CANTY, et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:98-cv-00842-FMA
District Judge Francis M. Allegra, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ALFRED J. CANTY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by PO Box 2517

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James A. Endicott +1 254 698 1500
No Logo NEACE CANTY, JR., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by PO Box 2517

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James A. Endicott +1 254 698 1500
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth Samuel Kessler +1 202 307 0313 Kenneth.Kessler@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 11/3/1998
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 352 - Military Pay - Retirement
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 10/13/2000
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (25) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 23 Filed: 10/13/2000, Entered: 10/18/2000 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by NEACE CANTY JR., ALFRED J. CANTY, USA. Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41 (a)(1)(B). Copy to parties. (JT)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 10/13/2000, Entered: 10/18/2000 Terminated Case
    Case closed (JT)
      LREF
      Blank 22 Filed: 8/21/2000, Entered: 8/21/2000 Court Filing
      SCHEDULING ORDER setting Joint Status Report due on 10/16/00, unless a stipulation of dismissal is filed prior thereto (signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra). Copy to parties. (FE)
        LREF
        Blank 21 Filed: 8/18/2000, Entered: 8/21/2000 Status Report
        JOINT STATUS REPORT by NEACE CANTY JR., ALFRED J. CANTY, USA. Service: 8/18/00 (HW)
          LREF
          Blank 20 Filed: 7/19/2000, Entered: 7/22/2000 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER set Defendant's Status Report deadline to 8/18/00. ( signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra ) Copy to parties. (JT)
            LREF
            Blank 19 Filed: 7/17/2000, Entered: 7/18/2000 Status Report
            JOINT STATUS REPORT. (DS)
              LREF
              Blank 18 Filed: 6/15/2000, Entered: 6/15/2000 Court Filing
              SCHEDULING ORDER setting Joint Status Report due on 7/17/00 unless stipulation of dismissal is filed prior thereto (signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra). Copy to parties. (FE)
                LREF
                Blank 17 Filed: 6/9/2000, Entered: 6/12/2000 Status Report
                JOINT STATUS REPORT by NEACE CANTY JR., ALFRED J. CANTY, USA. (JT)
                  LREF
                  Blank 16 Filed: 6/1/2000, Entered: 6/2/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                  ORDER granting [15-1] motion to Extend Time to file a joint status report. Reset joint Status Report deadline to 6/9/00. ( signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                    LREF
                    Blank 15 Filed: 5/25/2000, Entered: 5/25/2000, Terminated: 6/1/2000 Motion for Extension of Time
                    MOTION by NEACE CANTY JR., ALFRED J. CANTY (Service : 5/24/00 ) to Extend Time to file a joint status report [until June 9, 2000]. Response due: 6/12/00 (JT)
                      LREF
                      Blank 14 Filed: 4/25/2000, Entered: 4/26/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER set joint Status Report deadline to 5/25/00. ( signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                        LREF
                        Blank 13 Filed: 4/14/2000, Entered: 4/18/2000 ~Notice (other)
                        NOTICE of Decision by The Board for Correction of Naval Records by NEACE CANTY JR., ALFRED J. CANTY. Service: 4/13/00 (JT)
                          LREF
                          Blank 12 Filed: 4/6/1999, Entered: 4/12/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER granting [10-1] motion to stay proceedings. Plaintiff shall provide notice to the court of any decision rendered by the BCNR not later than 14 days after such decision is rendered. The parties shall file a joint status report with the court within 45 days after such decision is rendered. ( signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                            LREF
                            Blank 11 Filed: 4/2/1999, Entered: 4/8/1999 Terminated:
                            RESPONSE by USA (Service: 4/2/99 ) to [10-1] motion to Stay proceedings. Reply due: 4/19/99 (motion to extend time included) (JT) Modified on 04/08/1999
                              LREF
                              Blank 11 Filed: 4/2/1999, Entered: 4/8/1999 Terminated:
                              MOTION by USA (Service : 4/2/99 ) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint. Response due: 4/19/99 (response to motion to stay included) (JT) Modified on 04/08/1999
                                LREF
                                Blank 10 Filed: 4/1/1999, Entered: 4/5/1999, Terminated: 4/6/1999 Terminated:
                                MOTION by NEACE CANTY JR., ALFRED J. CANTY (Service : 3/31/99 ) to Stay of proceedings , (until 30 days after plaintiff's counsel receives the decision of the Navy Board). Response due: 4/16/99. (HW)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 9 Filed: 3/11/1999, Entered: 3/14/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                  ORDER granting [8-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to complaint. Reset Answer deadline to 4/5/99. ( signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 8 Filed: 3/5/1999, Entered: 3/10/1999, Terminated: 3/11/1999 Terminated:
                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 3/5/99 ) to Extend Time to respond to complaint , (until April 5, 1999). Response due: 4/5/99. (FE)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 7 Filed: 2/16/1999, Entered: 2/16/1999 Court Filing
                                      SPECIAL PROCEDURES ORDER ( signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 6 Filed: 1/27/1999, Entered: 1/28/1999 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                        Notice of reassignment to Judge Francis M. Allegra . Copy to parties. (CDC)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 5 Filed: 1/15/1999, Entered: 1/19/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                          ORDER granting [4-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to complaint Answer deadline to 3/5/99 ( signed by Sr. Judge Robert J. Yock ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 4 Filed: 1/11/1999, Entered: 1/13/1999, Terminated: 1/15/1999 Terminated: Court Filing
                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 1/6/99 ) to Extend Time to respond to complaint , (until March 5, 1999) by leave of the Judge. Response due: 2/8/99. (FE)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 3 Filed: 11/17/1998, Entered: 11/19/1998 Notice of Appearance/
                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Kenneth Samuel Kessler. Service : 11/17/98. (FE)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 2 Filed: 11/3/1998, Entered: 11/5/1998 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                Notice of assignment to Sr. Judge Robert J. Yock. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 11/3/1998, Entered: 11/5/1998 Complaint
                                                  COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #046526. Answer due on 1/2/99. (FE)
                                                    LREF

                                                    Statistics

                                                    This case has been viewed 205 times.

                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                    Space
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                     
                                                    PlainSite
                                                    Sign Up
                                                    Need Password Help?