III, [260-1] motion for partial summary judgment regarding the rate of spent nuclear fuel acceptance, and for [251-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment regarding plaintiff's greater than class C radioactive waste arguments (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 528 Filed: 11/12/2002, Entered: 11/14/2002, Terminated: 11/15/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 11/12/02) to defer briefing on the motions for partial summary judgment . Response due: 11/26/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 527 Filed: 11/6/2002, Entered: 11/12/2002 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY by USA to response to [514-1] motion to suspend Defendant's obligation to respond to Yankee Atomic's response to motions to strike the expert report and testimony of Dr. Bartlett and motion for an order allowing Dr. Bartlett to serve as an expert witness and Defendant's oppositioin to Yankee Atomic's motion for expedited consideration and resolution of the motions filed by the government and by Yankee Atomic concerning Dr. Bartlett's serving as an expert witness. Service: 11/6/02. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 526 Filed: 10/31/2002, Entered: 11/5/2002 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY by YANKEE ATOMIC to response to [487-1] motion to Compel. Service: 10/31/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 525 Filed: 10/31/2002, Entered: 11/5/2002 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY by YANKEE ATOMIC to response to [487-1] motion to Compel (also contains response to motion for protective order). Service: 10/31/02 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 524 Filed: 10/31/2002, Entered: 11/1/2002 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fa
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Response by YANKEE ATOMIC to [259-1] proposed findings by USA. Service by hand: 10/28/02 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 523 Filed: 10/31/2002, Entered: 11/1/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE, together with seven volumes of appendix, by YANKEE ATOMIC (Service by hand: 10/28/02) to [260-1] motion for partial summary judgment regarding the rate of spent nuclear fuel acceptance. Reply due: 11/14/02 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 522 Filed: 10/31/2002, Entered: 11/1/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [517-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 521 Filed: 10/30/2002, Entered: 10/30/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PUBLISHED DECISION. Order of October 9, 2002 re-issue as a published ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ). Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 520 Filed: 10/29/2002, Entered: 10/30/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by YANKEE ATOMIC (Service: 10/29/02 ) to [251-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment regarding plaintiff's greater than class C radioactive waste arguments (together with separate two volume appendix). Reply due: 11/12/02 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 519 Filed: 10/29/2002, Entered: 10/30/2002 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fa
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Response by YANKEE ATOMIC to [250-1] proposed findings by USA. Service by hand: 10/29/02. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 518 Filed: 10/28/2002, Entered: 10/30/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by YANKEE ATOMIC (Service: 10/28/02) to Extend Time to file reply to the motion to Compel until 10/31/02. Response due: 11/14/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 517 Filed: 10/28/2002, Entered: 10/30/2002, Terminated: 10/31/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by YANKEE ATOMIC (Service: 10/28/02) For leave to exceed the page limitation re: opposition to motion for partial summary judgment. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 516 Filed: 10/28/2002, Entered: 10/30/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by YANKEE ATOMIC (Service : 10/28/02 ) to Extend Time to serve Paragraph 3 pretrial submissions [until November 27, 2002]. Response due: 11/14/02 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 515 Filed: 10/25/2002, Entered: 10/29/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by YANKEE ATOMIC (Service: 10/25/02 ) to [514-1] motion to suspend Defendant's obligation to respond to Yankee Atomic's response to motions to strike the expert report and testimony of Dr. Bartlett and motion for an order allowing Dr. Bartlett to serve as an expert witness and Defendant's oppositioin to Yankee Atomic's motion for expedited consideration and resolution of the motions filed by the government and by Yankee Atomic concerning Dr. Bartlett's serving as an expert witness. Reply due: 11/8/02 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 514 Filed: 10/17/2002, Entered: 10/21/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 10/16/02 ) to suspend Defendant's obligation to respond to Yankee Atomic's response to motions to strike the expert report and testimony of Dr. Bartlett and motion for an order allowing Dr. Bartlett to serve as an expert witness and Defendant's oppositioin to Yankee Atomic's motion for expedited consideration and resolution of the motions filed by the government and by Yankee Atomic concerning Dr. Bartlett's serving as an expert witness. Response due: 11/4/02 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 513 Filed: 10/17/2002, Entered: 10/21/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying [501-1] motion for Leave to strike (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 512 Filed: 10/16/2002, Entered: 10/18/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [502-1] motion for Leave to file "Motion for leave to file motion to strike and motion to strike exhibits to Plaintiff's motion to compel" and motion to strike (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 511 Filed: 10/16/2002, Entered: 10/18/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [490-1] motion to Extend Time to file pretrial submissions, granting [480-2] motion to Extend Time to make submissions under paragraph 3 of the pretrial order, as amended Plaintiff's pretrial submissions due 10/28/02 (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 510 Filed: 10/16/2002, Entered: 10/18/2002 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUR-REPLY by YANKEE ATOMIC to [479-1] motion reply by USA. Service: 10/16/02 (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 509 Filed: 10/16/2002, Entered: 10/18/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [480-1] motion to Quash, granting [481-1] motion for Leave to file sur-reply to Defendant's reply to the Motion for Protective Order (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 508 Filed: 10/15/2002, Entered: 10/17/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 10/15/02 ) for Protective Order . (Included in the response to motion to compel). Response due: 11/1/02 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 508 Filed: 10/15/2002, Entered: 10/17/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by USA (Service: 10/15/02 ) to [487-1] motion to Compel. Reply due: 11/1/02. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 507 Filed: 10/15/2002, Entered: 10/17/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 10/15/02 ) for publication . Response due: 11/1/02 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 506 Filed: 10/15/2002, Entered: 10/17/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by USA (Service: 10/15/02 ) to [490-1] motion to Extend Time to file pretrial submissions. Reply due: 11/1/02 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 505 Filed: 10/11/2002, Entered: 10/16/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [497-1] motion to Extend Time within which to respond to motion to quash the deposition Response to [480-1] motion to Quash due 10/10/02, [480-2] motion for Protective Order due 10/10/02 (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 504 Filed: 10/11/2002, Entered: 10/16/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [500-1] motion to Extend Time within which to respond to motion to compel documentis subpoenaed from ABZ, Inc. Response to [487-1] motion to Compel due 10/15/02 (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 503 Filed: 10/11/2002, Entered: 10/16/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [466-1] motion for Protective Order, denying [437-1] motion to Compel the testimony of Robert Campbell (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 502 Filed: 10/11/2002, Entered: 10/16/2002, Terminated: 10/16/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 10/11/02) for Leave to file "Motion for leave to file motion to strike and motion to strike exhibits to Plaintiff's motion to compel" and motion to strike . Response due: 10/28/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 498 Filed: 10/11/2002, Entered: 10/14/2002 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY by USA to response to [480-1] motion to Quash he deposition notice for Martin J. Virgilo. Service: 10/10/02 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 501 Filed: 10/10/2002, Entered: 10/14/2002, Terminated: 10/17/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 10/10/02 ) for Leave to strike , (motion to strike exhibits to plaintiff's motion to compel included). Response due: 10/28/02 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 500 Filed: 10/10/2002, Entered: 10/14/2002, Terminated: 10/11/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 10/10/02 ) to Extend Time within which to respond to motion to compel documentis subpoenaed from ABZ, Inc. , (until 10/15/02). (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 499 Filed: 10/10/2002, Entered: 10/14/2002 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 10/8/02 ) to Extend Time within which to reply to motion to quash filed by leave of the Judge, (until 10/10/02). Response due: 10/10/02 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 497 Filed: 10/10/2002, Entered: 10/11/2002, Terminated: 10/11/2002 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 10/8/02) to Extend Time within which to respond to motion to quash the deposition , (until 10/10/02), filed by leave of the Judge (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 307 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?