CONFIDENTIAL INFORMA v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:98-cv-00796-ECH
District Judge Emily C. Hewitt, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo CONFIDENTIAL INFORMANT, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Cromwell Johnson +1 205 327 5223 +1 408 249 1397 tennischaz@yahoo.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space G. Robson Stewart +1 202 307 6493 +1 202 514 9440 george.r.stewart@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 10/16/1998
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 214 - Tax - Informer's Fees
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 7/7/2000
Origin 5
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case 98-746[N. District of Alabama]
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (50) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 45 Filed: 7/25/2000, Entered: 7/27/2000 Published DecisionCourt Filing
PUBLISHED DECISION reissuance of decision issued under seal on July 7, 2000. ( signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt ). Copy to parties. (JT)
    LREF
    Blank 44 Filed: 7/7/2000, Entered: 7/7/2000
    JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that judgment is entered in favor of the defendant and the complaint is dismissed. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD)
      LREF
      Blank 43 Filed: 7/7/2000, Entered: 7/7/2000 Court Filing
      Decision directing the clerk to enter judgment for defendant (Signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt) ; Copy to parties. (LD)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 7/7/2000, Entered: 7/7/2000
        Case closed (LD)
          LREF
          Blank 42 Filed: 5/30/2000, Entered: 5/31/2000 Terminated:
          REPLY by USA to [40-1] memorandum by CONFIDENTIAL INFORMA. Service: 5/30/00 FILED UNDER SEAL (JT)
            LREF
            Blank 41 Filed: 5/2/2000, Entered: 5/2/2000 Court Filing
            ORDER directing the Clerk to file Plaintiff's 4/28/00 submission under seal. ( signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt ) Copy to parties. (JT)
              LREF
              Blank 40 Filed: 4/28/2000, Entered: 5/2/2000 MemorandumCourt Filing
              SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF by CONFIDENTIAL INFORMA re: motion to dismiss the complaint by USA. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 4/22/00 FILED UNDER SEAL (See Order of 05/02/00) (JT)
                LREF
                Blank 39 Filed: 4/18/2000, Entered: 4/20/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER filing by leave and granting [38-1] motion to Extend Time to file brief and returning to Plainitff, as moot, the motion to extend time received on 4/14/00. Reset Plaintiff's brief deadline to 5/8/00 and reset Defendant's responsive brief deadline to 5/30/00. ( signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                  LREF
                  Blank 38 Filed: 4/18/2000, Entered: 4/20/2000, Terminated: 4/18/2000 Terminated: Court Filing
                  MOTION by CONFIDENTIAL INFORMA (Service : 4/4/00 ) to Extend Time to file brief [until May 8, 2000]. Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 4/21/00 (JT)
                    LREF
                    Blank 37 Filed: 3/2/2000, Entered: 3/6/2000 Terminated:
                    MOTION by CONFIDENTIAL INFORMA (Service : 3/1/00 ) to Extend Time to file brief [30 days]. Response due: 3/20/00 (JT)
                      LREF
                      Blank 36 Filed: 2/10/2000, Entered: 2/14/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER granting [35-1] motion to Extend Time, out of time, to file brief, granting [35-2] motion for Limited Discovery. Reset Plaintiff's brief re: authority of the government agents relevant to this case filing deadline to 3/6/00 and reset Defendant's response to Plaintiff's brief due 3/27/00. ( signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                        LREF
                        Blank 35 Filed: 2/9/2000, Entered: 2/10/2000, Terminated: 2/10/2000 Terminated:
                        MOTION by CONFIDENTIAL INFORMA (Service: 2/4/00) to Extend Time, out of time, to file brief , (until March 6, 2000) and for Limited Discovery . (FE)
                          LREF
                          Blank 34 Filed: 2/4/2000, Entered: 2/7/2000 Published DecisionCourt Filing
                          Opinion and order of December 21, 1999, reissued as a PUBLISHED DECISION. ( signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt ). Copy to parties. (DS)
                            LREF
                            Blank 33 Filed: 1/21/2000, Entered: 1/21/2000
                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by G. Robson Stewart Service : 1/20/00 (DS)
                              LREF
                              Blank 32 Filed: 1/14/2000, Entered: 1/14/2000 Court Filing
                              ORDER re: Plaintiff shall file supplemental brief by 2/4/00 and defendant shall file a response to supplemental brief by 2/25/00 (signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                LREF
                                Blank 31 Filed: 1/12/2000, Entered: 1/13/2000 Status Report
                                STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 1/12/00. (FE)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 30 Filed: 12/21/1999, Entered: 12/22/1999 Unpublished DecisionCourt Filing
                                  UNPUBLISHED DECISION granting in part, denying in part [27-1] motion to dismiss the complaint., plaintiff and defendant shall file with the Court separate supplemental briefs 1/21/00 and each party shall file requests for deletion from the published opinion of any material which the party believes shoul remain under seal by 1/21/00 ( signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt). Copy to parties. [FILED UNDER SEAL] (FE) Modified on 12/22/1999
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 29 Filed: 8/16/1999, Entered: 8/17/1999 Reply to Response to Motion
                                    REPLY by USA to response to [27-1] motion to dismiss the complaint. Service: 8/16/99 (JT)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 28 Filed: 8/2/1999, Entered: 8/3/1999 Terminated:
                                      RESPONSE by CONFIDENTIAL INFORMA (Service: 7/30/99 ) to [27-1] motion to dismiss the complaint. Reply due: 8/16/99 (JT)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 27 Filed: 7/2/1999, Entered: 7/6/1999 Terminated:
                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 7/2/99 ) to dismiss the complaint. (1 SEPARATE VOLUME OF APPENDIX (APPENDIX B) FILED UNDER SEAL) Response due: 8/2/99 (JT)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 26 Filed: 6/24/1999, Entered: 6/25/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                          ORDER granting [25-1] motion to Extend Time to file a motion to dismiss. Reset Defendant's motion to dismiss filing deadline to 7/2/99. ( signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 25 Filed: 6/23/1999, Entered: 6/24/1999, Terminated: 6/24/1999 Terminated:
                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 6/23/99 ) to Extend Time to file a motion to dismiss [until July 2, 1999]. Response due: 7/12/99 (JT)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 24 Filed: 5/28/1999, Entered: 6/4/1999 Amended Complaint
                                              AMENDED COMPLAINT by CONFIDENTIAL INFORMA (Answer due 6/28/99 ) amending [4-1] complaint. Service: 5/14/99 (JT)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 23 Filed: 5/28/1999, Entered: 6/4/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                ORDER granting [22-1] motion for Leave to Amend complaint. ( signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 22 Filed: 5/19/1999, Entered: 5/24/1999, Terminated: 5/28/1999 Terminated:
                                                  MOTION by CONFIDENTIAL INFORMA (Service : 5/14/99 ) for Leave to Amend complaint. Response due: 6/1/99 (JT)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 21 Filed: 5/14/1999, Entered: 5/19/1999 Answer
                                                    ANSWER to Complaint by USA. Service: 5/14/99 (JPSR due 7/1/99). (FE)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 20 Filed: 5/10/1999, Entered: 5/13/1999 Transcript
                                                      TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: Status Conference, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of May 4, 1999. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 19 Filed: 5/6/1999, Entered: 5/11/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER set telephonic status conference for 10:00 a.m., 5/28/99. Each filing in this case which will or could identify Plaintif or any individual taxpayer shall be filed under the Protective Order. ( signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 05/11/1999
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 18 Filed: 5/6/1999, Entered: 5/11/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                          PROTECTIVE ORDER ( signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank -- Filed: 5/4/1999, Entered: 5/5/1999 Status Conference
                                                            Status Conference held ( Transcript due 6/3/99 ) (DS)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 17 Filed: 4/27/1999, Entered: 5/1/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER set status conference for 10:00 a.m., 5/4/99. ( signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 16 Filed: 3/12/1999, Entered: 3/15/1999 Terminated:
                                                                RESPONSE by CONFIDENTIAL INFORMA (Service: 3/9/99 ) to [12-1] motion for a more definite statement and request that said response remain under seal. FILED UNDER SEAL (JT) Modified on 03/15/1999
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 15 Filed: 3/9/1999, Entered: 3/12/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER granting [14-1] motion to Extend Time to answer or otherwise respond to complaint Answer deadline to 5/14/99 ( signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 14 Filed: 3/5/1999, Entered: 3/10/1999, Terminated: 3/9/1999 Terminated:
                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 3/5/99 ) to Extend Time to answer or otherwise respond to complaint , (until May 14, 1999). Response due: 3/22/99. (FE)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 13 Filed: 2/25/1999, Entered: 3/2/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                      ORDER granting in part, denying in part [12-1] motion for a more definite statement (deemed to be a motion to compel a response). ( signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 03/02/1999
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 2/23/1999, Entered: 2/23/1999
                                                                        **Not member of bar flag removed. (HW)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 12 Filed: 2/22/1999, Entered: 2/24/1999, Terminated: 2/25/1999 Terminated:
                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 2/22/99 ) for a more definite statement . Response due: 3/11/99. (FE)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 11 Filed: 2/19/1999, Entered: 2/22/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                            SPECIAL PROCEDURES ORDER ( signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 10 Filed: 2/11/1999, Entered: 2/16/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                              ORDER granting [9-1] motion to substitute attorney (consented) Terminated attorney Calvin S. Rockefeller for CONFIDENTIAL INFORMA Added David Cromwell Johnson. ( signed by Judge Emily C. Hewitt ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 9 Filed: 2/9/1999, Entered: 2/11/1999, Terminated: 2/11/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                MOTION by CONFIDENTIAL INFORMA (Service : 2/8/99 ) to substitute attorney (consented) Terminated attorney Calvin S. Rockefeller for CONFIDENTIAL INFORMA Added David Cromwell Johnson. (JT)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 8 Filed: 1/27/1999, Entered: 1/30/1999 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                  Notice of reassignment to Judge Emily C. Hewitt . Copy to parties. (CDC) Modified on 02/03/1999
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 7 Filed: 1/27/1999, Entered: 1/28/1999 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Michael Fitzpatrick Cox. Service : 1/26/99. (FE) Modified on 02/03/1999
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 6 Filed: 1/26/1999, Entered: 1/29/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                      ORDER returning Plaintiff's motion to substitute counsel for failure to comply with Rule 81(d)(4). ( signed by Sr. Judge Moody R. Tidwell, III ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 02/03/1999
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 5 Filed: 1/22/1999, Entered: 1/25/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                        ORDER returning to Plaintiff their Notice of Appearance for correction of defects. ( signed by Sr. Judge Moody R. Tidwell, III ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 02/03/1999
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 4 Filed: 1/14/1999, Entered: 2/3/1999 Complaint
                                                                                          COMPLAINT filed. Copies (5) to defendant. Answer due on 3/15/99 (DS)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 3 Filed: 1/14/1999, Entered: 1/14/1999 Court Filing
                                                                                            Notice of assignment to Sr. Judge Moody R. Tidwell, III. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 2 Filed: 11/23/1998, Entered: 12/8/1998 Order on Motion for Order to Show CauseCourt Filing
                                                                                              ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE directing the Clerk to dismiss the case absent compliance by plaintiff within 15 days. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith Copy to parties. Show Cause Response due: 12/8/98 for CONFIDENTIAL INFORMA (DS)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 10/16/1998, Entered: 10/20/1998 Case Transferred In - District Transfer
                                                                                                Record transferred from the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Alabama, case number 98-cv-746, consisting of one bound volume. Notice to parties. (Amended complaint due by 11/13/98) (FE)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 10/16/1998, Entered: 10/20/1998 Set/Clear Flags
                                                                                                  **Not member of bar flag set (FE)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 10/16/1998, Entered: 10/20/1998 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                                                    CASE assigned to Judge Unassigned. (FE)
                                                                                                      LREF

                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 166 times.

                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                       
                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                      Need Password Help?