WALTERS v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:99-cv-00767-LSM
District Judge Lawrence S. Margolis, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ROBIN ANN WALTERS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William A. L'Esperance +1 505 266 8482
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayer Brown, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Lloyd Olsen wolsen@mayerbrownrowe.com
Office COFC
Filed 9/16/1999
Jury Demand
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 352 - Military Pay - Retirement
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County
Terminated 2/4/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (50) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 45 Filed: 2/4/2003, Entered: 2/10/2003 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by ROBIN ANN WALTERS, USA. Complaint dismissed, with prejudice, pursuant to Rule 41 (a)(1)(ii). Copy to parties. (JT)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 2/4/2003, Entered: 2/10/2003 Terminated Case
    Case closed. (JT)
      LREF
      Blank 44 Filed: 11/20/2002, Entered: 11/25/2002 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER Status Conference for 2:00 p.m., 1/28/03 ( signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ) Copy to parties. (HW)
        LREF
        Blank 43 Filed: 10/16/2002, Entered: 10/18/2002 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER setting Status Conference for 2:00 p.m. on 11/20/02 (signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (LTD)
          LREF
          Blank 42 Filed: 9/17/2002, Entered: 9/19/2002 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
          SCHEDULING ORDER setting Status conference for 2:00 p.m. 10/16/02 (signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (FE)
            LREF
            Blank 41 Filed: 8/28/2002, Entered: 9/4/2002 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
            NOTICE of filing of disagreement on remand by ROBIN ANN WALTERS. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
              LREF
              Blank 40 Filed: 8/7/2002, Entered: 8/9/2002 Terminated:
              RESPONSE by USA to [38-1] agency decision. Service: 8/7/02. (LTD)
                LREF
                Blank 39 Filed: 7/17/2002, Entered: 7/18/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER setting telephonic Status Conference for 3:00 p.m. on 9/12/02 (signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                  LREF
                  Blank 38 Filed: 7/8/2002, Entered: 7/9/2002 Decision by AgencyCourt Filing
                  Decision on Remand by The Department of the Navy. Copy to parties and to Judge. (DS)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 7/8/2002, Entered: 7/9/2002 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                    Deadline updated; Notice by the parties re: decision on remand due 8/7/02 (DS)
                      LREF
                      Blank 37 Filed: 3/27/2002, Entered: 3/27/2002
                      Administrative Record returned to defendant's attorney pursuant to Rule 60.1. (DS)
                        LREF
                        Blank 36 Filed: 3/21/2002, Entered: 3/27/2002 Unpublished DecisionCourt Filing
                        UNPUBLISHED DECISION denying, as moot, [15-1] motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative Motion for Judgment on the Administrative Record; granting [35-1] motion to Stay proceedings; vacating the decisions of the BCNR; and remanding to the BCNR for review of the merits of plaintiff's claim on the full administrative record by 7/8/02 . ( signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ). Copy to parties. (DS)
                          LREF
                          Blank 35 Filed: 3/6/2002, Entered: 3/7/2002 Terminated:
                          MOTION by USA (Service: 3/6/02) to Stay proceedings pending action by the Board for Correction of Naval Records. Response due: 3/25/02. (LTD)
                            LREF
                            Blank 34 Filed: 3/5/2002, Entered: 3/6/2002 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                            SCHEDULING ORDER setting Status conference for 2:00 p.m. 3/7/02 (signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (FE)
                              LREF
                              Blank 33 Filed: 2/20/2002, Entered: 2/26/2002 Notice of Change of Address
                              NOTICE of change of address by William A. L'Esperance. (HW)
                                LREF
                                Blank 32 Filed: 2/19/2002, Entered: 2/20/2002 Transcript
                                TRANSCRIPT of proceedings re: oral argument, 1 volume, at Washington, D.C., for date of February 12, 2002. Notice to parties. (FE)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 31 Filed: 2/13/2002, Entered: 2/14/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                  ORDER setting Status Conference for 3:00 p.m. on 2/27/02 (signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 30 Filed: 2/13/2002, Entered: 2/13/2002 Court Filing
                                    ORDER setting Status Conference for 3:00 p.m. on 2/27/02 (signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 2/12/2002, Entered: 2/12/2002
                                      Oral Argument re: [15-1] motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative Motion for Judgment on the Administrative Record by USA ( Transcript due 2/19/02 ) (DS)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 29 Filed: 2/7/2002, Entered: 2/8/2002 Status Report
                                        STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 2/7/02. (HW)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 28 Filed: 2/5/2002, Entered: 2/5/2002, Terminated: 2/4/2003 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                          "ORIGINAL" RESPONSE by ROBIN ANN WALTERS to [15-1] motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative Motion for Judgment on the Administrative Record. Filed by leave of the Judge. (LTD)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 27 Filed: 1/11/2002, Entered: 1/14/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                            ORDER returning Plaintiff's filing (new address for Plaintiff's counsel) (signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 26 Filed: 1/11/2002, Entered: 1/14/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                              ORDER oral argument set for 2:00 p.m. on 2/12/02 for [15-1] motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative Motion for Judgment on the Administrative Record (signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (LTD)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 25 Filed: 12/17/2001, Entered: 12/18/2001 Terminated: Court Filing
                                                RESPONSE by ROBIN ANN WALTERS (Service: 12/17/01) to [15-1] motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative Motion for Judgment on the Administrative Record. Filed by leave of the Judge. Reply due: 1/3/02. (LTD)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 24 Filed: 12/13/2001, Entered: 12/17/2001 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                  REPLY by USA to response to [15-1] motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative Motion for Judgment on the Administrative Record. Service: 12/13/01. (HW)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 23 Filed: 12/12/2001, Entered: 12/13/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER granting [22-1] motion to Extend Time to file reply to the Motion to Dismiss Reply to Response to Motion reset to 12/13/01 for [15-1] motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative Motion for Judgment on the Administrative Record (signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 22 Filed: 12/10/2001, Entered: 12/11/2001, Terminated: 12/12/2001 Terminated:
                                                      MOTION by USA (Service: 12/10/01) to Extend Time to file reply to the Motion to Dismiss until 12/13/01. Response due: 12/27/01. (LTD)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 21 Filed: 11/13/2001, Entered: 11/14/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER granting [20-1] motion to Extend Time to file reply to the Motion to Dismiss Reply to Response to Motion reset to 12/10/01 for [15-1] motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative Motion for Judgment on the Administrative Record ( signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 20 Filed: 11/8/2001, Entered: 11/9/2001, Terminated: 11/13/2001 Terminated:
                                                          MOTION by USA (Service: 11/8/01) to Extend Time to file reply to the Motion to Dismiss until 12/10/01. Response due: 11/26/01. (LTD)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 19 Filed: 10/2/2001, Entered: 10/2/2001 Court Filing
                                                            ORDER granting [18-1] motion to Extend Time to respond to the Motion for Summary Judgment Response to [15-1] motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative Motion for Judgment on the Administrative Record reset to 10/26/01 (signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 18 Filed: 9/26/2001, Entered: 9/26/2001, Terminated: 10/2/2001 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                              MOTION by ROBIN ANN WALTERS (Service: 9/21/01) to Extend Time to respond to the Motion for Summary Judgment until 10/26/01. Response due: 10/9/01. (LTD)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 17 Filed: 9/5/2001, Entered: 9/5/2001 Court Filing
                                                                Administrative record (three [3] volumes) filed by USA, by leave of the Judge. Service: 9/5/01. (FE)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 16 Filed: 9/5/2001, Entered: 9/5/2001 Court Filing
                                                                  STATEMENT OF FACTS (Filed by leave of the Judge) filed by USA. Service: 8/28/01. (FE)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 15 Filed: 9/5/2001, Entered: 9/5/2001, Terminated: 3/21/2002 Description not availableCourt Filing
                                                                    MOTION (Filed by leave of the Judge) by USA (Service: 8/28/01) to Dismiss or in the Alternative Motion for Judgment on the Administrative Record Response due: 9/28/01. (FE)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 14 Filed: 8/14/2001, Entered: 8/15/2001 Status Report
                                                                      STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 8/14/01. (FE)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 13 Filed: 6/19/2001, Entered: 6/20/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER granting [12-1] motion to Stay Proceedings (signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 12 Filed: 6/15/2001, Entered: 6/18/2001, Terminated: 6/19/2001 Terminated:
                                                                          MOTION by USA (Service: 6/15/01) to Stay Proceedings (to August 14, 2001). (DS)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 11 Filed: 4/30/2001, Entered: 5/1/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                            ORDER Answer deadline to 6/15/01 (signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis). Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 10 Filed: 4/16/2001, Entered: 4/17/2001 Status Report
                                                                              STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 4/16/01. (FE)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 9 Filed: 1/16/2001, Entered: 1/17/2001 Status Report
                                                                                STATUS REPORT by USA Service: 1/16/01 (FE)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 8 Filed: 9/15/2000, Entered: 9/18/2000 Status Report
                                                                                  STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 9/15/00. (FE)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 7 Filed: 5/17/2000, Entered: 5/18/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                    ORDER granting request for continued stay and set joint Status Report deadline to 9/15/00. ( signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 6 Filed: 5/12/2000, Entered: 5/16/2000 Status Report
                                                                                      STATUS REPORT by USA. Service: 5/12/00 (JT)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 12/20/1999, Entered: 5/15/2000 Set/Clear Flags
                                                                                        **Not member of bar flag removed. (DS)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 5 Filed: 11/17/1999, Entered: 11/19/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                          ORDER granting [4-1] motion to Stay proceedings pending action by the Board for Correction of Naval Records. Set joint Status Report deadline to 5/15/00. ( signed by Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis ) Copy to parties. (JT)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 4 Filed: 11/12/1999, Entered: 11/16/1999, Terminated: 11/17/1999 Terminated:
                                                                                            MOTION by USA (Service : 11/12/99 ) to Stay proceedings pending action by the Board for Correction of Naval Records. Response due: 11/29/99 (JT)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 3 Filed: 10/4/1999, Entered: 10/7/1999 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance for USA by William Lloyd Olsen Service : 10/4/99 (JT)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 2 Filed: 9/16/1999, Entered: 9/16/1999 Court Filing
                                                                                                Notice of assignment to Sr. Judge Lawrence S. Margolis. Copy to parties. (FE)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 9/16/1999, Entered: 9/16/1999
                                                                                                  COMPLAINT, FILING FEE $120, RECEIPT #048294. Answer due on 11/15/99. (FE)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 9/16/1999, Entered: 9/17/1999 Set/Clear Flags
                                                                                                    **Not member of bar flag set (FE)
                                                                                                      LREF

                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 129 times.

                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                       
                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                      Need Password Help?