YOUREK v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:98-cv-00772-JPW
District Judge John P. Wiese, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ROBERT A. YOUREK, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kutak Rock, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Barry P. Steinberg +1 202 828 2400 barry.steinberg@kutakrock
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Armando Omar Bonilla +1 202 616 2983 +1 202 514 3003 armando.bonilla@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 10/5/1998
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 346 - Military Pay - Correct/Reinstate
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 1/6/1999
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 15 Filed: 1/11/1999, Entered: 1/15/1999 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER mooting [4-1] motion for leave to conduct discovery necessary to perfect complaint (pursuant to Rule 27). ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (JT)
    LREF
    Blank 14 Filed: 1/6/1999, Entered: 1/12/1999 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by ROBERT A. YOUREK, USA. Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(B). Copy to parties. (JT)
      LREF
      Blank 13 Filed: 1/6/1999, Entered: 1/11/1999 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
      NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by ROBERT A. YOUREK and USA. Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41 (a)(1)(B) this day. Copy to parties. Nature of Jgm DP. (HW)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 1/6/1999, Entered: 1/12/1999 Terminated Case
        Case closed. (JT)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 1/6/1999, Entered: 1/11/1999 Terminated Case
          Case closed. (HW)
            LREF
            Blank 12 Filed: 1/4/1999, Entered: 1/7/1999 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER granting [11-1] motion to Extend Time within which to reply to response to motion for leave to take discovery. Plaintiff's reply to response to motion reset to 1/15/99 for [4-1] motion for leave to conduct discovery necessary to perfect complaint. ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (JT)
              LREF
              Blank 11 Filed: 12/28/1998, Entered: 1/4/1999, Terminated: 1/4/1999 Terminated:
              MOTION by ROBERT A. YOUREK (Service : 12/23/98 ) to Extend Time within which to reply to response to motion for leave to take discovery , (until January 15, 1999). (HW)
                LREF
                Blank 10 Filed: 12/18/1998, Entered: 12/21/1998 Terminated:
                RESPONSE by USA (Service: 12/18/98 ) to [4-1] motion for leave to conduct discovery necessary to perfect complaint (pursuant to Rule 27). Reply due: 1/4/99. (FE)
                  LREF
                  Blank 9 Filed: 11/20/1998, Entered: 11/25/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                  ORDER granting [8-1] motion to Extend Time within which to respond to plaintiff's motion for leave to take discovery. Defendant's response to [4-1] motion for leave to conduct discovery necessary to perfect complaint (pursuant to Rule 27) reset to 12/18/98. ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                    LREF
                    Blank 8 Filed: 11/18/1998, Entered: 11/25/1998, Terminated: 11/20/1998 Terminated:
                    MOTION by USA (Service : 11/18/98 ) to Extend Time within which to respond to plaintiff's motion for leave to take discovery , (until December 18, 1998). (HW)
                      LREF
                      Blank 7 Filed: 10/21/1998, Entered: 10/28/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER granting [6-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to motion for leave to take discovery. Defendant's response to [4-1] motion for leave to conduct discovery necessary to perfect complaint (pursuant to Rule 27) reset to 11/18/98. ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                        LREF
                        Blank 6 Filed: 10/16/1998, Entered: 10/20/1998, Terminated: 10/21/1998 Terminated:
                        MOTION by USA (Service : 10/16/98 ) to Extend Time to respond to motion for leave to take discovery , (until November 18, 1998). Response due: 11/16/98. (FE)
                          LREF
                          Blank 5 Filed: 10/14/1998, Entered: 10/16/1998 Notice of Appearance/
                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Armando Omar Bonilla. Service : 10/14/98. (FE)
                            LREF
                            Blank 3 Filed: 10/6/1998, Entered: 10/8/1998 OrderCourt Filing
                            ORDER (i) directing parties to confer and arrange for preliminary status conference (ii) identifying filing requirements for conference and (iii) precluding filing of dispositive motions until after conference has been held. ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                              LREF
                              Blank 4 Filed: 10/5/1998, Entered: 10/13/1998 Terminated:
                              MOTION by ROBERT A. YOUREK (Service: 10/5/98) for leave to conduct discovery necessary to perfect complaint (pursuant to Rule 27) . Response due: 10/19/98. Copies to defendant. (HW)
                                LREF
                                Blank 2 Filed: 10/5/1998, Entered: 10/5/1998 Court Filing
                                Notice of assignment to Judge John P. Wiese. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 1 Filed: 10/5/1998, Entered: 10/5/1998
                                  RULE 27 COMPLAINT. FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #046349. (Motion for discovery under Rule 27 due by 11/4/98) (FE)
                                    LREF

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 246 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?