METRIC CONSTRUCTORS v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:98-cv-00788-SGB
District Judge Susan G. Braden, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo METRIC CONSTRUCTORS, INC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Douglas Leo Patin +1 202 719 8241 +1 202 347 1684 dpatin@bradleyarant.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory Thomas Jaeger +1 202 353 7955 +1 202 353 7988 gregory.jaeger@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 10/13/1998
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 100 - Contract
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County
Terminated 6/9/2005
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (76) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 68 Filed: 6/9/2005, Entered: 6/17/2005 Stipulation of Dismissal
STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice filed by all parties. Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(ii) this day. (dls )
    LREF
    Blank 67 Filed: 3/2/2005, Entered: 3/3/2005 ADR Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
    ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 3/31/2005. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (mb2, )
      LREF
      Blank 66 Filed: 11/29/2004, Entered: 12/3/2004 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER: The parties shall notify the court informally by 12/20/2004, that the settlement has been completed or that nay circumstance prevents completion. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (jcp, )
        LREF
        Blank 65 Filed: 10/1/2004, Entered: 10/5/2004 Order Staying CaseCourt Filing
        ORDER STAYING CASE: The stay in this case is continued pending further order of the court. The parties shall notify the court informally by 10/15/2004, if they require additional time to complete the settlement process. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (jcp, )
          LREF
          Blank 64 Filed: 9/16/2004, Entered: 9/21/2004 Order on Motion to StayCourt Filing
          ORDER granting [63] Dft's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Suspension of Proceedings. The case is suspended until 9/30/2004. Should Judge Miller advise by order by 9/30/2004 that the case is not being settled, then trial, not to exceed 10 days, shall commence before the undersigned Judge in the National Courts Building on 12/6/2004 at 10:00 am. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (jcp, )
            LREF
            Blank 63 Filed: 9/9/2004, Entered: 9/14/2004, Terminated: 9/16/2004 Terminated:
            UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Suspension of Proceedings by USA.Service: 9/9/2004. Response due by 9/27/2004. (jcp, )
              LREF
              Blank 62 Filed: 8/6/2004, Entered: 8/10/2004 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
              ORDER granting [61] Dft's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Suspension of Proceedings. Accordingly, the case is suspended until 9/9/2004. Should Judge Miller advise by order by 9/9/2004 that the case is not being settled, then trial, not to exceed 10 days, shall commence before the undersigned Judge on 12/6/2004 at 10:00 am in the National Courts Building. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (jcp, )
                LREF
                Blank 61 Filed: 8/4/2004, Entered: 8/6/2004, Terminated: 8/6/2004 Terminated:
                MOTION for Extension of Time as to [60] Order Staying Case, Trial Management Order,,,until 9/9/04, by USA.Service: 8/4/04. Response due by 8/23/2004 (vro, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 60 Filed: 5/14/2004, Entered: 5/17/2004 Order Staying CaseCourt Filing
                  ORDER STAYING CASE AND TRIAL MANAGEMENT ORDER: The Honorable Christine O.C. Miller has agreed to serve as mediator for the parties in ADR proceedings. The case is suspended until 8/10/2004. Should Judge Miller advise by order by 8/10/2004 that the case is not being settled, then Trial, not to exceed 10 days, shall commence on 12/6/2004 10:00 AM in National Courts Building before Judge Susan G. Braden. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (jcp, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 59 Filed: 5/14/2004, Entered: 5/17/2004 Status Conference OrderCourt Filing
                    STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: An off-the-record telephonic Conference shall be held on Wednesday, 5/19/2004 11:00 AM before Judge Christine O.C. Miller. All information and documents submitted to the settlement judge for purposes of ADR will be kept confidential, not be included in the court's official file in this case, and not be disclosed to any person who is not participating in the mediation process. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (jcp, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 58 Filed: 4/29/2004, Entered: 5/3/2004 Terminated:
                      JOINT MOTION to Lift Stay of Proceedings and to refer case for mediation by METRIC CONSTRUCTORS, INC. and USA.Service: 4/29/04. (dw1)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 3/22/2004, Entered: 3/22/2004
                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan G. Braden: Status Conference held on 3/22/04. (jb1)
                          LREF
                          Blank 57 Filed: 11/17/2003, Entered: 11/20/2003 Terminated:
                          NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY and SUGGESTION of Stay by METRIC CONSTRUCTORS, INC. Service: 11/17/03. Response due by 12/4/2003. (jcp, )
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 9/12/2003, Entered: 9/12/2003
                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan G. Braden: Status Conference held on 09/04/03. (jb1)
                              LREF
                              Blank 56 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/15/2003 Court Filing
                              NOTICE of Reassignment to Judge Susan Braden. (jcp, )
                                LREF
                                Blank 55 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/15/2003 Court Filing
                                ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Pursuant to Rule 40.1(c) of the RCFC, which permits the Chief Judge to reassign any case if necessary for the efficient administration of justice, the Clerk of the Court is directed to reassign the above captioned case to Judge Susan Braden. Judge John P. Wiese no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (jcp, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 54 Filed: 4/1/2003, Entered: 4/7/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Court Filing
                                  ORDER granting [53] Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Expert Discovery deadline is 11/17/2003. Fact Discovery deadline is 9/5/2003. Joint Status Report due 12/1/2003. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (lrd)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 53 Filed: 3/24/2003, Entered: 3/26/2003, Terminated: 4/1/2003 Terminated:
                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery, until 11/15/03, by METRIC CONSTRUCTORS, INC. Service: 3/20/03. Response due 4/10/2003. (lrd)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 52 Filed: 10/17/2002, Entered: 10/21/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                      ORDER granting [50-1] motion to Extend Time within which to respond to METRIC CONSTRUCTORS' contention interrogatories by 12/24/02 and Fact Discovery deadline to 5/30/03 ( (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 51 Filed: 10/4/2002, Entered: 10/9/2002 Response to Motion
                                        RESPONSE by METRIC CONSTRUCTORS (Service: 10/4/02 ) to [50-1] motion to Extend Time within which to respond to METRIC CONSTRUCTORS' contention interrogatories. Reply due: 10/21/02 (JT)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 50 Filed: 9/25/2002, Entered: 9/30/2002, Terminated: 10/17/2002 Terminated:
                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 9/25/02 ) to Extend Time within which to respond to METRIC CONSTRUCTORS' contention interrogatories , (until December 24, 2002). Response due: 10/15/02. (HW)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 47 Filed: 9/20/2002, Entered: 9/23/2002 Transcript
                                            TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of August 22, 2002. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 49 Filed: 9/19/2002, Entered: 9/24/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                              ORDER Response to interrogatories due 10/25/02 (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 48 Filed: 9/19/2002, Entered: 9/24/2002 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                RESPONSE by METRIC CONSTRUCTORS (Service: 9/10/02) to [44-1] motion to Extend Time within which to respond to plaintiff's contention interrogatories. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 46 Filed: 9/4/2002, Entered: 9/18/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER granting [44-1] motion to Extend Time within which to respond to plaintiff's contention interrogatories. Response to Interrogatories due 9/25/02 ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 45 Filed: 8/28/2002, Entered: 9/18/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER granting [42-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to Defendant's interrogatories. Response to Interrogatories due 9/25/02 ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 44 Filed: 8/26/2002, Entered: 8/29/2002, Terminated: 9/4/2002 Terminated:
                                                      MOTION by USA (Service: 8/26/02) to Extend Time within which to respond to plaintiff's contention interrogatories , (until September 25, 2002). Response due: 9/12/02 (HW)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 43 Filed: 8/23/2002, Entered: 8/28/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER, re: Deposition of John Anderson (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 42 Filed: 8/22/2002, Entered: 8/27/2002, Terminated: 8/28/2002 Terminated:
                                                          MOTION by METRIC CONSTRUCTORS (Service : 8/19/02 ) to Extend Time to respond to Defendant's interrogatories [until September 25, 2002]. Response due: 9/5/02 (JT)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 41 Filed: 8/12/2002, Entered: 8/14/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER granting [40-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to plaintiff's interrogatories Response to Interrogatories due 8/26/02 (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 40 Filed: 8/2/2002, Entered: 8/6/2002, Terminated: 8/12/2002 Terminated:
                                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 8/2/02) to Extend Time to respond to plaintiff's interrogatories , (until August 26, 2002). (FE)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 39 Filed: 6/14/2002, Entered: 6/17/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER Discovery deadline is 2/28/03 , and Joint Status Report due 8/1/03 (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 38 Filed: 6/10/2002, Entered: 6/12/2002 Status Report
                                                                  JOINT STATUS REPORT. Service: 6/10/02. (LTD)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 37 Filed: 5/22/2002, Entered: 5/23/2002 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER setting Joint Status Report due on 6/10/02 (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 36 Filed: 3/12/2001, Entered: 3/13/2001 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                      ANSWER by METRIC CONSTRUCTORS to [35-2] counter claim by USA. Service: 3/12/01. (LTD)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 35 Filed: 2/15/2001, Entered: 2/20/2001 Description not available
                                                                        ANSWER to Complaint and COUNTERCLAIM [affirmative defenses] by USA against METRIC CONSTRUCTORS (and special plea in fraud). Service: 2/15/01 ( Answer to counterclaim due 3/12/01 ) (HW)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 34 Filed: 12/14/2000, Entered: 12/15/2000 Transcript
                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: Status Conference, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of November 17, 2000. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 33 Filed: 11/29/2000, Entered: 12/1/2000 ~Notice (other)
                                                                            NOTICE to the Court by METRIC CONSTRUCTORS. Service: 11/29/00 (JT)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 32 Filed: 11/17/2000, Entered: 11/21/2000 Status Report
                                                                              STATUS REPORT by METRIC CONSTRUCTORS. Service: 11/17/00 (JT)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 31 Filed: 11/17/2000, Entered: 11/20/2000 Status Report
                                                                                STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 11/16/00. (FE)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 11/17/2000, Entered: 11/20/2000 Status Conference
                                                                                  Status Conference held ( Transcript due 12/18/00 ) (DS)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 30 Filed: 11/15/2000, Entered: 11/17/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                    ORDER set Status Conference for 10:30 a.m., 11/17/00. ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 29 Filed: 4/21/2000, Entered: 4/24/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                      PROCEDURAL ORDER ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 28 Filed: 4/14/2000, Entered: 4/18/2000 Status Report
                                                                                        JOINT STATUS REPORT by METRIC CONSTRUCTORS, USA. (JT)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 27 Filed: 4/6/2000, Entered: 4/7/2000 ResponseCourt Filing
                                                                                          RESPONSE by METRIC CONSTRUCTORS to [26-1] report by USA, by leave of the Judge. Service by hand: 3/5/00. (FE)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 26 Filed: 3/20/2000, Entered: 3/23/2000 Status Report
                                                                                            STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 3/20/00. (FE)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 25 Filed: 3/6/2000, Entered: 3/8/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                              MOTION by METRIC CONSTRUCTORS (Service : 3/6/00 ) for order directing Defendant to respond to comlaint. Response due: 3/23/00 (JT)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 24 Filed: 12/29/1999, Entered: 12/29/1999 Court Filing
                                                                                                ORDER granting [23-1] motion for Leave to Serve, out of time, responses to Plaintiff's discovery requests. ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 23 Filed: 12/23/1999, Entered: 12/23/1999, Terminated: 12/29/1999 Motion for Leave to FileCourt Filing
                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 12/22/99 ) for Leave to Serve, out of time, responses to Plaintiff's discovery requests. Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 1/10/00 (JT)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 22 Filed: 11/30/1999, Entered: 12/3/1999 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Gregory Thomas Jaeger. Service : 11/30/99 (JT)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 21 Filed: 11/23/1999, Entered: 11/30/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER canceling the status conference scheduled for 12/14/99. ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 20 Filed: 11/2/1999, Entered: 11/4/1999 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER setting Status conference at 2:30 p.m. on 12/14/99. ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 19 Filed: 8/20/1999, Entered: 8/23/1999 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by James William Poirier. Service: 8/20/99. (FE)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 18 Filed: 8/2/1999, Entered: 8/2/1999
                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: Status Conference, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of July 6, 1999. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 17 Filed: 7/6/1999, Entered: 7/7/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER set status conference for 10:30 a.m, 8/5/99. ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 7/6/1999, Entered: 7/7/1999 Status Conference
                                                                                                                Status Conference held ( Transcript due 8/5/99 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 16 Filed: 5/27/1999, Entered: 5/28/1999 Transcript
                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: Status Conference, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of April 27, 1999 . Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 15 Filed: 4/28/1999, Entered: 5/3/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER suspending proceedings until 7/6/99 and setting status conference for 10:30 a.m., 7/6/99. ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 4/27/1999, Entered: 4/29/1999 Status Conference
                                                                                                                      Status Conference held ( Transcript due 5/27/99 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 14 Filed: 4/2/1999, Entered: 4/6/1999 Memorandum
                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM by METRIC CONSTRUCTORS re: explanation of revisions to certified claim. Service: 4/2/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 13 Filed: 3/22/1999, Entered: 3/22/1999
                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: Status Conference, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of March 11, 1999. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 12 Filed: 3/15/1999, Entered: 3/17/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER set status conference for 2:30 p.m., 4/27/99 and set Plaintiff's brief deadline re: explanation regarding claim pricing adjustments to 4/2/99. ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 3/11/1999, Entered: 3/11/1999
                                                                                                                              Status Conference held ( Transcript due 4/12/99 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 11 Filed: 3/9/1999, Entered: 3/12/1999 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER setting Status conference for 3:00 p.m. 3/11/99 at the National Courts Buildiing, 717 Madison Pl., N.W., Washington, D.C. ; ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 3/9/1999, Entered: 3/11/1999 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                  Status Conference set at 3:00 p.m. on 3/11/99 (DS)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 10 Filed: 3/4/1999, Entered: 3/8/1999 Response
                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by METRIC CONSTRUCTORS to [8-1] notice by USA. Service: 3/4/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 10 Filed: 3/4/1999, Entered: 3/8/1999 Status Report
                                                                                                                                      STATUS REPORT by METRIC CONSTRUCTORS. Service: 3/4/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 9 Filed: 2/11/1999, Entered: 2/12/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        ORDER set Status Conference for 2:30 p.m., 3/9/99. ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 8 Filed: 1/15/1999, Entered: 1/21/1999 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of intent to proceed by motion in lieu of an answer to the complaint by USA. Service: 1/15/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 7 Filed: 12/15/1998, Entered: 12/16/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [6-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint Answer deadline to 1/29/99 ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 6 Filed: 12/14/1998, Entered: 12/15/1998, Terminated: 12/15/1998 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 12/14/98 ) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint [until January 29, 1999]. Response due: 1/4/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 5 Filed: 12/14/1998, Entered: 12/15/1998 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by James Calvin Caine. Service : 12/14/98 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 4 Filed: 11/3/1998, Entered: 11/5/1998 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Caroline Alyce Elizabeth Smith. Service : 11/2/98. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 3 Filed: 10/15/1998, Entered: 10/19/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    ORDER directing parties to confer and arrange for preliminary status conference; identifying filing requirements for conference (if defendant intends to proceed by motion in lieu of an answer, a memorandum shall be filed no later than 10 days before the scheduled conference); and precluding the filing of dispositive motions until after conference has been held. ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 2 Filed: 10/13/1998, Entered: 10/14/1998 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      Notice of assignment to Judge John P. Wiese. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 10/13/1998, Entered: 10/14/1998 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #046392. Answer due on 12/14/98. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 118 times.

                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?