CONN. YANKEE v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:98-cv-00154-JFM
District Judge James F. Merow, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo CONNECTICUT YANKEE ATOMIC POWER COMPANY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenberg Traurig, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jerry Stouck +1 202 331 3173 +1 202 331 3101 stouckj@gtlaw.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Harold Dewitt Lester, Jr. +1 202 616 0478 +1 202 307 2503 harv.lester@usdoj.gov
No Logo CONNECTICUT DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC UTILITY CONTROL, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kaye Scholer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Randall L. Speck +1 202 682 3510 RSpeck@kayescholer.com
No Logo Framatome Anp, Inc., Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Raymond Rakes +1 540 983 9354
Office COFC
Filed 3/4/1998
Jury Demand None
Demand $270000000
Nature of Suit 536 - Spent Nuclear Fuel
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Judgment
County None
Terminated 10/4/2006
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case '07-5033'[]
Def Custody Status
Flags APPEAL, CLOSED, CRSAPP, ECF, SNF
  Entries (450) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 380 Filed: 8/21/2007, Entered: 8/21/2007 Court Filing
ORDER re Mr. William Peterson's submissions of July 23, 2007. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae)
    LREF
    Legal Document 379 Filed: 4/25/2007, Entered: 4/25/2007 Court Filing
    ORDER RETURNING UNFILED: Motion to Intervene, Memorandum, Complaint and Certificate of Service received April 18, 2007. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae)
      LREF
      Legal Document 378 Filed: 12/28/2006, Entered: 1/9/2007 CAFC Case Number
      CAFC Case Number 07-5033 for [375] Notice of Appeal filed by USA. (hw1, )
        LREF
        Legal Document 376 Filed: 12/15/2006, Entered: 12/15/2006
        CAFC Case Number 07-5027 for [375] Notice of Appeal filed by USA. (hw1, )
          LREF
          Legal Document 377 Filed: 12/14/2006, Entered: 12/18/2006 Notice of cross-appeal
          NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL, filed by CONNECTICUT YANKEE ATOMIC POWER COMPANY. Filing fee $ 455.00, receipt number 065834. (hw1, )
            LREF
            Legal Document 375 Filed: 12/4/2006, Entered: 12/5/2006 Notice of AppealCourt Filing
            NOTICE OF APPEAL to [373] Judgment filed by USA. Copies to Senior Judge James F. Merow, opposing party and CAFC. (dw1)
              LREF
              Legal Document 374 Filed: 10/5/2006, Entered: 10/5/2006
              AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint, And Defendant's Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims, Filed Pursuant To Paragrah (5) Of The Court's September 30, 2006 Order, filed by USA. (Lester, Harold)
                LREF
                Legal Document 373 Filed: 10/4/2006, Entered: 10/4/2006
                JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that plaintiffs recover of and from the United States, the following total amounts: (1) Yankee Atomic - $32,866.087.55; (2) Connecticut Yankee - $34,154,879.00; and (3) Maine Yankee - $75,774,554.00. (dls )
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 372 Filed: 10/4/2006, Entered: 10/4/2006 Court Filing
                  REISSUED PUBLISHED OPINION and ORDER. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment as set forth in the REISSUED OPINION and ORDER filed this day in this and 98-126 C, and 98-474 C. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 371 Filed: 10/4/2006, Entered: 10/4/2006 Court Filing
                    ORDER (filed in this and 98-126C and 98-474C: The Opinion originally filed under seal on September 30, 2006, with minor non-substantive edits, including an addition correction in the amount awarded to Yankee Atomic for deposition expenses, shall now be issued without the "sealed" restriction. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 370 Filed: 9/30/2006, Entered: 9/30/2006 Court Filing
                      ORDER: (1) The Opinion issued this date in this and 98-126 C and 98-474 C shall be temporarily filed under seal with access restricted to persons covered by the applicable protective order(s); (2) Counsel shall promptly review the sealed Opinion and notify the court if any portion of the Opinion is discovered to comprise sealed material and, if so, the exact portion concerned; (3) Absent any notice pursuant to (2) filed on or before October 10, 2006, the Opinion will be unsealed by an appropriate Order. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                        LREF
                        Sealed Legal Document 369 Filed: 9/30/2006, Entered: 9/30/2006 Court Filing
                        **SEALED** SEALED OPINION and ORDER: The Clerk is directed to enter judgment as set forth in the SEALED OPINION and ORDER filed this day in this and 98-126 C and 98-474 C. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Amended Answer and Counterclaims in Nos. 98-154C is GRANTED, and the pleadings shall be promptly filed by defendant, and upon their filing the Counterclaims shall be DENIED, without prejudice to their reassertion at an appropriate time in future litigation. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 368 Filed: 8/24/2006, Entered: 8/24/2006
                          RESPONSE to [367] MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority, filed by CONNECTICUT YANKEE ATOMIC POWER COMPANY.Reply due by 9/7/2006. (Stouck, Jerry)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 367 Filed: 8/16/2006, Entered: 8/16/2006, Terminated: 9/30/2006 Motion for Leave to File
                            MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority, filed by USA.Response due by 9/5/2006.(Sullivan, Marian)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 366 Filed: 7/6/2005, Entered: 7/6/2005
                              NOTICE of Change of Address by Jerry Stouck (Stouck, Jerry)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 365 Filed: 2/22/2005, Entered: 2/22/2005
                                POST TRIAL BRIEF In Reply To Plaintiff's Post-Trial Response Brief by USA. (Attachments: # (1) # (2))(Lester, Harold)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 2/22/2005, Entered: 2/22/2005
                                  SCHEDULING ORDER: Pursuant to the Order filed in 98-126 and deemed applicable in this case, defendant's Post Trial Reply Brief is due 2/22/2005. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 364 Filed: 2/18/2005, Entered: 2/18/2005
                                    POST TRIAL BRIEF - Connecticut Yankee's Reply on its Post-Trial Proposed Findings of Fact by CONNECTICUT YANKEE ATOMIC POWER COMPANY. (Attachments: # (1))(Stouck, Jerry)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 363 Filed: 2/3/2005, Entered: 2/3/2005 Court Filing
                                      SCHEDULING ORDER in re Unopposed Motion for an Enlargement of Time to File Replies on Post Trial Briefs and Proposed Findings of Fact filed in 98-126. Replies on post trial briefs and proposed findings of fact due 2/18/2005. (applicable in this and 98-474). Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 362 Filed: 1/25/2005, Entered: 1/25/2005 Court Filing
                                        SCHEDULING ORDER: final post-trial reply briefs due by 2/4/2005 (filed in 98-126). Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 1/14/2005, Entered: 1/14/2005
                                          ORDER granting [361] Motion for Leave to File Defendant's Responses to Plaintiffs' Proposed Post-Trial Findings of Fact. Defendant's Responses to Plaintiffs' Proposed Post-Trial Findings of Fact is deemed filed January 13, 2005. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 1/14/2005, Entered: 1/14/2005
                                            ORDER granting [360] Motion for Leave to File Defendant's Responses to Plaintiffs' Initial Post-Trial Brief. Defendant's Responses to Plaintiffs' Initial Post-Trial Brief is deemed filed January 13, 2005. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                              LREF
                                              Sealed Legal Document 361 Filed: 1/13/2005, Entered: 1/13/2005, Terminated: 1/14/2005 Motion for Leave to File
                                              **SEALED** MOTION for Leave to File Defendant's Responses To Plaintiff's Proposed Post-Trial Findings Of Fact by USA. Response due by 1/31/2005 (Attachments: # (1) # (2))(Lester, Harold)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 360 Filed: 1/13/2005, Entered: 1/13/2005, Terminated: 1/14/2005 Motion for Leave to File
                                                MOTION for Leave to File Defendant's Response To Plaintiff's Initial Post-Trial Brief by USA. Response due by 1/31/2005 (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3))(Lester, Harold)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 359 Filed: 1/13/2005, Entered: 1/13/2005 Court Filing
                                                  ORDER (filed in 98-126) deferring ruling on [324] Motion to Amend Pleadings - Rule 15(b): Action on the Motion for Leave to File Amended Answer and Counterclaims and Defendant's Alternative Motion for Leave to File Amended Answer and Counterclaims Pursuant to RCFC 13(f) and 15(b) and responses thereto shall be DEFERRED for consideration and resolution as a part of the case-in-chief in this matter, and can be addressed in oral argument scheduled for January 24, 2004. As a part of the scheduled oral argument the parties may also address, to the extent relevant, the jurisdictional issues raised in the Order to Show Cause and for Additional Briefing filed in Florida Power & Light Company, et al., Case Nos. 98-483C, 98-485C, 01-116C, 01-551C on October 15, 2004. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 358 Filed: 1/12/2005, Entered: 1/12/2005 Court Filing
                                                    ORDER granting [357] Motion for Extension of Time. On January 12, 2005, Defendant's Unopposed Motion for a One-Day Enlargement of Time was filed. Defendant requests an enlargement of time allowing the parties to file their responses to the opposing parties' proposed post-trial findings of fact and post-trial response briefs by 5:00 p.m. on January 13, 2005. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that defendant's unopposed motion, filed January 12, 2005, is GRANTED. (filed in 98-126) Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 357 Filed: 1/12/2005, Entered: 1/12/2005, Terminated: 1/12/2005 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                      Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [343] Post Trial Brief, [344] Post Trial Brief, [345] Statement of Facts, [346] Post Trial Brief Of One Additional Day by USA. Response due by 1/31/2005 (Lester, Harold)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 356 Filed: 1/7/2005, Entered: 1/7/2005 Court Filing
                                                        ORDER granting [355] Motion for Extension of Time to and including January 12, 2005, within which to respond to the opposing parties' proposed post-trial findings of fact and post-trial response briefs (filed in 98-126). Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 355 Filed: 1/7/2005, Entered: 1/7/2005, Terminated: 1/7/2005 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                          Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [349] Statement of Facts, [343] Post Trial Brief, [344] Post Trial Brief, [346] Post Trial Brief,until 1/12/2005, by USA. Response due by 1/24/2005 (Lester, Harold)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 354 Filed: 12/20/2004, Entered: 12/20/2004 Court Filing
                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER:Closing Argument reset for 1/24/2005 10:00 AM in National Courts Building before Senior Judge James F. Merow. (filed in 98-124) Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 353 Filed: 12/17/2004, Entered: 12/17/2004 Court Filing
                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER:Post Trial Response Brief due 1/10/2005. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 352 Filed: 12/1/2004, Entered: 12/1/2004
                                                                NOTICE by USA Of Compliance With Pargraph 8 And Footnote 3 Of The Court's Order Dated September 21, 2004 (Attachments: # (1))(Lester, Harold)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 351 Filed: 11/25/2004, Entered: 11/25/2004 Court Filing
                                                                  ORDER granting [350] Motion for Extension of Time. Post-trial response briefs and responses to proposed findings of fact shall be filed by December 22, 2004, and post-trial reply briefs shall be filed by January 28, 2005. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 11/25/2004, Entered: 11/29/2004 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                    Set/Reset Deadlines: Post trial Response briefs and responses to proposed findings of fact due by 12/22/2004. Post trial Reply briefs due by 1/28/2005. (jcp, )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 350 Filed: 11/24/2004, Entered: 11/24/2004, Terminated: 11/25/2004 Motion to Amend Schedule
                                                                      Consent MOTION to Amend Schedule re: [330] Scheduling Order,, by USA. Response due by 12/13/2004 (Lester, Harold)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 349 Filed: 11/23/2004, Entered: 11/23/2004
                                                                        STATEMENT OF FACTS Corrected Copy - Defendant's Proposed Post-Trial Findings of Fact by USA. (Miller, Richard)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 348 Filed: 11/23/2004, Entered: 11/23/2004 Court Filing
                                                                          ORDER granting [347] Motion for Leave to File Corrected Post-Trial Proposed Findings of Fact (filed in 98-126) Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 347 Filed: 11/22/2004, Entered: 11/22/2004, Terminated: 11/23/2004 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Copy of Defendant's Post-Trial Proposed Findings Of Fact by USA. Response due by 12/9/2004 (Lester, Harold)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 346 Filed: 11/18/2004, Entered: 11/18/2004
                                                                              POST TRIAL BRIEF by USA. (Attachments: # (1) # (2))(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 345 Filed: 11/18/2004, Entered: 11/18/2004
                                                                                STATEMENT OF FACTS (Defendant's Post-Trial Proposed Findings Of Fact) by USA. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 344 Filed: 11/17/2004, Entered: 11/17/2004
                                                                                  POST TRIAL BRIEF - Proposed Findings of Fact - by CONNECTICUT YANKEE ATOMIC POWER COMPANY. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 343 Filed: 11/17/2004, Entered: 11/17/2004
                                                                                    POST TRIAL BRIEF - Initial Post-Trial Legal Brief by CONNECTICUT YANKEE ATOMIC POWER COMPANY. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 342 Filed: 11/17/2004, Entered: 11/17/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                      ORDER granting [341] Motion for Extension of Time (filed in 98-126). Post Trial Brief due 5:00 p.m. 11/18/2004. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 341 Filed: 11/17/2004, Entered: 11/17/2004, Terminated: 11/17/2004 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time until 5 p.m., 11/18/2004 to file The Parties' Initial Post-Trial Briefs and Proposed Findings Of Fact by USA. Response due by 12/6/2004 (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 340 Filed: 11/12/2004, Entered: 11/12/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                          ORDER granting [339] Motion for Extension of Time. Post Trial Brief due 11/17/2004. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (filed in 98-126)(lae, )
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 339 Filed: 11/11/2004, Entered: 11/11/2004, Terminated: 11/12/2004 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time until 11/17/04 to file The Parties' Post-Trial Briefs And Proposed Findings Of Fact by USA. Response due by 11/29/2004 (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 338 Filed: 11/8/2004, Entered: 11/8/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                              Corrected Entry: ORDER granting [336] Motion for Extension of Time. Pretrial Brief due by 11/12/04. (Order filed in 98-126) Signed by Judge James F. Merow.Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 337 Filed: 11/8/2004, Entered: 11/8/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                ORDER granting [336] Motion for Extension of Time.Pretrial Brief due by 11/12/2004.Opposing Pretrial Brief due by 11/12/2004. (Order filed in 98-126) Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 336 Filed: 11/5/2004, Entered: 11/5/2004, Terminated: 11/8/2004 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                  Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until 11/12/04 to file The Parties' Initial Post-Trial Briefs And Proposed Findings Of Fact by USA. Response due by 11/22/2004 (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 335 Filed: 11/2/2004, Entered: 11/2/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER granting [334] Motion for Extension of Time. Post Trial Brief due 11/8/2004. (Order filed in 98-126 C deemed filed in 98-154 C and 98-474 C) Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document 334 Filed: 11/1/2004, Entered: 11/1/2004, Terminated: 11/2/2004 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                      Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until 11/8/2004 to file The Parties' Post-Trial Briefs And Proposed Findings Of Fact by USA. Response due by 11/18/2004 (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 333 Filed: 10/15/2004, Entered: 10/15/2004
                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re [324] MOTION to Amend Pleadings - Rule 15 [36] Answer filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) # (2))(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 332 Filed: 10/14/2004, Entered: 10/14/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER granting [331] Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply re [324] MOTION to Amend Pleadings - Rule 15 [36] Answer. Reply due by 10/15/2004. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, ) Modified on 10/14/2004 for clarity (dw1).
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 331 Filed: 10/13/2004, Entered: 10/13/2004, Terminated: 10/14/2004 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                            Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to Response to [324] MOTION to Amend Pleadings - Rule 15 [36] Answer (until 10/15/2004) by USA. Response due by 11/1/2004. (Lester, Harold) Modified on 10/14/2004 for clarity (dw1).
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 330 Filed: 10/12/2004, Entered: 10/12/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER:(1) That the dates set forth in the September 21, 2004 Order shall be deemed amended as follows: October 15, 2004 to November 4, 2004;November 16, 2004 to December 2, 2004;December 7, 2004 to December 22,2004;December 16, 2004 to January 14, 2004; (2) The courtroom location for the oral argument commencing at 10:00 a.m. on January 14, 2005, will be posted in the lobby of the National Courts Building; (3) Except as so amended, the September 21, 2004 Order shall, otherwise, remain in effect. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 329 Filed: 10/8/2004, Entered: 10/8/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER granting [328] Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply re [324] MOTION to Amend Pleadings - Rule 15 [36] Answer Reply due by 10/13/2004. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 328 Filed: 10/8/2004, Entered: 10/8/2004, Terminated: 10/8/2004 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                  Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to [326] Response to Motion, (until 10/13/2004) by USA. Response due by 10/25/2004 (Lester, Harold) Modified on 10/13/2004 for clarity (dw1).
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 327 Filed: 10/5/2004, Entered: 10/5/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER:Telephone Status Conference set for 10/6/2004 02:00 PM in Chambers before Senior Judge James F. Merow. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 326 Filed: 9/24/2004, Entered: 9/24/2004
                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to [324] MOTION to Amend Pleadings - Rule 15 [36] Answer Response of Connecticut to Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Amended Answer and Counterclaim filed by CONNECTICUT YANKEE ATOMIC POWER COMPANY. Reply due by 10/8/2004. (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 325 Filed: 9/17/2004, Entered: 9/17/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER re plaintiffs' Bench Memorandum Addressing the Admissibility of Certain Exhibits Prepared by Contractors (filed in case# 98-126). Plaintiffs shall promptly electronically file the Bench Memorandum Addressing the Admissibility of Certain Exhibits dated July 12, 2004, and tendered to the court during trial proceedings, which Memorandum shall upon receipt be deemed filed nunc pro tunc (July 12, 2004);(2) Proposed findings and objections to proposed findings, filed by the parties, shall clearly indicate, in the supporting record citations, any reliance on the contractor generated documents discussed herein. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 324 Filed: 8/5/2004, Entered: 8/5/2004, Terminated: 9/30/2006 Motion to Amend Pleadings - Rule 15
                                                                                                                          MOTION to Amend Pleadings - Rule 15 [36] Answer by USA. Response due by 8/23/2004 (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3))(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 323 Filed: 6/28/2004, Entered: 6/28/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER denying [304] Motion in Limine to Exclude Testimony and Evidence Regarding Plaintiff's Request for Pre-breach Damages and Alternative Restitution Claim and Defendant's Motion to Strike Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 322 Filed: 6/23/2004, Entered: 6/23/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                              ORDER: The court deems oral argument on pending motions unnecessary. Accordingly, oral argument on pending motions scheduled for June 29, 2004 at 10:00 a.m. is cancelled. Orders will be issued on pending motions on or before June 30, 2004. The Final Pre-trial Conference will be held on June 29, 2004 at 2:00 p.m. The courtroom number will be posted in the lobby of the National Courts Building on June 29th. Counsel are requested to confer prior to the Final Pre-trial Conference to reach agreement to the admission of as many of the proposed exhibits as feasible and submit list(s) of exhibits to be admitted at that conference. The opening session of the trial will also be devoted to the admission of proposed exhibits prior to testimony to the extent possible. Trial time will not be devoted to the admission of exhibits, except where testimony is required in this regard. Counsel are further requested to contact Ms. Linda Eddins, at (202) 219-9787 to arrange for courtroom set-up for trial. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document 321 Filed: 6/8/2004, Entered: 6/8/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER:President Bush has declared Friday, June 11, 2004, to be a day of national mourning to honor the memory of former President Ronald Reagan. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that the responses to the motions referenced in the Order of May 19, 2004, previously due on June 11, 2004, shall be filed by 12:00 noon EDT on June 14, 2004 and the replies shall be filed by 12:00 noon EDT on June 21, 2004. The court will hear oral argument on these motions on June 29, 2004 at 10:00 a.m., in lieu of the date previously set in the Order of May 19, 2004. (Filed in 98-126) Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 320 Filed: 5/24/2004, Entered: 5/24/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  CORRECTED SCHEDULING ORDER:The date for oral argument set forth in the Order, filed May 19, 2004, is hereby corrected. The court will hear oral argument on Tuesday, June 22, 2004 at 2:00 p.m., at 717 Madison Pl., NW, Washington, DC, in a courtroom to be assigned.Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 5/20/2004, Entered: 5/20/2004
                                                                                                                                    Set Deadlines/Hearings: Motion(s) due by 6/1/2004. Reply due by 6/18/2004. Response due by 6/11/2004. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/29/2004 02:00 PM before Senior Judge James F. Merow. Oral Argument set for 6/21/2004 02:00 PM before Senior Judge James F. Merow. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 319 Filed: 5/19/2004, Entered: 5/19/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting in part and denying in part [302] Motion in Limine Regarding Takings Damages; and granting in part and denying in part Motion, filed April 23, 2004 (in 98-126 C) for Leave to Substitute Ivan F. Stuart as an expert Witness in Place of Charles W. Pennington and to subpoena Dan M. Collier. The court will hear oral argument on pending motions on Tuesday, June 21, 2004 at 2:00 p.m. (National Courts Building, 717 Madison Pl. NW., Washington, DC). Additional motions in limine mentioned by plaintiffs' counsel at the pre-trial conference and motions concerning future damages referenced by defendant's counsel shall be filed on or before June 1, 2004. Responses shall be filed on or before June 11, 2004. Replies shall be filed on or before June 18, 2004. The court will hear oral argument on these motions on June 21, 2004 at 2:00 p.m. (National Courts Building)and The Final Pre-Trial Conference will be held on Tuesday, June 29, 2004 at 2:00 p.m (National Courts Building). Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 318 Filed: 5/13/2004, Entered: 5/17/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                        APPENDIX by USA to [317] Dft's Reply to Pltf's Opposition to Dft's Motion in Limine Regarding Takings Damages. [FILED UNDER SEAL][FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 5/13/2004, Entered: 5/13/2004
                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James F. Merow : Pretrial Conference held on May 13, 2004. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 317 Filed: 5/12/2004, Entered: 5/12/2004
                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re [302] MOTION in Limine Regarding Takings Damages, Appendix (Under Seal) Filed Separately, filed by USA. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 316 Filed: 4/16/2004, Entered: 4/16/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [314] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re [304]MOTION in Limine Exclude Testimony and Evidence Regarding Plaintiff's Request for Pre-Breach Damages and Alternative Restitution Claim, and Defendant's Motion to Strike. Response due by 4/23/2004. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae) Modified on 4/19/2004 (dw1).
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 315 Filed: 4/16/2004, Entered: 4/16/2004
                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to [302] MOTION in Limine regarding Takings Damages filed by CONNECTICUT YANKEE ATOMIC POWER COMPANY. Reply due by 4/30/2004. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Cover and Table of Contents# (2) Appendix Volume 1 of 7# (3) Appendix Volume 2 of 7# (4) Appendix Volume 3 of 7# (5) Appendix Volume 4 of 7# (6) Appendix Volume 5 of 7# (7) Appendix Volume 6 of 7# (8) Appendix Volume 7 of 7)(Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 314 Filed: 4/16/2004, Entered: 4/16/2004, Terminated: 4/16/2004 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to [304] MOTION in Limine, (until April 23, 2004), regarding pre-breach damages and alternative restitution claim by CONNECTICUT YANKEE ATOMIC POWER COMPANY. Response due by 5/3/2004 (Stouck, Jerry) Modified on 4/19/2004 for clarity (dw1).
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 313 Filed: 3/30/2004, Entered: 3/30/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting in part and denying in part [-] Motion to require plaintiff to identify those documents within plaintiff's exhibit list upon which it will rely at trial. (Original motion and order docketed to Yankee Atomic 98-126) Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 3/30/2004, Entered: 3/31/2004 Response
                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to Pltf's Motion to Compel Production of Documents Pursuant to the Court's 8/25/2003 Order, filed by USA. Reply due by 4/13/2004. [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT FILED IN CASE NO. 98-126C] Service: 3/30/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 312 Filed: 3/26/2004, Entered: 3/26/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting in part and denying in part [300] Motion to Compel and granting in part and denying in part [301] Motion to Quash. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae) Modified on 3/29/2004 (dw1).
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 311 Filed: 3/3/2004, Entered: 3/3/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [310]Motion for Extension of Time to File Responses re [302]MOTION in Limine, [304]MOTION in Limine. Responses due by 4/16/2004. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 310 Filed: 3/2/2004, Entered: 3/2/2004, Terminated: 3/3/2004 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                          Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply,until 04/16/2004, by CONNECTICUT YANKEE ATOMIC POWER COMPANY. Response due by 3/19/2004 (Stouck, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 309 Filed: 3/1/2004, Entered: 3/1/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER:For the purpose of trial proceedings, this case shall be CONSOLIDATED with Yankee Atomic Electric Co. v. United States, 98-126 C. Pretrial Conference set for 5/13/2004 02:00 PM in the National Courts Building before Senior Judge James F. Merow. Trial set for 7/12/2004 10:30 AM (concluding on August 27, 2004)in the National Courts Building before Senior Judge James F. Merow. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 306 Filed: 3/1/2004, Entered: 3/1/2004
                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 308 Filed: 2/27/2004, Entered: 3/1/2004 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Framatome ANP's OPPOSITION to Motion the government's [300] MOTION to Compel and Opposition to Framatome ANP's Motion to Quash. filed by USA. Service: 02/23/2004.(lld, )
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 307 Filed: 2/27/2004, Entered: 3/1/2004 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to YANKEE ATOMIC'S OPPOSITION to the government's [300] MOTION to Compel Production of Documents from Framatome ANP filed by USA. Service: 02/23/2004.(lld, ) Modified on 3/1/2004 (lld, ). (by leave of the judge)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 2/26/2004, Entered: 2/26/2004
                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James F. Merow : Telephone Scheduling Conference held on February 26, 2004. (lae, )
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 2/25/2004, Entered: 3/1/2004 Order
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER re: counsel shall promptly confer and contact Ms. Linda Eddins to arrange for a brief telephone conference this week limited to the matter of a trial date. A formal pretrial conference shall be subsequently scheduled, prior to the trial, to address outstanding pretrial matters. (See 98-126 for Order) Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 305 Filed: 2/23/2004, Entered: 3/1/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to File Replies to [301] Framatome ANP, Inc.'s Opposition to Dft's Motion to Compel, and [301] Framatome ANP, Inc.'s MOTION to Quash, and to Yankee Atomic Electric Company's Opposition to Dft's Motion to Compel, until 2/23/2004, by USA. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE]Service: 2/18/2004. Response due by 3/8/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 304 Filed: 2/20/2004, Entered: 2/27/2004, Terminated: 6/28/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony and Evidence Regarding Plaintiff's Request for Pre-Breach Damages and Alternative Restitution Claim, and Defendant's Motion to Strike FILED UNDER SEAL by USA.Service: 02/19/2004. Response due by 3/8/2004 (lld, ) Modified on 2/27/2004 (lld, ).
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 303 Filed: 2/20/2004, Entered: 2/27/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Status Conference and Status Report (See 98-126C) by CONNECTICUT YANKEE ATOMIC POWER COMPANY.Service: 02/20/2004. Response due by 3/8/2004 (lld, )
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 2/20/2004, Entered: 2/27/2004 Order on Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER: Counsel shall confer to reach agreement on the documents to be produced, in response to Requests Nos. 27 and 28. [294] Dft's Motion to Compel, shall be GRANTED to the extent provided above with respect to Requests Nos. 27 and 28 and is otherwise DENIED. [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT LOCATED IN CASE NO. 98-474C] Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 2/19/2004, Entered: 2/27/2004 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to Dft's Motion for an Enlargement in Which to Serve its Pretrial Submissions filed by CONNECTICUT YANKEE ATOMIC POWER COMPANY. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT LOCATED IN CASE NO. 98-126C] Service: 2/13/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 302 Filed: 2/18/2004, Entered: 2/26/2004, Terminated: 5/19/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION IN LIMINE REGARDING TAKINGS DAMAGES by USA. APPENDIX (UNDER SEAL) FILED SEPARATELYService: 02/17/2004 by hand. Response due by 3/3/2004 (lld, )
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 2/9/2004, Entered: 2/12/2004 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                    OPPOSITION to Dft's MOTION to Require Pltf to Identify Those Documents Within Pltf's Exhibit List Upon Which It Will Rely At Trial, filed by CONNECTICUT YANKEE ATOMIC POWER COMPANY. [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT LOCATED IN CASE NO. 98-126C] Reply due by 2/19/2004. Service: 2/9/2004 by hand.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 301 Filed: 2/4/2004, Entered: 2/9/2004 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION to [300] Dft's MOTION to Compel, Together with Motion to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum of the USA filed by FRAMATOME ANP, INC. Reply due by 2/20/2004. Service: 2/3/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 2/4/2004, Entered: 2/9/2004 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                        OPPOSITION to [300] Dft's MOTION to Compel Production of Documents From Framatome ANP filed by CONNECTICUT YANKEE ATOMIC POWER COMPANY. [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT LOCATED IN CASE NO. 98-126C] Reply due by 2/19/2004. Service: 2/4/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 301 Filed: 2/3/2004, Entered: 2/9/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Quash the Subpoena Duces Tecum of the USA, Together with Memorandum in Opposition to Dft's Motion to Compel by FRAMATOME ANP, INC.Service: 2/3/2004. Response due by 2/20/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 1/30/2004, Entered: 1/30/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER: The Court hereby DENIES [293] Dft's Second Motion to Renew its Motion to Consolidate as well as its previous motions relating to consolidation. The Court further LIFTS THE STAY of the remainder of the cases to which the Order of 4/16/2003, applied. The Clerk of the Court is directed to docket this Order in this case with an entry noting the same on the dockets of the remaining SNFcases captioned in Dft's instant motion, with a courtesy copy to all SNF parties and presiding SNF judges of the Court. [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT LOCATED IN CASE NO. 98-126C] Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 1/28/2004, Entered: 2/2/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Require Plaintiff to Identify Those Documents Within Plaintiff's Exhibit List Upon Which It Will Rely At Trial by USA. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT LOCATED IN CASE NO. 98-126C]Service: 1/22/2004. Response due by 2/9/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 300 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: 1/28/2004, Terminated: 3/26/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Compel Production of Documents by USA.Service: 1/22/2004. Response due by 2/9/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 299 Filed: 1/9/2004, Entered: 1/14/2004 Order Returning Document UnfiledCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER RETURNING: On 1/5/2004, the Clerk's Office received a motion to quash subpoena from non-party, Framatome ANP, Inc. It was not filed on receipt as service was not shown on the atty of record for dft, Harold D. Lester, Jr. In this circumstance, a motion to quash is premature. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that the motion received on 1/5/2004 shall be RETURNED to counsel UNFILED. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 1/8/2004, Entered: 1/13/2004 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                    OPPOSITION to Dft's MOTION to Enforce Request for Production of Documents filed by CONNECTICUT YANKEE ATOMIC POWER COMPANY. [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT LOCATED IN CASE NO. 98-474C] Reply due by 1/23/2004. Service: 1/8/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 298 Filed: 12/30/2003, Entered: 1/6/2004 Order on Motion to StayCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [297] Dft's 12/9/2003 Motion to Suspend Any Obligation to Respond to the RCFC 45 Objection Submitted by Framatome ANP, Inc. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 12/24/2003, Entered: 12/30/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Resp
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER: That with the exception of amended document request No. 25, which is GRANTED, Dft's Motion to Compel, filed 9/24/2003, shall be, otherwise, DENIED. Pltf's Motion for Protective Orders, filed 11/3/2003, shall be DENIED. Dft's Motion, filed 9/24/2003, for Extension of Time, to and including 2/12/2004, for its final pretrial submissions is GRANTED. This Order also serves to note that dft's pending motions for time enlargements, filed 11/17/2003 and 11/21/2003, are also ALLOWED. [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT LOCATED IN CASE NO. 98-126C] Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 12/23/2003, Entered: 1/13/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Enforce Request for Production of Documents by USA. [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT LOCATED IN CASE NO. 98-474C]Service: 12/22/2003. Response due by 1/8/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 12/17/2003, Entered: 12/22/2003 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT by CONNECTICUT YANKEE ATOMIC POWER COMPANY. [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT LOCATED IN CASE NO. 98-126C] Service: 12/17/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 297 Filed: 12/9/2003, Entered: 12/12/2003, Terminated: 12/30/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Suspend the Government's Obligation to Respond to Framatone ADP, Inc.'s Rule 45 Objection to Dft's Subpoena by USA. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE]Service: 12/5/03. Response due by 12/22/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 12/5/2003, Entered: 12/11/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY on Pltf's MOTION for a Protective Order filed by CONNECTICUT YANKEE ATOMIC POWER COMPANY. [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT LOCATED IN CASE NO. 98-126C] Service: 12/5/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 296 Filed: 12/1/2003, Entered: 12/4/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Counsel for Dft's Change of Telephone and Facsimile Numbers by USA. Service: 11/28/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 11/24/2003, Entered: 12/2/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Pltf's Response to Dft's MOTION for an Additional Enlargement of Five Months, REPLY to Pltf's Response to Dft's 9/24/2003 RENEWED MOTION to Compel, and RESPONSE to Pltf's MOTION for a Protective Order That Depositions Noticed on 9/26/2003 Not Be Had, filed by USA. [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT LOCATED IN CASE NO. 98-126C] Service: 11/24/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 295 Filed: 11/21/2003, Entered: 12/1/2003 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RULE 45 OBJECTION AND RESPONSE of Non-Party, FRAMATOME ANP, INC., to Subpoena of the United States of America. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 11/17/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 11/21/2003, Entered: 12/1/2003 Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ***Attorney William Raymond Rakes for FRAMATOME ANP, INC. added. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 11/21/2003, Entered: 11/26/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Pltf's 1) Response to Dft's Request for an Additional Enlargement of Five Months, 2) Response to the Dft's 9/24/2003 "Renewed" Motion to Compel and Motion for a Protective Order, and 3) Motion for a Protective Order That Depositions First Noticed 9/26/2003 Not Be Had, until 11/24/2003, by CONNECTICUT YANKEE ATOMIC POWER COMPANY. [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT LOCATED IN CASE NO. 98-126C]Service: 11/21/03. Response due by 12/8/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 11/18/2003, Entered: 11/24/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            OPPOSITION to [744] Dft's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responses on its Motions to enlarge the time for its pretrial submissions and to compel the production of documents by four days, filed by CONNECTICUT YANKEE ATOMIC POWER COMPANY. [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT LOCATED IN CASE NO. 98-126C] Reply due by 12/2/2003. Service: 11/18/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 11/17/2003, Entered: 11/21/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Pltf's 1) Response to the Dft's Request for an Additional Enlargement of Five Months, 2) Response to the Dft's 9/24/2003 "Renewed" Motion to Compel and Motion for a Protective Order, and 3) Motion for a Protective Order That Depositions First Noticed 9/26/2003 Not Be Had, until 11/21/03, by USA. [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT LOCATED IN CASE NO. 98-126C]Service: 11/17/03. Response due by 12/4/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 11/3/2003, Entered: 11/6/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Resp
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER: Leave is GRANTED for the filing of pltf's corrected combined response to dft's September 24, 2003 motions, received with the motion filed October 23, 2003; As pltf's October 21, 2003 original combined response was not filed by the clerk, because a copy of volume 2 of the appendix was missing and an original declaration was missing in volume 1, this unfiled submission shall now be RETURNED to pltf in view of the filing of the corrected version as provided; Pltf's motions, filed October 8, 16, 21, 23 shall be GRANTED to the extent reflected by the filing in (1) and, otherwise, DENIED; Dft's reply to the pltf's combined response as filed pursuant to (1) shall be filed on or before 11/15/2003. [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT LOCATED IN CASE NO. 98-126C] Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 11/3/2003, Entered: 11/6/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CORRECTED COMBINED RESPONSE to Dft's MOTION for an Additional Enlargement of Five Months, Dft's Renewed MOTION to Compel and MOTION for a Protective Order, and MOTION for a Protective Order That Depositions First Noticed September 26, 2003 Not Be Had, Together with Two (2) Separtely Bound Appendix Volumes filed by CONNECTICUT YANKEE ATOMIC POWER COMPANY. [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT LOCATED IN CASE NO. 98-126C] Reply due by 11/15/2003. Service: 10/23/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 10/23/2003, Entered: 10/27/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File a Corrected Copy of Its October 21, 2003 1) Response to the Government's Request for an Additional Enlargement of Five Months, 2) Response to the Government's September 24 "Renewed" Motion to Compel and Motion for Protective Order, and 3) Motion for a Protective Order That Deposition First Noticed September 26, 2003 Not Be Had by CONNECTICUT YANKEE ATOMIC POWER COMPANY. [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT LOCATED IN CASE NO. 98-126C]Service: 10/23/03 by hand. Response due by 11/6/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 10/22/2003, Entered: 10/24/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Dft's Opposition to Pltf's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Combined Opposition to Dft's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response, and Dft's MOTION to renew motion to compel the production of documents filed by CONNECTICUT YANKEE ATOMIC POWER COMPANY. [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT LOCATED IN CASE NO. 98-126C] Service: 10/22/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 10/21/2003, Entered: 10/23/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to File 1) Response to the Dft's Request for an Additional Enlargement of File Months, 2) Response to the Dft's September 24 "Renewed" Motion to Compel and Motion for Protective Order, and 3) Motion for a Protective Order That Depositions First Noticed September 26 Not Be Had by CONNECTICUT YANKEE ATOMIC POWER COMPANY. [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT LOCATED IN CASE NO. 98-126C]Service: 10/21/03 by hand. Response due by 11/4/2003.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 10/16/2003, Entered: 10/21/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time to Oppose Dft's MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Its Pretrial Submissions, and Dft's MOTION to Compel the Production of Documents, by CONNECTICUT YANKEE ATOMIC POWER COMPANY. [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT LOCATED IN CASE NO. 98-126C]Service: 10/16/03. Response due by 11/3/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 10/8/2003, Entered: 10/16/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to File Combined Opposition to Dft's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response and Dft's MOTION to renew Dft's motion to compel the production of documents, by CONNECTICUT YANKEE ATOMIC POWER COMPANY. [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT LOCATED IN CASE NO. 98-126C]Service: 10/8/03. Response due by 10/27/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 9/24/2003, Entered: 9/25/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Pltfs' Recent Pretrial Filings, until 2/12/2004, by USA. [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT LOCATED IN CASE NO. 98-126C]Service: 9/24/03. Response due by 10/14/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 9/16/2003, Entered: 9/22/2003 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT by CONNECTICUT YANKEE ATOMIC POWER COMPANY. [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT LOCATED IN CASE NO. 98-126C] Service: 9/16/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 294 Filed: 9/10/2003, Entered: 9/12/2003 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Pltfs' Responses to [293] Dft's Second MOTION to the Chief Judge to Renew Consideration of Dft's Motion to Consolidate, filed by USA. Service: 9/3/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 9/10/2003, Entered: 9/12/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Resp
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER allowing Dft's Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to [293] Dft's Second MOTION to Renew Its Motion to Consolidate. [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT LOCATED IN CASE NO. 98-126C] Reply due by 9/3/2003. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 9/4/2003, Entered: 9/9/2003 Order on Motion to Publish
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER: It is ORDERED that Pltf's Motion to Publish the Order of June 26, 2003, and Pltf's Motion to Publish the Order of August 25, 2003 are DENIED. [Original document located in Case No. 98-126C] Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 9/3/2003, Entered: 9/8/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to Pltfs' Response to Dft's Second Motion to Renew Its Motion to Consolidate, until 9/3/03, by USA. [Original document located in Case No. 98-126C]Service: 9/3/03. Response due by 9/22/2003.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 8/29/2003, Entered: 9/4/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Publish August 25, 2003 Decision on Privilege Issues, by CONNECTICUT YANKEE ATOMIC POWER COMPANY. [Original document located in Case No. 98-126C]Service: 8/29/03. Response due by 9/15/2003.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 8/29/2003, Entered: 9/4/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Publish the [288] Court's June 26, 2003 Decision Addressing the Government's Summary Judgment Motions, by CONNECTICUT YANKEE ATOMIC POWER COMPANY. [Original document located in Case No. 98-126C]Service: 8/29/03. Response due by 9/15/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 8/29/2003, Entered: 9/2/2003 Order on Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER: Accordingly, it is ORDERED that Pltf's Motions for Protective Order, filed August 4 and 18, 2003 and Dft's Motion to Compel, filed August 15, 2003, shall be GRANTED to the extent provided in this Order and shall, otherwise, be DENIED. [Original document located in Case No. 98-126C] Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (jcp, ) Modified on 9/2/2003 (jcp, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 8/28/2003, Entered: 9/3/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to Pltf's MOTION for a Protective Order and CROSS-MOTION to Compel a Response to the Government's Interrogatories Regarding the Production of E-Mail Pursuant to the Court's July 25, 2003 Order filed by USA. [Original document located in Case No. 98-126C] Reply due by 9/9/2003. Service: 8/28/03 by hand.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 8/26/2003, Entered: 8/28/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to the Chief Judge for Extension of Time to File Reply to Pltfs' Responses to Dft's Second Motion to Renew Its Motion to Consolidate, until 9/3/03, by USA. [Original document located in Case No. 98-126C]Service: 8/26/03. Response due by 9/12/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 8/25/2003, Entered: 8/26/2003 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER (Original document located in Case No. 98-126C): The following documents, using the numbers assigned in pltf's March 6, 2003 motion, must be produced: 58,61,74,76,77,88,89,90,92,93,94,95,96,97,98,99,102,103,104,111,112,120,136,138,139,146,149,154,155,156,157,203,206,209,211,212,214,216,219,220,E14,E15,E39,E40,E41,E42,E43,E44, and E95. The following documents do not, in their entirety, meet the necessary requirements for the privilege claimed and must be modified and produced as noted: 3,9,61,66,67,70,100,106,113,115,135,137,142,145,202,204,205,208,E44, and E46. With the exception of the above-listed production, it is concluded that the assertions of privilege by dft are otherwise, sustained. Accordingly, it is ORDERED: 1) That pltf's motion, filed March 6, 2003, shall be GRANTED to the extent of the production called for above and, otherwise, DENIED. 2) That to the extent testimony was withheld on the subject matter of the production order herein, that testimony shall now be taken. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 8/21/2003, Entered: 8/25/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      OPPOSITION to [293] Dft's Second MOTION to Renew Its Motion to Consolidate, Together with Separately Bound Appendix Volume [Large] filed by CONNECTICUT YANKEE ATOMIC POWER COMPANY. [Original document located in Case No. 98-126C] Reply due by 8/29/2003. Service: 8/15/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 8/21/2003, Entered: 8/25/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Dft's Second MOTION to Renew Its Motion to Consolidate filed by CONNECTICUT YANKEE ATOMIC POWER COMPANY per Order of 8/21/03. [Original document located in Case No. 98-126C] (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 8/21/2003, Entered: 8/25/2003 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER: That pltf's motion, filed August 15, 2003, for leave to file in this case Dft's Second Motion to Renew Its Motion to Consolidate and pltf's opposition thereto, shall be ALLOWED and the tendered dft's second motion, served July 29, 2003, and pltf's opposition thereto, served August 15, 2003, set out as Exhibit A and B to pltf's August 15, 2003 motion shall be deemed so FILED. [Original document located in Case No. 98-126C] Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 8/21/2003, Entered: 8/25/2003 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER: Accordingly, without in any way ruling on whether the documents concerned are correctly categorized as privileged, it is ORDERED: 1) Dft's motion, filed June 20, 2003, is GRANTED; 2) That, pursuant to the "claw-back" provisions of the May 20, 1999 orders and Judge Sypolt's September 26, 2001 order, pltf shall return documents Nos. 1339, 1723, and 1724 to dft's counsel pending any further order of the court in this regard; 3) Attachment No. 2 to pltf's status report, filed February 6, 2003, shall be considered stricken pending any further order of the court in this regard. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. [Original document located in Case No. 98-126C] (jcp, ) Modified on 8/25/2003 (jcp, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 8/18/2003, Entered: 8/20/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Protective Order by CONNECTICUT YANKEE ATOMIC POWER COMPANY. (Original document located in Case No. 98-126C)Service: 8/18/03 by hand. Response due by 9/2/2003.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/19/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to File Dft's Second Motion to Renew Its Motion to Consolidate and Yankee Utilities' Opposition Thereto In This Case filed by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY. (Original document located in Case No. 98-126C)Service: 8/15/03. Response due by 9/2/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/19/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit by 7 pages in Opposing Dft's Renewed Motion to Consolidate to Facilitate Reliance on Previous Briefing by CONNECTICUT YANKEE ATOMIC POWER COMPANY. (Original document located in Case No. 98-126C)Service: 8/15/03. Response due by 9/2/2003.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 8/8/2003, Entered: 8/8/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Set/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 8/15/2003 (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 8/5/2003, Entered: 8/7/2003 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Dft's Motion to the Chief Judge for Leave to Correct Certificate of Service and to Waive Requirements of RCFC 5.3 Regarding "Dft's Second Motion [to the Chief Judge] to Renew its Motion to Consolidate." (Original Motion located in Case No. 98-126C) (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 293 Filed: 7/30/2003, Entered: 7/31/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SECOND MOTION to Renew Its Motion to Consolidate by USA. (COPY - Original Document in Case No. 98-126C)Service: 7/29/03 by hand. Response due by 8/12/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 292 Filed: 7/2/2003, Entered: 7/7/2003 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER finding as moot [290] Pltf's Motion for Leave to File New Authority in Support of Opposition to Government's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on the Rate of Spent Fuel Accpetance. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 291 Filed: 7/1/2003, Entered: 7/3/2003 Order Returning Document UnfiledCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER RETURNING: It is ORDERED that Pltf's Notice of New Authority in Support of Opposition to Dft's Motion for Summary Judgment Upon Count III of Pltf's Complaint (Re Takings) is MOOT and shall be returned UNFILED to pltf's counsel. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 290 Filed: 6/30/2003, Entered: 7/2/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File New Authority in Support of Opposition to Government's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on the Rate of Spent Fuel Accpetance by CONNECTICUT YANKEE ATOMIC POWER COMPANY.Service: 6/30/03. Response due by 7/17/2003 (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 289 Filed: 6/27/2003, Entered: 7/1/2003 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER denying as moot [283] Pltf's Motion for Leave to File Notice of Additional Evidence and Volume 3 of its Appendix in Support of its Opposition to the Government's GTCC Waste Summary Judgment Motion. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 288 Filed: 6/26/2003, Entered: 6/30/2003 Order on Motion for Summary JudgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER: For reasons expressed in the Order filed this date in Yankee Atomic Electric Co. v. US, No. 98-126C, it is ORDERED that dft's motions: [166] Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Pltf's Greater Than Class C Radioactive Waste Arguments, [174] Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding the Rate of Spent Nuclear Fuel Acceptance, and [176] Motion for Summary Judgment Upon Count III of Pltf's Complaint, shall each be DENIED. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 287 Filed: 6/26/2003, Entered: 6/30/2003 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [286] Pltf's Motion for Leave to File New Authority in Support of Opposition to Government's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on the Rate of Spent Fuel Accpetance. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 286 Filed: 6/11/2003, Entered: 6/17/2003, Terminated: 6/26/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File New Authority in Support of Opposition to Government's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on the Rate of Spent Fuel Accpetance by CONNECTICUT YANKEE ATOMIC POWER COMPANY.Service: 06/11/03. Response due by 6/30/2003 (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 285 Filed: 5/22/2003, Entered: 6/3/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to [283] MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Addtional Evidence and Volume 3 of Appendix in suppport of it's opposition to GTCC waste summary filed by UNITED STATES. Reply due by 6/6/2003. Service: 5/22/03.(dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 284 Filed: 5/12/2003, Entered: 5/15/2003 Order on Motion to StrikeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying [277] Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 283 Filed: 5/8/2003, Entered: 5/13/2003, Terminated: 6/27/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Addtional Evidence and Volume 3 of Appendix in suppport of it's opposition to GTCC waste summary by CONNECTICUT YANKEE ATOMIC POWER COMPANY.Service by hand: 5/8/03. Response due by 5/22/2003.(dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 282 Filed: 4/28/2003, Entered: 4/30/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re [277] MOTION to Strike filed by The United States. Service: 4/28/03.(dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 281 Filed: 4/16/2003, Entered: 4/25/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 280 Filed: 4/2/2003, Entered: 4/8/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, re: further proceedings. Signed by Judge Diane G. Sypolt. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 279 Filed: 4/2/2003, Entered: 4/7/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re [174] Motion for Summary Judgment filed by The United States, filed with a (1) one volume appendix in support. Service: 3/28/03.(dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 278 Filed: 4/2/2003, Entered: 4/7/2003 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [276] Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 277 Filed: 3/28/2003, Entered: 4/2/2003, Terminated: 5/12/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Strike portions of Plaintiff's filings concerning the rate of acceptance of spent nuclear fuel containing information about settlement activities, by The United States. Service: 3/28/03. Response due 4/14/2003. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 276 Filed: 3/28/2003, Entered: 4/2/2003, Terminated: 4/2/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit of reply to the motion for partial summary judgment regarding the rate of spent nuclear fuel acceptance by 59 pages, by The United States. Service: 3/28/03. Response due 4/14/2003. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 275 Filed: 3/20/2003, Entered: 3/25/2003 Description not available
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion, re [166] Motion for Summary Judgment filed by The United States. Service: 3/18/03. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 274 Filed: 3/20/2003, Entered: 3/25/2003 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [272] Motion for Leave to Exceed the Page limitation. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 273 Filed: 3/18/2003, Entered: 3/21/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 272 Filed: 3/18/2003, Entered: 3/20/2003, Terminated: 3/20/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit of reply to the Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, re: Plaintiff's Greater Than Class C Radioactive Waste Arguments by 16 pages by The United States. Service: 3/18/03. Response due by 4/4/2003. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 271 Filed: 3/11/2003, Entered: 3/12/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 3/11/03) to Extend Time to reply to the motion for partial summary judgment until 3/18/03. Response due: 3/28/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 270 Filed: 3/7/2003, Entered: 3/10/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER re: See order [612-1] dated 3/7/03, in case 98-126C (signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 269 Filed: 2/25/2003, Entered: 3/4/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD) Modified on 03/04/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 268 Filed: 2/24/2003, Entered: 3/3/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 267 Filed: 2/5/2003, Entered: 2/13/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 266 Filed: 1/31/2003, Entered: 2/13/2003 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY by USA to response to [176-1] motion for Summary Judgment upon Count III. Service: 1/31/03 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 265 Filed: 1/31/2003, Entered: 2/12/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 264 Filed: 1/30/2003, Entered: 2/10/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 1/30/03) to Extend Time to file reply to the motion for summary judgment until 1/31/03. Response due: 2/18/03 (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 263 Filed: 1/29/2003, Entered: 2/7/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 262 Filed: 1/29/2003, Entered: 2/6/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of filing the appendix, in two volumes, to response to motion for partial summary judgment regarding the plaintiff's greater than class c radio active arguments by CONN. YANKEE. Three excerts of the appendix are filed UNDER SEAL. Service: 1/29/03 (HW) Modified on 02/06/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 261 Filed: 1/29/2003, Entered: 2/5/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by CONN. YANKEE (Service : 1/29/03 ) for Leave to file substitute appendix . Response due: 2/18/03 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 260 Filed: 1/23/2003, Entered: 1/31/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER. See 98-126 C for order granting 1/17/03 motion for leave, etc. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 259 Filed: 1/9/2003, Entered: 1/15/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER, re: See order in 98-154 (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 258 Filed: 1/3/2003, Entered: 1/9/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [257-1] motion to Extend Time to file reply to response to motion for summary judgment by 1/10/03 (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 257 Filed: 1/3/2003, Entered: 1/9/2003, Terminated: 1/3/2003 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service by hand: 12/30/02) to Extend Time to file reply to response to motion for summary judgment , (until January 10, 2003). Response due: 1/13/03. [by leave of the Judge] (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 256 Filed: 12/16/2002, Entered: 12/18/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by CONN. YANKEE (Service: 12/16/02 ) to [176-1] motion for Summary Judgment upon Count III. Reply due: 1/10/03 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 255 Filed: 12/16/2002, Entered: 12/18/2002 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fa
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Response by CONN. YANKEE to [175-1] proposed findings by USA. Service: 12/16/02 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 254 Filed: 11/15/2002, Entered: 11/19/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting in part, denying in part [253-1] motion to defer briefing on the motions for partial summary judgment Reply to Response to Motion due 1/10/03 for [176-1] motion for Summary Judgment upon Count III, for [174-1] motion for partial summary judgment regarding the rate of spent nuclear fuel acceptance, and for [166-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment regarding plaintiff's greater than class C radioactive waste arguments (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 253 Filed: 11/12/2002, Entered: 11/14/2002, Terminated: 11/15/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 11/12/02) to defer briefing on the motions for partial summary judgment . Response due: 11/26/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 252 Filed: 10/31/2002, Entered: 11/1/2002 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fa
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Response by CONN. YANKEE to [173-1] proposed findings by USA. Service by hand: 10/28/02 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 251 Filed: 10/31/2002, Entered: 11/1/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE, together with seven volumes of appendix, by CONN. YANKEE (Service by hand: 10/28/02) to [174-1] motion for partial summary judgment regarding the rate of spent nuclear fuel acceptance. Reply due: 11/14/02 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 250 Filed: 10/31/2002, Entered: 11/1/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [248-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 249 Filed: 10/29/2002, Entered: 10/30/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by CONN. YANKEE (Service by hand: 10/29/02 ) to [166-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment regarding plaintiff's greater than class C radioactive waste arguments (together with two volume appendix). Reply due: 11/12/02 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 248 Filed: 10/28/2002, Entered: 10/30/2002, Terminated: 10/31/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by CONN. YANKEE (Service: 10/28/02) For leave to exceed the page limitation re: opposition to motion for partial summary judgment. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 247 Filed: 10/16/2002, Entered: 10/18/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, re: see order in 98-126C (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow for Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 246 Filed: 10/9/2002, Entered: 10/11/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER see 98-126C for Order. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 245 Filed: 9/10/2002, Entered: 9/16/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 244 Filed: 9/5/2002, Entered: 9/9/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 243 Filed: 8/22/2002, Entered: 8/27/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 242 Filed: 8/20/2002, Entered: 8/22/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 241 Filed: 8/16/2002, Entered: 8/21/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 240 Filed: 8/5/2002, Entered: 8/7/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 239 Filed: 8/1/2002, Entered: 8/5/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 238 Filed: 7/30/2002, Entered: 8/2/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER re: see lead case for 7/30/02 order ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 237 Filed: 7/29/2002, Entered: 8/1/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER re: see order [467-1] dated 7/29/02, in case No. 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 236 Filed: 7/23/2002, Entered: 7/26/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 235 Filed: 7/16/2002, Entered: 7/18/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 234 Filed: 7/15/2002, Entered: 7/17/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 233 Filed: 7/10/2002, Entered: 7/12/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 232 Filed: 7/9/2002, Entered: 7/11/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER - see 98-126C for Order. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 231 Filed: 7/3/2002, Entered: 7/3/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 230 Filed: 7/2/2002, Entered: 7/3/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER-see Order in 98-126C ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 229 Filed: 7/2/2002, Entered: 7/3/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [228-1] motion to Extend Time in which to serve it's paragraph 3 pretrial submission Pretrial Submission due: 8/23/02 for CONN. YANKEE (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 228 Filed: 6/28/2002, Entered: 7/1/2002, Terminated: 7/2/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by CONN. YANKEE (Service : 6/28/02 ) to Extend Time in which to serve it's paragraph 3 pretrial submission . (VO)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 227 Filed: 6/28/2002, Entered: 7/1/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER-see Order in 98-126C. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 226 Filed: 6/18/2002, Entered: 6/19/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C.(signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (VO)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 225 Filed: 6/17/2002, Entered: 6/18/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 224 Filed: 6/6/2002, Entered: 6/11/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, re order in 98-126, filed 6/6/02. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 223 Filed: 6/4/2002, Entered: 6/4/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, re: see order in 98-126, filed 6/03/02. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (FE) Modified on 06/04/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 222 Filed: 5/28/2002, Entered: 5/29/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 221 Filed: 5/20/2002, Entered: 5/21/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 220 Filed: 5/9/2002, Entered: 5/10/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER re: See [395-1] order in case No. 98-126 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 219 Filed: 5/7/2002, Entered: 5/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 218 Filed: 5/7/2002, Entered: 5/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 217 Filed: 5/6/2002, Entered: 5/7/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 216 Filed: 5/3/2002, Entered: 5/3/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 215 Filed: 4/26/2002, Entered: 4/29/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, re: see order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 214 Filed: 4/23/2002, Entered: 4/24/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER, re: see order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 213 Filed: 4/18/2002, Entered: 4/18/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER, Re: see order in 98-126 ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (VO)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 212 Filed: 4/11/2002, Entered: 4/12/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          (Supplemental) MOTION by USA (Service by hand: 4/11/02 ) to Strike the fact and expert testimony of Dr. John Bartlett . Response due: 4/25/02. (HW) Modified on 04/12/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 211 Filed: 4/11/2002, Entered: 4/11/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER re: see order [344-2] dated 4/11/02 in Case No. 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 210 Filed: 4/2/2002, Entered: 4/2/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [209-1] motion to Extend Time to serve pretrial submissions Plaintiff to serve pretrial submissions by 7/1/02 (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 209 Filed: 4/1/2002, Entered: 4/2/2002, Terminated: 4/2/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by CONN. YANKEE (Service: 4/1/02) to Extend Time to serve pretrial submissions (to July 1, 2002). (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 208 Filed: 3/25/2002, Entered: 3/27/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, re: see order in 98-126 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 207 Filed: 3/25/2002, Entered: 3/26/2002 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Text not available.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 206 Filed: 3/19/2002, Entered: 3/20/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER, re: Defendant's response to Motion for Reconsideration and Clarification of the 3/5/03 order due 3/22/02 (signed by Chief Judge Lawrence Baskir for Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD) Modified on 03/20/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 205 Filed: 3/6/2002, Entered: 3/7/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [202-1] motion for Leave to submit a corrected response to plaintiff's proposed stipulation of facts (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 204 Filed: 3/5/2002, Entered: 3/6/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying Motion to preclude or, in the alternative, defer depositions pursuant to Rule 30(b)(6) (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 203 Filed: 3/5/2002, Entered: 3/6/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [198-1] motion to Extend Time to file pretrial submissions pursuant to 11/4/98 Pretrial Order, granting [193-1] motion to Extend Time within which to file and serve its pretrial submissions Defendant's Pre-trial submissions due 3/1/02 (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 202 Filed: 3/5/2002, Entered: 3/6/2002, Terminated: 3/6/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service by hand: 3/5/02) for Leave to submit a corrected response to plaintiff's proposed stipulation of facts . Response due: 3/19/02 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 201 Filed: 3/5/2002, Entered: 3/6/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [200-1] motion to submit expert report with facsimile of expert's signature and to submit original signature upon receipt (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 200 Filed: 3/1/2002, Entered: 3/5/2002, Terminated: 3/5/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 3/1/02) to submit expert report with facsimile of expert's signature and to submit original signature upon receipt . Response due: 3/18/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 199 Filed: 2/28/2002, Entered: 3/1/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting Motion to Extend Time to respond to interrogatories until 3/8/02 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 198 Filed: 2/21/2002, Entered: 2/22/2002, Terminated: 3/5/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service: 2/21/02) to Extend Time to file pretrial submissions pursuant to 11/4/98 Pretrial Order , (until March 1, 2002). Response due: 3/11/02. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 197 Filed: 2/20/2002, Entered: 2/21/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER denying as moot Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration/clarification (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 196 Filed: 2/13/2002, Entered: 2/14/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER, re: see order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 195 Filed: 2/8/2002, Entered: 2/11/2002 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY by USA to response to [193-1] motion to Extend Time within which to file and serve its pretrial submissions. Service: 2/8/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 194 Filed: 2/6/2002, Entered: 2/6/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by CONN. YANKEE (Service: 2/6/02) to [193-1] motion to Extend Time within which to file and serve its pretrial submissions. Reply due: 2/20/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 193 Filed: 2/5/2002, Entered: 2/6/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 2/5/02 ) to Extend Time within which to file and serve its pretrial submissions , (until February 22, 2002). Response due: 2/22/02. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 192 Filed: 2/5/2002, Entered: 2/5/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [189-1] motion to Withdraw [187-1] motion for Protective Order (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 191 Filed: 2/1/2002, Entered: 2/4/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER. See order in 98-126C filed 2/1/02. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 190 Filed: 2/1/2002, Entered: 2/4/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying motion to reconsider filed 1/22/02 and granting the motion to revise dates in 9/26/01 order filed 1/24/02 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 189 Filed: 2/1/2002, Entered: 2/4/2002, Terminated: 2/5/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by CONN. YANKEE (Service: 2/1/02) to Withdraw [187-1] motion for Protective Order . (DS) Modified on 02/04/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 188 Filed: 1/29/2002, Entered: 1/29/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER setting Status Conference for 2:00 p.m. on 2/12/02 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 187 Filed: 1/22/2002, Entered: 1/22/2002, Terminated: 2/5/2002 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by CONN. YANKEE (Service by hand: 1/22/02) for Protective Order . Response due: 2/5/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 186 Filed: 1/11/2002, Entered: 1/14/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER see order in 98-126C filed 1/11/02. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 185 Filed: 1/3/2002, Entered: 1/7/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER see order in 98-126C filled 01/03/02 ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 184 Filed: 12/26/2001, Entered: 12/28/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 12/21/01) to Compel production of information considered by experts . Response due: 1/7/02 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 183 Filed: 12/5/2001, Entered: 12/7/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 12/5/01 ) for Reconsideration of [182-1] order Response due: 8/3/98 (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 12/5/2001, Entered: 12/7/2001 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Deadline updated; Response to [183-1] motion for Reconsideration of [182-1] order due 12/19/01 . (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 181 Filed: 11/20/2001, Entered: 11/21/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER see order in 98-126C filed 11/20/01 ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 182 Filed: 11/19/2001, Entered: 11/28/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting in part, denying in part [177-1] motion to stay further compliance with pretrial proceedings, granting in part, denying in part [177-2] motion for expedited consideration. The time for Defendant's Pretrial Submissions required by paragraph 2, of the November 4, 1998 Pretrial Order, as amended, is enlarged so that they shall be submitted on or before February 8, 2002 (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 180 Filed: 11/16/2001, Entered: 11/19/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER see order 98-126C filed 11/16/01. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 179 Filed: 11/14/2001, Entered: 11/16/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER see order in 98-126C filed 11/14/01. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 178 Filed: 11/14/2001, Entered: 11/16/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER see order in 98-126C filed 11/14/01. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 177 Filed: 11/14/2001, Entered: 11/16/2001, Terminated: 11/19/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service by hand: 11/14/01) to stay further compliance with pretrial proceedings (pending decision on dispositive motions), and for expedited consideration . Response due: 11/28/01 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 176 Filed: 11/14/2001, Entered: 11/16/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service by hand: 11/14/01) for Summary Judgment upon Count III of plaintiff's complaint. Response due: 12/12/01 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 175 Filed: 11/14/2001, Entered: 11/16/2001 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact regarding Count III of plaintiff's complaint filed by USA. Service by hand: 11/14/01 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 174 Filed: 11/9/2001, Entered: 11/16/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION, together with a separate volume of appendix, by USA (Service by hand: 11/8/01) for partial summary judgment regarding the rate of spent nuclear fuel acceptance . Response due: 12/7/01 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 173 Filed: 11/9/2001, Entered: 11/16/2001 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact regarding the rate of spent nuclear fuel acceptance filed by USA. Service by hand: 11/8/01 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 172 Filed: 11/9/2001, Entered: 11/16/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [171-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 171 Filed: 11/9/2001, Entered: 11/16/2001, Terminated: 11/9/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service by hand: 11/8/01) For leave to exceed the page limitation re: dispositive motion filed [by leave of the judge]. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 170 Filed: 11/8/2001, Entered: 11/16/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER stating that the June 8, 1999, order is no longer in effect; authorizing Judge Weinstein to issue any order concerning the general preservation of e-mail deemed necessary; directing parties to participate in the coordinated discovery proceeding concerning e-mail production fully subject to Judge Weinstein's direction; and informing parties that any additional e-mail production, beyond that obtained in the coordinated discovery proceeding, shall be obtained only by leave of Court. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 169 Filed: 11/8/2001, Entered: 11/16/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [134-1] motion to permit expert Discovery pursuant to Rule 26(b)(3)(A)(ii), to the extent outlined in this order. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 168 Filed: 11/8/2001, Entered: 11/9/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER. See 98-126C. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 167 Filed: 11/8/2001, Entered: 11/9/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER. See 98-126C. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 166 Filed: 11/7/2001, Entered: 11/8/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service by hand: 11/7/01) for Partial Summary Judgment regarding plaintiff's greater than class C radioactive waste arguments . Response due: 12/5/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 165 Filed: 11/7/2001, Entered: 11/8/2001 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA. Service by hand: 11/7/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 164 Filed: 11/7/2001, Entered: 11/8/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting Motion for enlargement of time to respond to the Motion to Compel production of documents (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 163 Filed: 11/6/2001, Entered: 11/7/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting motion to enlarge time to respond to motion to compel production of documents to 11/6/01 ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 162 Filed: 11/6/2001, Entered: 11/7/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER re: Public Service Electric and Gas motion to extend time filed on 11/2/01, within which to respond to the defendant's motion to compel is GRANTED (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (see motion filed in 98-126C) (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 161 Filed: 11/6/2001, Entered: 11/7/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER re: granting motion to enlarge production of documents until 11/19/01 ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 160 Filed: 11/1/2001, Entered: 11/6/2001 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY by USA to response to [143-1] motion to transfer responsibliity for e-mail preservation and production issues to the coordinated discovery proceedings. Service: 11/1/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 159 Filed: 11/1/2001, Entered: 11/5/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying [144-1] motion for Clarification of the Court's 9/26/01 order. Individual Judges retain the right to decide dispositive motions. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 158 Filed: 10/30/2001, Entered: 11/1/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER re: proposed stipulated order, etc. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 157 Filed: 10/30/2001, Entered: 11/1/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [154-1] motion to Extend Time within which to reply to response to motion to transfer, etc., granting [145-1] motion for Leave to file papers that the Utility Plaintiffs have filed with Discovery Judge Reply to Response to Motion reset to 11/1/01 for [143-1] motion to transfer responsibliity for e-mail preservation and production issues to the coordinated discovery proceedings (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 156 Filed: 10/29/2001, Entered: 10/31/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 10/5/01) to transfer responsibility for e-mail preservation and production issues to the coordinated discovery proceedings . Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 155 Filed: 10/29/2001, Entered: 10/31/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [146-1] motion for Leave to file copies of Motion to Transfer Responsilbiity, etc. and granting Motion for Leave to file copies of Plaintiff's response to transfer motion (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 154 Filed: 10/29/2001, Entered: 10/31/2001, Terminated: 10/30/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 10/29/01 ) to Extend Time within which to reply to response to motion to transfer, etc. , (until November 1, 2001). (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 153 Filed: 10/19/2001, Entered: 10/23/2001 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of supplemental certificate of service by USA. Service: 10/19/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 152 Filed: 10/19/2001, Entered: 10/23/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 10/19/01) to Compel . Response due: 11/5/01. (Filed with response to third party objections). (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 152 Filed: 10/19/2001, Entered: 10/23/2001 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by USA to third party objections. Service: 10/19/01. (Filed with Motion to Compel). (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 151 Filed: 10/18/2001, Entered: 10/23/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 10/16/01) to Compel . (Filed with Response to third party objections). Response due: 11/2/01. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 151 Filed: 10/18/2001, Entered: 10/23/2001 ResponseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by USA to third party objections. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 10/16/01 (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 150 Filed: 10/18/2001, Entered: 10/19/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER directing the Clerk's Office to file Defendant's response and Defendant's corrected certificate of service is due 10/25/01 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 149 Filed: 10/17/2001, Entered: 10/18/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER re: Defendant's motion for enlargement filed on 10/15/01, within which to file the parties proposed stipulated order concerning the scheduling and conduct of depositions in the coordinated discovery proceeding, is GRANTED, see 98-126C motion (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 148 Filed: 10/16/2001, Entered: 10/17/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by CONN. YANKEE (Service: 10/16/01 ) to [143-1] motion to transfer responsibliity for e-mail preservation and production issues to the coordinated discovery proceedings. Reply due: 10/30/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 147 Filed: 10/15/2001, Entered: 10/16/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service by hand: 10/12/01) to Strike expert report of Dr. John W. Bartlett and exclude Dr. Bartlett from testifying as an expert or lay opinion witness . Response due: 10/26/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 146 Filed: 10/11/2001, Entered: 10/15/2001, Terminated: 10/29/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 10/10/01) for Leave to file copies of Motion to Transfer Responsilbiity, etc. . Response due: 10/29/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 145 Filed: 10/10/2001, Entered: 10/11/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by CONN. YANKEE (Service: 10/10/01) for Leave to file papers that the Utility Plaintiffs have filed with Discovery Judge . Response due: 10/29/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 144 Filed: 10/9/2001, Entered: 10/10/2001, Terminated: 11/1/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by CONN. YANKEE (Service by hand: 10/9/01) for Clarification of the Court's 9/26/01 order . Response due: 10/23/01. (LTD) Modified on 10/10/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 143 Filed: 10/5/2001, Entered: 10/9/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service: 10/5/01) to transfer responsibliity for e-mail preservation and production issues to the coordinated discovery proceedings . Response due: 10/22/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 142 Filed: 10/3/2001, Entered: 10/4/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [141-1] motion to Extend Time to submit a plan for production of e-mail messages Plan is to be filed by 10/22/01 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 141 Filed: 10/3/2001, Entered: 10/4/2001, Terminated: 10/3/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 10/1/01) to Extend Time to submit a plan for production of e-mail messages until 10/22/01. Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 140 Filed: 9/26/2001, Entered: 9/27/2001 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY by USA to response to [134-1] motion to permit expert Discovery pursuant to Rule 26(b)(3)(A)(ii) . Service: 9/26/01 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 139 Filed: 9/26/2001, Entered: 9/26/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [138-1] motion for entry of agreement and Protective Order (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 138 Filed: 9/24/2001, Entered: 9/26/2001, Terminated: 9/26/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    JOINT MOTION by USA (Service: 9/24/01) for entry of agreement and Protective Order . Response due: 10/11/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 137 Filed: 9/17/2001, Entered: 9/18/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by CONN. YANKEE (Service: 9/17/01) to [134-1] motion to permit expert Discovery pursuant to Rule 26(b)(3)(A)(ii). Reply due: 9/26/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 136 Filed: 9/13/2001, Entered: 9/13/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER setting Status Conference for 4:00 p.m. on 9/20/01 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 135 Filed: 9/4/2001, Entered: 9/4/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [112-1] motion for Leave to Substitute Charles W. Pennington as an expert witness in the place of James P. Malone (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 134 Filed: 8/31/2001, Entered: 9/4/2001, Terminated: 11/8/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service by hand: 8/31/01) to permit expert Discovery pursuant to Rule 26(b)(3)(A)(ii) and for Expedited Consideration . Response due: 9/14/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 133 Filed: 8/22/2001, Entered: 8/22/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting motion for protective order in the form provided by Exhibit A of the parties 08/10/01 motion (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). See case number 98-126 C for motion. Protective order in 98-458 C is also granted, subject to reconsideration by assigned judge. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 132 Filed: 8/15/2001, Entered: 8/16/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER setting Status Conference for 2:00 p.m. on 9/11/01 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein, Discovery Judge). Copy to parties. (LTD) Modified on 08/16/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 131 Filed: 8/13/2001, Entered: 8/13/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of proceedings (See: 98-126 for Transcript) 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of August 6, 2001. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 130 Filed: 8/9/2001, Entered: 8/10/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER re: (1) Defendant's pretrial submissions shall be forwarded on or before 12/3/01; (2) If prior to 12/3/01, defendant can demonstrate ongoing discovery will alter pretrial submissions, a motion shall be promptly filed: and (3) Defendant shall promptly commence the audit activity by 12/3/01 ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (FE) Modified on 08/10/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 129 Filed: 7/30/2001, Entered: 7/31/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER re: Pursuant to the order filed on July 25, 2001, the order filed on October 6, 1999, staying proceedings, is LIFTED (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 128 Filed: 7/25/2001, Entered: 7/26/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER regarding procedure for pretrial submissions, etc. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 127 Filed: 7/18/2001, Entered: 7/20/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by CONN. YANKEE (Service by hand: 7/18/01) for Leave to file joint motion for leave to file a proposed order on liability that was filed before Judge Wiese as managing Judge. Response due: 8/1/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 126 Filed: 7/11/2001, Entered: 7/13/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 7/11/01) for Leave to file a copy of the parties "Joint Motion for an order coordinating discovery" . Response due: 7/30/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 125 Filed: 7/5/2001, Entered: 7/6/2001 RemarkCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Copy of Motion for leave to file documents relevant to the telephone conference with Judge Wiese. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 124 Filed: 7/5/2001, Entered: 7/5/2001, Terminated: 1/8/2003 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service by hand: 7/3/01) for an order directing plaintiff to participate in consolidated discovery effort limited to schedule issues . Response due: 7/17/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 123 Filed: 5/31/2001, Entered: 6/1/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER resetting Status Conference for 2:30 p.m. on 6/14/01 (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 122 Filed: 5/29/2001, Entered: 5/31/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER setting Status Conference for 10:30 a.m. on 6/14/01 (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 121 Filed: 5/22/2001, Entered: 5/25/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER: On 1/8/2001, Dft filed a [116-1] Motion to the Chief Judge to reassign to a single Judge cases involving alleged breaches of teh standard contract published at 10 C.F.R. part 961. The Chief Judge hereby designates Judge Wiese as the managing judge in the above cited cases for the purpose of meeting with the parties to consider whether consolidation or other joint handling of discovery or other pre-trial matters is appropriate. Judge Wiese is requested to formulate a management plan, if one is appropriate, and is authorized to make appropriate rulings with respect to this purpose. (signed by Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir). Judge Wiese is designated as the managing judge. Copy to parties. (LTD) Modified on 3/17/2004 (jcp, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 120 Filed: 2/21/2001, Entered: 2/23/2001 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY by USA to response to [116-1] motion to the Chief Judge to reassign to a single Judge cases involving alleged breaches of teh standard contract published at 10 C.F.R. part 961. Service: 2/16/01 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 119 Filed: 2/21/2001, Entered: 2/23/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [118-1] motion for Leave to file a copy of the reply to opposition to the motion to the Chief Judge to reassign to a single Judge cases involving alleged breaches of the standard contract, etc. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 118 Filed: 2/20/2001, Entered: 2/22/2001, Terminated: 2/21/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 2/20/01) for Leave to file a copy of the reply to opposition to the motion to the Chief Judge to reassign to a single Judge cases involving alleged breaches of the standard contract, etc. . Response due: 3/9/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 117 Filed: 1/22/2001, Entered: 1/23/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by CONN. YANKEE (Service by hand: 1/22/01) to Extend Time to respond to the USA's motion to the Chief Judge to reassign cases to a single Judge , (until January 29, 2001). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 116 Filed: 1/10/2001, Entered: 1/10/2001, Terminated: 5/22/2001 Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service: 1/8/01) to the Chief Judge to reassign to a single Judge cases involving alleged breaches of teh standard contract published at 10 C.F.R. part 961 . Response due: 1/25/01. (HW) Modified on 01/10/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 115 Filed: 1/10/2001, Entered: 1/10/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [114-1] motion for Leave to file a copy of the USA's motion to the Chief Judge to reassign to a single judge cases involving alleged breaches of the standard contract, etc. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 114 Filed: 1/9/2001, Entered: 1/10/2001, Terminated: 1/10/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 1/9/01) for Leave to file a copy of the USA's motion to the Chief Judge to reassign to a single judge cases involving alleged breaches of the standard contract, etc. . Response due: 1/23/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 113 Filed: 12/19/2000, Entered: 12/28/2000 CAFC Mandate Affirming
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MANDATE (certified copy) from CAFC dated December 19, 2000 affirmed [24-1] order. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 112 Filed: 8/23/2000, Entered: 8/24/2000, Terminated: 9/4/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by CONN. YANKEE (Service : 8/23/00 (by hand)) for Leave to Substitute Charles W. Pennington as an expert witness in the place of James P. Malone. Response due: 9/6/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 111 Filed: 10/6/1999, Entered: 10/12/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [88-2] motion to stay proceedings. Proceedings shall be stayed pending further Order of the Court. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 109 Filed: 8/13/1999, Entered: 8/16/1999 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by USA re: Connecticut Department of Public Utility Control's amicus curiae brief opposing the Untied States' motion for a stay. Service: 8/13/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 110 Filed: 8/4/1999, Entered: 9/2/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [88-1] motion for Certification for Interlocutory Appeal (Pauline Newman, Circuit Judge). Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 108 Filed: 8/3/1999, Entered: 8/4/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [103-1] motion for Leave to File an Amicus Curiae brief opposing the United States' motion for a stay. Set the parties responses to the amicus curiae brief deadline to 8/13/99. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 107 Filed: 7/30/1999, Entered: 8/2/1999 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY by USA to response to [88-2] motion to Stay proceedings. Service: 7/30/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 106 Filed: 7/30/1999, Entered: 8/2/1999 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by USA (Service: 7/30/99 ) to [103-1] motion for Leave to File an Amicus Curiae brief opposing the United States' motion for a stay. Reply due: 8/13/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 105 Filed: 7/26/1999, Entered: 7/27/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [104-1] motion to Extend Time to reply to response to motion to stay proceedings. Defendant's reply to response to motion reset to 7/30/99 for [88-2] motion to Stay proceedings and Defendant's response to [103-1] motion for Leave to File an Amicus Curiae brief opposing the United States' motion for a stay reset to 7/30/99. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 104 Filed: 7/23/1999, Entered: 7/27/1999, Terminated: 7/26/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 7/23/99 ) to Extend Time to reply to response to motion to stay proceedings [until July 30, 1999]. Response due: 8/9/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 103 Filed: 7/15/1999, Entered: 7/16/1999, Terminated: 8/3/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by CONN DEPT OF PUBLIC (Service : 7/15/99 (by hand)) for Leave to File an Amicus Curiae brief opposing the United States' motion for a stay. (brief included) Response due: 7/29/99 (JT) Modified on 07/16/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 102 Filed: 7/15/1999, Entered: 7/16/1999 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by CONN. YANKEE (Service: 7/15/99 (by hand)) to [88-2] motion to stay proceedings. Reply due: 7/26/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 101 Filed: 7/12/1999, Entered: 7/13/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [100-1] motion to Extend Time to submit the two initial submissions of the Pretrial Scheduling Order by 7/13/99 (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 100 Filed: 7/9/1999, Entered: 7/12/1999, Terminated: 7/12/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by CONN. YANKEE (Service : 7/9/99 ) to Extend Time to submit the two initial submissions of the Pretrial Scheduling Order [until July 13, 1999]. Response due: 7/26/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 7/7/1999, Entered: 7/8/1999 CAFC Case Number
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CAFC Case Number Re: CAFC NUMBER: Misc. No. 590. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 99 Filed: 7/1/1999, Entered: 7/2/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [98-1] motion to Extend Time for completing its submissions under this Court's Pretrial Order by 7/9/99 (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 98 Filed: 6/30/1999, Entered: 7/1/1999, Terminated: 7/1/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by CONN. YANKEE (Service : 6/30/99 ) to Extend Time for completing its submissions under this Court's Pretrial Order [until July 9, 1999]. Response due: 7/19/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 97 Filed: 6/30/1999, Entered: 7/1/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [94-1] motion for entry of agreement and protective order. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 96 Filed: 6/30/1999, Entered: 7/1/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [95-1] motion for Leave to File status report. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 95 Filed: 6/29/1999, Entered: 6/30/1999, Terminated: 6/30/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 6/28/99 (by hand)) for Leave to File status report. (status report included) Response due: 7/12/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 94 Filed: 6/29/1999, Entered: 6/30/1999, Terminated: 6/30/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              JOINT MOTION by CONN. YANKEE, USA for entry of agreement and protective order. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 93 Filed: 6/29/1999, Entered: 6/30/1999 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by USA (Service: 6/28/99 (by hand)) to [89-1] motion for entry of an order protecting proprietary material disclosed in the course of litigation. Reply due: 7/8/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 92 Filed: 6/18/1999, Entered: 6/22/1999 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by USA (Service: 6/18/99 (by hand)) to [90-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to Defendant's motion for interlocutory appeal and a stay, [90-2] motion for expedited briefing and consideration. Reply due: 6/29/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 91 Filed: 6/18/1999, Entered: 6/21/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [90-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to Defendant's motion for interlocutory appeal and a stay, denying [90-2] motion for expedited briefing and consideration Response to [88-2] motion to Stay proceedings reset to 7/15/99 (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 89 Filed: 6/14/1999, Entered: 6/17/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by CONN. YANKEE (Service: 6/14/99) for entry of an order protecting proprietary material disclosed in the course of litigation . Response due: 7/1/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 90 Filed: 6/11/1999, Entered: 6/17/1999, Terminated: 6/18/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by CONN. YANKEE (Service : 6/11/99 ) to Extend Time to respond to Defendant's motion for interlocutory appeal and a stay [until July 15, 1999] and for expedited briefing and consideration. Response due: 6/28/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 88 Filed: 6/11/1999, Entered: 6/16/1999, Terminated: 8/4/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service by hand: 6/11/99) for Certification for Interlocutory Appeal and to Stay proceedings . Response due: 6/25/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 87 Filed: 6/8/1999, Entered: 6/14/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER denying [49-1] motion to compel the government to preserve and recover its e-mail documents and to adequately safeguard the preservaton of other documentary evidence and denying defendant's March 29, 1999 Motion for a Protective Order contained in defendant's Response to Motion to Compel (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 86 Filed: 6/3/1999, Entered: 6/8/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting in part, denying in part [44-1] motion to compel. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 85 Filed: 6/2/1999, Entered: 6/7/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting in part, denying in part [51-1] motion to compel the production of responsive documents and information, granting in part, denying in part [53-1] motion for Protective Order, granting in part, denying in part [81-1] motion to Extend Time to file pretrial submissions, granting in part, denying in part [81-2] motion to Amend [25-1] order. Reset pretrial submissions due: 6/30/99 for CONN. YANKEE. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 84 Filed: 5/21/1999, Entered: 5/27/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying as moot Plaintiff's 12/18/98 motion to compel deposition. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 05/27/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 83 Filed: 5/20/1999, Entered: 5/24/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER re: Governing review of priviledged or otherwise protected information (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 82 Filed: 5/20/1999, Entered: 5/24/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying [55-1] motion for Protective Order (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 79 Filed: 5/18/1999, Entered: 5/19/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [78-1] motion to compel the deposition of Christopher Kouts., denying [75-1] motion to Stay (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 81 Filed: 5/17/1999, Entered: 5/20/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by CONN. YANKEE (Service : 5/17/99 ) to Extend Time to file their pretrial submissions [until June 30, 1999] and to Amend [25-1] order. Response due: 6/3/99 (JT) Modified on 05/20/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 5/17/1999, Entered: 5/20/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Text not available.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 5/17/1999, Entered: 5/20/1999 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Deadline updated; Defendant's response to [81-2] motion to Amend [25-1] order reset to 6/3/99. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 78 Filed: 5/14/1999, Entered: 5/18/1999, Terminated: 5/18/1999 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by CONN. YANKEE (Service: 5/14/99 (by hand)) to [75-1] motion to stay. Reply due: 5/28/99 (motion to compel included) (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 78 Filed: 5/14/1999, Entered: 5/18/1999, Terminated: 5/18/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by CONN. YANKEE (Service : 5/14/99 (by hand)) to compel the deposition of Christopher Kouts. Response due: 5/28/99 (response to motion to stay included) (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 77 Filed: 5/12/1999, Entered: 5/17/1999 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 5/12/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 76 Filed: 5/12/1999, Entered: 5/17/1999 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STATUS REPORT by CONN. YANKEE. Service: 5/12/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 75 Filed: 5/10/1999, Entered: 5/12/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service by hand: 5/10/99) to Stay . Response due: 5/24/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 74 Filed: 5/6/1999, Entered: 5/7/1999 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER setting Status Report due on 5/12/99 ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 73 Filed: 5/5/1999, Entered: 5/6/1999 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of proceedings (For Transcript see: (98-126 C) 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of May 4, 1999. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 5/4/1999, Entered: 5/5/1999 Oral Argument
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Oral Argument re: [55-1] motion for Protective Order by CONN. YANKEE, [53-1] motion for Protective Order by USA, [51-1] motion to compel the production of responsive documents and information by CONN. YANKEE, [49-1] motion to compel the government to preserve and recover its e-mail documents and to adequately safeguard preservaton of other documentary evidence by CONN. YANKEE, [44-1] motion to Compel by CONN. YANKEE ( Transcript due 6/3/99 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 72 Filed: 4/22/1999, Entered: 4/28/1999 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY by USA to response to [53-1] motion for Protective Order. Service: 4/20/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 71 Filed: 4/22/1999, Entered: 4/28/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [69-1] motion for Leave to file telecopied signature (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 70 Filed: 4/21/1999, Entered: 4/27/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [67-1] motion to Extend Time to April 21, 1999, within which to file reply to response. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 69 Filed: 4/21/1999, Entered: 4/26/1999, Terminated: 4/22/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 4/20/99 ) for Leave to file telecopied signature. Response due: 5/7/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 68 Filed: 4/21/1999, Entered: 4/26/1999 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY by USA to response to [53-1] motion for Protective Order. Service: 4/21/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 67 Filed: 4/16/1999, Entered: 4/21/1999, Terminated: 4/21/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 4/16/99 ) to Extend Time within which to file reply to response to motion to compel, (until April 21, 1999). (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 66 Filed: 4/13/1999, Entered: 4/16/1999 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY by CONN. YANKEE to response to [55-1] motion for Protective Order. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 4/9/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 65 Filed: 4/9/1999, Entered: 4/15/1999 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY by CONN. YANKEE to response to [49-1] motion to compel the government to preserve and recover its e-mail documents and to adequately safeguard the preservaton of other documentary evidence. Service: 4/9/99. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 63 Filed: 4/8/1999, Entered: 4/14/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER oral argument set for 2:00 p.m., 5/4/99 for [44-1] motion to compel, [49-1] motion to compel, [53-1] motion for Protective Order, [51-1] motion to compel, [55-1] motion for Protective Order. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 64 Filed: 4/7/1999, Entered: 4/14/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [61-1] motion to Extend Time to reply on motion to compel and opposition to defendant's motion for a protective order. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 62 Filed: 4/6/1999, Entered: 4/12/1999 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by CONN. YANKEE (Service: 4/6/99 ) to [53-1] motion for Protective Order. Reply due: 4/19/99 (reply to response to motion included) (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 62 Filed: 4/6/1999, Entered: 4/12/1999 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY by CONN. YANKEE to response to [51-1] motion to compel the production of responsive documents and information. Service: 4/6/99 (response to motion included) (JT) Modified on 04/12/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 61 Filed: 4/5/1999, Entered: 4/9/1999, Terminated: 4/7/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by CONN. YANKEE (Service : 4/5/99) to Extend Time to reply on motion to compel and opposition to defendant's motion for a protective order , (until April 6, 1999). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 60 Filed: 4/1/1999, Entered: 4/6/1999 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by CONN. YANKEE (Service: 3/31/99 (by hand)) to [56-1] motion to Extend Time out of time Defendant's response to Plaintiff's emergency motion to compel, [56-2] motion to Strike [49-1] motion to compel the government to preserve and recover its e-mail documents and to adequately safeguard the preservaton of other documentary evidence by CONN. YANKEE. Filed by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 4/9/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 59 Filed: 3/29/1999, Entered: 3/31/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [56-1] motion to Extend Time out of time Defendant's response to Plaintiff's motion to compel, denying [56-2] motion to Strike [49-1] motion to compel the government to preserve and recover its e-mail documents and to adequately safeguard the preservaton of other documentary evidence by CONN. YANKEE. Defendant's response to [49-1] motion to compel the government to preserve and recover its e-mail documents and to adequately safeguard the preservaton of other documentary evidence reset to 3/29/99. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 58 Filed: 3/29/1999, Entered: 3/30/1999 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by USA (Service: 3/29/99 ) to [49-1] motion to compel the government to preserve and recover its e-mail documents and to adequately safeguard the preservaton of other documentary evidence. Reply due: 4/12/99 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 57 Filed: 3/29/1999, Entered: 3/30/1999 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by USA (Service: 3/29/99 (by hand)) to [55-1] motion for Protective Order. Reply due: 4/7/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 56 Filed: 3/23/1999, Entered: 3/25/1999, Terminated: 3/29/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 3/23/99 (by hand)) to Extend Time out of time Defendant's response to Plaintiff's emergency motion to compel or to Strike [49-1] motion to compel the government to preserve and recover its e-mail documents and to adequately safeguard the preservaton of other documentary evidence by CONN. YANKEE. Response due: 4/6/99 (JT) Modified on 03/25/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 3/23/1999, Entered: 3/25/1999 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Deadline updated; Plaintiff's response to [56-2] motion to Strike [49-1] motion to compel the government to preserve and recover its e-mail documents and to adequately safeguard the preservaton of other documentary evidence by CONN. YANKEE. reset to 4/6/99. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 55 Filed: 3/19/1999, Entered: 3/23/1999, Terminated: 5/20/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by CONN. YANKEE (Service by hand: 3/19/99 ) for Protective Order . Response due: 4/2/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 54 Filed: 3/17/1999, Entered: 3/21/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [52-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to motion to compel to March 17, 1999. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 53 Filed: 3/17/1999, Entered: 3/19/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 3/17/99 ) for Protective Order . Response due: 4/5/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 53 Filed: 3/17/1999, Entered: 3/19/1999 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by USA (Service: 3/17/99 ) to [51-1] motion to compel the production of responsive documents and information. Reply due: 3/29/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 52 Filed: 3/15/1999, Entered: 3/17/1999, Terminated: 3/17/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 3/15/99 ) to Extend Time to respond to motion to compel , (until March 17, 1999). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 51 Filed: 3/3/1999, Entered: 3/5/1999, Terminated: 6/2/1999 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by CONN. YANKEE (Service : 3/1/99 (by hand)) to compel the production of responsive documents and information. (1 Separate Volume of Appendix) Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 3/15/99 (JT) Modified on 03/05/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 50 Filed: 2/25/1999, Entered: 3/1/1999 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY by CONN. YANKEE to response to [44-1] motion to Compel. Service: 2/25/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 49 Filed: 2/18/1999, Entered: 2/19/1999, Terminated: 6/8/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by CONN. YANKEE (Service : 2/18/99 ) to compel the government to preserve and recover its e-mail documents and to adequately safeguard the preservaton of other documentary evidence. Response due: 3/4/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 48 Filed: 2/16/1999, Entered: 2/17/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [47-1] motion to Extend Time for submissions under pretrial order. Set pretrial submissions due: 5/17/99 for CONN. YANKEE. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 47 Filed: 2/11/1999, Entered: 2/12/1999, Terminated: 2/16/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by CONN. YANKEE (Service : 2/11/99 ) to Extend Time for submissions under pretrial order , (until May 17, 1999). Response due: 3/1/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 46 Filed: 2/10/1999, Entered: 2/11/1999 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by USA (Service: 2/10/99) to [44-1] motion to Compel. Reply due: 2/22/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 44 Filed: 1/28/1999, Entered: 1/30/1999, Terminated: 6/3/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by CONN. YANKEE (Service by hand: 1/27/99 ) to Compel document production. Response due: 2/10/99 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 45 Filed: 1/27/1999, Entered: 2/1/1999 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 1/27/99. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 43 Filed: 1/25/1999, Entered: 1/25/1999 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER denying [29-1] motion for Protective Order, denying [28-1] motion to Compel Discovery Status Report deadline to 1/27/99 ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 1/13/1999, Entered: 1/13/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Oral Argument re: [28-1] motion to Compel Discovery by CONN. YANKEE ( Transcript due 2/12/99 ), [29-1] motion for Protective Order. by USA ( Transcript due 2/12/99 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 42 Filed: 1/12/1999, Entered: 1/15/1999 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Harold Dewitt Lester Jr.. Service by hand: 1/12/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 41 Filed: 12/18/1998, Entered: 12/18/1998 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER oral argument set for 2:30 p.m., 1/13/99 for [29-1] motion for Protective Order and [28-1] motion to Compel Discovery. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 40 Filed: 12/16/1998, Entered: 12/17/1998 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY by USA to response to [29-1] motion for Protective Order. Service: 12/16/98. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 39 Filed: 12/15/1998, Entered: 12/17/1998 Published DecisionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PUBLISHED DECISION (reissuance of unpublished order entered on October 30, 1998). ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ). Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 38 Filed: 12/15/1998, Entered: 12/17/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [37-1] motion for publication of the Order of 10/30/98. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 37 Filed: 12/14/1998, Entered: 12/15/1998, Terminated: 12/15/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by CONN. YANKEE (Service : 12/14/98 (by hand)) for publication of the Order of 10/30/98. Response due: 12/28/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 36 Filed: 12/14/1998, Entered: 12/15/1998 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to Complaint by USA. Service: 12/14/98 ( JPSR due 2/1/99 ) (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 35 Filed: 12/7/1998, Entered: 12/9/1998 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by CONN. YANKEE (Service: 12/4/98 ) to [29-1] motion for Protective Order. Reply due: 12/18/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 35 Filed: 12/7/1998, Entered: 12/9/1998 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY by CONN. YANKEE to response to [28-1] motion to Compel Discovery. Service: 12/4/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 33 Filed: 12/2/1998, Entered: 12/8/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying [31-1] motion to Amend [25-1] order with the exception that briefs submitted pursuant to the 11/4/98 Pretrial Order may comprise up to 30 pages. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 32 Filed: 12/2/1998, Entered: 12/8/1998 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Significant Development by USA. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 12/1/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 34 Filed: 12/1/1998, Entered: 12/9/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [26-1] motion to Extend Time to answer the complaint by 12/14/98 ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 31 Filed: 11/25/1998, Entered: 12/3/1998, Terminated: 12/2/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by CONN. YANKEE (Service : 11/25/98 (by hand)) to Amend [25-1] order. Response due: 12/9/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 11/25/1998, Entered: 12/3/1998 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Deadline updated; Defendant's response to [31-1] motion to Amend [25-1] order reset to 12/9/98. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 29 Filed: 11/24/1998, Entered: 12/3/1998, Terminated: 1/25/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 11/24/98 (by hand)) for Protective Order. Response due: 12/8/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 29 Filed: 11/24/1998, Entered: 12/3/1998, Terminated: 1/25/1999 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by USA (Service: 11/24/98 (by hand)) to [28-1] motion to Compel Discovery. Reply due: 12/8/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 29 Filed: 11/24/1998, Entered: 12/3/1998, Terminated: 1/25/1999 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY by USA to response to [26-1] motion to Extend Time to answer the complaint. Service: 11/24/98 (by hand) (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 28 Filed: 11/17/1998, Entered: 11/19/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by CONN. YANKEE (Service by hand : 11/17/98 ) to Compel Discovery . Response due: 12/1/98. (FE) Modified on 11/19/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 27 Filed: 11/13/1998, Entered: 11/17/1998 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by CONN. YANKEE (Service by hand: 11/13/98 ) to [26-1] motion to Extend Time to answer the complaint. Reply due: 11/24/98. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 26 Filed: 11/9/1998, Entered: 11/12/1998, Terminated: 12/1/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 11/9/98 ) to Extend Time to answer the complaint [until 10 days after the U.S. Supreme Court has resolved Defendant's petition for a writ of certiorari]. Response due: 11/27/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 25 Filed: 11/4/1998, Entered: 11/6/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PRETRIAL ORDER (RULE 16) ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 24 Filed: 10/30/1998, Entered: 11/2/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting in part, denying in part [12-1] motion to Dismiss, granting [13-1] cross motion. (See entry of 12/15/98) ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (DS) Modified on 12/17/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 22 Filed: 9/28/1998, Entered: 10/1/1998 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF by CONN. YANKEE re: Dispositive Motions. Service: 9/28/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 9/28/1998, Entered: 10/1/1998 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Deadline updated; set Defendant's supplemental brief deadline to 10/13/98. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 23 Filed: 9/18/1998, Entered: 10/15/1998 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEE NO. 98-126C FOR TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: oral argument (one volume), taken at Washington, DC, on September 16, 1998 . Notice to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 21 Filed: 9/17/1998, Entered: 9/23/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER set Plaintiff's supplemental brief deadline to 9/28/98. Defendant's supplemental brief shall be filed within 10 days after the filing of Plaintiff's brief. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 20 Filed: 9/16/1998, Entered: 9/22/1998 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Filing additional excerpt from the transcript (Exhibit 10 of Plaintiff's reply to response to cross-motion) by CONN. YANKEE. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 9/15/98 (JT) Modified on 09/22/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 19 Filed: 9/16/1998, Entered: 9/22/1998 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY by CONN. YANKEE to response to [13-1] cross motion. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 8/13/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 9/16/1998, Entered: 9/16/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Oral Argument re: [12-1] motion to Dismiss by USA ( Transcript due 10/16/98 ), [13-1] cross motion by CONN. YANKEE ( Transcript due 10/16/98 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 18 Filed: 8/19/1998, Entered: 8/20/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER oral argument set for 2:00 p.m., 9/16/98 for [13-1] cross motion and [12-1] motion to Dismiss. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 17 Filed: 8/13/1998, Entered: 8/14/1998 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY by CONN. YANKEE to response to [13-1] cross motion. Service: 8/13/98. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 16 Filed: 8/3/1998, Entered: 8/5/1998 Statement of Genuine IssuesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by USA. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 7/30/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 15 Filed: 8/3/1998, Entered: 8/5/1998 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by USA (Service: 7/30/98 (by hand)) to [13-1] cross motion. Filed by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 8/13/98 (JT) Modified on 08/05/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 14 Filed: 7/2/1998, Entered: 7/8/1998 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by CONN. YANKEE. Service: 7/2/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 13 Filed: 7/2/1998, Entered: 7/8/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CROSS MOTION by CONN. YANKEE ( Service: 7/2/98 (by hand)) and RESPONSE to [12-1] motion to Dismiss by USA. (1 Separate Volume of Appendix) Response due: 7/30/98 (JT) Modified on 07/08/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 7/2/1998, Entered: 7/8/1998 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Deadline updated; Defendant's response to [13-1] cross motion reset to 7/30/98. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 12 Filed: 6/4/1998, Entered: 6/5/1998, Terminated: 10/30/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 6/4/98 ) to Dismiss . Response due: 7/6/98 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 11 Filed: 5/20/1998, Entered: 5/26/1998 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Stipulation by CONN. YANKEE and USA re: a compromise of the parties' respective positions concerning defendant's pending motion for a stay of all proceedings (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 10 Filed: 5/20/1998, Entered: 5/22/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [9-1] motion for entry of stipulated order resolving motion to stay. Motion to Stay is considered withdrawn and no ruling will be issued on this motion. ( signed by Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 9 Filed: 5/15/1998, Entered: 5/20/1998, Terminated: 5/20/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by CONN. YANKEE, USA (Service : 5/15/98 ) for entry of stipulated order resolving motion to stay. (CDC) Modified on 05/20/1998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 8 Filed: 5/1/1998, Entered: 5/5/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service by hand: 5/1/98) to Stay all proceedings , re: United States Court of Appeals for the District of Columbia Circuit upon pending motions and petitions for reconsideration of the decision in NORTHERN STATES POWER COMPANY v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY, Nos. 97-1064, 97-1065, 97-1370, and 97-1398. Response due: 5/15/98. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 7 Filed: 4/21/1998, Entered: 4/22/1998 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of reassignment to Judge James F. Merow . Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 6 Filed: 4/21/1998, Entered: 4/22/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [5-1] motion to reassign case. ( signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 5 Filed: 4/16/1998, Entered: 4/20/1998, Terminated: 4/21/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          JOINT MOTION by CONN. YANKEE, USA to reassign case. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 4 Filed: 3/17/1998, Entered: 3/18/1998 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Joseph Andrew Kijewski Service : 3/17/98 (CDC)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 3 Filed: 3/4/1998, Entered: 3/5/1998 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of assignment to Judge Bohdan A. Futey . Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 2 Filed: 3/4/1998, Entered: 3/5/1998 Notice of Related Cases
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by CONN. YANKEE of related case(s). ( 98-126). (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 3/4/1998, Entered: 3/5/1998 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT FILING FEE $ 120 RECEIPT # 045116 Answer due on 5/4/98 (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 165 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?