BELL v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:99-cv-00420-LSM
District Judge Lawrence S. Margolis, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo AUSTIN D. BELL, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark L. Waple +1 910 864 3737
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory Thomas Jaeger +1 202 353 7955 +1 202 353 7988 gregory.jaeger@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 7/1/1999
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 346 - Military Pay - Correct/Reinstate
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 7/3/2001
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (32) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 27 Filed: 8/29/2001, Entered: 9/10/2001 CAFC Mandate Dismissing
MANDATE (certified copy) from CAFC dated August 29, 2001 dismissed [26-1] appeal by AUSTIN D. BELL. (HW)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 7/18/2001, Entered: 7/18/2001
    CAFC Case Number Re: [26-1] appeal by AUSTIN D. BELL CAFC NUMBER: 01-5127. (HW)
      LREF
      Blank 26 Filed: 7/16/2001, Entered: 7/16/2001, Terminated: 8/29/2001 Notice of AppealCourt Filing
      NOTICE OF APPEAL by AUSTIN D. BELL. Copy to Judge Margolis, Defendant and to CAFC. Fee not included. (HW)
        LREF
        Blank 25 Filed: 7/3/2001, Entered: 7/5/2001 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER denying [20-1] motion for Leave to file Declaration and Enclosures (signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (FE)
          LREF
          Blank 24 Filed: 7/3/2001, Entered: 7/3/2001
          JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that judgment is entered for the government and the complaint is dismissed. No costs. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD)
            LREF
            Blank 23 Filed: 7/3/2001, Entered: 7/3/2001 Court Filing
            UNPUBLISHED DECISION granting [9-2] motion for judgment upon the administrative record., denying [9-1] motion to dismiss, denying [12-1] cross motion and directing the clerk shall enter judgment for the government. No costs. ( signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ). Copy to parties. (LD)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 7/3/2001, Entered: 7/3/2001
              Case closed (LD)
                LREF
                Blank 22 Filed: 6/21/2001, Entered: 6/22/2001 Reply to Response to Motion
                REPLY by AUSTIN D. BELL to response to [20-1] motion for Leave to file Declaration and Enclosures. Service: 6/20/01. (LTD)
                  LREF
                  Blank 21 Filed: 6/11/2001, Entered: 6/12/2001 Terminated:
                  RESPONSE by USA (Service: 6/11/01 ) to [20-1] motion for Leave to file Declaration and Enclosures. Reply due: 6/25/01 (DS)
                    LREF
                    Blank 20 Filed: 5/24/2001, Entered: 5/29/2001, Terminated: 7/3/2001 Terminated:
                    MOTION by AUSTIN D. BELL, et al. (Service: 5/23/01) for Leave to file Declaration and Enclosures . Response due: 6/11/01. (LTD)
                      LREF
                      Blank 19 Filed: 12/14/2000, Entered: 12/15/2000 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                      SCHEDULING ORDER setting Settlement conference for 11:00 a.m. 12/20/00 (signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (FE)
                        LREF
                        Blank 18 Filed: 10/31/2000, Entered: 11/2/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER set telephonic Status Conference for 2:30 p.m., 10/31/00. ( signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                          LREF
                          Blank 17 Filed: 10/10/2000, Entered: 10/10/2000
                          TRANSCRIPT of proceedings 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of October 5, 2000. Notice to parties. (FE)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 10/5/2000, Entered: 10/5/2000
                            Oral Argument re: [12-1] cross motion by AUSTIN D. BELL, [9-1] motion to dismiss by USA, [9-2] motion for judgment upon the administrative record by USA ( Transcript due 10/10/00 ) (DS)
                              LREF
                              Blank 16 Filed: 8/30/2000, Entered: 9/1/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                              ORDER oral argument set for 10:00 a.m., 10/5/00 for [12-1] cross motion, [9-1] motion to dismiss, [9-2] motion for judgment upon the administrative record. ( signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                LREF
                                Blank 15 Filed: 2/23/2000, Entered: 2/24/2000 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                REPLY by USA to response to [9-1] motion to dismiss, [9-2] motion for judgment upon the administrative record, by leave of the Judge. Service: 2/22/00. (FE)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 14 Filed: 2/10/2000, Entered: 2/13/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                  ORDER granting [13-1] motion to Extend Time to reply to response to motion to dismiss and respond to Plaintiff's cross-motion. Defendant's reply to response to motion reset to 2/22/00 for [9-1] motion to dismiss and response to [12-1] cross motion reset to 2/22/00. ( signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 13 Filed: 2/7/2000, Entered: 2/10/2000, Terminated: 2/10/2000 Terminated:
                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 2/7/00 ) to Extend Time to reply to response to motion to dismiss and respond to Plaintiff's cross-motion [until February 22, 2000]. Response due: 2/24/00 (JT)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 12 Filed: 1/6/2000, Entered: 1/6/2000, Terminated: 7/3/2001 Response to Motion
                                      RESPONSE by AUSTIN D. BELL (Service: 1/5/00 ) to [9-1] motion to dismiss. Reply due: 2/7/00 (cross-motion included) (JT)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 12 Filed: 1/6/2000, Entered: 1/6/2000, Terminated: 7/3/2001 Cross Motion
                                        CROSS MOTION by AUSTIN D. BELL ( Service: 1/5/00 ) and RESPONSE to [9-2] motion for judgment upon the administrative record by USA. Response due: 2/7/00 (response to motion to dismiss included) (JT) Modified on 01/06/2000
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 1/6/2000, Entered: 1/6/2000
                                          Deadline updated; Defendant's response to [12-1] cross motion reset to 2/7/00. (JT)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 11 Filed: 12/13/1999, Entered: 12/16/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                            ORDER granting [8-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint. Reset Answer deadline to 12/6/99. ( signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 10 Filed: 12/10/1999, Entered: 12/14/1999 Administrative RecordCourt Filing
                                              Administrative record filed by USA. Filed by leave of the Judge. (JT)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 9 Filed: 12/10/1999, Entered: 12/14/1999 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 12/6/99 ) to dismiss or, in the alternative, for judgment upon the administrative record. Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 1/6/00 (JT)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 8 Filed: 11/22/1999, Entered: 11/24/1999, Terminated: 12/13/1999 Terminated:
                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 11/22/99) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint , (until December 6, 1999). (FE)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 7 Filed: 10/28/1999, Entered: 11/1/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER granting [6-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint. Reset Answer deadline to 11/22/99. ( signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 6 Filed: 10/20/1999, Entered: 10/25/1999, Terminated: 10/28/1999 Terminated:
                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 10/20/99 ) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint [until November 22, 1999]. Response due: 11/8/99 (JT)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 5 Filed: 9/1/1999, Entered: 9/2/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER granting [4-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint. Reset Answer deadline to 10/21/99. ( signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 4 Filed: 8/27/1999, Entered: 8/30/1999, Terminated: 9/1/1999 Terminated:
                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 8/27/99 ) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint [until October 21, 1999]. Response due: 9/13/99 (JT)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 3 Filed: 8/2/1999, Entered: 8/3/1999 Notice of Appearance/
                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Gregory Thomas Jaeger. Service : 8/2/99 (JT)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 2 Filed: 7/1/1999, Entered: 7/2/1999 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                              Notice of assignment to Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 7/1/1999, Entered: 7/2/1999 Complaint
                                                                COMPLAINT (Filed with Exhibits 1 through 12), FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #047763. Answer due on 8/30/99. (FE)
                                                                  LREF

                                                                  Statistics

                                                                  This case has been viewed 194 times.

                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                  Space
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                   
                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                  Need Password Help?