KNOWLES v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:98-cv-00146-MBH
District Judge Marian Blank Horn, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo MONIKA M. KNOWLES, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth M. Carpenter +1 785 357 5251
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Steptoe & Johnson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sean C. Griffin +1 202 429 8176 sgriffin@steptoe.com
Office COFC
Filed 3/2/1998
Jury Demand
Demand $10000
Nature of Suit 346 - Military Pay - Correct/Reinstate
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 4/28/1999
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (23) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 21 Filed: 3/15/2000, Entered: 3/20/2000 CAFC Mandate Dismissing
MANDATE (certified copy) from CAFC dated March 15, 2000 dismissed [20-1] appeal by MONIKA M. KNOWLES. (HW)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 6/24/1999, Entered: 6/28/1999 CAFC Case Number
    CAFC Case Number Re: [20-1] appeal by MONIKA M. KNOWLES. CAFC NUMBER: 99-5116. (HW)
      LREF
      Blank 20 Filed: 6/23/1999, Entered: 6/23/1999, Terminated: 3/15/2000 Notice of AppealCourt Filing
      NOTICE OF APPEAL by MONIKA M. KNOWLES. Copy to Defendant, Judge Marian Blank Horn and to CAFC. FILING FEE $105.00; RECEIPT #047718. (HW)
        LREF
        Blank 19 Filed: 4/28/1999, Entered: 4/28/1999
        JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaint is dismissed, with prejudice. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD)
          LREF
          Blank 18 Filed: 4/28/1999, Entered: 4/28/1999 Court Filing
          PUBLISHED DECISION granting [9-1] defendant's motion to Dismiss, and directing the clerk to dismiss plaintiff's complaint with prejudcie. ( signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn ). Copy to parties. (LD)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 4/28/1999, Entered: 4/28/1999
            Case closed (LD)
              LREF
              Blank 17 Filed: 8/20/1998, Entered: 8/21/1998 Reply to Response to Motion
              REPLY by USA to response to [9-1] motion to Dismiss. Service: 8/20/98 (AB)
                LREF
                Blank 16 Filed: 8/6/1998, Entered: 8/11/1998 Terminated:
                RESPONSE by MONIKA M. KNOWLES (Service: 8/3/98 ) to [9-1] motion to Dismissl. Reply due: 8/20/98 (JT)
                  LREF
                  Blank 15 Filed: 7/14/1998, Entered: 7/17/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                  ORDER granting [12-1] motion for Leave to File the Administrative Record. ( signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                    LREF
                    Blank 14 Filed: 7/14/1998, Entered: 7/17/1998 Administrative Record
                    Administrative record filed by USA. (2 volumes) (JT) Modified on 07/17/1998
                      LREF
                      Blank 13 Filed: 7/9/1998, Entered: 7/15/1998 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law
                      JOINT STATEMENT OF LAW by MONIKA M. KNOWLES, USA. (JT)
                        LREF
                        Blank 12 Filed: 7/9/1998, Entered: 7/15/1998, Terminated: 7/14/1998 Terminated:
                        MOTION by USA (Service : 7/9/98 ) for Leave to File the Administrative Record. Response due: 7/27/98 (JT)
                          LREF
                          Blank 11 Filed: 7/9/1998, Entered: 7/14/1998 Statement of Facts
                          JOINT STATEMENT OF FACTS filed by MONIKA M. KNOWLES, USA. (JT)
                            LREF
                            Blank 10 Filed: 6/9/1998, Entered: 6/10/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                            ORDER denying [8-1] motion for Leave to file the administrative record and returning the administrative reocrd to defendant Response to [9-1] motion to Dismiss reset to 8/6/98, [9-2] motion for Summary Judgment reset to 8/6/98 , set Cross Motion deadline to 8/6/98 , Reply to Response to Motion reset to 8/20/98 for [9-1] motion to Dismiss , reset to 8/20/98 for [9-2] motion for Summary Judgment , set Response to cross motion deadline to 9/3/98 , set Reply to Response to cross motion to 9/17/98 , set Notice of Compliance deadline to 7/9/98 for defendant to resubmit the administrative record and for the parties to file a joint stipulation of facts and a joint statement of issues of law. ( Signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn. ) Copy to parties. (CDC)
                              LREF
                              Blank 9 Filed: 6/9/1998, Entered: 6/10/1998 Terminated: Court Filing
                              MOTION by USA (Service : 6/1/98 ) to Dismiss , for Summary Judgment Response due: 8/6/98. Filed by leave of the Judge (See Order of 6/9/98). (CDC)
                                LREF
                                Blank 8 Filed: 6/3/1998, Entered: 6/8/1998, Terminated: 6/9/1998 Terminated:
                                MOTION by USA (Service : 6/3/98 ) for Leave to file the administrative record Response due: 6/22/98 (AB)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 7 Filed: 6/3/1998, Entered: 6/5/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                  ORDER granting [6-1] motion for Leave to File the Administrative Record, denying [6-2] motion for Waiver of Duplication. ( signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 6 Filed: 6/1/1998, Entered: 6/3/1998, Terminated: 6/3/1998 Terminated:
                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 6/1/98 ) for Leave to File the Administrative Record and for Waiver of Duplication. Response due: 6/18/98 (JT)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 5 Filed: 4/29/1998, Entered: 5/4/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                      ORDER granting [4-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to complaint. Reset Answer deadline to 6/1/98. ( signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 4 Filed: 4/28/1998, Entered: 5/1/1998, Terminated: 4/29/1998 Terminated:
                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 4/28/98 ) to Extend Time to respond to complaint [to June 1, 1998]. Response due: 5/15/98 (JT)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 3 Filed: 3/10/1998, Entered: 3/11/1998 Notice of Appearance/
                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Sean Curtis Griffin. Service : 3/10/98 (JT)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 2 Filed: 3/2/1998, Entered: 3/2/1998 Court Filing
                                            Notice of assignment to Judge Marian Blank Horn. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 1 Filed: 3/2/1998, Entered: 3/2/1998
                                              COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #045102. Answer due on 5/1/98. (FE)
                                                LREF

                                                Statistics

                                                This case has been viewed 177 times.

                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                Space
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                 
                                                PlainSite
                                                Sign Up
                                                Need Password Help?