SIMONSEN, et al v. HHS
Federal Court Proceeding United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:98-vv-00206-UNJ

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo CLIFFORD G. SIMONSEN, Petitioner
No Logo HARRIET A. SIMONSEN, Petitioner
No Logo JANICE A. TRYGG, Petitioner
v.
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Respondent
Officially listed as "SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Linda Sara Renzi +1 202 616 4133 linda.renzi@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 3/27/1998
Jury Demand
Demand $250000
Nature of Suit 483 - Death - Other
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 300 Vaccine Injury Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 5/29/1998
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 7 Filed: 5/29/1998, Entered: 5/29/1998
JUDGMENT entered pursuant to Vaccine Rule 11(a) dismissing the petition (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (FE)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 5/29/1998, Entered: 5/29/1998
    Case closed (FE)
      LREF
      Blank 6 Filed: 4/27/1998, Entered: 4/28/1998 DECISION of Special Master
      Decision of Special Master John F. Edwards directing Clerk to enter judgment dismissing the petition. Copy to parties. (FE)
        LREF
        Blank 5 Filed: 4/21/1998, Entered: 4/24/1998 notice of filing
        Notice of filing Response to Order to Show Cause by CLIFFORD G. SIMONSEN, JANICE A. TRYGG, HARRIET A. SIMONSEN. Service: 4/16/98 (JT)
          LREF
          Blank 4 Filed: 4/16/1998, Entered: 4/20/1998 Notice of Appearance/
          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for HHS by Linda Sara Renzi. Service : 4/16/98 (JT)
            LREF
            Blank 3 Filed: 3/31/1998, Entered: 4/2/1998 Order on Motion for Order to Show Cause
            ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( signed by Special Master John F. Edwards ) Copy to parties. Show Cause Response due: 5/15/98 for HARRIET A. SIMONSEN, for JANICE A. TRYGG, for CLIFFORD G. SIMONSEN to show cause why the Special Master should not dismiss the petition for lack of jurisdiction. (JT)
              LREF
              Blank 2 Filed: 3/27/1998, Entered: 3/27/1998
              NOTICE OF assignment to Special Master John F. Edwards. Copy to parties. (FE)
                LREF
                Blank 1 Filed: 3/27/1998, Entered: 3/27/1998
                PETITION (Filed with Exhibits 1 through 11), by CLIFFORD G. SIMONSEN and JANICE A. TRYGG, legal heirs and representatives of the Estate of HARRIET A. SIMONSEN, deceased. FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #045241, Vac. Date: 11/12/96 (Respondent's report due 6/25/98). (FE)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 3/27/1998, Entered: 3/27/1998
                  CASE assigned to Judge Unassigned. (FE)
                    LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 124 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?