BROWN v. HHS
Federal Court Proceeding United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:98-vv-00401-UNJ

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo SHELBY BROWN, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Conway, Homer & Chin-Caplan, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ronald Craig Homer +1 617 695 1990 +1 617 695 0880 rhomer@ccandh.com
No Logo WINONA BROWN, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Conway, Homer & Chin-Caplan, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ronald Craig Homer +1 617 695 1990 +1 617 695 0880 rhomer@ccandh.com
v.
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Respondent
Officially listed as "SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES"
Office COFC
Filed 4/24/1998
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 483 - Death - Other
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 300 Vaccine Injury Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 9/16/1998
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 8 Filed: 12/11/1998, Entered: 12/14/1998 notice of filing
Notice of filing "Petitioner and Counsel Statement" by SHELBY BROWN, WINONA BROWN. Service: 12/7/98. (FE)
    LREF
    Blank 7 Filed: 9/30/1998, Entered: 10/2/1998 Petitioner's Election
    PETITIONER'S ELECTION to reject Judgment. Service: 9/28/98 Election(y/n): n (FE)
      LREF
      Blank 6 Filed: 9/16/1998, Entered: 9/16/1998
      JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Vaccine Rule 21(a), that the petition is dismissed without prejudice. (Signed by Clerk. ) Copy to parties. (LD)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 9/16/1998, Entered: 9/16/1998
        Case closed (LD)
          LREF
          Blank 5 Filed: 9/14/1998, Entered: 9/16/1998 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
          NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by petitioners Rule 21 a. Copy to parties. (LD)
            LREF
            Blank 4 Filed: 9/8/1998, Entered: 9/10/1998 Order
            ORDER re: Medical Expert Report due: 10/30/98 for WINONA BROWN, for SHELBY BROWN , or show cause, etc. ( signed by Special Master Richard B. Abell Copy to parties. (HW)
              LREF
              Blank 3 Filed: 4/28/1998, Entered: 5/1/1998 Order
              RULE 4(a) ORDER Petitioner is to contact the court by 5/25/98 to schedule the initial conference.( signed by Special Master Richard B. Abell ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                LREF
                Blank 2 Filed: 4/24/1998, Entered: 4/24/1998
                NOTICE OF assignment to Special Master Richard B. Abell. Copy to parties. (FE)
                  LREF
                  Blank 1 Filed: 4/24/1998, Entered: 4/24/1998
                  PETITION by SHELBY BROWN, deceased, by her mother and personal representative, WINONA BROWN. FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #045394. Vac. Date: Unknown, (Respondent's report due 7/23/98). (FE) Modified on 04/24/1998
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 4/24/1998, Entered: 4/24/1998
                    CASE assigned to Judge Unassigned. (FE)
                      LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 149 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?