ELLINGSON LUMBER v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:99-cv-00448-CCM
District Judge Christine O.C. Miller, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ELLINGSON LUMBER COMPANY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Saltman and Stevens PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alan Irving Saltman +1 202 452 2140 +1 202 775 8217 asaltman@saltmanandstevens.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory Thomas Jaeger +1 202 353 7955 +1 202 353 7988 gregory.jaeger@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 7/13/1999
Jury Demand
Demand $843000
Nature of Suit -
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 7/13/2001
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, ENDADR
  Entries (27) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 25 Filed: 7/13/2001, Entered: 12/12/2001 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
DUPLICATE ENTRY FOR STATISTICAL USE ONLY. (FE)
    LREF
    Blank 25 Filed: 7/13/2001, Entered: 7/13/2001
    Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal with prejudice by ELLINGSON LUMBER and USA. Filed by leave of the judge . Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41 (a)(1)(B). Copy to parties. (AB)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 7/13/2001, Entered: 7/13/2001
      Case closed (AB)
        LREF
        Blank 24 Filed: 7/3/2001, Entered: 7/3/2001
        STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 7/2/01 (DS)
          LREF
          Blank 23 Filed: 6/15/2001, Entered: 6/15/2001
          STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 6/15/01. (LTD)
            LREF
            Blank 22 Filed: 4/20/2001, Entered: 4/25/2001 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER Status Report deadline to 6/15/01 (signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller). Copy to parties. (FE)
              LREF
              Blank 21 Filed: 4/18/2001, Entered: 4/19/2001 Status Report
              STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 4/18/01. (FE)
                LREF
                Blank 20 Filed: 4/12/2001, Entered: 4/13/2001 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
                STATUS REPORT ORDER. Defendant's Status report due on 4/19/01 (signed by Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir for Judge Odell Cook Miller). Copyto parties. (LTD)
                  LREF
                  Blank 19 Filed: 11/15/2000, Entered: 11/17/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                  ORDER set Defendant's Status Report deadline to 12/15/00. ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                    LREF
                    Blank 18 Filed: 11/13/2000, Entered: 11/14/2000 Status Report
                    STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 11/9/00 (JT)
                      LREF
                      Blank 17 Filed: 7/31/2000, Entered: 8/2/2000 Status Report
                      STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 7/31/00. (FE)
                        LREF
                        Blank 16 Filed: 6/13/2000, Entered: 6/14/2000 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                        SCHEDULING ORDER setting Status Report due on 7/31/00 ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller). Copy to parties. (FE)
                          LREF
                          Blank 15 Filed: 6/12/2000, Entered: 6/13/2000 Status Report
                          STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 6/12/00. (FE)
                            LREF
                            Blank 14 Filed: 3/14/2000, Entered: 3/16/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                            ORDER suspending this case as well as 99-869C and 00-91C. Set Defendant's Status Report deadline to 6/12/00. ( by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 03/16/2000
                              LREF
                              Blank 13 Filed: 3/13/2000, Entered: 3/14/2000 Terminated:
                              MOTION by USA (Service : 3/13/00 ) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint [until June 11, 2000]. Response due: 3/30/00 (JT)
                                LREF
                                Blank 12 Filed: 3/13/2000, Entered: 3/14/2000 Status Report
                                STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 3/13/00 (JT)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 11 Filed: 2/9/2000, Entered: 2/11/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                  ORDER granting [10-1] motion to Extend Time to file a response to the complaint. Reset answer deadline to 3/13/00. ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 10 Filed: 2/8/2000, Entered: 2/9/2000, Terminated: 2/9/2000 Terminated:
                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 2/8/00) to Extend Time to file a response to the complaint , (until March 13, 2000). (FE)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 9 Filed: 11/18/1999, Entered: 11/23/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                      ORDER granting [8-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint. Reset Answer deadline to 2/10/00. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith for Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 8 Filed: 11/12/1999, Entered: 11/16/1999, Terminated: 11/18/1999 Terminated:
                                        MOTION by USA (Service : 11/12/99 ) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint [until February 10, 1999]. Response due: 11/29/99 (JT)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 7 Filed: 10/29/1999, Entered: 11/8/1999 Order Referring Case to ADRCourt Filing
                                          ORDER referring case to ADR administrator for assigment of a third-party neutral pursuant to General Order No. 13. ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) (DS)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 6 Filed: 10/27/1999, Entered: 10/30/1999 Terminated:
                                            JOINT MOTION by ELLINGSON LUMBER, USA to refer the pending case for Alternative Dispute Resolution. (JT) Modified on 10/30/1999
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 5 Filed: 9/14/1999, Entered: 9/17/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                              ORDER granting [4-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint Answer deadline to 11/12/99 (signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 4 Filed: 9/10/1999, Entered: 9/14/1999, Terminated: 9/14/1999 Terminated:
                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 9/10/99 ) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint [until November 12, 1999]. Response due: 9/27/99 (JT)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 8/5/1999, Entered: 8/6/1999 Notice of Appearance/
                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Gregory Thomas Jaeger. Service : 8/5/99 (JT)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 7/13/1999, Entered: 7/13/1999 Court Filing
                                                    Notice of assignment to Judge Christine O.C. Miller. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 7/13/1999, Entered: 7/13/1999
                                                      COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #047819. Answer due on 9/13/99. (FE)
                                                        LREF

                                                        Space Space

                                                        Statistics

                                                        This case has been viewed 66 times.

                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                        Space
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                         
                                                        PlainSite
                                                        Sign Up
                                                        Need Password Help?