BOSTON EDISON COMPANY v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:99-cv-00447-CFL
District Judge Charles F. Lettow, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Boston Edison Company, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by THE KULLMAN FIRM

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Layton Jager Smith, Jr. +1 601 368 5572 +1 601 368 5816 jsmith83@entergy.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alan J. Lo Re +1 202 307 0226 alan.lo.re@usdoj.gov
No Logo Consolidated Edison Company of New York, Inc., Movant
Office COFC
Filed 7/12/1999
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 536 - Spent Nuclear Fuel
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Judgment
County None
Terminated 2/15/2008
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags APPEAL, BOC, CLOSED, ECF, SNF
  Entries (429) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 399 Filed: 7/24/2008, Entered: 7/24/2008
CERTIFIED TRANSCRIPT OF JUDGMENT, forwarded to Layton Jager Smith, Jr. See letter in file. (bre, )
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 7/15/2008, Entered: 7/16/2008 Remark
    Remark - Certified Transcript of Judgment dated February 19, 2008 returned and destroyed. (lld)
      LREF
      Legal Document 398 Filed: 7/7/2008, Entered: 7/7/2008
      AMENDED JUDGMENT directed as provided in Rule 54(b), that the plaintiff, Boston Edison, recover of and from the United States damages in the sum of $40,030,000.00. Boston Edison is awarded costs of suit. This judgment shall be effective nunc pro tunc as of February 15, 2008. (lld)
        LREF
        Legal Document 397 Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: 7/3/2008 Court Filing
        ORDER. The Clerk is directed to enter the judgment dated February 15, 2008 as a final judgment nunc pro tunc, effective as of February 15, 2008, pursuant to RCFC 54(b). Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (lnb)
          LREF
          Legal Document 396 Filed: 6/27/2008, Entered: 6/27/2008, Terminated: 7/3/2008 ~Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b)
          MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b), filed by USA. Response due by 7/14/2008.(Lester, Harold) Modified on 6/29/2008 to correct response due date. (dls).
            LREF
            Legal Document 395 Filed: 6/27/2008, Entered: 6/27/2008, Terminated: 7/3/2008 ~Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b)
            MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b), filed by BOSTON EDISON COMPANY. Response due by 7/14/2008. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Conway, Richard) Modified on 6/29/2008 to correct response due date. (dls).
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 6/27/2008, Entered: 6/29/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
              Reset Deadlines: Responses to [395] and [396] Motions for entry of judgment due by 7/14/2008. (dls)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 5/5/2008, Entered: 5/21/2008 CAFC Appeal Fees
                CAFC Appeal Fees received $5, receipt number 068067 re [394] Notice of Appeal filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR GENERATION COMPANY. (hw1, )
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 394 Filed: 4/24/2008, Entered: 4/24/2008
                  NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR GENERATION COMPANY. Partial filing fee of $ 450.00 ($5.00 due), receipt number 068025. Copies to judge, opposing party and CAFC. (hw1, )
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 393 Filed: 4/15/2008, Entered: 4/16/2008 Notice of Appeal
                    NOTICE OF APPEAL, filed by USA. Copies to judge, opposing party and CAFC. (hw1, )
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 392 Filed: 4/14/2008, Entered: 4/14/2008 Court Filing
                      ORDER granting [391] defendant's Motion for Clarification. Defendant shall have until 28 days after the date on which final judgment in this case becomes no longer appealable or susceptible to review to file its response to Boston Edison Company's bill of costs. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (lnb)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 391 Filed: 4/8/2008, Entered: 4/8/2008, Terminated: 4/14/2008 Motion for Clarification
                        Unopposed MOTION for Clarification of [390] Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,, filed by USA.(Bryan, Patrick)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 390 Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: 4/4/2008 Court Filing
                          ORDER granting [389] joint motion by defendant and plaintiff Boston Edison Company for an enlargement of time for defendant to file its response to Boston Edison Company's bill of costs. Defendant shall file its response on or before 5/23/08. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (lnb)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: 4/7/2008 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                            Set Deadlines/Hearings: Objection to Bill of Costs due by 5/13/2008. (dw1)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 389 Filed: 4/3/2008, Entered: 4/3/2008, Terminated: 4/4/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                              Joint MOTION For An Enlargement Of Time For Defendant To Respond To Plaintiff Boston Edison Company's Bill Of Costs, filed by USA.(Bryan, Patrick)
                                LREF
                                Sealed Legal Document 388 Filed: 3/27/2008, Entered: 3/27/2008
                                **SEALED** Cumulative Index for TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-25) held on June 4, 2007 through June 20, 2007. See attached lists of exhibits filed by the parties. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit # (2) Exhibit # (3) Exhibit) (dw1)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 387 Filed: 3/17/2008, Entered: 3/17/2008
                                  BILL OF COSTS, filed by BOSTON EDISON COMPANY.Objection to Bill of Costs due by 4/17/2008 (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support of Bill of Costs# (2) Appendix A, Part I# (3) Appendix A, Part II# (4) Appendix A, Part III)(Conway, Richard)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 386 Filed: 2/25/2008, Entered: 3/11/2008 Certified Transcript to Attorney
                                    CERTIFIED TRANSCRIPT OF JUDGMENT forwarded to Layton Jager Smith, Jr. See letter in file. (bre, )
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 385 Filed: 2/20/2008, Entered: 2/20/2008 Court Filing
                                      PUBLISHED OPINION showing redactions from version previously filed under seal. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (lnb)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 384 Filed: 2/20/2008, Entered: 2/20/2008
                                        RESPONSE to [380] Unpublished Opinion/Order,, filed by BOSTON EDISON COMPANY. (Conway, Richard)
                                          LREF
                                          Sealed Legal Document 383 Filed: 2/20/2008, Entered: 2/20/2008
                                          **SEALED**NOTICE, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR GENERATION COMPANY of Proposed Redactions (Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 382 Filed: 2/20/2008, Entered: 2/20/2008
                                            RESPONSE to Defendant's Response To Court Order, Dated February 15, 2008, Regarding Proposed Redactions, filed by USA. (Bryan, Patrick)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 381 Filed: 2/15/2008, Entered: 2/15/2008
                                              JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that plaintiff, Boston Edison, recover of and from the United States damages in the sum of $40,030,000.00. Boston Edison is awarded costs of suit. (lld)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 380 Filed: 2/15/2008, Entered: 2/15/2008 Court Filing
                                                OPINION and ORDER for Judgment Issued UNDER SEAL. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment for Boston Edison and against the United States in the amount of $40,030,000. Boston Edison is awarded costs of suit. On or before February 20, 2008, the parties are requested to submit proposed redactions of any confidential or proprietary information that may be set out in this decision rendered under seal. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (lnb)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document 379 Filed: 11/27/2007, Entered: 11/29/2007 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-212) held on November 8, 2007 before Judge Charles F. Lettow. (dw1)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Sealed Legal Document 378 Filed: 11/6/2007, Entered: 11/6/2007
                                                    **SEALED**POST TRIAL BRIEF In Reply, filed by BOSTON EDISON COMPANY. (Conway, Richard)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 377 Filed: 11/2/2007, Entered: 11/2/2007 Court Filing
                                                      ORDER granting [376] plaintiff Boston Edison's motion for leave to file under seal and electronically its post-trial brief. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (lnb)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 376 Filed: 11/2/2007, Entered: 11/2/2007, Terminated: 11/2/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                                        MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal, Electronically, a Copy of "Plaintiff Boston Edison Company's Post-Trial Reply Brief", filed by BOSTON EDISON COMPANY.Response due by 11/19/2007.(Conway, Richard)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Sealed Legal Document 375 Filed: 10/23/2007, Entered: 10/23/2007
                                                          **SEALED**POST TRIAL BRIEF, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR GENERATION COMPANY. (Chu, Jack)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 374 Filed: 10/22/2007, Entered: 10/22/2007 Court Filing
                                                            ORDER granting [373] Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal Electronically. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (lnb)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 373 Filed: 10/22/2007, Entered: 10/22/2007, Terminated: 10/22/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                                              MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal Electronically, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR GENERATION COMPANY.Response due by 11/8/2007.(Chu, Jack)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Sealed Legal Document 372 Filed: 10/10/2007, Entered: 10/10/2007
                                                                **SEALED**POST TRIAL BRIEF, filed by USA. (Gardner, Joshua)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 371 Filed: 10/2/2007, Entered: 10/2/2007 Court Filing
                                                                  ORDER granting [370] Motion to Amend Scheduling Order [364] of June 22, 2007. The court adopts the following revised schedule for post-trial briefing and argument: government's post-trial responsive brief is due 10/10/2007; Entergy's post-trial responsive brief is due 10/23/2007; Boston Edison's post-trial reply is due 11/6/2007; and closing argument will be held on 11/8/2007 at 10 a.m. at the National Courts Building in Washington, D.C. before Judge Charles F. Lettow. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (lnb)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 370 Filed: 10/1/2007, Entered: 10/1/2007, Terminated: 10/2/2007 Motion to Amend Schedule
                                                                    Unopposed MOTION to Amend Schedule re: [364] Scheduling Order,, filed by USA.Response due by 10/18/2007.(Bryan, Patrick)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 369 Filed: 8/23/2007, Entered: 8/23/2007
                                                                      **SEALED**POST TRIAL BRIEF, filed by BOSTON EDISON COMPANY. (Conway, Richard)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 368 Filed: 8/21/2007, Entered: 8/21/2007 Court Filing
                                                                        ORDER granting [367] Motion for Leave to File post-trial brief under seal electronically. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (bpc)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 367 Filed: 8/20/2007, Entered: 8/20/2007, Terminated: 8/21/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal, Electronically, a Copy of Boston Edison Company's Post-Trial Brief, filed by BOSTON EDISON COMPANY.Response due by 9/7/2007.(Conway, Richard)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 366 Filed: 8/7/2007, Entered: 8/7/2007 Court Filing
                                                                            ORDER RETURNING UNFILED: Motion to intervene received 7/24/2007 from William Peterson. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (rhb, )
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 365 Filed: 8/1/2007, Entered: 8/1/2007 Court Filing
                                                                              ORDER denying [361] Application for Access to Protected Material filed by CONSOLIDATED EDISON COMPANY OF NEW YORK, INC. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (bpc)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 364 Filed: 6/22/2007, Entered: 6/22/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER: Boston Edisons Post Trial Brief due 8/23/2007; the government's Post Trial Response Brief due 10/4/2007; Entergys post-trial responsive brief due 10/17/2007; Boston Edisons Post Trial Reply due 10/31/2007; and Closing Argument set for 11/2/2007, at 10 a.m. at the National Courts Building in Washington, D.C. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (bpc)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 363 Filed: 6/21/2007, Entered: 6/21/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 3517-4086) held on June 18, 2007 through June 20, 2007 before Judge Charles F. Lettow. The June 19, 2007 transcript was also filed with a CLOSED SESSION version. (dw1)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 6/20/2007, Entered: 6/20/2007
                                                                                    Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 7/5/2007. (vp1, )
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 362 Filed: 6/18/2007, Entered: 6/19/2007 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1726-3516) held on June 11, 2007 through June 15, 2007 before Judge Charles F. Lettow. The transcripts dated June 11, 2007 and June 14-15, 2007 have been filed with closed versions. (dw1)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 361 Filed: 6/14/2007, Entered: 6/14/2007, Terminated: 8/1/2007
                                                                                        APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Consolidated Edison, filed by CONSOLIDATED EDISON COMPANY OF NEW YORK, INC.,. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Robertson, Cynthia)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 360 Filed: 6/11/2007, Entered: 6/11/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-1725) held on June 4, 2007 through June 8, 2007 before Judge Charles F. Lettow. The transcript dated June 7, 2007 was also filed with a CLOSED SESSION version. (dw1)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 359 Filed: 6/8/2007, Entered: 6/8/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                            ORDER denying [344] Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (bpc)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 358 Filed: 6/6/2007, Entered: 6/6/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                              ORDER granting [353] Motion for Leave to File an amended exhibit list; granting [354] Motion for leave to designate prior trial testimony; granting [355] Motion for leave to submit a revised exhibit list. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (bpc)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 357 Filed: 6/5/2007, Entered: 6/5/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-88) held on May 29, 2007 before Judge Charles F. Lettow. (dw1)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 356 Filed: 6/4/2007, Entered: 6/4/2007
                                                                                                  STIPULATION, filed by all parties. (Finn, Stephen)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 355 Filed: 6/3/2007, Entered: 6/3/2007, Terminated: 6/6/2007 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION Motion To Submit Revised Exhibit List, filed by USA.Response due by 6/21/2007.(Bryan, Patrick)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document 354 Filed: 6/3/2007, Entered: 6/3/2007, Terminated: 6/6/2007 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION Motion For Leave To Designate Prior Trial Testimony, filed by USA.Response due by 6/21/2007.(Bryan, Patrick)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 353 Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: 6/1/2007, Terminated: 6/6/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Exhibit List, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR GENERATION COMPANY.Response due by 6/18/2007.(Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 352 Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: 6/1/2007
                                                                                                          NOTICE, filed by USA re [344] MOTION to Strike [320] Notice (Other), [326] Notice (Other) Plaintiffs' Joint Notice Of Deposition & Trial Testimony Designations, [320] Notice (Other), [326] Notice (Other) Notice Of Filing Of Defendant's Specific Objections To The Deposition And Prior Trial Testimony That Plaintiffs Seek To Designate And Defendant's Listing Of Counter-Designations (Bryan, Patrick)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 351 Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: 6/1/2007
                                                                                                            RESPONSE to [344] MOTION to Strike [320] Notice (Other), [326] Notice (Other) Plaintiffs' Joint Notice Of Deposition & Trial Testimony Designations, filed by BOSTON EDISON COMPANY, ENTERGY NUCLEAR GENERATION COMPANY.Reply due by 6/15/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (Responses to Interrogatories Nos. 36, 43, 45, 50)# (2) Exhibit B (Yankee opinion)# (3) Exhibit C (NSP Transcript Excerpt)# (4) Exhibit D (Response to Interrogatory No. 7)# (5) Exhibit E (Responses to Supplemental Interrogatories Nos. 77, 78, 79, 80, 81))(Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 350 Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: 6/1/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER denying [299] Motion in Limine to exclude the testimony of the governments expert witness, Mr. Warren K. Brewer; denying [302] Motion in Limine to exclude the testimony of Boston Edisons expert witness, Mr. Robert B. Hevert. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (bpc)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 349 Filed: 5/31/2007, Entered: 6/1/2007 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-42) held on May 15, 2007 before Judge Charles F. Lettow. (dw1)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 348 Filed: 5/31/2007, Entered: 5/31/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER denying [303] Motion in Limine seeking to exclude, in part, the testimony of Boston Edison Companys expert witness, Mr. John J. Reed. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (bpc)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 347 Filed: 5/31/2007, Entered: 5/31/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER denying [297] Motion in Limine to exclude testimony by the governments witnesses, Mr. David Zabransky and Mr. Robert Morgan, regarding Article XIV of the Standard Contract. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (bpc)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 346 Filed: 5/30/2007, Entered: 5/30/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [323] Motion for Leave to serve a trial subpoena on Mr. Jack D. Harrington. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (bpc)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 345 Filed: 5/29/2007, Entered: 5/29/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                        PRETRIAL ORDER for trial scheduled for June 4-20, 2007, at the National Courts Building in Washington, D.C. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (bpc)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 344 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: 5/25/2007, Terminated: 6/8/2007 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                          MOTION to Strike [320] Notice (Other), [326] Notice (Other) Plaintiffs' Joint Notice Of Deposition & Trial Testimony Designations, filed by USA.Response due by 6/8/2007.(Bryan, Patrick)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 343 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: 5/25/2007
                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to [297] MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony by the Government Regarding Article XIV of the Standard Contract, Including the Testimony of Defendant's Witnesses, Mr. David Zabransky and Mr. Robert Morgan, filed by USA.Reply due by 6/6/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix)(Bryan, Patrick)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 342 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: 5/25/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [341] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Response due by 5/25/2007. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (bpc)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: 5/25/2007
                                                                                                                                Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 6/13/2007. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 341 Filed: 5/24/2007, Entered: 5/24/2007, Terminated: 5/25/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response or Reply as to [297] MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony by the Government Regarding Article XIV of the Standard Contract, Including the Testimony of Defendant's Witnesses, Mr. David Zabransky and Mr. Robert Morgan, filed by USA.Response due by 6/7/2007.(Bryan, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 340 Filed: 5/24/2007, Entered: 5/24/2007
                                                                                                                                    **SEALED**RESPONSE to [323] MOTION for Leave to File Serve a Trial Subpoena on Mr. Jack D. Harrington and Request for Expedited Consideration, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR GENERATION COMPANY.Reply due by 6/5/2007.(Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 339 Filed: 5/24/2007, Entered: 5/24/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [336] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Response due by 5/24/2007. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (bpc)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 338 Filed: 5/24/2007, Entered: 5/24/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        ORDER denying [298] Motion in Limine; denying [300] Motion in Limine; denying [301] Motion in Limine; denying [305] Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (bpc)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 337 Filed: 5/24/2007, Entered: 5/24/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying [283] Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (bpc)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 336 Filed: 5/23/2007, Entered: 5/23/2007, Terminated: 5/24/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response or Reply as to [297] MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony by the Government Regarding Article XIV of the Standard Contract, Including the Testimony of Defendant's Witnesses, Mr. David Zabransky and Mr. Robert Morgan, filed by USA.Response due by 6/11/2007.(Bryan, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 335 Filed: 5/23/2007, Entered: 5/23/2007
                                                                                                                                              **SEALED**RESPONSE to [299] MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Defendant's Expert Witness, Mr. Warren K. Brewer, filed by USA.Reply due by 6/7/2007. (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3) # (4))(Orfield, Sonia)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 334 Filed: 5/23/2007, Entered: 5/23/2007
                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to [298] MOTION in Limine to Exclude Certain Testimony of Entergy's Witness, Donald R. Denton, filed by USA.Reply due by 6/7/2007. (Finn, Stephen)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 333 Filed: 5/23/2007, Entered: 5/23/2007
                                                                                                                                                  **SEALED**RESPONSE to [302] MOTION in Limine To Exclude The Testimony Of Plaintiff Boston Edison Company's Expert Witness, Robert B. Hevert, filed by BOSTON EDISON COMPANY.Reply due by 6/7/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C)(Conway, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 332 Filed: 5/23/2007, Entered: 5/23/2007
                                                                                                                                                    **SEALED**RESPONSE to [303] MOTION in Limine To Exlcude, In Part, The Testimony Of Plaintiff Boston Edison Company's Expert Witness, John J. Reed, filed by BOSTON EDISON COMPANY.Reply due by 6/7/2007.(Conway, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 331 Filed: 5/23/2007, Entered: 5/23/2007
                                                                                                                                                      **SEALED**RESPONSE to [305] MOTION in Limine To Exclude The Testimony of Plaintiff Boston Edison Company's Expert Witness, William J. Manion, filed by BOSTON EDISON COMPANY.Reply due by 6/7/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit A (cont'd)# (3) Exhibit A (cont'd)# (4) Exhibit B# (5) Exhibit C# (6) Exhibit D)(Conway, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 330 Filed: 5/23/2007, Entered: 5/23/2007
                                                                                                                                                        **SEALED**RESPONSE to [301] MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Defendant's Expert Witness, Dr. Jonathan A. Neuberger, filed by USA.Reply due by 6/7/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix # (2) Appendix # (3) Appendix)(Damelin, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 329 Filed: 5/23/2007, Entered: 5/23/2007
                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to [298] MOTION in Limine to Exclude Certain Testimony of Entergy's Witness, Donald R. Denton, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR GENERATION COMPANY.Reply due by 6/7/2007. (Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 328 Filed: 5/23/2007, Entered: 5/23/2007
                                                                                                                                                            **SEALED**RESPONSE to [300] MOTION in Limine To Exclude The Testimony Of Plaintiff Boston Edison Company's Expert Witness, Eileen M. Supko, filed by BOSTON EDISON COMPANY.Reply due by 6/7/2007.(Conway, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 327 Filed: 5/23/2007, Entered: 5/23/2007
                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to [313] Response to Motion [Dispositive] for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Entergy Nuclear Generation Company, filed by BOSTON EDISON COMPANY. (Conway, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 326 Filed: 5/22/2007, Entered: 5/22/2007
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE, filed by BOSTON EDISON COMPANY, ENTERGY NUCLEAR GENERATION COMPANY AMENDED JOINT NOTICE OF DEPOSITION & TRIAL TESTIMONY DESIGNATIONS (Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 325 Filed: 5/22/2007, Entered: 5/22/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [324] Motion for Leave to File under seal electronically responses to certain of the governments motions in limine. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (bpc)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 324 Filed: 5/22/2007, Entered: 5/22/2007, Terminated: 5/22/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Responses to Motions In Limine Under Seal Electronically, filed by BOSTON EDISON COMPANY.Response due by 6/8/2007.(Conway, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 323 Filed: 5/21/2007, Entered: 5/21/2007, Terminated: 5/30/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                      **SEALED** MOTION for Leave to File Serve a Trial Subpoena on Mr. Jack D. Harrington and Request for Expedited Consideration, filed by BOSTON EDISON COMPANY.Response due by 6/7/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C# (4) Exhibit D# (5) Exhibit D)(Conway, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 322 Filed: 5/21/2007, Entered: 5/21/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [321] Motion for Leave to File motion for leave to serve a trial subpoena on Mr. Jack D. Harrington and request for expedited consideration. If the motion for leave to serve a trial subpoena is filed on or before May 22, 2007, the responses of Entergy Nuclear Generation Company and the government to Boston Edisons motion shall be filed on or before May 24, 2007. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (bpc)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 321 Filed: 5/19/2007, Entered: 5/19/2007, Terminated: 5/21/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Leave to Serve a Trial Subpoena on Mr. Jack D. Harrington and Request for Expedited Consideration Under Seal Electronically, filed by BOSTON EDISON COMPANY.Response due by 6/7/2007.(Conway, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 320 Filed: 5/18/2007, Entered: 5/18/2007
                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE, filed by all plaintiffs of Deposition & Trial Testimony Designations (Conway, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 319 Filed: 5/17/2007, Entered: 5/17/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [318] Motion for Leave to File response to the government's response to Entergy's motion for partial summary judgment. Response due by 5/23/2007. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (bpc)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 318 Filed: 5/16/2007, Entered: 5/16/2007, Terminated: 5/17/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                Consent MOTION for Leave to File Response to Defendant's Response to Plaintiff Entergy Nuclear Generation Company's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, filed by BOSTON EDISON COMPANY.Response due by 6/4/2007.(Conway, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 317 Filed: 5/15/2007, Entered: 5/15/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                  SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re: [292] Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR GENERATION COMPANY. (Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 5/15/2007, Entered: 5/15/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                    Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 5/30/2007. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 316 Filed: 5/14/2007, Entered: 5/14/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                      **SEALED**PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact RE: [283] MOTION for Summary Judgment On Claims For Diminution In Value, filed by BOSTON EDISON COMPANY. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Pages 1-55# (2) Appendix Pages 56-91# (3) Appendix Pages 92-125# (4) Appendix Pages 126-175# (5) Appendix Pages 176-200# (6) Appendix Pages 201-228# (7) Appendix Pages 229-261# (8) Appendix Pages 262-301# (9) Appendix Pages 302-343# (10) Appendix Pages 344-382# (11) Appendix Pages 383-417# (12) Appendix Pages 418-462# (13) Appendix Pages 463-495# (14) Appendix Pages 496-510# (15) Appendix Pages 511-542# (16) Appendix Pages 543-570# (17) Appendix Pages 571-587# (18) Appendix Pages 588-639# (19) Appendix Pages 640-665# (20) Appendix Pages 666-707# (21) Appendix Pages 708-746# (22) Appendix Pages 747-782# (23) Appendix Pages 783-820# (24) Appendix Pages 821-855# (25) Appendix Pages 856-878# (26) Appendix Pages 879-913# (27) Appendix Pages 914-944# (28) Appendix Pages 945-965# (29) Appendix Pages 966-1004)(Conway, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 315 Filed: 5/14/2007, Entered: 5/14/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                        **SEALED**RESPONSE to [284] PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact, filed by BOSTON EDISON COMPANY, filed by BOSTON EDISON COMPANY.(Conway, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 314 Filed: 5/14/2007, Entered: 5/14/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                          **SEALED**RESPONSE to [283] MOTION for Summary Judgment On Claims For Diminution In Value, filed by BOSTON EDISON COMPANY.Reply due by 5/29/2007.(Conway, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 313 Filed: 5/14/2007, Entered: 5/14/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                            **SEALED**RESPONSE to [283] MOTION for Summary Judgment On Claims For Diminution In Value, filed by USA.Reply due by 6/1/2007.(Gardner, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 312 Filed: 5/14/2007, Entered: 5/14/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [309] Motion for Leave to File a pre-trial memorandum under seal electronically. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (bpc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 311 Filed: 5/14/2007, Entered: 5/14/2007, Terminated: 2/7/2008 Motion to Substitute Attorney (Consented)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Consented MOTION to Substitute Attorney L. Jager Smith in place of Alex D. Tomaszczuk, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR GENERATION COMPANY. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Appointment of J. Smith# (2) Exhibit 2 - Consent to Substitution of Lead Counsel)(Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 310 Filed: 5/11/2007, Entered: 5/11/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                  JOINT STATUS REPORT Regarding Meeting of Counsel, filed by all parties. (Conway, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 309 Filed: 5/11/2007, Entered: 5/11/2007, Terminated: 5/14/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File, Under Seal, Electronically, a Copy of "Plaintiff Boston Edison Company's Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff Entergy Nuclear Generation Company's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Boston Edison's Claims for Diminution in Value", filed by BOSTON EDISON COMPANY.Response due by 5/29/2007.(Conway, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 308 Filed: 5/9/2007, Entered: 5/9/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [304] Motion to Take Deposition of Mr. Thomas LaGuardia, subject to conditions set forth; granting [306] Motion for Leave to File Response to Defendant's Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (bpc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 307 Filed: 5/7/2007, Entered: 5/7/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER:Telephonic Status Conference set for 5/15/2007 at 02:00 PM before Judge Charles F. Lettow. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (bpc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 306 Filed: 5/7/2007, Entered: 5/7/2007, Terminated: 5/9/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File A Response To The Government's Memorandum Of Contentions Of Fact And Law, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR GENERATION COMPANY.Response due by 5/24/2007.(Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 305 Filed: 5/4/2007, Entered: 5/4/2007, Terminated: 5/24/2007 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                            **SEALED** MOTION in Limine To Exclude The Testimony of Plaintiff Boston Edison Company's Expert Witness, William J. Manion, filed by USA.Response due by 5/21/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix # (2) Appendix)(Gardner, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 304 Filed: 5/4/2007, Entered: 5/4/2007, Terminated: 5/9/2007 Motion to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION to Take Deposition After The Close Of Discovery, filed by USA.Response due by 5/21/2007.(Bryan, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 303 Filed: 5/4/2007, Entered: 5/4/2007, Terminated: 5/31/2007 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                **SEALED** MOTION in Limine To Exlcude, In Part, The Testimony Of Plaintiff Boston Edison Company's Expert Witness, John J. Reed, filed by USA.Response due by 5/21/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix # (2) Appendix # (3) Appendix # (4) Appendix # (5) Appendix # (6) Appendix # (7) Appendix)(Finn, Stephen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 302 Filed: 5/4/2007, Entered: 5/4/2007, Terminated: 6/1/2007 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  **SEALED** MOTION in Limine To Exclude The Testimony Of Plaintiff Boston Edison Company's Expert Witness, Robert B. Hevert, filed by USA.Response due by 5/21/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix # (2) Appendix # (3) Appendix)(Gardner, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 301 Filed: 5/4/2007, Entered: 5/4/2007, Terminated: 5/24/2007 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    **SEALED** MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Defendant's Expert Witness, Dr. Jonathan A. Neuberger, filed by BOSTON EDISON COMPANY.Response due by 5/21/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B)(Conway, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 300 Filed: 5/4/2007, Entered: 5/4/2007, Terminated: 5/24/2007 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      **SEALED** MOTION in Limine To Exclude The Testimony Of Plaintiff Boston Edison Company's Expert Witness, Eileen M. Supko, filed by USA.Response due by 5/21/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix # (2) # (3) # (4))(Gardner, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 299 Filed: 5/4/2007, Entered: 5/4/2007, Terminated: 6/1/2007 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        **SEALED** MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Defendant's Expert Witness, Mr. Warren K. Brewer, filed by BOSTON EDISON COMPANY.Response due by 5/21/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B)(Conway, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 298 Filed: 5/4/2007, Entered: 5/4/2007, Terminated: 5/24/2007 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION in Limine to Exclude Certain Testimony of Entergy's Witness, Donald R. Denton, filed by BOSTON EDISON COMPANY.Response due by 5/21/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Conway, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 297 Filed: 5/4/2007, Entered: 5/4/2007, Terminated: 5/31/2007 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony by the Government Regarding Article XIV of the Standard Contract, Including the Testimony of Defendant's Witnesses, Mr. David Zabransky and Mr. Robert Morgan, filed by BOSTON EDISON COMPANY.Response due by 5/21/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C# (4) Exhibit D)(Conway, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 296 Filed: 5/4/2007, Entered: 5/4/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [294] Motion to Seal Document; granting [295] Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (bpc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 295 Filed: 5/4/2007, Entered: 5/4/2007, Terminated: 5/4/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Pretrial Motions Under Seal Electronically, filed by BOSTON EDISON COMPANY.Response due by 5/21/2007.(Conway, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 294 Filed: 5/3/2007, Entered: 5/3/2007, Terminated: 5/4/2007 ~Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document To Be Filed By The Government, filed by USA.Response due by 5/21/2007.(Gardner, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 293 Filed: 4/30/2007, Entered: 4/30/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Exhibit List Part 1, filed by BOSTON EDISON COMPANY. (Attachments: # (1) Supplement Exhibit List Part 2)(Conway, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 292 Filed: 4/30/2007, Entered: 4/30/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law, filed by USA. (Gardner, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 291 Filed: 4/30/2007, Entered: 4/30/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Exhibit List, filed by USA. (Gardner, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 290 Filed: 4/30/2007, Entered: 4/30/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Exhibit List, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR GENERATION COMPANY. (Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 289 Filed: 4/30/2007, Entered: 4/30/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Witness List, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR GENERATION COMPANY. (Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 288 Filed: 4/30/2007, Entered: 4/30/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Witness List, filed by BOSTON EDISON COMPANY. (Conway, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 287 Filed: 4/30/2007, Entered: 4/30/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Witness List, filed by USA. (Gardner, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 286 Filed: 4/19/2007, Entered: 4/19/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER directing clerk to return submission of applicant for intervention. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (bpc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 285 Filed: 4/16/2007, Entered: 4/16/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR GENERATION COMPANY. (Herzfeld, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 284 Filed: 4/11/2007, Entered: 4/11/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact RE: [283] MOTION for Summary Judgment On Claims For Diminution In Value, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR GENERATION COMPANY. (Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 283 Filed: 4/11/2007, Entered: 4/11/2007, Terminated: 5/24/2007 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        **SEALED** MOTION for Summary Judgment On Claims For Diminution In Value, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR GENERATION COMPANY.Response due by 5/14/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Part 1 (BECO Standard Contract)# (2) Appendix Part 2 (BECO Offering Memorandum pt. 1)# (3) Appendix Part 3 (BECO Offering Memorandum, pt. 2)# (4) Appendix Part 4 (BECO Offering Memorandum, pt. 3)# (5) Appendix Part 5 (ENGC Indicative Bid)# (6) Appendix Part 6 (1997 Decommissioning Study)# (7) Appendix Part 7 (Purchase and Sale Agreement, pt. 1)# (8) Appendix Part 8 (Purchase and Sale Agreement, pt. 2)# (9) Appendix Part 9 (Purchase and Sale Agreement Schedule 2.1(e))# (10) Appendix Part 10 (BECO Response to Second Set of Interrogatories)# (11) Appendix Part 11 (Reed Amended Expert Report, pt. 1)# (12) Appendix Part 12 (Reed Amended Expert Report, pt. 2)# (13) Appendix Part 13 (BECO Amended Complaint)# (14) Appendix Part 14 (Reed Deposition Transcript Excerpt)# (15) Appendix Part 15 (Entergy Discounted Cash Flow Model))(Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 282 Filed: 4/11/2007, Entered: 4/11/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [278] Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal Electronically; denying [279] Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (bpc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 281 Filed: 4/11/2007, Entered: 4/11/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to [279] MOTION to Strike [278] MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal Electronically and Plaintiff Entergy Nuclear Generation Company's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment MOTION to Strike [278] MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal Electronically and Plaintiff Entergy Nuclear Generation Company's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR GENERATION COMPANY.Reply due by 4/23/2007. (Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 280 Filed: 4/9/2007, Entered: 4/9/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to [278] MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal Electronically, filed by USA.Reply due by 4/23/2007. (Gardner, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 279 Filed: 4/9/2007, Entered: 4/9/2007, Terminated: 4/11/2007 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Strike [278] MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal Electronically and Plaintiff Entergy Nuclear Generation Company's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, filed by BOSTON EDISON COMPANY.Response due by 4/26/2007.(Conway, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 278 Filed: 4/6/2007, Entered: 4/6/2007, Terminated: 4/11/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal Electronically, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR GENERATION COMPANY.Response due by 4/23/2007.(Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 277 Filed: 4/3/2007, Entered: 4/3/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [275] Motion for enlargement of discovery to allow for deposition of Mr. David Zabransky. Discovery shall close April 5, 2007. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (bpc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 276 Filed: 3/30/2007, Entered: 3/30/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law, filed by BOSTON EDISON COMPANY. (Conway, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 275 Filed: 3/28/2007, Entered: 3/28/2007, Terminated: 4/3/2007 Motion to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION to Take Deposition After The Close Of Discovery, filed by USA.Response due by 4/16/2007.(Bryan, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 274 Filed: 3/15/2007, Entered: 3/15/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [273] Motion for Enlargement of Time for discovery. Discovery shall close by 3/28/2007. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (bpc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 273 Filed: 3/14/2007, Entered: 3/14/2007, Terminated: 3/15/2007 Motion to Amend Schedule
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION to Amend Schedule re: [272] Order on Motion to Amend Schedule,,,, filed by BOSTON EDISON COMPANY.Response due by 4/2/2007.(Conway, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 272 Filed: 2/26/2007, Entered: 2/26/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [270] Motion for Extension of Time.Close of discovery by March 23, 2007. Boston Edison contentions of fact and law and Boston Edison draft exhibit and witness lists due March 30, 2007. Entergy contentions of fact and law and Entergy draft exhibit and witness lists due April 16, 2007. Government draft exhibit and witness lists due April 20, 2007. Government contentions of fact and law and all parties final exhibit and witness lists due April 30, 2007. Meeting of counsel by May 4, 2007. Submission of pre-trial motions by May 4, 2007. Opposition to pre-trial motions due May 23, 2007. Pre-trial conference on May 29, 2007, commencing at 10:00 a.m. in the National Courts Building, Washington, DC. Trial from June 4, 2007 to June 20, 2007, commencing at 9:30 a.m. in the National Courts Building, Washington, DC. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (bpc, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 271 Filed: 2/26/2007, Entered: 2/26/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PUBLISHED OPINION granting in part and denyng in part [254] motion for a protective order, granting [257] cross-motion to compel, granting in part and denying in part [255] motion for leave to take a deposition under RCFC 30(b)(6), and granting in part and denying in part [264] cross-motion for a protective order.Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (bpc, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 270 Filed: 2/22/2007, Entered: 2/22/2007, Terminated: 2/26/2007 Motion to Amend Schedule
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION to Amend Schedule re: [248] Scheduling Order, filed by USA.Response due by 3/12/2007.(Bryan, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 269 Filed: 2/1/2007, Entered: 2/1/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Additional Authority In Support of Its Motion For Leave to Take a Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C# (4) Exhibit D)(Conway, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 268 Filed: 1/16/2007, Entered: 1/18/2007 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-113) held on January 11, 2007 before Judge Charles F. Lettow. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 267 Filed: 1/8/2007, Entered: 1/8/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re [255] MOTION to Take Deposition from 30(b)(6) Representative(s) of Defendant, The United States, filed by BOSTON EDISON COMPANY. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit Exhibit C# (4) Exhibit Exhibit D# (5) Exhibit Exhibit E)(Conway, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 266 Filed: 1/3/2007, Entered: 1/3/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [265] Motion for Extension of Time. Reply Brief due by 1/8/2007. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (rhb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 265 Filed: 1/2/2007, Entered: 1/2/2007, Terminated: 1/3/2007 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until January 8, 2006 to Reply to Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Take a Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition filed by BOSTON EDISON COMPANY.(Conway, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 264 Filed: 12/22/2006, Entered: 12/22/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to [255] MOTION to Take Deposition from 30(b)(6) Representative(s) of Defendant, The United States And Cross-Motion For A Protective Order, filed by USA.Reply due by 1/5/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Part I# (2) Appendix Part II# (3) Appendix Part III)(Bryan, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 263 Filed: 12/22/2006, Entered: 12/22/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [262] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to [255] MOTION to Take Deposition from 30(b)(6) Representative(s) of Defendant, The United States. Response due by 12/22/2006. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (bpc, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 262 Filed: 12/20/2006, Entered: 12/20/2006, Terminated: 12/22/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response or Reply as to [255] MOTION to Take Deposition from 30(b)(6) Representative(s) of Defendant, The United States, filed by USA.Response due by 1/8/2007.(Bryan, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 261 Filed: 12/19/2006, Entered: 12/19/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [259] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re [255] MOTION to Take Deposition from 30(b)(6) Representative(s) of Defendant, The United States.Response due by 12/20/2006. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (bpc, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 260 Filed: 12/18/2006, Entered: 12/18/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re [254] MOTION for Protective Order, filed by BOSTON EDISON COMPANY. (Conway, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 259 Filed: 12/15/2006, Entered: 12/15/2006, Terminated: 12/19/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until December 20, 2006 to File Response or Reply as to [255] MOTION to Take Deposition from 30(b)(6) Representative(s) of Defendant, The United States, filed by USA.Response due by 1/2/2007.(Bryan, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 258 Filed: 12/14/2006, Entered: 12/14/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER: Hearing set for 1/11/2007 at 02:00 PM in the National Courts Building before Judge Charles F. Lettow. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (bpc, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 257 Filed: 12/7/2006, Entered: 12/7/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to [254] MOTION for Protective Order and Cross-Motion to Compel, filed by USA.Reply due by 12/21/2006. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix # (2) Appendix)(Damelin, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 256 Filed: 12/7/2006, Entered: 12/7/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to [254] MOTION for Protective Order, filed by ENTERGY NUCLEAR GENERATION COMPANY.Reply due by 12/21/2006. (Chu, Jack)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 255 Filed: 12/1/2006, Entered: 12/1/2006, Terminated: 2/26/2007 Motion to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Take Deposition from 30(b)(6) Representative(s) of Defendant, The United States, filed by BOSTON EDISON COMPANY.Response due by 12/18/2006. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C# (4) Exhibit D# (5) Exhibit E)(Conway, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 254 Filed: 11/20/2006, Entered: 11/20/2006, Terminated: 2/26/2007 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Protective Order, filed by BOSTON EDISON COMPANY.Response due by 12/7/2006. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C# (4) Exhibit D# (5) Exhibit E)(Conway, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 253 Filed: 10/2/2006, Entered: 10/2/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [252] Motion for Extension of Time Government's expert reports due 10/30/2006; Entergy Nuclear's expert reports due 11/9/2006; Rebuttal expert reports due 11/30/2006; Expert depositions from 11/30/2006 to 1/12/2007 Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (rhb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 252 Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: 9/29/2006, Terminated: 10/2/2006 Motion to Amend Schedule
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION to Amend Schedule re: [248] Scheduling Order, filed by USA.(Bryan, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 251 Filed: 6/15/2006, Entered: 6/15/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Change of Address by Richard J. Conway (Conway, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 250 Filed: 5/31/2006, Entered: 5/31/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [249] parties Joint Motion for an Order Regarding Discovery of Draft Expert Reports. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow.(aj1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 249 Filed: 5/31/2006, Entered: 5/31/2006, Terminated: 5/31/2006 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION For An Order Regarding Discovery of Draft Expert Reports, filed by BOSTON EDISON COMPANY. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Conway, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 248 Filed: 2/17/2006, Entered: 2/17/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER for the Boston Edison portion of this case, as consolidated for a limited purpose with Entergy Nuclear Generation Co. v. US, No. 03-2626C. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (aj1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 247 Filed: 2/15/2006, Entered: 2/15/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                JOINT STATUS REPORT Regarding Proposed Scheduling Order, filed by all parties. (Conway, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 246 Filed: 2/10/2006, Entered: 2/13/2006 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on February 8, 2006 before Judge Charles F. Lettow. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 2/8/2006, Entered: 2/8/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 2/23/2006. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 245 Filed: 2/1/2006, Entered: 2/1/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER:Status Conference set for 2/8/2006 at 3:45 PM at the National Courts Building, 717 Madison Pl. NW Washington, DC, before Judge Charles F. Lettow.Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (aj1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 244 Filed: 1/12/2006, Entered: 1/12/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Proposed Pretrial Order, filed by USA. (Lo Re, Alan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 243 Filed: 12/28/2005, Entered: 1/3/2006 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on December 20, 2005 before Judge Charles F. Lettow. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 12/22/2005, Entered: 12/22/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 1/4/2006. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 242 Filed: 12/7/2005, Entered: 12/7/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 12/20/2005 02:00 PM at National Courts Building in Washington, DC before Judge Charles F. Lettow. Status conference to discuss matters addressed in Joint Status Report filed on Dec. 5, 2005 regarding a plan and schedule for the Boston Edison portion of the Boston Edison (No. 99-447C) and Entergy Nuclear Generation (No. 03-2626C) cases as consolidated for a limited purpose.Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (aj1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 241 Filed: 12/2/2005, Entered: 12/2/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by USA. (Lo Re, Alan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 240 Filed: 11/23/2005, Entered: 11/23/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [239] Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to file Joint Status Report. The parties shall now file a Joint Status Report on or Before December 2, 2005. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (aj1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 239 Filed: 11/23/2005, Entered: 11/23/2005, Terminated: 11/23/2005 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until December 2, 2005 to Submit Joint Status Report, filed by USA. Response due by 12/12/2005. (Gardner, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 11/23/2005, Entered: 11/26/2005 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/2/2005. (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 238 Filed: 10/7/2005, Entered: 10/7/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT ORDER - Joint Status Report reporting a plan and schedule for the Boston Edison portion of the Boston Edison (No. 99-447C) and Entergy Nuclear Generation (No. 03-2626C) cases as consolidated for a limited purpose. Joint Status Report due by 11/30/2005.Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (aj1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 237 Filed: 9/14/2005, Entered: 9/14/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting Motion for Enlargement of Time for Plaintiff Entergy Nuclear Generation Company to respond to defendant's "First Set of Interrogatories and Request for Admissions" and "First Request for Production of Documents." Extension of fourteen days to September 26, 2005.Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (aj1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 236 Filed: 7/29/2005, Entered: 7/29/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PUBLISHED OPINION granting in part and denying in part defendant's motion to consolidate this case with Entergy Nuclear Generation Company v. United States, No. 03-2626C. Consolidation ordered for a limited purpose. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (gjc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 6/17/2005, Entered: 6/17/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 6/29/2005. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 235 Filed: 6/15/2005, Entered: 6/22/2005 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT (Pg 1-74) of Proceedings held on 6/14/05 before Judge Charles F. Lettow. (eph, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 234 Filed: 6/3/2005, Entered: 6/3/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [233] Motion for Extension of Time. JPSR due within 21 days of the court's decision on the motion to consolidate. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (gjc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 233 Filed: 6/1/2005, Entered: 6/1/2005, Terminated: 6/3/2005 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 21 days after the Court decides the Government's pending motion to consolidate to file the parties' Joint Preliminary Status Report filed by USA. Response due by 6/20/2005. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 232 Filed: 5/25/2005, Entered: 5/25/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Setting Hearing on [224] MOTION to Consolidate Case 03-2626 with this case: Motion Hearing set for 6/14/2005, 10:00 AM in National Courts Building before Judge Charles F. Lettow. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (gjc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 231 Filed: 5/16/2005, Entered: 5/16/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re [224] MOTION to Consolidate Cases 03-2626 with this case Or, In The Alternative, For Issuance Of A Summons Pursuant To RCFC 14(a) And Notice Pursuant To RCFC 14(b) filed by USA. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 230 Filed: 5/16/2005, Entered: 5/16/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [229] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Defendant's reply due by 05/16/2005. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (gjc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 5/16/2005, Entered: 5/16/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Set/Reset Deadlines: Reply due by 5/16/2005. (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 229 Filed: 5/12/2005, Entered: 5/12/2005, Terminated: 5/16/2005 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to [228] Response to Motion to Consolidate, (until 5/16/2005) filed by USA. Response due by 5/31/2005. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 228 Filed: 4/28/2005, Entered: 4/28/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to [224] MOTION to Consolidate Cases 03-2626 with this case Or, In The Alternative, For Issuance Of A Summons Pursuant To RCFC 14(a) And Notice Pursuant To RCFC 14(b) filed by BOSTON EDISON COMPANY. Reply due by 5/12/2005. (Conway, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 227 Filed: 4/19/2005, Entered: 4/19/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [226] Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's response to plaintiff's discovery requests due by 04/18/2005. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (gjc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 226 Filed: 4/15/2005, Entered: 4/15/2005, Terminated: 4/19/2005 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until 4/18/2005 to Respond to Plaintiff's Written Discovery Requests filed by USA. Response due by 5/2/2005 (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 225 Filed: 4/11/2005, Entered: 4/11/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to [1] Complaint filed by USA. JPSR due by 6/2/2005.(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 224 Filed: 4/11/2005, Entered: 4/11/2005, Terminated: 7/29/2005 Motion to Consolidate Cases
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Consolidate Cases 03-2626 with this case Or, In The Alternative, For Issuance Of A Summons Pursuant To RCFC 14(a) And Notice Pursuant To RCFC 14(b) filed by USA. Response due by 4/28/2005 (Attachments: # (1) # (2))(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 223 Filed: 4/8/2005, Entered: 4/8/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [221] Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint is due by 04/11/2005. Defendant's Responses to Plaintiff's Written Discovery Requests are due by 04/15/2005. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (gjc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 4/8/2005, Entered: 4/11/2005 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer Due by 4/11/2005. (jat, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 222 Filed: 4/7/2005, Entered: 4/7/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to [221] MOTION to Amend Schedule To Establish Due Dates For Defendant's Answer To Plaintiff's Complaint And Responses To Plaintiff's Written Discovery filed by BOSTON EDISON COMPANY. Reply due by 4/21/2005. (Conway, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 221 Filed: 4/1/2005, Entered: 4/1/2005, Terminated: 4/8/2005 Motion to Amend Schedule
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Amend Schedule To Establish Due Dates For Defendant's Answer To Plaintiff's Complaint And Responses To Plaintiff's Written Discovery filed by USA. Response due by 4/18/2005 (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 220 Filed: 4/1/2005, Entered: 4/1/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Alan J. Lo Re for USA. (Lo Re, Alan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 219 Filed: 2/15/2005, Entered: 2/15/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PUBLISHED OPINION on [193] Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment, Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment, and [201] Defendant's Motion to Strike the Affidavit of Geoffrey Lubbock. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (rs1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 218 Filed: 2/10/2005, Entered: 2/10/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Additional Authority by BOSTON EDISON COMPANY (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit January 19, 2005 SMUD Decision (Braden))(Conway, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 217 Filed: 12/7/2004, Entered: 12/7/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUR-REPLY re [209] MOTION for Leave to File Defendant's Response To Pages 12 And 13 Of Plaintiff Boston Edison Company's September 10, 2004 Post-Hearing Report filed by BOSTON EDISON COMPANY. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit One# (2) Exhibit Two# (3) Exhibit Three# (4) Exhibit Four)(Conway, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 216 Filed: 11/24/2004, Entered: 11/24/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [211] Motion to Stay Discovery. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (gjc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 215 Filed: 11/23/2004, Entered: 11/23/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to [7] Motion to Stay filed by BOSTON EDISON COMPANY. Reply due by 12/7/2004. (Conway, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 214 Filed: 11/23/2004, Entered: 11/23/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to [208] Supplemental Brief , Pursuant To The Court's Order Dated November 23, 2004 filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3) # (4) # (5))(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 213 Filed: 11/23/2004, Entered: 11/23/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [209] Motion for Leave to File Defendant's Response to Pages 12 and 13 of Plaintiff Boston Edison Company's Post-Hearing Report. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (gjc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 11/23/2004, Entered: 11/23/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Set Deadlines/Hearings: Plaintiff's response to defendant's supplemental brief due by 12/7/2004. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 212 Filed: 11/18/2004, Entered: 11/18/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re [209] MOTION for Leave to File Defendant's Response To Pages 12 And 13 Of Plaintiff Boston Edison Company's September 10, 2004 Post-Hearing Report filed by USA. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 211 Filed: 11/9/2004, Entered: 11/9/2004, Terminated: 11/24/2004 Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Stay Discovery by USA. Response due by 11/26/2004 (Attachments: # (1) Attachment 1# (2) Attachment 2)(Shaibani, Stefan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 210 Filed: 11/3/2004, Entered: 11/3/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to [209] MOTION for Leave to File Defendant's Response To Pages 12 And 13 Of Plaintiff Boston Edison Company's September 10, 2004 Post-Hearing Report filed by BOSTON EDISON COMPANY. Reply due by 11/18/2004. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Conway, Richard) Modified on 11/3/2004 to correct reply due date (dw1).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 11/3/2004, Entered: 11/3/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Set Deadlines/Hearings: Reply due by 11/18/2004. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 209 Filed: 10/26/2004, Entered: 10/26/2004, Terminated: 11/23/2004 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File Defendant's Response To Pages 12 And 13 Of Plaintiff Boston Edison Company's September 10, 2004 Post-Hearing Report by USA. Response due by 11/12/2004 (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3) # (4) # (5) # (6))(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 208 Filed: 9/10/2004, Entered: 9/10/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF re: [206] Transcript, [207] Supplemental Brief Post Hearing Report by BOSTON EDISON COMPANY. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit # (2) Exhibit # (3) Exhibit # (4) Exhibit # (5) Exhibit)(Conway, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 207 Filed: 9/10/2004, Entered: 9/10/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF Pursuant to the Court's Direction at the Parties' August 31, 2004 Hearing by USA. (Shaibani, Stefan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 9/3/2004, Entered: 9/3/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 9/15/2004. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 206 Filed: 9/2/2004, Entered: 9/8/2004 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings in One Volume held on 8/31/2004 before Judge Charles F. Lettow. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 205 Filed: 8/30/2004, Entered: 8/30/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re [204] MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit of Defendant's Reply To Plaintiff's Response To Defendant's Motion To Dismiss Or, In The Alternative, For Summary Judgment, And Defendant's Response To Plaintiff's Cross-Motion For Summary And Motion To Strike The Government's Opposition filed by BOSTON EDISON COMPANY. (Conway, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 204 Filed: 8/26/2004, Entered: 8/26/2004, Terminated: 2/7/2008 Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limit of Defendant's Reply To Plaintiff's Response To Defendant's Motion To Dismiss Or, In The Alternative, For Summary Judgment, And Defendant's Response To Plaintiff's Cross-Motion For Summary Judgment Upon Liability by 17 pages by USA. Response due by 9/13/2004 (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3) # (4) # (5) # (6) # (7) # (8) # (9) # (10) # (11) # (12))(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 203 Filed: 8/26/2004, Entered: 8/26/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to [125] PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Proposed Findings of Fact in Support of Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment on Liability by USA filed by USA. (Shaibani, Stefan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 202 Filed: 8/23/2004, Entered: 8/23/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to [201] Motion to Strike the Affidavit of Geoffrey Lubbock filed by BOSTON EDISON COMPANY. (Conway, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 201 Filed: 8/6/2004, Entered: 8/6/2004, Terminated: 2/15/2005 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Strike the Affidavit of Geoffrey Lubbock by USA. Response due by 8/23/2004 (Shaibani, Stefan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 200 Filed: 7/26/2004, Entered: 7/26/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [199] Motion for Extension of Time to File defendant's Reply re [193] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) Or, In The Alternative, For Summary Judgment Upon Counts I And II, And For Summary Judgment Upon Count III, Of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint until 8/26/2004. Defendant's reply due by 8/26/2004. Hearing on defendant's motion and plaintiff's cross-motion shall be re-scheduled to commence at 2:00 p.m. on August 31, 2004. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (lcd, ) Modified on 7/26/2004 for clarity(dw1).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 7/26/2004, Entered: 7/26/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Set Deadlines/Hearings: Reply due by 8/26/2004. Hearing set for 8/31/2004 02:00 PM before Judge Charles F. Lettow. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 199 Filed: 7/21/2004, Entered: 7/21/2004, Terminated: 7/26/2004 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [198] Response to Motion,,,until 8/26/2004, by USA. Response due by 8/9/2004 (Shaibani, Stefan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 198 Filed: 7/9/2004, Entered: 7/9/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to [193] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) Or, In The Alternative, For Summary Judgment Upon Counts I And II, And For Summary Judgment Upon Count III, Of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint And Cross-Motion For Summary Judgment On Liability Regarding Count I Of The Amended Complaint filed by BOSTON EDISON COMPANY. Reply due by 7/23/2004. (Attachments: # (1) Plaintiff Boston Edison Company's Response to Defendant's Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact# (2) Boston Edison Company's Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact in Support of its Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment on Liability# (3) Appendix Volume 1# (4) Appendix Volume 2# (5) Appendix Volume 3)(Conway, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 197 Filed: 5/28/2004, Entered: 5/28/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER: Plaintiff's Consent Motion for Enlargement of Time [196] is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall submit its response to [193] Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment, by 7/9/2004. Defendant's Reply is due by 8/6/2004. Hearing on [193] Defendant's Motion set for 8/26/2004 09:30 AM in National Courts Building before Judge Charles F. Lettow. Plaintiff is also instructed to ensure the proper judge's name is included on its future filings. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (lcd, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 196 Filed: 5/26/2004, Entered: 5/26/2004, Terminated: 2/7/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [193] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) Or, In The Alternative, For Summary Judgment Upon Counts I And II, And For Summary Judgment Upon Count III, Of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint,until July 2, 2004, by BOSTON EDISON COMPANY. Response due by 6/14/2004 (Conway, Richard) Modified on 5/26/2004 to correct July 1, 2004 to July 2, 2004, per attachment (jcp, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 195 Filed: 4/30/2004, Entered: 5/5/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PROTECTED PORTIONS OF DFT'S APPENDIX to [193] Dft's MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) Or, In The Alternative, For Summary Judgment Upon Counts I And II, And For Summary Judgment Upon Count III Of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, by USA. [FILED UNDER SEAL] Service: 4/30/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 194 Filed: 4/30/2004, Entered: 4/30/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA. (Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 193 Filed: 4/30/2004, Entered: 4/30/2004, Terminated: 2/15/2005 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) Or, In The Alternative, For Summary Judgment Upon Counts I And II, And For Summary Judgment Upon Count III, Of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by USA. Response due by 6/1/2004 (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3) # (4) # (5) # (6) # (7) # (8) # (9) # (10) # (11) # (12) # (13) # (14) # (15) # (16) # (17) # (18))(Lester, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 192 Filed: 3/23/2004, Entered: 3/24/2004 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on March 16, 2004 before Judge Charles F. Lettow. (Attachments: # (1) Transcript) (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 3/17/2004, Entered: 3/17/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 3/22/2004. (vp1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 191 Filed: 3/16/2004, Entered: 3/16/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER1. BOSTON EDISON's Amended Complaint is deemed filed this date. [181] MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by BOSTON EDISON COMPANY is DENIED as MOOT.2. [72] Motion for Summary Judgment filed by USA is DENIED without prejudice.3. [126] Motion for Summary Judgment filed by BOSTON EDISON COMPANY is DENIED without prejudice.4. [132] Motion for Summary Judgment filed by USA is DENIED without prejudice.5. [138] Cross Motion for Summary Judgment filed by USA is DENIED without prejudice.6. All prior orders to file documents under seal are LIFTED.7. USA shall file any motion to dismiss on jurisdictional grounds on or before 4/30/2004. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with the Rules of this Court.8. Hearing on motion to dismiss shall be held on 6/16/2004.9. Discovery shall proceed concurrently with the briefing and consideration of USA's motion to dismiss.10. The Court will defer consideration of consolidation with Entergy Nuclear Generation Co., No. 03-2626-C, pending resolution of jurisdictional issues. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (lcd, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 3/16/2004, Entered: 3/16/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Set Deadlines/Hearings:Defendant's Dispositive Motion(s) due by 4/30/2004. Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss set for 6/16/2004 09:30 AM in National Courts Building before Judge Charles F. Lettow. (dw1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 3/16/2004, Entered: 3/16/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Charles F. Lettow : Status Conference held on 3/16/2004. (lcd, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 190 Filed: 3/1/2004, Entered: 3/1/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 189 Filed: 2/26/2004, Entered: 2/29/2004 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 02/20/2004.(lld, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 188 Filed: 2/26/2004, Entered: 2/29/2004 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [186] Motion for Leave to File Status Report Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (lld, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 187 Filed: 2/20/2004, Entered: 2/27/2004 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT by BOSTON EDISON COMPANY. Service: 2/20/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 186 Filed: 2/20/2004, Entered: 2/27/2004, Terminated: 2/26/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to File a Separate Status Report by USA.Service: 2/20/2004. Response due by 3/8/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 185 Filed: 2/20/2004, Entered: 2/27/2004 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to [181] Pltf's MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by USA. Reply due by 3/5/2004. Service: 2/20/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 184 Filed: 2/13/2004, Entered: 2/25/2004 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER:. Status Conference currently set for 3/8/2204 shall be held on 3/16/2004 09:30 AM in National Courts Building before Judge Charles F. Lettow. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (lld, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 183 Filed: 2/3/2004, Entered: 2/6/2004 Order on Motion Lifting StayCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER: [179] Pltf's Motion to Lift the Stay on Further Proceedings, is DENIED as MOOT. [182] Dft's Consent Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART: A) as regards the reguest for additional time to respond to pltf's Motion to Lift the Stay on Further Proceedings, dft's Motion for Enlargement is DENIED as MOOT; B) as regards the request for additional time to respond to pltf's Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint, dft's Motion for Enlargement is GRANTED. Dft shall Respond to pltf's Motion for Leave to File and Amended Complaint on or before 2/20/2004. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report on or before 2/20/2004. A status conference shall be held in this case on 3/8/2004, commencing at 9:30 am at the National Court's Building. The Clerk's Office is directed to serve a copy of this Order on counsel for each of the parties in in Entergy Nuclear Generation Co. v. USA, No. 03-2626C. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 2/3/2004, Entered: 2/3/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT LOCATED IN CASE NO. 03-2626C] The parties are instructed to file a joint status report in 03-2626C on or before 2/20/2004; a status conference in this case (03-2626C) will be held on 3/18/2004; a status conference in Boston Edison v. United States, No. 99-447-C, will be held on 3/8/2004. The Clerk's Office shall serve a copy of this order on counsel in Boston Edison v. United States, No. 99-447-C. Status Conference set for 3/8/2004 09:30 AM in National Courts Building before Judge Charles F. Lettow. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 1/30/2004, Entered: 1/30/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER: The Court hereby DENIES [170] Dft's Second Motion to Renew its Motion toConsolidate as well as its previous motions relating to consolidation. The Court further LIFTS THE STAY of the remainder of the cases to which the Order of 4/16/2003, applied. The Clerk of the Court is directed to docket this Order in this case with an entry noting the same on the dockets of the remaining SNFcases captioned in Dft's instant motion, with a courtesy copy to all SNF parties and presiding SNF judges of the Court. [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT LOCATED IN CASE NO. 98-126C] Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 182 Filed: 1/28/2004, Entered: 2/3/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responses to [181] Pltf's MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint, and [179] Pltf's MOTION to Lift the Stay on Further Proceedings, until 2/20/2004, by USA.Service: 1/28/2004. Response due by 2/17/2004 (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 181 Filed: 1/13/2004, Entered: 1/16/2004, Terminated: 3/16/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by BOSTON EDISON COMPANY.Service: 1/13/2004. Response due by 1/30/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 180 Filed: 1/13/2004, Entered: 1/16/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Consented MOTION to Substitute Counsel Richard J. Conway in place of Alex D. Tomaszczuk by BOSTON EDISON COMPANY.Service: 1/13/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 179 Filed: 1/13/2004, Entered: 1/16/2004, Terminated: 2/3/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Lift the Stay on Further Proceedings by BOSTON EDISON COMPANY.Service: 1/13/2004. Response due by 1/30/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 1/13/2004, Entered: 1/16/2004 Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ***Attorney Richard J. Conway for BOSTON EDISON COMPANY added. Attorney Alexander D. Tomaszczuk terminated. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 178 Filed: 12/5/2003, Entered: 12/11/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Counsel for Dft's Change of Telephone and Facsimile Numbers by USA. Service: 12/5/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 177 Filed: 11/5/2003, Entered: 11/10/2003 Notice of Directly Related Case(s)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Directly Related Case [03-2626C] by BOSTON EDISON COMPANY. Service: 11/5/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 176 Filed: 10/22/2003, Entered: 10/27/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER: The Court hereby ORDERS that all filings in this case relating to issues of consolidation shall be captioned solely in the name of this case and shall show the name of the presiding judge in this case. A courtesy copy of any such filing relating to issues of consolidation shall be provided to the Clerk's Office for transmission to the Chief Judge. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 175 Filed: 9/9/2003, Entered: 9/11/2003 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Pltfs' Responses to Dft's Second Motion to the Chief Judge to Renew Consideration of Dft's Motion to Consolidate filed by USA, Filed by Leave of the Judge. Service: 9/3/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 174 Filed: 9/9/2003, Entered: 9/11/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [173] Dft's Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to Pltfs' Responses to Dft's Second Motion to the Chief Judge to Renew Consideration of Dft's Motion to Consolidate, until 9/3/03. Dft's reply is filed by leave of court this date. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 173 Filed: 9/3/2003, Entered: 9/8/2003, Terminated: 9/9/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to Pltfs' Response to Dft's Second Motion to Renew Its Motion to Consolidate, until 9/3/03, by USA.Service: 9/3/03. Response due by 9/22/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 8/26/2003, Entered: 8/29/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to the Chief Judge for Extension of Time to File Reply to Pltfs' Responses to Dft's Second Motion to Renew Its Motion to Consoldiate, until 9/3/03, by USA. [Original document located in Case No. 98-126C]Service: 8/26/03. Response due by 9/12/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 172 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/15/2003 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Reassignment to Judge Charles Lettow. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 171 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/15/2003 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Pursuant to Rule 40.1(c) of the RCFC, which permits the Chief Judge to reassign any case if necessary for the efficient administration of justice, the Clerk of the Court is directed to reassign the above captioned case to Judge Charles Lettow. Judge Francis M. Allegra no longer assigned to case. The Clerk is also directed to notify the parties that the case will not be included in the September 8, 2003, Expansion of ECF. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/29/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        OPPOSITION to [170] Dft's Second MOTION to Renew Its Motion to Consolidate filed by BOSTON EDISON COMPANY. [Original document located in Case No. 98-483C] Reply due by 8/29/2003. Service: 8/15/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 8/8/2003, Entered: 8/8/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Set/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 8/15/2003 (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 8/5/2003, Entered: 8/7/2003 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Dft's Motion to the Chief Judge for Leave to Correct Certificate of Service and to Waive Requirements of RCFC 5.3 Regarding "Dft's Second Motion [to the Chief Judge] to Renew its Motion to Consolidate." (Original Motion located in Case No. 98-126C) (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 170 Filed: 7/30/2003, Entered: 7/31/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SECOND MOTION to Renew Its Motion to Consolidate by USA. [COPY] (Original Document in Case No. 98-126C)Service: 7/29/03 by hand. Response due by 8/12/2003.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 169 Filed: 5/20/2003, Entered: 5/29/2003 Order Staying CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER STAYING CASE until further order of the court. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 168 Filed: 4/16/2003, Entered: 4/25/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 167 Filed: 4/2/2003, Entered: 4/8/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, re: further proceedings. Signed by Judge Diane G. Sypolt. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 166 Filed: 3/18/2003, Entered: 3/21/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 165 Filed: 3/14/2003, Entered: 3/17/2003 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER denying [163] Motion to unseal Plaintiff's motion to suspend briefing. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 164 Filed: 3/13/2003, Entered: 3/14/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by BOSTON EDISON COMPAN (Service: 3/13/03) to [163-1] motion to unseal Plaintiff's motion to suspend briefing. Reply due: 3/27/03. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 163 Filed: 3/11/2003, Entered: 3/11/2003, Terminated: 3/14/2003 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 2/24/03) to unseal Plaintiff's motion to suspend briefing . Response due: 3/13/03. FILED UNDER SEAL. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 162 Filed: 3/11/2003, Entered: 3/11/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by USA (Service: 2/24/03) to [152-1] motion to Stay proceedings four months to pursue settlement discussions. Reply due: 3/10/03. FILED UNDER SEAL. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 161 Filed: 3/11/2003, Entered: 3/11/2003 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [154-1] motion to temporarily file under seal two pleadings (signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 160 Filed: 3/11/2003, Entered: 3/11/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY by BOSTON EDISON COMPANY to response to [152-1] motion to Stay proceedings four months to pursue settlement discussions. Service: 3/6/03. FILED UNDER SEAL. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 159 Filed: 3/11/2003, Entered: 3/11/2003 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [157-1] motion for Leave to file under seal the reply to the motion to suspend briefing (signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 158 Filed: 3/7/2003, Entered: 3/10/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER re: See order [612-1] dated 3/7/03 in case 98-126C (signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 157 Filed: 3/6/2003, Entered: 3/7/2003, Terminated: 3/11/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by BOSTON EDISON COMPANY (Service: 3/6/03) for Leave to file under seal the reply to the motion to suspend briefing . Response due: 3/24/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 156 Filed: 2/25/2003, Entered: 3/4/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 155 Filed: 2/24/2003, Entered: 3/3/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 154 Filed: 2/24/2003, Entered: 3/3/2003, Terminated: 3/11/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 2/24/03) to temporarily file under seal two pleadings . Response due: 3/13/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 153 Filed: 2/10/2003, Entered: 2/21/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [151-1] motion for Leave to file under seal Motion to Suspend Briefing (signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 152 Filed: 2/6/2003, Entered: 2/13/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by BOSTON EDISON COMPANY (Service: 2/6/03) to Stay proceedings four months to pursue settlement discussions . Response due: 2/24/03. FILED UNDER SEAL. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 151 Filed: 2/6/2003, Entered: 2/13/2003, Terminated: 2/10/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by BOSTON EDISON COMPAN (Service : 2/6/03 ) for Leave to file under seal Motion to Suspend Briefing . Response due: 2/24/03 (VO)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 150 Filed: 2/5/2003, Entered: 2/13/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 149 Filed: 1/31/2003, Entered: 2/12/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 147 Filed: 1/29/2003, Entered: 2/7/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 148 Filed: 1/28/2003, Entered: 2/12/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [146-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the motions for partial summary judgment Response to [132-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment due 2/7/03 (signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 146 Filed: 1/27/2003, Entered: 2/3/2003, Terminated: 1/28/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by BOSTON EDISON COMPANY (Service: 1/24/03 to Extend Time to respond to the motions for partial summary judgment until 2/7/03, on the rate of spent nuclear fuel acceptance and the Greater-Than-Class-C waste issue. Response due: 2/10/03. FILED UNDER SEAL. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 145 Filed: 1/27/2003, Entered: 2/3/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [144-1] motion for Leave to under seal unopposed motion for enlargement of time (signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 144 Filed: 1/24/2003, Entered: 1/31/2003, Terminated: 1/27/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by BOSTON EDISON COMPANY (Service: 1/24/03) for Leave to under seal unopposed motion for enlargement of time . Response due: 2/10/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 143 Filed: 1/23/2003, Entered: 1/31/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER - see 98-126 C for order ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 142 Filed: 1/17/2003, Entered: 1/24/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [141-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the motions for summary judgment Response to [138-1] cross motion due 1/24/03, [132-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment due 1/24/03, [72-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment due 1/24/03 , and Reply to Response to Motion due 1/24/03 for [126-1] motion for Summary Judgment (signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 141 Filed: 1/15/2003, Entered: 1/24/2003, Terminated: 1/17/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by BOSTON EDISON COMPANY (Service: 1/15/03) to Extend Time to respond to the motions for summary judgment until 1/24/03 on the rate of spent nuclear acceptance and the Greater-Than-Class-C waste issue and to file reply to the motion for summary judgment on liability and respond to the cross-motion. Response due: 2/3/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 140 Filed: 1/9/2003, Entered: 1/15/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 139 Filed: 1/6/2003, Entered: 1/9/2003 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted FactCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA (filed by leave of the Judge). Service: 12/20/02 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 138 Filed: 1/6/2003, Entered: 1/9/2003 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CROSS MOTION by USA (Service: 12/20/02) and RESPONSE to [126-1] motion for Summary Judgment by BOSTON EDISON COMPANY (together with a separate appendix), filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 1/21/03. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 1/6/2003, Entered: 1/9/2003 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Deadline updated; Response to [138-1] cross motion reset to 1/21/03 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 137 Filed: 1/3/2003, Entered: 1/9/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [136-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to motions for partial summary judgment Response to [132-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment reset to 1/17/03, [72-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment reset to 1/17/03 (signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 136 Filed: 1/2/2003, Entered: 1/7/2003, Terminated: 1/3/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by BOSTON EDISON COMPAN (Service : 1/2/03 ) to Extend Time to respond to motions for partial summary judgment [until January 17, 2003]. Response due: 1/21/03 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 135 Filed: 12/13/2002, Entered: 12/17/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [134-1] motion to Extend Time within which to respond to motion for summary judgment Response to [126-1] motion for Summary Judgment due 12/20/02 (signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 134 Filed: 12/10/2002, Entered: 12/13/2002, Terminated: 12/13/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 12/10/02 ) to Extend Time within which to respond to motion for summary judgment , (until December 20, 2002). Response due: 12/27/02 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 133 Filed: 12/10/2002, Entered: 12/11/2002 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted FactCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA. Service: 10/25/02. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 132 Filed: 12/10/2002, Entered: 12/11/2002 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION, with appendix, by USA (Service: 10/25/02) for partial Summary Judgment regarding the rate of spent nuclear fuel acceptance. Response due: 1/10/03. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD) Modified on 12/11/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 131 Filed: 12/10/2002, Entered: 12/11/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [124-1] motion For leave to exceed the page limitation (signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 130 Filed: 12/10/2002, Entered: 12/11/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting in part, denying in part [123-1] motion requesting an order setting 11/25/02, as the deadline for plaintiff to respond to the government's summary judgment motions Response to [72-1] motion for partial Summary Judgment due 1/3/03 (signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 129 Filed: 12/10/2002, Entered: 12/11/2002 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Stefan Shaibani Service :12/10/02 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 128 Filed: 11/25/2002, Entered: 11/27/2002 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY by USA to response to [123-1] motion requesting an order setting 11/25/02, as the deadline for plaintiff to respond to the government's summary judgment motions. Service: 11/25/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 127 Filed: 11/12/2002, Entered: 11/15/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by BOSTON EDISON COMPANY (Service: 11/12/02) to [123-1] motion requesting an order setting 11/25/02, as the deadline for plaintiff to respond to the government's summary judgment motions. Reply due: 11/26/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 126 Filed: 11/12/2002, Entered: 11/15/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by BOSTON EDISON COMPANY (Service: 11/12/02) for Summary Judgment . Response due: 11/29/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 125 Filed: 11/12/2002, Entered: 11/15/2002 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by BOSTON EDISON COMPANY. Service: 11/12/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 124 Filed: 10/28/2002, Entered: 10/30/2002, Terminated: 12/10/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service: 10/28/02) For leave to exceed the page limitation for the motion for partial summary judgment. Response due: 11/14/02 (LTD) Modified on 11/13/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 123 Filed: 10/28/2002, Entered: 10/30/2002, Terminated: 12/10/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service: 10/25/02) requesting an order setting 11/25/02, as the deadline for plaintiff to respond to the government's summary judgment motions . Response due: 11/12/02. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 122 Filed: 10/16/2002, Entered: 10/18/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow for Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 121 Filed: 10/9/2002, Entered: 10/11/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER see 98-126C for Order. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 120 Filed: 9/10/2002, Entered: 9/16/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 119 Filed: 9/5/2002, Entered: 9/9/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 118 Filed: 8/22/2002, Entered: 8/27/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 117 Filed: 8/20/2002, Entered: 8/22/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 116 Filed: 8/16/2002, Entered: 8/21/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 115 Filed: 8/5/2002, Entered: 8/7/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 114 Filed: 7/30/2002, Entered: 8/5/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 113 Filed: 7/29/2002, Entered: 8/1/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER re: see order [467-1] dated 7/29/02, in case No. 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 112 Filed: 7/23/2002, Entered: 7/26/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 111 Filed: 7/16/2002, Entered: 7/18/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 110 Filed: 7/15/2002, Entered: 7/17/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 109 Filed: 7/10/2002, Entered: 7/12/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 108 Filed: 7/9/2002, Entered: 7/11/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER - see 98-126C for Order. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 107 Filed: 7/3/2002, Entered: 7/3/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 106 Filed: 7/2/2002, Entered: 7/3/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER-see 98-126C for Order ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 105 Filed: 6/28/2002, Entered: 7/1/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER-see 98-126C for Order ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 104 Filed: 6/18/2002, Entered: 6/19/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C.(signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (VO)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 103 Filed: 6/17/2002, Entered: 6/18/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER, Re: see order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (VO)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 102 Filed: 6/6/2002, Entered: 6/11/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER, re: see order in 98-126, filed 6/6/02. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 101 Filed: 6/3/2002, Entered: 6/4/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER, re: see order in 98-126, filed 6/03/02. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 100 Filed: 5/28/2002, Entered: 5/29/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 99 Filed: 5/20/2002, Entered: 5/21/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 98 Filed: 5/9/2002, Entered: 5/10/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER re: See [395-1] order in case No. 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 97 Filed: 5/7/2002, Entered: 5/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 96 Filed: 5/7/2002, Entered: 5/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 95 Filed: 5/6/2002, Entered: 5/7/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 94 Filed: 5/3/2002, Entered: 5/3/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir for Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 93 Filed: 4/26/2002, Entered: 4/29/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER, re: see order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 92 Filed: 4/23/2002, Entered: 4/24/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 91 Filed: 4/18/2002, Entered: 4/18/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER, re: See order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 90 Filed: 4/11/2002, Entered: 4/11/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER re: see order [344-2] dated 4/11/02 in Case No. 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 89 Filed: 3/25/2002, Entered: 3/26/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER, re: see order in 98-126 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 88 Filed: 3/19/2002, Entered: 3/20/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, re: See order in 98-126 (signed by Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 87 Filed: 3/5/2002, Entered: 3/6/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying the motion to preclude or, in the alternative, defer, depositions pursuant to Rule 30(b)(6) (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 86 Filed: 2/28/2002, Entered: 3/1/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting Plaintiff's motion to extend time to respond to interrogatories until 3/8/02 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 85 Filed: 2/20/2002, Entered: 2/21/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER, re: See Case No. 98-126 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 84 Filed: 2/13/2002, Entered: 2/14/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER, re: see order in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 83 Filed: 2/1/2002, Entered: 2/4/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER denying motion to reconsider filed 1/22/02 and granting the motion to revise dates in 9/26/01 order filed 1/24/02 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 82 Filed: 2/1/2002, Entered: 2/4/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER. See order in 98-126C filed 2/1/02. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 81 Filed: 1/29/2002, Entered: 1/29/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER setting Status Conference for 2:00 p.m. on 2/12/02 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Sypolt). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 80 Filed: 1/25/2002, Entered: 1/28/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER staying briefing in response to Defendant's Motion for Partial summary Judgment, filed on 11/28/01 (signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 79 Filed: 1/25/2002, Entered: 1/25/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER directing the Clerk's Office to return Defendant's Motion for partial Summary Judgment (signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 78 Filed: 1/11/2002, Entered: 1/14/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER see order in 98-126C filed 1/11/02. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 77 Filed: 1/3/2002, Entered: 1/7/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER see order in 98-126C filed 01/03/02 ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 76 Filed: 12/21/2001, Entered: 12/27/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by BOSTON EDISON COMPANY (Service: 12/21/01) to Extend Time to file response to the Motion for partial Summary Judgment until 1/25/02. Response due: 1/7/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 75 Filed: 11/30/2001, Entered: 12/3/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Setting Status Conference for 2:00 p.m. 12/13/01. ( signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra ) Copy to parties. (VO)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 74 Filed: 11/30/2001, Entered: 12/3/2001 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STATUS REPORT by USA Service: 11/30/01. (VO)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 73 Filed: 11/28/2001, Entered: 11/30/2001 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA. Service by hand: 11/27/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 72 Filed: 11/28/2001, Entered: 11/30/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION, with one volume of Appendix, by USA (Service by hand: 11/27/01) for partial Summary Judgment . Response due: 12/26/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 71 Filed: 11/27/2001, Entered: 11/29/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service: 11/27/01) to waive paragraph (1)(c)(iii) of the 8/2/99 Special Procedures Order to file two motions for partial disposition of the issues and For leave to exceed the page limitation by 10 pages for one of the Motions for Summary Judgment . Response due: 12/11/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 70 Filed: 11/20/2001, Entered: 11/21/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER see order in 98-126C filed 11/20/01 ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 69 Filed: 11/16/2001, Entered: 11/19/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER see order 98-126C filed 11/16/01. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 68 Filed: 11/14/2001, Entered: 11/16/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER see order in 98-126C filed 11/14/01. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 67 Filed: 11/14/2001, Entered: 11/16/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER see order in 98-126C filed 11/14/01. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 66 Filed: 11/8/2001, Entered: 11/9/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER. See 98-126C. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 65 Filed: 11/8/2001, Entered: 11/9/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER. See 98-126C. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 64 Filed: 11/7/2001, Entered: 11/8/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER. See 98-126 C ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 63 Filed: 11/6/2001, Entered: 11/7/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting motion to enlarge time to respond to motion to compel production of documents to 11/06/01 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 62 Filed: 11/6/2001, Entered: 11/7/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER re: Public Service Electric and Gas motion filed on 11/2/01, within which to respond to defendant's motion to compel is GRANTED (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ). Copy to parties. (see motion filed in 98-126C) (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 61 Filed: 11/6/2001, Entered: 11/7/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting motion to enlarge time to complete production of documents to 11/19/01 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 60 Filed: 11/1/2001, Entered: 11/5/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER denying [44-1] motion for Clarification of the Court's 9/26/01 order. Individual Judges retain the right to decide dispositive motions. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 59 Filed: 10/30/2001, Entered: 11/1/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER re: proposed stipulated order, etc. ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 58 Filed: 10/29/2001, Entered: 10/31/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [47-1] motion for Leave to file copies of the Motion to Transfer Responsibility, etc. and granting Plaintiff's Motion for leave to file copies of the transfer motion (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 57 Filed: 10/19/2001, Entered: 10/23/2001 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of supplemental certificate of service by USA. Service: 10/19/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 56 Filed: 10/19/2001, Entered: 10/23/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 10/19/01) to Compel . Response due: 11/5/01. (Filed with response to third party objections). (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 56 Filed: 10/19/2001, Entered: 10/23/2001 Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by USA to third party objections. Service: 10/19/01. (Filed with Motion to Compel). (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 54 Filed: 10/19/2001, Entered: 10/22/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER re: All filings shall bear the name of the discovery Judge, all matters to be brought to the attention of the Court shall be filed with the discovery Judge only, the Clerk of the Court is directed not to accept for filing any motion by a party in one of the captioned cases for leave to file material with a Judge in an individual case ( signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 55 Filed: 10/18/2001, Entered: 10/23/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service: 10/16/01) to Compel . Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 11/2/01. (Filed with response to third party objections). (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 55 Filed: 10/18/2001, Entered: 10/23/2001 ResponseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by USA to third party objections. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 10/16/01. (Filed with Motion to Compel). (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 53 Filed: 10/18/2001, Entered: 10/19/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER directing the Clerk's Office to file Defendant's response and Defendant's corrected certificate due 10/25/01 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 52 Filed: 10/17/2001, Entered: 10/18/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER re: Defendant's motion to extend time filed on 10/15/01, within which to file the proposed stipulated order concerning the scheduling and conduct of depositions in the coordinated discovery proceeding, is GRANTED, see motion filed in 98-126C (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 51 Filed: 10/17/2001, Entered: 10/18/2001 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE to the Court regarding liability by USA. Service: 10/12/01. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 50 Filed: 10/17/2001, Entered: 10/18/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER directing the Clerk's Office to file Defendant's notice regarding liability and Plaintiff's response to the notice is due by 10/29/01 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 49 Filed: 10/12/2001, Entered: 10/16/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying [45-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to interrogatories and granting defendant's request for expedited consideration (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 48 Filed: 10/12/2001, Entered: 10/15/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by BOSTON EDISON COMPANY (Service: 10/10/01) for Leave to file the Motion for Clarification . Response due: 10/29/01. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 47 Filed: 10/11/2001, Entered: 10/15/2001, Terminated: 10/29/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service: 10/10/01) for Leave to file copies of the Motion to Transfer Responsibility, etc. Response due: 10/29/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 46 Filed: 10/10/2001, Entered: 10/11/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by USA (Service: 10/10/01) to [45-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to interrogatories. Reply due: 10/24/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 45 Filed: 10/9/2001, Entered: 10/10/2001, Terminated: 10/12/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by BOSTON EDISON COMPANY (Service: 10/9/01) to Extend Time to respond to interrogatories until 10/29/01. Response due: 10/26/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 44 Filed: 10/9/2001, Entered: 10/10/2001, Terminated: 11/1/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by BOSTON EDISON COMPANY (Service by hand: 10/9/01) for Clarification of the Court's 9/26/01 order . Response due: 10/23/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 43 Filed: 10/3/2001, Entered: 10/4/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [42-1] motion to Extend Time to submit a plan for production of e-mail messages Plan is to be filed on 10/22/01 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 42 Filed: 10/3/2001, Entered: 10/4/2001, Terminated: 10/3/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 10/1/01) to Extend Time to submit a plan for production of e-mail messages until 10/22/01. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 41 Filed: 10/2/2001, Entered: 10/3/2001 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Erin Elizabeth Powell. Service: 10/2/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 40 Filed: 9/26/2001, Entered: 9/26/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER re: The Joint Motion for an Order for Consolidated Discovery filed on 7/10/01, is granted, woith the exception of document production, the parties are granted an enlargement of time until 10/1/01, to submit a plan addressing the production of e-mail messages (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 39 Filed: 9/13/2001, Entered: 9/13/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER setting Status Conference for 4:00 p.m. on 9/20/01 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 38 Filed: 8/22/2001, Entered: 8/22/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting motion for protective order in the form provided by Exhibit A of the parties 08/10/01 motion (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). See case number 98-126 C for motion. Protective order in 98-458 C is also granted, subject to reconsideration by assigned judge. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 37 Filed: 8/15/2001, Entered: 8/16/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER setting Status Conference for 2:00 p.m. on 9/11/01 (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 36 Filed: 7/20/2001, Entered: 7/20/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER re: The stay entered on February 20, 2001, is hereby lifted and Judge Diane G. Weinstein is hereby designated to preside over the discovery phase of the proceedings ( signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 35 Filed: 7/17/2001, Entered: 7/17/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [34-1] motion for Leave to file in this case a copy of filings made before Judge Wiese as managing Judge (signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 34 Filed: 7/13/2001, Entered: 7/16/2001, Terminated: 7/17/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by BOSTON EDISON COMPAN (Service: 7/13/01) for Leave to file in this case a copy of filings made before Judge Wiese as managing Judge . (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 33 Filed: 7/5/2001, Entered: 7/6/2001 RemarkCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Copy of Yankee Atomic's Motion for Leave to file documents relevant to the telephone conference with Judge Wiese. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 32 Filed: 5/31/2001, Entered: 6/1/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER resetting Status Conference for 2:30 p.m. on 6/14/01 (signed by Judge John P. Wiese). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 31 Filed: 5/29/2001, Entered: 5/30/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER scheduling Status Conference for 10:30 a.m., 6/14/01 ( signed by Judge John P. Wiese ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 30 Filed: 5/22/2001, Entered: 5/25/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER: On 1/8/2001, Dft filed a [17-1] Motion to the Chief Judge to reassign to a single Judge cases involving alleged breaches of the standard contract published at C.P.R. part 961. The Chief Judge hereby designates Judge Wiese as the managing judge in the above cited cases for the purpose of meeting with the parties to consider whether consolidation or other joint handling of discovery or other pre-trial matters is appropriate. Judge Wiese is requested to formulate a management plan, if one is appropriate, and is authorized to make appropriate rulings with respect to this purpose. (signed by Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir). Judge Wiese is designated as managing judge. Copy to parties. (LTD) Modified on 3/17/2004 (jcp, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 29 Filed: 2/27/2001, Entered: 2/27/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [24-1] motion for Leave to file in this case copy of reply to motion to reassign to a single Judge cases involving alleged breaches of contract, etc. (signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 28 Filed: 2/22/2001, Entered: 2/23/2001 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY (Service: 1/29/01 ) to [17-1] motion to the Chief Judge to reassign to a single Judge cases involving alleged breaches of the standard contract published at C.P.R. part 961, (together with a separate appendix). Reply due: 2/8/01 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 27 Filed: 2/22/2001, Entered: 2/23/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [26-1] motion for Leave to file in this case a copy of "Yankee Utilities" opposition to motion to reassign cases ( signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 26 Filed: 2/20/2001, Entered: 2/22/2001, Terminated: 2/22/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by BOSTON EDISON COMPAN (Service: 2/20/01) for Leave to file in this case a copy of "Yankee Utilities" opposition to motion to reassign cases . Response due: 2/20/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 25 Filed: 2/20/2001, Entered: 2/22/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER re: This case is hereby stayed until further order of the Court (signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 24 Filed: 2/20/2001, Entered: 2/21/2001, Terminated: 2/27/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 2/20/01) for Leave to file inthis case a copy of reply to motion to reassign to a single Judge cases involving alleged breaches of contract, etc. Response due: 3/9/01 (HW) Modified on 02/21/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 23 Filed: 1/31/2001, Entered: 1/31/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by BOSTON EDISON COMPAN (Service: 1/29/01 ) to [17-1] motion to the Chief Judge to reassign to a single Judge cases involving alleged breaches of the standard contract published at C.P.R. part 961. Reply due: 2/12/01 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 22 Filed: 1/31/2001, Entered: 1/31/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [21-1] motion for Leave to file a copy of "Plaintif's memorandum in opposition to the USA's motion to the Chief Judge to reassign to a single Judge the fourteen pending standard contract cases" (signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra). Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 21 Filed: 1/30/2001, Entered: 1/30/2001, Terminated: 1/31/2001 Motion for Leave to FileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by BOSTON EDISON COMPAN (Service: 1/30/01) for Leave to file a copy of "Plaintif's memorandum in opposition to the USA's motion to the Chief Judge to reassign to a single Judge the fourteen pending standard contract cases" . (FE) Modified on 01/30/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 20 Filed: 1/29/2001, Entered: 1/30/2001 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                See 30-1 Response to motion filed January 29, 2001, in 98-483C Florida Power & Light Company. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 19 Filed: 1/22/2001, Entered: 1/23/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by BOSTON EDISON COMPAN (Service by hand: 1/22/01) to Extend Time to respond to the USA's motion to the Chief Judge to reassign cases to a single Judge , (until January 29, 2001). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 18 Filed: 1/18/2001, Entered: 1/19/2001 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 1/18/01. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 17 Filed: 1/11/2001, Entered: 1/11/2001, Terminated: 5/22/2001 Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service: 1/8/01) to the Chief Judge to reassign to a single Judge cases involving alleged breaches of the standard contract published at C.P.R. part 961 . Response due: 1/25/01. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 16 Filed: 1/11/2001, Entered: 1/11/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [15-1] motion for Leave to file a copy of the USA's motion to the Chief Judge to reassign to a single judge cases involving alleged breaches of the standard contract published at 10 C.F.R. Part 961 ( signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 15 Filed: 1/9/2001, Entered: 1/9/2001, Terminated: 1/11/2001 Motion for Leave to FileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service: 1/9/01) for Leave to file a copy of the USA's motion to the Chief Judge to reassign to a single judge cases involving alleged breaches of the standard contract published at 10 C.F.R. Part 961 . Response due: 1/23/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 14 Filed: 12/15/2000, Entered: 12/18/2000 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of change of address by Alexander D. Tomaszczuk. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 13 Filed: 11/2/2000, Entered: 11/6/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER the existing stay is continued until 21 days after the U.S. Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit issues its mandates in Northern States Power Co. and Maine Yankee Atomic Power Co. Within 30 days of the issuance of such mandate, the parties shall file a joint status report. ( signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 12 Filed: 10/31/2000, Entered: 11/2/2000 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                JOINT STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 10/31/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 11 Filed: 10/13/2000, Entered: 10/18/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER set joint Status Report deadline to 10/31/00. ( signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 10 Filed: 9/13/2000, Entered: 9/14/2000 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of FEDERAL CIRCUIT DECISIONS, AS REQUIRED BY THIS COURTS ORDER DATED 10/21/99 by BOSTON EDISON COMPAN. Service: 9/13/00. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 9 Filed: 10/21/1999, Entered: 10/26/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [7-1] motion to stay proceedings. The parties shall notify the court within 14 days of any decisions in U.S. Court of Appeals cases Northern States v. U.S.; Main Yankee v. U.S. ( signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 8 Filed: 9/7/1999, Entered: 10/21/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER re: Defendant's obligation to file a response to the complaint is suspended until further order. ( signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 7 Filed: 8/12/1999, Entered: 8/12/1999, Terminated: 10/21/1999 Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 8/12/99 ) to stay proceedings. Response due: 8/30/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 6 Filed: 8/2/1999, Entered: 8/2/1999 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SPECIAL PROCEDURES ORDER of Judge Francis M. Allegra directing parties to confer with chambers and arrange for preliminary status conference; identifying timing and filing requirements for conference (with special requirements if defendant intends to proceed by motion in lieu of answer); precluding the filing of dispositive motions until the conference has been held; and establishing special procedures regarding, inter alia,mandatory disclosure, limitations on discovery, enlargements and the content of the joint preliminary status report. Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 5 Filed: 7/29/1999, Entered: 7/30/1999 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Harold Dewitt Lester Jr. Service: 7/29/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 4 Filed: 7/20/1999, Entered: 7/20/1999 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of reassignment to Judge Francis M. Allegra. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 7/12/1999, Entered: 7/13/1999 Notice of Related Cases
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by BOSTON EDISON COMPAN of related cases: 98-621 C, 98-514 C, 98-485 C, 98-483 C, 98-429 C, 98-474 C, 98-488 C, 98-614 C, 98-126 C, 98-484 C. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 7/12/1999, Entered: 7/13/1999 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of assignment to Judge Marian Blank Horn. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 7/12/1999, Entered: 7/13/1999 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #047816. Answer due on 9/10/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 198 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?