PEABODY COAL COMPANY, et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:99-cv-00298-RHH
District Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr., presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Eastern Associated Coal Corporation, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "EASTERN ASSOCIATED COAL CORP."

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker & McKenzie, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven Harlan Becker +1 212 626 4100 +1 212 626 4120 steven.h.becker@bakernet.com
No Logo Peabody Coal Company, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker & McKenzie, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven Harlan Becker +1 212 626 4100 +1 212 626 4120 steven.h.becker@bakernet.com
No Logo PINE RIDGE COAL COMPANY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker & McKenzie, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven Harlan Becker +1 212 626 4100 +1 212 626 4120 steven.h.becker@bakernet.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Charles Stoddart +1 202 307 6445 robert.c.stoddart@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 5/13/1999
Jury Demand
Demand $100000
Nature of Suit 206 - Tax - Excise
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County
Terminated 7/30/2004
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (41) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 40 Filed: 10/18/2005, Entered: 10/25/2005 Notice of Change of Address
NOTICE of Change of Address by Steven Harlan Becker. Service: 10/18/2005.(hw1, )
    LREF
    Blank 39 Filed: 8/5/2004, Entered: 8/10/2004 Joint Status ReportCourt Filing
    JOINT STATUS REPORT by all plaintiffs, by leave of the Judge. Service: 8/2/04.(dw1)
      LREF
      Blank 38 Filed: 7/30/2004, Entered: 8/3/2004 Stipulation of Dismissal
      STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice filed by all parties. Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(ii) this day. (dls)
        LREF
        Blank 37 Filed: 4/5/2004, Entered: 4/7/2004 Joint Status Report
        JOINT STATUS REPORT by all parties. Service: 4/2/2004.(jcp, )
          LREF
          Blank 36 Filed: 1/14/2004, Entered: 1/16/2004 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER: The Clerk of Court shall dismiss with prejudice the claims for the taxable quarters 9403 through 9709 for Eastern Associated Coal Company, 9403 through 9409 for Peabody Coal Company, and 9412 through 9606 for Pine Ridge Coal Company. The parties will bear their own costs. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (jcp, )
            LREF
            Blank 35 Filed: 12/5/2003, Entered: 12/10/2003 Joint Status Report
            JOINT STATUS REPORT by all parties. Service: 12/5/03.(jcp, )
              LREF
              Blank 34 Filed: 8/7/2003, Entered: 8/11/2003 Joint Status Report
              JOINT STATUS REPORT by all parties. Service: 8/6/03.(jcp, )
                LREF
                Blank 33 Filed: 6/12/2003, Entered: 6/18/2003 Stipulation of Dismissal
                STIPULATION for Partial Dismissal by all parties. Service: 6/12/03.(dw1, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 32 Filed: 4/9/2003, Entered: 4/15/2003 Joint Status Report
                  JOINT STATUS REPORT by EASTERN ASSOCIATED COAL CORP., et al. Service: 4/8/03. (lrd)
                    LREF
                    Blank 31 Filed: 7/1/2002, Entered: 7/2/2002 Status ReportCourt Filing
                    JOINT STATUS REPORT by PEABODY COAL COMPANY, EASTERN ASSOCIATED, PINE RIDGE COAL. Filed by leave of the Judge. (JT)
                      LREF
                      Blank 30 Filed: 6/24/2002, Entered: 6/25/2002 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                      NOTICE of Certain Arguments that Plaintiffs intend to raise at the 6/24/02 hearing by PEABODY COAL COMPANY, EASTERN ASSOCIATED, PINE RIDGE COAL. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 6/20/02 (JT)
                        LREF
                        Blank 29 Filed: 2/26/2002, Entered: 2/27/2002 Response
                        SUR-REPLY by PEABODY COAL COMPANY to reply filed 1/7/02 by USA in 99-268T. Service: 2/25/02. (LTD)
                          LREF
                          Blank 28 Filed: 2/22/2002, Entered: 2/22/2002 Court Filing
                          SCHEDULING ORDER setting Status Report due on 6/21/02 ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                            LREF
                            Blank 27 Filed: 2/21/2002, Entered: 2/21/2002
                            JOINT STATUS REPORT by PEABODY COAL COMPANY, EASTERN ASSOCIATED and PINE RIDGE COAL. Service: 2/20/02. (FE)
                              LREF
                              Blank 26 Filed: 1/8/2002, Entered: 1/9/2002 RemarkCourt Filing
                              PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO BRING RECENT DEVELOPMENTS TO THE COURT'S ATTENTION AND TO FILE A SHORT REPLY BRIEF. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                LREF
                                Blank 25 Filed: 1/4/2002, Entered: 1/7/2002 Terminated:
                                MOTION by PEABODY COAL COMPANY (Service: 1/4/02) for Leave to file a brief in response to Defendant's additional brief . Response due: 1/22/02. (LTD)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 24 Filed: 11/2/2001, Entered: 11/5/2001 Statement of Genuine IssuesCourt Filing
                                  STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by PEABODY COAL COMPANY Service: 10/22/01. Filed by leave of the Judge. (FE)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 23 Filed: 11/2/2001, Entered: 11/5/2001 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                    RESPONSE by PEABODY COAL COMPANY (Service: 10/22/01 ) to cross motion filed in 99-268T by USA. Filed by leave of the Judge. (FE)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 22 Filed: 10/25/2001, Entered: 10/31/2001 Status Report
                                      JOINT STATUS REPORT by PEABODY COAL COMPANY and USA. Service: (AB)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 21 Filed: 8/31/2001, Entered: 8/31/2001
                                        PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by PEABODY COAL COMPANY. Service: 8/31/01. (LTD)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 20 Filed: 8/31/2001, Entered: 8/31/2001, Terminated: 7/30/2004 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                          MOTION by PEABODY COAL COMPANY (Service: 8/31/01) for Summary Judgment . Response due: 10/1/01. (LTD)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 19 Filed: 8/22/2001, Entered: 8/23/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                            ORDER regarding further procedures ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 18 Filed: 8/16/2001, Entered: 8/16/2001, Terminated: 8/22/2001 Motion for Reconsideration
                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 8/16/01) for Reconsideration of [16-4] order , and for instructions whether an answer is needed to raise defenses, etc. . Response due: 9/4/01. (LTD)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 8/16/2001, Entered: 8/16/2001
                                                Deadline updated; Response to [18-1] motion for Reconsideration of [16-4] order and [18-2] motion for instructions whether an answer is needed to defenses, etc. reset to 9/4/01 . (LTD)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 17 Filed: 8/15/2001, Entered: 8/16/2001 Status Report
                                                  STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 8/15/01. (FE)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 16 Filed: 8/7/2001, Entered: 8/8/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER Plaintiff's Motion Filing deadline to 8/31/01 , Defendant's Response deadline to 10/1/01 , Plaintiff's Reply deadline to 10/15/01 and defendant's motion to notify other parties is denied (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 15 Filed: 7/26/2001, Entered: 7/26/2001 Court Filing
                                                      SCHEDULING ORDER setting Status conference for 10:00 a.m. 8/2/01, in the National Courts Building, Washington, DC ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 14 Filed: 7/2/2001, Entered: 7/3/2001 ResponseCourt Filing
                                                        RESPONSE by PEABODY COAL COMPANY, EASTERN ASSOCIATED and PINE RIDGE COAL to [13-1] report by USA, by leave of the Judge. Service: 6/26/01. (FE)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 13 Filed: 6/19/2001, Entered: 6/20/2001 Status Report
                                                          STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 6/19/01. (FE)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 12 Filed: 7/17/2000, Entered: 7/20/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER re: this case is suspended until 30 days after the final disposition of Cyprus Amax Coal Company, et al. v. United States. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 07/20/2000
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 11 Filed: 7/7/2000, Entered: 7/12/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER re: the parties will contact the Court as soon as possible to schedule a conference to discuss this matter. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 07/12/2000
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 10 Filed: 8/10/1999, Entered: 8/11/1999 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                REPLY by USA to response to [8-1] motion to Dismiss. Service: 8/10/99 (JT)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 9 Filed: 7/30/1999, Entered: 8/2/1999 Response to Motion
                                                                  RESPONSE by PEABODY COAL COMPANY, EASTERN ASSOCIATED, PINE RIDGE COAL (Service: 7/29/99 ) to [8-1] motion to dismiss. Reply due: 8/16/99 (JT)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 8 Filed: 7/12/1999, Entered: 7/14/1999 Terminated:
                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 7/12/99) to Dismiss . Response due: 8/12/99. (FE)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 7 Filed: 6/14/1999, Entered: 6/14/1999 Court Filing
                                                                      Notice of reassignment to Judge Robert H. Hodges . Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 6 Filed: 6/14/1999, Entered: 6/14/1999 Court Filing
                                                                        ORDER granting [5-1] motion for reassignment to Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 5 Filed: 6/1/1999, Entered: 6/4/1999, Terminated: 6/14/1999 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                          MOTION by PEABODY COAL COMPANY, EASTERN ASSOCIATED, PINE RIDGE COAL (Service : 5/28/99 ) for reassignment to Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. and to stay further proceedings. Response due: 6/14/99 (JT)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 4 Filed: 5/21/1999, Entered: 5/24/1999 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Robert Charles Stoddart. Service: 5/21/99. (FE)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 3 Filed: 5/13/1999, Entered: 5/14/1999 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                              Notice of assignment to Chief Judge Loren A. Smith. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 2 Filed: 5/13/1999, Entered: 5/14/1999 Notice of Related Cases
                                                                                NOTICE by PEABODY COAL COMPANY, EASTERN ASSOCIATED, PINE RIDGE COAL of related cases. (FE)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 5/13/1999, Entered: 5/14/1999 Complaint
                                                                                  COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #047504. Answer due on 7/12/99. (FE)
                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                    This case has been viewed 171 times.

                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                    Space
                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                     
                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                    Need Password Help?