JACOBSON v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:99-cv-00375-JFM
District Judge James F. Merow, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo TODD JACOBSON, Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven John Gillingham +1 202 616 2311 +1 202 353 7988 steve.gillingham@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 6/14/1999
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 352 - Military Pay - Retirement
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 3/9/2001
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (28) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 25 Filed: 3/9/2001, Entered: 12/12/2001 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
DUPLICATE ENTRY FOR STATISTICAL USE ONLY. (FE)
    LREF
    Blank 25 Filed: 3/9/2001, Entered: 3/12/2001 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
    Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal with prejudice by TODD JACOBSON and USA. Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41 (a)(1)(B). Copy to parties. (AB)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 3/9/2001, Entered: 3/12/2001 Terminated Case
      Case closed (AB)
        LREF
        Blank 24 Filed: 2/5/2001, Entered: 2/6/2001 Status Report
        STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 2/5/01. (FE)
          LREF
          Blank 23 Filed: 11/15/2000, Entered: 11/17/2000 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER denying [21-1] motion to lift the stay of proceedings, denying [21-2] motion to return to the administrative record to this court. The procedure set forth in the 9/6/00 Order shall remain in effect. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (JT)
            LREF
            Blank 22 Filed: 11/7/2000, Entered: 11/8/2000 Status ReportCourt Filing
            STATUS REPORT by USA. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 11/6/00 (JT) Modified on 11/08/2000
              LREF
              Blank 21 Filed: 11/1/2000, Entered: 11/3/2000, Terminated: 11/15/2000 Terminated:
              MOTION by TODD JACOBSON (Service: 11/1/00) to lift the stay of proceedings , and to return to the administrative record to this court . Response due: 11/20/00 (DS)
                LREF
                Blank 20 Filed: 9/6/2000, Entered: 9/7/2000 Status Report
                STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 9/1/00. (FE)
                  LREF
                  Blank 19 Filed: 9/6/2000, Entered: 9/7/2000 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                  SCHEDULING ORDER setting Status Report due on 11/6/00 and every 90 days thereafter (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (FE)
                    LREF
                    Blank 18 Filed: 7/18/2000, Entered: 7/21/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                    ORDER re: proceedings shall remain suspended. Set Status Report deadline to 9/1/00 or within 7 days of the Board's ruling, whichever occurs sooner. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                      LREF
                      Blank 17 Filed: 7/17/2000, Entered: 7/19/2000 Status Report
                      STATUS REPORT by USA Service: 7/17/00 (FE)
                        LREF
                        Blank 16 Filed: 6/2/2000, Entered: 6/7/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER continuing the stay of proceedings and set Status Report(s) deadline to 7/17/00 or within seven days of the Board's ruling. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                          LREF
                          Blank 15 Filed: 6/1/2000, Entered: 6/2/2000 Status Report
                          STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 6/1/00 (DS)
                            LREF
                            Blank 14 Filed: 3/2/2000, Entered: 3/6/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                            ORDER continuing the suspension of proceedings and set status report deadline to 30 days after the ABCMR issues its decision or 6/1/00. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                              LREF
                              Blank 13 Filed: 3/1/2000, Entered: 3/2/2000 Status Report
                              STATUS REPORT by USA Service: 3/1/00 (FE)
                                LREF
                                Blank 12 Filed: 11/1/1999, Entered: 11/4/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                ORDER granting [11-1] motion to stay proceedings. A status report shall be filed within 30 days after the ABCMR issues its decision. Absent a status report pursuant to the above, set Status Report deadline to 3/1/00. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 11 Filed: 10/28/1999, Entered: 11/1/1999, Terminated: 11/1/1999 Terminated:
                                  MOTION by USA (Service : 10/28/99 ) to stay proceedings. Response due: 11/15/99 (JT)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 10 Filed: 10/20/1999, Entered: 10/25/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                    ORDER returning, to Wade A. Jacobson, as unfiled the motion received on 10/15/99 for failure to comply with Rule 81(d). ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 9 Filed: 9/30/1999, Entered: 10/4/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                      ORDER returning as unfiled the Notice of Appearance received on 9/24/99. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 8 Filed: 9/28/1999, Entered: 9/29/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                        ORDER granting [7-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the amended complaint Answer deadline to 11/2/99 (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 7 Filed: 9/24/1999, Entered: 9/29/1999, Terminated: 9/28/1999 Terminated:
                                          MOTION by USA (Service: 9/24/99) to Extend Time to respond to the amended complaint , (until November 2, 1999). (FE)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 6 Filed: 8/30/1999, Entered: 8/31/1999 Amended Complaint
                                            AMENDED COMPLAINT by TODD JACOBSON (Answer due 9/24/99 ) amending [1-1] complaint. Service: 8/30/99 (JT)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 5 Filed: 8/17/1999, Entered: 8/17/1999 Court Filing
                                              ORDER granting [4-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint Answer deadline to 9/24/99 (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 4 Filed: 8/13/1999, Entered: 8/16/1999, Terminated: 8/17/1999 Terminated:
                                                MOTION by USA (Service: 8/13/99) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint , (until September 24, 1999). (FE)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 7/8/1999, Entered: 7/9/1999 Notice of Appearance/
                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Steven John Gillingham. Service : 7/8/99 (JT)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 6/16/1999, Entered: 6/17/1999 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                    Notice of assignment to Sr. Judge James F. Merow. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 6/14/1999, Entered: 6/14/1999
                                                      COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #047661. Answer due on 8/13/99. (FE)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 6/14/1999, Entered: 6/14/1999
                                                        CASE assigned to Judge Unassigned. (FE)
                                                          LREF

                                                          Statistics

                                                          This case has been viewed 191 times.

                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                          Space
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                           
                                                          PlainSite
                                                          Sign Up
                                                          Need Password Help?