LOVINGER v. HHS
Federal Court Proceeding United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:98-vv-00138-UNJ

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ROBERT D. LOVINGER, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Wheeler Trigg O'Donnell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Michael Fitzpatrick +1 303 244 1874 +1 303 244 1879 fitzpatrick@wtotrial.com
v.
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Respondent
Officially listed as "SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES"

Toggle Switch Represented by Rawls & McNelis PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Levon Terzian +1 804 782 0613 dterzian@rawlsmcnelis.com
Office COFC
Filed 2/23/1998
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 483 - Death - Other
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 300 Vaccine Injury Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 12/10/2001
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (52) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 49 Filed: 4/9/2002, Entered: 4/9/2002
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT in the amount of $88,266.00, was electronically wire transferred to CGU Life of America, on January 31, 2002. See letter in file. (FE)
    LREF
    Blank 48 Filed: 4/9/2002, Entered: 4/9/2002
    SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT in the amount of $30,850.00, was mailed on February 11, 2002 to John Fitzpatrick, Esquire, attorney for the petitioners. See letter in file. (FE)
      LREF
      Blank 47 Filed: 4/9/2002, Entered: 4/9/2002
      SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT in the amount of $150.00, was mailed on February 11, 2002 to John Fitzpatrick, Esquire, attorney for the petitioners. See letter in file. (FE)
        LREF
        Blank 46 Filed: 4/9/2002, Entered: 4/9/2002
        SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT in the amount of $62,000.00, was mailed on February 11, 2002 to John M. Fitzpatrick, Esquire, attorney for the petitioners. See letter in file. (FE)
          LREF
          Blank 45 Filed: 12/17/2001, Entered: 12/17/2001
          Certified copy of election and judgment forwarded to HHS. See letter in file. (FE)
            LREF
            Blank 44 Filed: 12/14/2001, Entered: 12/17/2001 Petitioner's Election
            PETITIONER'S ELECTION to accept Judgment. Service: 12/13/01 (LD)
              LREF
              Blank 43 Filed: 12/10/2001, Entered: 12/10/2001
              JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Vaccine Rule 11(a), that petitioner is awarded compensation in the form of an annuity, as provided for in the parties' November 20, 2001 Stipulation, together with the following lump sums: a) A lump sum of $62,000.00 in the form of a check payable to petitioner. This amount represents compensation for past pain and suffering. b) A lump sum of $150.00 in the form of a check payable to petitioner for petitioner's out-of-pocket expenses. It is further ordered and adjudged that petitioner is awarded attorney's fees and costs in the amount of $30,850.00 in the form of a check payable to petitioner and petitioner's attorney. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 12/10/2001, Entered: 12/10/2001
                Case closed (LD)
                  LREF
                  Blank 42 Filed: 12/5/2001, Entered: 12/6/2001 Notice Not to Seek Review
                  JOINT NOTICE NOT TO SEEK REVIEW (LD)
                    LREF
                    Blank 41 Filed: 11/26/2001, Entered: 11/28/2001 DECISION of Special Master
                    Decision of Special Master George L. Hastings Jr. . Copy to parties. (DS)
                      LREF
                      Blank 40 Filed: 11/20/2001, Entered: 11/21/2001 Stipulation
                      Stipulation by ROBERT D. LOVINGER and HHS of compensation. (AB)
                        LREF
                        Blank 39 Filed: 8/2/2001, Entered: 8/3/2001 Order
                        ORDER re: Tentative Settlement (signed by Special Master George L. Hastings Jr.). Copy to parties. (FE)
                          LREF
                          Blank 38 Filed: 7/17/2001, Entered: 7/17/2001
                          ORDER re: The hearing scheduled for 7/20 and 7/21, is hereby canceled (signed by Special Master George L. Hastings Jr.). Copy to parties. (FE)
                            LREF
                            Blank 37 Filed: 7/11/2001, Entered: 7/12/2001 notice of filing
                            Notice of filing Exhibit 105: CV of Aristides Sismanis, M.D. by ROBERT D. LOVINGER. Service: 7/10/01 (AB)
                              LREF
                              Blank 36 Filed: 7/6/2001, Entered: 7/9/2001 notice of filing
                              Notice of filing Exhibits 103-104 by ROBERT D. LOVINGER. Service: 7/5/01 (AB)
                                LREF
                                Blank 35 Filed: 7/5/2001, Entered: 7/5/2001
                                Notice of filing Exhibit 102 by ROBERT D. LOVINGER Service: 7/3/01 (AB)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 34 Filed: 6/28/2001, Entered: 6/29/2001 Order
                                  ORDER Evidentiary Hearing: 9:30 a.m. 7/19/01 , at the Special Master's Office, 529 14th St., N.W., Suite 302, Washington, D.C. (signed by Special Master George L. Hastings Jr.). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 33 Filed: 6/14/2001, Entered: 6/15/2001 notice of filing
                                    Notice of filing Exhibit 101: medical literature by ROBERT D. LOVINGER Service: 6/13/01 (AB)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 32 Filed: 5/23/2001, Entered: 5/24/2001 Order
                                      ORDER setting Status Conference for 11:00 a.m. on 7/5/01 (signed by Special Master George L. Hastings Jr.). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 31 Filed: 4/9/2001, Entered: 4/10/2001 notice of filing
                                        Notice of filing Exhibits 74-100 by ROBERT D. LOVINGER Service: 4/6/01 (AB)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 30 Filed: 1/31/2001, Entered: 2/1/2001 notice of filing
                                          Notice of filing Exhibits 69-73 by ROBERT D. LOVINGER Service: 1/30/01 (AB)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 29 Filed: 1/4/2001, Entered: 1/5/2001 Scheduling Order
                                            SCHEDULING ORDER setting Status Conference set for: 3/5/01 (signed by Special Master George L. Hastings Jr.). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 28 Filed: 11/21/2000, Entered: 11/27/2000 notice of filing
                                              Notice of filing Exhibits 67-68 by ROBERT D. LOVINGER. Service: 11/20/00 (JT)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 27 Filed: 10/30/2000, Entered: 10/31/2000 notice of filing
                                                Notice of filing Exhibits 60-66 by ROBERT D. LOVINGER. Service: 10/27/00 (JT)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 26 Filed: 10/11/2000, Entered: 10/13/2000 notice of filing
                                                  Notice of filing Exhibits 58 and 59 by ROBERT D. LOVINGER. Service: 9/25/00 (JT)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 25 Filed: 8/9/2000, Entered: 8/10/2000 Status Report
                                                    STATUS REPORT by ROBERT D. LOVINGER. Service: 8/7/00. (FE)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 24 Filed: 6/20/2000, Entered: 6/21/2000 Status Report
                                                      STATUS REPORT by ROBERT D. LOVINGER. Service: 6/14/00 (JT)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 23 Filed: 6/7/2000, Entered: 6/8/2000 Order
                                                        ORDER re: Petitioner's counsel shall file the overdue status report immediately, and thereafter further status reports shall be filed at 60 day intervals until Dr. Wise's article is filed oor the case is otherwise ready for hearing (signed by Special Master George L. Hastings Jr.). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 22 Filed: 3/2/2000, Entered: 3/6/2000 Status Report
                                                          STATUS REPORT by ROBERT D. LOVINGER. Service: 2/28/00 (JT)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 21 Filed: 12/29/1999, Entered: 12/29/1999
                                                            STATUS REPORT by ROBERT D. LOVINGER. Service: 12/23/99 (JT)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 20 Filed: 10/29/1999, Entered: 11/2/1999 Status Report
                                                              STATUS REPORT by ROBERT D. LOVINGER. Service: 10/26/99 (JT)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 19 Filed: 8/30/1999, Entered: 9/1/1999 Order
                                                                ORDER re: letter sent directly to the Special Master and set Expert Report or status report due: 11/1/99 for ROBERT D. LOVINGER. ( signed by Special Master George L. Hastings Jr. ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 18 Filed: 5/21/1999, Entered: 5/26/1999 ~Notice (other)
                                                                  NOTICE of Intent to remain in the Vaccine Injury Compensation Program by ROBERT D. LOVINGER. Service: 5/18/99 (JT)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 17 Filed: 4/27/1999, Entered: 5/1/1999 Order
                                                                    ORDER set Notice of Compliance deadline to 5/27/99 for Petitoner to file a notice of intent. ( signed by Special Master George L. Hastings Jr. ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 16 Filed: 4/12/1999, Entered: 4/15/1999 Order
                                                                      ORDER re: Petitioner should file the article by Dr. Wise when it becomes available. Petitioner should also telephone this office to request a status conference. ( signed by Special Master George L. Hastings Jr. ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 15 Filed: 2/2/1999, Entered: 2/2/1999
                                                                        Notice of filing Exhibits 52-57 by ROBERT D. LOVINGER. Service: 2/1/99 (JT)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 14 Filed: 11/30/1998, Entered: 12/3/1998 Status Report
                                                                          STATUS REPORT by ROBERT D. LOVINGER. Service: 11/25/98 . (FE)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 11/30/1998, Entered: 12/3/1998 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                            Deadline updated; Status Report deadline to 1/30/99 . (FE)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 13 Filed: 11/6/1998, Entered: 11/10/1998 Order
                                                                              ORDER re: Petitioner's counsel's telephonic motion, made on November 5, 1998, the "due date" for the special master's decision in this case is hereby suspended for an indefinite period of time (but for no longer than 180 days) ( signed by Special Master George L. Hastings Jr. ). Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 12 Filed: 10/13/1998, Entered: 10/15/1998 notice of filing
                                                                                Notice of filing Exhibit "F" and "G" by HHS. Service: 10/13/98. (FE)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 10 Filed: 10/1/1998, Entered: 10/5/1998 notice of filing
                                                                                  Notice of filing Exhibits 44 through 51 by ROBERT D. LOVINGER. Service: 9/29/98. (FE)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 11 Filed: 9/30/1998, Entered: 10/5/1998 Order
                                                                                    ORDER set Status Report deadline to 12/1/98 and every 60 days thereafter until Petitioner either withdraws his claim or files an expert report. ( signed by Special Master George L. Hastings Jr. ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 9 Filed: 8/14/1998, Entered: 8/18/1998 Order
                                                                                      ORDER re: Status Conference for 9/28/98 ( signed by Special Master George L. Hastings Jr. ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 8 Filed: 8/11/1998, Entered: 8/13/1998 Expert Report - Rule 26
                                                                                        Expert Reports by HHS [Exhibit A by Arthur P. Safran, M.D.; Exhibit B, supplemental by Arthur P. Safran, M.D.; Exhibit C, curriculum vitae of Arthur P. Safran, M.D.; Exhibits D by Steven D. Rauch, M.D.; and Exhibit E curriculum vitae of Dr. Rauch] Service: 8/11/98. (HW)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 7 Filed: 6/22/1998, Entered: 6/24/1998 Respondent's Report
                                                                                          RESPONDENT'S REPORT Service: 6/22/98 (FE)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 6 Filed: 5/22/1998, Entered: 5/28/1998 Order
                                                                                            ORDER reset date Respondent's Report due to 6/25/98. ( signed by Special Master George L. Hastings Jr. ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 5 Filed: 5/4/1998, Entered: 5/5/1998 notice of filing
                                                                                              Notice of filing Exhs. 27 through 43 by ROBERT D. LOVINGER Service: 5/1/98 (CDC)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 4 Filed: 3/13/1998, Entered: 3/17/1998 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for HHS by David Levon Terzian. Service : 3/13/98. (HW)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 3/6/1998, Entered: 3/9/1998 Order
                                                                                                  INITIAL ORDER ( signed by Special Master George L. Hastings Jr. ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 2/23/1998, Entered: 2/25/1998 Case Assigned/Reassigned to Special Master
                                                                                                    NOTICE OF assignment to Special Master George L. Hastings Jr. . Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 2/23/1998, Entered: 2/25/1998 Petition
                                                                                                      PETITION (Filed with Exhibits 1 through 26), by ROBERT D. LOVINGER. FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #045052, Vac. Date: 4/18/96 (Respondent's report due 5/26/98). (FE)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 2/23/1998, Entered: 2/25/1998 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                                                        CASE assigned to Judge Unassigned. (FE)
                                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 128 times.

                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                           
                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                          Need Password Help?