TEMPLE-INLAND INC. v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:99-cv-00699-EGB
District Judge Eric G. Bruggink, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo TEMPLE-INLAND INC., Plaintiff

Represented by Sutherland Asbill & Brennan LLP

v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Office COFC
Filed 8/9/1999
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 511 - Taking - FIRREA
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County None
Terminated 6/21/2006
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (102) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 94 Filed: 6/21/2006, Entered: 6/22/2006 Stipulation of Dismissal
STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice filed by all parties. Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(ii) this day. (dls )
    LREF
    Blank 93 Filed: 6/14/2006, Entered: 6/15/2006 Terminated:
    MOTION to Stay Further Proceedings , filed by USA. Service: 6/14/2006.Response due by 7/3/2006.(mb2, )
      LREF
      Blank 92 Filed: 5/31/2006, Entered: 6/6/2006 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
      STATUS REPORT ORDER: Status Report due by 6/16/2006. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mb2, )
        LREF
        Blank 91 Filed: 5/18/2006, Entered: 5/25/2006 Joint Status Report
        JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. Service: 5/18/2006.(mb2, )
          LREF
          Blank 90 Filed: 4/25/2006, Entered: 4/26/2006 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
          STATUS REPORT ORDER: Status Report due by 5/19/2006. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mb2, )
            LREF
            Blank 89 Filed: 4/14/2006, Entered: 4/19/2006 Joint Status Report
            JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (mb2, )
              LREF
              Blank 88 Filed: 3/15/2006, Entered: 3/20/2006 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
              STATUS REPORT ORDER: Parties Joint Status Report due by 4/14/2006. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. for Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (dw1)
                LREF
                Blank 87 Filed: 3/10/2006, Entered: 3/13/2006 Joint Status Report
                JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. Service: 3/10/2006.(mb2, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 86 Filed: 2/16/2006, Entered: 2/22/2006 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
                  STATUS REPORT ORDER: Status Report due by 3/10/2006. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mb2, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 85 Filed: 1/25/2006, Entered: 1/30/2006 Status Report
                    STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. Service: 1/26/2006.(mb2, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 84 Filed: 12/14/2005, Entered: 12/20/2005 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
                      STATUS REPORT ORDER: Status Report due by 1/26/2006. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mb2, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 83 Filed: 11/30/2005, Entered: 12/5/2005 Terminated:
                        Joint Status Report and MOTION to Stay the Proceedings , filed by TEMPLE-INLAND INC., USA. Service: 11/30/2005. Response due by 12/19/2005. (mb2, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 82 Filed: 11/8/2005, Entered: 11/9/2005 Published OpinionCourt Filing
                          PUBLISHED OPINION on [66] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by TEMPLE-INLAND INC., Status Report due by 11/30/2005. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mb2, )
                            LREF
                            Sealed Legal Document 81 Filed: 9/14/2005, Entered: 9/16/2005 Response
                            **SEALED**RESPONSE to [80] Supplemental Memorandum, filed by USA. Service: 9/14/2005.(mb2, )
                              LREF
                              Sealed Legal Document 80 Filed: 8/31/2005, Entered: 9/2/2005 Supplemental Brief
                              **SEALED**SUPPLEMENTAL Memorandum to Address First Heights Bank, filed by TEMPLE-INLAND INC. Service: 8/26/2005.(mb2, )
                                LREF
                                Blank 79 Filed: 8/31/2005, Entered: 9/2/2005 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                ORDER granting [78] Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum to Address First Heights Bank.Defendant may response by 9/14/2005. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mb2, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 78 Filed: 8/26/2005, Entered: 8/30/2005, Terminated: 8/31/2005 Terminated:
                                  MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum to Address First Heights Bank, filed by TEMPLE-INLAND INC. Service: 8/26/2005. Response due by 9/12/2005. (mb2, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 8/17/2005, Entered: 8/18/2005 Transcript
                                    TRANSCRIPT (Pg 1-160) of Proceedings held on 7/20/05 before Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (eph, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 7/22/2005, Entered: 7/22/2005
                                      Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 8/22/2005. (vp1, )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 77 Filed: 7/21/2005, Entered: 7/25/2005 Order on Motion to Amend/CorrectCourt Filing
                                        ORDER granting [76] Motion to Correct Transcript. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mb2, )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 76 Filed: 7/18/2005, Entered: 7/20/2005, Terminated: 7/21/2005 Terminated:
                                          MOTION to Correct Transcript, filed by TEMPLE-INLAND INC.Service: 7/14/2005. Response due by 8/1/2005. (mb2, )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 6/8/2005, Entered: 6/8/2005
                                            Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 6/20/2005. (vp1, )
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 75 Filed: 5/20/2005, Entered: 5/26/2005 Order Setting Oral Argument/Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                              ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion [66] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment: Motion Hearing set for 7/20/2005 at 10:00 AM in National Courts Building before Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mb2, )
                                                LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 5/19/2005, Entered: 5/31/2005 Transcript
                                                TRANSCRIPT (Pg 1-34) of Proceedings held on 5/19/05 before Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (eph, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Sealed Legal Document 74 Filed: 5/9/2005, Entered: 5/11/2005 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                  **SEALED**REPLY to Response to Motion (with separate appendix) re [66] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, filed by TEMPLE-INLAND INC. Service: 5/9/2005 by hand.(mb2, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 73 Filed: 5/2/2005, Entered: 5/9/2005 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER granting [72] Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply re [66] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. Reply due by 5/9/2005. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mb2, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 72 Filed: 4/26/2005, Entered: 4/28/2005, Terminated: 5/2/2005 Terminated:
                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to [66] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, until 5/2/2005, filed by TEMPLE-INLAND INC. Service: 4/25/2005. Response due by 5/12/2005. (mb2, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 71 Filed: 4/13/2005, Entered: 4/15/2005 Status Conference OrderCourt Filing
                                                        STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 5/19/2005 at 02:00 PM before Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mb2, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Sealed Legal Document 70 Filed: 4/6/2005, Entered: 4/11/2005 Response to Motion
                                                          **SEALED**RESPONSE to [66] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, filed by USA. (filed with two volume separate appendix) Reply due by 5/2/2005. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 3/31/2005.(mb2, ) Modified on 4/11/2005 (mb2, ). Modified on 4/11/2005 (mb2, ).
                                                            LREF
                                                            Sealed Legal Document 69 Filed: 4/6/2005, Entered: 4/8/2005 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fa
                                                            **SEALED**RESPONSE to [67] PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by USA filed by USA. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 3/31/2005.(mb2, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Sealed Legal Document 68 Filed: 3/1/2005, Entered: 3/2/2005 ~Notice (other)
                                                              **SEALED**NOTICE of Filing Supplement to Appendix by TEMPLE-INLAND INC. re [66] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 2/21/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 67 Filed: 2/11/2005, Entered: 2/14/2005 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by TEMPLE-INLAND INC. Service: 2/11/2005.(mb2, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 66 Filed: 2/11/2005, Entered: 2/14/2005 Terminated:
                                                                  **SEALED** MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (with 10 Volume Appendix) by TEMPLE-INLAND INC.Service: 2/11/2005. Response due by 3/14/2005 (mb2, )
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 65 Filed: 12/15/2004, Entered: 12/23/2004 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiff Reply due by 5/2/2005. Defendant's Cross Motions due by 3/31/2005. Plaintiff's Dispositive Motion(s) due by 2/11/2005. Defendant's Reply due by 5/20/2005. Signed by Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (dw1)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 64 Filed: 12/9/2004, Entered: 12/15/2004 Joint Status Report
                                                                      JOINT STATUS REPORT by all parties. Service: 12/9/2004.(dw1)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 63 Filed: 6/3/2004, Entered: 6/7/2004 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER granting [62] Pltfs' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. On or before 12/10/2004, a joint status report shall be filed proposing scheduling of briefing for any motion(s) for summary judgment upon damages. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (jcp, )
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 62 Filed: 5/28/2004, Entered: 6/2/2004, Terminated: 6/3/2004 Terminated:
                                                                          UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time until 6/18/2004 for Pltfs to Produce Revised Company and Expert Reports and until 7/2/2004 for Dfts to Notify Pltfs Whether it Wishes to Engage an Additional Expert, by TEMPLE-INLAND INC. Service: 5/28/2004. Response due by 6/14/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 61 Filed: 4/29/2004, Entered: 5/3/2004 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                            ORDER granting [59] Motion for leave to engage an additional testifying expert and to provide a report from such expert in the area of financial accounting. On or before 6/4/04, plaintiffs will produce to defendant their revised company and expert reports. On or before 6/18/04, defendant will notify plaintiffs' counsel whether it wishes to engage an additional expert in light of plaintiffs' designation of Mr. Ranallo. On or before 6/30/04, the parties shall file a joint status report. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (jat, )
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 4/29/2004, Entered: 5/3/2004 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                              Set/Reset Deadlines: . Status Report due by 6/30/2004 (jat, )
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 60 Filed: 4/26/2004, Entered: 4/28/2004 Response to Motion
                                                                                RESPONSE to [59] Pltfs' MOTION for Leave to Engage Additional Expert in the Area of Financial Accounting and Conditional Request for Leave to Engage a Third Expert, filed by USA. Reply due by 5/10/2004. Service: 4/26/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 59 Filed: 4/9/2004, Entered: 4/13/2004, Terminated: 4/29/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                  MOTION for leave to engage an additional testifying expert and to provide a report from such expert in the area of financial accounting by TEMPLE-INLAND INC..Service: 4/8/04. Response due by 4/26/2004. (dw1)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 58 Filed: 3/24/2004, Entered: 3/26/2004 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                    ORDER adopting the procedures set out in the proposed schedule and setting Joint Status Report due by 10/1/2004. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (jat, )
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 57 Filed: 3/23/2004, Entered: 3/25/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                      JOINT PROPOSED SCHEDULE by all parties. Service: 3/19/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 56 Filed: 3/23/2004, Entered: 3/25/2004 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                        ORDER: [55] Dft's Motion for Leave to File a Joint Scheduling Report With Pltfs' Facsimile Signature is granted. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (jcp, )
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 55 Filed: 3/19/2004, Entered: 3/24/2004, Terminated: 3/23/2004 Terminated:
                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File Joint Scheduling Report With Pltfs' Facsimile Signature, by USA.Service: 3/19/2004. Response due by 4/5/2004. (jcp, )
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 54 Filed: 3/16/2004, Entered: 3/18/2004 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings in One Volume held on 2/13/2004 before Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (jcp, )
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 53 Filed: 2/25/2004, Entered: 3/1/2004 Published OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                                              PUBLISHED OPINION: Plaintiffs' motion for partial summary judgement is granted in part and denied in part. Defendant's motion for partial summary judgment is granted in part and denied in part. On or before 3/19/04, the parties shall file a joint proposed schedule for resolving remaining issues. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (jat, )
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 2/19/2004, Entered: 2/19/2004
                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Eric G. Bruggink : Oral Argument held on 02/13/2004. (mkb, )
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 2/12/2004, Entered: 2/12/2004
                                                                                                  Set/Reset Transcript Deadlines: Transcript due by 3/15/2004. (vp1, )
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 52 Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: 1/26/2004 Order Setting Oral Argument/Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion re: [37] Pltf's MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, and [43] Dft's CROSS MOTION to [37] Pltf's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment: Oral Argument will be heard from the courtroom Friday, 2/13/2004 10:00 AM in National Courts Building before Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (jcp, )
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 51 Filed: 1/13/2004, Entered: 1/16/2004 Description not available
                                                                                                      REPLY to Pltf's Opposition to [43] Dft's CROSS MOTION to [37] Pltf's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by USA. Service: 1/13/2004.(jcp, )
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 50 Filed: 12/16/2003, Entered: 12/22/2003 Response to Motion
                                                                                                        OPPOSITION to [43] Dft's CROSS MOTION and REPLY in Support of [37] Pltfs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Liability filed by TEMPLE-INLAND INC. Reply due by 12/30/2003. Service: 12/16/03 by hand.(jcp, )
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 49 Filed: 12/16/2003, Entered: 12/22/2003 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fa
                                                                                                          COUNTER STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS/RESPONSE to [41] Dft's PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact filed by TEMPLE-INLAND INC. Service: 12/16/03 by hand.(jcp, )
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 48 Filed: 12/15/2003, Entered: 12/19/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File RespCourt Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER granting [47] Pltf's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to [43] Dft's CROSS MOTION and Reply to Dft's Opposition to [37] Pltf's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, until 12/16/2003. Reply due by 1/13/2004. Response due by 12/16/2003. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese for Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (jcp, ) Modified on 12/19/2003 (jcp, ).
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 47 Filed: 12/11/2003, Entered: 12/15/2003, Terminated: 12/15/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                              UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to [43] Dft's CROSS MOTION and Reply in Support of [37] Pltfs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, until 12/16/2003, and Extension of Time for Dft to File Reply to Pltfs' Opposition to Dft's Cross Motion, by TEMPLE-INLAND INC.Service: 12/10/03. Response due by 12/29/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 46 Filed: 11/13/2003, Entered: 11/19/2003 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                CORRECTED APPENDIX AND APPENDIX INDEX [VOLUME I OF II] by USA in Support of [43] Dft's CROSS MOTION and OPPOSITION to [37] Pltf's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 45 Filed: 11/13/2003, Entered: 11/19/2003 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [44] Dft's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File a Corrected Appendix and Corrected Appendix Index to Dft's Memorandum in Support of Its Cross Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Pltfs' Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 44 Filed: 11/7/2003, Entered: 11/13/2003, Terminated: 11/13/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                    UNOPPOSED MOTION for Leave to File a Corrected Appendix and Corrected Appendix Index by USA.Service: 11/7/03. Response due by 11/24/2003. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 43 Filed: 11/6/2003, Entered: 11/13/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                      CROSS MOTION and OPPOSITION to [37] Pltfs' Motion for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support, Together with Two (2) Separately Bound Appendix Volumes by USA. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE]Service: 11/3/03. Response due by 12/12/2003. (jcp, ) Modified on 11/13/2003 (jcp, ).
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 42 Filed: 11/6/2003, Entered: 11/13/2003 Response to Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fa
                                                                                                                        STATEMENT OF GENUINE ISSUES OF MATERIAL FACT IN DISPUTE/RESPONSE to [38] Pltf's PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact filed by USA. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 11/3/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 41 Filed: 11/6/2003, Entered: 11/13/2003 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                          PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact in Support of Cross Motion for Summary Judgment by USA. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 11/3/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 40 Filed: 10/31/2003, Entered: 11/5/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [39] Dft's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Dft shall file a single brief containing its response and any cross-motion for summary judgment on or before 11/3/2003, if pltfs' motion is limited to the issue of liability only. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 39 Filed: 10/28/2003, Entered: 10/29/2003, Terminated: 10/31/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time until 11/3/03 to file cross-motion for summary judgment by USA.Service: 10/28/03. Response due by 11/14/2003 (jat, )
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 38 Filed: 9/22/2003, Entered: 9/26/2003 Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact
                                                                                                                                PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact by TEMPLE-INLAND INC.. Service: 9/22/03.(dw1, )
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 37 Filed: 9/22/2003, Entered: 9/26/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by TEMPLE-INLAND INC., filed with a twelve (12) volume appendix. Service by hand: 9/19/03. Response due by 10/23/2003. (dw1, )
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 36 Filed: 7/28/2003, Entered: 7/29/2003 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER:Pltfs' motion for summary judgment shall be filed on or before 9/19/03. (Dispositive Motion(s) due by 9/19/2003.) Dft shall file a single brief containing its response and any cross-motion for summary judgment. This response/cross-motion shall be filed on or before 10/31/03, if pltfs' motion is limited to the issue of liability only. (Response due by 10/31/2003.) Pltfs shall file a single brief containing any reply to dft's response and/or response to dft's cross-motion by 12/12/03, if pltfs' motion for summary judgment and dft's cross-motion, if any, are limted to liability only. (Reply due by 12/12/2003.) Dft's reply, if any, shall be filed on or before 1/9/04, if pltfs' motion for summary judgment is limited to liability. (Notice of Compliance due by 1/9/2004.) Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 35 Filed: 7/25/2003, Entered: 7/28/2003 Joint Status Report
                                                                                                                                      JOINT STATUS REPORT by TEMPLE-INLAND INC., UNITED STATES. Service: 7/25/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 34 Filed: 7/18/2003, Entered: 7/21/2003 Joint Status Report
                                                                                                                                        JOINT STATUS REPORT Regarding Use of Prior "Common Guarini" Depositions and Documents and Use of Declarations by all parties. Service: 7/18/03.(jcp, )
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 33 Filed: 6/20/2003, Entered: 6/23/2003 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [32] Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Leave to produce an expert report addressing Plaintiffs' second expert report. Defendant may produce the expert report of Dr. Mark Zmijewski in response to plaintiffs' second expert report. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (jcp, )
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 32 Filed: 6/17/2003, Entered: 6/20/2003, Terminated: 6/20/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to produce an expert report addressing plaintiffs' second expert report by Robert Howard by UNITED STATES.Service: 6/17/03. (hw1, )
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 31 Filed: 4/17/2003, Entered: 4/24/2003 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Court Filing
                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [30] Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Discovery due by 7/18/2003. The parties are directed to file a joint Status Report due by 7/25/2003 Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 30 Filed: 4/16/2003, Entered: 4/23/2003, Terminated: 4/17/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery, until 7/18/03, by TEMPLE-INLAND INC. and The United States. Response due 5/5/2003. (lrd)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 29 Filed: 2/28/2003, Entered: 3/5/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER re: Parties shall file a Joint Status Report by deadline of 5/12/03 , and Discovery deadline to 4/30/03 ( signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 28 Filed: 2/27/2003, Entered: 3/5/2003 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                    JOINT STATUS REPORT. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 27 Filed: 2/24/2003, Entered: 2/28/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [26-1] joint motion to Extend Time to complete discovery Discovery deadline is 4/30/03 , and Joint Status Report due 3/31/03 (signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 26 Filed: 2/19/2003, Entered: 2/26/2003, Terminated: 2/24/2003 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                        JOINT MOTION to Extend Time to complete discovery until 3/30/03. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 25 Filed: 12/19/2002, Entered: 12/27/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [24-1] motion to Extend Time to complete depositions by 2/7/03 ( signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 24 Filed: 12/17/2002, Entered: 12/19/2002, Terminated: 12/19/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by TEMPLE-INLAND INC. (Service : 12/16/02 ) to Extend Time to complete depositions [until February 7, 2003]. Response due: 1/2/03 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 23 Filed: 10/10/2002, Entered: 10/28/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER re: (1) Defendant's expert reports on damages shall be served on or before 12/4/02; (2) Deposition of defendant's expert or experts shall be completed on or before 1/31/03; (3) All Discovery ncluding expert discovery, shall be completed by deadline of 3/21/03 ; and (4) The parties shall file a Joint Status Report by deadline of 2/28/03 ( signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 22 Filed: 10/7/2002, Entered: 10/9/2002 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                JOINT STATUS REPORT. (LTD)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 21 Filed: 6/7/2002, Entered: 6/11/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [20-1] motion to Extend Time within which to complete depositions : (1) Defendant shall complete any depositions of plaintiffs' expert or party representatives by 8/1/02 ; (2) Discovery shall be completed by deadline of 11/14/02 ; (3) and Parties shall file joint Status Reports by deadline by 10/8/02 ( signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 20 Filed: 6/4/2002, Entered: 6/5/2002, Terminated: 6/7/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 6/4/02 ) to Extend Time within which to complete depositions , (until October 8, 2002 and November 14, 2002, respectively) (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 19 Filed: 5/7/2002, Entered: 5/7/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      CONSENT ORDER re: Discovery in the instant case shall be governed by the "AMPO", entered by the court for all WINSTAR-related cases (No. 90-8 et al.) on April 14, 1998 ( signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 18 Filed: 5/6/2002, Entered: 5/7/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by TEMPLE-INLAND INC. (Service: 5/6/02) for entry of consent order . Response due: 5/23/02. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 17 Filed: 2/12/2002, Entered: 2/13/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [16-1] motion to Extend Time within which to revise the scheduling order deadlines Discovery deadline to 10/30/02 and Joint Status Report deadline to 9/23/02 (signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 16 Filed: 2/7/2002, Entered: 2/8/2002, Terminated: 2/12/2002 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by TEMPLE-INLAND INC. (Service : 2/6/02 ) to Extend Time within which to revise the scheduling order deadlines . (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 15 Filed: 11/20/2001, Entered: 11/21/2001 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to Complaint by USA. Service: 11/20/01 (JPSR due 1/7/02). (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 14 Filed: 10/3/2001, Entered: 10/3/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER Answer deadline to 11/20/01 , Discovery deadline to 5/20/02 and Joint Status Report deadline to 3/18/02 (signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 13 Filed: 9/26/2001, Entered: 9/26/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                  JOINT STATUS REPORT by TEMPLE-INLAND INC. and USA. Service: 9/21/01. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 12 Filed: 9/26/2001, Entered: 9/26/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [11-1] motion for Leave to file joint status report with a facsimile signature (signed by Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir for Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 11 Filed: 9/21/2001, Entered: 9/24/2001, Terminated: 9/26/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service: 9/21/01) for Leave to file joint status report with a facsimile signature . (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 10 Filed: 8/31/2001, Entered: 9/4/2001 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Brian Akira Mizoguchi Service : 8/31/01 (HW)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 9 Filed: 8/29/2001, Entered: 8/29/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER setting Joint Status Report due on 9/21/01 (signed by Sr. Judge Eric G. Bruggink). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 8 Filed: 10/26/1999, Entered: 10/29/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [7-1] motion to stay proceedings. ( signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 7 Filed: 10/8/1999, Entered: 10/13/1999, Terminated: 10/26/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 10/8/99 ) to stay proceedings. Response due: 10/25/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 6 Filed: 9/9/1999, Entered: 9/10/1999 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of reassignment to Judge Eric G. Bruggink . Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 5 Filed: 9/8/1999, Entered: 9/10/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [4-1] motion to Transfer Case to Judge Bruggink. ( signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 9/3/1999, Entered: 9/7/1999, Terminated: 9/8/1999 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by USA (Service : 9/3/99 ) to Transfer Case to Judge Bruggink. Response due: 9/20/99 (notice of related cases included) (JT) Modified on 09/07/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 4 Filed: 9/3/1999, Entered: 9/7/1999, Terminated: 9/8/1999 Notice of Related Cases
                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by USA of related case(s). (95-525C, 96-494C, 96-584C, 96-590C, and 96-811C). (motion to transfer included) (JT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 3 Filed: 8/20/1999, Entered: 8/23/1999 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Paul Gerald Freeborne. Service: 8/20/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 2 Filed: 8/9/1999, Entered: 8/13/1999 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of assignment to Judge Robert H. Hodges . Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 8/9/1999, Entered: 8/10/1999 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #048054. Answer due on 10/8/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 188 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?