CHUCK HOVEY YACHTS v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:98-cv-00852-JFM
District Judge James F. Merow, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo CHUCK HOVEY YACHTS, INC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James M. Kamman +1 714 241 1180
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Steptoe & Johnson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edward Louis Froelich +1 202 429 3000
Office COFC
Filed 11/6/1998
Jury Demand
Demand $91000
Nature of Suit 206 - Tax - Excise
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 9/14/1999
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 16 Filed: 9/14/1999, Entered: 9/17/1999 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by CHUCK HOVEY YACHTS and USA . Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41 (a)(1)(B) this day. Copy to parties. Nature of Jgm DP. (FE)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 9/14/1999, Entered: 9/17/1999 Terminated Case
    Case closed (FE)
      LREF
      Blank 15 Filed: 7/28/1999, Entered: 7/29/1999 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER granting [14-1] motion to Extend Time to file pretrial submissions. Reset Notice of Compliance deadline to 8/13/99 for Defendant's pretrial submissions. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (JT)
        LREF
        Blank 14 Filed: 7/28/1999, Entered: 7/29/1999, Terminated: 7/28/1999 Terminated:
        MOTION by USA (Service : 7/28/99 ) to Extend Time to file pretrial submissions [until August 13, 1999]. Response due: 8/16/99 (JT)
          LREF
          Blank 13 Filed: 7/20/1999, Entered: 7/22/1999 ~Notice (other)
          NOTICE of intent to offer evidence regarding the law of Mexico by USA. Service: 7/20/99 (JT)
            LREF
            Blank 12 Filed: 5/27/1999, Entered: 6/2/1999 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER granting [11-1] motion to Extend Time to file pretrial submissions. Set Notice of Compliance deadline to 8/3/99 for Defendant to file their pretrial submissions. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (JT)
              LREF
              Blank 11 Filed: 5/25/1999, Entered: 5/27/1999, Terminated: 5/27/1999 Terminated:
              MOTION by USA (Service: 5/25/99) to Extend Time to file pretrial submissions , (until August 13, 1999). (FE)
                LREF
                Blank 10 Filed: 2/11/1999, Entered: 2/16/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                PRETRIAL ORDER set Prehearing Submissions due: 4/15/99 for CHUCK HOVEY YACHTS. Defendant's submissions and responses are due within 60 days of the receipt of Plaintiff's submissions. Plaintiff's responses are due within 30 days of receipt of Defendant's submissions. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 02/16/1999
                  LREF
                  Blank 9 Filed: 2/11/1999, Entered: 2/11/1999
                  ANSWER to Complaint by USA. Service: 2/10/99 ( JPSR due 3/30/99 ). (HW)
                    LREF
                    Blank 8 Filed: 2/4/1999, Entered: 2/8/1999 Amended Complaint
                    AMENDED COMPLAINT by CHUCK HOVEY YACHTS (Answer due 2/19/99 ) amending [1-1] complaint. Service: 1/28/99 (JT)
                      LREF
                      Blank 7 Filed: 2/4/1999, Entered: 2/8/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER granting [6-1] motion to Withdraw [3-1] motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted by USA. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                        LREF
                        Blank 6 Filed: 2/3/1999, Entered: 2/5/1999, Terminated: 2/4/1999 Terminated:
                        MOTION by USA (Service : 2/3/99 ) to Withdraw [3-1] motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted by USA and consent to filing of first amended complaint. (JT)
                          LREF
                          Blank 5 Filed: 2/3/1999, Entered: 2/4/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER re: the tendered First Amended Complaint shall be held pending the ruling on Defendant's motion to dismiss. In their remaining filing concerning the motion to dismiss, the parties shall address the issue of filing the tendered First Amended Complaint. Plaintiff's response to [3-1] motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted reset to 2/19/99. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                            LREF
                            Blank 4 Filed: 1/8/1999, Entered: 1/12/1999 Notice of Appearance/
                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Edward Louis Froelich. Service : 1/7/99 (JT)
                              LREF
                              Blank 3 Filed: 1/6/1999, Entered: 1/12/1999 Terminated:
                              MOTION by USA (Service : 1/6/99 ) to dismiss for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. Response due: 2/8/99 (JT)
                                LREF
                                Blank 2 Filed: 11/6/1998, Entered: 11/12/1998 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                Notice of assignment to Sr. Judge James F. Merow. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 1 Filed: 11/6/1998, Entered: 11/12/1998 Complaint
                                  COMPLAINT (Filed with Exhibit A), FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #046564. Answer due on 1/5/99. (FE)
                                    LREF

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 171 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?