SINGLETERRY v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:99-cv-00015-JFM
District Judge James F. Merow, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo PAUL SINGLETERRY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Boynton Waldron Doleac Woodman & Scott PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Benjamin Thomas King +1 603 436 4010
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Mischel Coleman
Office COFC
Filed 1/11/1999
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 352 - Military Pay - Retirement
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 8/11/1999
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 15 Filed: 10/5/2000, Entered: 10/12/2000 CAFC Mandate Affirming
MANDATE (certified copy) from CAFC dated October 5, 2000 affirmed [13-1] judgment order. (HW)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 10/14/1999, Entered: 10/20/1999 CAFC Case Number
    CAFC Case Number Re: [14-1] appeal by PAUL SINGLETERRY CAFC NUMBER: 00-5007 (HW)
      LREF
      Blank 14 Filed: 10/12/1999, Entered: 10/13/1999 Terminated: Court Filing
      NOTICE OF APPEAL by PAUL SINGLETERRY. Copy to defendant, Judge Merow, and to C.A.F.C. FILING FEE $ 105.00 RECEIPT # 048424 (CDC)
        LREF
        Blank 13 Filed: 8/11/1999, Entered: 8/11/1999
        JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaint if dismissed. No costs. (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (LD)
          LREF
          Blank 12 Filed: 8/11/1999, Entered: 8/11/1999 Court Filing
          ORDER concluding that plaintiff's cause of action accrued on April 19, 1990, the date he was discharged from the Air Force. Therefore, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 2501, plaintiff was required to file his complaint on or before April 19, 1996. Since plaintiff dod not file until January 11, 1999, his action is barred by the statute of limitations. Accordingly, it is ordered that defendant's April 8, 1999 [6-1] motion to dismiss is granted. The clerk is directed to dismiss the complaint. No costs. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (LD)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 8/11/1999, Entered: 8/11/1999
            Case closed (LD)
              LREF
              Blank 11 Filed: 6/28/1999, Entered: 6/29/1999 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER returning UNFILED to the sender, plaintiff's June 20, 1999, letter; and directing plaintiff's attorney of record to file any motion for leave to file an additional submission, together with the submission, by deadline to 7/19/99 ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                LREF
                Blank 10 Filed: 6/11/1999, Entered: 6/16/1999 Reply to Response to Motion
                REPLY by USA to response to [6-1] motion to dismiss. Service: 6/11/99. (FE)
                  LREF
                  Blank 9 Filed: 5/27/1999, Entered: 6/2/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                  ORDER granting [8-1] motion to Extend Time to reply to response to motion to dismiss. Defendant's reply to response to motion reset to 6/11/99 for [6-1] motion to dismiss. ( signed by Sr. Judge James F. Merow ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                    LREF
                    Blank 8 Filed: 5/24/1999, Entered: 5/27/1999, Terminated: 5/27/1999 Terminated:
                    MOTION by USA (Service : 5/24/99 ) to Extend Time to reply to response to motion to dismiss [until June 11, 1999]. Response due: 6/10/99 (JT)
                      LREF
                      Blank 7 Filed: 5/10/1999, Entered: 5/13/1999 Terminated:
                      RESPONSE by PAUL SINGLETERRY (Service: 5/8/99 ) to [6-1] motion to dismiss. Reply due: 5/25/99 (JT)
                        LREF
                        Blank 6 Filed: 4/8/1999, Entered: 4/13/1999, Terminated: 8/11/1999 Terminated:
                        MOTION by USA (Service : 4/8/99 ) to dismiss. Response due: 5/10/99 (JT)
                          LREF
                          Blank 5 Filed: 3/10/1999, Entered: 3/12/1999 Order
                          ORDER granting [4-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint. reset Answer deadline to 4/9/99 ( signed by the Clerk ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                            LREF
                            Blank 4 Filed: 3/9/1999, Entered: 3/12/1999, Terminated: 3/10/1999 Terminated:
                            MOTION by USA (Service : 3/9/99 ) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint. (to April 9, 1999) (DS)
                              LREF
                              Blank 3 Filed: 2/1/1999, Entered: 2/2/1999 Notice of Appearance/
                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Jonathan Mischel Coleman. Service : 2/1/99 (JT)
                                LREF
                                Blank 2 Filed: 1/11/1999, Entered: 1/13/1999 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                Notice of assignment to Sr. Judge James F. Merow. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 1 Filed: 1/11/1999, Entered: 1/13/1999 Complaint
                                  COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #046823. Answer due on 3/12/99. (FE)
                                    LREF

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 374 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?