CAGUAS CENTRAL, et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:98-cv-00804-RHH
District Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr., presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ANA D. MARRERO, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Osvaldo Carlo-Linares +1 787 759 6331
No Logo CAGUAS CENTRAL FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Osvaldo Carlo-Linares +1 787 759 6331
No Logo FAUSTINO FRANQUIZ, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Osvaldo Carlo-Linares +1 787 759 6331
No Logo FELIX BALINAS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Osvaldo Carlo-Linares +1 787 759 6331
No Logo HILDA RUIZ, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Osvaldo Carlo-Linares +1 787 759 6331
No Logo LORENZO MUNOZ FRANCO, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Osvaldo Carlo-Linares +1 787 759 6331
No Logo MARIA VICTORIA VAZQUEZ, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Osvaldo Carlo-Linares +1 787 759 6331
No Logo SEVERIANO CORDERO, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Osvaldo Carlo-Linares +1 787 759 6331
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory Raymond Firehock
No Logo Fdic, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Sands Anderson Marks & Miller

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Alan Gray +1 804 783 7237 +1 804 783 7291 bgray@sandsanderson.com
Office COFC
Filed 10/21/1998
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 511 - Taking - FIRREA
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 3/2/1999
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (37) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 33 Filed: 8/14/2000, Entered: 8/21/2000 CAFC Mandate Affirming
MANDATE (certified copy) dated August 14, 2000 affirmed [31-1] judgment order (HW)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 5/11/1999, Entered: 5/20/1999 CAFC Case Number
    CAFC Case Number Re: [32-1] appeal by FELIX BALINAS, ANA D. MARRERO, FAUSTINO FRANQUIZ, LORENZO MUNOZ FRANCO, HILDA RUIZ, MARIA VICTORIA VAZQUEZ, SEVERIANO CORDERO, MARIA VICTORIA VAZQUEZ, CAGUAS CENTRAL CAFC NUMBER: 99-5084 (HW)
      LREF
      Blank 32 Filed: 5/3/1999, Entered: 5/3/1999, Terminated: 8/14/2000 Notice of AppealCourt Filing
      NOTICE OF APPEAL by CAGUAS CENTRAL, MARIA VICTORIA VAZQUEZ, SEVERIANO CORDERO, MARIA VICTORIA VAZQUEZ, HILDA RUIZ, LORENZO MUNOZ FRANCO, FAUSTINO FRANQUIZ, ANA D. MARRERO, FELIX BALINAS. Copy to Defendant, Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. and to CAFC. FILING FEE $ 105.00; RECEIPT # 047389. (HW)
        LREF
        Blank 31 Filed: 3/2/1999, Entered: 3/2/1999
        JUDGMENT entered dismissing the complaint for lack of jurisdiction and for failure to state a claim for which relief may be granted. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (DS)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 3/2/1999, Entered: 3/2/1999
          Case closed (DS)
            LREF
            Blank 30 Filed: 3/1/1999, Entered: 3/2/1999 Unpublished DecisionCourt Filing
            UNPUBLISHED DECISION directing the Clerk to dismiss the complaint for lack of jurisdiction and for failure to state a claim for which relief may be granted. No costs. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ). Copy to parties. (DS)
              LREF
              Blank 29 Filed: 2/22/1999, Entered: 2/24/1999 Reply to Response to Motion
              REPLY by USA to response to [20-1] motion to Dismiss. Service: 2/22/99 (JT)
                LREF
                Blank 28 Filed: 2/4/1999, Entered: 2/8/1999 Terminated:
                RESPONSE by MARIA VICTORIA VAZQUEZ, SEVERIANO CORDERO, MARIA VICTORIA VAZQUEZ, HILDA RUIZ, LORENZO MUNOZ FRANCO, FAUSTINO FRANQUIZ, ANA D. MARRERO, FELIX BALINAS (Service: 2/4/99 ) to [20-1] motion to Dismiss. Reply due: 2/22/99 (JT)
                  LREF
                  Blank 27 Filed: 1/25/1999, Entered: 1/27/1999 Terminated: Court Filing
                  MOTION by MARIA VICTORIA VAZQUEZ, SEVERIANO CORDERO, MARIA VICTORIA VAZQUEZ, HILDA RUIZ, LORENZO MUNOZ FRANCO, FAUSTINO FRANQUIZ, ANA D. MARRERO, FELIX BALINAS (Service : 1/21/99 ) to Withdraw [25-1] motion to Extend Time to file opposition to motion to dismiss by plaintiffs , by leave of the Judge. Response due: 2/8/99. (FE)
                    LREF
                    Blank 26 Filed: 1/22/1999, Entered: 1/25/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                    ORDER granting [25-1] motion to Extend Time until 1/22/99 to file opposition to motion to dismiss. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                      LREF
                      Blank 25 Filed: 1/21/1999, Entered: 1/25/1999, Terminated: 1/22/1999 Terminated: Court Filing
                      MOTION by CAGUAS CENTRAL, MARIA VICTORIA VAZQUEZ, SEVERIANO CORDERO, MARIA VICTORIA VAZQUEZ, HILDA RUIZ, LORENZO MUNOZ FRANCO, FAUSTINO FRANQUIZ, ANA D. MARRERO, FELIX BALINAS (Service : 1/14/99 ) to Extend Time to file opposition to motion to dismiss , (until January 22, 1999) by leave of the Judge. Response due: 2/1/99. (FE)
                        LREF
                        Blank 24 Filed: 1/15/1999, Entered: 1/21/1999 Terminated:
                        MOTION by MARIA VICTORIA VAZQUEZ, SEVERIANO CORDERO, MARIA VICTORIA VAZQUEZ, HILDA RUIZ, LORENZO MUNOZ FRANCO, FAUSTINO FRANQUIZ, ANA D. MARRERO, FELIX BALINAS (Service : 1/14/99 ) for Leave to File submission in response to the Court's 11/16/98 Order. Response due: 2/1/99 (JT)
                          LREF
                          Blank 23 Filed: 1/14/1999, Entered: 1/19/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER re: involuntary plaintiff FDIC's memorandum regarding tolling agreements. Defendant file a motion to dismiss on 1/4/99, plaintiffs' response and defendant's reply are due in accordance with RCFC 83.2. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                            LREF
                            Blank 22 Filed: 1/11/1999, Entered: 1/13/1999 Terminated:
                            RESPONSE by FDIC to [13-1] order. Service: 1/11/99. (HW)
                              LREF
                              Blank 21 Filed: 1/7/1999, Entered: 1/11/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                              ORDER re: tolling agreements within the Government. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                LREF
                                Blank 20 Filed: 1/4/1999, Entered: 1/6/1999 Terminated:
                                MOTION by USA (Service : 1/4/99 ) to Dismiss. Response due: 2/4/99 (JT)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 19 Filed: 12/23/1998, Entered: 12/30/1998 Terminated:
                                  RESPONSE by MARIA VICTORIA VAZQUEZ, SEVERIANO CORDERO, MARIA VICTORIA VAZQUEZ, HILDA RUIZ, LORENZO MUNOZ FRANCO, FAUSTINO FRANQUIZ, ANA D. MARRERO, FELIX BALINAS to [9-1] order. Service: 12/21/98 (JT)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 18 Filed: 12/22/1998, Entered: 12/23/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                    ORDER granting [17-1] motion to Extend Time to supplemental pleading. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 16 Filed: 12/21/1998, Entered: 12/22/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                      ORDER granting [15-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the Court's Order of 12/14/98. Set Notice of Compliance deadline to 1/11/99 for the FDIC to respond to the Court's Order of 12/14/98. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 12/21/1998, Entered: 12/21/1998
                                        **Not member of bar flag removed. (HW)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 17 Filed: 12/18/1998, Entered: 12/22/1998, Terminated: 12/22/1998 Terminated:
                                          MOTION by USA (Service: 12/18/98) to Extend Time to supplemental pleading requests extension of 10 days. Response due: 1/4/99. (FE)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 15 Filed: 12/17/1998, Entered: 12/18/1998, Terminated: 12/21/1998 Terminated:
                                            MOTION by FDIC (Service : 12/17/98 ) to Extend Time to respond to the Court's Order of 12/14/98. Response due: 1/4/99 (JT)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 14 Filed: 12/15/1998, Entered: 12/17/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                              ORDER directing the Clerk to return Plaintiff's 12/9/98 submission. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 13 Filed: 12/14/1998, Entered: 12/15/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                ORDER re: "tolling agreement" ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 12 Filed: 12/11/1998, Entered: 12/15/1998 Memorandum
                                                  MEMORANDUM by FDIC re: statute of limitations as a jurisdictional issue. Service: 12/11/98 (JT)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 11 Filed: 12/10/1998, Entered: 12/14/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER re: FDIC's explanation of the tolling agreement and how it affects the jurisdiction of this court and the Plaintiffs' cause of action. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 10 Filed: 12/4/1998, Entered: 12/9/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER set Notice of Compliance deadline to 12/11/98 for FDIC to submit statutory authority for agreeing with the Justice Department that their claims would not be time barred ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 9 Filed: 12/4/1998, Entered: 12/9/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER directing the clerk to return Plaintiff's motion unfiled. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 8 Filed: 12/3/1998, Entered: 12/8/1998 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                          MOTION by CAGUAS CENTRAL (Service : 11/23/98 ) to Extend Time to file supplemental pleading [until December 1, 1998]. Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 12/10/98 (JT)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 7 Filed: 11/25/1998, Entered: 12/3/1998 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                            MEMORANDUM by FDIC re: applicable statute of limitations. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 11/20/98 (JT)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 6 Filed: 11/16/1998, Entered: 11/18/1998 Notice of Appearance/
                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Gregory Raymond Firehock. Service : 11/16/98. (FE) Modified on 11/30/1998
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 5 Filed: 11/16/1998, Entered: 11/17/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER set Notice of Compliance deadline to 11/20/98 for the Plaintiff to file a supplemental pleading establishing the date that this cause of action arose. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 11/17/1998
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 4 Filed: 10/30/1998, Entered: 11/3/1998 Notice of Related Cases
                                                                  NOTICE by FDIC of related case(s). (Nos. 90-8C, et al.). (DS)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 3 Filed: 10/30/1998, Entered: 11/3/1998 ~Notice (other)
                                                                    [NOTICE of] consent to appear as an involuntary plaintiff in this case filed by FDIC. Service: 10/30/98 (DS)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 2 Filed: 10/21/1998, Entered: 10/22/1998 Complaint
                                                                      COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #046414. Answer due on 12/21/98. (FE)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 10/21/1998, Entered: 10/22/1998 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                        Notice of assignment to Judge Robert H. Hodges. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 10/21/1998, Entered: 10/22/1998 Set/Clear Flags
                                                                          **Not member of bar flag set (FE)
                                                                            LREF

                                                                            Statistics

                                                                            This case has been viewed 231 times.

                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                            Space
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                             
                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                            Need Password Help?