CONSOL OF KENTUCKY, et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:99-cv-00299-RHH
District Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr., presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Consol Of Kentucky Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker & McKenzie, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven Harlan Becker +1 212 626 4100 +1 212 626 4120 steven.h.becker@bakernet.com
No Logo CONSOL OF PENNSYLVANIA COAL COMPANY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker & McKenzie, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven Harlan Becker +1 212 626 4100 +1 212 626 4120 steven.h.becker@bakernet.com
No Logo Consolidation Coal Company, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker & McKenzie, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven Harlan Becker +1 212 626 4100 +1 212 626 4120 steven.h.becker@bakernet.com
No Logo GARDEN CREEK POCAHONTAS COMPANY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker & McKenzie, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven Harlan Becker +1 212 626 4100 +1 212 626 4120 steven.h.becker@bakernet.com
No Logo Island Creek Coal Company, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker & McKenzie, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven Harlan Becker +1 212 626 4100 +1 212 626 4120 steven.h.becker@bakernet.com
No Logo Laurel Run Mining Company, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker & McKenzie, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven Harlan Becker +1 212 626 4100 +1 212 626 4120 steven.h.becker@bakernet.com
No Logo Mcelroy Coal Company, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker & McKenzie, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven Harlan Becker +1 212 626 4100 +1 212 626 4120 steven.h.becker@bakernet.com
No Logo NINEVAH COAL COMPANY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker & McKenzie, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven Harlan Becker +1 212 626 4100 +1 212 626 4120 steven.h.becker@bakernet.com
No Logo Quarto Mining Company, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker & McKenzie, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven Harlan Becker +1 212 626 4100 +1 212 626 4120 steven.h.becker@bakernet.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Charles Stoddart +1 202 307 6445 robert.c.stoddart@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 5/13/1999
Jury Demand
Demand $100000
Nature of Suit 206 - Tax - Excise
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County
Terminated 10/2/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (32) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 30 Filed: 10/25/2005, Entered: 10/25/2005
NOTICE of Change of Address by Steven Harlan Becker. Service: 10/18/2005.(hw1, )
    LREF
    Blank 29 Filed: 10/2/2003, Entered: 10/31/2003 Stipulation of Dismissal
    STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice filed by all parties. Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(ii) this day. (dls)
      LREF
      Blank 28 Filed: 8/7/2003, Entered: 8/11/2003 Joint Status Report
      JOINT STATUS REPORT by all parties. Service: 8/6/03.(jcp, )
        LREF
        Blank 27 Filed: 4/9/2003, Entered: 4/15/2003 Joint Status Report
        JOINT STATUS REPORT by CONSOL OF KENTUCKY INC., et al. Service: 4/8/03. (lrd)
          LREF
          Blank 26 Filed: 7/1/2002, Entered: 7/2/2002 Status ReportCourt Filing
          JOINT STATUS REPORT by CONSOL OF KENTUCKY, CONSOL OF PENNSYLVAN, CONSOLIDATION COAL, GARDEN CREEK, ISLAND CREEK, LAUREL RUN MINING, MCELROY COAL COMPANY, NINEVAH COAL COMPANY, QUARTO MINING COMPAN. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 6/26/02 (JT)
            LREF
            Blank 25 Filed: 6/24/2002, Entered: 6/25/2002 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
            NOTICE of Certain Arguments that Plaintiffs intend to raise at the 6/24/02 hearing by CONSOL OF KENTUCKY. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 6/20/02 (JT)
              LREF
              Blank 24 Filed: 2/26/2002, Entered: 2/27/2002 Response
              SUR-REPLY by CONSOL OF KENTUCKY to reply file 1/7/02 by USA in 99-268T. Service: 2/25/02. (LTD)
                LREF
                Blank 23 Filed: 2/22/2002, Entered: 2/22/2002 Court Filing
                SCHEDULING ORDER setting Status Report due on 6/21/02 ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                  LREF
                  Blank 22 Filed: 2/21/2002, Entered: 2/21/2002
                  JOINT STATUS REPORT by CONSOL OF KENTUCKY, CONSOL OF PENNSYLVAN, CONSOLIDATION COAL, GARDEN CREEK, ISLAND CREEK, LAUREL RUN MINING, MCELROY COAL COMPANY, NINEVAH COAL COMPANY and QUARTO MINING COMPAN. Service: 2/20/02. (FE)
                    LREF
                    Blank 21 Filed: 1/8/2002, Entered: 1/9/2002 RemarkCourt Filing
                    PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO BRING RECENT DEVELOPMENTS TO THE COURT'S ATTENTION AND TO FILE A SHORT REPLY BRIEF. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                      LREF
                      Blank 20 Filed: 1/4/2002, Entered: 1/7/2002 Terminated:
                      MOTION by CONSOL OF KENTUCKY (Service: 1/4/02) for Leave to file a brief in response to Defendant's additional brief . Response due: 1/22/02. (LTD)
                        LREF
                        Blank 19 Filed: 11/2/2001, Entered: 11/5/2001 Statement of Genuine IssuesCourt Filing
                        STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by CONSOL OF KENTUCKY. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                          LREF
                          Blank 18 Filed: 11/2/2001, Entered: 11/5/2001 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                          RESPONSE by CONSOL OF KENTUCKY (Service: 10/22/01) to cross-motion filed in 99-268T by USA. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                            LREF
                            Blank 17 Filed: 10/25/2001, Entered: 10/31/2001 Status Report
                            JOINT STATUS REPORT by CONSOL OF KENTUCKY and USA. Service: (AB)
                              LREF
                              Blank 16 Filed: 8/31/2001, Entered: 8/31/2001
                              PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by CONSOL OF KENTUCKY, et al. Service: 8/31/01. (LTD)
                                LREF
                                Blank 15 Filed: 8/31/2001, Entered: 8/31/2001, Terminated: 10/2/2003 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                MOTION by CONSOL OF KENTUCKY (Service: 8/31/01) for Summary Judgment . Response due: 10/1/01. (LTD)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 14 Filed: 8/22/2001, Entered: 8/22/2001 Court Filing
                                  ORDER regarding further procedures ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 13 Filed: 8/16/2001, Entered: 8/16/2001, Terminated: 10/2/2003 Motion for Reconsideration
                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 8/16/01) for Reconsideration of [11-4] order , and for instructions whether an answer is needed to raise defenses, etc. . Response due: 9/4/01. (LTD)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 8/16/2001, Entered: 8/16/2001
                                      Deadline updated; Response to [13-1] motion for Reconsideration of [11-4] order and [13-2] motion for instructions whether an answer is needed to defenses, etc. reset to 9/4/01 . (LTD)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 12 Filed: 8/15/2001, Entered: 8/16/2001 Status Report
                                        STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 8/15/01. (FE)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 11 Filed: 8/7/2001, Entered: 8/8/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                          ORDER Plaintiff's Motion Filing deadline to 8/31/01 , Defendant's Response deadline to 10/1/01 , Plaintiff's Reply deadline to 10/15/01 and defendant's motion to notify other parties is denied (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 10 Filed: 7/26/2001, Entered: 7/26/2001 Court Filing
                                            SCHEDULING ORDER setting Status conference for 10:00 a.m. 8/2/01, in the National Courts Building, Washington, DC ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 9 Filed: 7/2/2001, Entered: 7/3/2001 ResponseCourt Filing
                                              RESPONSE by CONSOL OF KENTUCKY, CONSOL OF PENNSYLVAN, CONSOLIDATION COAL, GARDEN CREEK, ISLAND CREEK, LAUREL RUN MINING, MCELROY COAL COMPANY, NINEVAH COAL COMPANY and QUARTO MINING COMPAN to [7-1] report by USA, by leave of the Judge. Service: 6/26/01. (FE)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 8 Filed: 6/20/2001, Entered: 6/22/2001 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                Notice of reassignment to Judge Robert H. Hodges . Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 7 Filed: 6/19/2001, Entered: 6/20/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 6/19/01) for transfer of this case to Judge Hodges . Response due: 7/6/01. (FE)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 7 Filed: 6/19/2001, Entered: 6/20/2001 Status Report
                                                    STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 6/19/01. (FE)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 6 Filed: 6/2/1999, Entered: 6/7/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER denying [5-1] motion for reassignment to Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. and granting [5-2] motion to stay further proceedings (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 5 Filed: 6/1/1999, Entered: 6/4/1999, Terminated: 6/2/1999 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                        MOTION by CONSOL OF KENTUCKY, CONSOL OF PENNSYLVAN, CONSOLIDATION COAL, GARDEN CREEK, ISLAND CREEK, LAUREL RUN MINING, MCELROY COAL COMPANY, NINEVAH COAL COMPANY, QUARTO MINING COMPAN (Service : 5/28/99 ) for reassignment to Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. and to stay further proceedings. Response due: 6/14/99 (JT)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 4 Filed: 5/21/1999, Entered: 5/24/1999 Notice of Appearance/
                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Robert Charles Stoddart. Service: 5/21/99. (FE)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 3 Filed: 5/13/1999, Entered: 5/14/1999 Notice of Related Cases
                                                            NOTICE by CONSOL OF KENTUCKY, CONSOL OF PENNSYLVAN, CONSOLIDATION COAL, GARDEN CREEK, ISLAND CREEK, LAUREL RUN MINING, MCELROY COAL COMPANY, NINEVAH COAL COMPANY, QUARTO MINING COMPANY of related cases. (FE)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 2 Filed: 5/13/1999, Entered: 5/14/1999 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                              Notice of assignment to Sr. Judge James F. Merow. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 5/13/1999, Entered: 5/14/1999 Complaint
                                                                COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #047505. Answer due on 7/12/99. (FE)
                                                                  LREF

                                                                  Statistics

                                                                  This case has been viewed 175 times.

                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                  Space
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                   
                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                  Need Password Help?