HUMPHRIES v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:99-cv-00085-LAS
District Judge Loren A. Smith, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ALEXANDER TITO HUMPHRIES, Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory Thomas Jaeger +1 202 353 7955 +1 202 353 7988 gregory.jaeger@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 2/24/1999
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 516 - Miscellaneous - Damages
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 11/8/2001
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 16 Filed: 11/8/2001, Entered: 11/8/2001
JUDGMENT pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaint is dismissed, without prejudice (signed by Clerk). Copy to parties. (FE)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 11/8/2001, Entered: 11/8/2001
    Case closed. (FE)
      LREF
      Blank 15 Filed: 11/7/2001, Entered: 12/7/2001 Published DecisionCourt Filing
      PUBLISHED DECISION granting [14-1] motion to Dismiss for Want of Prosecution. (signed by Sr. Judge Loren A. Smith) Copy to parties. (DS)
        LREF
        Blank 14 Filed: 5/11/2001, Entered: 5/14/2001 Terminated:
        MOTION by USA (Service: 5/11/01) to Dismiss for Want of Prosecution . Response due: 5/25/01. (LTD)
          LREF
          Blank 13 Filed: 4/5/2000, Entered: 4/6/2000 Notice of Appearance/
          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Gregory Thomas Jaeger. Service : 4/5/00 (JT)
            LREF
            Blank 12 Filed: 9/13/1999, Entered: 9/20/1999 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER re: Plaintiff's handwritten filing is returned as unfiled. Plaintiff is given an additional 30 days to comply with the Court's 6/17/99 order. ( signed by Acting Chief Judge Edward J Damich for Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 09/20/1999
              LREF
              Blank 11 Filed: 6/17/1999, Entered: 6/21/1999 Published DecisionCourt Filing
              PUBLISHED DECISION granting [10-1] motion for More Definite Statement. Set Notice of Compliance deadline to 12/14/99 for Plaintiff to file a more definite statement of the court's jurisdiction. Defendant's response to Plaintiff's complaint shall be due 30 days after the filing of Plaintiff's more definite statement. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith ). Copy to parties. (JT)
                LREF
                Blank 10 Filed: 5/25/1999, Entered: 5/27/1999 Terminated:
                MOTION by USA (Service: 5/25/99) for More Definite Statement . Response due: 6/11/99. (FE)
                  LREF
                  Blank 9 Filed: 5/7/1999, Entered: 5/10/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                  ORDER granting [8-1] motion to Extend Time to file response to the complaint Answer deadline to 5/26/99 (signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith). Copy to parties. (FE)
                    LREF
                    Blank 8 Filed: 4/22/1999, Entered: 4/27/1999, Terminated: 5/7/1999 Terminated:
                    MOTION by USA (Service: 4/22/99) to Extend Time to file response to the complaint , (until May 26, 1999). Response due: 5/10/99. (FE)
                      LREF
                      Blank 7 Filed: 4/12/1999, Entered: 4/15/1999 RemarkCourt Filing
                      Letter to the Court from Alexander Humphries. Filed by leave of the Judge. (JT)
                        LREF
                        Blank 6 Filed: 4/12/1999, Entered: 4/15/1999 RemarkCourt Filing
                        Letter dated 3/29/99 from Alexander Humphries to the Clerk of the Court. Filed by leave of the Judge. (JT)
                          LREF
                          Blank 5 Filed: 3/17/1999, Entered: 3/19/1999 Notice of Appearance/
                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Patricia Mary McCarthy. Service : 3/16/99 (JT)
                            LREF
                            Blank 4 Filed: 2/24/1999, Entered: 2/25/1999 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                            Notice of assignment to Chief Judge Loren A. Smith. Copy to parties. (FE)
                              LREF
                              Blank 3 Filed: 2/24/1999, Entered: 2/25/1999 Complaint
                              COMPLAINT filed. Answer due on 4/26/99. (FE)
                                LREF
                                Blank 2 Filed: 2/24/1999, Entered: 2/25/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                ORDER granting [1-1] motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (signed by Judge Diane Gilbert Weinstein) Copy to parties. (FE)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 1 Filed: 2/24/1999, Entered: 2/25/1999, Terminated: 2/24/1999 Terminated:
                                  MOTION by ALEXANDER TITO HUMPHRIES (Service: 2/24/99) to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (FE)
                                    LREF

                                    Space Space

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 62 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?