JIM WALTER RESOURCES v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:99-cv-00516-FMA
District Judge Francis M. Allegra, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Jim Walter Resources, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hunton & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Martin Rolfe +1 804 788 8200 rrolfe@hunton.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Charles Stoddart +1 202 307 6445 robert.c.stoddart@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 7/28/1999
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 206 - Tax - Excise
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County
Terminated 6/12/2006
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, ECF
  Entries (80) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 73 Filed: 6/12/2006, Entered: 6/12/2006
STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice, filed by all parties.. (Stoddart, Robert)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 6/12/2006, Entered: 6/13/2006 Terminated Case - Public
    Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(ii) this day. (dls )
      LREF
      Legal Document 72 Filed: 6/9/2006, Entered: 6/9/2006
      JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Stoddart, Robert)
        LREF
        Legal Document 71 Filed: 5/10/2006, Entered: 5/10/2006
        JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Stoddart, Robert)
          LREF
          Legal Document 70 Filed: 4/10/2006, Entered: 4/10/2006
          JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Stoddart, Robert)
            LREF
            Legal Document 69 Filed: 3/10/2006, Entered: 3/10/2006
            STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Stoddart, Robert)
              LREF
              Legal Document 68 Filed: 2/8/2006, Entered: 2/8/2006
              JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Stoddart, Robert)
                LREF
                Legal Document 67 Filed: 1/11/2006, Entered: 1/11/2006 Court Filing
                STATUS REPORT ORDER. Joint status report due by 2/8/2006, 3/10/2006, and every thirty days thereafter. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (Allegra, Francis)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 1/10/2006, Entered: 1/12/2006 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                  Set/Reset Deadlines: .Joint Status Report due by 3/10/2006 (mij, )
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 66 Filed: 12/12/2005, Entered: 12/12/2005
                    JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by USA. (Stoddart, Robert)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 65 Filed: 9/12/2005, Entered: 9/12/2005
                      JOINT STATUS REPORT by all parties. (Stoddart, Robert)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 64 Filed: 6/13/2005, Entered: 6/13/2005
                        JOINT STATUS REPORT by USA. (Stoddart, Robert)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 63 Filed: 3/25/2005, Entered: 3/25/2005
                          NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (jat, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 62 Filed: 3/25/2005, Entered: 3/25/2005 Court Filing
                            ORDER directing the Clerk to designate this case as an electronic (ECF) case. All future filings will be in electronic form. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (jat, )
                              LREF
                              Blank 61 Filed: 3/14/2005, Entered: 3/16/2005 Joint Status Report
                              JOINT STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 3/14/2005.(mb2, )
                                LREF
                                Blank 60 Filed: 12/13/2004, Entered: 12/21/2004 Joint Status Report
                                JOINT STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 12/13/04.(dw1)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 59 Filed: 9/13/2004, Entered: 9/16/2004 Joint Status Report
                                  JOINT STATUS REPORT by all parties. Service: 9/13/2004.(jcp, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 58 Filed: 6/14/2004, Entered: 6/16/2004 Joint Status Report
                                    JOINT STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 6/14/04.(dw1)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 57 Filed: 3/15/2004, Entered: 3/16/2004 Joint Status Report
                                      JOINT STATUS REPORT by all parties. Service: 3/15/2004.(jcp, )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 56 Filed: 12/15/2003, Entered: 12/19/2003 Joint Status Report
                                        JOINT STATUS REPORT by all parties. Service: 12/15/03.(jcp, )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 55 Filed: 9/15/2003, Entered: 9/17/2003 Joint Status Report
                                          JOINT STATUS REPORT by JIM WALTER RESOURCES, INC., USA. Service: 9/15/03.(jcp, )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 9/15/2003, Entered: 9/17/2003 Status Report/Order
                                            STATUS REPORT ORDER:In lieu of all other status report orders, the parties shall file a Joint Status Report on or before 9/15/2003, and every 90 days thereafter, discussing the process of the stipulation for judgment process elected by pltfs. [ORIGINAL DOCUMENT LOCATED IN CASE NO. 99-267T] Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (jcp, )
                                              LREF
                                              Blank -- Filed: 9/15/2003, Entered: 9/17/2003 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                              Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/15/2003. (jcp, )
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 54 Filed: 3/6/2003, Entered: 3/10/2003 Status Report
                                                JOINT STATUS REPORT by JIM WALTER RESOURCES, and USA. Service: 3/6/03 (HW)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 53 Filed: 12/16/2002, Entered: 12/18/2002 Status Report
                                                  STATUS REPORT by JIM WALTER RESOURCES. Service: 12/13/02. (LTD)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 52 Filed: 12/13/2002, Entered: 12/18/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER denying [47-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, denying [47-2] motion for partial Summary Judgment. (See 99-267 for Order) ( signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 51 Filed: 11/27/2002, Entered: 12/2/2002 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
                                                      STATUS REPORT ORDER. Plaintiff's Status reports due 12/20/02 (signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 50 Filed: 11/21/2002, Entered: 11/25/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER granting [49-1] motion to Extend Time to file response to protective motion for partial dismissal or for partial summary judgment Response to [47-1] motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and [47-2] motion for partial Summary Judgment due 1/3/03 (signed by Judge Edward J. Damich for Judge Francis M. Allegra). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 49 Filed: 11/13/2002, Entered: 11/15/2002, Terminated: 11/21/2002 Terminated:
                                                          MOTION by JIM WALTER RESOURCES (Service: 11/12/02) to Extend Time to file response to protective motion for partial dismissal or for partial summary judgment , (until January 3, 2003). (FE)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 48 Filed: 11/12/2002, Entered: 11/14/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER setting Status Conference for 10:00a.m. 11/27/02 ( signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra ) Copy to parties. (VO) Modified on 11/15/2002
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 47 Filed: 11/1/2002, Entered: 11/15/2002, Terminated: 12/13/2002 Terminated:
                                                              SEE NO. 99-267T FOR MOTION by USA (Service: 10/29/02) to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or for partial Summary Judgment . Response due: 11/29/02 (DS) Modified on 11/15/2002
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 46 Filed: 10/25/2002, Entered: 10/29/2002 Status Report
                                                                STATUS REPORT by JIM WALTER RESOURCES Service: 10/24/02 (HW)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 45 Filed: 9/3/2002, Entered: 9/5/2002 Memorandum
                                                                  MEMORANDUM by JIM WALTER RESOURCES re: U.S. Shoe Corp v. United States. Service: 8/30/02. (LTD)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 44 Filed: 9/3/2002, Entered: 9/5/2002 Status Report
                                                                    JOINT STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 9/3/02 (JT)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 43 Filed: 9/3/2002, Entered: 9/5/2002 Memorandum
                                                                      MEMORANDUM by USA re: [42-2] order. Service: 9/3/02 (JT)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 42 Filed: 7/29/2002, Entered: 7/31/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER Parties shall file a short memorandum not to exceed five pages in length by 9/3/02 (signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 41 Filed: 7/23/2002, Entered: 7/25/2002 Terminated:
                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service: 7/23/02) for Leave to alert the court to new authority . Response due: 8/9/02. (LTD)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 40 Filed: 7/8/2002, Entered: 7/9/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                            ORDER granting [39-1] motion to Correct the transcript (signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 39 Filed: 6/28/2002, Entered: 7/1/2002, Terminated: 7/8/2002 Terminated:
                                                                              MOTION by JIM WALTER RESOURCES (Service : 6/27/02 ) to Correct the transcript . Response due: 7/15/02 (HW)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 38 Filed: 6/21/2002, Entered: 6/24/2002 Description not availableCourt Filing
                                                                                SPECIAL PROCEDURES ORDER of Judge Francis M. Allegra. Copy to parties. (FE) Modified on 06/25/2002
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 37 Filed: 6/10/2002, Entered: 6/18/2002 Transcript
                                                                                  SEE NO. 99-267T FOR TRANSCRIPT of proceedings for oral argument held May 20, 2002. Notice to parties. (DS)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 36 Filed: 6/5/2002, Entered: 6/6/2002 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                    STATUS REPORT ORDER. Joint Status report due 9/3/02 (signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 35 Filed: 6/4/2002, Entered: 6/5/2002 Status Report
                                                                                      JOINT STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 6/4/02. (LTD)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 5/20/2002, Entered: 6/18/2002 Oral Argument
                                                                                        Oral Argument re: [21-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment by JIM WALTER RESOURCES (See Case No. 99-267T for transcript) (DS)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 34 Filed: 3/18/2002, Entered: 3/19/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                          ORDER oral argument set for 2:00 p.m. 5/20/02 for [21-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment , in the National Courts Building, 717 Madison Pl., N.W., Washington, D.C. ( signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 33 Filed: 3/12/2002, Entered: 3/13/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                            ORDER oral argument set for 10:00 a.m. on 5/20/02 for [21-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment (signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 32 Filed: 2/4/2002, Entered: 2/5/2002 Status Report
                                                                                              Joint STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 2/4/02 (HW)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 31 Filed: 1/25/2002, Entered: 1/28/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                ORDER Joint Status Report due 2/5/02 , and Telephonic Status Conference set for 2:00 p.m. on 2/13/02 (signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 30 Filed: 1/18/2002, Entered: 1/18/2002
                                                                                                  RESPONSE by JIM WALTER RESOURCES to [28-2] order. Service: 1/17/02. (LTD)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 29 Filed: 1/17/2002, Entered: 1/18/2002 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                    Notice of reassignment to Judge Francis M. Allegra . Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 28 Filed: 1/3/2002, Entered: 1/4/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER denying [27-1] motion For reconsideration of [26-1] order under Rule 83.2; and granting plaintiff leave to file a sur-reply brief by 1/22/02 . ( signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 27 Filed: 12/28/2001, Entered: 1/2/2002, Terminated: 1/3/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                        MOTION by JIM WALTER RESOURCES (Service : 12/27/01 ) For reconsideration of [26-1] order under Rule 83.2 re: case 99-267T. (AB)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 26 Filed: 12/18/2001, Entered: 1/2/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER - See 99-267 T for defendant's motion for leave to file a reply brief in USIBELLI COAL MINE, INC. ( signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 25 Filed: 12/7/2001, Entered: 12/10/2001 Status Report
                                                                                                            Joint STATUS REPORT by JIM WALTER RESOURCES. Service: 12/7/01. (HW)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 24 Filed: 10/24/2001, Entered: 10/25/2001 Statement of Genuine IssuesCourt Filing
                                                                                                              STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by JIM WALTER RESOURCES. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 10/22/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 23 Filed: 10/24/2001, Entered: 10/25/2001 Reply to Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                REPLY by JIM WALTER RESOURCES to response to [21-1] motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 10/22/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 22 Filed: 10/23/2001, Entered: 10/24/2001 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                  PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by JIM WALTER RESOURCES, et al. Service: 10/22/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 21 Filed: 10/23/2001, Entered: 10/24/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                    MOTION by JIM WALTER RESOURCES, et al. (Service: 10/22/01) for Partial Summary Judgment . Response due: 11/23/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 20 Filed: 10/23/2001, Entered: 10/24/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service: 10/23/01) for Partial Summary Judgment . Response due: 11/23/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 19 Filed: 10/23/2001, Entered: 10/24/2001 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                        PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA. Service: 10/23/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 18 Filed: 10/23/2001, Entered: 10/24/2001 Statement of Genuine Issues
                                                                                                                          STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES by USA. Service: 10/23/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 17 Filed: 10/11/2001, Entered: 10/12/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER Joint Status Report deadline is 12/7/01 , and All briefs on motions for partial summary judgment are due by 10/23/01 (signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 16 Filed: 9/28/2001, Entered: 10/1/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [14-1] motion for Leave to file the attached letter (signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 15 Filed: 9/28/2001, Entered: 10/1/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                ORDER setting telephonic Status Conference for 2:00 p.m. on 10/10/01 (signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 14 Filed: 9/27/2001, Entered: 9/28/2001, Terminated: 9/28/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 9/27/01) for Leave to file the attached letter . Response due: 10/15/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 13 Filed: 9/21/2001, Entered: 9/24/2001 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                    REPLY by USA to response to [12-1] motion for Pre-trial conference, [12-2] motion for instructions whether an answer is needed to raise defenses first made necessary by the denial of certiorari in Cyprus Amax. Service: 9/21/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 12 Filed: 9/17/2001, Entered: 9/18/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                      MOTION by JIM WALTER RESOURCES (Service: 9/17/01) for Pre-trial conference , and for instructions whether an answer is needed to raise defenses first made necessary by the denial of certiorari in Cyprus Amax . Response due: 10/4/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 11 Filed: 8/30/2001, Entered: 8/31/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 8/30/01) for instructions whether an answer is needed to raise defenses first made necessary by the denial of certiorari in Cyprus Amax (with status report). Response due: 9/17/01. (LTD) Modified on 08/31/2001
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 11 Filed: 8/30/2001, Entered: 8/31/2001 Status Report
                                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 8/30/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 10 Filed: 7/5/2001, Entered: 7/6/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            MOTION (together with status report) by USA (Service: 7/5/01) to Transfer Case to Judge Hodges . Response due: 7/23/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 10 Filed: 7/5/2001, Entered: 7/6/2001 Status Report
                                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 7/5/01. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 9 Filed: 9/16/1999, Entered: 9/21/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [8-1] motion to Stay proceedings. The parties shall file a joint status report 30 days after the final decision in Cyrus Amax is issued. ( signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 8 Filed: 9/14/1999, Entered: 9/17/1999, Terminated: 9/16/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                  JOINT MOTION by USA (Service: 9/13/99) to Stay proceedings . (FE)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 7 Filed: 9/10/1999, Entered: 9/14/1999 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM by USA re: the basis for its eventual motion to dismiss. Service: 9/10/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 6 Filed: 9/8/1999, Entered: 9/9/1999 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      SCHEDULING ORDER setting Preliminary Status conference for 10:00 a.m. 9/23/99, in the National Courts Building, 717 Madison Pl., N.W., Washington, D.C. 20005, defendant shall file a memorandum briefly identifying the factual and/or legal bases upon which it plans to file a dispositive motion on or before 9/13/99 and if plaintiff wishes to file a response, the response must be filed by 9/20/99 (signed by Judge Nancy Firestone). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 5 Filed: 9/2/1999, Entered: 9/3/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        ORDER re: Special Procedures (signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 4 Filed: 8/31/1999, Entered: 9/1/1999 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Robert Charles Stoddart. Service: 8/31/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 3 Filed: 8/9/1999, Entered: 8/9/1999 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of letter from by JIM WALTER RESOURCES re: correction page for schedule A, filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 8/9/99. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 2 Filed: 7/28/1999, Entered: 7/30/1999 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              Notice of assignment to Judge Nancy B. Firestone. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 7/28/1999, Entered: 7/30/1999 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #047895. Answer due on 9/27/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 152 times.

                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?