CYPRUS AMAX COAL, et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:99-cv-00300-MMS
District Judge Margaret M. Sweeney, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo CYPRUS COAL AMAX COMPANY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker & McKenzie, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven Harlan Becker +1 212 626 4100 +1 212 626 4120 steven.h.becker@bakernet.com
No Logo CYPRUS CUMBERLAND RESOURCES CORP., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker & McKenzie, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven Harlan Becker +1 212 626 4100 +1 212 626 4120 steven.h.becker@bakernet.com
No Logo CYPRUS EMERALD RESOURCES CORP., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker & McKenzie, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven Harlan Becker +1 212 626 4100 +1 212 626 4120 steven.h.becker@bakernet.com
No Logo CYPRUS PLATEAU MINING CORPORATION, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker & McKenzie, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven Harlan Becker +1 212 626 4100 +1 212 626 4120 steven.h.becker@bakernet.com
No Logo CYPRUS WESTERN COAL COMPANY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker & McKenzie, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven Harlan Becker +1 212 626 4100 +1 212 626 4120 steven.h.becker@bakernet.com
No Logo TWENTYMILE COAL COMPANY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker & McKenzie, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven Harlan Becker +1 212 626 4100 +1 212 626 4120 steven.h.becker@bakernet.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Charles Stoddart +1 202 307 6445 robert.c.stoddart@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 5/13/1999
Jury Demand
Demand $100000
Nature of Suit 206 - Tax - Excise
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County
Terminated 3/8/2006
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (35) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 30 Filed: 3/8/2006, Entered: 3/13/2006 Stipulation of Dismissal
STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice, filed by all parties. Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(ii) this day. (mb2, )
    LREF
    Blank 29 Filed: 3/8/2006, Entered: 3/13/2006 Status Report
    STATUS REPORT, filed by USA. Service: 3/8/2006.(mb2, )
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 3/8/2006, Entered: 3/13/2006 Terminated Case - Public
      Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(ii) this day. (mb2, )
        LREF
        Blank 28 Filed: 2/9/2006, Entered: 2/13/2006 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
        STATUS REPORT ORDER: Status Report due by 3/9/2006. Signed by Judge Margaret M. Sweeney. (mb2, )
          LREF
          Blank 27 Filed: 1/9/2006, Entered: 1/12/2006 Notice of ReassignmentCourt Filing
          NOTICE of Reassignment. Case reassigned to Judge Margaret Sweeney for all further proceedings. Judge Lawrence M. Baskir no longer assigned to case. (dls )
            LREF
            Blank 26 Filed: 1/9/2006, Entered: 1/12/2006 Order Reassigning CaseCourt Filing
            ORDER reassigning case to Judge Margaret M. Sweeney. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (dls )
              LREF
              Blank 25 Filed: 10/25/2005, Entered: 10/25/2005
              NOTICE of Change of Address by Steven Harlan Becker. Service: 10/18/2005.(hw1, )
                LREF
                Blank 24 Filed: 12/1/2004, Entered: 12/7/2004 Joint Status Report
                JOINT STATUS REPORT by all parties. Service: 11/30/2004.(jcp, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 23 Filed: 8/3/2004, Entered: 8/6/2004 Status Report
                  JOINT STATUS REPORT by CYPRUS COAL AMAX COMPANY. Service: 8/2/04.(jat, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 22 Filed: 4/5/2004, Entered: 4/7/2004 Joint Status Report
                    JOINT STATUS REPORT by all parties. Service: 4/2/2004.(jcp, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 21 Filed: 12/5/2003, Entered: 12/10/2003 Joint Status Report
                      JOINT STATUS REPORT by all parties. Service: 12/5/03.(jcp, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 20 Filed: 8/7/2003, Entered: 8/11/2003 Joint Status Report
                        JOINT STATUS REPORT by all parties. Service: 8/6/03.(jcp, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 19 Filed: 4/9/2003, Entered: 4/15/2003 Joint Status Report
                          JOINT STATUS REPORT by CYPRUS COAL AMAX COMPANY, et al. Service: 4/8/03. (lrd)
                            LREF
                            Blank 18 Filed: 3/25/2003, Entered: 3/27/2003 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
                            STATUS REPORT ORDER; Joint Status Report due 4/11/2003. Signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. (lrd)
                              LREF
                              Blank 17 Filed: 6/27/2002, Entered: 6/28/2002 Status Report
                              JOINT STATUS REPORT by CYPRUS AMAX COAL, CYPRUS WESTERN COAL, CYPRUS CUMBERLAND, CYPRUS EMERALD, CYPRUS PLATEAU and TWENTYMILE COAL. Service: 6/26/02. (FE)
                                LREF
                                Blank 16 Filed: 2/21/2002, Entered: 2/21/2002
                                JOINT STATUS REPORT by CYPRUS AMAX COAL, CYPRUS WESTERN COAL, CYPRUS CUMBERLAND, CYPRUS EMERALD, CYPRUS PLATEAU and TWENTYMILE COAL. Service: 2/20/02. (FE)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 15 Filed: 10/25/2001, Entered: 10/31/2001 Status Report
                                  JOINT STATUS REPORT by CYPRUS AMAX COAL and USA. Service: (AB)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 14 Filed: 8/30/2001, Entered: 8/31/2001 Terminated:
                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 8/30/01) for instructions whether an answer is needed to raise defenses first made necessary by the denial of certiorari in Cyprus Amax (with status report). Response due: 9/17/01. (LTD)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 14 Filed: 8/30/2001, Entered: 8/31/2001 Status Report
                                      STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 8/30/01. (LTD)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 13 Filed: 6/28/2001, Entered: 6/28/2001 Court Filing
                                        RESPONSE by CYPRUS AMAX COAL, et al. to [12-1] status report by USA. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 6/26/01. (LTD)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 12 Filed: 6/19/2001, Entered: 6/20/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                          MOTION by USA (Service: 6/19/01) for transfer of this case to Judge Hodges . Response due: 7/6/01. (FE)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 12 Filed: 6/19/2001, Entered: 6/20/2001 Status Report
                                            STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 6/19/01. (FE)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 11 Filed: 3/23/2000, Entered: 3/27/2000 Status Report
                                              JOINT STATUS REPORT by CYPRUS AMAX COAL, CYPRUS WESTERN COAL, CYPRUS CUMBERLAND, CYPRUS EMERALD, CYPRUS PLATEAU, TWENTYMILE COAL. Service: 3/22/00 (JT)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 10 Filed: 8/10/1999, Entered: 8/13/1999 Transcript
                                                TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: Status Conference, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of July 12, 1999 . Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 9 Filed: 7/13/1999, Entered: 7/14/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER denying [6-1] motion for reassignment to Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr., granting [6-2] motion to stay further proceedings. The parties will advise the Court within 10 days of a decision by the Court of Appeals. ( signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 7/12/1999, Entered: 7/19/1999 Status Conference
                                                    Status Conference held ( Transcript due 8/11/99 ) (DS)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 8 Filed: 6/25/1999, Entered: 6/28/1999 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                      MEMORANDUM by USA re: the factual and legal bases of its planned motion to dismiss. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 6/24/99 (JT)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 7 Filed: 6/25/1999, Entered: 6/28/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER set telephonic status conference for 2:00 p.m., 7/12/99. ( signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank -- Filed: 6/24/1999, Entered: 6/28/1999 Status Conference
                                                          Status Conference set at 2:00 p.m. on 7/12/99 (DS)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 6 Filed: 6/1/1999, Entered: 6/4/1999, Terminated: 7/13/1999 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                            MOTION by CYPRUS AMAX COAL, CYPRUS WESTERN COAL, CYPRUS CUMBERLAND, CYPRUS EMERALD, CYPRUS PLATEAU, TWENTYMILE COAL (Service : 5/28/99 ) for reassignment to Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. and to stay further proceedings. Response due: 6/14/99 (JT)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 5 Filed: 5/25/1999, Entered: 5/26/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER re: Special Procedures (signed by Judge Lawrence M. Baskir). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 4 Filed: 5/21/1999, Entered: 5/24/1999 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Robert Charles Stoddart. Service: 5/21/99. (FE)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 5/13/1999, Entered: 5/14/1999 Notice of Related Cases
                                                                  NOTICE by CYPRUS AMAX COAL, CYPRUS WESTERN COAL, CYPRUS CUMBERLAND, CYPRUS EMERALD, CYPRUS PLATEAU, TWENTYMILE COAL of related cases. (FE)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 5/13/1999, Entered: 5/14/1999 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                    Notice of assignment to Judge Lawrence M. Baskir. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 5/13/1999, Entered: 5/14/1999 Complaint
                                                                      COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #047506. Answer due on 7/12/99. (FE)
                                                                        LREF

                                                                        Statistics

                                                                        This case has been viewed 188 times.

                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                        Space
                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                         
                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                        Need Password Help?