OGDEN CONSTRUCTORS v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:99-cv-00738-CCM
District Judge Christine O.C. Miller, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo OGDEN CONSTRUCTORS, INC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Watt Tieder Hoffar & Fitzgerald, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John B. Tieder, Jr. +1 703 749 1000
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory Thomas Jaeger +1 202 353 7955 +1 202 353 7988 gregory.jaeger@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 8/27/1999
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 100 - Contract
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County
Terminated 10/22/2003
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
199-cv-00738-CCM None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, LEAD
  Entries (75) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 71 Filed: 10/22/2003, Entered: 10/23/2003 Stipulation of Dismissal
STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice filed by all parties. Complaint (in this and 00-264C) dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(ii) this day. (dls)
    LREF
    Blank 70 Filed: 6/12/2003, Entered: 6/18/2003 Status Report/OrderCourt Filing
    STATUS REPORT ORDER: Joint Status Report due by 9/23/2003. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (dw1, )
      LREF
      Blank 69 Filed: 6/9/2003, Entered: 6/17/2003 Joint Status Report
      JOINT STATUS REPORT by all parties. Service: 6/9/03.(dw1, )
        LREF
        Blank 68 Filed: 4/2/2003, Entered: 4/8/2003 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
        SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 6/9/2003Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (dw1, )
          LREF
          Blank 67 Filed: 3/31/2003, Entered: 4/4/2003 Joint Status Report
          JOINT STATUS REPORT by OGDEN CONSTRUCTORS, INC. and The United States.Service: 3/31/03. (lrd)
            LREF
            Blank 65 Filed: 2/3/2003, Entered: 2/12/2003 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
            SCHEDULING ORDER setting Joint Status Report due on 3/31/03 (signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller). Copy to parties. (FE)
              LREF
              Blank 66 Filed: 1/29/2003, Entered: 2/12/2003 Status ReportCourt Filing
              JOINT STATUS REPORT. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                LREF
                Blank 64 Filed: 1/6/2003, Entered: 1/10/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER granting [63-1] motion to Stay Jointi Status Report due 1/21/03 (signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                  LREF
                  Blank 63 Filed: 12/30/2002, Entered: 1/3/2003, Terminated: 1/6/2003 Terminated:
                  MOTION by OGDEN CONSTRUCTORS (Service : 12/30/02 ) to Stay , until January 20, 2003. (HW)
                    LREF
                    Blank 62 Filed: 9/12/2002, Entered: 9/16/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                    ORDER granting [61-1] motion to Stay proceedings until 12/31/02 (signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller). Copy to parties. (FE)
                      LREF
                      Blank 61 Filed: 9/9/2002, Entered: 9/12/2002, Terminated: 9/12/2002 Terminated:
                      MOTION by OGDEN CONSTRUCTORS (Service: 9/9/02) to Stay proceedings until 12/31/02 . Response due: 9/26/02. (LTD)
                        LREF
                        Blank 60 Filed: 5/24/2002, Entered: 5/28/2002 Status Report
                        JOINT STATUS REPORT. (LTD)
                          LREF
                          Blank 59 Filed: 4/26/2002, Entered: 4/29/2002 ~Notice (other)
                          NOTICE of automatic stay by OGDEN CONSTRUCTORS. Service: 4/26/02. (LTD)
                            LREF
                            Blank 58 Filed: 2/25/2002, Entered: 2/26/2002 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                            SCHEDULING ORDER setting Joint Status Report due on 5/24/02 (signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller). Copy to parties. (FE)
                              LREF
                              Blank 57 Filed: 2/22/2002, Entered: 2/25/2002 Status Report
                              JOINT STATUS REPORT by OGDEN CONSTRUCTORS and USA. Service: 2/22/02. (FE)
                                LREF
                                Blank 56 Filed: 1/15/2002, Entered: 1/15/2002 Court Filing
                                ORDER granting [55-1] motion to Extend Time to conduct deposition Parties shall complete deposition of Plaintiff's expert by 2/8/02 (signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 55 Filed: 1/14/2002, Entered: 1/14/2002, Terminated: 1/15/2002 Motion for Extension of Time
                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 1/14/02) to Extend Time to conduct deposition until 2/8/02. Response due: 1/31/02. (LTD)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 54 Filed: 12/13/2001, Entered: 12/14/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                    ORDER Discovery deadline is 1/14/02 , and Dispositive Motion Filing deadline is 1/28/02 (signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 53 Filed: 9/18/2001, Entered: 9/19/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                      ORDER granting [52-1] motion to Extend Time to file the expert report; (1) Plaintiff Dispositive Motion Filing deadline to 11/2/01 ; (2) Plaintiff shall submit expert report by 10/24/01; and (3) Defendant shall submit expert report by 10/1/01 (signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 52 Filed: 9/17/2001, Entered: 9/18/2001, Terminated: 9/18/2001 Terminated:
                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 9/17/01) to Extend Time to file the expert report until 10/1/01. Response due: 10/4/01. (LTD)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 51 Filed: 8/29/2001, Entered: 8/30/2001 Transcript
                                          TRANSCRIPT of proceedings 1 volume (31 pages), at Washington, D.C., for date of August 23, 2001. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 50 Filed: 8/23/2001, Entered: 8/23/2001 Court Filing
                                            IT IS ORDERED, as follows: (1) Plaintiff shal file any dispositive motions by 10/19/01 ; (2) By 9/17/01, defendant shall submit its expert report to plaintiff; and (3) By 10/10/01, plaintiff shall submit any expert report to defendant ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (HW)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 49 Filed: 8/10/2001, Entered: 8/13/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                              ORDER granting [46-1] motion to Extend Time to complete deposition discovery Deposition Discovery deadline is 8/23/01 (signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 48 Filed: 8/8/2001, Entered: 8/10/2001 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                REPLY by USA to response to [46-1] motion to Extend Time to complete deposition discovery. Service: 8/8/01. (LTD)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 47 Filed: 7/31/2001, Entered: 8/1/2001 Response to Motion
                                                  RESPONSE by OGDEN CONSTRUCTORS (Service: 7/30/01) to [46-1] motion to Extend Time to complete deposition discovery. Reply due: 8/13/01. (HW)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 46 Filed: 7/20/2001, Entered: 7/20/2001, Terminated: 8/10/2001 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                    MOTION by USA (Service: 7/20/01) to Extend Time to complete deposition discovery , (until August 24, 2001). Response due: 8/6/01. (FE)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 45 Filed: 6/25/2001, Entered: 7/3/2001 Answer to Counterclaim
                                                      ANSWER by OGDEN CONSTRUCTORS to defendant's counterclaims and special plea in fraud. Service: 6/25/01 (DS)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 44 Filed: 6/11/2001, Entered: 7/3/2001 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                        AMENDED ANSWER, COUNTERCLAIMS AND SPECIAL PLEA IN FRAUD filed by USA against OGDEN CONSTRUCTORS amending [23-1] answer, [8-1] answer by USA. (Ans. to Counterclaims and special plea in fraud due: 7/2/01) (DS) Modified on 07/03/2001
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 43 Filed: 6/11/2001, Entered: 6/12/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER granting [36-1] motion for Leave to file first amended answer asserting counterclaims, etc., granting [36-2] motion for Leave to to conduct additional discovery Limited Discovery deadline to 7/31/01 and Status Conference for 2:00 p.m. 8/23/01 (signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 42 Filed: 6/4/2001, Entered: 6/8/2001 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                            REPLY by USA to response to [36-1] motion for Leave to file first amended answer asserting counterclaims, etc., [36-2] motion for Leave to to conduct additional discovery . Service: 6/4/01 (DS)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 41 Filed: 5/31/2001, Entered: 6/5/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER granting [40-1] motion to Extend Time to file reply to Motion to Amend answer Reply to Response to Motion reset to 6/4/01 for [36-1] motion for Leave to file first amended answer asserting counterclaims, etc., reset to 6/4/01 for [36-2] motion for Leave to to conduct additional discovery ( signed by Chief Judge Lawrence M. Baskir for Judge Christine Odell Cook Miller ) Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 40 Filed: 5/29/2001, Entered: 5/31/2001, Terminated: 5/31/2001 Terminated:
                                                                MOTION by USA (Service: 5/29/01) to Extend Time to file reply to Motion to Amend answer until 6/2/01. Response due: 6/15/01. (LTD)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 39 Filed: 5/14/2001, Entered: 5/15/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                  RESPONSE by OGDEN CONSTRUCTORS (Service: 5/14/01) to [36-1] motion for Leave to file first amended answer asserting counterclaims, etc., [36-2] motion for Leave to to conduct additional discovery. Reply due: 5/29/01. (FE)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 38 Filed: 5/11/2001, Entered: 5/14/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                    ORDER granting [37-1] motion to Extend Time to file response to Motion for leave to file an amended answer Response to [36-1] motion for Leave to file first amended answer asserting counterclaims, etc. reset to 5/14/01, [36-2] motion for Leave to to conduct additional discovery reset to 5/14/01 (signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 37 Filed: 5/10/2001, Entered: 5/11/2001, Terminated: 5/11/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                      MOTION by OGDEN CONSTRUCTORS (Service: 5/9/01) to Extend Time to file response to Motion for leave to file an amended answer (until 5/14/01). Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 5/29/01. (LTD) Modified on 05/11/2001
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 36 Filed: 4/24/2001, Entered: 4/25/2001, Terminated: 6/11/2001 Terminated:
                                                                        MOTION by USA (Service: 4/23/01) for Leave to file first amended answer asserting counterclaims, etc. and for Leave to to conduct additional discovery , (filed with a (1) one volume appendix). Response due: 5/10/01. (FE)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 35 Filed: 3/22/2001, Entered: 3/23/2001 Transcript
                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: Status Conference, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of February 20, 2001. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 34 Filed: 2/20/2001, Entered: 2/22/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                            ORDER Discovery deadline to 4/2/01 (signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 2/20/2001, Entered: 3/15/2001 Status Conference
                                                                              Status Conference held ( Transcript due 3/22/01 ) (DS)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 33 Filed: 2/1/2001, Entered: 2/2/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                ORDER granting [32-1] motion to Extend Time to complete fact discovery Fact Discovery deadline to 3/2/01 (signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 32 Filed: 1/31/2001, Entered: 2/1/2001, Terminated: 2/1/2001 Terminated:
                                                                                  MOTION by USA (Service: 1/31/01) to Extend Time to complete fact discovery , (until March 2, 2001). (FE)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 31 Filed: 12/14/2000, Entered: 12/15/2000 Transcript
                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: Status Conference, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of November 16, 2000. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 30 Filed: 11/17/2000, Entered: 11/21/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                      ORDER reset fact discovery deadline to 1/31/01 ; Paragraphs 2 and 3 of the Order of 8/31/00 are vacated; set Status Conference for 2:00 p.m., 2/20/01. ( signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 11/16/2000, Entered: 11/20/2000 Status Conference
                                                                                        Status Conference held ( Transcript due 12/18/00 ) (DS)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 29 Filed: 8/31/2000, Entered: 9/4/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                          ORDER granting [28-1] motion to Extend Time to complete fact discovery, expert discovery and all discovery. Reset fact discovery deadline to 11/17/00 ; reset expert and all other discovery deadline to 12/15/00 ; and reset Status Conference for 2:30 p.m., 11/16/00. ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 28 Filed: 8/31/2000, Entered: 9/4/2000, Terminated: 8/31/2000 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                            JOINT MOTION by OGDEN CONSTRUCTORS, USA to Extend Time to complete fact discovery, expert discovery and all discovery [until November 17, 2000 and December 15, 2000]. Filed by leave of the Judge. (JT)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 27 Filed: 8/2/2000, Entered: 8/3/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                              ORDER granting [26-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to second set of discovery requests Discovery deadline to 8/4/00 (signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 26 Filed: 7/31/2000, Entered: 8/2/2000, Terminated: 8/2/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service: 7/31/00) to Extend Time to respond to second set of discovery requests , (until August 4, 2000). (FE)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 25 Filed: 7/27/2000, Entered: 8/1/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER granting [24-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to Defendant's interrogatories and request for production of documents. Reset Plaintiff's deadline to respond to Defendant's interrogatories and request for production of documents to 8/4/00. ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 24 Filed: 7/27/2000, Entered: 8/1/2000, Terminated: 7/27/2000 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                                                                    MOTION by OGDEN CONSTRUCTORS (Service : 7/21/00 ) to Extend Time to respond to Defendant's interrogatories and request for production of documents [until August 4, 2000]. Filed by leave of the Judge. Response due: 8/7/00 (JT)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 20 Filed: 7/18/2000, Entered: 7/19/2000 Transcript
                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of proceedings, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of June 15, 2000. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 23 Filed: 7/14/2000, Entered: 7/19/2000 AnswerCourt Filing
                                                                                                        ANSWER (re: 00-264) to Complaint by USA. Filed by leave of the Judge. Service: 7/12/00 (JT)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 22 Filed: 7/7/2000, Entered: 7/19/2000 Order
                                                                                                          ORDER granting [21-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint in Case No. 00-264C. reset Answer deadline to 7/12/00 for Case No. 00-264C ( signed by the Clerk ) Copy to parties. (DS) Modified on 07/21/2000
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 21 Filed: 7/5/2000, Entered: 7/19/2000, Terminated: 7/7/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 7/5/00 ) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint in Case No. 00-264C (to July 12, 2000). (DS) Modified on 07/19/2000
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 19 Filed: 6/15/2000, Entered: 6/23/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER Consolidating this case with case No.00-264C , directing parties to serve written discovery requests by 6/26/00 , complete all fact discovery and the depositions of all fact witnesses by 9/18/00 , and identify all expert witnesses by 10/2/00 ; and scheduling a Status Conference for 2:30 p.m. on 9/21/00 ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ). Copy to parties. (DS)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 6/15/2000, Entered: 6/23/2000 Set/Clear Flags
                                                                                                                Consolidated Lead Case (DS)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 6/15/2000, Entered: 6/16/2000 Status Conference
                                                                                                                  Status Conference held ( Transcript due 7/17/00 ) (DS)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 18 Filed: 6/5/2000, Entered: 6/8/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [17-1] motion to Extend Time for all written discovery. Reset deadline for service of written discovery to 6/19/00. ( signed by Chief Judge Loren A. Smith for Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 17 Filed: 6/2/2000, Entered: 6/5/2000, Terminated: 6/5/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                      MOTION by OGDEN CONSTRUCTORS (Service: 6/2/00) to Extend Time for all written discovery , (until June 19, 2000). (FE)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 16 Filed: 5/22/2000, Entered: 5/23/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [15-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to Plaintiff's discovery requests. Reset Defendant's response to Plaintiff's discovery requests deadline to 5/24/00. ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 15 Filed: 5/19/2000, Entered: 5/22/2000, Terminated: 5/22/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service : 5/19/00 ) to Extend Time to respond to Plaintiff's discovery requests [until May 24, 2000]. Response due: 6/5/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 14 Filed: 4/19/2000, Entered: 4/21/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [13-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to Plaintiff's discovery requests, granting [13-2] motion to modify discovery deadlines, granting [13-3] motion to reschedule the status conference. Reset Defendant's deadline to respond to Plaintiff's discovery requests to 5/19/00 ; all written discovery requests shall be served by 6/5/00; reset fact discovery and depositions deadline to 8/18/00 ; and reset Status Conference for 3:00 p.m., 6/15/00. ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (JT) Modified on 04/21/2000
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 13 Filed: 4/14/2000, Entered: 4/19/2000, Terminated: 4/19/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                              MOTION by USA (Service : 4/14/00 ) to Extend Time to respond to Plaintiff's discovery requests [until May 19, 2000]; to modify discovery deadlines ; and to reschedule the status conference. Response due: 5/1/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 12 Filed: 2/11/2000, Entered: 2/14/2000 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER setting Status conference for 2:30 p.m. 5/3/00, in the National Courts Bldg., 717 Madison Pl., N.W., Washington, D.C. (signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 11 Filed: 2/9/2000, Entered: 2/10/2000 Joint Preliminary Status Report
                                                                                                                                  JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS REPORT (FE)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 10 Filed: 2/4/2000, Entered: 2/8/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [9-1] motion to Extend Time to file the joint preliminary status report date Joint Preliminary Status Report due to 2/9/00 (signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 9 Filed: 2/2/2000, Entered: 2/4/2000, Terminated: 2/4/2000 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                      MOTION by USA (Service : 2/2/00 ) to Extend Time to file the joint preliminary status report [until February 9, 2000]. Response due: 2/22/00 (JT)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 8 Filed: 12/17/1999, Entered: 12/21/1999 Answer
                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to Complaint by USA. Service: 12/17/99 ( JPSR due 2/3/00 ) (JT)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 7 Filed: 12/13/1999, Entered: 8/31/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [6-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint. Reset Answer deadline to 12/17/99. ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 6 Filed: 12/9/1999, Entered: 12/13/1999, Terminated: 12/13/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 12/9/99 ) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint [until December 17, 1999]. Response due: 12/27/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 5 Filed: 10/28/1999, Entered: 11/1/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [4-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the complaint. Reset Answer deadline to 12/10/99. ( signed by Judge Christine O. C. Miller ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 4 Filed: 10/25/1999, Entered: 10/28/1999, Terminated: 10/28/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                                                                                MOTION by USA (Service : 10/25/99 ) to Extend Time to respond to the complaint [until December 10, 1999]. Response due: 11/12/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 9/10/1999, Entered: 9/14/1999 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by Gregory Thomas Jaeger. Service : 9/10/99 (JT)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 8/27/1999, Entered: 8/27/1999 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    Notice of assignment to Judge Christine O.C. Miller. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 8/27/1999, Entered: 8/27/1999
                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #048190. Answer due on 10/26/99. (FE)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                                                                                        Space Space

                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 73 times.

                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?