GREENBRIER COAL, et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:99-cv-00302-MBH
District Judge Marian Blank Horn, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ANR COAL COMPANY LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker & McKenzie, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven Harlan Becker +1 212 626 4100 +1 212 626 4120 steven.h.becker@bakernet.com
No Logo BROOKS RUN COAL COMPANY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker & McKenzie, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven Harlan Becker +1 212 626 4100 +1 212 626 4120 steven.h.becker@bakernet.com
No Logo GREENBRIER COAL COMPANY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker & McKenzie, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven Harlan Becker +1 212 626 4100 +1 212 626 4120 steven.h.becker@bakernet.com
No Logo KINGWOOD COAL COMPANY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker & McKenzie, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven Harlan Becker +1 212 626 4100 +1 212 626 4120 steven.h.becker@bakernet.com
No Logo VIRGINIA IRON, COAL AND COKE COMPANY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker & McKenzie, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven Harlan Becker +1 212 626 4100 +1 212 626 4120 steven.h.becker@bakernet.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Charles Stoddart +1 202 307 6445 robert.c.stoddart@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 5/13/1999
Jury Demand
Demand $100000
Nature of Suit 206 - Tax - Excise
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 12/3/2001
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (23) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 20 Filed: 10/24/2005, Entered: 10/24/2005
NOTICE of Change of Address by Steven Harlan Becker. Service: 10/18/2005.(hw1, )
    LREF
    Blank 19 Filed: 12/3/2001, Entered: 12/3/2001
    JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaint is dismissed, without prejudice. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD) Modified on 12/04/2001
      LREF
      Blank 18 Filed: 12/3/2001, Entered: 12/3/2001 Court Filing
      ORDER directing the the clerk to dismiss this suit without prejudice. ( signed by Sr. Judge Marian Blank Horn ) Copy to parties. (LD) Modified on 12/04/2001
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 12/3/2001, Entered: 12/3/2001
        Case closed (LD)
          LREF
          Blank 17 Filed: 11/30/2001, Entered: 12/4/2001 Response to Order to Show Cause
          Response to order to show cause by GREENBRIER COAL, et al. Service: 11/29/01 (DS)
            LREF
            Blank 16 Filed: 11/20/2001, Entered: 11/21/2001 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER stating that the order of 10/29/01 remains in force (signed by Sr. Judge Marian Blank Horn). Copy to parties. (LTD)
              LREF
              Blank 15 Filed: 11/8/2001, Entered: 11/9/2001 Terminated:
              RESPONSE by GREENBRIER COAL, BROOKS RUN COAL, KINGWOOD COAL, VIRGINA IRON, COAL and ANR COAL COMPANY LLC to [11-1] report by USA. Service: 11/7/01. (FE)
                LREF
                Blank 13 Filed: 10/29/2001, Entered: 10/30/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER Plaintiff's to show cause on 11/30/01 , and Plaintiff's Status Report due 11/9/01 (signed by Sr. Judge Marian Blank Horn). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                  LREF
                  Blank 14 Filed: 10/25/2001, Entered: 10/31/2001 Status Report
                  JOINT STATUS REPORT by GREENBRIER COAL and USA. Service: (AB)
                    LREF
                    Blank 12 Filed: 8/30/2001, Entered: 8/31/2001 Terminated:
                    MOTION by USA (Service: 8/30/01) for instructions whether an answer is needed to raise defenses first made necessary by the denial of certiorari in Cyprus Amax (with status report). Response due: 9/17/01. (LTD)
                      LREF
                      Blank 12 Filed: 8/30/2001, Entered: 8/31/2001 Status Report
                      STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 8/30/01. (LTD)
                        LREF
                        Blank 11 Filed: 6/19/2001, Entered: 6/20/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                        MOTION by USA (Service: 6/19/01) for transfer of this case to Judge Hodges . Response due: 7/6/01. (FE)
                          LREF
                          Blank 11 Filed: 6/19/2001, Entered: 6/20/2001 Status Report
                          STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 6/19/01. (FE)
                            LREF
                            Blank 10 Filed: 8/20/1999, Entered: 8/20/1999 Court Filing
                            REPLY by USA to response to [6-1] motion to dismiss. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 8/10/99 (JT)
                              LREF
                              Blank 9 Filed: 8/20/1999, Entered: 8/20/1999 Court Filing
                              ORDER directing the Clerk's Office to file Defendant's reply to response to motion to dismiss. ( signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                LREF
                                Blank 8 Filed: 8/17/1999, Entered: 8/18/1999 Terminated:
                                RESPONSE by GREENBRIER COAL, BROOKS RUN COAL, KINGWOOD COAL, VIRGINA IRON, COAL and ANR COAL COMPANY LLC (Service: 8/16/99) to [6-1] motion to Dismiss. Reply due: 8/26/99. (FE)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 7 Filed: 8/13/1999, Entered: 8/13/1999 Court Filing
                                  ORDER Plaintiff shall file copies of its opposition to Defendant's motion to dismiss by 8/19/99. The Clerk's Office did not previously receive the Plaintiffs' opposition. Set Notice of Compliance deadline to 8/26/99 for Defendant to reply to Plaintiffs' response. If Defendant chooses not to submit a new reply brief, Defendant shall notify the court so the previously-submitted reply may be filed. ( signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 6 Filed: 7/12/1999, Entered: 7/14/1999 Terminated:
                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 7/12/99) to Dismiss . Response due: 8/12/99. (FE)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 5 Filed: 6/1/1999, Entered: 6/4/1999 Terminated: Court Filing
                                      MOTION by GREENBRIER COAL, BROOKS RUN COAL, KINGWOOD COAL, VIRGINA IRON, COAL, ANR COAL COMPANY LLC (Service : 5/28/99 ) for reassignment to Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr. and to stay further proceedings. Response due: 6/14/99 (JT)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 4 Filed: 5/21/1999, Entered: 5/24/1999 Notice of Appearance/
                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Robert Charles Stoddart. Service: 5/21/99. (FE)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 3 Filed: 5/13/1999, Entered: 5/14/1999 Notice of Related Cases
                                          NOTICE by GREENBRIER COAL, BROOKS RUN COAL, KINGWOOD COAL, VIRGINA IRON, COAL, ANR COAL COMPANY LLC of related cases. (FE)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 2 Filed: 5/13/1999, Entered: 5/14/1999 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                            Notice of assignment to Judge Marian Blank Horn. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 1 Filed: 5/13/1999, Entered: 5/14/1999 Complaint
                                              COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #047508. Answer due on 7/12/99. (FE)
                                                LREF

                                                Statistics

                                                This case has been viewed 123 times.

                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                Space
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                 
                                                PlainSite
                                                Sign Up
                                                Need Password Help?