GOAD v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:99-cv-00311-RBA
District Judge Roger B. Andewelt, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ROLAND L. GOAD, Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kyle Eric Chadwick +1 202 616 0476 +1 202 305 7644 kyle.chadwick@usdoj.gov
No Logo MARY L. SINDERSON, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mary L. Sinderson +1 713 627 3606
Office COFC
Filed 5/17/1999
Jury Demand
Demand $143000
Nature of Suit 352 - Military Pay - Retirement
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 3/23/2000
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (46) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 37 Filed: 7/21/2000, Entered: 7/28/2000 CAFC Mandate Dismissing
MANDATE (certified copy) from CAFC dated July 21, 2000 dismissed [33-1] appeal by ROLAND L. GOAD. (HW)
    LREF
    Blank 36 Filed: 4/14/2000, Entered: 4/14/2000
    CORRECTED JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Order of 4/14/00 correcting the spelling of plaintiff's first name. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD)
      LREF
      Blank 35 Filed: 4/14/2000, Entered: 4/14/2000 Court Filing
      ORDER granting [34-1] motion to correct order of March 23, 2000, to reflect the correct spelling of plaintiff's name, and directing the clerk to amend the judgment entred on March 23, 2000, accordingly. ( signed by Judge Roger B. Andewelt ) Copy to parties. (LD)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 4/10/2000, Entered: 4/14/2000 CAFC Case Number
        CAFC Case Number Re: [33-1] appeal by ROLAND L. GOAD CAFC NUMBER: 00-5063 (HW)
          LREF
          Blank 34 Filed: 4/3/2000, Entered: 4/5/2000, Terminated: 4/14/2000 Terminated:
          MOTION, pursuant to RCFC 60(a), by ROLAND L. GOAD (Service: 3/27/00) to correct order of March 23, 2000, to reflect the correct spelling of plaintiff's name. Response due: 4/13/00 (DS)
            LREF
            Blank 33 Filed: 4/3/2000, Entered: 4/3/2000, Terminated: 7/21/2000 Notice of AppealCourt Filing
            NOTICE OF APPEAL by ROLAND L. GOAD. Copy to Defendant, Judge Roger B. Andewelt and to CAFC. FILING FEE $105.00; RECEIPT # 049367. (HW)
              LREF
              Blank 32 Filed: 3/23/2000, Entered: 3/23/2000
              JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaint is dismissed. No costs. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD)
                LREF
                Blank 31 Filed: 3/23/2000, Entered: 3/23/2000 Court Filing
                PUBLISHED DECISION granting [10-1] motion to dismiss in lieu of answer., denying [30-1] motion Third Rule 11 Suggestion For Sanctions, denying [29-1] motion to stay all further filings pending resolution of dispositive motions., denying [28-1] motion for sanctions., denying [26-1] motion for sanctions., denying [23-1] motion to Strike [21-1] motion for an order requiring the government to suspend payment of disputed amounts pending resolution of the issue by ROLAND L. GOAD, denying [21-1] motion for an order requiring the government to suspend payment of disputed amounts pending resolution of the issue, denying [16-1] motion to Strike [15-1] motion response by USA., denying [13-1] motion to Strike [12-1] motion for Sanctions by USA, [12-1] motion response by USA and [12-1] motion reply by USA denying [12-1] motion for Sanctions, denying [8-1] motion for Summary Judgment, and directing the clerk to enter judgment accordingly. No costs. ( signed by Judge Roger B. Andewelt ). Copy to parties. (LD)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 3/23/2000, Entered: 3/23/2000
                  Case closed (LD)
                    LREF
                    Blank 30 Filed: 3/21/2000, Entered: 3/23/2000 Terminated:
                    MOTION by ROLAND L. GOAD (Service: 3/16/00) Third Rule 11 Suggestion For Sanctions . Response due: 4/3/00. (FE)
                      LREF
                      Blank 29 Filed: 3/10/2000, Entered: 3/14/2000 Terminated:
                      RESPONSE by USA (Service: 3/10/00 ) to [28-1] motion for sanctions. Reply due: 3/27/00 (motion to stay included) (JT)
                        LREF
                        Blank 29 Filed: 3/10/2000, Entered: 3/14/2000 Terminated:
                        MOTION by USA (Service : 3/10/00 ) to stay all further filings pending resolution of dispositive motions. Response due: 3/27/00 (response to motion included) (JT)
                          LREF
                          Blank 28 Filed: 2/24/2000, Entered: 2/25/2000 Terminated:
                          MOTION by ROLAND L. GOAD (Service : 2/22/00 ) for sanctions. Response due: 3/10/00 (JT)
                            LREF
                            Blank 27 Filed: 2/7/2000, Entered: 2/9/2000 Terminated:
                            RESPONSE by USA (Service: 2/7/00 ) to [26-1] motion for sanctions. Reply due: 2/22/00 (JT)
                              LREF
                              Blank 26 Filed: 1/24/2000, Entered: 2/1/2000 Terminated:
                              MOTION by ROLAND L. GOAD (Service : 1/20/00 ) for sanctions. Response due: 2/7/00 (JT)
                                LREF
                                Blank 25 Filed: 1/18/2000, Entered: 1/18/2000 Court Filing
                                NOTICE of "Amendment to Texas Constitution" by ROLAND L. GOAD, by leave odf the Judge. Service: 12/28/99. (FE)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 24 Filed: 1/13/2000, Entered: 1/13/2000, Terminated: 3/23/2000 Response to Motion
                                  RESPONSE by USA (Service: 1/13/00) to [23-1] motion to Strike [21-1] motion for an order requiring the government to suspend payment of disputed amounts pending resolution of the issue by ROLAND L. GOAD. Reply due: 1/27/00. (FE)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 23 Filed: 1/4/2000, Entered: 1/4/2000, Terminated: 3/23/2000 Motion to Strike
                                    MOTION by ROLAND L. GOAD (Service: 12/28/99) to Strike [21-1] motion for an order requiring the government to suspend payment of disputed amounts pending resolution of the issue by ROLAND L. GOAD . Response due: 1/14/00. (FE)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 22 Filed: 12/16/1999, Entered: 12/21/1999 Terminated:
                                      RESPONSE by USA (Service: 12/16/99) to [21-1] motion for an order requiring the government to suspend payment of disputed amounts pending resolution of the issue. Reply due: 12/30/99. (FE)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 21 Filed: 12/6/1999, Entered: 12/8/1999 Terminated:
                                        MOTION by ROLAND L. GOAD (Service: 11/30/99) for an order requiring the government to suspend payment of disputed amounts pending resolution of the issue . Response due: 12/17/99. (FE)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 20 Filed: 11/1/1999, Entered: 11/4/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                          ORDER granting [19-1] motion to Withdraw [2-1] motion for Notice to Third Parties by ROLAND L. GOAD. ( signed by Judge Roger B. Andewelt ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 19 Filed: 10/12/1999, Entered: 10/15/1999, Terminated: 11/1/1999 Terminated:
                                            MOTION by ROLAND L. GOAD (Service : 10/5/99 ) to Withdraw [2-1] motion for Notice to Third Parties by ROLAND L. GOAD. Response due: 10/22/99 (JT)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank -- Filed: 10/12/1999, Entered: 10/15/1999 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                              Deadline updated; Defendant's response to [19-1] motion to Withdraw [2-1] motion for Notice to Third Parties by ROLAND L. GOAD reset to 10/22/99. (JT)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 18 Filed: 9/29/1999, Entered: 9/30/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                ORDER granting [14-1] motion to quash service of notice of suit (signed by Judge Roger B. Andewelt). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 17 Filed: 9/23/1999, Entered: 9/29/1999 Terminated:
                                                  RESPONSE by USA (Service: 9/23/99 ) to [16-1] motion to Strike [15-1] motion response by USA. Reply due: 10/8/99 (JT)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 16 Filed: 9/13/1999, Entered: 9/20/1999 Terminated:
                                                    MOTION by ROLAND L. GOAD (Service : 9/10/99 ) to Strike [15-1] motion response by USA. Response due: 9/27/99 (JT)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank -- Filed: 9/13/1999, Entered: 9/20/1999 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                      Deadline updated; Response to [16-1] motion to Strike [15-1] motion response by USA reset to 9/27/99. (JT)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 15 Filed: 9/2/1999, Entered: 9/3/1999 Terminated:
                                                        RESPONSE by USA (Service: 9/1/99) to [13-1] motion to Strike [12-1] motion for Sanctions by USA, [12-1] motion response by USA and [12-1] motion reply by USA. Reply due: 9/13/99. (FE)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 14 Filed: 8/27/1999, Entered: 8/30/1999, Terminated: 9/29/1999 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                          MOTION by MARY L. SINDERSON (Service : 8/4/99 ) to quash service of notice of suit. Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 8/23/99 (JT)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 13 Filed: 8/20/1999, Entered: 8/23/1999 Terminated:
                                                            MOTION by ROLAND L. GOAD (Service: 8/16/99) to Strike [12-1] motion for Sanctions by USA, [12-1] motion response by USA and [12-1] motion reply by USA . Response due: 9/20/99. (FE)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 12 Filed: 8/11/1999, Entered: 8/12/1999 Terminated:
                                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 8/11/99) for Sanctions . Response due: 8/30/99. (FE)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 12 Filed: 8/11/1999, Entered: 8/12/1999 Terminated:
                                                                RESPONSE by USA (Service: 8/11/99) to [8-1] motion for Summary Judgment. Reply due: 8/23/99. (FE)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 12 Filed: 8/11/1999, Entered: 8/12/1999 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                  REPLY by USA to response to [10-1] motion to dismiss in lieu of answer. Service: 8/11/99. (FE)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 11 Filed: 7/30/1999, Entered: 7/30/1999, Terminated: 3/23/2000 Response to Motion
                                                                    RESPONSE by ROLAND L. GOAD (Service: 7/27/99) to [10-1] motion to dismiss in lieu of answer. Reply due: 8/9/99. (FE)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 10 Filed: 7/30/1999, Entered: 7/30/1999, Terminated: 3/23/2000 Description not availableCourt Filing
                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 7/19/99 ) to dismiss in lieu of answer. Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 8/19/99 (JT)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 9 Filed: 7/28/1999, Entered: 7/28/1999
                                                                        NOTICE ISSUED this day and delivered to plaintiff for service. (DS)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 8 Filed: 7/26/1999, Entered: 7/26/1999, Terminated: 3/23/2000 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                          MOTION by ROLAND L. GOAD (Service : 7/22/99 ) for Summary Judgment. Response due: 8/23/99 (JT)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 7 Filed: 7/26/1999, Entered: 7/26/1999
                                                                            PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by ROLAND L. GOAD. Service: 7/22/99 (JT)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 6 Filed: 6/21/1999, Entered: 7/28/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                              ORDER granting [2-1] motion for Notice to Third Parties. ( signed by Judge Roger B. Andewelt ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 5 Filed: 6/18/1999, Entered: 6/22/1999 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                                INITIAL BRIEF by ROLAND L. GOAD. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 6/14/99 (JT)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 4 Filed: 6/7/1999, Entered: 6/9/1999 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Kyle Eric Chadwick. Service: 6/7/99. (FE)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 3 Filed: 5/19/1999, Entered: 5/20/1999 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                    Notice of assignment to Judge Roger B. Andewelt. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 2 Filed: 5/17/1999, Entered: 7/28/1999, Terminated: 6/21/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                      MOTION by ROLAND L. GOAD (Service : ) for Notice to Third Parties. Response due: 6/1/99 (DS)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 5/17/1999, Entered: 5/17/1999
                                                                                        COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #047513. Answer due on 7/16/99. (FE)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 5/17/1999, Entered: 5/17/1999
                                                                                          CASE assigned to Judge Unassigned. (FE)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 1/4/1999, Entered: 1/4/2000 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                            Deadline updated; Response to [23-1] motion to Strike [21-1] motion for an order requiring the government to suspend payment of disputed amounts pending resolution of the issue by ROLAND L. GOAD reset to 1/14/00 . (FE)
                                                                                              LREF

                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                              This case has been viewed 152 times.

                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                              Space
                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                               
                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                              Need Password Help?