TERRELL v. HHS
Federal Court Proceeding United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:98-vv-00732-UNJ

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo LANETTE C. TERRELL, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ralanda Webb +1 312 683 9700
No Logo NAYDEEN TERRELL, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ralanda Webb +1 312 683 9700
v.
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Respondent
Officially listed as "SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Glenn Alexander MacLeod +1 202 616 4122 glenn.macleod@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 9/18/1998
Jury Demand
Demand $250000
Nature of Suit 483 - Death - Other
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 300 Vaccine Injury Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 11/10/1999
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (43) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 41 Filed: 4/4/2000, Entered: 4/5/2000 Satisfaction of Judgment
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT in the amount of $6,330.13, will be mailed on March 7, 2000 to Ralanda Webb, Esq., Attorney for the Petitioners. (FE)
    LREF
    Blank 40 Filed: 2/16/2000, Entered: 2/23/2000 Judgment Forwarded (Election)
    Certified copy of judgment solely awarding counsel fees and expenses, forwarded to HHS. See letter in file. (FE)
      LREF
      Blank 39 Filed: 2/15/2000, Entered: 2/15/2000
      JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Vaccine Rule 11(a), that petiiotner is awarded attorney's fees and costs in the amount of $6,330.13. Ms. Webb may collect $6,150.13 from Ms. Terrell. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD)
        LREF
        Blank 38 Filed: 1/18/2000, Entered: 1/19/2000 Notice Not to Seek Review
        NOTICE NOT TO SEEK REVIEW by LANETTE C. TERRELL. Service: 1/13/00 (DS)
          LREF
          Blank 37 Filed: 1/13/2000, Entered: 1/13/2000
          Decision of Special Master John F. Edwards re: Fees and Costs. Copy to parties. (JT)
            LREF
            Blank 36 Filed: 12/13/1999, Entered: 12/16/1999 ~Notice (other)
            NOTICE of Statement on Fees and Costs by NAYDEEN TERRELL, LANETTE C. TERRELL. Service: 11/19/99 (JT)
              LREF
              Blank 35 Filed: 11/30/1999, Entered: 12/2/1999 Order
              ORDER re: Petitioner shall supplement the fee petition by 12/15/99 (signed by Special Master John F. Edwards). Copy to parties. (FE)
                LREF
                Blank 34 Filed: 11/22/1999, Entered: 11/29/1999 Motion for Attorney Fees
                MOTION by NAYDEEN TERRELL, LANETTE C. TERRELL (Service : 11/17/99 ) for Attorney Fees. Response due: 12/6/99 (JT)
                  LREF
                  Blank 33 Filed: 11/10/1999, Entered: 11/10/1999
                  JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Vaccine Rule 21(a), that the petition is dismissed without prejudice. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 11/10/1999, Entered: 11/10/1999
                    Case closed (LD)
                      LREF
                      Blank 32 Filed: 11/9/1999, Entered: 11/10/1999 ~Notice (other)
                      NOTICE of Dismissal by NAYDEEN TERRELL, LANETTE C. TERRELL Service: 11/4/99 (LD)
                        LREF
                        Blank 31 Filed: 10/28/1999, Entered: 11/1/1999 Order
                        ORDER set Petitioner's motion for dismissal filing deadline to 11/5/99. ( signed by Special Master John F. Edwards ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                          LREF
                          Blank 30 Filed: 10/26/1999, Entered: 10/29/1999 Order
                          ORDER set telephonic Status Conference for 3:00 p.m., 10/27/99. ( signed by Special Master John F. Edwards ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                            LREF
                            Blank 29 Filed: 9/16/1999, Entered: 9/23/1999 Order
                            ORDER re: Petitioner's shall notify special master by 10/18/99 of decision to withdraw petition or remain before the special master ( signed by Special Master John F. Edwards ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                              LREF
                              Blank 28 Filed: 8/5/1999, Entered: 8/6/1999 Terminated:
                              MOTION by NAYDEEN TERRELL and LANETTE C. TERRELL (Service: 7/30/99) to Extend Time to file a written medical expert opinion , (until September 30, 1999). Response due: 8/16/99. (FE)
                                LREF
                                Blank 27 Filed: 8/5/1999, Entered: 8/6/1999 Scheduling Order
                                SCHEDULING ORDER setting Medical Expert Opinion due: 10/8/99 for LANETTE C. TERRELL, for NAYDEEN TERRELL ( signed by Master John F. Edwards). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 26 Filed: 8/2/1999, Entered: 8/3/1999 Terminated:
                                  MOTION by NAYDEEN TERRELL, LANETTE C. TERRELL (Service : 7/30/99 ) to Extend Time to submit an expert opinion [until September 30, 1999]. Response due: 8/16/99 (JT)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 25 Filed: 8/2/1999, Entered: 8/3/1999 Status Report
                                    STATUS REPORT by NAYDEEN TERRELL and LANETTE C. TERRELL. Service: 7/30/99. (FE)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 24 Filed: 6/11/1999, Entered: 6/16/1999 Scheduling Order
                                      SCHEDULING ORDER setting Additional Documents due: 7/30/99 for LANETTE C. TERRELL and for NAYDEEN TERRELL; Medical Expert Opinion due: 7/30/99 for LANETTE C. TERRELL and for NAYDEEN TERRELL (signed by Special Master John F. Edwards). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 23 Filed: 6/8/1999, Entered: 6/11/1999 Status Report
                                        STATUS REPORT by NAYDEEN TERRELL, LANETTE C. TERRELL Service: 6/4/99. (FE)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 22 Filed: 5/24/1999, Entered: 5/27/1999 Order
                                          ORDER set Additional Documents (records obtained in response to subpoena) due: 7/2/99 for LANETTE C. TERRELL, for NAYDEEN TERRELL and set Expert Report due: 7/2/99 for LANETTE C. TERRELL, for NAYDEEN TERRELL. ( signed by Special Master John F. Edwards ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 21 Filed: 5/20/1999, Entered: 5/24/1999 Status Report
                                            STATUS REPORT by NAYDEEN TERRELL and LANETTE C. TERRELL. Service: 5/17/99. (FE)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 20 Filed: 4/21/1999, Entered: 4/27/1999 Order
                                              ORDER suspending the time for filing the special master's decision 180 days. ( signed by Special Master John F. Edwards ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 19 Filed: 3/10/1999, Entered: 3/13/1999 Order
                                                ORDER granting the Petitioner's oral motion for discovery. ( signed by Special Master John F. Edwards ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 18 Filed: 3/10/1999, Entered: 3/13/1999 Order
                                                  ORDER granting Petitioner's oral motion for discovery. ( signed by Special Master John F. Edwards ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 17 Filed: 3/10/1999, Entered: 3/13/1999 Order
                                                    ORDER set Petitioners' status report deadline to 4/16/99. ( signed by ADR Spec. Master John F. Edwards ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 16 Filed: 2/16/1999, Entered: 2/16/1999
                                                      ORDER set telephonic status conference for 12:00 p.m., 3/4/99. ( signed by Special Master John F. Edwards ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 15 Filed: 2/3/1999, Entered: 2/5/1999 Petition
                                                        AMENDED PETITION by NAYDEEN TERRELL, LANETTE C. TERRELL. (DS)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 14 Filed: 2/3/1999, Entered: 2/5/1999 Order
                                                          ORDER granting [13-1] motion for Leave to to file Amended Petition ( signed by Special Master John F. Edwards ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 13 Filed: 2/3/1999, Entered: 2/3/1999, Terminated: 2/3/1999 Motion for Leave to File
                                                            MOTION by NAYDEEN TERRELL (Service : 2/1/99 ) for Leave to to file Amended Petition Response due: 2/18/99 (AB)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 12 Filed: 1/14/1999, Entered: 1/19/1999 Order
                                                              ORDER re: petitioner's counsel has notified special master of change in telephone number ( signed by Special Master John F. Edwards ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 11 Filed: 12/15/1998, Entered: 12/16/1998 Order
                                                                ORDER defering indefinitely the submission of Respondent's Rule 4 Report. ( signed by Special Master John F. Edwards ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 10 Filed: 11/18/1998, Entered: 11/24/1998 notice of filing
                                                                  Notice of filing Exhibits A-D by HHS. Service: 11/18/98 (JT)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 9 Filed: 11/12/1998, Entered: 11/16/1998 Order
                                                                    ORDER set Additional Documents (records requested by respondent and an amended petition) due: 12/11/98 for LANETTE C. TERRELL, for NAYDEEN TERRELL ( signed by Special Master John F. Edwards ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 8 Filed: 11/10/1998, Entered: 11/13/1998 notice of filing
                                                                      Notice of filing Vaccine Rule 4(a) by HHS. Service: 11/10/98. (FE)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 7 Filed: 10/21/1998, Entered: 10/29/1998 Order
                                                                        ORDER setting telephonic status conference for 10/26/98 at 3:00 p.m. ( signed by Special Master John F. Edwards ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 6 Filed: 10/20/1998, Entered: 10/21/1998 Status Report
                                                                          STATUS REPORT by HHS. Service: 10/20/98. (FE)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 5 Filed: 10/14/1998, Entered: 10/16/1998 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for HHS by Glenn Alexander MacLeod. Service: 10/14/98. (FE)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 4 Filed: 10/13/1998, Entered: 10/16/1998 notice of filing
                                                                              Notice of filing Exhibit "B" (corrected) by NAYDEEN TERRELL, LANETTE C. TERRELL. Service: 10/7/98. (FE)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 3 Filed: 9/23/1998, Entered: 9/29/1998 Status Report/Order
                                                                                STATUS REPORT ORDER. Joint Status report due on 10/9/98. Respondent shall file immediately a notice of appearance ( signed by Special Master John F. Edwards ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 9/18/1998, Entered: 9/21/1998 Case Assigned/Reassigned to Special Master
                                                                                  NOTICE OF assignment to Special Master John F. Edwards. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 9/18/1998, Entered: 9/21/1998 Petition
                                                                                    PETITION (Filed with Exhibits A through E), by NAYDEEN TERRELL, deceased, by and through her parent and legal representative, LANETTE C. TERRELL. FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #046240, Vac. Date: 9/17/96 (report due 12/17/98). (FE)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 9/18/1998, Entered: 9/21/1998 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                                      CASE assigned to Judge Unassigned. (FE)
                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                        This case has been viewed 141 times.

                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                        Space
                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                         
                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                        Need Password Help?