RESPITEK, INC. v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:99-cv-00063-LJB
District Judge Lynn J. Bush, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo RESPITEK, INC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lawrence Phillip Ingram +1 813 229 3321
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory Thomas Jaeger +1 202 353 7955 +1 202 353 7988 gregory.jaeger@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 2/12/1999
Jury Demand
Demand $13000
Nature of Suit 116 - Contract - Supply (CDA)
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County
Terminated 7/25/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 15 Filed: 7/25/2003, Entered: 7/28/2003 Stipulation of Dismissal
STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice filed by all parties. Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(ii) this day. (dls, )
    LREF
    Blank 14 Filed: 7/25/2003, Entered: 7/28/2003 Notice of Appearance/
    NOTICE of Appearance filed by Gregory Thomas Jaeger for UNITED STATES. Service: 7/25/03.(dls, )
      LREF
      Blank 13 Filed: 5/18/2000, Entered: 5/21/2000 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER granting [12-1] motion to Extend Time to file motion for summary judgment. Reset Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment Filing deadline to 7/14/00. ( signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush ) Copy to parties. (JT)
        LREF
        Blank 12 Filed: 5/15/2000, Entered: 5/16/2000, Terminated: 5/18/2000 Terminated:
        MOTION by RESPITEK, INC. (Service: 5/9/00) to Extend Time to file motion for summary judgment , (until July 15, 2000). (FE)
          LREF
          Blank 11 Filed: 3/31/2000, Entered: 4/3/2000 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER granting [10-1] motion to Extend Time to file motion for final summary judgment. Reset motion for summary judgment filing deadline to 5/15/00. ( signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush ) Copy to parties. (JT)
            LREF
            Blank 10 Filed: 3/29/2000, Entered: 3/29/2000, Terminated: 3/31/2000 Motion for Extension of Time
            MOTION by RESPITEK, INC. (Service: 3/28/00) to Extend Time to file motion for final summary judgment , (45 days). (FE)
              LREF
              Blank 9 Filed: 7/13/1999, Entered: 7/14/1999 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER set discovery deadline to 1/28/00 and set dispositive motion filing deadline to 3/31/00. ( signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                LREF
                Blank 8 Filed: 6/21/1999, Entered: 6/22/1999 Joint Preliminary Status Report
                JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS REPORT (FE)
                  LREF
                  Blank 7 Filed: 5/12/1999, Entered: 5/17/1999 Answer
                  ANSWER to Complaint by USA. Service: 5/12/99 (JPSR due 6/29/99). (FE)
                    LREF
                    Blank 6 Filed: 4/14/1999, Entered: 4/19/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                    ORDER granting [4-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint Answer deadline to 5/13/99 (signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush). Copy to parties. (FE)
                      LREF
                      Blank 5 Filed: 4/13/1999, Entered: 4/15/1999 Order
                      ORDER granting [4-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint. reset Answer deadline to 5/13/99 ( signed by the Clerk ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                        LREF
                        Blank 4 Filed: 4/12/1999, Entered: 4/15/1999, Terminated: 4/13/1999 Terminated:
                        MOTION by USA (Service : 4/12/99 ) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint. (to May 13, 1999) (DS)
                          LREF
                          Blank 3 Filed: 2/25/1999, Entered: 3/1/1999 Notice of Appearance/
                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Erin Elizabeth Powell. Service : 2/25/99. (FE)
                            LREF
                            Blank 2 Filed: 2/12/1999, Entered: 2/12/1999 Court Filing
                            Notice of assignment to Judge Lynn J. Bush. Copy to parties. (FE)
                              LREF
                              Blank 1 Filed: 2/12/1999, Entered: 2/12/1999
                              COMPLAINT (Filed with Exhibits A through E), FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #046977. Answer due on 4/13/99. (FE)
                                LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 66 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?