MARVIN v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:98-cv-00129-JPW
District Judge John P. Wiese, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo WILLIAM J. MARVIN, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space George Albert Hunlock, Jr. +1 619 535 9053
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth Michael Dintzer +1 202 307 0282 +1 202 514 8624 kenneth.dintzer@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 2/19/1998
Jury Demand
Demand $500000
Nature of Suit 346 - Military Pay - Correct/Reinstate
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 10/9/1998
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 13 Filed: 10/9/1998, Entered: 10/14/1998 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by WILLIAM J. MARVIN and USA. Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41 (a)(1)(B) this day. Copy to parties. Nature of Jgm DP. (HW)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 10/9/1998, Entered: 10/14/1998 Terminated Case
    Case closed. (HW)
      LREF
      Blank 12 Filed: 8/10/1998, Entered: 8/10/1998
      TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: Status Conference, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of August 4, 1998. Notice to parties. (FE)
        LREF
        Blank 11 Filed: 8/5/1998, Entered: 8/10/1998 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER set Notice of Compliance deadline to 9/4/98 for Plaintiff's counsel to contact Defendant's counsel and the court to advise whether Plaintiff intends to pursue his claim or file a voluntary dismissal. ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (JT)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 8/4/1998, Entered: 8/4/1998
          Status Conference held ( Transcript due 9/3/98 ) (DS)
            LREF
            Blank 10 Filed: 7/15/1998, Entered: 7/20/1998 Memorandum
            MEMORANDUM by USA pursuant to [3-1] order. Service: 7/15/98. (HW)
              LREF
              Blank 9 Filed: 6/9/1998, Entered: 6/10/1998 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER set Status Conference for 2:30 p.m., 8/4/98. ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                LREF
                Blank 8 Filed: 5/27/1998, Entered: 5/29/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER granting [7-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint. Reset Answer deadline to 6/25/98. ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                  LREF
                  Blank 7 Filed: 5/26/1998, Entered: 5/28/1998, Terminated: 5/27/1998 Terminated:
                  MOTION by USA (Service : 5/26/98 ) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint [until 6/25/98]. (AB)
                    LREF
                    Blank 6 Filed: 4/20/1998, Entered: 4/23/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                    ORDER granting [5-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to complaint . Answer deadline to 5/26/98 ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ). Copy to parties. (HW)
                      LREF
                      Blank 5 Filed: 4/16/1998, Entered: 4/20/1998, Terminated: 4/20/1998 Terminated:
                      MOTION by USA (Service : 4/16/98 ) to Extend Time to respond to complaint [to May 26, 1998]. Response due: 5/4/98 (JT)
                        LREF
                        Blank 4 Filed: 3/6/1998, Entered: 3/9/1998 Notice of Appearance/
                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Kenneth Michael Dintzer. Service : 3/6/98. (HW)
                          LREF
                          Blank 3 Filed: 2/20/1998, Entered: 2/25/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER directing parties to confer and arrange for preliinary status conference; identifying filing requirements for conference; and precluding filing of dispositive motions until after conference has been held. ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                            LREF
                            Blank 2 Filed: 2/19/1998, Entered: 2/20/1998 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                            Notice of assignment to Judge John P. Wiese. Copy to parties. (FE)
                              LREF
                              Blank 1 Filed: 2/19/1998, Entered: 2/20/1998 Complaint
                              COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #045025. Answer due on 4/20/98. (FE)
                                LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 128 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?