DUBOSE v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:98-cv-00903-MBH
District Judge Marian Blank Horn, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo DANETTA DUBOSE, Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles John Crueger
Office COFC
Filed 12/2/1998
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 202 - Tax - Declaratory Judgment 28:1507
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 11/24/1999
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 12 Filed: 4/13/2000, Entered: 4/14/2000 Remark
JUDGMENT OF 11/24/99 RETURNED BY U.S.P.S. AS UNCLAIMED. (LD)
    LREF
    Blank 11 Filed: 11/24/1999, Entered: 11/24/1999
    JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaint is dismissed pursuant to RCFC 41(b). (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 11/24/1999, Entered: 11/24/1999
      Case closed (LD)
        LREF
        Blank 10 Filed: 11/23/1999, Entered: 11/24/1999 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER directing the clerk to dismiss the case pursuant to RCFC 41(b). ( signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn ) Copy to parties. (LD)
          LREF
          Blank 9 Filed: 6/25/1999, Entered: 6/25/1999
          Order returned undeliverable. (FE)
            LREF
            Blank 8 Filed: 4/22/1999, Entered: 4/28/1999 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER set Plaintiff's status report deadline to 5/12/99. ( signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn ) Copy to parties. (JT)
              LREF
              Blank 7 Filed: 3/19/1999, Entered: 3/22/1999 Status Report
              STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 3/19/99. (FE)
                LREF
                Blank 6 Filed: 2/17/1999, Entered: 3/22/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER re: the Plaintiff is to provide the court and opposing counsel with a telephone number at which she can be reached by 3/10/99. The Plaintiff is also ordered to contact Defendant's counsel to ascertain if the facts and claims outlined in the Defendant's 2/1/99 status report are accurate. Set status reports deadline to 3/19/99 by both Plaintiff and Defendant. ( signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 03/22/1999
                  LREF
                  Blank 5 Filed: 2/2/1999, Entered: 2/3/1999 Notice of Appearance/
                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Charles John Crueger. Service : 2/2/99. (FE)
                    LREF
                    Blank 4 Filed: 2/1/1999, Entered: 2/2/1999 Status Report
                    STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 2/1/99. (FE)
                      LREF
                      Blank 3 Filed: 1/11/1999, Entered: 1/15/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER set joint status report deadline to 2/1/99. ( signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                        LREF
                        Blank 2 Filed: 12/8/1998, Entered: 12/8/1998 Court Filing
                        Notice of assignment to Judge Marian Blank Horn. Copy to parties. (FE)
                          LREF
                          Blank 1 Filed: 12/2/1998, Entered: 12/2/1998
                          COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #046674. Answer due on 1/31/99. (FE)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 12/2/1998, Entered: 12/2/1998
                            CASE assigned to Judge Unassigned. (FE)
                              LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 99 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?