MOUNTAIN COAL, et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:99-cv-00301-RHH
District Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr., presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo CANYON FUEL COMPANY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker & McKenzie, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven Harlan Becker +1 212 626 4100 +1 212 626 4120 steven.h.becker@bakernet.com
No Logo MOUNTAIN COAL COMPANY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker & McKenzie, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven Harlan Becker +1 212 626 4100 +1 212 626 4120 steven.h.becker@bakernet.com
No Logo SKYLINE COAL COMPANY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker & McKenzie, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven Harlan Becker +1 212 626 4100 +1 212 626 4120 steven.h.becker@bakernet.com
No Logo SOLDIER CREEK COAL COMPANY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker & McKenzie, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven Harlan Becker +1 212 626 4100 +1 212 626 4120 steven.h.becker@bakernet.com
No Logo SOUTHERN UTAH FUEL COMPANY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker & McKenzie, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven Harlan Becker +1 212 626 4100 +1 212 626 4120 steven.h.becker@bakernet.com
No Logo THUNDER BASIN COAL COMPANY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker & McKenzie, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven Harlan Becker +1 212 626 4100 +1 212 626 4120 steven.h.becker@bakernet.com
No Logo UTAH FUEL COMPANY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker & McKenzie, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven Harlan Becker +1 212 626 4100 +1 212 626 4120 steven.h.becker@bakernet.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Charles Stoddart +1 202 307 6445 robert.c.stoddart@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 5/13/1999
Jury Demand
Demand $100000
Nature of Suit 206 - Tax - Excise
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County
Terminated 9/11/2008
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (48) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 9/11/2008, Entered: 9/12/2008 Terminated Case - Public
Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(i) this day. (bre, )
    LREF
    Blank 46 Filed: 6/6/2008, Entered: 6/8/2008 Stipulation of Dismissal
    STIPULATION of Partial Dismissal with prejudice, filed by CANYON FUEL COMPANY, USA. (dls)
      LREF
      Blank 45 Filed: 1/19/2007, Entered: 1/22/2007 Joint Status Report
      JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. Service: 1/19/2007.(mij, )
        LREF
        Blank 44 Filed: 1/5/2007, Entered: 1/5/2007 Court Filing
        ORDER concerning parties who have filed claims in this court for refund of excise taxes on coal production. Signed by Judge James F. Merow for Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (mij, )
          LREF
          Blank 43 Filed: 4/5/2006, Entered: 4/6/2006 Stipulation of Dismissal
          STIPULATION of Partial Dismissal, filed by all parties. (mb2, )
            LREF
            Blank 42 Filed: 10/24/2005, Entered: 10/24/2005
            NOTICE of Change of Address by Steven Harlan Becker. Service: 10/18/2005.(hw1, )
              LREF
              Blank 41 Filed: 6/16/2005, Entered: 6/21/2005 Joint Status Report
              JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by USA. Service: 6/16/2005.(mb2, )
                LREF
                Blank 40 Filed: 6/9/2005, Entered: 6/14/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER: Parties Shall Respond by 6/16/2005. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (mb2, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 39 Filed: 6/2/2005, Entered: 6/6/2005 Stipulation of Dismissal
                  STIPULATION for Partial Dismissal with prejudice by all parties. Service: 6/2/05.(dw1)
                    LREF
                    Blank 38 Filed: 2/25/2005, Entered: 2/28/2005 Joint Status Report
                    JOINT STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 2/25/2005.(mb2, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 37 Filed: 1/26/2005, Entered: 1/28/2005 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
                      STATUS REPORT ORDER: Status Report due by 2/25/2005. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (mb2, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 36 Filed: 1/21/2005, Entered: 1/25/2005 Joint Status Report
                        JOINT STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 01/21/05.(mb2, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 35 Filed: 1/11/2005, Entered: 1/13/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER issued to parties who have filed claims for refund of excise taxes on coal productions. Attorneys asked to respond no later than 2/21/05. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (eph, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 34 Filed: 12/1/2004, Entered: 12/7/2004 Joint Status Report
                            JOINT STATUS REPORT by all parties. Service: 11/30/2004.(jcp, )
                              LREF
                              Blank 33 Filed: 8/3/2004, Entered: 8/6/2004 Status Report
                              JOINT STATUS REPORT by MOUNTAIN COAL COMPANY. Service: 8/2/04.(jat, )
                                LREF
                                Blank 32 Filed: 4/5/2004, Entered: 4/7/2004 Joint Status Report
                                JOINT STATUS REPORT by all parties. Service: 4/2/2004.(jcp, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 31 Filed: 12/5/2003, Entered: 12/10/2003 Joint Status Report
                                  JOINT STATUS REPORT by all parties. Service: 12/5/03.(jcp, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 30 Filed: 8/7/2003, Entered: 8/11/2003 Joint Status Report
                                    JOINT STATUS REPORT by all parties. Service: 8/6/03.(jcp, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 29 Filed: 4/9/2003, Entered: 4/15/2003 Joint Status Report
                                      JOINT STATUS REPORT by CANYON FUEL COMPANY. Service: 4/8/03. (lrd)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 28 Filed: 7/1/2002, Entered: 7/2/2002 Status ReportCourt Filing
                                        JOINT STATUS REPORT by MOUNTAIN COAL, THUNDER BASIN COAL, CANYON FUEL, SKYLINE COAL, SOLDIER CREEK COAL, SOUTHERN UTAH FUEL, UTAH FUEL COMPANY. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 6/26/02 (JT)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 27 Filed: 6/24/2002, Entered: 6/25/2002 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                          NOTICE of Certain Arguments that Plaintiffs intend to raise at the 6/24/02 hearing by MOUNTAIN COAL. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 6/20/02 (JT)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 26 Filed: 2/26/2002, Entered: 2/27/2002 Response
                                            SUR-REPLY by MOUNTAIN COAL to reply filed 1/7/02 by USA in 99-268T. Service: 2/25/02. (LTD)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 25 Filed: 2/22/2002, Entered: 2/22/2002 Court Filing
                                              SCHEDULING ORDER setting Status Report due on 6/21/02 ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 24 Filed: 2/21/2002, Entered: 2/21/2002
                                                JOINT STATUS REPORT by MOUNTAIN COAL, THUNDER BASIN COAL, CANYON FUEL, SKYLINE COAL, SOLDIER CREEK COAL, SOUTHERN UTAH FUEL and UTAH FUEL COMPANY. Service: 2/20/02. (FE)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 23 Filed: 1/8/2002, Entered: 1/9/2002 RemarkCourt Filing
                                                  PLALINTIFF'S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO BRING RECENT DEVELOPMENTS TO THE COURT'S ATTENTION AND TO FILE A SHORT REPLY BRIEF. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 22 Filed: 1/4/2002, Entered: 1/7/2002 Terminated:
                                                    MOTION by MOUNTAIN COAL (Service: 1/4/02) for Leave to file a brief in response to Defendant's additional brief . Response due: 1/22/02. (LTD)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 21 Filed: 11/2/2001, Entered: 11/5/2001 Statement of Genuine IssuesCourt Filing
                                                      STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by MOUNTAIN COAL Service: 10/22/01. Filed by leave of the Judge. (FE)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 20 Filed: 11/2/2001, Entered: 11/5/2001 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                        RESPONSE by MOUNTAIN COAL (Service: 10/22/01 ) to cross motion filed in 99-268T by USA. Filed by leave of the Judge. (FE)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 19 Filed: 10/25/2001, Entered: 10/31/2001 Status Report
                                                          JOINT STATUS REPORT by MOUNTAIN COAL and USA. Service: (AB)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 18 Filed: 8/31/2001, Entered: 8/31/2001
                                                            PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by MOUNTAIN COAL. Service: 8/31/01. (LTD)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 17 Filed: 8/31/2001, Entered: 8/31/2001, Terminated: 9/11/2008 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                              MOTION by MOUNTAIN COAL (Service: 8/31/01) for Summary Judgment . Response due: 10/1/01. (LTD)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 16 Filed: 8/22/2001, Entered: 8/23/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER regarding further procedures ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 15 Filed: 8/16/2001, Entered: 8/16/2001, Terminated: 8/22/2001 Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 8/16/01) for Reconsideration of [13-4] order , and for instructions whether an answer is needed to raise defenses, etc. . Response due: 9/4/01. (LTD)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 8/16/2001, Entered: 8/16/2001
                                                                    Deadline updated; Response to [15-1] motion for Reconsideration of [13-4] order and [15-2] motion for instructions whether an answer is needed to defenses, etc. reset to 9/4/01 . (LTD)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 14 Filed: 8/15/2001, Entered: 8/16/2001 Status Report
                                                                      STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 8/15/01. (FE)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 13 Filed: 8/7/2001, Entered: 8/8/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER Plaintiff's Motion Filing deadline to 8/31/01 , Defendant's Response deadline to 10/1/01 , Plaintiff's Reply deadline to 10/15/01 and defendant's motion to notify other parties is denied (signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 12 Filed: 7/26/2001, Entered: 7/26/2001 Court Filing
                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER setting Status conference for 10:00 a.m. 8/2/01, in the National Courts Building, Washington, DC ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges). Copy to parties. parties. (FE)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 11 Filed: 7/2/2001, Entered: 7/3/2001 ResponseCourt Filing
                                                                            RESPONSE by MOUNTAIN COAL, THUNDER BASIN COAL, CANYON FUEL, SKYLINE COAL, SOLDIER CREEK COAL, SOUTHERN UTAH FUEL and UTAH FUEL COMPANY to [10-1] report by USA, by leave of the Judge. Service: 6/26/01. (FE)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 10 Filed: 6/19/2001, Entered: 6/20/2001 Status Report
                                                                              STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 6/19/01. (FE)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 9 Filed: 9/11/2000, Entered: 9/12/2000 Status Report
                                                                                STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 9/11/00. (FE)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 8 Filed: 8/16/2000, Entered: 8/18/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                  ORDER re: we have suspended most of the related coal cases until Defendant decides whether to apply for Supreme Court review. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 7 Filed: 6/8/1999, Entered: 6/9/1999 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                    Notice of reassignment to Judge Robert H. Hodges . Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 6 Filed: 6/8/1999, Entered: 6/9/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                      ORDER granting [5-1] motion for reassignment to Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr, granting [5-2] motion to stay further proceedings. ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 5 Filed: 6/1/1999, Entered: 6/4/1999, Terminated: 6/8/1999 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                        MOTION by MOUNTAIN COAL, THUNDER BASIN COAL, CANYON FUEL, SKYLINE COAL, SOLDIER CREEK COAL, SOUTHERN UTAH FUEL, UTAH FUEL COMPANY (Service : 5/28/99 ) for reassignment to Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr and to stay further proceedings. Response due: 6/14/99 (JT)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 4 Filed: 5/21/1999, Entered: 5/24/1999 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Robert Charles Stoddart. Service: 5/21/99. (FE)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 3 Filed: 5/13/1999, Entered: 5/14/1999 Notice of Related Cases
                                                                                            NOTICE by MOUNTAIN COAL, THUNDER BASIN COAL, CANYON FUEL, SKYLINE COAL, SOLDIER CREEK COAL, SOUTHERN UTAH FUEL, UTAH FUEL COMPANY of related cases. (FE)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 2 Filed: 5/13/1999, Entered: 5/14/1999 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                              Notice of assignment to Judge Christine O.C. Miller. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 5/13/1999, Entered: 5/14/1999 Complaint
                                                                                                COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #047507. Answer due on 7/12/99. (FE)
                                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 103 times.

                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                   
                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                  Need Password Help?